Brown v. CRST Malone, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-01527-JCH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 5:08 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LARRY BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & James, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space T. Michael Ward +1 314 242 5306 +1 314 242 5506 tmward@bjpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE A. BARTON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Hughes, Sr. +1 314 241 4477 +1 314 241 4475 rlhughes@birch.net
v.
No Logo Crst Malone, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore R. Bynum, III +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 t.r.bynum@huschblackwell.com
Space Michael Patrick Nolan +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 michael.nolan@huschblackwell.com
No Logo AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Austin Moore +1 816 714 7100 +1 816 714 7101 moore@stuevesiegel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Nagi Law Firm Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Hohenstein +1 314 889 8000 +1 314 231 1776 thohenstein@polsinelli.com
No Logo Crst Malone, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (100) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
USCA JUDGMENT as to 90 Notice of Appeal, filed by Larry Brown After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court. (CLA) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
    OPINION from USCA re 90 Notice of Appeal, : USCA Appeal #: 12-3669 We affirm the district court's grant of summary judgment in favor of CRST.(CLA) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
      Initial Notification and or Briefing Schedule from USCA for 90 Notice of Appeal filed by Larry Brown USCA Appeal Number: 12-3669 Method of Appendix due: 11/23/12 Notice of Appeal treated as: noa Notice of Appeal forwarded to panel: Yes Transcript due: 12/19/12(CLA) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
        LETTER from USCA USCA Appeal #: 12-3669(CLA) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
          Bill of Costs Taxed in amount of $2,074.09 against Plaintiff Larry Brown re: 89 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by CRST Malone, Inc. (TRC) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
            NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding 88 Judgment - (Case), 87 Memorandum & Order,. Notice of Appeal filed on 11/1/12 by Plaintiff Larry Brown. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE(BAK) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
              ENTRY of Appearance by T. Michael Ward for Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Ward, T.) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 88 Judgment - (Case) by Plaintiff Larry Brown. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0865-3540584 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2012: # 2 Payment Receipt) (LMR). Modified on 11/16/2012 (LMR). (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Bill of Costs by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Affidavit T.R. Bynum)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    JUDGMENT IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendant CRSTsMotion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and judgment is granted in favor of Defendant CRST. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/3/12. (CLA) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 87 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that CRST Malone, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 72) is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs claims are dismissed with prejudice. An appropriate Judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant AMSs Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 71) is DENIED as moot. 71 72 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/3/12. (CLA)
                        LREF
                        Blank 87 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that CRST Malone, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 72) is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs claims are dismissed with prejudice. An appropriate Judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant AMSs Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 71) is DENIED as moot. 71 72 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/3/12. (CLA) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Response to Pltf;s Admissions, Denials and Averments, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Response to Pltf's Admissions, Denials and Averments, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39)(Bynum, Theodore) (document blank - atty to refile - Modified on 9/12/2012 (CEL). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                SUPPLEMENTAL re 82 Docket Text Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSES TO DFT'SMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 2 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 3 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT''S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 4 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 5 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 6 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 7 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 8 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 9 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 10 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 11 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 12 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 13 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 14 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 15 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 16 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 17 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 18 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 19 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 20 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 21 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 22 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 23 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, # 24 Exhibit IN SUPPORT OF PLT'S RESPONSE TO DFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT)(Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Docket Text ORDER: Re: 80 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: PLT'S EXHIBITS RE PLT'S STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS; PLT'S STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ;Proposed extension date AUGUST 30, 2012 by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Hughes, Richard) (Main Document 80 replaced on 8/30/2012 to fix orientation of document as attorney filed document upside down) (TRC). filed by Larry Brown ; ORDERED SO ORDERED, ( Response to Court due by 8/30/2012.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/30/12. (TRC) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                    SUPPLEMENTAL re: 80 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: PLT'S EXHIBITS RE PLT'S STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS; PLT'S STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ;Proposed extension date AUGUST 30, 2012 ATTACH PLT'S EXHIBIT LIST by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Hughes, Richard) Modified on 8/30/2012 to term motion and redocket as a supplement(TRC). (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: PLT'S EXHIBITS RE PLT'S STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS; PLT'S STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ;Proposed extension date AUGUST 30, 2012 by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Hughes, Richard) (Main Document 80 replaced on 8/30/2012 to fix orientation of document as attorney filed document upside down) (TRC). (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                        STATEMENT of Material Facts re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLT STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS filed by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant CRST Malone, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMS Staff Leasing filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Response to AMS' Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                              ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Hartenbach James R. Date of Conference: 7/31/12. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(TRC) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                  STATEMENT of Material Facts re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit)(Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23 (security edited due to SSN on document - Modified on 7/31/2012 (CEL).), # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Docket Text ORDER: Re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation /Request to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (which will be filed July 30, 2012) in excess of 15 pages provided by Rule 78-4.01 by Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. (Hohenstein, Thomas) filed by AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD; SO ORDERED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 7/30/12. (CLA) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation /Request to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (which will be filed July 30, 2012) in excess of 15 pages provided by Rule 78-4.01 by Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Docket Text ORDER: Re: 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, (Restated Request for Modification) by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) filed by AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH., ( Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2012.)(refer to document# 67 for additional details). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 07/10/2012. (CLK) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, (Restated Request for Modification) by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 25 ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (ECF No. 25) is DENIED.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 7/6/12. (CEL) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER re 60 ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd.'sObjection and Motion to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. 60), is GRANTED in part, and the subpoena issued to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford a/k/a CNA Financial Corporation is quashed. FURTHER ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd.'s Objection and Motion to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. 60) is DENIED without prejudice in all other respects.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 6/26/12. (CEL) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Hartenbach James R. Neutral selected by Parties (copy emailed to neutral)(LSD) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Larry Brown Neutral: Hartenbach James R. Date of Conference: Tuesday, July 31, 2012 time: 9:30 a.m. Location: USA & M, 720 Olive Street, Suite 2300, St. Louis, MO 63101-2317 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Signed Memorandum, Designation of Neutral by Parties and ADR Converence Report)(Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Docket Text ORDER: Re: 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, by Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. AND 59 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, by Plaintiff Larry Brown.; ORDERED : MOTIONS TO AMEND, docs. 57 and 59 DENIED. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 6/19/12. (CEL) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss :Third Party Complaint for Indemnity Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) Response to Supplemental Brief in Opposition to the Motin to Dismiss filed by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Telephonic Deposition of William Reid)(Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION to Quash Objection and Motion to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lynn Hanson, # 2 Exhibit B - Subpoena)(Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                First MOTION to Amend/Correct 57 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, (Entered on Case October 27, 2011) Modification to Case Mgmt Order by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss :Third Party Complaint for Indemnity Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) Supplemental Brief in Support filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, (Entered on Case October 27, 2011) by Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Richard Hughes ADR Completion Deadline due by 8/1/2012. Designation of Neutral due by 6/21/2012. ADR Conference Schedule due by 6/21/2012. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 6/1/12. (CLA) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER OF ADR TIMELINESS: ORDERED the deadlines set forth are to be met timely with the appropriate forms filed with the Clerk of the District Court as indicated in the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution. If a deadline cannot be met, the designated lead counsel shall file a motion requesting an extension of the deadline prior to the expiration of that deadline. FURTHER ORDERED that if compliance with a deadline set forth in the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution has not occurred, such noncompliance may result in the imposition of sanctions to the appropriate party or parties.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 6/1/12. (CLA) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Docket Text ORDER: Re: 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Discovery by ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. ; ORDERED : SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 5/30/12. (CEL) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Discovery filed by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Discovery by ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss :Third Party Complaint for Indemnity Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton: Telephone Conference held on 5/22/2012 re; motion to compel. Discussions heard re: discovery of documents, interrogs and request for production. Court requests a list of documents to be provided by pltffs atty. Pltff ordered the transcript of the workers compensation trial. Supp'e responses will be due by 6/1/12 (Court Reporter:D. Kreigshauser.) (FTR Gold: No.) (motion, doc. 30 Granted in part and denied in part(CEL) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Docket Text ORDER: REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES DUE FRIDAY JUNE 1, 2012.SO ORDERED JCH. ( Response to Court due by 6/1/2012.). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 05/22/12. (CLK) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Docket Text ORDER: CONFERENCE CALL SET FOR 5/22/12 AT 10:30 A.M. REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL DOC. #30; DEFT TO SET UP THE TELECONFERENCE. SO ORDERED JCH. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 5/21/12. (CLA) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 30 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Expedited) filed by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 41 Supplemental Brief in Support of it's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss :Third Party Complaint for Indemnity Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Docket Text ORDER: Re: 42 MOTION to Withdraw by Third Party Defendant Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Moore, John) filed by Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing ; ORDERED SO ORDERED, Attorney John A. Moore terminated. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 5/8/12. (TRC) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.'s Motion to Convert Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A., Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Into a Motion for Summary Judgment and Continue the Briefing Schedule to Allow Time for Discovery (ECF No. 27 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc. is granted until Friday, May 18, 2012, to respond to Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (ECF No. 25 ).(Response to Court due by 5/18/2012). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 5/8/12. (TRC) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw by Third Party Defendant Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Moore, John) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Supplemental Brief in Support of 30 MOTION to Compel Discovery by ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bynum, Theodore) Modified on 5/8/2012 to term motion and redocket as a supplemental brief in support (TRC). (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 MOTION to Continue the Briefing Schedule to Allow Time for Discovery and to Convert Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A., Ltd's Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 27 MOTION to Continue the Briefing Schedule to Allow Time for Discovery and to Convert Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A., Ltd's Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Summary Judgment Memorandum In Support of Responsee filed by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 27 MOTION to Continue the Briefing Schedule to Allow Time for Discovery and to Convert Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A., Ltd's Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Thomas P. Hohenstein (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd.s Request to Modify Order to Shorten Time to Allow for an Additional Two Days to Respond to Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.s Motion to Convert (ECF No. 35) is GRANTED, and Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd., is granted until Wednesday, May 2, 2012, to respond to the Motion to Convert (ECF No. 27). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc. is granted until Monday, May 7, 2012, to reply to Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd.s response to the Motion to Convert. 35 Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/27/12. (CLA) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Third Party MOTION for Extension of: Additional Two Days to Respond to Defendant CRST Malone, Inc's Motion to Convert by Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Certification of Mailing by Plaintiff Larry Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit List, # 3 Supplement Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant, # 4 Supplement Plaintiff's Request to Produce to Defendant)(Hughes, Richard) Modified on 4/27/2012 (CLA). (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 29 ORDERED that Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time (ECF No. 29) is GRANTED, and Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A., Ltd., is granted until Monday, April 30, 2012, at 10:00 A.M. to respond to the Motion to Convert (ECF No. 27). FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc. is granted until Tuesday, May 1, 2012, at 10:00 A.M. to reply to Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A., Ltd.'s response to the Motion to Convert. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.'s request for a hearing on the Motion to Convert is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that any response or reply to Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A., Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) shall be held in abeyance pending further order of the Court.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/26/12. (CEL) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Expedite Time for Hearing on Motion to Convert Response and Objection to filed by Third Party Defendant Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 30 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite Time for Hearing on Motion to Convert by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 27 MOTION to Continue the Briefing Schedule to Allow Time for Discovery and to Convert Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A., Ltd's Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Continue the Briefing Schedule to Allow Time for Discovery and to Convert Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A., Ltd's Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss :Third Party Complaint for Indemnity Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (part 1 of 2), # 2 Appendix (part 2 of 2))(Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss :Third Party Complaint for Indemnity Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Third Party Defendants AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text ORDER: Re: 23 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Third Party Defendant Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) filed by Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing ; ORDERED SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/13/12. (TRC) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Third Party Defendant Breckenridge Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a AMS Staff Leasing f/k/a AMS Staff Leasing. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 13 Third Party Complaint by AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD.(Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ENTRY of Appearance by John A. Moore for Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. (Moore, John) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas P. Hohenstein for Third Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. (Hohenstein, Thomas) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD PARTY Summons Issued as to 3rd party defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD. The summons was mailed to Atty Theodore Bynum. (CEL) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc. Process Server: Special Delivery Service, Inc. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM re 13 Third Party Complaint SUMMONS ON A THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text ORDER: Re: 14 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) filed by CRST Malone, Inc.; GRANTED JCH. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 1/23/12. (CLA) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against third party defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. LTD, filed by CRST Malone, Inc..(Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: standard Motion to Join Parties due by 1/16/2011. Discovery Completion due by 6/15/2012. ADR Future Reference 6/1/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2012. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 10/27/11. (CLA) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton: Rule 16 Conference held on 10/27/2011. Conference held by phone. Case Management Order to issue. (FTR Gold: No.) (TRC) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Larry Brown. JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN. (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Larry Brown and Defendant CRST Malone, Inc. (Hughes, Richard) Modified on 10/18/2011 to add defendant as filer (TRC). Modified on 10/18/2011 - per phone call with Plaintiff's attorney's office, wrong joint scheduling plan filed and attorney will be filing an amended joint scheduling plan (TRC). (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (see order for additional details) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/17/2011. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/27/2011 10:00 AM by Telephone before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 9/19/11. (TRC) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of Appearance by Theodore R. Bynum, III for Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.. (Bynum, Theodore) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc. Sent To: Jefferson County Circuit Court Executed by State Court Clerk (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Nolan, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint 4 Complaint (Removal) filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, 11JE-CC00188 by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.. (SAJ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Complaint (Removal) Received From: Circuit Court of Jefferson County, 11JE-CC00188, filed by Larry Brown.(SAJ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc... (Nolan, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 7/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 25 ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (ECF No. 25) is DENIED.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 7/6/12. (CEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Defendant CRST Malone, Inc. To Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal (Nolan, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 4/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd.s Request to Modify Order to Shorten Time to Allow for an Additional Two Days to Respond to Defendant CRST Malone, Inc.s Motion to Convert (ECF No. 35) is GRANTED, and Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd., is granted until Wednesday, May 2, 2012, to respond to the Motion to Convert (ECF No. 27). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff CRST Malone, Inc. is granted until Monday, May 7, 2012, to reply to Third-Party Defendant AMS Staff Leasing, N.A. Ltd.s response to the Motion to Convert. 35 Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/27/12. (CLA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County, Circuit Court, case number 11JE-CC00188, with receipt number 0865-2910783, in the amount of $350 Jury Demand,, filed by CRST Malone, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Original Filing Form, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nolan, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?