Shane Galitski et al v. Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:12-cv-00903
District Judge Cormac J. Carney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 21, 2016 at 12:55 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian Newbold, Plaintiff

Represented by Doyle Lowther LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Glynn Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E Glynn +1 858 271 1100 +1 858 876 1530 tom@glynnlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Hail +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jimh@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by rosnerandmansfield.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan McQuarrie Mansfield +1 858 348 1005 +1 858 348 1150 alan@rosnerandmansfield.com
No Logo Richard Taliaferro, Plaintiff

Represented by Doyle Lowther LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Glynn Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E Glynn +1 858 271 1100 +1 858 876 1530 tom@glynnlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Hail +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jimh@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by rosnerandmansfield.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan McQuarrie Mansfield +1 858 348 1005 +1 858 348 1150 alan@rosnerandmansfield.com
No Logo Shane Galitski, Plaintiff

Represented by Doyle Lowther LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Glynn Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E Glynn +1 858 271 1100 +1 858 876 1530 tom@glynnlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Hail +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jimh@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by rosnerandmansfield.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan McQuarrie Mansfield +1 858 348 1005 +1 858 348 1150 alan@rosnerandmansfield.com
v.
Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynn,Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Dabdoub +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 adabdoub@lynnllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Mark Tillotson +1 214 981 3838 +1 214 981 3839 jmt@lynnllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David I Hurwitz +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 dhurwitz@omm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 385 - Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transferred from California Centralhas been opened in Northern District of Texas as case 3:12-cv-04782 filed 11/21/2012. (yl) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE 16 : (See document for details) Electronic Documents are accessible through Pacer. Case transferred to the Northern District of Texas. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (Attachments: # 1 TRANSMITTAL LETTER) (rla) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting 37 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marc R. Stanley on behalf of plaintiff, designating William J. Doyle II as local counsel. (twdb) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
        APPLICATION for attorney Marc R. Stanley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Richard Taliaferro and Brian Newbold. Lodged Proposed Order. (dv) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
          RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF HURWITZ filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
            RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION to Compel Arbitration 17 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF PENNINGTON filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
              DECLARATION of Jeffrey Tillotson in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration 17 filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                REPLY in support MOTION to Compel Arbitration 17 filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                  REPLY in support of MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas 16 filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                    REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, granting Stipulation to Continue 29 . The hearings re Motion originally scheduled have been rescheduled 16 17 18 . ( Motion set for hearing on 11/26/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney.) (twdb) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION to Continue Hearings on Defendant's Motions to Transfer, to Compel Arbitration, and to Dismiss from October 5, 2012 to November 26, 2012 Re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 , MOTION to Compel Arbitration 17 , MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas 16 filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Hurwitz, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                          Evidentiary Objection In Opposition to re: MOTION to Compel Arbitration 17 filed by Plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Doyle, William) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                            Evidentiary Objection In Opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 filed by Plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Doyle, William) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 filed by Plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Doyle, William) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Marc R. Stanley In Opposition To MOTION to Compel Arbitration 17 filed by Plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Doyle, William) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Arbitration 17 filed by Plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Doyle, William) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION of James R. Hail In Opposition To MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas 16 filed by Plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Doyle, William) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas 16 filed by Plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Doyle, William) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of Michael Pennington in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration 17 filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Amended Declaration of Michael Pennington, # 2 Exhibit B to Amended Declaration of Michael Pennington)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER Granting Stipulation Re: Relief From Local Rule 23-3, by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Before the Court is the Stipulation 19 re Relief from Local Rule 23-3 between Plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Richard Taliaferro and Brian Newbold, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated (collectively "Plaintiffs") and Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC ("Defendant"). Having considered the Stipulation, the Court finds that good cause exists to relieve Plaintiffs of the requirement of Local Rule 23-3. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that: 1. Plaintiffs shall be relieved of the requirement in Local Rule 23-3 of filing a class certification motion by September 5, 2012; and 2. The motion for class certification shall be filed by March 25, 2013, unless otherwise ordered. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION for Relief from from Local Rule 23-3 filed by plaintiff Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doyle, William) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David I. Hurwitz, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 9)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael Pennington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Declaration David I. Hurwitz, # 5 Exhibit A)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Timothy Sheppard, # 2 Declaration Alan Dabdoub, # 3 Exhibit 1 of Decl of A. Dabdoub, # 4 Exhibit 2 of Decl of A. Dabdoub, # 5 Exhibit 3 of Decl of A. Dabdoub)(Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Interested Parties filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, identifying Shane Galitski, Richard Taliaferro, Brian Newbold, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David I Hurwitz counsel for Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Adding David Ian Hurwitz as attorney as counsel of record for Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, a New York corporation for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Hurwitz, David) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doyle, William) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Samsung Telecommunications America LLC answer now due 8/2/2012, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC.(Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting 8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Volney on behalf of Defendant Samsung, designating Ekwan E. Rhow as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting 6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alan Dabdoub on behalf of Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, designating Ekwan E. Rhow as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting 7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gail Hayworth on behalf of Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, designating Ekwan E. Rhow as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney John D. Volney to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10687269 paid.) filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service)(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Gail Ann Hayworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10687225 paid.) filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service)(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      APPLICATION for attorney Alan Dabdoub to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-10686927 paid.) filed by defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service)(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Taliaferro, Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, upon Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC served on 6/12/2012, answer due 7/24/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Johnda I. Crites, Senior Litigation Paralegal in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Doyle, William) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Samsung Telecommunications America LLC answer now due 7/24/2012, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America LLC.(Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(dg) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold, Richard Taliaferro, (dg) (dg). (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                COMPLAINT against defendants Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P Rosenbluth.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Richard Taliaferro, Shane Galitski, Brian Newbold.(dg) (lwag). (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 367 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?