CARAZANI v. ZEGARRA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00107
District Judge Rudolph Contreras, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 7:20 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo VIRGINIA CARAZANI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Moore Carpenter +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 jcarpenter@jenner.com
v.
No Logo EMMA ZEGARRA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EMMA ZEGARRA
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER in response to plaintiff's 21 letter. (Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/1/14) (tj ) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Letter from Carrie F. Apfel. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/01/2014 (jf, ) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 15 the plaintiff's motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/3/13. (TA) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 15 the plaintiff's motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/3/13. (TA) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, / Supplemental Wage Calculation filed by VIRGINIA CARAZANI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Emma Zegarra filed by VIRGINIA CARAZANI. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Proposed Order)(Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
              STATUS REPORT by VIRGINIA CARAZANI. (Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                MOTION for Default Judgment as to Emma Zegarra by VIRGINIA CARAZANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of Carrie F. Apfel in Support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Initial Disclosures and Respond to Discovery Requests, MOTION for Hearing / Motion for an Immediate Status Conference by VIRGINIA CARAZANI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Proposed Order)(Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against EMMA ZEGARRA filed by VIRGINIA CARAZANI.(znmw, ) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                      STATUS REPORT by VIRGINIA CARAZANI, EMMA ZEGARRA. (Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                        RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Case randomly reassigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER: Initial Disclosures due 4/20/2012. Montions to amend pleadings due 5/17/2012 for the Plaintiff and 5/31/2012 for the Defendant; with oppositions due 17 days later; and replies, if any due 14 days later. Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due 8/9/2012; with the Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due 9/6/2012. Supplements due 9/24/2012. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/27/2012. Discovery and all related motions due 9/28/2012. Status Hearing set for 11/16/2012 9:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/28/12. (dot ) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Response to Order of the Court
                              RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 7 Scheduling Order / Plaintiff's Report to the Court filed by VIRGINIA CARAZANI. (Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/1/12. (dot ) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 Answer
                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by EMMA ZEGARRA.(td, ) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie F Apfel on behalf of VIRGINIA CARAZANI (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Summons Returned Executed
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EMMA ZEGARRA served on 1/26/2012, answer due 2/16/2012 (Carpenter, Julie) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. This order replaces the Court's previously filed procedures order #2 on the docket. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 26, 2012. (SM) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: 1/25/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, signed on January 25, 2012. (SM) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/25/2012 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against EMMA ZEGARRA ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616045458) filed by VIRGINIA CARAZANI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td, ) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 428 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?