LARDNER v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00874-RCL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2020 at 11:37 AM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GEORGE LARDNER, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James H. Lesar +1 202 393 1921 +1 202 697 3699 jhlesar@gmail.com
v.
No Logo DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tricia Dianne Francis +1 202 616 2257 +1 202 514 8780 tricia.Francis@usdoj.gov
Space Lisa Sheri Goldfluss +1 202 514 7198 +1 202 514 8780 Lisa.Goldfluss@usdoj.gov
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Andrea McBarnette +1 202 514 7153 +1 202 514 8780 andrea.mcbarnette@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Space Diane M. Sullivan +1 202 514 7205 +1 202 514 8780 diane.sullivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Andrea McBarnette and Cindy S. Owens (Whitaker, Claire)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION for Leave to File In Camera Ex Parte by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
          STATUS REPORT Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Change of Address by James H. Lesar (Lesar, James) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
              STATUS REPORT - Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER requiring parties to submit a joint status report within fourteen days of today's date. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/7/2013. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                  STATUS REPORT - Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER denying 102 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 13, 2012. (lcrcl3/intrcl6) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rules 52(b) and 59(b) Motion for Reconsideration filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration June 2012 Lardner Decl, # 2 Declaration June 2012 Lesar Decl)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideratin by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT re 105 Memorandum in Opposition by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                            Memorandum in opposition to re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rules 52(b) and 59(b) filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re 98 Order Pursuant to Rules 52(b) and 59(b) by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rule 56(f) Lardner Decl.)(Lesar, James) Modified on 5/3/2012 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                    ERRATA re 100 Status Report by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Status Report)(McBarnette, Andrea) Modified on 4/27/2012 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                      STATUS REPORT Joint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 58 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 4, 2012. (lcrcl2/intrcl2) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER denying 95 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 24, 2012. (lchhk1) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 93 Order and Defendant's Motion for Leave to Stay Proceedings filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/04/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Stay Litigation on FBI"s New Stance in Light of Milner v. Dep't of Navy by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Case reassigned to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Henry H. Kennedy no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER for supplemental briefing on the effect of Milner v. Department of Navy, 131 S.Ct. 1259 (2011). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on November 18, 2011. (lchhk1) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Andrea McBarnette on behalf of All Defendants. Substituting for attorney Tricia D. Francis. (McBarnette, Andrea) Modified event title on 11/2/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Tricia D. Francis on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Andrea McBarnette (Francis, Tricia) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Milner Decision by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Signed Second Supplemental Declaration of George Lardner by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Attachment A, # 2 Appendix Attachment B, # 3 Appendix Attachment C, # 4 Appendix Attachment D, # 5 Appendix Attachment E, # 6 Appendix Attachment F, # 7 Appendix Attachment G, # 8 Affidavit Second Supplemental Lardner Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Lesar, James) (Attachment 12 and 13 replaced on 2/15/2011 to correct upside down pages). Modified on 2/15/2011 (znmw, ). (Various Exhibits Illegible) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT re 84 Memorandum in Opposition, 85 Reply to opposition to Motion Declaration of David Hardy by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and to Extend Briefing Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE re 80 of Filing of Corrected Supplemental Cross-Mootion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Corrected Supplemental Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Attachment A--Indices Search Form, # 3 Exhibit Attachment B--JUdgment in Lardner v. DOJ, # 4 Exhibit Attachment C--NOF of Memphis Commercial Appeal Article on Withers, # 5 Affidavit Supplemental Lardner Declaration)(Lesar, James) Modified to add link on 12/21/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Supplemental Memorandum in opposition to re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (See Docket Entry 80 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Supplemental Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Lardner Declaration)(Lesar, James) Modified event title on 12/15/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/04/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Supplemental Motion for Summaray Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to FBI's Supplement to its Motion for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Supplemental Memorandum re 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplement filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration IRS - Goldman, # 2 Declaration DEA - Little)(McBarnette, Andrea) Modified event title on 9/28/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Vaughn Index. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Part 2 of Hardy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint and Proposed Breifing Schedule by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration FBI Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to and to Set Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Breifing Schedule by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER directing the Federal Bureau of Investigation to file its renewed motion for summary judgment no later than October 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on October 5, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT October 2009 by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Declaration in support of 8/14/09 status report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of 8/14/09 Status Report)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Declaration in support of 7/2/09 status report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE re 61 Status Report (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of 7/2/09 Status Report)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 58 MOTION to Compel Release of Records FBI Transferred to NARA but Retains Copies Of filed by GEORGE LARDNER, JR. (Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 58 MOTION to Compel Release of Records FBI Transferred to NARA but Retains Copies Of filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Release of Records FBI Transferred to NARA but Retains Copies Of by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Status Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Revise Briefing Schedule by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Revise Briefing Schedule by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions and Replies by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit Lesar Decl., # 6 Appendix Local Rule 7l1(h))(Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit IRS Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Hardy Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motions for Summary Judgment by GEORGE LARDNER, JR (Lesar, James) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file the parties' dispositive motions by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Owens, Cindy) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 44 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct order granting defendant's consent motion to enlarge time for filing a Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Owens, Cindy) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 43 defendant's consent motion to amend the 5/30/07 scheduling order. Motions for summary judgment to be submitted by 7/17/08; Oppositions due by 9/1/08; Reply due by 9/22/08. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 5/27/08. (tj ) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,, file Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Owens, Cindy) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE Substituting for attorney John G. Interrante (Owens, Cindy) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a motion for summary judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by John G. Interrante on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE Substituting for attorney Diane M. Sullivan (Interrante, John) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a dispositive motion by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Sullivan, Diane) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by Diane M. Sullivan on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE Substituting for attorney Peter S. Smith (Sullivan, Diane) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing of Dispositive Motion by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Service of Revised Vaughn Declaration by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 30, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by GEORGE LARDNER, JR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, JOHN DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Status Report Order. The parties shall submit a status report and/or proposed schedule for further proceedings in this case by May 25, 2007. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on February 5, 2007. (FL, ) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Stay the Briefing Schedule and for Entry of Deadline for the Filing of Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Vaughn Declaration and Index by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION Enlargement of the Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION Enlargement of the Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order for Status Report re 15 and 21 . Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on June 6, 2006. (FL, ) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order denying as moot 12 plaintiff's motion for Vaughn Index. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on April 11, 2005. (FL, ) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 20 MOTION for Order Requiring Prompt Disclosure, Etc. and Proposed Order by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order Requiring Prompt Disclosure, Etc. by GEORGE LARDNER JR.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James H. Lesar# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the FBI's Status Report Regarding Documents Referred and the FBI's Report as to the Time Period Required to Process Investigative Records by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Report to the Court by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order Concerning Further Proceedings)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 02/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER (Kennedy, Henry) (Entered: 01/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 01/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Vaughn Index , Etc. by GEORGE LARDNER JR.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13 # 14)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 01/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order for Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Conference set for 12/5/2003, at 10:15 am before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on October 14, 2003. (FL, ) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive Relief by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1)(Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 motion in response to Complaint by JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 13, 2012. (lcrcl3/intrcl6)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Sheri Goldfluss on behalf of JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Goldfluss, Lisa) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 99 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION disposing of 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 58 Motion to Compel; and 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 4, 2012. (lcrcl2/intrcl2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Preliminary Electronic Case Filing Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on April 15, 2003. (FL, ) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by GEORGE LARDNER JR..(bcs, ) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?