Xilinx, Inc. v. Invention Investment Fund I LP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00666
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 9:25 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Intellectual Ventures, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Intellectual Ventures I LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Invention Investment Fund I LP, Defendant
No Logo Invention Investment Fund II LLC, Defendant
No Logo Xilinx, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (114) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Farnan : D.I. # 45, 74, 81 (cla, ) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
    ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell : D.I. # 56, 71, 72, 82, 83 (cla, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
      ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RETURN OF SEALED DOCUMENTS: Pursuant to the attached STANDING ORDER dated January 8, 2013, sealed documents identified on the highlighted docket sheet will be claimed by the FILING party/attorney no later than 7/7/14. Filing attorney or their designee shall CLAIM their sealed documents by sending an E-MAIL, Subject: Return of Sealed Documents, to returnsealeddocs@ded.uscourts.gov, listing the case number and a contact's name, phone number and address. Parties not registered in CM/ECF may call our Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to claim their sealed documents. Once sealed documents are claimed, THE CLERK SHALL prepare receipts and contact filers WHEN THEIR DOCUMENTS ARE READY FOR PICK-UP at the Clerk's Office, 844 N. King Street, Intake Help Desk, Room 4209. Documents not claimed shall be unsealed and handled pursuant to the standing order. (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Docket Sheet) (cla, ) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL (filed in lead case no. 10-1065), ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/2/14. (ntl) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Xilinx, Inc. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Civil Action Nos. 10-1065-LPS and 11-666-LPS are consolidated for all purposes. Hereafter, all papers shall be filed in Civil Action No. 10-1065-LPS. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/23/12. (ntl) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to Motion re 103 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (Transferred Action Duplicative) -- Motion to Dismiss or Consolidate -- filed by Xilinx, Inc.. (Bauer, Richard) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                REPLY to Response to Motion re 98 MOTION to Stay Pending Conclusion of PTO Reexaminations of the Patents-in-Suit filed by Xilinx, Inc.. (Bauer, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE to Motion re 103 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (Transferred Action Duplicative) -- Motion to Dismiss or Consolidate -- filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE to Motion re 98 MOTION to Stay Pending Conclusion of PTO Reexaminations of the Patents-in-Suit filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 104 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                      STATEMENT re 95 Order, -- Joint Submission on Proposed Case Schedule -- by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Xilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Bauer, Richard) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss Based upon (Transferred Action Duplicative) -- Motion to Dismiss or Consolidate -- - filed by Xilinx, Inc.. (Bauer, Richard) (ntl). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                          STATEMENT re (89 in 1:10-cv-01065-LPS) Notice (Other) -- Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Subsequent Proceedings Relating to Defendants' Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Conclusion of PTO Reexaminations of the Patents-in-Suit by Xilinx, Inc.. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 91 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim -- Xilinx, Inc.'s Answer to the Counterclaims of Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC -- by Xilinx, Inc..(Bauer, Richard) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Submission of Proposed Schedule - re 99 Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Proposed Scheduling Order - re 95 Order,. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Stay Pending Conclusion of PTO Reexaminations of the Patents-in-Suit - filed by Xilinx, Inc.. (Bauer, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                    Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Xilinx to Answer Counterclaims to September 23, 2011 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Xilinx, Inc.. (Bauer, Richard) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Behrooz Shariati, Laurie M. Charrington and Henry Leslie Welch - filed by Xilinx, Inc.. (Bauer, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal to the Court no later than September 27, 2011. The parties are to review the Courts form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, Forms). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/13/11. (ntl) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Desmarais, Michael P. Stadnick, Ameet A. Modi, and Eugene Chiu of Desmarais LLP - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (the law firms of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP and Jones Day for plaintiff Xilinx, Inc.) by Xilinx, Inc. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bradford John Black and Peter Hsueh-Kang Chang of Black & Chang LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: Attorneys no longer represent Defendants. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 91 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Xilinx, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Local Counsel Letter sent to Defendant's counsel. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/1/2011. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Local Counsel Letter sent to Plaintiff's counsel. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/1/2011. (els) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Record of case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number in Other District: 3:11-cv-00671. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                        CLERKS NOTICE: Transferring to the USDC for the District of Delaware the claims concerning the patents that are part of the Delaware Action (patent '325, '087, '646 and '669). (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                          ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO ENJOIN, DISMISS AND/OR TRANSFER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Case Management Order filed by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY in support of (re 56 MOTION ) to Enjoin - Public Version filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/21/2011) Modified on 7/21/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 79 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exhibit 1 to 76 Declaration of Behrooz Shariati by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/21/2011) Modified on 7/21/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 79 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Xilinx's Reply in Support of 56 Its Motion to Enjoin by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/21/2011) Modified on 7/21/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 80 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - Defendants' Reply in Support of 39 their Motion to Dismiss Xilinx's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph F. Chernesky)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/20/2011) Modified on 7/21/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re 77 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011) Modified on 7/21/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        ORDER granting 75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY (re 39 MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ) Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Xilinx's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Public Version) filed byIntellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph F. Chernesky)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/20/2011
                                                                            STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION DISCLOSED IN DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS XILINX'S COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Declaration of Behrooz Shariati in Support of Xilinx's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Enjoin filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Permit Xilinx to File Under Seal Its Reply in Support of its Motion to Enjoin filed by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 70 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph F. Chernesky, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 39 MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ) Xilinx's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Public Version) filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 68 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Justin Liu in Support of Xilinx's Opposition by Xilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14)(Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 68 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Xilinx's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (link e.filed documents to this order) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 56 MOTION ) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin filed byIntellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph F. Chernesky)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Declaration of Justin Liu in Support of 64 Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Behrooz Shariati in Opposition to 64 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 39 MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ) filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PERMIT XILINX TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PERMIT DEFENDANTS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Xilinx, Inc. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 7/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford John Black of Peter H. Chang (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/14/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REDACTION Public Version of 56 Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/16/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 53 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/16/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC of Withdrawal of Frank M. Washko (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 45 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended [Proposed] Order by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 5/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 5/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AMENDED DOCUMENT by Xilinx, Inc.. Amendment to 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Notice. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 5/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Renotice motion hearing re 39 MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed byIntellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/28/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/28/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 45 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-16 and F.R.C.P. 7.1 ) filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laurie M. Charrington, # 2 Proposed Order)(Charrington, Laurie) (Filed on 4/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-16 and F.R.C.P. 7.1 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Detkin, # 2 Declaration of Bradford Black, # 3 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order Granting Xilinx Motion to Enjoin by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 4/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Justin Liu in Support of Xilinx Motion to Enjoin filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 4/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Behrooz Shariati in Support of Xilinx Motion to Enjoin filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 4/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Xilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation to Permit Xilinx to File Under Seal, # 2 Declaration of Behrooz Shariati, # 3 [Proposed] Order)(Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 4/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Ameet A. Modi in Support of 39 MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed byIntellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit U)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Xilinx's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Koh granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Eugene Chiu. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Koh granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Ameet Modi. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Koh granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Stadnick. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Koh granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of John Desmarais. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009308) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION of Eugene Chiu for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009308) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 30 APPLICATION of Ameet A. Modi for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009308) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION of Ameet A. Modi for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009308) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re 28 APPLICATION of Michael P. Stadnick for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009308) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION of Michael P. Stadnick for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009308) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 26 APPLICATION of John M. Desmarais for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009308) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION of John M. Desmarais for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009308) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on March 9, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Xilinx, Inc.. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 3/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Xilinx, Inc., Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/28/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011) Modified on 3/2/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Extenstion of Time to Respond to Complaint by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC, Xilinx, Inc. (Washko, Frank) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/2/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford John Black (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 2/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Michael Washko (Washko, Frank) (Filed on 2/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Xilinx, Inc. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 2/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xilinx, Inc.. Invention Investment Fund II LLC served on 2/17/2011, answer due 3/10/2011. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 2/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xilinx, Inc.. Invention Investment Fund I LP served on 2/17/2011, answer due 3/10/2011. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 2/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xilinx, Inc.. Intellectual Ventures, LLC served on 2/17/2011, answer due 3/10/2011. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 2/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xilinx, Inc.. Intellectual Ventures II LLC served on 2/17/2011, answer due 3/10/2011. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 2/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xilinx, Inc.. Intellectual Ventures I LLC served on 2/17/2011, answer due 3/10/2011. (Shariati, Behrooz) (Filed on 2/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***WRONG STANDING ORDER ATTACHED TO HARD COPY GIVEN AT CASE OPENING, SEE DOCKET #9 FOR AMENDED ORDER*** ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) Modified on 2/17/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Invention Investment Fund I LP. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Invention Investment Fund II LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Intellectual Ventures Management LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Intellectual Ventures, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures Management LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Invention Investment Fund I LP, Invention Investment Fund II LLC (Filing fee $350, receipt number 54611009106). Filed by Xilinx, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2011: # 1 COMPLAINT part 2, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/29/2011.] (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 312 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?