ALS Scan, Inc. v. Global Innovations, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-01028
Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo ALS Scan, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by lombardolegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L Lombardo ROBERT@LOMBARDOLEGAL.COM
v.
No Logo Chris Fernandez, Defendant

Represented by Law Office of Rensburg and McGill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly Lynn McGill +1 301 620 4333 +1 301 620 0466 Kelly@remsburgandmcgill.com

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent M Ahalt +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 bahalt@mhlawyers.com

Represented by Online Media Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Hernan Carreon +1 541 482 2321 +1 541 482 4683
No Logo Equinix, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Perry Palan +1 202 289 1313 +1 202 289 1330 PPalan@BTLaw.com
No Logo Global Innovations, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/03/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P Bricken +1 301 694 5850 +1 301 694 5852

Represented by Greenberg & Lieberman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stevan H Lieberman +1 202 625 7000 +1 202 625 7001 stevan@aplegal.com

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent M Ahalt +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 bahalt@mhlawyers.com

Represented by Online Media Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/04/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Hernan Carreon +1 541 482 2321 +1 541 482 4683
No Logo Ramsey Lamerson, Defendant

Represented by Greenberg & Lieberman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stevan H Lieberman +1 202 625 7000 +1 202 625 7001 stevan@aplegal.com

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent M Ahalt +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 bahalt@mhlawyers.com

Represented by Online Media Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/04/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Hernan Carreon +1 541 482 2321 +1 541 482 4683
No Logo Victor Allen Hannan, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/05/2004, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ardra Monique O'Neal +1 703 714 7400 +1 703 714 7410

Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/05/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francine Elizabeth Friedman +1 202 955 1500 +1 202 778 2201 ffriedman@hunton.com

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent M Ahalt +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 bahalt@mhlawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
No Logo Wiltel Communications, Defendant

Represented by Fiske & Harvey PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip John Harvey +1 703 518 9910 +1 703 518 9931 PHarvey@FiskeHarvey.com

Represented by Venable LLP

Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (145) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING 144 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by ALS Scan, Inc., Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson, Chris Fernandez. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 2/27/06. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ALS Scan, Inc., Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson, Chris Fernandez (Ahalt, Brent) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
Correspondence re: settlement of all claims (Ahalt, Brent) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 141 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 137 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Fernandez, Lamerson and Global Innovations, Inc. Responses due by 2/21/2006. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 2/3/06. (Gauvey, Susan) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 137 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Fernandez, Lamerson and Global Innovations, Inc. by Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson, Chris Fernandez. Responses due by 2/21/2006 (Ahalt, Brent) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 139 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 137 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Fernandez, Lamerson and Global Innovations, Inc. and Request for Leave of Court to File Such Response Responses due by 2/6/2006, however, response limited to amount of appropriate damages as no sufficient basis provided for failure to respond on timely basis to motion for default or order to show cause.. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 1/24/06. (Gauvey, Susan) (Entered: 01/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 137 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Fernandez, Lamerson and Global Innovations, Inc. and Request for Leave of Court to File Such Response by Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson, Chris Fernandez. Responses due by 2/9/2006 (Ahalt, Brent) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Brent M Ahalt on behalf of Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson, Chris Fernandez (Ahalt, Brent) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Fernandez, Lamerson and Global Innovations, Inc. by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 12/15/2005 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESSORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document until November 28, 2005. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 10/28/2005. (Gauvey, Susan) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 11/14/2005 (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER ORDER RE: Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 10/13/05. (slf, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER SETTING date for a Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 7/19/05. (c/m Chambers 7/19/05) (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None
Supplemental MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Lamerson, Global and Fernandez by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 7/28/2005 (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALS Scan, Inc. re 128 Order as to Defendant Chris Fernandez (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALS Scan, Inc. re 128 Order as to Defendants Global Innovations, Inc. and Ramsey Lamerson (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING 127 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by ALS Scan, Inc., Victor Allen Hannan. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 4/26/05. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 4/22/05. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Victor Allen Hannan by ALS Scan, Inc., Victor Allen Hannan. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 121 Motion of Global Innovations, Inc., and Ramsey Lamerson, for Charles H. Carreon to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Hernan Carreon terminated. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 3/31/05. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Chris Fernandez by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 4/4/2005 (Attachments: # 1)(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Global Innovations, Inc. and Ramsey Lamerson by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 4/4/2005 (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 119 Motion of Defendant Chris Fernandez to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly Lynn McGill terminated. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 3/11/05. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 120 Motion of Defendants Ramsey Lamerson and Global Innovations, Inc., for Leave to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stevan Lieberman terminated. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 3/11/05. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson. Responses due by 3/21/2005 (Lieberman, Stevan) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson. Responses due by 3/21/2005 (Lieberman, Stevan) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chris Fernandez. Responses due by 3/11/2005 (Attachments: # 1)(McGill, Kelly) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Victor Allen Hannan.(Ahalt, Brent) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 87 Motion of Defendant Victor Hannan to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 2/4/05. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficiency of Process and/or Service of Process filed by Victor Allen Hannan. (Attachments: # 1)(Ahalt, Brent) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chris Fernandez. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Lieberman, Stevan) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficiency of Process and/or Service of Process filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. Replies due by 1/26/2005. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER MOOTING 107 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court; VACATING 103 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff ALS ALLOWED to file a Memorandum in Opposition by 1/12/05 as therein set forth. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 1/7/05. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DIRECTING that the deadlines in the original Scheduling Order be pushed back 90 days. Status Report due 5/16/05. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 1/7/05. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Ahalt, Brent) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 106 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 103 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Victor Allen Hannan. Replies due by 1/11/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ahalt, Brent) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by ALS Scan, Inc. re 103 Order on Motion to Dismiss, (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 103 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 12/30/2004 (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER CONFIRMING the Scheduling Order entered by Judge Legg on 9/30/04 and SETTING Date for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 12/3/04. (jlb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER denying 88 Motion to Stay as moot in light of order of dismissal entered today as to defendant Victor Alan Hannan. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 12/3/2004. (Gauvey, Susan) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 87 Motion to Dismiss as to defendant Victor Alan Hannan only. No opposition having been entered and having reviewed the motion, the motion to dismiss is granted. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 12/3/2004. (Gauvey, Susan) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard P Bricken terminated. Signed by Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 12/3/2004. (Gauvey, Susan) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
Second Correspondence re: Motion to Withdraw (Bricken, Richard) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/28/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE by Global Innovations, Inc. OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PRO HAC COUNSEL (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 11/28/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None
Correspondence re: Withdraw of Appearance (Bricken, Richard) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey for all proceedings and the entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 11/22/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
Status Report Submitted by Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson (Lieberman, Stevan) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Stevan Lieberman on behalf of Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson (Lieberman, Stevan) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Global and Mr. Lamerson are to SHOW CAUSE on or before 11/17/04 why judgment should not be entered against them. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 11/10/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Richard P Bricken on behalf of Global Innovations, Inc. (Bricken, Richard) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 11/5/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Chris Fernandez. (McGill, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting (#90) Status Report. Signed by Judge Benson Everett Legg on 10/15/2004. (Legg, Benson Everett) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FURTHER STATUS REPORT by Global Innovations, Inc.. (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
Report re: Deposition hours (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Stay Scheduling Order as to Defendant Hannan by Victor Allen Hannan. Responses due by 10/29/2004 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynch, John) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficiency of Process and/or Service of Process by Victor Allen Hannan. Responses due by 10/29/2004 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support Of)(Lynch, John) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Lynch on behalf of Victor Allen Hannan (Lynch, John) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Chris Fernandez.(McGill, Kelly) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Global Innovations, Inc.. Responses due by 10/29/2004 (Bricken, Richard) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/11/2004, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Global Innovations, Inc..(Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 10/11/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/14/2005. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 9/30/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying as moot 51 Motion of defendant Fernandez to Dismiss, denying as moot 52 Motion of defendant Hannan to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, granting 62 Motion of plaintiff for Reconsideration, granting 76 Motion of defendants Global and Lamerson to Strike; DIRECTING defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 9/30/04. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 9/30/04. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 22 Motion of Defendants to Dismiss or Stay; denying 37 Motion of Defendants to Disqualify Plaintiff's counsel or for other relief. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 9/28/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 9/28/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE by Global Innovations, Inc. re 22 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay of Defendants Global Innovations, Inc. and Ramsey Lamerson; Order Thereon re STATUS OF NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL OF RELATED ACTION (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike 74 Amended Complaint by Global Innovations, Inc.. Responses due by 6/10/2004 (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert L Lombardo (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Chris Fernandez, Global Innovations, Inc., Victor Allen Hannan, Ramsey Lamerson, filed by ALS Scan, Inc..(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/13/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE by Global Innovations, Inc. of Unavailability of Counsel (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 03/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING 71 Notice to Substitute Attorney filed by Victor Allen Hannan. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 3/8/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Lynch, John) (Entered: 03/04/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 21 Motion of Equinix to Dismiss, and finding as moot 28 Motion of ALS Scan, Inc. for Discovery, AND GRANTING 65 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 2/18/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re 60 Amended Complaint,, 61 Correspondence Application of FRCP 15(a) of Defendant Hannan filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 02/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re 60 Amended Complaint,, 61 Correspondence Application of FRCP 15(a) filed by Chris Fernandez. Replies due by 2/19/2004. (McGill, Kelly) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re 60 Amended Complaint,, 61 Correspondence Application of FRCP 15(a) filed by Global Innovations, Inc.. Replies due by 2/17/2004. (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 02/03/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
MARGINAL ORDER GRANTING 63 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by ALS Scan, Inc., Wiltel Communications. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 1/30/04. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/02/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Equinix, Inc. by ALS Scan, Inc., Equinix, Inc.. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION for Reconsideration re 60 Amended Complaint,, 61 Correspondence Application of FRCP 15(a) filed by Victor Allen Hannan. Replies due by 2/11/2004. (Friedman, Francine) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ALS Scan, Inc., Wiltel Communications. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration re 60 Amended Complaint,, 61 Correspondence Application of FRCP 15(a) by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 2/2/2004 (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
Correspondence from Judge Benson E. Legg re: Returned pleading - Amended Complaint. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Chris Fernandez, Global Innovations, Inc., Victor Allen Hannan, Ramsey Lamerson, filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Highlighted Amended Complaint -LR 103(6)(c))(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 57 Consent Motion by Plaintiff for Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion of Victor Hannan to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 12/19/03(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 56 Motion by Plaintiff for Extension of Time to File a Response to the motion by Chris Fernandez to dismiss to 1/9/04. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 12/19/03 (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2004 (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss motion of defendant fernandez to dismmiss for lack of personal jurisdiction by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 1/1/2004 (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 12/15/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: None
MARGINAL ORDER granting 54 Motion of Andra O'Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid - Receipt #2294729 - for Document #55 see #54). Signed by Clerk on 12/11/03. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None
MOTION of Andra O'Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Victor Allen Hannan. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None
Memorandum re 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Victor Allen Hannan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victor Alan Hannan# 2 Referenced Cases)(Friedman, Francine) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Victor Allen Hannan. Responses due by 12/29/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Friedman, Francine) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss motion of defendant fernandez to dismmiss for lack of personal jurisdiction by Chris Fernandez. Responses due by 12/18/2003 (Attachments: # 1 memorandum# 2 memo# 3 moion)(McGill, Kelly) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT on Appeal of California Action by ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings# 2 Exhibit US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit Case Summary)(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 11/19/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 11/14/2003. (Legg, Benson) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. Replies due by 11/26/2003. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION for Other Relief OF DEFENDANTS GLOBAL INNOVATIONS, INC. AND RAMSEY LAMERSON FOR REMEDIAL ORDER TO MITIGATE HARM RESULTING FROM DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT; REQUEST FOR REFERRAL OF MISCONDUCT BY ATTORNEY ROBERT LOMBARDO TO COURT'S DISCIPLINARY COMMITTEE filed by Global Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 PROFFER OF EVIDENCE TO BE SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REMEDIAL ORDER TO MITIGATE HARM RESULTING FROM DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT AND REQUEST FOR REFERRAL OF MISCONDUCT BY ATTORNEY ROBERT LOMBARDO TO COURT?S DISC)(Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Victor Allen Hannan. Responses due by 12/1/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Friedman, Francine) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 42 Motion by Chris Fernandez for Extension of Time to File an Answer to the Complaint to November 28, 2003. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 11/7/03. (mcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. Replies due by 11/20/2003. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION for Other Relief OF DEFENDANTS GLOBAL INNOVATIONS, INC. AND RAMSEY LAMERSON FOR REMEDIAL ORDER TO MITIGATE HARM RESULTING FROM DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT; REQUEST FOR REFERRAL OF MISCONDUCT BY ATTORNEY ROBERT LOMBARDO TO COURT'S filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. Replies due by 11/14/2003. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Chris Fernandez. Responses due by 11/14/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT)(Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 10/28/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint pursuant to Order of the Court dated 10/17/03 served on Victor Allen Hannan on 10/21/03, filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 10/28/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint pursuant to Order of the Court dated 10/17/03 served on Victor Allen Hannan on 10/21/03, filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 10/28/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chris Fernandez on October 8, 2003, filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER EXTENDING the time to effect service up to and including 10/24/03. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 10/17/03. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Other Relief OF DEFENDANTS GLOBAL INNOVATIONS, INC. AND RAMSEY LAMERSON FOR REMEDIAL ORDER TO MITIGATE HARM RESULTING FROM DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT; REQUEST FOR REFERRAL OF MISCONDUCT BY ATTORNEY ROBERT LOMBARDO TO COURT'S DISCIPLINARY COMMITTEE; PROPOSED ORDER by Global Innovations, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2003 (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER EXTENDING the time up to and including 10 17/03 to effect service as therein set forth. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 10/6/03. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay of Defendants Global Innovations, Inc. and Ramsey Lamerson; Order Thereon filed by Global Innovations, Inc.. (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support re 22 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay of Defendants Global Innovations, Inc. and Ramsey Lamerson; Order Thereon -- Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Stay filed by Equinix, Inc.. Replies due by 10/13/2003. (Palan, Perry) (Entered: 09/29/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Alternative Service of Process for Defendant Hannan and for Extension of Time by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 10/13/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Affidavit of Attempted Service# 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit)(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Alternative Service of Process for Defendant Fernandez and for Extension of Time by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 10/13/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Attempted Service# 2 Exhibit April 14-15 e-mails)(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT in response to Order of September 8, 2003 by ALS Scan, Inc.. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
Memorandum re 22 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay of Defendants Global Innovations, Inc. and Ramsey Lamerson; Order Thereon Memorandum in Support of Opposition filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit onlinemedialawcomresume# 2 Exhibit February 20, 2003 e-mail# 3 Exhibit March 4, 3003 e-mail# 4 Exhibit March 11, 2003 letter# 5 Exhibit February 8, 2002 letter from Carreon to APIC# 6 Exhibit April 14-15, 2003 e-mails# 7 Exhibit April 18, 2003 letter# 8 Exhibit April 25, 2003 letter# 9 Exhibit July 25, 2003 e-mail# 10 Exhibit Judge White's Tentative Ruling# 11 Exhibit September 6, 2003 e-mail# 12 Exhibit Ninth Circuit Appeal Docket)(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay of Defendants Global Innovations, Inc. and Ramsey Lamerson; Order Thereon filed by ALS Scan, Inc.. Replies due by 10/2/2003. (Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Discovery Jurisdictional by ALS Scan, Inc.. Responses due by 10/2/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Affidavit)(Lombardo, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
MARGINAL ORDER granting 26 Motion of WilTel Communications for Philip J. Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (fee pd). Signed by Clerk on 9/9/03. (See #26) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Philip J. Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wiltel Communications. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DIRECTING Mr. Lombardo to advise the court in writing, on or before 9/22/03, as to the date when service was effected. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 9/8/03. (cag, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Wiltel Communications.(Marshall, Stephen) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/1/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE by Global Innovations, Inc. of Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 103.3 (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 09/01/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/1/2003, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss or Stay of Defendants Global Innovations, Inc. and Ramsey Lamerson; Order Thereon by Global Innovations, Inc.. Responses due by 9/18/2003 (Carreon, Charles) (Entered: 09/01/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Equinix, Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Equinix's Motion to Dismiss# 2 Declaration of Renee Lanam)(Palan, Perry) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
MARGINAL ORDER granting 16 Motion of defendants for Extension of Time to respond to complaint and to expedite the pro hac vice motion of Charles Carreon. Signed by Judge William D Quarles Jr. on 8/25/03. (c/m 8/25/03 jnl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
ORDER granting 18 Motion of Defendants for Charles Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 8/25/03. (fee pd)(See #18) (c/m 8/25/03 jnl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Charles Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Global Innovations, Inc., Ramsey Lamerson. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 15 Motion of Equinix for Extension of Time to Answer to and including 9/1/03. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/21/03. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P.(6)(b) FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST TO EXPEDITE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION; ORDER THEREON by Global Innovations, Inc.. Responses due by 9/8/2003 (Bricken, Richard) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Equinix, Inc.. Responses due by 9/8/2003 (Palan, Perry) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING re 13 Stipulation filed by ALS Scan, Inc., Wiltel Communications. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 8/8/2003. (Legg, Benson) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Extend Time for Wiltel Communications, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALS Scan, Inc., Wiltel Communications. (Marshall, Stephen) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None
STIPULATION by Equinix, Inc.. (Palan, Perry) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING (5) Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 06/30/2003. (Legg, Benson) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Benson E Legg on 06/30/2003. (Legg, Benson) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
Return Pleading letter regarding Stipulation.(mms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None
Clerk re: ECF Warning Letter. (mms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Perry Palan on behalf of Equinix, Inc. (mms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALS Scan, Inc. Global Innovations, Inc. served on 5/15/2003, answer due 6/4/2003. (mms, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2003 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/02/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time for Wiltel Communications, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALS Scan, Inc., Wiltel Communications. (Marshall, Stephen) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer July 11, 2003 by Wiltel Communications. Responses due by 5/29/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit stipulation)(Marshall, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: None
Correspondence mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (nrm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: None
Summons Issued (20 days) as to Equinix, Inc., Chris Fernandez, Global Innovations, Inc., Victor Allen Hannan, Ramsey Lamerson, Wiltel Communications. (nrm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Equinix, Inc., Chris Fernandez, Global Innovations, Inc., Victor Allen Hannan, Ramsey Lamerson, Wiltel Communications ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 1193648.), filed by ALS Scan, Inc..(nrm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 387 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?