Almy et al v. United States Department of Defense et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-05627
District Judge Richard Seeborg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony J. Loverde, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Goodman +1 202 667 7630 goodman@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Lee Fong +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 SFong@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Rhea Gosling +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 kgosling@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Anne Roberts +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 Jroberts@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Servicemember Legal Defense Network

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron D. Tax +1 202 328 3244 Aaron@sldn.org
No Logo Jason D. Knight, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Goodman +1 202 667 7630 goodman@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Lee Fong +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 SFong@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Rhea Gosling +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 kgosling@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Anne Roberts +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 Jroberts@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Servicemember Legal Defense Network

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron D. Tax +1 202 328 3244 Aaron@sldn.org
No Logo Michael D. Almy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Goodman +1 202 667 7630 goodman@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Lee Fong +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 SFong@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Rhea Gosling +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 kgosling@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Anne Roberts +1 858 720 5100 +1 858 720 5125 Jroberts@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Servicemember Legal Defense Network

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron D. Tax +1 202 328 3244 Aaron@sldn.org
v.
No Logo United States Air Force, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of the Air Force"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Navy United States Navy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of the Navy"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael B. Donley, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Ray Mabus, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Secretary of Defense Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 100 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR FINALIZING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
    LREF
    Blank 98 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
      LREF
      Blank 94 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 93 GRANTING TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
        LREF
        Blank 79 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY OF CURRENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO CREATE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
          LREF
          Blank 77 Filed: 8/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF ALMY'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/3/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
            LREF
            Blank 74 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF ALMY'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/12/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
              LREF
              Blank 69 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 68 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/20/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                  CLERKS NOTICE ALL PARTIES SHALL APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                    CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Supplemental Case Management Statement and Proposed Order filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 5/10/2012) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                      CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Supplemental Case Management Statement and Proposed Order filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2012) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                          CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                            CLERKS NOTICE All parties shall appear telephonically at the Case Management Conference scheduled for Febraury 9, 2012. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 59 Case Management Statement Notice of Request of M. Andrew Woodmansee to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 2/2/2012) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Case Management Statement and Proposed Order filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 2/2/2012) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                  CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION re 56 Clerks Notice PLAINTIFFS JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 12/7/2011) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                      CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 55 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY BRIEFING ON PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS AND TO VACATE HEARING DATE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 9/29/2011) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 53 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING FORTH REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE DEADLINES.Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/2/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                              STIPULATION (Joint) Setting Forth Revised Briefing Schedule Deadlines by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/25/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 8/25/2011). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2011) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                  EXHIBITS re 49 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 49 ) (Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 9/2/2011. Replies due by 9/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Proposed Order re 47 Case Management Statement Joint Case Management Statement by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 8/18/2011) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 8/18/2011) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING FORTH DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION re 38 Amended Complaint, 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 8/3/2011) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Proposed Order re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 7/27/2011) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/10/2011. Replies due by 8/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration by Almy, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Almy Dec, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Almy Dec, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Almy Dec, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Almy Dec, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Almy Dec, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Almy Dec, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Almy Dec, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Almy Dec, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Almy Dec, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Almy Dec, # 12 Declaration by Knight, # 13 Exhibit 1 to Knight Dec, # 14 Exhibit 2 to Knight Dec, # 15 Exhibit 3 to Knight Dec, # 16 Exhibit 4 to Knight Dec, # 17 Exhibit 5 to Knight Dec, # 18 Exhibit 6 to Knight Dec, # 19 Exhibit 7 to Knight Dec, # 20 Declaration by Loverde, # 21 Exhibit 1 to Loverde Dec, # 22 Exhibit 2 to Loverde Dec, # 23 Exhibit 3 to Loverde Dec, # 24 Exhibit 4 to Loverde Dec, # 25 Exhibit 5 to Loverde Dec, # 26 Exhibit 6 to Loverde Dec, # 27 Exhibit 7 to Loverde Dec, # 28 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 7/27/2011) Modified on 8/4/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER Changing the Date of the Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/07/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION Setting Forth Deadline for Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Request for Order to Change Date of Initial Case Management Conference by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/5/2011) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER RE 39 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE OF THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS MODIFIED. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 6/1/2011) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violations of the United States Constitution and Administrative Procedures Act against Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. Filed byJason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde, Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 5/4/2011) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed byMichael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 5/3/2011) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY (re 30 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ) filed byMichael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 4/21/2011) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY (re 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Court of Federal Claims, Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss Action ) filed byDepartment of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 4/21/2011) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Court of Federal Claims, Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss Action ) filed byMichael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 4/14/2011) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 30 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ) filed byDepartment of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trail Transcript, Witt v. Dep't of the Air Force)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 4/13/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Woodmansee, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Woodmansee - Proposed First Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Woodmansee - Redline, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/16/2011) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference continued to 5/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 25 MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference ) filed byMichael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2011) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 8 Order, Set Hearings Reassignment Order (Roberts, Jessica) (Filed on 3/11/2011) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER RE: 25 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/11.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 3/10/2011) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 3/21/11 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2011) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2011) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 3/4/2011) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Transfer Case to the Court of Federal Claims, Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss Action filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/11/2011) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan B Parker (Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/11/2011) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 12 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 1/11/2011) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Gerald Freeborne (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 1/3/2011) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, on United States Attorney's Office (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 12/29/2010) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 12/29/2010) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER RE: 11 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY AARON D. TAX PRO HACE VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER RE: 10 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN M. GOODMAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Aaron D. Tax ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611054198.) filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by John M. Goodman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611054197.) filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ERRONEOUS FILING. DOCKETED IN ERROR IN WRONG CASE CLERKS NOTICE - Certified copy of Docket and Certified copy of Remand Order sent to Santa Clara County Superior Court via U.S. Postal Service. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010) Modified on 12/17/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE: 7 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/15/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violations of the States Constitution and Administrative Act against Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611053855). Filed by Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde, Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?