Hewlett-Packard Company v. Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-02773
District Judge James F. Holderman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 8:00 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.

Represented by Bracewell LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Barry Kenneth Shelton +1 512 375 4907 +1 512 479 6745 barry.shelton@pillsburylaw.com
v.
No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Woodruff Colt +1 650 801 5004 +1 650 801 5100 dougcolt@quinnemanuel.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 2/26/2014.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hewlett-Packard Company by Barry K. Shelton (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
      RECEIVED from California Northern; Case Number 3:12-cv-01076 . (lcw) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
        ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Illinois (CTO-2). (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 04/17/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 13 Motion to Stay (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 04/17/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/17/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 04/17/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
              Proposed Order re 13 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Filed on 4/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/9/12. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION To Stay Proceedings Pursuant To Local Rule 7-12 filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Shelton, Barry) (Filed on 4/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 4/20/2012. Replies due by 4/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Shelton, Barry) (Filed on 4/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Hewlett-Packard Company . (Shelton, Barry) (Filed on 4/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC re 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer, (NEW HEARING DATE) (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge due by 4/6/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                              Proposed Order re 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer, by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. (Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer, filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 4/10/2012. Replies due by 4/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Colt, Douglas) (Filed on 3/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC served on 3/7/2012, answer due 3/28/2012. (Shelton, Barry) (Filed on 3/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    CLERKS NOTICE Effective March 20, 2012, Magistrate Judge Laurel Beelers courtroom and chambers will be located in the Phillip Burton Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom C, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California 94102. On or after March 20, 2012, all filings for matters pending on Judge Beelers docket, all court appearances, and all deliveries of chambers copies of documents must be made at the San Francisco Courthouse. The days and times for law and motion calendars and all currently scheduled proceedings remain unchanged. Please note that all of Judge Beelers case files will be moved to the San Francisco Courthouse, therefore all case numbers assigned to her will be changed slightly to reflect the correct venue. Previously, all case numbers started with 4 to indicate the Oakland office (Example: 4:12-cv-12345-LB). As of March 20, 2012, all of Judge Beelers case files will begin with 3 to indicate the San Francisco office, but everything else will stay the same (Example: 3:12-cv-12345-LB). When e-filing, using the short case number format will always avoid problems when searching for the correct case: 12-12345 (YY-NNNNN). For information on the San Francisco Courthouses accessibility, parking, driving directions, public transit, hotels and other helpful links, please visit our website: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov, click on Court Information on the right hand side of our main page, then select the San Francisco link under Address and Jurisdiction. The main telephone number for the San Francisco Division is 415-522-2000. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                      REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                        ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                          Summons Issued as to Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Hewlett-Packard Company identifying Other Affiliate Time Warner Cable, Other Affiliate Panera Bread Company, Other Affiliate Panera, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Corporation, Other Affiliate Wandering WiFi, Other Affiliate AirWatch, LLC, Other Affiliate Best Western River North Hotel, Other Affiliate BestComm Networks, Inc., Other Affiliate Burr Ridge Suites, LLC, Other Affiliate Caribou Coffee Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Dominick's Supermarkets, Inc., Other Affiliate Eleven Wireless, Other Affiliate Elmhurst Suites, LLC, Other Affiliate SpringHill Suites by Marriott, Other Affiliate Farmer's Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Other Affiliate Guest-Tek Interactive Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Health Telephone, Other Affiliate Holiday Inn Great America, Other Affiliate Joie de Vivre Hotels, Other Affiliate Kenergy Corp., Other Affiliate Kissimmee Utility Authority, Other Affiliate La Quinta, Other Affiliate Las Vegas Sands Corp., Other Affiliate Studio Plus Hotels, Inc., Other Affiliate Sunray TVI, Other Affiliate Tantus Networks, Other Affiliate Wendy's/Arby's Restaurants, LLC, Other Affiliate Wendy's Arby's Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Safeway, Inc., Other Affiliate La Quinta Inns & Suites for Hewlett-Packard Company. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611071243.). Filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2012: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjl, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 4/18/2012.] (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 559 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?