HOLK v. CADBURY SCHWEPPES AMERICAS BEVERAGES et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-03018
District Judge Mary Little Cooper, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Mary Little Cooper
Last Updated November 14, 2016 at 12:31 AM EST (8.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo STACY HOLK, Plaintiff

Represented by Wilentz, Goldman & Spitzer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LYNNE M. KIZIS +1 732 636 8000 lkizis@wilentz.com
Space Daniel Robert Lapinski +1 212 267 3091 +1 732 726 4735 dlapinski@wilentz.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PHILIP A. TORTORETI +1 732 636 8000 +1 732 726 6542 ptortoreti@wilentz.com
v.
No Logo CADBURY SCHWEPPES AMERICAS BEVERAGES, Defendant

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2007 Richard Benjamin Harper +1 212 408 2675 +1 212 259 2475 richard.harper@bakerbotts.com
TERMINATED: 07/30/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Benjamin Harper +1 212 408 2675 +1 212 259 2475 richard.harper@bakerbotts.com
TERMINATED: 07/30/2007 Maureen Patricia Reid +1 212 408 2521 +1 212 259 2521 maureen.reid@bakerbotts.com
No Logo COTT QUALITY BEVERAGE, INC., Defendant
No Logo ESSEX COTT DISTRIBUTORS, INC., Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Snapple Beverage Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Benjamin Harper +1 212 408 2675 +1 212 259 2475 richard.harper@bakerbotts.com
TERMINATED: 11/12/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Benjamin Harper +1 212 408 2675 +1 212 259 2475 richard.harper@bakerbotts.com
Space Maureen Patricia Reid +1 212 408 2521 +1 212 259 2521 maureen.reid@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SETH T. TAUBE +1 212 408 2500 +1 212 408 2501 seth.taube@bakerbotts.com
No Logo SNAPPLE DISTRIBUTORS, INC., Defendant

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2007 Richard Benjamin Harper +1 212 408 2675 +1 212 259 2475 richard.harper@bakerbotts.com
TERMINATED: 07/30/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Benjamin Harper +1 212 408 2675 +1 212 259 2475 richard.harper@bakerbotts.com
TERMINATED: 07/30/2007 Maureen Patricia Reid +1 212 408 2521 +1 212 259 2521 maureen.reid@bakerbotts.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (145) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 145 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 11/22/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski. (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 143 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER setting a Status Conference with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman for November 19, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/9/10. (ij, ) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion to Reopen Case Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 10/14/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 139 MOTION to Reopen Case (UNOPPOSED) filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Reopen Case (UNOPPOSED) by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 138 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER staying actin and administratively DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 9/8/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for referral to United States Food and Drug Administration Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/31/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski to the Honorable Lois Goodman, USMJ with attached form of Order for Referral. (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 135 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 56 Motion to disqualify experts ; denying 58 Motion to disqualify experts ; denying 64 Motion to disqualify experts ; denying 74 Motion to Certify Class and staying this action for a period of six months, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/10/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW granting 114 Deft's Unopposed Motion to Seal portions of Pltf's Reply Submitted in Support of her Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/4/2010. (gxh) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Seth T. Taube. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Seth Taube. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 96 Motion to Seal Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/14/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 87 Motion to Seal Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/14/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 85 Motion to Seal materials Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/14/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 110 Motion to Seal Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/14/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Seth T. Taube. (TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Seth T. Taube. (TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski to the Hon. Lois Goodman Regarding the Court's July 7, 2010 Order.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER each party to submit letters/briefs by CMECF by July 9, 2010 setting forth each party's position with regard to a stay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/7/10. (ij, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support re 74 MOTION to Certify Class [Reply Brief in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification] filed by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Of Daniel Lapinski in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Seth Taube. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3)(TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ORDER setting Conference Call for June 30, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. with Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call at that time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/29/10. (ij, ) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the briefing schedule with respect to pltf's motion for class certification is hereby modified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/24/10. (lk) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Daniel Lapinski re 118 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION OF NEW AUTHORITIES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski to the Honorable Mary L. Cooper with Attachment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USDC NJ Simandle Opinion in Coyle filed June 15, 2010)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski to the Honorable Lois Goodman, USMJ. (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 114 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply Submitted in Support of Her Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. (UNOPPOSED) MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply Submitted in Support of Her Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. (UNOPPOSED) filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Law: Declaration of Bryan Mazur, # 2 Exhibit 1A to the Declaration of Bryan Mazur)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply Submitted in Support of Her Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. (UNOPPOSED) by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ryan L. Bangert to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Bryan Mazur re 111 Memorandum in Support of Motion by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit A3, # 4 Exhibit A4, # 5 Exhibit A5, # 6 Exhibit A6)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 110 MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 69 Motion to Seal Document Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/9/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Maureen P. Reid. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave of George Richard Baker, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/8/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave of Ryan L. Bangert, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/7/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 63 Motion for Leave of Joseph L. Tucker, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/7/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Maureen P. Reid re 98 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 98 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 to Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit 5 to Memorandum of Law, # 3 Exhibit 6 to Memorandum of Law, # 4 Exhibit 7 to Memorandum of Law, # 5 Exhibit 8 to Memorandum of Law)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 101 Declaration by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2B, # 2 Exhibit 2C, # 3 Exhibit 2H, # 4 Exhibit 2K)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Bryan Mazur re 98 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2D, # 2 Exhibit 2E, # 3 Exhibit 2F, # 4 Exhibit 2G, # 5 Exhibit 2I, # 6 Exhibit 2J)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 99 Declaration by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1E, # 2 Exhibit 1F, # 3 Exhibit 1G, # 4 Exhibit 1H, # 5 Exhibit 1J)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Maureen P. Reid re 98 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B, # 3 Exhibit 1C, # 4 Exhibit 1I, # 5 Exhibit 1K, # 6 Exhibit 1L)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 74 MOTION to Certify Class filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 96 MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Law- Declaration of Bryan Mazur, # 2 Exhibit 1A to Bryan Mazur's Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1B to Bryan Mazur's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1C to Bryan Mazur's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 1D to Bryan Mazur's Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 1E to Bryan Mazur's Declaration)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 64 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith Ugone, PH.D. Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion filed by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Maureen P. Reid re 91 Exhibit (to Document), 90 Declaration, 93 Exhibit (to Document), 92 Declaration, 89 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 92 Declaration, by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 to Bangert Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 6 to Bangert Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 8 to Bangert Declaration)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Ryan L. Bangert re 89 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to Bangert Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 3 to Bangert Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 4 to Bangert Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 7 to Bangert Declaration)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 90 Declaration by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to Mazur Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 3 to Mazur Declaration)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION re 89 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 64 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith Ugone, PH.D. filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 87 MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification (UNOPPOSED) MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification (UNOPPOSED) filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Bryan Mazur (exhibit to Memorandum), # 2 Exhibit 1a - Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Class Certification (exhibit to Declaration))(REID, MAUREEN) (Main Document 88 replaced on 6/2/2010) (dd, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/2/2010) (dd, ). (Entered: 05/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification (UNOPPOSED) by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order with Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 85 MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Defendants Reply in Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Alan G. Goedde, Ph.D. (UNOPPOSED) MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Defendants Reply in Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Alan G. Goedde, Ph.D. (UNOPPOSED) filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Materials Cited in Defendants Reply in Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Alan G. Goedde, Ph.D. (UNOPPOSED) by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law.)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 75 Memorandum in Support of Motion by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Part 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 9 Exhibit Exhibits 15 16 and 17, # 10 Exhibit Exhibits 18 19 20, # 11 Exhibit Exhibits 21 and 22)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Maureen P. Reid. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 75 Memorandum in Support of Motion by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 4, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 5, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 6, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 7, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 8, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 9, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 10, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 11, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 12, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 13, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Part 14, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Part 1, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Part 2, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Part 3, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Part 4, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit Part 5)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 75 Memorandum in Support of Motion by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 4, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 4a, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 11)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 75 Memorandum in Support of Motion by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 3, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 4, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 4a, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 5, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 6, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 7, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 8)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
Exhibit to 78 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 58 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Alan G. Goedde, Ph.D. filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit E)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 56 MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Lauran Schultz filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Maureen P. Reid. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 74 MOTION to Certify Class filed by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Certify Class by STACY HOLK. Responses due by 6/4/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Daniel R. Lapinski. (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Maureen P. Reid. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Maureen P. Reid. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 69 MOTION to Seal Document (Unopposed) MOTION to Seal Document (Unopposed) filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Document (Unopposed) by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bryan Mazur, # 2 Exhibit 1A, # 3 Exhibit 1B - part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit 1B - part 1 of 2, # 5 Proposed Order and Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Alan G. Goedde, Ph.D. filed by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 56 MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Lauran Schultz filed by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
Letter from Van H. Beckwith. (TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 64 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith Ugone, PH.D. filed by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-part 2, # 3 Exhibit A-part 3, # 4 Exhibit A-part 4, # 5 Exhibit A-part-5, # 6 Exhibit A-part 6, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Keith Ugone, PH.D. by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph L. Tucker by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Daniel Lapinski, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth T. Taube, # 2 Certification of Ryan L. Bangert, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STACY HOLK re 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for George Richard Baker (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for George Richard Baker by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Daniel Lapinski, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 58 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Alan G. Goedde, Ph.D. filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - C)(TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Alan G. Goedde, Ph.D. by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 56 MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Lauran Schultz filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibits C - F)(TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
MOTION To Exclude the Expert Testimony of Lauran Schultz by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER ORDER that the parties shall notify Chambers of the undersigned within 5 days of a ruling on the Class Certification motion in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 3/31/2010. (gxh) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/28/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2010 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/28/2010. (ss, ) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
Certification of Seth T. Taube in Support of Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order on behalf of SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (gxh) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION.(TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION, filed by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the initial conference is rescheduled to 1/12/2010 at 9:30am Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/3/2009. (ss, ) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 46 Motion to Withdraw Richard B. Harper as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/23/2009. (ss, ) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney RICHARD B. HARPER terminated Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/12/2009. (ss, ) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed) by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by SETH T. TAUBE on behalf of SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION (TAUBE, SETH) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER, Initial Conference set for 12/14/2009 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/20/2009. (ss, ) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REOPENING CASE; reinstating Amended Complaint and directing pltf. to contact Magistrate Judge immediately to schedule a conference Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 10/13/2009. (ss, ) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed) by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA as to 36 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by STACY HOLK (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(ca3trj, ) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
USCA JUDGMENT as to 36 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by STACY HOLK (ca3mlb, ) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on June 2, 2008 before Judge Mary L. Cooper. Court Reporter: Melissa Haneke. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (mmh) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
USCA Case Number 08-3060 for 36 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by STACY HOLK. USCA Case Manager Shannon Craven (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3tmk, ) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by STACY HOLK for proceedings held on 6/2/08 before Judge Cooper. (ij, ) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 34 Opinion, 35 Order on Motion to Dismiss by STACY HOLK. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 366636. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ij, ) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss amended complaint Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 6/12/2008. (ss, ) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 6/12/2008. (ss, ) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
Letter from Philip A. Tortoreti, Esq.. (TORTORETI, PHILIP) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary L. Cooper: Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2008 re: 26 MOTION to Dismiss. Ordered motion taken under advisement. (ESR: ELLINGTON.) (eh, ) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION. (HARPER, RICHARD) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
Letter from Maureen P. Reid. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint -- Oral Argument Requested filed by STACY HOLK. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(KIZIS, LYNNE) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER ORDER granting request for additional 10 pages on memoranda. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 11/1/07. (ij, ) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER finding as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 10/22/2007. (ss, ) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION.Responses due by 11/19/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support# 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law# 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law# 4 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law# 5 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, Part 1 of 8# 6 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, Part 2 of 8# 7 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, Part 3 of 8# 8 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, Part 4 of 8# 9 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, Part 5 of 8# 10 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, Part 6 of 8# 11 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, Part 7 of 8# 12 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law, Part 8 of 8# 13 Exhibit E to Memorandum of Law# 14 Text of Proposed Order)(HARPER, RICHARD) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/8/2007, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants all defendants., filed by STACY HOLK.(LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 10/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND PLEADINGS Signed by Judge John J. Hughes on 9/24/2007. (ss, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
Proposed Pretrial Order (Proposed) Consent Order Granting Leave to Amend Pleadings by STACY HOLK. (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER modifying return date and briefing schedule for 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION and Signed by Judge John J. Hughes on 8/28/2007. (ss, ) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
Letter from Philip A. Tortoreti. (TORTORETI, PHILIP) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
Rule 7.1 Letter for extension of return date re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by STACY HOLK. (TORTORETI, PHILIP) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION.Responses due by 8/21/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 3 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 4 Exhibit B Part 1 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 5 Exhibit B Part 2 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 6 Exhibit B Part 3 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 7 Exhibit B Part 4 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 8 Exhibit B Part 5 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 9 Exhibit B Part 6 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 10 Exhibit B Part 7 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 11 Exhibit B Part 8 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 12 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 13 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# 14 Text of Proposed Order)(HARPER, RICHARD) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
  • Attachment 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 3 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 4 Exhibit B Part 1 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 5 Exhibit B Part 2 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 6 Exhibit B Part 3 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 7 Exhibit B Part 4 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 8 Exhibit B Part 5 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 9 Exhibit B Part 6 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 10 Exhibit B Part 7 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 11 Exhibit B Part 8 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 12 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 13 Exhibit D to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
  • Attachment 14 Text of Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R. LAPINSKI on behalf of STACY HOLK (LAPINSKI, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by LYNNE M. KIZIS on behalf of STACY HOLK (KIZIS, LYNNE) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by STACY HOLK (Attachments: # 1 Errata Notice of Appearance by Lynne Kizis, Esq.)(TORTORETI, PHILIP) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by STACY HOLK (TORTORETI, PHILIP) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP A. TORTORETI on behalf of STACY HOLK (TORTORETI, PHILIP) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Allyson Ho to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HARPER, RICHARD) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Van H. Beckwith to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HARPER, RICHARD) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave of ALLYSON HO, ESQ. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge John J. Hughes on 7/16/2007. (ss, ) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave of VAN H. BECKWITH ESQ. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge John J. Hughes on 7/16/2007. (ss, ) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER extending time to answer as to defts. CADBURY SCHWEPPES AMERICAS BEVERAGES, SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION, & SNAPPLE DISTRIBUTORS, INC, ans. due 7/30/07. Signed by Judge John J. Hughes on 7/12/07. (lk) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER extending time within which dfts. may answer complaint to 7/30/2007 Signed by Judge John J. Hughes on 7/9/2007. (ss, ) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Van Beckwith by CADBURY SCHWEPPES AMERICAS BEVERAGES, SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION, SNAPPLE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of R. Harper# 2 Certification of V. Beckwith# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(HARPER, RICHARD) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allyson Ho by CADBURY SCHWEPPES AMERICAS BEVERAGES, SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION, SNAPPLE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of R. Harper# 2 Certification of A. Ho# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(HARPER, RICHARD) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Van H. Beckwith by CADBURY SCHWEPPES AMERICAS BEVERAGES, SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION, SNAPPLE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Van H. Beckwith# 2 Certification of Richard B. Harper# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allyson N. Ho by CADBURY SCHWEPPES AMERICAS BEVERAGES, SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION, SNAPPLE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Allyson Ho# 2 Certification of Richard B. Harper# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing:Initial Conference set for 8/16/2007 @10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge John J. Hughes. (Attached: Instructions, Joint Discovery Plan)(dg, ) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION Consent Order Extending Time Within Which Defendants May Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CADBURY SCHWEPPES AMERICAS BEVERAGES, SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION, SNAPPLE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. (REID, MAUREEN) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CADBURY SCHWEPPES AMERICAS BEVERAGES, SNAPPLE BEVERAGE CORPORATION, SNAPPLE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. from Monmouth County Superior Court, case number 07-2462. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 200 346021) with the following state court proceeding annexed 1)complaint (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Wexler# 2 Defendants' Rule 7.1 Statement)(tp ) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 114 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?