Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff, Plaintiff
Walker Truesdell Roth & Associates, Plaintiff Officially listed as "Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust"
Access Management Luxembourg SA , Defendant Officially listed as "Access Management Luxembourg SA (f/k/a Access International Advisors Luxembourg) SA) as represented by its Liquidator Maitre Ferdinand Entringer"
Claudine Magon de la Villehuchet , Defendant Officially listed as "Claudine Magon de la Villehuchet (a/k/a Claudine de la Villehuchet) individually as the sole beneficiary under the Will of Thierry Magon de la Villehuchet (a/k/a Rene Thierry de la Villehuchet)"
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein)"
Post-Confirmation Report. Fifteenth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through June 30, 2018 Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren)
Post-Confirmation Report. Fourteenth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through December 31, 2017 Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
Post-Confirmation Report. Thirteenth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through September 30, 2017 Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
Post-Confirmation Report. Twelfth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through June 30, 2017 Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
Post-Confirmation Report. Eleventh Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through March 31, 2017 Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
Post-Confirmation Report. Tenth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through December 31, 2016 Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
Post-Confirmation Report. Ninth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, As Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through September 30, 2016 Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 2220)) . Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 2219)) . Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Eton Park CLO Management 2 (Claim No. 263) To Eton Park Master Fund, Ltd. filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of Eton Park Funds. (Glueckstein, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Eton Park CLO Management 1 (Claim No. 262) To Eton Park Fund, L.P. filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of Eton Park Funds. (Glueckstein, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
Order of U.S. District Court Judge Laura Taylor Swain signed on 7/15/2016 re: 2202. For the foregoing reasons, the bankruptcy court's Memorandum Decision and corresponding Order Granting Plan Administrator's Objection and Reclassifying Proofs of Claim Nos. 171, 172 and 173 is affirmed in all respects. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to enter judgment affirming the Bankruptcy Courts January 15, 2016, Order and to close this appeal. (tro) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
Post-Confirmation Report. Eighth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through June 30, 2016 Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
Notice of Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Motion of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, for the Entry of an Order Directing the Immediate Payment of its Allowed Superpriority Administrative Claim (related document(s)2208, 2064) filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
Post-Confirmation Report. Seventh Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through March 31, 2016 Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
Notice of Transmittal of Record of Appeal. All documents have been filed with the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically under Civil Case Number 16-cv-00575 assigned to the Honorable Laura Taylor Swain. Check the District Court Docket Sheet for the Briefing Schedule. (related document(s)2202) (Lopez, Mary). (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Motion of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, for the Entry of an Order Directing the Immediate Payment of its Allowed Superpriority Administrative Claim (related document(s)2064) filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. with hearing to be held on 5/19/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 5/12/2016, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Counter Designation (appellee) (related document(s)2205) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Statement of Issues on Appeal (related document(s)2201) filed by Howard M. File on behalf of Robin Bartosh, Toby Bartosh, Cosmetics Plus Group Ltd.. (File, Howard) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
Designation of Contents (appellant). of Record on Appeal (related document(s)2201) filed by Howard M. File on behalf of Robin Bartosh, Toby Bartosh, Cosmetics Plus Group Ltd.. (File, Howard) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1600575 Judge Laura Taylor Swain (related document(s)2202) filed by Clerk's Office, U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
Order Signed On 1/26/2016 Re: Granting Plan Administrators Objection And Reclassifying Proof Of Claim Nos. 171, 172 And 173 (Related Doc # 2096) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
Entered in Error. See Doc.# 2202. Election to Appeal to US District Court filed by Howard M. File on behalf of Robin Bartosh, Toby Bartosh, Cosmetics Plus Group Ltd.. (File, Howard) Modified on 2/10/2016 (Rouzeau, Anatin). (Entered: 01/25/2016)
Post-Confirmation Report. Sixth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator Concerning Activity Through December 31, 2015 Filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/15/2016. Re: (I) Allowing Claim No. 172 Filed By Cosmetics Plus Group Ltd., As A Class 4 General Unsecured Claim In The Amount Of $350,000 And (II) Disallowing And Expunging Claim Nos. 171 And 173 Filed By Robin Bartosh And Toby Bartosh (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Order Signed On 1/15/2016. Re: Granting Plan Administrators Objection And Reclassifying Proof Of Claim Nos. 171, 172 And 173 (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Notice of Settlement of an Order (related document(s)2193, 2192) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. Objections due by 1/14/2016, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
ERRATA ORDER Signed On 1/4/2016. Re: Memorandum Decision Granting Plan Administrators Objection And Reclassifying Proofs Of Claim Nos. 171, 172, And 173 (related document(s)2192) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
Written Opinion Signed On 1/4/2016. Re: Memorandum Decision Granting Plan Administrators Objection And Reclassifying Proofs Of Claim Nos. 171, 172, And 173 (related document(s)2154, 2096) (Greene, Chantel)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 2189)) . Notice Date 12/17/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Of Motion Of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association For The Entry Of An Order Directing The Immediate Payment Of Its Allowed Superpriority Administrative Claim (related document(s)2064) filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. with hearing to be held on 3/10/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/3/2016, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Fawer, Mark S. To Liquidity Solutions Inc . To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions Inc.(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
Post-Confirmation Report. Fifth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Acticity Through September 30, 2015 Filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 2183)) . Notice Date 10/21/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
Letter / Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Paul Traub, PLLC (Claim No. 356) To Argo Partners filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners. (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Motion of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, for the Entry of an Order Directing the Immediate Payment of its Allowed Superpriority Administrative Claim (related document(s)2064) filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. with hearing to be held on 1/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 12/31/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Service)(Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/2/2015. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 83 Filed By Gertrude Rothschild (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 7/22/2015 2:04PM RE: Evidentiary Hearing - Objection o the Plan Administrator to Proof of Claim Nos. 171, 172, and 173. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/9/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/18/2015. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/11/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/9/2015. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
Memorandum of Law Post-Hearing Reply filed by Howard M. File on behalf of Robin Bartosh, Toby Bartosh, Cosmetics Plus Group Ltd.. (File, Howard) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
Declaration of Brendan M. Scott in Response to Post-Hearing Memorandum of Claimants Robin Bartosh, Toby Bartosh and the Cosmetics Plus Group Ltd. and in Further Support of the Plan Administrator's Objection to Proof of Claim Nos.171, 172, and 173 (related document(s)2173, 2096, 2113) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
Memorandum of Law in Response to Post-Hearing Memorandum of Claimants Robin Bartosh, Toby Bartosh and the Cosmetics Plus Group Ltd. and in Further Support of Plan Administrators Objection to Proof of Claim Nos. 171, 172, and 173 (related document(s)2096) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan in Support of of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 83 Filed by Gertrude Rothschild (related document(s)2170) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 83 Filed by Gertrude Rothschild filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 9/14/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 9/7/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulation and Order)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
Post-Confirmation Report. Fourth Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through June 30, 2015 Filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Motion of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, for the Entry of an Order Directing the Immediate Payment of its Allowed Superpriority Administrative Claim (related document(s)2064) filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/20/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
Letter to Hon. Judge Stuart Bernstein Filed by Howard M. File on behalf of Cosmetics Plus Group Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(File, Howard) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 7/20/2015. Re: Reducing And Allowing Claim No. 603 Filed By Los Angeles County Treasurer And Tax Collector (related document(s)2158) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Balanced Strategies Fund Ltd. filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners. (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 7/7/2015. Re: Settling Potential Claims By Plan Administrator For The Post-Confirmation Chapter 11 Estate Of Dreier LLP Against Patricia Rosito Vago (related document(s)2155) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed on 6/29/2015. Re: Settling And Resolving (I) Dreier LLPs Entitlement To The Fee Award Arising From The Ticketmaster Settlement And (II) Claims Filed Against The Dreier LLP Estate Relating To The Ticketmaster Litigation (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 6/29/2015. Re: Settling And Resolving Dreier LLPs Entitlement To The Fee Award Arising From The Howard Brett Berger, Et Al. Settlement (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 603 Filed by Los Angeles County Treasurer and Tax Collector filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 7/20/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 7/13/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Declaration in Support)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Settling Potential Claims by Plan Administrator for the Post-Confirmation Chapter 11 Estate of Dreier LLP Against Patricia Rosito Vago; Stipulation and Order Settling Potential Claims by Plan Administrator for the Post-Confirmation Chapter 11 Estate of Dreier LLP Against Patricia Rosito Vago; and Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan, Plan Administrator for Dreier LLP, in Support of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Settling Potential Claims by Plan Administrator for the Post-Confirmation Chapter 11 Estate of Dreier LLP Against Patricia Rosito Vago (related document(s)2155, 2156) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan, Plan Administrator for Dreier LLP, in Support of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Settling Potential Claims by Plan Administrator for the Post-Confirmation Chapter 11 Estate of Dreier LLP Against Patricia Rosito Vago (related document(s)2155) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 7/6/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 7/6/2015, (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Settling Potential Claims by Plan Administrator for the Post-Confirmation Chapter 11 Estate of Dreier LLP Against Patricia Rosito Vago filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 7/6/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 7/6/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order Settling Potential Claims by Plan Administrator for the Post-Confirmation Chapter 11 Estate of Dreier LLP Against Patricia Rosito Vago)(Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Of Motion Of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association For The Entry Of An Order Directing The Immediate Payment Of Its Allowed Superpriority Administrative Claim (related document(s)2064) filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. with hearing to be held on 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 9/10/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Recovery Ltd. filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners. (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Enterprise Fund filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners. (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Concordia MAC29 Ltd. filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners. (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor of Mark S. Fawer (Claim No. 381) filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions Inc. (Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
Exhibit B of Notice of Presentment of Modified Stipulation and Order Settling and Resolving Dreier LLP's Entitlement to the Fee Award Arising from the Howard Brett Berger, et al. Settlement (FILED UNDER SEAL) (related document(s)2141, 1337) (Rouzeau, Anatin). Modified on 12/18/2017 (Wilson, Timothy). (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Notice of Agenda for Hearing on June 4, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. (related document(s)2090, 2088, 2094, 2092) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Reply to Motion (related document(s)2092) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Declaration # 2 Exhibit A to Reply Declaration # 3 Exhibit B to Reply Declaration) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Amended Claim No. 590 (related document(s)2094) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Settling and Resolving (I) Dreier LLP's Entitlement to the Fee Award Arising from the Ticketmaster Settlement and (II) Claims Filed Against the Dreier LLP Estate Relating to the Ticketmaster Litigation filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 6/26/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 6/23/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order # 2 Exhibit A to Stipulation # 3 Exhibit B to Stipulation # 4 Exhibit C to Stipulation # 5 Gowan Declaration)(Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Modified Stipulation and Order Settling and Resolving Dreier LLP's Entitlement to the Fee Award Arising from the Howard Brett Berger, et al. Settlement filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 6/26/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 6/23/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Modified Stipulation and Order # 2 Gowan Delcaration # 3 Exhibit A to Gowan Declaration # 4 Exhibit B to Gowan Declaration # 5 Exhibit C to Gowan Declaration)(Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying, Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 568 Filed by Landmark Square 1-6, LLC filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 6/12/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 6/7/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulation and Order)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
Post-Confirmation Report. Third Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through March 31, 2015 Filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s)2090, 2088, 2094, 2092) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 6/4/2015 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
Certificate of Service (related document(s)2133) Filed by Abigail Snow on behalf of Los Angeles County Treasurer & Tax Collector. (Snow, Abigail) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
Response to Motion / Claim Objection (related document(s)2092) filed by Abigail Snow on behalf of Los Angeles County Treasurer & Tax Collector. with hearing to be held on 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F) (Snow, Abigail) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Barry S. Glaser filed by Abigail Snow on behalf of Los Angeles County Treasurer & Tax Collector. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snow, Abigail) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
So Ordered Memorandum Endorsed Order Signed On 4/16/2015. Re: The Court Declines To Approve This Settlement Because The Administrators Submission Fails To Demonstrate That It Is Reasonable. In Particular, It Fails To Disclose The Amount Of Attorneys Fees Provided For In The Settlement And Why The Amount That The Administrator Is Willing To Accept In Satisfaction Of Her Quantum Meruit Claim Is Appropriate. (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
Declaration Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan in Support of Stipulation and Order Settling and Resolving Dreier LLP's Entitlement to the Fee Award Arising from the Howard Brett Berger, et al. Settlement (related document(s)2108) filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Motion of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association for the Entry of an Order Directing the Immediate Payment of Its Allowed Superpriority Claim (related document 2105) (related document(s)2064) filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
Notice of Withdrawal of the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 411 Filed By Canon Financial Services, Inc. (related document(s)2080) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
(This document should have been filed in case no. 12-1198) Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Stephen Z. Starr on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Starr, Stephen) Modified on 4/8/2015 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/26/2015 10:18AM RE: Objection of Plan Administrator to Claim No. 26; Objection of Plan Administrator to Claim No. 56..et al... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/25/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/3/2015. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 4/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/27/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/25/2015. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
Pretrial Scheduling Order Signed On 3/27/2015. Re: Evidentiary Hearing with hearing to be held on 6/17/2015 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
Order Signed On 3/26/2015 Re: Granting The Plan Administrators Objection To Proof Of Claim No. 503 Filed By Samuel Pryor (Related Doc # 2086) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
Order Signed On 3/26/2015 Re: Granting The Plan Administrators Objection To Proof Of Claim No. 474 Filed By Tammy J. Bruno (Related Doc # 2084) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
Order Signed On 3/26/2015 Re: Granting The Plan Administrators Objection To Proof Of Claim No. 437 Filed By Staten Island Development, LLC And D.N.R. Group Of Companies, Inc.(Related Doc # 2082) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
Order Signed On 3/26/2015 Re: Granting The Plan Administrators Objection To Proof Of Claim No. 336 Filed By Scott B. Hockler (Related Doc # 2078) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
Order Signed On 3/26/2015 Re: Granting The Plan Administrators Objection To Proof Of Claim No. 298 Filed By Bridgette M. Taylor (Related Doc # 2076) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
Order Signed On 3/26/2015 Re: Granting The Plan Administrators Objection To Proof Of Claim No. 56 Filed By Jonathan Barnett Interior Design, Inc. (Related Doc # 2074) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
Order Signed On 3/26/2015 Re: Granting The Plan Administrators Objection To Proof Of Claim No. 26 Filed By Gregory R. Bennett (Related Doc # 2072) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Claim No. 231 filed Joseph M. Pastore III (related document(s)2098) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
Notice of Agenda Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for Thursday, March 26, 2015 filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
Reply to Motion Plan Administrator's Reply to Claimants' Response and in Further Support of Plan Administratro's Objection to Proof of Claim Nos. 171, 172, and 173 (related document(s)2096) filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Gowan Declaration) (Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
Opposition (related document(s)2098) filed by Joseph M Pastore III on behalf of Joseph M Pastore III. Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Affirmation of Claimant Joseph M. Pastore III # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D) (Pastore, Joseph) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Settling and Resolving Dreier LLP's Entitlement to the Fee Award Arising from the Howard Brett Berger, et al. Settlement filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 4/9/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 4/6/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/10/2015. Re: Regarding Claim No. 302Filed By Browne Woods George Llp, Claim No. 303 Filed By Lee A. Weiss And Claim No. 304 Filed By Brian C. Kerr (related document(s)2071) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/10/2015. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 511 Filed By Michael J. Plonsker (related document(s)2070) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Motion of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association for the Entry of an Order Directing the Immediate Payment of Its Allowed Superpriority Administrative Claim (related document(s)2064) filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. with hearing to be held on 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 4/23/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 2/26/2015. Re: Allowing Claim No. 480 Filed ByCj Apparel Group Llc As A General Unsecured Claim (related document(s)2061) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 2/26/2015.Re: Allowing Claim No. 478Filed By Hilco Trading, Llc As A General Unsecured Claim (related document(s)2060) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 231 Filed by Joseph M. Pastore III (related document(s)2098) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 231 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Proof of Claim No. 231 filed by Joseph M. Pastore III with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Gowan Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Proof of Claim Nos. 171, 172 and 173 (related document(s)2096) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 171, 172, 173 Plan Administrator's Objection to Proof of Claim Nos. 171, 172 and 173 with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim 171 # 2 Exhibit B - Claim 173 # 3 Exhibit C - Claim 172 # 4 Exhibit D - Gowan Declaration # 5 Exhibit E - Dismissal Order # 6 Exhibit F - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 590 Filed by the Internal Revenue Service (related document(s)2094) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 590 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Claim No. 590 Filed by the Internal Revenue Service with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Bogen Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 603 Filed by Los Angeles County Treasurer and Tax Collector (related document(s)2092) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 603 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Claim No. 603 Filed by Los Angeles County Treasurer and Tax Collector with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Bogen Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 568 Filed by Landmark Square 1-6, LLC (related document(s)2090) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 568 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Claim No. 568 Filed by Landmark Square 1-6 LLC with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Scott Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim no. 508 Filed by Howard Berger and Professional Traders Management (related document(s)2088) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 508 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Claim No. 508 Filed by Howard Berger and Professional Traders Management with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Bogen Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 503 Filed by Samuel Pryor (related document(s)2086) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 503 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Proof of Claim No. 503 Filed by Samuel Pryor with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Scott Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Bogen Declaration # 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 474 Filed by Tammy J. Bruno (related document(s)2084) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 474 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Claim No. 474 Filed by Tammy J. Bruno with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Bogen Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 437 Filed by Staten Island Development, LLC and D.N.R. Group of Companies, Inc. (related document(s)2082) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 437 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Claim No. 437 Filed by Staten Island Development, LLC and D.N.R. Group of Companies, Inc. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Scott Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 411 Filed by Canon Financial Services, Inc. (related document(s)2080) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 411 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Proof of Claim No. 411 Filed by Canon Financial Services, Inc. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Scott Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 336 Filed by Scott B. Hockler (related document(s)2078) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 336 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Claim No. 336 Filed by Scott B. Hockler with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Scott Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Bogen Declaration # 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 298 Filed by Bridgette M. Taylor (related document(s)2076) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 298 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Proof of Claim No. 298 Filed by Bridgette M. Taylor with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Scott Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Bogen Declaration # 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 56 Filed by Jonathan Barnett Interior Design, Inc. (related document(s)2074) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 56 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Claim No. 56 Filed by Jonathan Barnett Interior Design, Inc. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Bogen Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on the Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 26 Filed by Gregory R. Bennett (related document(s)2072) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/19/2015, (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 26 Objection of the Plan Administrator to Claim No. 26 Filed by Gregory R. Bennett with hearing to be held on 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/19/2015, filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim # 2 Exhibit B - Bogen Declaration # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Regarding Claim No. 302 filed by Browne Woods George LLP, Claim No. 303 Filed by Lee A. Weiss and Claim No. 304 Filed by Brian C. Kerr filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 3/6/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/3/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Regarding Claim No. 511 Filed by Michael J. Plonsker filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 3/6/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/3/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
Post-Confirmation Report. Second Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through December 31, 2014 Filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
Motion to Compel //Motion for the Entry of an Order Directing the Immediate Payment of Allowed Superpriority Administrative Claim filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association with hearing to be held on 3/19/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/12/2015,. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for the Entry of an Order Directing the Immediate Payment of Allowed Superpriority Administrative Claim # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Text of Proposed Order # 7 Affidavit of Service) (Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2061, 2062, 2060) Filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Regarding Claim No. 514 Filed by Joel A. Chernov filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 2/23/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 2/20/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Kiss, Lauren) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Allowing Claim No. 480 Filed by CJ Apparel Group LLC as a General Unsecured Claim filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 2/23/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 2/20/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Southard, Sean) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Allowing Claim No. 478 Filed by Hilco Trading, LLC as a General Unsecured Claim filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 2/23/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 2/20/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Southard, Sean) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/9/2015. Re: Liquidating And Allowing Claim No. 424 Filed By Thomas J. Farrell AndSubsequently Transferred To Liquidity Solutions, Inc. (related document(s)2055) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 4/24/214 10:12AM RE: Confirmation Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/17/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: VERITEXT REPORTING COMPANY.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/24/2014. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 12/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/18/2014. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/17/2015. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order by and Between the Plan Administrator, Thomas J. Farrell and Liquidity Solutions, Inc., Liquidating and Allowing Claim No. 424 Filed by Thomas J. Farrell and Subsequently Assigned to Liquidity Solutions, Inc. filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 1/7/2015 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 1/2/2015, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Withdrawal of Claim Number 37 Filed by Avant Garden, LLC filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
Statement Notice of Letter Agreement (related document(s)2028) filed by J. Benjamin King on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Agreement) (King, J.) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 12/8/2014. Re: Settling And Resolving Dreier Llps Entitlement To The Fee Award Arising FromThe National City Corporation Shareholders Settlement (related document(s)2038) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 12/8/2014. Re: Further Reducing Superpriority Claim Of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (related document(s)2037) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
Order Signed On 11/24/2014 Re: Pursuant To Section 105(a) Of The Bankruptcy Code And Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing And Approving The Settlement Of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-05447(Related Doc # 2028) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Second Adjournment of Presentment (related document(s)2045) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan, Post-Confirmation Plan Administrator for Dreier LLP (related document(s)2046) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan, Post-Confirmation Plan Administrator for Dreier LLP, in Support of Stipulation and Order Allowing Claim No. 393 Filed by Alarmex Holding, LLC (related document(s)2034) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Second Adjournment of Presentment of Plan Administrator's Motion for an Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-05447 (related document(s)2028) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 12/5/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 12/1/2014, (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing originally set for 11/14/2014, 12:00 pm (related document(s)2028) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 11/21/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 11/14/2014, (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): No. 397 filed by Pro Safety Services LLC filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): No. 280 filed by Debt Resolve, Inc. filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 11/10/2014. Re: Reducing And Allowing Claim No. 354 Filed By Maura I. Russell (related document(s)2023) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Settling and Resolving Dreier LLP's Entitlement to the Fee Award Arising from the National City Corporation Shareholders Settlement filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 12/5/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 12/2/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Southard, Sean) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Notice of Presentment Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Further Reducing Superpriority Claim of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 12/5/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 12/2/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Southard, Sean) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Allowing Claim No. 393 and Stipulation and Order Allowing Claim No. 393. (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Allowing Claim No. 393 Filed by Alarmex Holding, LLC filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 12/5/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 12/2/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order Allowing Claim No. 393 Filed by Alarmex Holding, Inc.)(Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Joseph Hess (related document(s)2031, 2022, 1989) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Ferrante, Angela) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Joseph A. Hess (related document(s)2031, 2027, 2022, 2028, 1989) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Ferrante, Angela) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Plan Administrator's Motion for an Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-05447 (related document(s)2027, 2028) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 11/14/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 11/12/2014, (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Order of U.S. District Court Judge Paul A. Engelmayer signed on 9/5/2014 re: 1865. . For the foregoing reasons, Alarmex's motion for reconsideration is denied in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions. The Court also directs that this bankruptcy appeal be closed (as opposed to being placed on the Court's suspense docket, as previously ordered). filed by Alarmex Holdings, LLC. (Savinon, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
Motion to Authorize /Motion for an Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-05447 (related document(s)2027) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan with hearing to be held on 11/14/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 11/12/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement # 2 Exhibit B - Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-05447 # 3 Supplement Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan, Post-Confirmation Plan Administrator for Dreier LLP, for an Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019) (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
Notice of Proposed Order /Notice of Presentment of Plan Administrator's Motion for an Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-05447 filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 11/14/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 11/12/2014, (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/10/2014. Re: Liquidating And Allowing Claim No. 377 Filed By Analysis Group, Inc. And Withdrawing Claim No. 468 Filed By Netratings, Inc. (related document(s)2014) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/10/2014. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 492 Filed By Arianna Frankl (related document(s)2015) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/10/2014. Re: Liquidating And Allowing Claim No. 384 Filed By Lion Button Holdings, LLC (related document(s)2016) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 354 Filed by Maura I. Russell filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 11/7/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/31/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
Post-Confirmation Report. First Post-Confirmation Report of Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator, Concerning Activity Through September 30, 2014 filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Initial Distributions)(Southard, Sean) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation And Order Allowing Claim No. 235 Filed By Rochelle Gores As A General Unsecured Claim Signed On 10/1/2014. (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 9/18/2014. Re: Amending And Allowing Claim No. 196 Filed By The City Of New York Department Of Finance (related document(s)1999) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan in Support of Stipulation Amending and Allowing Claim No. 196 Filed By the City of New York Department of Finance (related document(s)1999) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2014, 2016, 2015) filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Liquidating and Allowing Claim No. 384 Filed by Lion Button Holdings, LLC filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 10/9/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/2/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Amended Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 492 Filed by Arianna Frankl filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 10/9/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/2/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation Liquidating and Allowing Claim No. 377 Filed by Analysis Group, Inc. and Withdrawing Claim No. 468 Filed by NetRatings, Inc. filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 10/9/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 9/2/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 492 Filed by Arianna Frankl filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 10/9/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 10/2/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 9/11/2014. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 459 Filed By Mark D. Passin (related document(s)2000) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Allowing Claim No. 235 Filed by Rochelle Gores as a General Unsecured Claim filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 9/26/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 9/19/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Disallowing Claim No. 256 Filed by Stephen Stallings filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 9/26/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 9/19/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 9/4/2014. Re: Liquidating And Allowing Claim No. 299 Filed By Jay K. Reisinger (related document(s)1995) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 9/4/2014. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 363 Filed By Steven E. Fox (related document(s)1994) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor for Michael Glover filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions Inc. (Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor for Buckley, Eric (Claim No. 155) filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions Inc. (Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2002) filed by Alexander S. Lorenzo on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Lorenzo, Alexander) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
Letter to the Trustee regarding Change of Address for Paul Gardi and Alex Interactive Media, LLC. filed by Alexander S. Lorenzo on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Lorenzo, Alexander) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 459 Filed by Mark D. Passin filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 9/10/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 9/3/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation Amending and Allowing Claim No. 196 Filed By the City of New York Department of Finance filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 9/10/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 9/3/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 7/31/2014 10:05AM RE: Fee application for ASK LLP, Special Counsel. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/30/2014. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: VERITEXT REPORTING COMPANY.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/8/2014. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/22/2014. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/2/2014. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/30/2014. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)1996, 1994, 1995) filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Amending and Allowing Claim No. 242 filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 8/28/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 8/21/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 299 Filed by Jay K. Reisinger filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 8/28/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 8/21/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 363 Filed by Steven E. Fox filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 8/28/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 8/21/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scott, Brendan) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
Order signed on 8/6/2014 Approving Final Application of ASK LLP as Counsel to Sheila M. Gowan, Chapter 11 Trustee for Dreier LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred for the Period from July 20, 2010 through February 9, 2012, (Related Doc # 1967) for ASK LLP, fees awarded: $102,221.21, expense awarded: $19,111.46. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 1990)) . Notice Date 08/01/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/02/2014)
Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Enterprise Fund Limited (Claim No. 258) To Balanced Strategies Fund Limited filed by Janice MacAvoy on behalf of Concordia Advisors, L.L.C.. (MacAvoy, Janice) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Klestadt & Winters, LLP as Counsel for Sheila M. Gowan, as Plan Administrator of Dreier LLP filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Service Lists filed by Jonathan L. Flaxer on behalf of Gerard A. McHale, Jr., P.A., as Liquidation Trustee. (Flaxer, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (related document(s)1986) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Diamond McCarthy LLP. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Notice of Withdrawal Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Diamond McCarthy LLP. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 6/19/2014 10:02AM RE: Thirteenth and Final Fee Application of Klestadt & Winters, LLP, Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors; Final Fee Application of Dickstein Shapiro as Special Trial Counsel for Sheila M. Gowan..et al.... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/18/2014. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: VERITEXT REPORTING COMPANY.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/27/2014. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/21/2014. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/18/2014. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Amended Notice of Hearing (related document(s)1967) filed by Gary D. Underdahl on behalf of ASK Financial. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Underdahl, Gary) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
(DOCUMENT FILED IN THE WRONG CASE, SEE CASE NO. 14-11691 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by James C. Moon on behalf of Plaza Contracting Company d/b/a KM Plaza, Katz Meltzer Construction Company. (Moon, James) Modified on 6/24/2014 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 06/24/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Operating Report for May 2014 (related document(s)1977) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Order Signed On 6/18/2014 Re: Granting Motion Of Chapter 11 Trustee For An Order Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing And Approving The Settlement Of Adversary Proceeding No. 12-01572(Related Doc # 1933) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Reply to Motion Reply of Dickstein Shapiro LLP to Objections of United States Trustee to Final Application of Dickstein Shapiro LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Special Trial Counsel for Sheila M. Gowan, Chapter 11 Trustee for Dreier LLP for the Period from November 1, 2013 through May 13, 2014 (related document(s)1942) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Reply of Diamond McCarthy LLP to Objection of United States Trustee (related document(s)1973) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Diamond McCarthy LLP. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
Reply to Motion Reply of Diamond McCarthy LLP to Objection of United States Trustee to the Thirteenth Interim and Final Fee Application of Diamond McCarthy LLP as Counsel for Sheila M. Gowan, Chapter 11 Trustee (related document(s)1952) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Diamond McCarthy LLP. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)1970) filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment and Amended Motion of Chapter 11 Trustee for an Order Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 12-01572 (related document(s)1928, 1933) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Reply to Motion Reply of Klestadt & Winters, LLP to Objection of United States Trustee to Thirteenth Interim and Final Application of Klestadt & Winters, LLP, Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 330 and 331 for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s)1939) filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Klestadt & Winters, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Statement Submitted In Response to United States Trustee's Objection and to confirm photocopying costs per page (related document(s)1955) filed by Stephen Z. Starr on behalf of Starr & Starr PLLC. with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 (check with court for location) (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for ASK LLP for ASK Financial, Special Counsel, period: 7/20/2010 to 2/9/2012, fee:$102,221.11, expenses: $24,925.24. filed by ASK Financial with hearing to be held on 7/10/2014 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB). (Attachments: # 1 Application and Exhibits # 2 Certification of Gary D. Underdahl # 3 Proposed Order) (Underdahl, Gary) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
Objection to Motion /Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Interim and Final Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s)1960, 1954, 1951, 1965, 1949, 1939, 1955, 1948, 1953, 1961, 1942, 1944, 1952) filed by Brian Shoichi Masumoto on behalf of United States Trustee. (Masumoto, Brian) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for Lawrence Blake Morris, Special Counsel, period: 1/1/2014 to 5/13/2014, fee:$51745.33, expenses: $1495.00. filed by Howard D. Ressler with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Amended Notice of Hearing on Applications for Thirteenth Interim and Final Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals (related document(s)1963) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
Amended Notice of Hearing on Applications for Thirteenth Interim and Final Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals (related document(s)1941) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 6/12/2014, (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
Certificate of Service (related document(s)1961) filed by Stephen Z. Starr on behalf of Stephen Z. Starr Starr & Starr, PLLC. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
Supplemental Application for Final Professional Compensation / SUPPLEMENT TO APPLICATION -- to add corrected summary chart and 4 inadvertently ommitted invoices.(related document(s)1955) filed by Stephen Z. Starr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corrected summary chart # 2 Exhibit B - Invoices) (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
(This Entry Replaces Entry #1945 which was filed on 5/30/2014) Application for Final Professional Compensation for Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, Special Counsel, period: 9/20/2013 to 5/13/2014, fee:$120,650, expenses: $1833.78. filed by Reid Collins & Tsai LLP with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 (check with court for location) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - King Certification # 2 Exhibit B - Sch. of Fees # 3 Exhibit C - Invoices for Professional Service) (King, J.) Modified on 6/3/2014 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 06/03/2014)
Certificate of Service (related document(s)1955) filed by Stephen Z. Starr on behalf of Stephen Z. Starr Starr & Starr, PLLC. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Affidavit of Service of April 2014 Operating Report (related document(s)1946) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Final Fee Applications of BDO USA, LLP, Constellation Investment Consulting Corp.,, Development Specialists, Inc., Diamond McCarthy LLP, GCG, Inc., and Sheila M. Gowan (related document(s)1954, 1951, 1948, 1953, 1944, 1941, 1952) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Joseph A. Hess re: Notice of Hearing on Applications for Thirteenth Interim and Final Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals (related document(s)1941) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ferrante, Angela) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Final Application for Final Professional Compensation - Twelfth Interim and Final Application of Starr & Starr, PLLC, Special Counsel to the Official Commitee of Unsecured Creditors, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 330 and 331 for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Stephen Z. Starr, Special Counsel, period: 8/24/2009 to 5/13/2014, fee:$71124.98, expenses: $8377.54.(related document(s)1941) filed by Stephen Z. Starr with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Hourly Matters Bills # 2 Exhibit B - Summary Chart re Hourly Compensation Receivables Matters # 3 Exhibit C - Bill re Time & Expenses for Interim Applications and Final Fee Application # 4 Exhibit D - Contingency Fee bills_Part 1 # 5 Exhibit D - Contingency Fee Bills_Part 2) (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for Sheila M. Gowan, Trustee Chapter 11, period: 12/30/2008 to 5/13/2014, fee:$1151067.50, expenses: $2725.38. filed by Howard D. Ressler with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Cash Disbursements # 2 Exhibit B - Trustee's Fee Summary # 3 Exhibit C - Expenses # 4 Exhibit D-1 - Detailed Time Records Part 1 # 5 Exhibit Ex D - Detailed Time Records Part2 # 6 Exhibit E - Gowan CV) (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for GCG, Inc., Other Professional, period: 9/3/2013 to 5/13/2014, fee:$273678.60, expenses: $10454.62. filed by Howard D. Ressler with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for Diamond McCarthy LLP, Trustee's Attorney, period: 12/30/2008 to 5/13/2014, fee:$11019303.95, expenses: $298434.81. filed by Howard D. Ressler with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Janvey Certification # 2 Exhibit B - Summary Sheet # 3 Exhibit C - Expense Summary # 4 Exhibit D - Matter Summary # 5 Exhibit E - Detailed Time Records # 6 Exhibit F - Expenses) (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for Development Specialist, Inc., Other Professional, period: 2/9/2009 to 5/13/2014, fee:$1724007.00, expenses: $120480.39. filed by Howard D. Ressler with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Certificate of Service of Eleventh Interim and Final Application of Niehaus LLP, Special Litigation Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s)1949) filed by Steven Gabriel Hayes-Williams on behalf of Niehaus LLP. (Hayes-Williams, Steven) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation and Eleventh Interim Application for Niehaus LLP, Special Counsel, period: 8/24/2009 to 5/13/2014, fee:$229300.06, expenses: $16790.43. filed by Niehaus LLP with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Certification) (Hayes-Williams, Steven) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for Constellation Investment Consulting Corp., Consultant, period: 6/28/2012 to 5/13/2014, fee:$268329.15, expenses: $2313.52. filed by Howard D. Ressler with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
(THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN REFILED, SEE DOCUMENT #1960 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Application for Final Professional Compensation for Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2014 to 5/13/2014, fee:$57,750.00, expenses: $114.76. filed by Reid Collins & Tsai LLP with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 (check with court for location) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - King Certification # 2 Exhibit B - Sch. of Fees # 3 Exhibit C - Invoices for Professional Service) (King, J.) Modified on 6/3/2014 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for BDO USA, LLP, Other Professional, period: 1/23/2012 to 5/13/2014, fee:$339,499.50, expenses: $486.93. filed by Howard D. Ressler with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Affidavit of Service re Chapter 11 Trustee's Final Application of Dickstein Shapiro LLP for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Special Trial Counsel for Sheila M. Gowan. (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Special Trial Counsel for Sheila M. Gowan, Chapter 11 Trustee for Dreier LLP for Eric Fisher, Trustee's Attorney, period: 11/1/2013 to 5/13/2014, fee:$102,409.50, expenses: $4380.30. filed by Eric Fisher with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
Notice of Hearing on Applications for Thirteenth Interim and Final Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 6/12/2014, (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
Application for Final Professional Compensation - Thirteenth Interim and Final Application of Klestadt & Winters, LLP, Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 330 and 331 for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Klestadt & Winters, LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 1/8/2009 to 5/13/2014, fee:$2,150,837.00, expenses: $44,166.53. filed by Klestadt & Winters, LLP with hearing to be held on 6/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/12/2014,. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Order Signed On 5/23/2014. Re: Approving Post-Confirmation TimetableAs Required By Local Bankruptcy Rule 3021-1(a) (related document(s)1926) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
Notice of Withdrawal filed by Joseph H. Lemkin on behalf of EMC Mortgage, LLC (formerly known as EMC Mortgage Corporation (hereinafter EMC, LLC). (Lemkin, Joseph) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Notice of Withdrawal filed by James P. Berg on behalf of EMC Mortgage, LLC (formerly known as EMC Mortgage Corporation (hereinafter EMC, LLC). (Berg, James) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Joseph A. Hess re: (i) Notice of Presentment of Motion to Approve Settlement Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019; and (ii) Docket No. 1929. (related document(s)1929) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of Dreier LLP. (Ferrante, Angela) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Amended Motion to Approve Amended Motion of Chapter 11 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankrutpcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 12-01572 (related document(s)1928, 1927) filed by Stephen T. Loden on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan Responses due by 6/9/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Gowan Declaration # 2 Exhibit B - Settlement Agreement # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Declaration of Seth H. Ostrow in Support of Motion for Substitution of Counsel (related document(s)1931) filed by Seth H. Ostrow on behalf of Ostrow Kaufman LLP. (Ostrow, Seth) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Consent Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Seth H. Ostrow on behalf of Ostrow Kaufman LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order for Substitution of Counsel) (Ostrow, Seth) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Post-Confirmation Timetable (related document(s)1926) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Notice of Entry of Judgment - Notice of (I) Entry of an Order Confirming the Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code; (II) Occurrence of Effective Date; (III) Administrative Claims Bar Date; and (IV) Rejection Damages Bar Date (related document(s)1921) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Motion of Chapter 11 Trustee for an Order Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 12-01572 (related document(s)1927) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 6/16/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 6/9/2014, (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
(THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN REFILED, SEE DOCUMENT #1933 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Motion to Approve Compromise Motion of Chapter 11 Trustee for an Order Purusant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 12-01572 filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan Responses due by 6/9/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Gowan Declaration # 2 Exhibit B - O'Dowd Settlement Agreement # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order) (Ressler, Howard) Modified on 5/22/2014 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Post-Confirmation Timetable as Required by Local Bankruptcy Rule 3021-1(a) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 5/22/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 5/22/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Approving Post-Confirmation Timetable)(Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 459 Filed by Mark D. Passin (related document(s)1924) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 459 Filed by Mark D. Passin filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 5/29/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 5/29/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
Order Signed On 5/5/2014 Re: Pursuant To Section 105(a) Of The Bankruptcy Code And Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing And Approving The Settlement Of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-03493(Related Doc # 1905) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law signed on 4/28/2014 Confirming Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreir LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 4/22/2014. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 516 Filed By Yakub Hazzard (related document(s)1897) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
Notice of Withdrawal Conditional Withdrawal of Objection to Proposed Plan (related document(s)1901) filed by Arianna Frankl on behalf of Arianna Frankl. (Frankl, Arianna) (Entered: 04/19/2014)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 1892)) . Notice Date 04/17/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection (Conditional) (related document(s)1900) filed by Eric C. Osterberg on behalf of Eric Charles Osterberg. (Osterberg, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Debra Wolther (related document(s)1911, 1909, 1910, 1913, 1912, 1914) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of Dreier LLP. (Ferrante, Angela) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Notice of Proposed Order - Notice of Filing of Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1129 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3020 Confirming Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)1848) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Entry of an Order Confirming the Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)1848) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Certification of Ballots - Declaration of Craig E. Johnson of GCG, Inc. Certifying the Methodology for the Solicitation and Tabulation of Votes On and Results of Voting with Respect to the Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s)1848) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Declaration of Yale Scott Bogen in Support of Entry of an Order Confirming the Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s)1848) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan in Support of Entry of an Order Confirming the Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s)1848) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Chapter 11 Plan - Supplement to the Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)1848) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 4/14/2014. Re: Reducing And Allowing Claim No. 294 Filed By Thomas I. Mandelbaum (related document(s)1756) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Motion to Authorize and, Motion to Approve an Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-03493 (related document(s)1904) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement # 2 Exhibit B - Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-03493 # 3 Supplement Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan, Chapter 11 Trustee for Dreier LLP, in Support of Motion of Chapter 11 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing) (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
Notice of Proposed Order /Notice of Presentment of Motion of Chapter 11 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Authorizing and Approving the Settlement of Adversary Proceeding No. 10-03493 filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 5/2/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 4/25/2014, (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 4/9/2014. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 232 Filed By Lisa Bonner (related document(s)1884) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1402353 Judge Paul A. Engelmayer (related document(s)1865) filed by Clerk's Office Office, U.S.Bankruptcy, S.D.N.Y. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan (related document(s)1848) filed by Arianna Frankl on behalf of Arianna Frankl. (Frankl, Arianna) (Entered: 04/06/2014)
Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan (related document(s)1848) filed by Eric C. Osterberg on behalf of Eric Charles Osterberg. with hearing to be held on 4/24/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Jacobs Complaint)(Osterberg, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 516 Filed by Yakub Hazzard (related document(s)1897) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Monthly Operating Report for February 2014 (related document(s)1891) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 516 Filed by Yakub Hazzard filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 4/21/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 4/21/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding No. 13-01534 (Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Dreier LLP v. Prentice Capital Management L.P.) filed by Steven Gabriel Hayes-Williams on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Hayes-Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
So Ordered First Amended Stipulation Signed On 3/25/2014 Re: Reducing And Allowing Claim No. 593 Filed By Cynthia J. Urbach . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Order Signed On 3/25/2014. Re:Approving Trustees CancellationOf Bonds And Replacement With Consolidated Bond (related document(s)1882) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/18/2014 10:03AM RE: Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, Special Counsel, period: 9/20/2013 to 1/31/2013, fee $62,900.00, expenses: $1,719.02. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/17/2014. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: VERITEXT REPORTING COMPANY.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/26/2014. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 4/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/21/2014. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/17/2014. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferor: Strategic Workforce Solutions To TRC MASTER FUND LLC . To TRC MASTER FUND LLC. filed by TR Capital Management, LLC.(Ross, Terrel) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 232 and Declaration in Support (related document(s)1885, 1884) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Trustee's Cancellation of Bonds and Replacement with Consolidated Bond (related document(s)1882) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
Order signed on 3/19/2014 Granting First Interim Application for Allowance of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, fees awarded: $50,320.00, expense awarded: $1,719.02, and Granting Motion for Approval of Provision of Notice Pursuant to FRBP 2002(i). (Related Doc # 1855) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/19/2014. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 457 Filed By Marshall P. Horowitz (related document(s)1863) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/19/2014. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 522 Filed By Henry S. David (related document(s)1862) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
Declaration in Support of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 232 Filed by Lisa Bonner (related document(s)1884) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 232 Filed by Lisa Bonner filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 4/8/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 4/8/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Proposed Order of Settlement with Irene Lebovics, Cy E. Hammond, Sam Oolie, and Michael J. Parrella, Sr. filed by Steven Gabriel Hayes-Williams on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. with presentment to be held on 4/1/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 4/1/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul R. Niehaus in Support of the Stipulation and Proposed Order of Settlement # 2 Exhibit A (Stipulation and Proposed Order of Settlement) # 3 Certificate of Service)(Hayes-Williams, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Trustee's Cancellation of Bonds and Replacement with Consolidated Bond filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 3/24/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/24/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Approving Trustee's Cancellation of Bonds)(Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/13/2014. Re: Reducing And Allowing Claim Nos. 357, 358, 360, 364, And 435 Filed By Lori G. Rudolph, Bradford A. Tobin,Anthony B. Stumbo, Brett J. Nizzo And Diane Romanik, Respectively (related document(s)1858) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/13/2014. Re: Reducing And AllowingClaim No. 269 Filed By Michael Resnikoff (related document(s)1859) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Statement of Issues for Appeal and Designation of Contents of Record (related document(s)1865) filed by David Sack on behalf of Alarmex Holdings, LLC. (Sack, David) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Operating Report for January 2014 (related document(s)1876) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)1866) filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 457 Filed by Marshall P. Horowitz (related document(s)1863) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 522 Filed by Henry S. David (related document(s)1862) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 269 Filed by Michael H. Resnikoff (related document(s)1859) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim Nos. 357, 358, 360, 364, and 435 (related document(s)1858) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
(DOCUMENT FILED IN THE WRONG CASE, SEE CASE NO. 10-22998 DOCUMENT #343 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Bond Issued by Marianne T. O'Toole and Hartford Fire Insurance Company in the amount of $325,000.00 filed by Marianne T. O'Toole. (Lopez, Mary) Modified on 2/26/2014 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Solicitation Documents (related document(s)1847, 1850) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of Dreier LLP. (Ferrante, Angela) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Notice of Presentment of First Amended Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 593 Filed By Cynthia J. Urbach (related document(s)1609, 1797, 1853, 1626) filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. with presentment to be held on 3/21/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/14/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed First Amended Stipulation and Order)(Southard, Sean) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 2/11/2014 10:06AM RE: Motion to Approve First Amended (I) Disclosure Statement, (II) Form of and Manner of Notice, (III)Form of Ballots and (IV) Solicitation Materials and Solicitation Procedures...et al.... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/13/2014. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: VERITEXT REPORTING COMPANY.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/19/2014. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/17/2014. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/13/2014. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 457 Filed by Marshall P. Horowitz filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 3/17/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/10/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 522 Filed by Henry S. David filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 3/17/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/10/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 2/21/2014. Re: Reclassifying And Allowing Claim No. 452 Filed By Marcia J. Harris (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 269 Filed by Michael H. Resnikoff filed by Charles Rubio on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 3/12/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/5/2014, (Rubio, Charles) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim Nos. 357, 358, 360, 364, and 435 Filed by Lori G. Rudolph, Bradford A. Tobin, Anthony B. Stumbo, Brett J. Nizzo and Diane Romanik, Respectively (related document(s)1720, 1722, 1728, 1724, 1726) filed by Charles Rubio on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 3/12/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/5/2014, (Rubio, Charles) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Notice of Hearing filed by J. Benjamin King on behalf of Reid Collins & Tsai LLP. with hearing to be held on 3/18/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/11/2014, (King, J.) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Reid Collins & Tsai LLP, Special Counsel, period: 9/20/2013 to 1/31/2014, fee:$62,900.00, expenses: $1,719.02. filed by Reid Collins & Tsai LLP with hearing to be held on 3/18/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/11/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (King, J.) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)1853) filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 593 Filed By Cynthia J. Urbach and Providing For Early Final Distribution (related document(s)1609, 1797, 1792, 1626) filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. with presentment to be held on 3/10/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 3/3/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulation and Order # 2 Declaration In Support)(Southard, Sean) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Amended Disclosure Statement - Second Amended Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (Blackline) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Amended Disclosure Statement - Second Amended Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)1795, 1839) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Amended Plan - Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (Blackline) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Amended Plan - Second Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)1794, 1837) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Order signed on 2/13/2014, Approving Discolsure Statement, (II)Form and Manner of Notices, (III)Form of Ballots and (IV)Solicitation Materials and Solicitation Procedures (Related Doc # 1796) (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Proposed Order of Settlement with Prentice Capital Management, L.P. filed by Steven Gabriel Hayes-Williams on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. with presentment to be held on 2/28/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 2/28/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul Niehaus in Support of Notice of Presentment of Settlement with Prentice Capital Management, L.P. # 2 Exhibit A: Stipulation and Proposed Order of Settlement with Prentice Capital Management, L.P. # 3 Certificate of Service)(Hayes-Williams, Steven) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Monthly Operating Report for December 2013 (related document(s)1843) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Amended Disclosure Statement - First Amended Disclosure Statement for First Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (Corrected Blackline) (related document(s)1840, 1839) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Joseph A. Hess re Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibits to Motion for the Entry of an Order Approving (I) Disclosure Statement, (II) Form and Manner of Notices, (III) Form of Ballots and (IV) Solicitation Materials and Solicitation Procedures (related document(s)1834) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of Dreier LLP. (Ferrante, Angela) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Amended Disclosure Statement - First Amended Disclosure Statement for First Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (Blackline) (related document(s)1795) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Amended Disclosure Statement - First Amended Disclosure Statement for First Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)1795) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Amended Plan - First Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (blackline) (related document(s)1794) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Amended Plan - First Amended Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)1794) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Response to Motion / Response of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s)1822, 1819, 1817, 1809, 1828, 1818) filed by Brian Shoichi Masumoto on behalf of United States Trustee. (Masumoto, Brian) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
Third Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Chapter 11 Trustee's Objections to Certain Proofs of Claims (WARN Act Claims) (related document(s)1720, 1722, 1728, 1724, 1726) filed by Charles Rubio on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 4/3/2014 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Rubio, Charles) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
Motion to Approve - Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibits to Motion for the Entry of an Order Approving (I) Disclosure Statement, (II) Form and Manner of Notices, (III) Form of Ballots and (IV) Solicitation Materials and Solicitation Procedures (related document(s)1796) filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Certificate of Service /Declaration of Service (related document(s)1828) filed by Paul R. Niehaus on behalf of Niehaus LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Electronic Filing)(Niehaus, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Notice of Withdrawal of Claim No. 513 filed by Schlesigner Gannon & Lazetera LLP filed by Charles Rubio on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Rubio, Charles) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Affidavit of Service of (i) Notice of Hearing; (ii) Twelfth Interim Application for Compensation of Diamond McCarthy LLP; (iii) Twelfth Interim Application for Compensation of Development Specialists Inc; and (iv) First Interim Application for Compensation of GCG, Inc., (related document(s)1816, 1819, 1817, 1818) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Tenth Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Niehaus LLP, Special Counsel, period: 8/1/2013 to 12/31/2013, fee:$8835.00, expenses: $879.00.(related document(s)1816) filed by Paul R. Niehaus with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/4/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Certification # 4 Summary) (Niehaus, Paul) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Second Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Chapter 11 Trustee's Objections to Certain Proofs of Claim (WARN Act Claims) [Proofs of Claim Nos. 357, 358, 360, 364 and 435] (related document(s)1720, 1722, 1728, 1724, 1726) filed by Charles Rubio on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Rubio, Charles) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Notice of Settlement of an Order on Motions for Partial Summary Judgment filed in Adversary Proceedings filed by J. Benjamin King on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 1/30/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Attachments: # 1 proposed order)(King, J.) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Third Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 393 (related document(s)1712) filed by Stephen T. Loden on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
Certificate of Service of 11th Interim Fee Application of Starr & Starr, PLLC (related document(s)1822) filed by Stephen Z. Starr on behalf of Starr & Starr PLLC. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation [11TH INTERIM APPLICATION] for Starr & Starr PLLC, Special Counsel, period: 8/1/2013 to 12/31/2013, fee:$3183, expenses: $512.30.(related document(s)1816) filed by Starr & Starr PLLC with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB). (Attachments: # 1 Errata Summary of Application) (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
Second Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 452 Filed by Marcia J. Harris (related document(s)1820) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 2/18/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 2/11/2014, (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
Declaration in Support of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 452 Filed by Marcia J. Harris (related document(s)1750) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation First Interim Fee Application of GCG, Inc., as Administrative Agent for the Chapter 11 Trustee, for Allowance of Compensation for the Period of September 3, 2013 through December 31, 2013 for GCG, Inc., Other Professional, period: 9/3/2013 to 12/31/2013, fee:$13,589.30, expenses: $. filed by GCG, Inc. with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/4/2014,. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation Twelfth Interim Fee Application of Development Specialists, Inc. as Financial Advisor to the Chapter 11 Trustee for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred During the Period August 1, 2013 through December 31, 2013 for Development Specialist, Inc., Other Professional, period: 8/1/2013 to 12/31/2013, fee:$93,084.75, expenses: $9,646.36. filed by Howard D. Ressler, Development Specialist, Inc. with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/4/2014,. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation Twelfth Interim Application of Diamond McCarthy LLP, Counsel for Sheila M. Gowan, the Chapter 11 Trustee, for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred for the Period August 1, 2013 thorugh December 31, 2013 for Diamond McCarthy LLP, Trustee's Attorney, period: 8/1/2013 to 12/31/2013, fee:$317,312.50, expenses: $7,328.83. filed by Diamond McCarthy LLP with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/4/2014,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Janvey Certification # 2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Professionals and Paraprofessionals # 3 Exhibit C - Schedule of Expenses # 4 Exhibit D - Summary of Matters # 5 Exhibit E - Detailed Time Records # 6 Exhibit F - Detailed Expense Records) (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
Notice of Hearing on Twelfth Applications for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 2/4/2014, (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Memorandum of Law in opposition to Objection (related document(s)1712) filed by Jonathan Honig on behalf of Alarmex Holdings, LLC. (Honig, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation - Twelfth Interim Application of Klestadt & Winters, LLP, Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 330 and 331 for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Klestadt & Winters, LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 8/1/2013 to 12/31/2013, fee:$129,009.50, expenses: $1,126.74. filed by Klestadt & Winters, LLP with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/4/2014,. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
Response Claimants' Response In Opposition to Chapter 11 Trustee's Objections to Warn Act Claims Set Forth In Proofs of Claim 357, 358, 360, 365, and 435 filed by Anthony B. Stumbo on behalf of Anthony Stumbo. (Stumbo, Anthony) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Monthly Operating Reports for October and November 2013 (related document(s)1801, 1802) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
Letter /Amended Agenda for January 14, 2014 Pretrial Conferences (related document(s)1804) filed by Stephen Z. Starr on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
Letter /Agenda for January 14, 2014 Pretrial Conferences filed by Stephen Z. Starr on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/10/2013 10:05AM RE: Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion for Objection to Claim No. 393; Chapter 11 Trustee's Seventh Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Number: 142, 238, 287, 297, 301, 371, 571; Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion for Objection to Claim No. 214; Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion for Objection to Claim No. 293; Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion for Objection to Claim No. 292. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/7/2014. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/14/2014. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/7/2014. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/7/2014. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Tracy L. Klestadt Disclosing Revised Professional Fee Hourly Rates filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Joseph Hess re Docket Nos. 1795, 1796 and Disclosure Statement Notice (related document(s)1796, 1795) filed by Angela Ferrante on behalf of Dreier LLP. (Ferrante, Angela) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
Motion to Approve - Motion for the Entry of an Order Approving (I) Disclosure Statement, (II) Form of and Manner of Notices, (III) Form of Ballots and (IV) Solicitation Materials and Solicitation Procedures (related document(s)1795, 1794) filed by Sean C. Southard on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors with hearing to be held on 2/11/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/4/2014,. (Southard, Sean) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
Disclosure Statement - Disclosure Statement for Plan of Liquidation of Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
Chapter 11 Plan - Plan of Liquidation for Dreier LLP Jointly Proposed by the Chapter 11 Trustee and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code filed by Joseph Corneau on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Corneau, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
Order Signed On 12/19/2013 Re: Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(e), 328 And 330 Authorizing The Retention And Employment Of Dickstein Shapiro LLP As Special Trial Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc To November 1, 2013(Related Doc # 1769) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 1785)) . Notice Date 12/18/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
Statement Notice of Satisfaction of Secured Portion of Claim No. 228 (related document(s)198) filed by Charles Rubio on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Rubio, Charles) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
Statement of No Objection /Certificate of No Objection re: Notice of Presentment of Chapter 11 Trustee's Application to Retain Dickstein Shapiro LLP as Special Trial Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to November 1, 2013 (related document(s)1768) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
Stipulation /Letter and Proposed Stipulation And Order Appointing Mediator (related document(s)1609, 1626) filed by Mickee M. Hennessy on behalf of Mickee M. Hennessy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulation and Order)(Hennessy, Mickee) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Proposed Order of Settlement with John J. McCloy, II filed by Steven Gabriel Hayes-Williams on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. with presentment to be held on 1/2/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 1/2/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Settlement # 2 Niehaus Declaration in Support of Settlement with John McCloy # 3 Certificate of Service)(Hayes-Williams, Steven) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferor: Alter, Regina To Liquidity Solutions Inc . To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions Inc.(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
Order Signed On 12/10/2013 Re: Granting Trustees Objection To Proof Of Claim Filed By Sheldon H. Solow(Claim No. 214)(Related Doc # 1718) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Order Signed On 12/10/2013 Re: Granting Trustees Objection To Proof Of Claim Filed By Monika Tashman (Claim No. 293) (Related Doc # 1730) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
Order Signed On 12/10/2013 Re: Granting Trustees Objection To Proof Of Claim Filed By Rebekah Connolly (Claim No. 292) (Related Doc # 1732) . (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 12/9/2013. Re: Disallowing And Expunging Claim No. 244 Filed By John S. McClelland (related document(s)1751) (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
Second Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 393 (related document(s)1712) filed by Stephen T. Loden on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 1/23/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 1/16/2014, (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 1758)) . Notice Date 12/06/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/07/2013)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 1757)) . Notice Date 12/06/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/07/2013)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 1755)) . Notice Date 12/06/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/07/2013)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 1754)) . Notice Date 12/06/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/07/2013)
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security (related document(s) (Related Doc # 1738)) . Notice Date 12/06/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/07/2013)
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 10, 2013 at 10:00 A.M. (related document(s)1716, 1720, 1732, 1722, 1728, 1724, 1718, 1730, 1726) filed by Charles Rubio on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 12/10/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Rubio, Charles) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment and Application Pursuant to Section 327(e), 328 and 330 of the Bankruptcy Code for Authorization to Retain Dickstein Shapiro LLP as Special Trial Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc November 1, 2013 [Dkt. Nos. 1768 and 1769]. (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
Notice of Objection to Claims Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibit to Omnibus Objection No. 7 to Claims (Wrong Debtor Claims) (related document(s)1716) filed by Charles Rubio on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 12/10/2013 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 12/3/2013, (Rubio, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
Application to Employ Dickstein Shapiro LLP as Special Trial Counsel Pursuant to Sections 327(e), 328 and 330 of the Bankruptcy Code, Nunc Pro Tunc to November 1, 2013 (related document(s)1768) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan Responses due by 12/13/2013, with presentment to be held on 12/20/2013 (check with court for location). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sheila M. Gowan in Support of Application to Retain Dickstein Shapiro LLP # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Eric B. Fisher in Support of Application to Retain Dickstein Shapiro LLP # 3 Exhibit C - Order Authorizing the Retention of Dickstein Shapiro LLP) (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
Notice of Proposed Order /Notice of Presentment of Chapter 11 Trustee's Application Pursuant to Section 327(e), 328 and 330 of the Bankruptcy Code for Authorization to Retain Dickstein Shapiro LLP as Special Trial Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to November 1, 2013 filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 12/20/2013 (check with court for location) Objections due by 12/13/2013, (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 393 (related document(s)1712) filed by Stephen T. Loden on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 1/16/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 1/9/2014, (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Chapter 11 Trustee's Objections to Certain Proofs of Claim (WARN Act Claims) (related document(s)1720, 1722, 1728, 1724, 1726) filed by Charles Rubio on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 1/28/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Rubio, Charles) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 294 Filed by Thomas I. Mandelbaum (related document(s)1756) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Adversary case 13-01696. Complaint against Legend Merchant Group, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Dreier LLP. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Adversary case 13-01695. Complaint against Global NAPs New Hampshire, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Dreier LLP. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Adversary case 13-01694. Complaint against Solid State Logic, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Dreier LLP. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Adversary case 13-01693. Complaint against MTM Technologies, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Dreier LLP. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Adversary case 13-01692. Complaint against VCG Special Opportunities Master Fund Limited . Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Dreier LLP. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Adversary case 13-01691. Complaint against David Engelke . Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Dreier LLP. (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reducing and Allowing Claim No. 294 Filed by Thomas I. Mandelbaum filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 12/11/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 12/4/2013, (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Elmore, Leonard (Claim No. 220) To Liquidity Solutions Inc . To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions Inc.(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Disallowing and Expunging Claim No. 244 Filed by John S. McClelland (related document(s)1751) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 452 Filed by Marcia J. Harris (related document(s)1750) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Disallowing and Expunging Claim No. 244 Filed by John S. McClelland filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 12/6/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 11/29/2013, (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 452 Filed by Marcia J. Harris [CORRECTED TO ADD SIGNATURE] filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 12/6/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 11/29/2013, (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
(INCORRECT PDF FILE SUBMITTED, SEE DOCUMENT #1750 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Reclassifying and Allowing Claim No. 452 Filed by Marcia J. Harris filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with presentment to be held on 12/6/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 11/29/2013, (Ressler, Howard) Modified on 11/14/2013 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Rebekah Connolly (Claim No. 292) (related document(s)1733, 1732) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Monika Tashman (Claim No. 293) (related document(s)1730, 1731) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Lori G. Rudolph (Claim No. 357) (related document(s)1729, 1728) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Diane Romanik (Claim No. 435) (related document(s)1727, 1726) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Bradford A. Tobin (Claim No. 358) (related document(s)1724, 1725) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Anthony B. Stumbo (Claim No. 360) (related document(s)1722, 1723) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trustee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Brett J. Nizzo (Claim No. 364) (related document(s)1720, 1721) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trusee's Objection to Proof of Claim Filed by Sheldon H. Solow (Claim No. 214) (related document(s)1719, 1718) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trustee's Omnibus Objection No. 7 to Claims (Wrong Debtor Claims) (related document(s)1716, 1717) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing and Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 393 (related document(s)1712, 1713) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)