Morse v. Regents of the University of California, Berkeley et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-05594
District Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo DAVID MORSE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gonzalez & Leigh, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matt Gonzalez +1 415 912 5950 +1 415 912 5951 mgonzalez@gonzalezleigh.com
TERMINATED: 04/11/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Whitney Leigh +1 415 912 5950 +1 415 912 5951 wleigh@gonzalezleigh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Gross +1 415 544 0200 +1 415 544 0201 terry@grossbelsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The First Amendment Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Allen Greene +1 510 208 7744 +1 510 208 4562 nicfeliciano@thefirstamendment.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Winslow King +1 510 208 7744 +1 510 208 4562 gking@thefirstamendment.org
v.
No Logo Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Defendant
No Logo City of Berkeley Police Department, Defendant

Represented by Stubbs & Leone

No Logo County of Alameda, California, Defendant
Officially listed as "County of Alameda"
No Logo Harris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Stubbs & Leone

No Logo MANCHESTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Stubbs & Leone

No Logo Mitchell J. Celaya , III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Stubbs & Leone

No Logo Nicole Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Stubbs & Leone

No Logo University of California, Berkeley, Defendant
Officially listed as "Regents of the University of California, Berkeley"

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Stubbs & Leone

No Logo Reich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Stubbs & Leone

UC Berkeley UC Berkeley, Defendant
Officially listed as "University of California at Berkeley Police Department"

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Stubbs & Leone

No Logo Wyckoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Stubbs & Leone

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 77 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/12/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
    LREF
    Blank 73 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 7/13/2012 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/21/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
      LREF
      Blank 69 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PRETRIAL STATEMENTS. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2012 02:00 PM. The Court VACATES the 6/22/2012 Pretrial Conference and RESETS it for 6/25/12 at 2:00pm.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/12/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Reich, Wyckoff, David Morse. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 6/1/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/31/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
          Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/23/2012 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 2/23/2012). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/23/2012) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 66 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND SETTING TRIAL DATES.Court ORDERS that the deposition of Plaintiff occur on 3/14/12 at a time and place to be notified by Defendants. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/26/12. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 5/1/2012. Jury Selection set for 7/9/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 7/9/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/28/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              Letter from Terry Gross, Esq. to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers . (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 2/27/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                Letter from Claudia Leed, Esq. to Judge Yvonne Gonzales Rogers. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 2/27/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                  Letter Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Request to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDavid Morse. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 2/22/2012) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                    Letter from William J. Carroll . (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 2/16/2012) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM FEBRUARY 8, 2012 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 60 Stipulation. Defendants' request is GRANTED, but the Court re-sets the Case Management Conference to Thursday, February 23, 2012 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from February 8, 2012 to February 26, 2012 filed by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Reich, Wyckoff, David Morse. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 2/2/2012) Modified on 2/3/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Reich, Wyckoff, David Morse. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 1/30/2012) Modified on 1/31/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                            CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2012 09:00 AM. Dispostive Motions to be heard by 4/10/2012. Jury Selection set for 6/11/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 6/11/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in a designated courtroom in the Oakland Courthouse. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers on 1/18/12. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by David Morse of Firm Name Change (Greene, David) (Filed on 1/3/2012) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                                  Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference HELD 10/28/11 (Date Filed: 12/28/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2012 03:00 PM. () (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/28/2011) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                    CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by David Morse. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 10/27/2011) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 10/24/2011 before Magistrate Judge Spero. Case did not settle. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2011) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 52 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                        ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 51 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                          ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2011 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re: Case Management Conference by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, City of Berkeley Police Department, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Reich. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 9/15/2011) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                              Letter from Terry Gross, Gross Belsky Alonso LLP. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 9/13/2011) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                Letter from Claudia Leed re: Request for Stay of Discovery. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 9/9/2011) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                  ASSOCIATION of Counsel by David Morse. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 8/31/2011) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Letter from Claudia Leed to Judge Susan Ilston. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 10/24/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 08/24/2011. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER RE: ADR. Referred to Magistrate Judge Spero for an early settlement conferece. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) Modified on 8/22/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                          ERRONEOUS ATTACHMENT***Letter from Dennis L. James to the Court requesting a mediation session. (Attachments: # 1 env.)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011) Modified on 8/16/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Letter from Terry Gross, Gross Belsky Alonso LLP. Attorneys for Plaintiff David Morse In Response to Defendants' August 12, 2011 Letter. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 8/15/2011) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Letter from Claudia Leed. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2011 03:00 PM. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER Re: Tolling Statute of Limitations (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference HELD ON 7/1/11 (Date Filed: 7/6/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2011 03:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 6/11/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 6/11/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2012 03:00 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. () (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/6/2011) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Regents of the University of California, Berkeley, Reich, Wyckoff (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 7/1/2011) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            STIPULATION and Agreement to Toll the Statute of Limitations by David Morse. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 6/30/2011) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Reich, Wyckoff. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 . The case management conference is continued to 7/1/11 at 2:30 pm.(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011) Modified on 5/19/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re: Continuing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Case Management Conference by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Regents of the University of California, Berkeley, Reich, University of California at Berkeley Police Department, Wyckoff. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 5/18/2011) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Regents of the University of California, Berkeley, Reich, University of California at Berkeley Police Department, Wyckoff. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Brief
                                                                                      Reply Brief In Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of 20 Their Motion to Dismiss filed byMitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Regents of the University of California, Berkeley, Reich, Wyckoff. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 5/6/2011) Modified on 5/9/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                        RESPONSE/Opposition to (re 20 MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byDavid Morse. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 4/29/2011) Modified on 5/2/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: 4/14/2011 Order
                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION re 26 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011) Modified on 4/15/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011, Terminated: 4/14/2011 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                            NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by G. Whitney Leigh (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 4/11/2011) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: 3/31/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
                                                                                              ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011 Proposed Order
                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge Time by David Morse. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 3/29/2011) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                  Declaration of G. Whitney Leigh In Support of 22 Notice of Motion and Motion to Enlarge the Time in which Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is Due and to Continue Case Management Conference filed byDavid Morse. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss and to Continue Case Management Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by David Morse. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Leigh, G.) (Filed on 3/29/2011) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: 2/17/2011 Proposed Order
                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Regents of the University of California, Berkeley, Reich, Wyckoff. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 2/17/2011) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: 2/17/2011, Terminated: 5/18/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Regents of the University of California, Berkeley, Reich, Wyckoff. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 2/17/2011) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Morse (Greene, David) (Filed on 2/10/2011) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Order
                                                                                                            STANDING ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants City of Berkeley incorrectly sued herein as City of Berkeley Police Department, City of Berkeley Police Chief Michael Meehan without Prejudice by Alameda County Sheriff's Department. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 2/9/2011) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants County of Alameda, Alameda County Sheriff's Department and Alameda County Sheriff Gregory Ahern without Prejudice by County of Alameda. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 2/4/2011) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on January 28, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 Clerk's Notice of Impending ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Mitchell J. Celaya, III, Harris, Manchester, Nicole Miller, Regents of the University of California, Berkeley, Reich, University of California at Berkeley Police Department, Wyckoff. (Leed, Claudia) (Filed on 1/26/2011) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and [Proposed] Order filed by County of Alameda, Gregory J. Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Department. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/26/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Morse [Proof of Service-Summons and Complaint re Alameda County Sheriff Gregory J. Ahern] (Leigh, Gilbert) (Filed on 1/18/2011) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Morse [Proof of Service-Summons and Complaint re Alameda County Sheriff's Department] (Leigh, Gilbert) (Filed on 1/18/2011) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Morse [Proof of Serivce-Summons and Complaint re County of Alameda] (Leigh, Gilbert) (Filed on 1/18/2011) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Morse [Proof of Service-Summons and Complaint re City of Berkeley Police Chief Michael K. Meehan] (Leigh, Gilbert) (Filed on 1/18/2011) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Morse [Proof of Service-Summons and Complaint re City of Berkeley Police Department] (Leigh, Gilbert) (Filed on 1/18/2011) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (King, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/13/2011) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Morse.. (King, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/21/2010) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Gregory J. Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Mitchell J. Celaya, III, City of Berkeley Police Department, County of Alameda, Harris, Manchester, Michael K. Meehan, Nicole Miller, Regents of the University of California, Berkeley, Reich, University of California at Berkeley Police Department, Wyckoff. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010) (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Gregory J. Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Mitchell J. Celaya, III, City of Berkeley Police Department, County of Alameda, Harris, Manchester, Michael K. Meehan, Nicole Miller, Regents of the University of California, Berkeley, Reich, University of California at Berkeley Police Department, Wyckoff (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611053766). Filed by David Morse. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 235 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?