Ahmed v. Magan
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00342-GCS-MRA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2017 at 5:42 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abukar Hassan Ahmed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colleen M Coyle +1 202 887 4000 ccoyle@akingump.com
Space Jonathan Goodrich +1 202 887 4162 +1 202 887 4288 jgoodrich@akingump.com
Space Mark Joseph MacDougall +1 202 887 4510 +1 202 887 4288 mmacdougall@akingump.com
Space Kristine L. Sendek-Smith +1 202 887 4078 +1 202 887 4288 ksendeksmith@akingump.com
Space Tiffany Therese Smith +1 202 887 4594 +1 202 887 4288 ttsmith@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nushin Sarkarati +1 415 544 0444 +1 415 544 0456 nsarkarati@cja.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Justice & Accountability

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea C Evans +1 415 544 0444 +1 415 544 0456 aevans@cja.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark D. Beckett +1 212 408 5226 +1 212 541 6369 mbeckett@chadbourne.com
Space Christina Hioureas +1 212 408 1149 +1 646 710 1149 chioureas@chadbourne.com
Space Rachel W Thorn rthorn@chadbourne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kegler Brown Hill & Ritter Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Ray Cookson +1 614 462 5400 +1 614 464 2634 kcookson@keglerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P Bress +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 rick.bress@lw.com
Space Katya S Georgieva +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 katya.georgieva@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Center for Justice & Accountability

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Elisa Fain +1 415 544 0444 +1 415 544 0456 nfain@cja.org
Space L Kathleen Roberts +1 415 544 0444 +1 415 544 0456 kroberts@cja.org
v.
No Logo Abdi Aden Magan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Abdi Aden Magan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abdi Aden Magan

Toggle Switch Represented by Donnellon & Ezanidis LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Donnellon +1 614 886 3776 jrd@columbuslegalhelp.com
Space Peter C Ezanidis +1 614 223 1730 +1 614 223 1729 pce@columbuslegalhelp.com
United States of America United States of America, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by U. S. Attorney Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J Stark +1 614 469 5715 john.stark@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Joseph Beane +1 202 616 2035 +1 202 616 8470 eric.beane@usdoj.gov
Space Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (118) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
    CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Abukar Hassan Ahmed against Abdi Aden Magan. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 10/3/13. (lvw1) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 10-2-13. (ga) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Plf be awarded $5,000,000.00 in compensatory damages and $10,000,000.00 in punitive damages; Objections to R&R due by 9/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 8/20/13. (sh1) Modified the award amounts on 8/21/2013 (er1). (Entered: 08/20/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed of Intent to Request Redaction (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            Transcript of Damages Hearing held on 5/30/13, before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gina Wells, Telephone number 614-719-3225. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 8/5/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2013. (jr1) (jr1). (Entered: 07/15/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
              Mail Returned as insufficient address order 106 mailed to Adbi Aden Magan. (rew) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                TRIAL BRIEF - Plaintiff's Brief Regarding the Impact of Kiobel v. Royal Dutch Petroleum on this Case by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: status conf held on 5/9/13; Clerk to mail and e-mail (aamagan@hotmail.com) to Dft's Abdi A Magan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/9/13. (sh1) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 105 Motion for Hearing; Dft to call the Magistrate Chambers by 5/9/13 @ 2:30 PM. Clerk to email and mail this Order to defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/6/13. (sh1) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Hearing - Request for a Status Hearing by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 101 Motion for Hearing; Hrg set for May 30-31, 2013 before Mag Judge Abel in room 228. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/28/13. (sh1) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Abel. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 1-15-13. (ga) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Ray Cookson (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Hearing on Damages by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 11/20/12. (lvw1) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 98 Motion for InCamera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 8/17/12. (sh1) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for InCamera Review and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to File Medical Records and Expert Reports by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. Responses due by 9/4/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Hioureas Decl Part 1, # 2 Hioureas Decl Part 2, # 3 Hioureas Decl Part 3, # 4 Hioureas Decl Part 4, # 5 Hioureas Decl Part 5, # 6 Hioureas Decl Part 6, # 7 Hioureas Decl Part 7, # 8 Hioureas Decl Part 8, # 9 Ahmed Supp Decl, # 10 Jimale Decl, # 11 Shabel Decl, # 12 Omar Decl, # 13 Warsame Decl, # 14 Williams Decl, # 15 Cassanelli Part 1, # 16 Cassanelli Part 2, # 17 Cassanelli Part 3, # 18 Cassanelli Part 4, # 19 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 90 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order via e-mail & express mail upon Defendant Abdi Aden Magan w/in three (3) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 8/6/2012. (kk2) Modified on 8/6/2012 to fix typo in deft's name (kk2) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 94 Motion for Extension of Time to 8/10/12 to file case dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/25/12. (sh1) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/10/2012. to File Case-Dispositive Motions and Memorandum of Law in Support by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 93 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 86 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/9/12. (sh1) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed of Failure of Defendant Abdi Aden Magan to Maintain Address for Regular Mail Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 87 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of L Kathleen Roberts; granting 88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nushin Sarkarati. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/26/12. (sh1) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                                    MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Magan and Memorandum of Law in Support by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christina Hioureas, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 7, Part 2, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (sr) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nushin Sarkarati (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number COL022810) filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (sr) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of L. Kathleen Roberts (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number COL022811) filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (sr) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                            MOTION to Compel Defendant to Acknowledge the Protective Order and to Provide Instructions for Production in Compliance Therewith and Memorandum of Law in Support by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christina Georgia Hioureas, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER. Defendant is ordered to comply with 84 Order on Motion to Compel by 6/8/2012. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant via email and express mail upon Abdi Aden Magan within three (3) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/24/2012. (pes1) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 82 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/21/12. (sh1) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 80 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/27/12. (sh1) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                    MOTION to Compel Production of All Relevant Documents and Memorandum of Law in Support by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christina Georgia Hioureas, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 79 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/29/2012. (Abel, Mark) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum of Law in Support of a Protective Order by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christina Georgia Hioureas, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                          MOTION to Compel and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant to Confirm His Attendance at His Deposition and to Indicate Whether He Will Represent Himself or Engage in Counsel by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christina Georgia Hioureas, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Natasha E. Fain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/23/12. (sh1) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Leave for Natasha Elisa Fain to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number COL021554) filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (sr) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is no longer stayed. The following scheduling order is hereby adopted, Discovery due by 6/29/2012; Case Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2012. Clerk of Courts to serve this Order on Dft Adbi via mail and e-mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/16/12. (sh1) Modified text on 2/17/2012 (er1). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Defendant Magan's motion for extension of time and a notice of intent to represent himself is DENIED (doc. 74 ).Any motion for an extension/to stay proceedings must be filed w/in 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/23/12. (sh1) Modified on 1/25/2012 to add text to entry. (pes1). (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time and Notice of Intent to Represent Self filed by Defendant Abdi Aden Magan. (sr) Modified text to correct filer on 1/23/2012 (sr1). (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Dft to retain new counsel w/in 28 days from the date of this order or state that Dft will represent himself. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/19/11. (sh1) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Cookson, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Stay by Defendant Abdi Aden Magan. (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw by Defendant Abdi Aden Magan. (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by Abdi Aden Magan. (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel to submit a proposed sched order by 12/10/11; Plf tp make a settle proposal by 12/31/11; Dft's to respond w/in 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/14/11. (sh1) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER denying 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 11-7-11. (ga) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE by Interested Party United States of America of Substitution of Counsel (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave for Mark D. Beckett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 06/02/2011. (sr) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 59 Motion for Leave for Richard P. Bress to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 06/02/2011. (sr) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave for Rachel W. Thorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 06/02/2011. (sr) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 58 Motion for Leave for Christina G. Hioureas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 06/02/2011. (sr) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 57 Motion for Leave for Katya S. Georgieva to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 06/02/2011. (sr) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark D. Beckett (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number COL017586) filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2011: # 2 Motion For PHV) (sr). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard P. Bress (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number COL017587) filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2011: # 2 Motion For PHV) (sr). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christina G. Hioureas (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number COL017588) filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sr) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katya S. Georgieva (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number COL017589) filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (sr) (Additional attachment added on # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sr). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel W. Thorn (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number COL017590) filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sr) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed Notice of Withdrawal (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed Notice of Substitution of New Trial Attorney for Plaintiff (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 52 Motion to Withdraw as counsel. Movants are free to so move again once Plaintiff has retained or identified substitute counsel or if other circumstances warrant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 05/27/2011. (sr) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Response re 47 Response (non motion) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Response to the Statement of Interest of the United States by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 46 Motion to Stay. Parties are directed to call Magistrate Judge Abel's chambers within seven (7) days of the date of entry of an order ruling upon the pending motion to dismiss, to set a date for a telephone conference at which a new case schedule will be established. Plaintiff shall have until 4/29/2011 to file a memo contra 47 Defendant's response to the statement of interest. Defendant shall have until 5/13/2011 to file a reply in support of his response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/22/2011. (er1) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. Amendment to 48 Stipulation Corrected Joint Stipulation for Schedule to File Plaintiff Ahmed's Response to Defendant Magan's Response to the USA's Statement of Interest. (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Schedule to File Plaintiff Ahmed's Response to Defendant Magan's Response to the USA's Statement of Interest by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Response to Statement of Interest of USA by Defendant Abdi Aden Magan. (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Interested Party United States of America Statement of Interest of the United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Beane, Eric) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER CANCELLING SETTLEMENT WEEK - Counsel will make a status report by 4/22/11 regarding June 2011 mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/23/11. (jcw1) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John J Stark for Interested Party United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit App. for Admission/Cert. of Good Standing) (Stark, John) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER deferring ruling on 18 Motion to Dismiss; denying 26 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 2-10-11. (ga) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Week Mediation Conference set for 3/16/2011 @ 1:30 PM before Al McKenna mediator. (sh1) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 27 Uncontested Motion to Substitute the Amended Declaration of Abukar Hassan Ahmed for Original Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/7/2011. (er1) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave for Jonathan Goodrich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 02/07/2011. (sr) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT WEEK MEDIATION: Counsel are DIRECTED to call Magistrate Judge Abel on or before 4/22/2011 to schedule a conference to discuss the depositions taken, the depositions remaining and whether the parties will be in a position to discuss settlement in June. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/27/2011. (er1) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Interested Party United States of America re 29 Order Notice of Potential Participation (Stark, John) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on the Parties' Interest in Settlement Negotiations by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Goodrich by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 200COL015743) (er1) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed Notice of Withdrawal re C. Coyle (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Expert disclosures due by 3/30/2011; Responsive expert disclosures due by 5/2/2011; supplemental discovery responses due by 5/5/2011; discovery cut off on 6/20/2011 & case dispositive motions due by 7/21/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/10/2011. (kjm1) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Stipulated Revised Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/15/2010. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Expert Reports filed by Defendant Abdi Aden Magan. (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/15/2010. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Expert Reports by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support of) (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 12-6-10. (ga) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Defendant Abdi Aden Magan of service of discovery (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Uncontested Motion to Substitute the Amended Declaration of Abukar Hassan Ahmed for Original Declaration Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re 25 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Tiffany) Modified text on 7/26/2010 (er1). (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Strike THE AFFIDAVITS OF ALESSANDRO CAMPO, MAHMOUD HAJI NUR AND MOHAMED ABDIRIZAK by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 6/25/2010. Primary Expert due by 12/10/2010. Rebuttal Expert due by 1/11/2011. Discovery due by 3/1/2011. Dispositive motions due by 4/1/2010. Settlement Week in 3/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/25/10. (rew) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 21 , 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Colleen M. Coyle and Andrea C Evans on behalf of Plaintiff Ahmed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/24/10. (rew) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrea C. Evans (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-2672982) by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Colleen M. Coyle (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-2672981) by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. Amendment to 19 Rule 26(f) Report Amended Rule 26(f) Report. (Sendek-Smith, Kristine) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Sendek-Smith, Kristine) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Abdi Aden Magan. Responses due by 7/6/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Magan, # 2 Affidavit of Campo, # 3 Affidavit of Campo Second, # 4 Affidavit of Nur, # 5 Affidavit of Abdirizak) (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Abdi Aden Magan answer due 6/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/04/10. (rew) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 6/11/2010. by Defendant Abdi Aden Magan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. The preliminary pretrial conference previously scheduled in this case for June 17, 2010 is CONTINUED until June 24, 2010 at 10:00 AM. The parties to confer and to Rule 26 (f) report are extended until June 8, 2010 and June 17, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/02/10. (rew) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/24/2010. Plaintiff's Motion to Postpone Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2010 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel. Conf of the parties due 6/3/10; Rule 26f report of the parties due 6/10/10. (sh1) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by 6/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/14/2010. (er1) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Ezanidis for Defendant Abdi Aden Magan (Ezanidis, Peter) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 6/4/2010. by Defendant Abdi Aden Magan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Donnellon for Defendant Abdi Aden Magan (Donnellon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Abdi Aden Magan. Abdi Aden Magan served on 4/23/2010, answer due 5/14/2010. (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marj J MacDougall and granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristine Sendek-Smith on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/05/10. (rew) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristine Sendek-Smith for Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 12300) (rew) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark J MacDougall for Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 12300) (rew) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/5/2010) (rew). Modified on 5/5/2010 (rew). (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Mark J. MacDougall, Natasha E. Fain, Kristine L. Sendek-Smith and Andrea C. Evans. (pes1) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 86 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/9/12. (sh1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Abdi Aden Magan. (rew) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 82 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/21/12. (sh1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Plaintiff Abukar Hassan Ahmed re 1 Complaint Notice of Summons to be Issued by Clerk's Office (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 79 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/29/2012. (Abel, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Abdi Aden Magan ( Filing fee $ 350 paid - receipt number: 0648-2587810), filed by Abukar Hassan Ahmed. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Tiffany) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?