Network Protection Sciences, LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01106-WHA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 10:58 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Network Protection Sciences, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CARRIE ANN LONGSTAFF +1 212 589 4697 +1 212 589 4201 clongstaff@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
Space Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com
Space Daymon Jeffrey Rambin +1 903 233 4830 +1 903 236 8787 jrambin@capshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Fawn Kopeikin +1 650 428 3900 +1 650 428 3901 jkopeikin@gcalaw.com
Space Valerie Margo Wagner +1 650 428 3900 +1 650 428 3901 vwagner@gcalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL CUKOR +1 973 596 4500 +1 973 639 6462 mcukor@gibbonslaw.com
Space Andrew Peter MacArthur +1 212 613 2167 +1 212 554 9637 amacarthur@gibbonslaw.com
Space Vincent E. McGeary +1 973 596 4500 +1 973 596 0545 vmcgeary@gibbonslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jonathon Brugh Lower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jillian Alexandria Centanni +1 973 596 4500 jcentanni@gibbonslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Owens Tarabichi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Richard Owens +1 408 298 8202 +1 408 521 2203 dowens@owenstarabichi.com
Space Bruno W Tarabichi btarabichi@owenstarabichi.com
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Juniper Networks, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo SONIC WALL, INC., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Deep Nines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sanford E Warren, Jr. +1 214 969 2877 +1 214 969 4343 swarren@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldfarb LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey M Goldfarb +1 214 583 2233 jgoldfarb@goldfarbllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E Glenn Thames +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 glennthames@potterminton.com
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michele Kim Connors

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keala Chan +1 415 875 6414 kealachan@quinnemanuel.com
Space William Owen Cooper +1 925 984 3225 +1 415 875 6700 willcooper@quinnemanuel.com
Space Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Bernstein Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alice Catherine Garber +1 415 765 6623 +1 415 283 4804 agarber@blgrp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Lynn Brewer +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 rbrewer@wsgr.com
Space Stefani Elise Shanberg +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 sshanberg@wsgr.com
No Logo Juniper Networks, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas J. Dixon +1 949 760 5220 ddixon@irell.com
Space Eric B Hanson +1 310 203 7070 +1 310 203 7199 ehanson@irell.com
Space David Craig McPhie +1 949 760 5216 dmcphie@irell.com
No Logo SONIC WALL, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carr & Ferrell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth B Wilson +1 650 812 3400 +1 650 812 3444 kwilson@carrferrell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Brent Rasmussen brasmussen@lrlaw.com
Space Colby Brian Springer +1 650 391 1394 +1 650 687 8492 cspringer@lrrlaw.com
No Logo Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Binney +1 206 354 3871 dhbinney@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Thomas McDonald +1 206 623 7580 + 206 623 7022 david.mcdonald@klgates.com
Space James George Warriner +1 512 482 6800 +1 512 482 6859 jim.warriner@klgates.com
Space Roderick B Williams +1 512 482 6880 +1 512 482 6859 rick.williams@klgates.com
No Logo Network Protection Sciences, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (426) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 392 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 311) by Hon. William Alsup granting 311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
    ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 311) by Hon. William Alsup granting 311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 391 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
      ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 310) by Hon. William Alsup granting 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
        LREF
        Blank 390 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL (DKT. NOS. 260, 291) [correcting Dkt. No. 342] by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
          LREF
          Blank 390 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL (DKT. NOS. 260, 291) [correcting Dkt. No. 342] by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
            EXHIBITS re 315 Exhibits, 387 Order, Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences, LLCs Opposition to Fortinet, Inc.s Motions in Limine Nos. 1-5, Unsealed Pursuant to Order at Dkt. No. 387 filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Related document(s) 315 , 387 ) (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/2/2013) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
              DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ex. 3 to Declaration of David Owens ISO Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Opposition to Motion to Strike Dr. Keromytis - order granting sealing at ECF No. 342, which is unavailable for linking by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 10/2/2013) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 387 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 316) re 316 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Jill F Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences' Oppositions to Fortinet's Motions in Limine Nos 1-5 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
                  LREF
                  Blank 387 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 316) re 316 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Jill F Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences' Oppositions to Fortinet's Motions in Limine Nos 1-5 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 269 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fortinet's Reply ISO Motion to Strike Jarosz, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 276 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                      DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 327 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 5, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 260 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                        DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 327 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 3, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 260 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                          DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 38, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 28, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                              DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 25, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 24, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 23, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 19, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                      DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 17, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                        DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 11, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                          DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 10, Part 4, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 10, Part 3, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                              DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 10, Part 2, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 10, Part 1, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 7, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 6, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                      DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 5, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                        DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 4, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                          DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 3, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 1, Part 4, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                              DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 1, Part 3, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 1, Part 2, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh. 1, Part 1, Motion to Seal at Dkt. 291 by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-25-2013, before Judge William Alsup. Official Court Reporter Connie Kuhl, connie_kuhl@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-24-2013, before Judge William Alsup. Official Court Reporter Connie Kuhl, connie_kuhl@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (Related documents(s) 322 , 330 ) (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Amendment to 261 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Unredacted Versions Pursuant to Docket 341, Order Denying Moiton to File Documents Under Seal). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Owens, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Angelos Keromytis in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket 242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket 238) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 8, 9, 10, 18 and 28 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 28)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 356 Filed: 9/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 343 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 356 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 343 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 10 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 9 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 8 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 7 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 6 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 5 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 4 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 3 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 2 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 339 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1, Part 1 to the Declaration of Kopeikin in Support of NPS' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 238-242) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        EXHIBITS (Corrected) Exhibits 26-27 to Docket Nos. 238-242 Pursuant to Docket 338, Order Granting-In-Part Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on September 26, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 9/27/2013). Case settled. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2013) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 342 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL (DKT. NOS. 260, 291) re 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC, 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 332 Exhibits filed by Fortinet, Inc., 327 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 333 Exhibits, filed by Fortinet, Inc., 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 342 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                *** REFILED TO CORRECT ECF ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #390. *** ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL (DKT. NOS. 260, 291) re 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC, 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 332 Exhibits filed by Fortinet, Inc., 327 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 333 Exhibits, filed by Fortinet, Inc., 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) Modified on 10/2/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/2/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 341 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 262) by Hon. William Alsup denying 262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 341 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 262) by Hon. William Alsup denying 262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 340 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OFFORTINET, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT OPINIONS OF JOHN C. JAROSZ re 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 25, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 340 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OFFORTINET, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT OPINIONS OF JOHN C. JAROSZ re 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 25, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 339 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 243) by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 339 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 243) by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 338 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD - ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 276) by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) Modified on 9/26/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 338 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD - ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 276) by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) Modified on 9/26/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 337 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Alsup finding as moot 283 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 289 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on 292 Motion in Limine; denying 294 Motion in Limine; denying 307 Motion in Limine (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 337 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Alsup finding as moot 283 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 289 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on 292 Motion in Limine; denying 294 Motion in Limine; denying 307 Motion in Limine (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/25/2013) re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment 251 MOTION to Strike 249 MOTION to Strike. Case is referred to Magistrate Corley for settlement conference. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held on 9/24/2013 (Date Filed: 9/26/2013). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/26/2013) Modified on 9/26/2013 (dt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 334 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          OMNIBUS ORDER DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF DR. KEROMYTIS, AND GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF MR. JAROSZ by Judge Alsup denying 230 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 249 Motion to Strike ; granting 251 Motion to Strike (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 334 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            OMNIBUS ORDER DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF DR. KEROMYTIS, AND GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF MR. JAROSZ by Judge Alsup denying 230 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 249 Motion to Strike ; granting 251 Motion to Strike (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Revised Redacted Exhibits to Declaration at Dkt. No. 291 filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 326 ) (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/25/2013) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 275 Declaration in Support, Revised Redacted Exhibits Pursuant to Order at Dkt. 327 filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 275 ) (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/25/2013) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of William O. Cooper in Support of 311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Trial Brief filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 311 ) (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fortinet, Inc. for Court Reporter Connie Kuhl. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 249 MOTION to Strike Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Angelos Keromytis ) Unsealed Pursuant to Order at Dkt. No. 328 filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 328 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 272) by Hon. William Alsup denying 272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 328 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 272) by Hon. William Alsup denying 272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 327 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 260) by Hon. William Alsup denying 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 327 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 260) by Hon. William Alsup denying 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 326 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 291) by Hon. William Alsup denying 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 326 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 291) by Hon. William Alsup denying 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 325 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish refreshments to members of the jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/24/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 325 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish refreshments to members of the jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/24/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 324 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 24, 2013. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 324 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 24, 2013. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Marie Veglia Notice of Appearance of Robert P. Feldman (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/23/2013) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Network Protection Sciences, LLC for Court Reporter Connie Kuhl. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/23/2013) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of William O. Cooper in Support of 310 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Motion in Limine NOs. 1- 4 filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 310 ) (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/23/2013) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 9/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/22/2013) (Entered: 09/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 9/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 314 MOTION Administrative Motion for Misc. Relief - Augmentation of Exhibit List ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John M. Neukom, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/21/2013) (Entered: 09/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Marie Veglia (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/20/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/20/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Jill F Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences' Oppositions to Fortinet's Motions in Limine Nos 1-5 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/19/2013) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS Corrected Exhibits Nos. 40 and 42 to 288 Declaration of Jill Kopeikin filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 42)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/18/2013) Modified on 9/19/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Administrative Motion for Misc. Relief - Augmentation of Exhibit List filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Responses due by 10/2/2013. Replies due by 10/9/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill f. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Administrative Motion for Misc. Relief - to Augment, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Proposed Order)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Fortinet, Inc. . (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRIAL BRIEF [Redacted] Trial Brief by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Trial Brief filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Motion in Limine NOs. 1- 4 filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 298 Declaration in Support Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Motions in Limine No. 1-4 filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 298 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 307 Joint MOTION in Limine Paired Motion in Limine No. 4 ) Fortinet, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 4 filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION in Limine Paired Motion in Limine No. 4 filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/2/2013. Replies due by 10/9/2013. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF by Fortinet, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4A, # 6 Exhibit 4B, # 7 Exhibit 4C, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 18, # 22 19, # 23 20, # 24 21, # 25 23, # 26 24, # 27 25, # 28 26, # 29 27, # 30 28, # 31 29, # 32 30, # 33 31, # 34 32, # 35 33, # 36 34, # 37 35, # 38 36)(Wagner, Valerie) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 289 First MOTION in Limine No. 1 Exhibits to Cooper Declaration filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 289 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List 26(a)(3) Disclosure by Fortinet, Inc... (Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION in Opposition to 289 First MOTION in Limine No. 1 Declaration of William O. Cooper filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 289 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief Fortinet, Inc.'s Memoranda of Law In Support of Disputed Proposed Jury Instructions filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire by Fortinet, Inc. . (Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Form of Verdict by Fortinet, Inc. . (Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin In support of Motions In Limine Nos. 1 - 4 filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM In Support of Disputed Jury Instructions by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Wagner, Valerie) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERRATA re 294 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 3 Errrata to Motion in Limine NO. by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 294 Joint MOTION in Limine No. 3 ) Fortinet, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 3 filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/1/2013. Replies due by 10/8/2013. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 292 First MOTION in Limine No 2. Joint Paired Motions ) Fortinet, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2 filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION in Limine No 2. Joint Paired Motions filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/1/2013. Replies due by 10/8/2013. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 289 First MOTION in Limine No. 1 ) Fortinet, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 1 filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/1/2013. Replies due by 10/8/2013. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION in Limine paired motions in limine filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/1/2013. Replies due by 10/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION in Limine paired motions in limine filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/1/2013. Replies due by 10/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION in Limine paired motions in limine filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/1/2013. Replies due by 10/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION in Limine paired motions in limine filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/1/2013. Replies due by 10/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION in Limine paired motions in limine filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/1/2013. Replies due by 10/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION in Limine Paired Motions in Limine filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/1/2013. Replies due by 10/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pretrial Conference Statement by Network Protection Sciences, LLC Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Witness List, # 2 Appendix Fortinet, Inc.'s Witness List, # 3 Appendix Joint Proposed Exhibit List)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 266 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 269 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Expert Testimony and Exhibits by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 268 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Witness Deposition Transcript by Fortinet, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 267 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Expert Witness Deposition Transcript by Fortinet, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of William O. Cooper in Support of 245 Opposition/Response to Motion, 243 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated by Fortinet filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 245 , 243 ) (Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William O. Cooper, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of William O. Cooper in Partial Support of 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 260 , 259 ) (Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/12/2013) Modified on 9/13/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of William O. Cooper in Opposition to 262 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 261 , 262 ) (Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/12/2013) Modified on 9/13/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 251 MOTION to Strike Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of John C. Jarosz ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William O. Cooper, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 249 MOTION to Strike Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Angelos Keromytis ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 270 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE SEALING MOTION (DKT. NO. 243) re 243 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated by Fortinet filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 12, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 270 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE SEALING MOTION (DKT. NO. 243) re 243 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated by Fortinet filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 12, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE JAROSZ TESTIMONY AND REPORT by Hon. William Alsup granting 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 268 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT REPLY (DKT. NO. 253) by Hon. William Alsup granting 253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 268 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT REPLY (DKT. NO. 253) by Hon. William Alsup granting 253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING FORTINET'S MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEROMYTIS (DKT. NO. 250) by Hon. William Alsup granting 250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 266 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL MEGAPATH DOCUMENTS by Hon. William Alsup granting 244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 266 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL MEGAPATH DOCUMENTS by Hon. William Alsup granting 244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 264 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 263 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF Disassociation of Texas Counsel and REQUEST FOR ORDER Removing Texas Counsel from ECF Distribution by Network Protection Sciences, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/9/2013) Modified on 9/9/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Owens, David) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 251 MOTION to Strike Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of John C. Jarosz ) filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Owens, David) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Owens, David) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 249 MOTION to Strike Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Angelos Keromytis ) filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Declaration, # 9 Declaration)(Owens, David) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 258 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING CENTANNI PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 256 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 257 Filed: 8/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER CONTINUING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 247 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 257 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER CONTINUING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 247 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jillian Centanni ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7814408.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/1/13 filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Centanni, Jillian) (Filed on 8/23/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 248 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Designated by Non-Party Megapath Corporation (Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC' (Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Katherine Mudge, Docket 248-1) filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Related document(s) 248 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/23/2013) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Fortinet, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John M. Neukom, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit 15, # 4 Exhibit 16, # 5 Exhibit 17, # 6 Exhibit 18)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of John C. Jarosz filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 9/5/2013. Replies due by 9/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike and Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Angelos Keromytis filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 9/5/2013. Replies due by 9/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Designated by Non-Party Megapath Corporation (Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Katherine Mudge in Support of Administrative Motion for a Sealing Order - Non-Party MegaPath Corporation's Documents (Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgement), # 2 Proposed Order Sealing MegaPath Corporation Confidential Documents (Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgement).)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Continuance of September 5, 2013 Hearing filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/21/2013) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 246 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [denying 207 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [238 filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Designated by Non-Party Megapath Corporation filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated by Fortinet filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 238 Opposition/Response to Motion,, 241 Exhibits,,, 239 Exhibits,, 240 Exhibits,,, Opposition to Fortinet, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 25 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Redacted_Ex. 26 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Redacted_ Ex. 27 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Redacted _ Ex. 28 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 5 Declaration Redacted _ Declaration of Angelos Karomytis, Ph. D, # 6 Exhibit Attachment A to Declaration of Angelos Karomytis, Ph.D, # 7 Exhibit Attachment B to Declaration of Angelos Karomytis, Ph. D., # 8 Exhibit Attachment C to the Declaration of Angelos Karomytis, Ph. D.)(Related document(s) 238 , 241 , 239 , 240 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 238 Opposition/Response to Motion,, 239 Exhibits,, 240 Exhibits,,, Opposition to Fortinet, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted _ Ex. 18 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 4, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 5, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 20 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 21 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 22 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 23 to Kopekin Declaration)(Related document(s) 238 , 239 , 240 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 238 Opposition/Response to Motion,, 239 Exhibits,, Opposition to Fortinet, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted _ Ex. 7 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Redacted_ Ex. 8 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Redacted _ Ex. 9 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Redacted _ Ex. 10 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Ex 11. to Kopeikin Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 14 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 15 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 16 to Kopeikin Declaration)(Related document(s) 238 , 239 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 238 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Opposition to Fortinet, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 4, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 5, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 6, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 7, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 8, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 9, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 10)(Related document(s) 238 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/15/2013) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Posted in Error, See Entry 245 RESPONSE (re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Opposition to Fortinet, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Redacted_ Ex. 1 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Kopeikin Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Kopeikin Declaration, Part 2)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/15/2013) Modified on 8/16/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Supplemental Brief re 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Related document(s) 207 ) (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2013) Modified on 8/6/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Supplemental Briefing (re 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct ) filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/6/2013) Modified on 8/6/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 232 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes in support of Fortinets Motion for Summary Judgment by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 5), # 2 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 5), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Part 3 of 5), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Part 4 of 5), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Part 5 of 5), # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 10 (Part 1 of 6), # 9 Exhibit 10 (Part 2 of 6), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Part 3 of 6), # 11 Exhibit 10 (Part 4 of 6), # 12 Exhibit 10 (Part 5 of 6), # 13 Exhibit 10 (Part 6 of 6), # 14 Exhibit 12)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/5/2013) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Brief in Support of 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Related document(s) 207 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/5/2013) Modified on 8/5/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Brief in Opposition to (re 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct ) filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 8/5/2013) Modified on 8/5/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 232 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 232 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes In Support of Fortinet, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 8/15/2013. Replies due by 8/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes In Support Of Fortinet's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), # 6 Exhibit 3 (Part 3), # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10 (Part 1), # 14 Exhibit 10 (Part 2), # 15 Exhibit 10 (Part 3), # 16 Exhibit 10 (Part 4), # 17 Exhibit 11, # 18 Exhibit 12, # 19 Exhibit 13, # 20 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/1/2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2013. (Related documents(s) 228 , 227 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fortinet, Inc. for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Network Protection Sciences, LLC for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Cukor, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/1/2013) re 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2013) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 225 Filed: 7/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JILLIAN CENTANNI by Hon. William Alsup denying 217 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 225 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JILLIAN CENTANNI by Hon. William Alsup denying 217 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement re 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit 36, # 2 Declaration Declaration of John M. Neukom)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 7/25/2013) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 223 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 221 Motion leave to file.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 223 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 221 Motion leave to file.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 221 MOTION Leave to File Supplemental Material ) filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Valerie M. Wagner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wagner, Valerie) (Filed on 7/19/2013) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Leave to File Supplemental Material filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Responses due by 7/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/15/2013) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of John M. Neukom, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 7/5/2013) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 218 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY CHAN re 216 Notice (Other) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 1, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 218 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY CHAN re 216 Notice (Other) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 1, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jillian Centanni ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7814408.) filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Centanni, Jillian) (Filed on 7/1/2013) Modified on 7/2/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/2/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Fortinet, Inc. of Withdrawal of Keala F. Chan as Attorney of Record for Fortinet, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Hannah Tranh in Support of 212 RESPONSE to MOTION to Dismiss filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Related document(s) 207 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 6/28/2013) Modified on 6/28/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Jill Kopeikin in Support re 212 RESPONSE to MOTION to Dismiss filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Defendant Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Defendant Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Defendant Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Defendant Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Defendant Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Related document(s) 207 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 6/28/2013) Modified on 6/28/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct Declaration of Rakesh Ramde In Support of Network Protection Sciences LLC's Opposition to Defendant Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Rakesh Ramde)(Related document(s) 207 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 207 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct ) Plaintiff Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Response to Defendant Fortinet Inc.'s Motion to Strike Select Portions of Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 211 Filed: 6/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW MACARTHUR by Judge Alsup denying 208 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 210 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 211 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW MACARTHUR by Judge Alsup denying 208 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 210 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Andrew P. MacArthur (Filing fee $ 305.) Filing fee previously paid on 06/18/2013 filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Andrew P. MacArthur, # 2 Declaration Michael Cukor, # 3 Declaration Jill F. Kopeikin, # 4 Proposed Order)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 6/20/2013) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 208 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew MacArthur ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7782804.) ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John M. Neukom)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew MacArthur ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7782804.) filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(MacArthur, Andrew) (Filed on 6/18/2013) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 207 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss for (i) Lack of Standing and (ii) Litigation Misconduct filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 6/27/2013. Replies due by 7/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of John M. Neukom, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 6/13/2013) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 206 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup granting 205 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 206 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup granting 205 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Administrative Motion for an Order Adopting Stipulation to Extend Certain Deadlines Relating to Expert Witnesses filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 6/5/2013) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement NOTICE OF NARROWING CLAIMS by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 5/31/2013) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by William Owen Cooper (Cooper, William) (Filed on 5/30/2013) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Jill Fawn Kopeikin (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fortinet, Inc. for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 5/13/2013) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/9/2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2013. (Related documents(s) 199 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 5/13/2013) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Network Protection Sciences, LLC for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 5/10/2013) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/9/2013) re 191 MOTION to Amend/Correct Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion is granted. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2013) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 191 Motion to Amend/Correct ;.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 191 MOTION to Amend/Correct Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions ) Fortinet, Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 4/25/2013) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 195 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY by Hon. William Alsup granting 192 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Alsop, # 2 Appendix Adkins, # 3 Appendix Lamb, # 4 Appendix Elguindi, # 5 Appendix Flint, # 6 Appendix Zachariassen, # 7 Appendix Mackintosh)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 195 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY by Hon. William Alsup granting 192 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Alsop, # 2 Appendix Adkins, # 3 Appendix Lamb, # 4 Appendix Elguindi, # 5 Appendix Flint, # 6 Appendix Zachariassen, # 7 Appendix Mackintosh)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2013: # 8 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corrected DECLARATION of Jill F. Kopeikin in Opposition to 191 MOTION to Amend/Correct Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 191 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 4/19/2013) Modified on 4/19/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 191 MOTION to Amend/Correct Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions ) filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 4/18/2013) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Unopposed Administrative Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin In Support of Unopposed Administrative Motion for the Issuance of Letters Rogatory, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Administrative Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, # 3 Proposed Order Letters Rogatory - John Alsop, # 4 Proposed Order Letters Rogatory - Rod Adkins, # 5 Proposed Order Letters Rogatory - Steven Lamb, # 6 Proposed Order Letters Rogatory - Omaya Elguindi, # 7 Proposed Order Letters Rogatory - Andrew Flint, # 8 Proposed Order Letters Rogatory - Glenn Mackintosh, # 9 Proposed Order Letters Rogatory - Rayan Zachariassen)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 4/10/2013) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct Fortinet, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 4/18/2013. Replies due by 4/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Declaration of John M. Neukom in support of Fortinet, Inc's Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Declaration Declaration of Stefani Shanberg in support of Fortinet, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 4/4/2013) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David Richard Owens (Owens, David) (Filed on 3/26/2013) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 189 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief re 185 Order Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Comments regarding the Court's Tentative Claim Construction Order filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Related document(s) 185 ) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief re 185 Order Fortinet, Inc.'s Comments Re: The Court's Tentative Claim Construction Order filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Related document(s) 185 ) (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on December 19, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2013. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/27/2012) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TENTATIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER, REQUEST FOR CRITIQUE AND ORDER STRIKING REPLY MATERIALS IN PART (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TENTATIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER, REQUEST FOR CRITIQUE AND ORDER STRIKING REPLY MATERIALS IN PART (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 12/19/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/19/2012). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2012) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on December 5, 2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2013. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/13/2012) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 175 MOTION to Strike 174 Claim Construction Statement, 173 Claim Construction Statement, ) Fortinet, Inc.'s Reply Brief In Support Of Its Motion To Strike Select Portions Of Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 12/7/2012) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 12/5/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/5/2012). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2012) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 175 MOTION to Strike 174 Claim Construction Statement, 173 Claim Construction Statement, ) Plaintiff Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Response to Defendant Fortinet Inc.'s Motion to Strike Select Portions of Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin in Support of Plaintiff Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Response to Defendant Fortinet Inc.'s Motion to Strike Select Portions of Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 12/5/2012) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Settlement Conference- case did not settle. Parties shall update the Court via confidential letters, to be faxed to chambers, after the claim construction order issued and motion for summary judgment filed. (Date Filed: 12/5/2012). (Court Reporter N/A.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2012: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (knm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Hon. William Alsup granting 176 Motion to Shorten Time.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 176 MOTION to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Fortinet's Motion to Strike ) PLAINTIFF NETWORK PROTECTION SCIENCES, LLCS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FORTINET, INC.S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-3 filed byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JILL F. KOPEIKIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NETWORK PROTECTION SCIENCES, LLCS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FORTINET, INC.S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-3, # 2 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF JILL F. KOPEIKIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF NETWORK PROTECTION SCIENCES, LLCS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT FORTINET, INC.S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-3)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 11/26/2012) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Shorten Time for a Hearing on Fortinet's Motion to Strike filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of John M. Neukom pursuant to Civil LR 6-3)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/21/2012) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike 174 Claim Construction Statement, 173 Claim Construction Statement, filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/5/2012. Replies due by 12/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of John M. Neukom, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/21/2012) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Brief in Support of Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill F. Kopeikin, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 11/16/2012) Modified on 11/20/2012 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jill Kopeikin posted separately as Entry 174CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Reply Brief In Support Of Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 11/15/2012) Modified on 11/16/2012 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/16/2012 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes in Support of 171 Claim Construction Statement Declaration of Andrew M. Holmes In Support of Fortinet, Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 171 ) (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 11/8/2012) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Fortinet, Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 11/8/2012) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Settlement Conference- case did not settle (Date Filed: 11/7/2012). Further Settlement Conference set for 12/5/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(Court Reporter N/A.) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2012) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Keala Chan (Chan, Keala) (Filed on 11/5/2012) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Opening Brief in Support of Network Protection Sciences, LLC's Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 10/24/2012) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 165 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 17, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 167 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 165 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 17, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement [Patent Local Rule 4-3] filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 10/8/2012) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/17/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Andrew Michael Holmes Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Fortinet, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 10/2/2012) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup granting 163 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 156 Order to Modify and Extend Certian Deadlines filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RESETTING THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/2/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 162 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RESETTING THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/2/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 160 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION, AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 8/3/2012) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-20-2012, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2012. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/24/2012) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Laporte: Settlement Conference set for 10/10/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Stefani Elise Shanberg (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 7/9/2012) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 156 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re Schedule for Claim Construction by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 7/2/2012) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 6/20/2012). Jury Selection set for 9/30/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2012) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 6/28/2013. Jury Trial set for 9/30/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 8/1/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/19/2012 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 12/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/20/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2012 11:45 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) REPORT; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 6/14/2012) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 150 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DISMISSING ALL DEFENDANTS EXCEPT FORTINET, INC. FOR MISJOINDER UNDER FRCP 21 re 145 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 13, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Order to Show Cause 145 Order regarding Misjoinder byNetwork Protection Sciences, LLC. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 6/13/2012) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re 145 Order to Show Cause Regarding Misjoinder by Fortinet, Inc.. (Brewer, Robin) (Filed on 6/13/2012) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING RASMUSSEN PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 144 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kenneth Brian Wilson (Wilson, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/8/2012) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 145 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING MISJOINDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brent Rasmussen ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6874461.) filed by Sonicwall, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Springer, Colby) (Filed on 6/6/2012) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/18/12 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific. The attached document contains instructions for connecting to the call for parties to the case. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 5/31/2012) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options /Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Springer, Colby) (Filed on 5/31/2012) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 5/31/2012) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 5/31/2012) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 5/30/2012) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Binney, David) (Filed on 5/30/2012) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 136 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 135 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 132 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 131 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney Michael Cukor leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611073459.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/27/12 filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Vincent E. McGeary leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611073459.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/27/12 filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committe on 4/17/12. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Margo Wagner for Plaintiff Network Protection Sciences, LLC (Wagner, Valerie) (Filed on 4/13/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Network Protection Sciences, LLC and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 4/13/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Fawn Kopeikin for Plaintiff Network Protection Sciences LLC (Kopeikin, Jill) (Filed on 4/13/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by David H. Binney (Binney, David) (Filed on 3/9/2012) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order: Discovery & Dispute Procedures, # 3 Standing Order for All Judges)(rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:10-cv-00224. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2012: # 2 Transmittal Notice) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Network Protection Sciences, LLC re Compuation of Damages (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Considering all of the private and public interest factors, Defendants have shown that the Northern District of California is clearly more convenient than the Eastern District of Texas. Four of the § 1404(a) factors weigh in favor of transfer, and the rest are neutral or do not apply. None of the factors weigh against transfer. As such, Defendants motion to transfer venue is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/23/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART and Prehearing Statement filed by Deep Nines, Inc., Fortinet, Inc., Juniper Networks, Inc., Network Protection Sciences, LLC, SonicWALL, Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Claim Chart)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Fortinet, Inc., Juniper Networks, Inc., SonicWALL, Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. (Hanson, Eric) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SonicWALL, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Thoma Bravo Fund IX, L.P. for SonicWALL, Inc.. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Network Protection Sciences, LLC re P.R. 4-2 (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline to Comply with P.R. 4-1(b) and extends the deadline for the parties to meet and confer to discuss list of P.R. 4-1(a) disclosures up to and including December 2, 2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/21/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 4-1(b) by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 11/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Juniper Networks, Inc. re: P.R. 4-1 (Hanson, Eric) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Network Protection Sciences, LLC re P.R. 4-1 (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28011. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Network Protection Sciences, LLC re 89 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed)Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed) OF WITHDRAW OF DISPUTED LANGUAGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MISC. 11-1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/11. (bga, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. of Compliance (Warriner, James) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by SonicWALL, Inc. has Complied with Dates for Document Production and Exchange of Privilege Logs (Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Fortinet, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Privilege Log (Brewer, Robin) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Juniper Networks, Inc. - Notice of Compliance (Hanson, Eric) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Network Protection Sciences, LLC re Privilege Log (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 101 Motion to Seal Response to the Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/20/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE by Network Protection Sciences, LLC to 98 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rambin, # 2 Exhibit 1 Jackson Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 2 Rambin to Gardner Correspondence, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Response to the Notice of Supplemental Authority by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline to Exchange Privilege Logs and extends the deadline for the parties to exchange privilege logs up to and including September 30, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/14/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Exchange of Privilege Logs by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Fortinet, Inc., Juniper Networks, Inc., SonicWALL, Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. re 54 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Jackson, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph Vernon, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Dft Sonic Wall Inc deadline to produce documents is 9/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/31/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Document Production) by SonicWALL, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney W Brent Rasmussen for SonicWALL, Inc.,W Brent Rasmussen for SonicWALL, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID TXE 1-1835) (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The defendants shall disclose the identity of the prior art references and provide copies of otherwise unavailable prior art on June 24, 2011. The deadline for the defendants to disclose their invalidity contentions is extended to June 30, 2011. No other deadlines are affected by this order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/28/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Extension of Certain P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Deadlines by Fortinet, Inc., Juniper Networks, Inc., SonicWALL, Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Network Protection Sciences, LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel (Longstaff, Carrie) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 89 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed)Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed) filed by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hanson, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 89 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed)Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hanson, Eric) Modified on 5/20/2011 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed) by Deep Nines, Inc., Fortinet, Inc., Juniper Networks, Inc., Network Protection Sciences, LLC, SonicWALL, Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Redlined Proposed Protective Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2011: # 2 Plaintiff Proposed protective order, # 3 Defendant proposed protective order) (sm, ). (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Deep Nines Inc. to Disclose the Addresses of Greg Jackson, Sue Dark and Shawn Eldridge by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cukor, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Affidavit DeRieux, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robin Lynn Brewer for Fortinet, Inc.,Robin Lynn Brewer for Fortinet, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-477) (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric B Hanson for Juniper Networks, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-461. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Juniper Networks, Inc. of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by SonicWALL, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Price, Adam) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Network Protection Sciences, LLC re Initial Disclosures (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Network Protection Sciences, LLC re P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Fortinet, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. Notice of compliance regarding initial disclosures (Warriner, James) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Network Protection Sciences, LLC (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rambin, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Formation, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Press Release, # 4 Exhibit 3 - CEO Bio, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Gadde Profile)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 74 Reply to Response to Motion,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Signed Declaration of V. Gadde)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/11/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document (Declaration of Eric Hanson is contained in main document) : 74 Reply to Response to Motion,,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 3/11/2011 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit S. Chapman (SonicWALL), # 2 Affidavit G. Jackson (Deep Nines), # 3 Affidavit T. Nelson (Fortinet), # 4 Affidavit E. Aarrestad (WatchGuard), # 5 Affidavit R. Barber (WatchGuard), # 6 Affidavit S. Wang (WatchGuard), # 7 Affidavit R. Smith (WatchGuard), # 8 Affidavit V. Gadde (Juniper), # 9 Exhibit A, # 10 Exhibit B)(Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 3/11/2011 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Discovery Order by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Discovery Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Joinder of Parties due by 10/14/2011., Claim Construction Hearing set for 6/13/2012 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2012 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/2011. (ch, ) Modified on 3/10/2011 (ch, ). (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dixon, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2011: # 2 REVISED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER) (sm, ). (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on March 3, 2011. (jml) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders by WatchGuard Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File to File Their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer. Defendants' deadline to respond is due 3/10/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/23/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (All Defendants) by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. (Warriner, James) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 5-1, # 34 Affidavit Cuke, # 35 Affidavit Rambin, # 36 Affidavit Ramde and Exhibits A-C, # 37 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Deep Nines, Inc. re 54 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Notice of Joinder (Goldfarb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by SonicWALL, Inc. re 54 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Joinder in Motion to Change Venue (Price, Adam) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Earl Glenn Thames, Jr terminated as counsel for Dft Deep Nines Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/31/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION for Joinder Defendant Deep Nines, Inc.'s Joinder in Defendant Juniper Networks, Inc.'s Motion to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Deep Nines, Inc.. (Goldfarb, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/31/2011 (sm, ). (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 54 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Responses due by 2/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/28/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Deep Nines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 54 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on March 2, 2011.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. re 54 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Joinder in Motion to Change Venue (Warriner, James) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Fortinet, Inc. re 54 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Joinder in Motion to Transfer Venue (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/28/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Douglas J. Dixon, # 3 Exhibits to the Declaration of Douglas J. Dixon, # 4 Declaration of Greg Jackson, # 5 Declaration of Todd Nelson, # 6 Declaration of Vijaya Gadde, # 7 Declaration of Laurel Buckner, # 8 Declaration of Stephen Zirschky)(Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alice Catherine Garber terminated as counsel for Dft Fortinet Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/12/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alice C. Garber by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garber, Alice) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sanford E Warren, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/4/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James George Warriner on behalf of WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. (Warriner, James) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Deep Nines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warren, Sanford) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas James Dixon for Juniper Networks, Inc.,Douglas James Dixon for Juniper Networks, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-195) (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 37 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Network Protection Sciences, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 31 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Network Protection Sciences, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 30 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Network Protection Sciences, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Network Protection Sciences, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michele Kim Connors on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Connors, Michele) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Cukor on behalf of Network Protection Sciences, LLC (Cukor, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Deep Nines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Deep Nines, Inc.. (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carrie A Longstaff on behalf of Network Protection Sciences, LLC (Longstaff, Carrie) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fortinet, Inc. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Deep Nines, Inc..(Thames, Earl) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM to the Original Complaint against Network Protection Sciences, LLC by Fortinet, Inc..(Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Network Protection Sciences, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam G Price (Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the counterclaims of Defendants Juniper Networks, Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. and SonicWALL, Inc.. Responses due by 10/18/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Counterclaims of Juniper Networks, Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. and SonicWALL, Inc. by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SonicWALL, Inc. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM to the original Complaint against Network Protection Sciences, LLC by WatchGuard Technologies, Inc..(Binney, David) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM to the Original Complaint against Network Protection Sciences, LLC by SonicWALL, Inc..(Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Fortinet Inc deadline is extended to 10/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Juniper Networks, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Juniper Network, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Network Protection Sciences, LLC by Juniper Networks, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stefani E Shanberg on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Deep Nines Inc deadline is extended to 10/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/7/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Deep Nines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. served on 7/23/2010 (ch, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Craig McPhie for Juniper Networks, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5569. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David H Binney for WatchGuard Technologies, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5566) (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David T McDonald for WatchGuard Technologies, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5566) (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kenneth B Wilson for SonicWALL, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5565) (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Colby Brian Springer for SonicWALL, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5565) (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. SonicWALL, Inc. served on 7/19/2010 on Fred Gonzalez designated to accept svc of process, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SonicWALL, Inc.( Price, Adam) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re WatchGuard Technologies, Inc..( Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roderick B Williams on behalf of WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. (Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fortinet, Inc..( Garber, Alice) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Deep Nines, Inc.( Warren, Sanford) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Deep Nines, Inc. personally served on 7/15/2010 Sue Dark designated to accept service of process, answer due 8/5/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Fortinet, Inc. personally served on 7/16/2010 through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, Sue Vertrees, answer due 8/6/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Juniper Networks, Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Juniper Networks, Inc. personally served Scott LaScale, operations manager c/o The Corporation Trust Co, Registered Agent on 7/16/2010, answer due 8/6/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Deep Nines, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Fortinet Inc, # 2 Juniper Networks Inc, # 3 SonicWALL Inc, # 4 WatchGuard Technologies Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 156 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/6/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DISMISSING ALL DEFENDANTS EXCEPT FORTINET, INC. FOR MISJOINDER UNDER FRCP 21 re 145 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 13, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 145 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING MISJOINDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Unifi Scientific Advances, Inc. for Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 136 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 135 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Deep Nines, Inc., Fortinet, Inc., Juniper Networks, Inc., SonicWALL, Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2561239.), filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 193 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?