ALEC L. et al v. JACKSON et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-02235
District Judge Robert L. Wilkins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 4:59 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALEC L., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Victoria Loorz Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Victoria Loorz Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo GARRETT S., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Valerie Serrels Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Valerie Serrels Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo Grant, S., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Valerie Serrels Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through his Guardian Ad Litem Valerie Serrels Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo JANET WALLACE , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a nonprofit Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a nonprofit Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo MADELINE W., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through her Guardian Ad Litem Janet Wallace Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through her Guardian Ad Litem Janet Wallace Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo NINA GROVE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo VALERIE SERRELS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo VICTORIA LOORZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo WildEarth Guardians, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a nonprofit Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a nonprofit Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
No Logo ZOE J., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEERS LAW OFFICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Beers +1 406 728 4888 +7288 728 728 8445 blo@montana.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through her Guardian Ad Litem Nina Grove Tanya Sanerib +1 503 544 8512 tsanerib@biologicaldiversity.org

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer & Glitzenstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Marie Sanerib +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 tanyasanerib@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Advocates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
by and through her Guardian Ad Litem Nina Grove Julia A Olson +1 541 344 7066 +1 541 344 7061 jaoearth@aol.com
v.
No Logo GARY F. LOCKE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo KENNETH L. SALAZAR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo KENNETH LEE SALAZAR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo LEON E. PANETTA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo LEON EDWARD PANETTA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo LEON PANETTA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo LISA P. JACKSON, Defendant

Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEVEN CHU, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo THOMAS J. VILSACK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo Thomas James Vilsack, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin F. McDermott +1 202 514 4122 martin.mcdermott@usdoj.gov
No Logo CALIFORNIA DUMP TRUCK OWNERS ASSOCIATION, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Hadzi-Antich +1 916 419 7111 tha@pacificlegal.org
No Logo DALTON TRUCKING, INC., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Hadzi-Antich +1 916 419 7111 tha@pacificlegal.org
No Logo DELTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Hadzi-Antich +1 916 419 7111 tha@pacificlegal.org
No Logo ENGINEERING & UTILITY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Hadzi-Antich +1 916 419 7111 tha@pacificlegal.org
No Logo National Association of Manufacturers, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David T. Buente, Jr. +1 202 736 8111 +1 202 736 8711 dbuente@sidley.com
Space Joseph Robert Guerra +1 202 736 8023 +1 202 736 8711 jguerra@sidley.com
Space Roger R. Martella, PHV +1 202 736 8000 +1 202 736 8711 rmartella@sidley.com
Space Quin Mikael Sorenson +1 202 736 8000 qsorenson@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy K. Webster +1 202 736 8138 +1 202 736 8711 twebster@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jim Wedeking +1 202 736 8281 jwedeking@sidley.com
Space Jim Wedeking +1 202 736 8281 jwedeking@sidley.com
No Logo SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, INC., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Hadzi-Antich +1 916 419 7111 tha@pacificlegal.org
No Logo JAMES E. HANSEN, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paige Michele Tomaselli +1 415 826 2770 +1 415 826 0507 ptomaselli@centerforfoodsafety.org
Dr. Paige Michele Tomaselli +1 415 826 2770 +1 415 826 0507 ptomaselli@icta.org
No Logo JAMES L. HUFFMAN, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison D Wood +1 202 955 1945 awood@hunton.com
No Logo JASON SCOTT JOHNSTON, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison D Wood +1 202 955 1945 awood@hunton.com
No Logo ROBERT A. DESTRO, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison D Wood +1 202 955 1945 awood@hunton.com
No Logo RONALD A. CASS, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison D Wood +1 202 955 1945 awood@hunton.com
Citation Section 33 U.S.C. § 1365
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (188) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Robert L. Wilkins held on March 5, 2012; Page Numbers: 1 - 26. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Court Reporter Email Address : cathryjns1@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2013.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
      Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 185 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (rdj) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT re 172 , 173 , 183 & 184 by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-3379211. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Gregory, Philip) Modified on 6/27/2013 (zrdj, ). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 174 Motion for Reconsideration. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration, Defendants' and Intervenors' Oppositions thereto, and Plaintiffs' Reply, and the entire record herein, for the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/22/2013. (lcrlw3) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 183 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Plaintiffs' 174 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/22/2013. (lcrlw3) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION to Substitute Party and Request for Status Conference by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment 1)(Gregory, Philip) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Attorney Tanya Sanerib terminated. (Sanerib, Tanya) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jordanna G. Thigpen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thigpen, Jordanna) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 174 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Olson, Julia) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                      Memorandum in opposition to re 175 MOTION for Reconsideration re 174 MOTION for Reconsideration Memorandum In Support Thereof, 174 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by CALIFORNIA DUMP TRUCK OWNERS ASSOCIATION, DALTON TRUCKING, INC., DELTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., ENGINEERING & UTILITY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Sorenson, Quin) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in opposition to re 175 MOTION for Reconsideration re 174 MOTION for Reconsideration Memorandum In Support Thereof, 174 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by ROBERT M. GATES, LISA P. JACKSON, GARY F. LOCKE, LEON EDWARD PANETTA, KENNETH LEE SALAZAR, THOMAS J. VILSACK. (McDermott, Martin) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS re 174 MOTION for Reconsideration (Gregory, Philip) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM re 174 MOTION for Reconsideration Memorandum In Support Thereof by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gregory, Philip) Modified on 6/29/2012 to correct event(rdj). (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Reconsideration by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Gregory, Philip) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors 64 , 67 & 159 Motions to Dismiss;and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is hereby dismissed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/31/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 172 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re : Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors 64 , 67 & 159 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/31/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Robert L. Wilkins held on May 11, 2012; Page Numbers: 1 - 109. Date of Issuance:May 25, 2012. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 202-354-3249, Court Reporter Email Address : kingreporter2@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2012.(Stonestreet, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LEAVE TO FILE DENIED as to Lynn Augstein, Letter to the Court. "Leave to file denied. See Local Rule 5.1(b)", Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/24/2012. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. (rdj) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Robert L. Wilkins held on April 2, 2012; Page Numbers: 1 - 75. Date of Issuance:May 10, 2012. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 202-354-3249, Court Reporter Email Address : kingreporter2@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/31/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2012.(Stonestreet, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Robert Guerra on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS (Guerra, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE re 166 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Brief of Amicus Curiae Huffman, et al., filed by ROBERT M. GATES, LISA P. JACKSON, GARY F. LOCKE, LEON EDWARD PANETTA, KENNETH L. SALAZAR, THOMAS J. VILSACK. (McDermott, Martin) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to Brief of Amicus Curiae Huffman, et al., by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in REsponse to brief of Amicus Curiae Huffman, et al., # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Memorandum)(Olson, Julia) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                              AMICUS BRIEF by RONALD A. CASS, ROBERT A. DESTRO, JAMES L. HUFFMAN, JASON SCOTT JOHNSTON. (rdj) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 163 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief;and Law Professors shall be permitted to participate in these proceedings as amici curiae, including filing a brief with this Court.. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/25/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief by RONALD A. CASS, ROBERT A. DESTRO, JAMES L. HUFFMAN, JASON SCOTT JOHNSTON (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 67 , 159 MOTION to Dismiss of Intervenor-Defendants filed by CALIFORNIA DUMP TRUCK OWNERS ASSOCIATION, DALTON TRUCKING, INC., DELTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., ENGINEERING & UTILITY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Sorenson, Quin) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Quin M Sorenson on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS (Sorenson, Quin) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 67 , 159 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Intervenors filed by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Julia) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by CALIFORNIA DUMP TRUCK OWNERS ASSOCIATION, DALTON TRUCKING, INC., DELTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., ENGINEERING & UTILITY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Hadzi-Antich on behalf of CALIFORNIA DUMP TRUCK OWNERS ASSOCIATION, DALTON TRUCKING, INC., DELTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., ENGINEERING & UTILITY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 153 MOTION to Intervene RESPONSE BY TO PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PROPOSED DEFENDANTS-INTERVENORS DELTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC., ET AL.S MOTION TO INTERVENE filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS. (Buente, David) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 147 MOTION to Intervene filed by CALIFORNIA DUMP TRUCK OWNERS ASSOCIATION, DALTON TRUCKING, INC., DELTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., ENGINEERING & UTILITY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Strike 154 Memorandum in Opposition, (Strike Portion of Opposition Addressing the NAM's Motion to Intervene), MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief (as alternative relief) by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buente, David) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 153 MOTION to Intervene filed by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendants-Intervenors' Motion to Intervene)(Olson, Julia) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by CALIFORNIA DUMP TRUCK OWNERS ASSOCIATION, DALTON TRUCKING, INC., DELTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., ENGINEERING & UTILITY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits and Declaration of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Andrew J. Vasconi in Support of Engineering and Utility Contractors Associations Motion to Intervene, # 4 Declaration of Terry Klenske in Support of Dalton Trucking, Inc.s Motion to Intervene, # 5 Declaration of Peter L. Rasic in Support of Southern California Contractors Association Inc.s Motion to Intervene, # 6 Declaration of Norman R. Skip Brown in Support of Delta Construction Company, Inc.s Motion to Intervene, # 7 Declaration of Emily Cohen in Support of Engineering and Utility Contractors Associations Motion to Intervene, # 8 Declaration of Lee Brown in Support of California Dump Truck Owners Associations Motion to Intervene, # 9 Declaration of Robert McClernon in Support of California Dump Truck Owners Associations Motion to Intervene, # 10 Declaration of Larry C. Russell in Support of Southern California Contractors Associations Motion to Intervene, # 11 Declaration of Theodore Hazdi-Antich in Support of Defendants-Intervenors Motion to Intervene, # 12 Proposed Motion to Dismiss, # 13 Text of Proposed Order - Motion to Dismiss)(znmw, ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 149 MOTION for Hearing, MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing; A hearing is set for April 2, 2012 at 2:00 P.M. EST in courtroom 17 before Judge Robert L. Wilkins on pending motions to intervene (National Association of Manufacturers Motion for Intervention (Docket No. 65) and Delta Construction Company, Inc. et al.s Motion for Intervention (yet to be filed)) and for further status regarding Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 64) and Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Docket No. 24). It is FURTHER ORDERED that Delta Construction Company, Inc. et al. shall file their renewed motion for intervention by no later than March 6, 2012; oppositions shall be filed by March 16, 2012; and replies, if any, shall be filed by March 23, 2012.It is FURTHER ORDERED that National Association of Manufacturers Motion to Consider Movants Motion to Intervene (Docket No. 150) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 3/5/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE re 149 MOTION for Hearing MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing filed by STEVEN CHU, ROBERT M. GATES, LISA P. JACKSON, GARY F. LOCKE, LEON E. PANETTA, KENNETH L. SALAZAR. (McDermott, Martin) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION MOTION FOR THE COURT TO CONSIDER MOVANTS MOTION TO INTERVENE AT THE COURTS EARLIEST CONVENIENCE AND TO ALLOW PROPOSED INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT TO PARTICIPATE IN THE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MARCH 5, 2012TO re 65 by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buente, David) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Hearing, MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanerib, Tanya) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            STATUS REPORT by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Sanerib, Tanya) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by DELTA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., DALTON TRUCKING, INC., SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION, INC., CALIFORNIA DUMP TRUCK OWNERS ASSOCIATION, ENGINEERING & UTILITY CONTRACTORS ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Andrew J. Vasconi, # 4 Declaration of Andrew J. Vasconi, # 5 Declaration of Peter L. Rasic, # 6 Declaration of Norman R. "Skip" Brown, # 7 Declaration of Emily Cohen, # 8 Declaration of Lee Brown, # 9 Declaration of Robert McClernon, # 10 Declaration of Larry C. Russell, # 11 Proposed Motion to Dismiss, # 12 Text of Proposed Order -Motion to Dismiss)(znmw, ) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas J. Beers, :Firm- Beers Law Offices, :Address- 234 East Pine Street PO Box 7968 Missoula, MT 59807-7968. Phone No. - 406-728-4888. Fax No. - 406-728-8445 by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanerib, Tanya) (Entered: 02/18/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julia A. Olson, :Firm- Wild Earth Advocates, :Address- 2985 Adams St. Eugene, OR 97405. Phone No. - 541-344-7066. Fax No. - 541-344-7061 by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., GARRETT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanerib, Tanya) (Entered: 02/18/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Philip L. Gregory, :Firm- Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP, :Address- 840 Malcolm Road Burlingame, California 94010. Phone No. - 650-697-6000. Fax No. - 650-697-0577 by NINA GROVE, ZOE J., KIDS VS. GLOBAL WARMING, ALEC L., VICTORIA LOORZ, GRANT S., VALERIE SERRELS, MADELINE W., JANET WALLACE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanerib, Tanya) (Entered: 02/18/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Sanerib on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sanerib, Tanya) (Entered: 02/18/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Martin F. McDermott on behalf of STEVEN CHU, ROBERT M. GATES, LISA P. JACKSON, GARY F. LOCKE, LEON E. PANETTA, KENNETH L. SALAZAR, THOMAS J. VILSACK (McDermott, Martin) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties shall enter appearances within ten (10) days of this Order; it is: FURTHER ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer and Plaintiffs shall cause to be filed a Joint Status Report setting forth the following: (1) what motions, if any, remain pending; (2) whether any party wishes to withdraw any pending motion; and (3) whether any party believes any pending motion is now moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to counsel for Plaintiffs at the following addresses: Joseph W. Cotchett,Philip L. Gregory,Paul N. McCloskey,COTCHETT PITRE & McCARTHY, LLP,San Francisco Airport Office Center 840 Malcolm RoadBurlingame, CA 94010. Julia Olson WILD EARTH ADVOCATES,2985 Adams St.Eugene, OR 97405. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/8/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Buente on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS (Buente, David) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Wedeking on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS (Wedeking, James) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy K. Webster on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MANUFACTURERS (Webster, Timothy) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:11-cv-02203. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2011: # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (zrdj, ). (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Case electronically transferred to the District of Columbia. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Brief for Amicus Curiae Law Professors - Exhibit A filed byAlec L.. (Middleton, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Declaration of Jennifer J. Middleton Amicus Counsel - Exhibit B filed byAlec L.. (Middleton, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Proposed Order by Alec L.. (Middleton, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Alec L.. Responses due by 12/21/2011. Replies due by 12/28/2011. (Middleton, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 95 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2011 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 12/1/2011) re 95 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Thomas J. Vilsack, Gary F. Locke, Kenneth L. Salazar, Lisa P. Jackson, Leon E. Panetta. Court took matter under submission and will issue order (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice Regarding Proposed Video Recording of December 15, 2011 Motion Hearing. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 97 MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, ) filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/25/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/25/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 95 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) ) filed bySteven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTIFICATION OF REQUEST TO VIDEO RECORD December 15, 2011 Motion Hearing as part of Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 1, 2011, all parties must complete the attached Party Response to Request for Video Recording and email it to cameras@cand.uscourts.gov.(Attachments: # 1 Party Response to Request for Video Recording) (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 123 filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Gregg, Ragu-Jara) (Filed on 11/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim ) filed bySteven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 125 . *** REPLY (re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Gregg, Ragu-Jara) (Filed on 11/21/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 65 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Gregg, Ragu-Jara) (Filed on 11/21/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 118 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Victoria Loorz in Support of 118 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Julia A. Olson in Support of 118 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 118 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 95 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) ) in Opposition filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/18/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT in Support re 95 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Gregg, Ragu-Jara) (Filed on 11/18/2011) Modified on 11/21/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 114 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Galpern) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James E. Hansen re 107 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION of Daniel Galpern for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611066953) filed by James E. Hansen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Hanson (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Corrected Filing filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Daniel Galpern in Support of 107 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed byJames Hanson. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 107 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief by James Hanson. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 108 Exhibits Exhibit 1 to Proposed Brief Amicus Curiae filed byJames Hanson. (Related document(s) 108 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 107 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed byJames Hanson. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by James Hanson. Responses due by 11/28/2011. Replies due by 12/5/2011. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 64 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim ) in Opposition filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) in Opposition filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Julia A. Olson in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 100 Reply to Opposition/Response, Second Declaration filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 24 , 100 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Julia A. Olson in Support of 102 Opposition/Response to Motion, to NAM's Motion to Intervene filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 102 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 65 MOTION to Intervene ) by NAM filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Intervention)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Pushker Kharecha, Ph.D. in Support of 100 Reply to Opposition/Response, 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Supplemental filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 100 , 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 97 MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, ) Proposed Intervenor-Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike, or, in the Alternative, Administrative Motion to Allow Filing of the NAM's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion and to Set Date for Plaintiffs' Reply Brief filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Partially Granting Defendants' 96 Motion for Administrative Relief and Setting Hearing Date for Defendants' 95 Motion to Transfer and Resetting Hearing Dates for (1) Plaintiffs' 24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; (2) Defendants' 64 Motion to Dismiss; (3) Intervenor's 65 Motion to Intervene; (4) Intervenor's 67 Motion to Dismiss; and (5) Plaintiffs' 97 Motion to Strike. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 82 Declaration in Support, 85 Proposed Order, 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, 84 Declaration in Support, 83 Declaration in Support, filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/18/2011. Replies due by 11/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julia A. Olson, # 2 Proposed Order)(Olson, Julia) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Shorten Time and for Administrative Relief to Set Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue for Novemeber 28, 2011 filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/18/2011. Replies due by 11/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Buente) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066440.) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Sorenson) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Mongaven) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 77 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Martella) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Guerra) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Gregg) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed in error [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 68 Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief and Setting (1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (2) Intervenor's Motion to Intervene, and (3) Intervenor's Motion to Dismiss for Same Time as Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motions set for Hearing on 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/3/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by National Association of Manufacturers. (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Steven Messner in Support of 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, The National Association of Manufacturers Motion to Intervene and Opposition to Plaintiffs; Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of W. David Montgomery, PhD in Support of 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, The National Association of Manufacturers Motion to Intervene and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of William J. Warren-Hicks, PhD in Support of 81 Opposition/Response to Motion, The National Association of Manufacturers' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Proposed Intervenor's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Association of Manufacturers re 75 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of Quin M. Sorenson for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 334611066446) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION of Karen K. Mongoven for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066447) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION of Roger R. Martella, Jr. for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066444) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of Joseph R. Guerra for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066445) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION of Ragu-Jara Gregg for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066442) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION of David T. Buente, Jr. for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066440) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Granting Defendants' 64 Motion To Dismiss by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/1/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Granting Defendants' 68 Motion For Administrative Relief To Set Hearing Date On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Same Date As Hearing On Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 11/1/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed bySteven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by National Association of Manufacturers Corporate Disclosure Statement (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by National Association of Manufacturers (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Shorten Time and to Set Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Same Day as Hearing on Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motion -- Administrative Relief Sought filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by National Association of Manufacturers. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011)[Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] Modified on 3/5/2012 (ztcb, ). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Dr. Chad Moutray in Support of 65 MOTION to Intervene filed byNational Association of Manufacturers. (Related document(s) 65 ) (Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene filed by National Association of Manufacturers. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Samuel) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] Modified on 3/5/2012 (ztcb, ). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2011) Modified on 11/1/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] Modified on 3/5/2012 (ztcb, ). (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 4(m) (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/31/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER on Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 10/31/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Attorney General served on 10/7/11. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. U.S. Attorney served on 10/7/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Steven Chu served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Lisa P. Jackson served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Gary F. Locke served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Leon E. Panetta served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Kenneth L. Salazar served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011; Thomas J. Vilsack served on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Steven Chu, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/12/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians of Curing Service on Defendants Pursuant to Rule 4(i)(4)(B) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 10/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) ) filed bySteven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 10/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Beers Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney pro hac vice)(Beers, Thomas) (Filed on 10/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Beers) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT A of the 42 Declaration of Alec Loorz in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 , 42 , 43 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 46 Declaration in Support,, Julia A. Olson, Exhibit N filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Steven W. Running, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 46 Declaration in Support,, Julia A. Olson, Exhibit M filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 46 Declaration in Support,, Julia A. Olson, Exhibit L filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 46 Declaration in Support,, Julia A. Olson filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Julia A. Olson in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Arjun Makhijani, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Camille Parmesan, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 42 Declaration in Support, Alec Loorz filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Alec Loorz in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Lise Van Susteren, M.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Kevin E. Trenberth, Sc.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of James Gustave Speth in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Sivan Kartha, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Stefan Rahmstorf, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Jonathan Overpeck, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Madeleine MacGillivray Wallace in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of David B. Lobell, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Pushker Kharecha, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Nelson Kanuk in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Zoe Johnson in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jaime Lynn Butler in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Ove Hoegh-Guldberg, Ph.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Grant Serrels in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Garrett Serrels in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Paul Epstein, M.D. in Support of 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byNina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/12/2011. Replies due by 10/19/2011. (Olson, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011)[Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION of Thomas J. Beers for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064990) filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Steven Chu served on 8/4/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Kenneth L. Salazar served on 8/8/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Thomas J. Vilsack served on 8/4/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Robert M. Gates served on 8/10/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace , Zoe J.. Lisa P. Jackson served on 8/4/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline W. , Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S. , Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace . Gary F. Locke served on 8/4/2011, answer due 10/3/2011. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/29/2011. Replies due by 10/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 9/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.]. (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Application re 12 Case Management Scheduling Order, Motion to Vacate, filed by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 9/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE the court has reviewed the motion for related case and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 5, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 7 Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OF FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SUBSEQUENTLY A CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINES PURSUANT TO ADR SCHEDULING ORDER by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application FOR CONTINUANCE OF FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SUBSEQUENTLY A CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINES PURSUANT TO ADR SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 8/3/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Leon E. Panetta, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. (McDermott, Martin) (Filed on 8/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Nina Grove, Zoe J., Kids vs. Global Warming, Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Grant S., Garrett S., Valerie Serrels, Madeline W., Janet Wallace, WildEarth Guardians (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 8/2/2011) Modified on 8/3/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Steven Chu, Leon E. Panetta, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack. Filed by Madeline W., Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S., Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Janet Wallace, Zoe J.. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 7/27/2011) Modified on 7/28/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Steven Chu, Robert M. Gates, Lisa P. Jackson, Gary F. Locke, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611059475.) filed byMadeline W., Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Alec L., WildEarth Guardians, Garrett S., Victoria Loorz, Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, Zoe J., Janet Wallce. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2011.] (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 260 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?