Intellectual Ventures I LLC v. Symantec Corporation et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-01067
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 6:42 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Check Point Software Technologies, Inc. Check Point Software Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011 Shaw, John W. +1 302 571 6689

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo Mcafee, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Olivia M. Kim

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/29/2012 Lauren Murphy Pringle +1 302 652 5070 pringle@fr.com
TERMINATED: 04/09/2012 Adam R Steinert +1 612 337 2539 +1 612 288 9696 steinert@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linhong Zhang +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 lwzhang@fr.com

Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vernon M. Winters +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 vern.winters@weil.com
Symantec Corporation Symantec Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Symantec Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Grimm +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 tcgefiling@mnat.com
No Logo Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Counter-Claimant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo Trend Micro Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Trend Micro Incorporated"

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo Checkpoint Software Technologies Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/19/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaw, John W. +1 302 571 6689

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph C. Gratz wyethkvn@kvn.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clement S. Roberts +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 CSR@KVN.com

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Represented by Shaw Keller LLP

No Logo Intellectual Ventures, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Intellectual Ventures I LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph James Farnan, III +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 jjfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooke Ashley-May Taylor +1 206 516 3880 +1 206 516 3883 btaylor@susmangodfrey.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (762) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on December 1, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2016.(bpg) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on the pending post-trial motion on December 1, 2015 beginning at 3:00 p.m. Each side will be allocated up to 45 minutes to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/15. (ntl) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Rule 50(a) motions (D.I. 657, 669, 675), and in light of the Court's entry of non-final judgment (D.I. 741), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Symantec's Rule 50(a) motions (D.I. 657, 669) are DENIED with respect to the '610 patent and DENIED AS MOOT with respect to the '050 and '142 patents; and (2) IV's motion (D.I. 675) is DENIED AS MOOT. Further, having reviewed IV's Rule 58(d) motion for entry of judgment and for prejudgment and post-judgment interest (D.I. 688), and in light of the Court's entry of non-final judgment (D.I. 741), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that IV's motion is: (1) DENIED AS MOOT with respect to entry of judgment and with respect to prejudgment and post-judgment interest for the '050 and '142 patents, and (2) DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew (after the Court rules on the pending Rule 50(b) motion, see D.I. 752) with respect to prejudgment and post-judgment interest for the '610 patent. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/22/15. (ntl) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
        REPLY BRIEF re 752 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement, Invalidity, and Damages for U.S. Patent No. 5,987,610 filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 757 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Weston OBlack by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Part 1 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Part 2 of 2, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
            [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 752 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement, Invalidity, and Damages for U.S. Patent No. 5,987,610 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/13/2015. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              Redaction of 686. Pretrial conference held on January 9, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan. Phone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                MANDATE of USCA as to 736 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. USCA Decision: Appeal No. 15-1677 is DISMISSED. (ntl) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                  REDACTED VERSION of 753 Opening Brief in Support, of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement, Invalidity, and Damages for U.S. Patent No. 5,987,610 by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                    [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 752 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement, Invalidity, and Damages for U.S. Patent No. 5,987,610 filed by Symantec Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement, Invalidity, and Damages for U.S. Patent No. 5,987,610 - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intellectual Ventures I LLC TRANSCRIPT NOT NEEDED (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 746 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Symantec Corp. USCA Case Number 15-1771. (ntl) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 747 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. USCA Case Number 15-1769. (ntl) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                              [SEALED] STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Concerning Redacted Pretrial Conference Transcript by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 745 Order . Appeal filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 745 Order, 726 Memorandum Opinion, 727 Order . Cross Appeal filed by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER GRANTING 743 MOTION to Certify the Order Concerning Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 for Immediate Appeal Under Rule 54(b) filed by Symantec Corp. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/17/15. (ntl) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                      OPENING BRIEF in Support re 743 MOTION to Certify the Order Concerning Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 for Immediate Appeal Under Rule 54(b) re 727 Order (Unopposed) filed by Symantec Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/29/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Certify the Order Concerning Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 for Immediate Appeal Under Rule 54(b) re 727 Order (Unopposed) - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                          Remark: In entering the interim final judgment today, the Court has sided with Symantec on the two disputed issues, for the reasons stated by Symantec. (See D.I. 735 at nn.1-2). (ntl) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NON-FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/8/15. (ntl) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Trend Micro's May 11, 2015 Letter - re (224 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on May 6, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intellectual Ventures I LLC TRANSCRIPT NOT NEEDED (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 736 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. USCA Case Number 15-1677. (ntl) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of 726 Memorandum Opinion, 727 Order . Appeal filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                        PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Non-Final Judgment by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding response to Plaintiff's letter of May 6, 2015. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on April 10, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 732 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORAL ORDER: The parties' stipulation and proposed order to extend time (D.I. 730) is GRANTED and the deadline to submit a joint status report is extended to April 29, 2015. The Court will hold a status teleconference on Wednesday May 6, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. at the same time as the joint status teleconference in the related case (12-1581). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/28/15. (ntl) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a joint status report containing the parties' proposals for further proceedings and/or order(s) to April 29, 2015 - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 626 Statement, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 632 Letter, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Exhibits A-I)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 727 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER re 726 Memorandum Opinion -- 698 Motion For Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Symantec Corp. is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/22/15. (ntl) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/22/15. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 1:12-cv-01581-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by Intellectual Ventures I LLC re (183 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (722 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 724 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 698 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings -- Motion For Pantent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101-- Reply Brief in Support of Symantec Corporation's Motion for Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 filed by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                DECLARATION re 722 Answering Brief in Opposition, of John P. Lahad by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 722 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 698 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings -- Motion For Pantent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101-- filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/9/2015. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume J held on February 6, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Redaction of 719 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume I held on February 5, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015.(bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        [SEALED] Transcript of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume I held on February 5, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Redaction of 717 . Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume H held on February 4, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            [SEALED] Transcript of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume H held on February 4, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume G held on February 3, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume F held on February 2, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Redaction of 713 . Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume E held on January 30, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    [SEALED] Transcript of Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume E held on January 30, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Redaction of 711 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume D held on January 29, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        [SEALED] Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume D held on January 29, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Redaction of 709 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume C held on January 28, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            [SEALED] Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume C held on January 28, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 700 Declaration, by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B, # 2 Exhibit C - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit C - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit D - H)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 699 Opening Brief in Support, by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Redaction of 705 Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume B held on January 27, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume B held on January 27, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) Modified on 3/20/2015 (ntl). (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Redaction of 703 Transcript. Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume A held on January 26, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Official Transcript of Jury Trial - Volume A held on January 26, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) Modified on 3/20/2015 (ntl). (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 701 Reply Brief of Richard W. Hess by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 688 MOTION for Entry of Judgment and for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 698 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law -- Motion For Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101-- [Declaration of Michael J. Gerardi] by Symantec Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 4 Exhibits D-H)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 3/16/2015 (ntl). (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 698 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law -- Motion For Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101-- filed by Symantec Corp. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/30/2015. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 3/16/2015 (ntl). (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law -- Motion For Patent Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101-- - filed by Symantec Corp. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 3/16/2015 (ntl). (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 694 Declaration, of Dean G. Dunlavey in support of Symantec Corporation's Answering Brief in Opposition to Intellectual Ventures' Motion for Entry of Non-Final Judgment and for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C-D, # 3 Exhibit E-F)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 693 Answering Brief in Opposition, [Symantec Corporation's Answering Brief in Opposition to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Motion for Entry of Non-Final Judgment and for Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest] by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 693 Answering Brief in Opposition, [Declaration of W. Christopher Bakewell] by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 693 Answering Brief in Opposition, [Declaration of Dean G. Dunlaey In Support of Symantec Corporation's Answering Brief by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C-D, # 3 Exhibit E-F)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 688 MOTION for Entry of Judgment and for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest filed by Symantec Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Non-Final Judgment Following Jury Trial)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint status report (D.I. 685), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Symantec shall file its motion seeking to challenge one or more of the patents-in-suit for lack of patentable subject matter (Section 101) no later than March 13, 2015. An opening brief, not to exceed thirty (30), pages shall be due at the same time. An answering brief, not to exceed thirty (30) pages, shall be due on March 30, 2015. A reply brief shall be due on April 2, 2015. The Court will hear oral argument on the motion on April 10, 2015 beginning at 10:00 a.m., at the same time as oral argument on the motion in the related case. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/4/15. (ntl) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 691 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Letter to Counsel from Judge Stark regarding present inclinations. (ntl) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 690 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 689 Declaration, of Richard W. Hess by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] DECLARATION re 688 MOTION for Entry of Judgment and for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest of Richard W. Hess by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Entry of Judgment and for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on January 9, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on January 9, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 685 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing that jurors be provided lunch (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/13/15. (ntl) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 670 Opening Brief in Support, re 669 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity, Infringement, and Damages Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 669 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity, Infringement, and Damages Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 666 Response to Motion [Symantec's Opposition to IV's Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Dr. McDaniel's Precluded Opinions] by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 658 MEMORANDUM in Support [Opening Brief of Symantec Corporation's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Infringement & Damages under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a)] by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Jury Notes for jury trial, which began on 1/26/2015. (rpg) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated in Court on February 4, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to allow certain rebuttal testimony (D.I. 663) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/9/15. (ntl) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 677 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 676 Jury Verdict. (rpg) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] JURY VERDICT. (rpg) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED PAGE 30 to 673 FINAL Jury Instructions for jury trial, which began on 1/26/2015. (rpg) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    FINAL Jury Instructions for jury trial, which began on 1/26/2015. (rpg) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Draft Jury Instructions distributed to counsel in open Court on 2/4/2015 for jury trial, which commenced on 1/26/2015. (rpg) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 671 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        VERDICT SHEET for Jury Trial, which began on 1/26/2015. (rpg) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 669 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity, Infringement, and Damages Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) filed by Symantec Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/23/2015. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity, Infringement, and Damages Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Response to Intellectual Ventures I, LLC's Proposed Jury Instruction Concerning Comparability of License Agreements. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Comparability of License Agreements Instruction. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] RESPONSE to Motion re 663 MOTION to Allow Dr. McDaniel's Rebuttal Testimony Regarding IP Addresses and Packets filed by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT re 664 Letter Symantec's Proposed Verdict Form (Corrected) by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Verdict Form and Jury Instructions. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Verdict Form)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Allow Dr. McDaniel's Rebuttal Testimony Regarding IP Addresses and Packets - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Proposals for Jury Instructions - re 655 Proposed Jury Instructions. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 651 Letter, to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding objections to deposition designations of Messrs. Tondevold, Bennion and Stein by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Tabs 1-3)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 650 Letter, to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Flynn regarding Symantec's deposition designations by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Tabs 1-6)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 643 MOTION to Preclude [Symantec Corporation's Motion to Preclude IV from Referring to McAfee's Positions Taken During Litigation; Renewed Motion to Exclude IV-Intel Settlement Agreement; Renewedd Motion for Cautionary Jury Instruction; and A lternative Motion to Allow Symantec to Introduce Evidence of the Reexamination by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 2/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Support re 657 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law under Fed. R. P. Civ. 50(A) filed by Symantec Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/20/2015. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 2/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law under Fed. R. P. Civ. 50(A) - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 1/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      VERDICT SHEET by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Plaintiff's). (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 1/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC . (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 1/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          VERDICT SHEET by Symantec Corp. . (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 01/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Gajarsa of Latham & Watkins LLP - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Gerardi of Latham & Watkins LLP - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding objections to deposition designations of Messrs. Tondevold, Bennion and Stein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab 1, # 2 Exhibit Tab 2, # 3 Exhibit Tab 3)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Flynn regarding Symantec's deposition designations. (Attachments: # 1 Deposition Transcript, # 2 Deposition Transcript, # 3 Deposition Transcript, # 4 Deposition Transcript, # 5 Deposition Transcript, # 6 Deposition Transcript)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated in Court today, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Symantec's motion to preclude IV from taking certain positions and renewed motion to exclude certain evidence and for other relief (D.I. 643) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/26/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER: Having considered the parties' dispute with respect to the admissibility of the prosecution history of the three patents-in-suit, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that IV's objections to the admissibility of this evidence are OVERRULED. The prosecution history documents will be admitted, once they are offered into evidence consistent with the procedures set out in the pretrial order. Accordingly, as explained in Court today, either party may display and reference the prosecution history documents in its opening statement. The Court concludes that the prosecution history is relevant at least to issues of invalidity and that the risk of unfair prejudice, waste of time, and confusion (see Fed. R. Evid. 403) do not substantially outweigh the probative value of this evidence. Neither party will be permitted to use the prosecution history, or any other evidence, to reargue the Court's claim construction order. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/26/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Symantec's objections to the deposition designations of John Maddison (D.I. 641), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Symantec's objections are OVERRULED. The Court finds that the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 32(a) are satisfied, as Symantec had reasonable notice of the subpoena and John Maddison is an unavailable witness located more than 100 miles from the courthouse at which trial is occurring. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/26/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters (D.I. 632, 638), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that IV's renewed motion to preclude Symantec's fact witnesses and experts from testifying about non-infringing alternatives is DENIED. Pursuant to the Court's ruling on IV's fifth motion in limine, the Court allowed IV to take depositions of Symantec's fact witnesses on facts underlying the experts' opinions on non-infringing alternatives, in order to cure any lingering prejudice. To the extent IV now seeks reconsideration, it has failed to identify any new evidence or error in the Courts decision to deny IV's original motion. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/26/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Deposition Designation Objection. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 1/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] RESPONSE to Motion re 643 MOTION to Preclude [Symantec Corporation's Motion to Preclude IV from Referring to McAfee's Positions Taken During Litigation; Renewed Motion to Exclude IV-Intel Settlement Agreement; Renewedd Motion for Cautionary Jury Instruction; and A filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 1/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] MOTION to Preclude [Symantec Corporation's Motion to Preclude IV from Referring to McAfee's Positions Taken During Litigation; Renewed Motion to Exclude IV-Intel Settlement Agreement; Renewedd Motion for Cautionary Jury Instruction; and Alternative Motion to Allow Symantec to Introduce Evidence of the Reexamination] - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 01/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 1/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letter regarding disputes over designations regarding the testimony of Brooks Talley (D.I. 639), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) IVs first objection (pp. 16-17) is SUSTAINED, as any minimal probative value of the testimony is substantially outweighed by the risk of unfair prejudice to IV; (2) IV's second and third objections (pp. 33-34, 120-21) are OVERRULED, as the evidence is relevant for the reasons stated by Symantec and the Rule 403 balance does not support exclusion; and (3) Symatec's objection (pp. 230-31) is OVERRULED as the question is not improperly leading. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 1/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Objection to Deposition Designations for John Maddison. (Attachments: # 1 Maddison Deposition Transcript)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 1/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Concerning Patent Ownership by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 1/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Objections to Deposition Designations of Trial Witnesses. (Farnan, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2015: # 1 Exhibit A) (ntl). Modified on 1/26/2015 (ntl). (Entered: 01/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding response to IV's letter request filed earlier today [D.I. 632] - re 632 Letter,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Voir Dire Questions. (ntl) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Preliminary Jury Instructions. (ntl) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM ORDER re jury instructions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/23/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 624 Letter, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 625 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Symantec's response to Plaintiff's January 14, 2015 letter by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Fact Witnesses Testifying at Trial. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT re 626 Statement, [Symantec's Response to Intellectual Ventures' Submission on Proposed Jury Instructions re: Damages] by Symantec Corp.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 621 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding issues raised during January 9, 2015 pre-trial conference by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-J)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 622 Letter, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-K)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding jury trial scheduled to commence on January 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/21/2015. (rpg) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] STATEMENT [Symantec's Submission Regarding Its Proposed Damages Instructions Pursuant to the Court's January 9, 2015 Directive] by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] STATEMENT Intellectual Ventures' Submission on Proposed Jury Instructions Re: Damages by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Symantec's response to Plaintiff's January 14, 2015 letter - re 622 Letter,. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Symantec's January 14, 2015 Letter - re 621 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, subject to the overall limitations on time discussed with the parties at the pretrial conference, the upcoming jury trial will be held during some or all of the following times, as needed: Jan. 26, 27, 28 from 8:30 a.m. to 4:30 p.m.; Jan. 29 from 8:30 a.m. to 2:30 p.m.; Jan. 30 and Feb. 2 from 8:30 a.m. to 4:30 p.m.; Feb. 3 from 8:30 a.m. to 2:30 p.m.; Feb. 4 from 8:30 a.m. to 4:30 p.m.; Feb. 5 from 10 a.m. to 4:30 p.m.; and Feb. 6 from 8:30 a.m. to 2:30 p.m. (rpg) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Issues Raised During Pretrial Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding issues raised during January 9, 2015 pre-trial conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-J)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Max L. Tribble - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brett M. Sandford of LATHAM & WATKINS LLP - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Letter Briefing Following Pre-Trial Conference by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 616 Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Under the '155 Patent filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/12/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Under U.S. Patent No. 7,506,155 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 615 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM ORDER re rulings on various motions in limine and other pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/6/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 614 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 608 Proposed Pretrial Order,, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibits 12-14)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER - Having reviewed the proposed pretrial order (D.I. 608 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties joint request for thirty (30) hours per side for trial is DENIED. Each side will be allocated a maximum of 20-24 hours for its presentation at trial, with the specific number of hours to be determined at the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/31/14. (rwc) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court GRANTS the parties' joint request to supply potential jurors with a juror questionnaire (D.I. 611), PROVIDED that: (1) the parties confer with the Court's jury administrator about the details for providing such a document to potential jurors, including the time by which it must be done; and (2) the questionnaire to be used is modified from that submitted to the Court in that the following questions are deleted: Nos. 5a, 5b, 6a, 6b, 7a, 7b, 9a, 9b, 9c, 24, 25a, 25b, 25c, and 27. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/29/14. (ntl) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Juror Questionnaire. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Juror Questionnaire)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of 35 U.S.C. § 282 Notice filed by Symantec Corp..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey G. Homrig - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Part 1 of 3, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Part 2 of 3, # 13 Exhibit 11 - Part 3 of 3, # 14 Exhibit 12 - Part 1 of 9, # 15 Exhibit 12 - Part 2 of 9, # 16 Exhibit 12 - Part 3 of 9, # 17 Exhibit 12 - Part 4 of 9, # 18 Exhibit 12 - Part 5 of 9, # 19 Exhibit 12 - Part 6 of 9, # 20 Exhibit 12 - Part 7 of 9, # 21 Exhibit 12 - Part 8 of 9, # 22 Exhibit 12 - Part 9 of 9, # 23 Exhibit 13, # 24 Exhibit 14)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Voir Dire by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          VERDICT SHEET by Intellectual Ventures I LLC Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            VERDICT SHEET by Symantec Corp. . (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC Proposed Final Jury Instructions. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters regarding Symantec's "inten[t] to pursue its defense of invalidity for non-patentable subject matter under 34 U.S.C. § 101" (D.I. 600 at 1; see also D.I. 601), the parties are advised that they should put their proposals for how and when the Court should resolve any § 101 issues in their proposed final pretrial order. Symantec chose not to file a case-dispositive motion on § 101 grounds by the deadline for such motions, and Symantec has not filed a motion for leave to file an additional case-dispositive motion. Given that trial will commence in January 2015, that multiple patents are asserted in this action, and the Court's busy calendar between now and the start of trial, the parties' proposals for resolving § 101 issues should not contemplate resolution of these issues prior to trial. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/20/14. (ntl) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendant's November 7, 2014 Letter - re 600 Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs, Esquire regarding Trend Micro Defendants 11/6/2014 Motion for Leave to File Judgment on the Pleadings in C.A. No. 12-1581. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph H. Lee of LATHAM & WATKINS LLP - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order Amending Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove William W. Yu as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with Latham & Watkins LLP. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/9/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/19/2014. A 10-day Jury Trial is set for 1/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/11/14. (ntl) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of (592 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 151 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Declaration, by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Intel Corporation, Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION regarding Pretrial and Trial Dates by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Defendants' motion to sever and stay this action with respect to a patent that is in reexamination proceedings (D.I. 582), as well as Defendants' opening brief (D.I. 583) and declaration (D.I. 584), Plaintiffs' answering brief (D.I. 586) and declaration (D.I. 587), and Defendants' reply brief (D.I. 591) and declaration (D.I. 592), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion is DENIED for the following reasons. Awaiting final resolution of the ongoing reexam offers the potential of some (but not complete) simplification, but this factor only slightly favors a stay, as only 2 of the 4 patents-in-suit are in reexam, so (as Plaintiffs point out) "severing and staying the patents in reexam will not reduce the number of trials but may double the number of trials." (D.I. 586 at 9) Discovery is complete and a trial date is now set (and only weeks ago all parties jointly proposed trial dates, without any indication Defendants would seek a partial stay), and more generally the stage or proceedings disfavors a stay, particularly as Defendants' request comes so close to trial and after all sides and the Court have invested enormous resources in this case. The Court is not persuaded that Defendants are not seeking an unfair tactical advantage, and Defendants have articulated no persuasive grounds for finding they will be prejudiced by proceeding to trial on essentially the schedule they themselves very recently proposed, further disfavoring a stay. Plaintiffs would be prejudiced from a stay, given the possibility of additional trials and the consequent delay in achieving resolution of this litigation. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, after reviewing the parties' joint status reports (D.I. 580, 588), that trial in the IV/Symantec action will be held between January 26 and February 6, 2015 and trial in the IV/Trend Micro action will be held between May 11 and May 22, 2015. The parties in each action shall meet and confer and SUBMIT, no later than June 9, proposed scheduling orders leading to these trial dates. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/3/14. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 1:12-cv-01581-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re (150 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Reply Brief, (591 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) Reply Brief -- Declaration of Michael J. Flynn -- by Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits G-K)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF re 582 MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims Related to U.S. Patent No. 6,460,050 Pending Conclusion of Inter Partes Examination filed by Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Incorporated. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 587 Declaration, of Weston O'Black by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 586 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT Responsive to May 15, 2014 Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 586 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Weston O'Black by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 582 MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims Related to U.S. Patent No. 6,460,050 Pending Conclusion of Inter Partes Examination filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' joint status report (C.A. 10-1067 D.I. 580) and the Court's calendar, the Court intends to try these cases on the following dates: (i) IV1 v. Symantec October 6-17, 2014; and (ii) IV1 v Trend January 26-February 6, 2015. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit, no later than May 20, 2014, schedules to work toward these trial dates and/or advise the Court whether there are any irreconcilable conflicts preventing any party from proceeding to trial on these dates. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/15/14. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 1:12-cv-01581-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re (141 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS, 582 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims Related to U.S. Patent No. 6,460,050 Pending Conclusion of Inter Partes Examination -- Declaration of Michael J. Flynn -- by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 582 MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims Related to U.S. Patent No. 6,460,050 Pending Conclusion of Inter Partes Examination filed by Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/19/2014. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims Related to U.S. Patent No. 6,460,050 Pending Conclusion of Inter Partes Examination - filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 577 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 579 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION of 573 Memorandum Opinion. (ntl) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline to submit a Joint Status Report to 4/15/2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Proposed Redactions to the March 31, 2014 Memorandum Opinion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline to submit redactions to the Court's March 31, 2014 Memorandum Opinion to 4/9/2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Douglas E. Lumish - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 574 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re (133 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS, 573 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) Memorandum Opinion re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/31/14. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 1:12-cv-01581-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/31/14.This order has been emailed to local counsel. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 1:12-cv-01581-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Mark A. Flagel as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer at firm. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Supplemental Authority concerning IV's Response to Symantec's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims - re 451 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that within the earlier of either sixty (60) days after decisions on the Daubert and summary judgment motions in the matter of 10-1067-LPS, or thirty (30) days after entry of claim construction in the matter of 13-440-LPS, the parties shall provide, in separate, confidential emails to Judge Thynge, a status report and advise how the decision(s) affects the positions/views of the parties regarding mediation, with a brief explanation why. A copy of the emails shall be forwarded to Judge Thynges Judicial Administrator, Ms. Cathleen Kennedy. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/17/13. (cak) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 569 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Official Transcript of Oral Argument held on August 29, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (bpg) (Main Document 569 replaced on 3/11/2014) (ntl). Modified on 3/11/2014 (ntl). (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of (567 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 129 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Declaration of Michael J. Flynn by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] DECLARATION of Michael J. Flynn by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Letter to Judge Stark)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] STATEMENT re 538 Answering Brief in Opposition, 536 Answering Brief in Opposition IV 1's Supplement and Correction to Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 552 Declaration of Aviel Rubin, Ph.D. by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 551 Declaration of Kathy Yu by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits PP through SS)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 549 Declaration, of Kathy Yu by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits L through N)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 562 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 548 Reply Brief in Support of Its Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Intellectual Ventures' Damages Expert, Michael Wagner by Symantec Corp.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 561 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 550 Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment by Symantec Corp.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 555 Declaration of Richard W. Hess by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 559 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 554 Reply Brief re 514 MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Three Opinions of Symantec Damages Expert W. Christopher Bakewell by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 556 Declaration, of Weston O'Black by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 553 Reply Brief, re 517 MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Symantec's Expert's Opinions Regarding an "Indication of a Characteristic" and Related Claim Terms and "Technically Relevant" Patents by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 553 Reply Brief, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Farnan, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2013: # 6 Declaration) (rpg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2013: # 7 Declaration) (rpg). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 554 Reply Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 514 MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Three Opinions of Symantec Damages Expert W. Christopher Bakewell filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 517 MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Symantec's Expert's Opinions Regarding an "Indication of a Characteristic" and Related Claim Terms and "Technically Relevant" Patents filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re 550 Reply Brief, 508 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Declaration of Aviel Rubin, Ph.D. by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] DECLARATION re 550 Reply Brief, 508 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Declaration of Kathy Yu -- by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PP-SS)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 508 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 548 Reply Brief, 511 MOTION to Preclude -- Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Intellectual Ventures' Damages Expert, Michael Wagner -- Declaration of Kathy Yu -- by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits L-N)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 511 MOTION to Preclude -- Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Intellectual Ventures' Damages Expert, Michael Wagner filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 539 Declaration,, of Richard W. Hess by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-T)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 546 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 538 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 537 Declaration,, of John P. Lahad by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-26)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 536 Answering Brief in Opposition by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 532 Declaration, by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 531 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 534 Declaration, by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-J)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 533 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re 538 Answering Brief in Opposition, Richard W. Hess by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 511 MOTION to Preclude -- Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Intellectual Ventures' Damages Expert, Michael Wagner filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] DECLARATION re 536 Answering Brief in Opposition of John P. Lahad by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 26)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 508 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 519 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Four Symantec Affirmative Defenses [Symantec Corporation's Response and Statement of Non-Opposition to IV's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Four Symantec Affirmative Defenses] filed by Symantec Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2013. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 533 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Motion to Exclude Symantec's Expert's Opinions Regarding An "Indication of a Characteristic" and Related Claim Terms and "Technically Relevant" Patents (of Neil A. Rubin) by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through J)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 517 MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Symantec's Expert's Opinions Regarding an "Indication of a Characteristic" and Related Claim Terms and "Technically Relevant" Patents filed by Symantec Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2013. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 531 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Motion to Exclude Three Opinions of Symantec Damages Expert W. Christopher Bakewell (of Kathy Yu) by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through Q (Part 1), # 2 Exhibits A through Q (Part 2))(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 514 MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Three Opinions of Symantec Damages Expert W. Christopher Bakewell filed by Symantec Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2013. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on all pending motions, in both 10-1067 and 12-1581, on August 29, 2013 beginning at 10 a.m. Both sides will be allocated up to two (2) hours to present argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/10/13. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 1:12-cv-01581-LPS(ntl) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to the request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery teleconference scheduled for 6/28/13 at 12:15 PM is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/25/13. (ntl) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 510 Declaration,, re 508 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Appendix of Records and Declaration of William W. Yu -- by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-L, # 2 Exhibits M-O, # 3 Exhibits P-S, # 4 Exhibits T-Z, # 5 Exhibits AA-CC, # 6 Exhibit DD, # 7 Exhibit EE Part 1 of 3, # 8 Exhibit EE Part 2of 3, # 9 Exhibit EE Part 3 of 3, # 10 Exhibits FF-OO)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 527 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 509 Opening Brief in Support re 508 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 515 Opening Brief in Support,, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-14, # 2 Exhibit 15)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 525 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 513 Declaration, -- Declaration of Michael J. Flynn -- by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 509 Opening Brief in Support by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 520 Opening Brief in Support, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Four Symantec Affirmative Defenses by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-8)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 518 Opening Brief in Support,, IV1's Motion to Exclude Symantec's Expert's Opinions Regarding an "Indication of a Characteristic" and Related Claim Terms and "Technically Relevant" Patents by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Discovery Teleconference is set for 6/28/2013 at 12:15 PM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/21/13. (ntl) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 519 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Four Symantec Affirmative Defenses filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 519 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Four Symantec Affirmative Defenses - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 517 MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Symantec's Expert's Opinions Regarding an "Indication of a Characteristic" and Related Claim Terms and "Technically Relevant" Patents filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Symantec's Expert's Opinions Regarding an "Indication of a Characteristic" and Related Claim Terms and "Technically Relevant" Patents - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 515 Opening Brief in Support,, of Richard W. Hess by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 514 MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Three Opinions of Symantec Damages Expert W. Christopher Bakewell filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Preclude - IV1's Motion to Exclude Three Opinions of Symantec Damages Expert W. Christopher Bakewell - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] DECLARATION re 511 MOTION to Preclude -- Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Intellectual Ventures' Damages Expert, Michael Wagner -- Declaration of Michael J. Flynn -- by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B, # 2 Exhibits C-K)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 511 MOTION to Preclude -- Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Intellectual Ventures' Damages Expert, Michael Wagner filed by Symantec Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 511 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Preclude -- Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Intellectual Ventures' Damages Expert, Michael Wagner - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 508 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Appendix of Records and Declaration of William W. Yu -- by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Pages 1-18 - Exhibits A-E, # 2 Pages 19 - 71 - Exhibits F-I, # 3 Pages 72-130 - Exhibits J-L, # 4 Pages 131-155 - Exhibit M, # 5 Pages 156-175 - Exhibit N, # 6 Pages 176-205 - Exhibits O-Q, # 7 Pages 206-305 - Exhibits R-S, # 8 Pages 306-411 - Exhibits T-Z, # 9 Pages 412-487 - Exhibits AA-CC, # 10 Pages 488-498 - Exhibit DD, # 11 Pages 499-518 - Exhibit EE Part 1, # 12 Pages 519-537 - Exhibit EE Part 2, # 13 Pages 538-556 - Exhibit EE Part 3, # 14 Pages 557-687 - Exhibits FF-JJ, # 15 Pages 688-886 - Exhibits KK-OO)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 508 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Symantec Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/1/2013. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 508 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Aviel Rubin on the Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,987,610 and 7,506,155 by Symantec Corp..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadlines for Briefing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions to Various Dates - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 498 MOTION Defendants' Motion For Leave To Supplement The Record To Address Recently Developed Facts Regarding Their Motion For Clarification Of The Courts Construction Of "Within The Telephone Network" filed by Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 503 Response to Motion, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] RESPONSE to Motion re 498 MOTION Defendants' Motion For Leave To Supplement The Record To Address Recently Developed Facts Regarding Their Motion For Clarification Of The Courts Construction Of "Within The Telephone Network" filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on April 18, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2013. (bpg) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 501 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/3/13. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 1:12-cv-01581-LPS(ntl) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Subpoenas to Gil Chilton and Steven Yuen-Lam Lau by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT re (63 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS, 498 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) MOTION Defendants' Motion For Leave To Supplement The Record To Address Recently Developed Facts Regarding Their Motion For Clarification Of The Courts Construction Of "Within The Telephone Network" -- D. Del. LR 7.1.1 Statement -- by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Defendants' Motion For Leave To Supplement The Record To Address Recently Developed Facts Regarding Their Motion For Clarification Of The Courts Construction Of "Within The Telephone Network" - filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER Schedule for Fact and Expert Discovery by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Intel Corporation, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden)(Louden, Karen) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit an Order to implement the Court's April 18, 2013 ruling to April 24, 2013 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Symantec Corp.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of (493 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 58 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Exhibit to a Document -- Exhibits A, D, E, & F -- by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Symantec Corp.. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' April 11, 2013 Letter - re 492 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] EXHIBIT re (57 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS, 492 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) Letter -- Exhibits A, D, E, and F -- by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Symantec Corp.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B & C)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice between Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Check Point Software Technologies Inc. and Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Discovery Teleconference is set for 4/18/2013 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/5/13. (ntl) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for the exchange of expert reports between Plaintiff and Check Point Defendants to Expert Reports - April 12, 2013; Rebuttal Expert Reports - May 17, 2013; and Reply Expert Reports - May 29, 2013 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 481 Declaration, DECLARATION OF YURY KAPGAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 487 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 480 Reply Brief DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Symantec Corp.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for the exchange of expert reports between Plaintiff and Check Point Defendants to Expert Reports - March 22, 2013; Rebuttal Expert Reports - April 24, 2013; and Reply Expert Reports - May 8, 2013 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of (46 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS, 483 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) Declaration, by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of (482 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) Reply Brief, (45 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Reply Brief by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] DECLARATION re (482 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) Reply Brief, (45 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Sanctions for Spoliating Evidence by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S)(Louden, Karen) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 454 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliating Evidence filed by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] DECLARATION re 480 Reply Brief DECLARATION OF YURY KAPGAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6-7)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 451 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Symantec Corp.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Victoria L. Cook as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Susman Godfrey L.L.P.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Extend Deadline for the Exchange of Expert Reports between Intellectual Ventures and Check Point to Opening Reports: March 15, 2013; Answering Reports: April 17, 2013; Reply Reports: May 1, 2013 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 453 Declaration, DECLARATION OF YURY KAPGAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-J, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L-DD)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 476 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 452 Opening Brief in Support, DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Symantec Corp.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 470 Declaration of Brian Platt by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 466 Declaration, of Michael J. Farnan by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Q)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 465 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 464 Declaration,, of Weston O'Black by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-O)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 463 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 465 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Brian Platt, Esq. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 465 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Paul G. Nagy, Esq. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to file reply briefs to March 1, 2013 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Between Plaintiff and Check Point to Extend Opening, Rebuttal, and Reply Expert Report Deadlines to March 1, 2013, April 3, 2013, and April 17, 2013 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] DECLARATION re 465 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Michael J. Farnan by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 454 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliating Evidence filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re 463 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Weston O'Black by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G - Part 1 of 3, # 8 Exhibit G - Part 2 of 3, # 9 Exhibit G - Part 3 of 3, # 10 Exhibit H - Part 1 of 2, # 11 Exhibit H - Part 2 of 2, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 451 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion for Clarification of the Court's Construction of "Within the Telephone Network". (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION amending Second Amended Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 437 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Clarification of the Court's Construction of "Within the Telephone Network" filed by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of (456 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 24 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Declaration, by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - R)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of (455 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (23 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND deadline for Plaintiff's Opposition to Symantec's Motion to Amend and Defendants' Motion for Sanctions to 2/11/2013 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re (454 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 22 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliating Evidence -- Declaration of Jack B. Blumenfeld -- by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D, # 2 Exhibit E - I, # 3 Exhibit J - M, # 4 Exhibit N - P (Part 1), # 5 Exhibit P (Part 2) - R)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 454 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliating Evidence filed by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 454 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliating Evidence - filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 451 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS [Declaration of Yury Kapgan in Support] by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I, # 2 Exhibit J-M, # 3 Exhibit N-Q, # 4 Exhibit R-DD)(Grimm, Thomas) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/1/2013) (ntl). (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 451 MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Symantec Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/4/2013. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File DEFENDANT SYMANTEC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 449 Answering Brief in Opposition, of John P. Lahad by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 437 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Clarification of the Court's Construction of "Within the Telephone Network" filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/25/2013. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 3, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Heather Triozzi of Hawkins Reporting Service,Telephone number (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2013. (bpg) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters relating to discovery disputes (D.I. 428, 429, 430, 433, 434, 435), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff's request that the Court strike two "untimely-disclosed" prior art references is DENIED; (2) Plaintiff's request that Trend produce trial exhibits from the "Prism" case is GRANTED; (3) Plaintiff's request that Trend be ordered to produce a 30(b)(6) witness who can explain internal operations of the core engines is GRANTED; and (4) Defendants' request for a half-day deposition of Plaintiff's Mr. Jung is GRANTED. No portion of the discovery teleconference to be held on January 3, 2013 beginning at 11:45 am will be devoted to argument on the preceding disputes. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/2/13. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 1:12-cv-01581-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 435 Letter, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 434 Letter, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 430 Letter, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of (433 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 7 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Letter, by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Intel Corporation, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-T)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED, re 436 Second Amended Scheduling Order (only deadlines for expert reports amended and court's recent rulings regarding depositions incorporated). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/27/2012. (rpg) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of (428 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS, 4 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Letter by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - T)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of (5 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS, 429 in 1:10-cv-01067-LPS) Letter by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re (10 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) MOTION Defendants' Motion for Clarification of the Court's Construction of "Within the Telephone Network" by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Intel Corporation, Symantec Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 437 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Clarification of the Court's Construction of "Within the Telephone Network" filed by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Intel Corporation, Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/14/2013. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Defendants' Motion for Clarification of the Court's Construction of "Within the Telephone Network" - filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated, Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Intel Corporation, McAfee Inc., Symantec Corp.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Amending Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Check Point's December 20, 2012 Letter - re 429 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendants' December 20, 2012 Letter - re 428 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to plaintiff's December 20, 2012 letter concerning discovery dispute - re (6 in 1:12-cv-01581-LPS) Letter,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibits G-H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibits J-T)(Louden, Karen) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/2/2013) (ntl). (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: Mediation conferences in this matter are scheduled for 1/17/2013 and 3/12/2013. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/21/12. (cak) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Service of Subpoena Directed to John A. Maddison by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding January 3, 2013 discovery conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding issues for January 3, 2013 discovery conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-M, # 2 Exhibits N-T)(Louden, Karen) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on November 20, 2012 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2013. (bpg) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 425 Memorandum Opinion re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/12/12. (ntl) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 425 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/12/12. (ntl) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Responses and Objections to Defendants' Rule 45 Subpoena and Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition Notice by Intel Corporation (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on November 8, 2012 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/20/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2013. (bpg) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Symantec Corporation's Written Objections to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I, LLC's Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by Symantec Corp..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kathy Yu - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Answers and Objections to Symantec Corp.'s First Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Discovery Teleconference is set for 1/3/2013 at 11:45 AM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/27/12. (ntl) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Symantec's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Common Interrogatory Nos. 3, 5-7, 12-13, 15-16 and Interrogatory Nos. 1-4 to Symantec by Symantec Corp..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Trend Micro's First Supplemental Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories; and 2) Trend Micro's Supplemental Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Common Interrogatories by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Symantec Corporation Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Symantec Corp..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's Amended Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure; (ii) Plaintiff's Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories; (iii) Plaintiff's Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories; (iv) Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Answers and Objections to Trend Micro's Interrogatory No. 2; (v) Plaintiff's Amended Answers and Objections to Symantec Corp.'s First Set of Interrogatories; (vi) Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories No. 2; and (vii) Plaintiff's Fifth Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., and Check Point Software Technologies, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 5) by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Eighth Supplemental Responses To Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set Of Interrogatories (No. 1); (2) Defendants' List Of Thirty Prior Art References by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 412 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 300 Motion to Sever; denying 300 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/21/2012. (rpg) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Trend Micro's Second Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. and Check Point Software Technologies, Inc.'s Response to Intellectual Ventures I, LLC's Third Set of Requests for Production by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Trend Micro's Objections and Responses to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Fourth Set of Requests for Production by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Symantec's Responses to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Fourth Set of Requests for Production by Symantec Corp..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER incorporating the instructions given at the November 8, 2012 oral argument by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. and Check Point Software Technologies, Inc.'s Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William W. Yu - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER -- Discovery due by 11/21/2012, Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/9/12. (ntl) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoena of Richard Bennion by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories No. 2 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Supplemental DECLARATION re 300 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California of Stuart Bartow by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 7, # 2 Exhibits 8 through 15)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER Amended Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bryan K. James of McDermott Will & Emery LLP - filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 12/20/12 at 3:30 PM Eastern Time. Jack B. Blumenfeld, Esquire shall initiate the teleconference call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/1/2012. (cak) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) of Symantec Corp. on November 20, 2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoenas Served on Chris Kuivenhoven and John Haynes by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle P. Woodhouse - filed by Symantec Corp.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures I LLC Personnel on dates as outlined in notice by Symantec Corp..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Amended Answers and Objections to Trend Micro, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories No. 2 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures I LLC Personnel on dates as outlined in notice by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Check Point Software Technologies, Inc.'s Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Check Point; (ii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Trend Micro; and (iii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Fourth Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Symantec Corporation by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of SUBPOENA (William Ryan Clark) by Symantec Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Trend Micro's Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Barrie Tondevold on October 26, 2012 by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 10/24/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/16/2012. (cak) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SO ORDERED, re 382 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to McAfee Inc. -- McAfee Inc. terminated; Attorney Anita Kadala; Olivia M. Kim; Edward G. Poplawski; Benjamin J. Schladweiler; Collins J. Seitz, Jr; Vernon M. Winters; Bryan K. Anderson and Sandra S. Fujiyama terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/12/12. (ntl) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Between Intellectual Ventures I LLC and McAfee, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoena directed to Hilgraeve, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures I LLC pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on October 22, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Kosiara on November 9, 2012 by Symantec Corp..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Trend Micro Incorporated and Trend Micro, Inc. (USA) on October 22, 2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Chen, Quoc Ta, Sichao Wang, Franz S. Hinner, Lisa Lee, and Sandi Meyer on October 23, 2012, October 24, 2012, October 25, 2012, October 26, 2012, October 29, 2012, and October 30, 2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoena of Don Gibson by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant Symantec's Responses to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Common Interrogatories and 2) Symantec's Responses to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Symantec by Symantec Corp..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff IV1's Response to Trend Micro's First Set of Requests for Admission; (ii) Plaintiff's Answers and Objections to Trend Second Set of Interrogatories; (iii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Responses and Objections to Trend Micro's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents; (iv) Plaintiff's Answers and Objections to Symantec Corp.'s First Set of Interrogatories; (v) Plaintiff's Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set Request for Admission; and (vi) Plaintiff's Answers and Objections to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Trend Micro's Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and (2) Trend Micro's Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Common Interrogatories by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. and Check Point Software Technologies, Inc.'s Responses to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9-15) by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena of FRNK Technology Group by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., Check Point Software Technologies, Inc., McAfee Inc., Symantec Corporation, Trend Micro Incorporated and Trend Micro, Inc. (USA)'s Seventh Supplemental Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of of Subpoena upon Innovation Management Sciences, LLC by McAfee Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on August 31, 2012 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter: Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2012. (bpg) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER: Regarding the filing of case dispositive motions, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each party is permitted to file as many case dispositive motions as desired; provided, however, that each party will be limited to a combined total of 40 pages for all opening briefs, a combined total of 40 pages for all answering briefs, and a combined total of 20 pages for all reply briefs regardless of the number of case dispositive motions that are filed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/20/12.(ntl) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoenas upon Fred J. Geiger, Robert G. Hook and Mark Raymond Pace by McAfee Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Fred Kost on October 10, 2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vijay Seshadri and Adam Glick on October 8, 2012 and October 9, 2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear argument on the pending motion to sever and transfer on November 8, 2012 beginning at 1:00 p.m. Each side will be allocated up to 30 minutes to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/12.(ntl) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Harris on September 14, 2012 by Symantec Corp..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Harris on September 14, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of RICHARD HARRIS on September 14, 2012 by McAfee Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena upon William Ryan Clark by McAfee Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edgar Sargent and Victoria L. Cook of Susman Godfrey L.L.P. - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendant Check Point's First Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena upon Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC by McAfee Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Mailshell, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 300 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David F. McGowan - filed by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 349 Exhibit to a Document by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Trend Micro's August 27, 2012 Letter - re 343 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 349 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED EXHIBIT re 348 Letter, EXHIBIT E -- by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Plaintiff's August 27, 2012 letter - re 342 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A - Part 6, # 7 Exhibit A - Part 7, # 8 Exhibit A - Part 8, # 9 Exhibit A - Part 9, # 10 Exhibit B, # 11 Exhibit C, # 12 Exhibit D)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to McAfee's August 27, 2012 Letter - re 341 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Plaintiff's August 27, 2012 letter (D.I. 342). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Louden, Karen) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel K. Greene of McDermott Will & Emery LLP - filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 344 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED EXHIBIT re 343 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding request for two-month extension of fact discovery deadline (Exhibit C) by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding request for two-month extension of fact discovery deadline - to November 21, 2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Louden, Karen) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding Discovery Dispute - re 333 Order Setting Teleconference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on August 9, 2012 before Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2012. (bpg) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's First Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories Nos. 4, 5, and 6; and (ii) Plaintiff's First Supplemental Answers and Objections to Defendant McAfee, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 2-4) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Check Point Software Technologies Inc. and Check Point Software Technologies Ltd.; (ii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant McAfee, Inc.; (iii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Symantec; (iv) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Trend Micro; and (v) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Symantec Corp.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Symantec Corp..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff and (ii) Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., McAfee Inc., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Trend Micro's First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC; (2) Trend Micro's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC; and (3) Trend Micro's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Intellectual Ventures I LLC by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Service of Defendant McAfee, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Nos. 5-10) by McAfee Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Discovery Teleconference is set for 8/31/2012 at 11:30 AM. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/21/12. (ntl) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Service regarding Defendant McAfee Inc.'s First Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by McAfee Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoenas upon iPCapital Group, Inc. and Jolokai Networks by McAfee Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 300 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoenas directed to Pacific Crest Securities LLC and J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Lodging by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., McAfee Inc., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Patent '155 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Patent '155 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Patent '050, # 4 Exhibit Patent '142, # 5 Exhibit Patent '610 - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit Patent '610 - Part 2)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sixth Supplemental Responses to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., McAfee Inc., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Claim Construction. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoena Directed to Lehman Brothers Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Subpoena Directed to Citigroup, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Check Point Software Technologies, Ltd. and Check Point Software Technologies Inc.'s Supplemental Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 5) by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. and Check Point Software Technologies, Inc.'s Notice of 30(b)(6) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. and Check Point Software Technologies, Inc. on 8/17/2012 - Revised by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Responses and Objections to McAfee, Inc.'s Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 97-196 [Incorrectly Numbered as Nos. 97-186]) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Russell E. Cass - filed by McAfee Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service of Defendant McAfee, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Revised Notice of Deposition to McAfee Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) by McAfee Inc. re 236 Notice (Other), (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney D. Stuart Bartow - filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Defendants' Objections to the Declaration of Dr. Patrick McDaniel (D.I. 298) - re 298 Objections,. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Teleconference (Counsel for Trend Micro to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 9/11/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of the case, mechanics of mediation, etc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/7/2012. (cak) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoenas by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-17)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of McAfee, Inc. - Revised by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. and Check Point Software Technologies, Inc. on 8/17/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Defendants' August 6, 2012 Letter - re 309 Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding pending claim construction hearing. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman Hearing scheduled for 8/9/2012 at 9:00 AM will hereby begin at 9:30 AM on 8/9/12. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/6/12. (ntl) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Interim STATUS REPORT by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Don Merino, Ryan Clark, Jim Weisfield, Sanjay Prasad, Greg Kisor, Peter Detkin and Nathan Myhrvold on August 22, 2012, August 23, 2012, August 24, 2012, August 28, 2012, August 29, 2012, August 30, 2012 and August 31, 2012, respectively by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., McAfee Inc., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoenas upon Don Merino, Ryan Clark, Jim Weisfield, Sanjay Prasad, Greg Kisor, Peter Detkin and Nathan Myhrvold by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., McAfee Inc., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoenas upon Aldi Inc., Brown Shoe Co., Edward J. Franczek, Eugene Lee, Charles Digate and SafeNet, Inc. by McAfee Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendants Trend Micro Incorporated and Trend Micro, Inc.'s (USA) Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 300 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California of Stuart Bartow by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 301 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 300 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/20/2012. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Sever , MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - filed by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on July 10, 2012 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2012. (bpg) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd., McAfee Inc., Symantec Corp., Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated to 241 Declaration of Dr. Patrick McDaniel. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant McAfee's Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition; and (ii) Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant Symantec Corp.'s Notice of 30(b)(6) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding Second Supplemental Declaration of Vernon M. Winters In Support Of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief - re 224 Claim Construction Opening Brief, 225 Declaration,. (Attachments: # 1 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Check Point Software Technologies, Ltd. and Check Point Software Technologies Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration (D.I. 205 ) ("Motion"), which is now pressed only by the Trend Micro Defendants (D.I. 285 , 290 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED, without prejudice to Trend Micro renewing its request for transfer if the Court severs Trend Micro from this action. The Motion was predicated upon the view that "the Federal Circuit's decision in Link_A_Media warrants reconsideration of the Court's denial of Defendants' motion to transfer." (D.I. 205 at 1) Subsequently, the Federal Circuit issued its decision denying mandamus in In re Altera Corp., Misc. No. 121, slip op. (July 20, 2012). See generally Motion at 5-6 ("Defendants respectfully suggest that the Court may wish to defer proceedings on this motion pending the Federal Circuit's action in the Altera case, which may be helpful to resolution of the instant motion."); D.I. 285 at 1 ("In light of Altera, Defendants McAfee, Checkpoint and Symantec withdraw from this [M]otion."). Accordingly, the Court finds no basis on the present record for granting the reconsideration sought by Trend Micro. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/30/12. (ntl) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoenas served on Micron Technology, Inc.; Microsoft Corporation; Sony Corporation of America; Unisys Corporation; and Xilinx, Inc. by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoenas, # 2 Patents and Protective Order)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Trend Micro's July 25, 2012 Letter - re 290 Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures I LLC pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) on August 14, 2012 by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding Court's Oral Order of July 23, 2012 - re 284 Order,. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding July 23, 2012 Order - re 284 Order,. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of McAfee, Inc. on August 13, 2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoenas of Sequoia Holdings, LLC, The Reading Hospital and Medical Center and Verizon Corporate Services Group by Symantec Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Tab 1, # 2 Tab 2, # 3 Tab 3)(Murphy, Regina) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Check Point Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures LLC's Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding Informing the Court that Defendants McAfee, Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. and Symantec Corporation withdraw from the pending Venue Reconsideration Motion - re 205 MOTION for Reconsideration re 95 Order, . (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: In light of the Federal Circuit's decision in In re Altera Corporation, Misc. Docket No. 121 (July 20, 2012), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are to submit letter briefs addressing the impact, if any, of the Federal Circuit's decision on the pending motion for reconsideration (D.I. 205 ). Each side shall submit a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, no later than Wednesday, July 25, 2012. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/23/12. (ntl) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoenas by Symantec Corp. (Murphy, Regina) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoenas served on Apple Inc.; Ocean Tomo LLC; and Oracle Corporation by Check Point Software Technologies Inc., Check Point Software Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoenas (Tabs 1-3), # 2 Exhibit A-E)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoenas served on Allen SBH Investments LLC; Brown University; Bush Foundation; Commonfund Capital Venture Partners VII, L.P.; Cornell University; Detelle Relay KG, LLC; Dore Capital, L.P.; Flag Capital Management, LLC; The Flora Family Foundation; Grinnell College; The William and Flora Hewlett Foundation; Howard Hughes Medical Institute; Legacy Venture; Mayo Clinic; Mayo Foundation Retirement Trust; Next Generation Partners V, L.P.; Noregin Assets N.V., L.L.C.; OC Applications Research LLC; The Rockefeller Foundation; Roldan Block N.Y., LLC; SAP America, Inc.; The Skillman Foundation; TIFF Advisory Services, Inc.; Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania; University of Minnesota; and The Vanderbilt University by Symantec Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoenas (Tabs 1-26), # 2 Exhibit A-E)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures I LLC on August 1, 2012 by Symantec Corp..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding Joint Status Letter regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the letter request for an extension to file the joint status letter by 7/17/12 is GRANTED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/16/12. (ntl) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of -- Rule 30(b)(6) to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC on August 3, 2012 by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated.(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Websense, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Flynn regarding status of discovery disputes. (Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding request for an extension to July 17, 2012 to file the Joint Status Letter - re 255 Letter. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 264 Exhibit to a Document by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 258 Exhibit to a Document by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding request for ruling on Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration - re 205 MOTION for Reconsideration re 95 Order, . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Louden, Karen) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena to Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC. by McAfee Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena to Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Service regarding McAfee, Inc.'s Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Nos. 97-186) by McAfee Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: Per the parties' request (D.I. 252 ), the Markman hearing is rescheduled for August 9, 2012 beginning at 9:00 a.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/11/12. (ntl) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures I LLC on August 1, 2012 by McAfee Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Trend Micro's July 5, 2012 Letter - re 257 Letter,. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 2, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to McAfee's July 5. 2012 Letter - re 255 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 264 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED EXHIBIT re 263 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (EXHIBIT 6) by Trend Micro Inc. (USA), Trend Micro Incorporated. (Louden, Karen) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs Louden regarding response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel - re 256 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6 (EXHIBIT 6 FILED SEPARATELY UNDER SEAL))(Louden, Karen) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,020 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?