GAY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:09-cv-00370-FMA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit Military Pay - Retirement
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 46 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Response due by 5/6/2013. Reply due by 6/3/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
    LREF
    Blank 44 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER LIFTING STAY. Joint Status Report due 4/3/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before October 31, 2012, the parties shall each file a response to this order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: The case shall remain stayed and the parties shall continue to follow the April 4, 2012, order establishing periodic status reports. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 10/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER: Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint by 11/14/2011. Defendant shall file its response by 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER LIFTING STAY with: Joint Status Report due 10/13/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 71 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?