Williams v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-05202

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2017 at 11:43 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jimmy Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Darius Wadia, L.L.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darius Wadia +1 212 233 1212 +1 212 571 9149 dwadia@wadialaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott A. Korenbaum, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Korenbaum +1 212 587 0018 +1 212 658 9480 scott@korenbaumlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoll, Glickman & Bellina, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Brian Stoll +1 718 852 3710 +1 718 852 3586 astoll@stollglickman.com
v.
No Logo Carlos Matos, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa Wachs +1 718 222 2332 +1 718 802 2540 mwachs@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elan David Parra +1 212 442 8600 +1 212 788 9776 eparra@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Daniel Ehrenreich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Wachs +1 718 222 2332 +1 718 802 2540 mwachs@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Christopher Francolla +1 212 788 0988 +1 212 788 9776 bfrancol@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elan David Parra +1 212 442 8600 +1 212 788 9776 eparra@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John and Jane Does 1 through 7, Defendant
No Logo Richard Pengel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Wachs +1 718 222 2332 +1 718 802 2540 mwachs@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Christopher Francolla +1 212 788 0988 +1 212 788 9776 bfrancol@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elan David Parra +1 212 442 8600 +1 212 788 9776 eparra@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa Wachs +1 718 222 2332 +1 718 802 2540 mwachs@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elan David Parra +1 212 442 8600 +1 212 788 9776 eparra@law.nyc.gov
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 7/1/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 TranscriptCourt Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 7/1/2013 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Bill of Costs
      BILL OF COSTS docketed as Judgment #13,1562 on 8/14/13 in favor of P.O. Richard Pengel and P.O. Daniel Ehrenreich, et al. against Plaintiff, Jimmy Williams for the sum of $659.20.(mro)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Judgment*Court Filing
        JUDGMENT: That the Complaint be and it is hereby dismissed. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/2/2013) (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/30/2013, Entered: 6/30/2013 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott A. Korenbaum on behalf of Jimmy Williams. (Korenbaum, Scott)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Notice of Filing Transcript
            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/13/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 74 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 TranscriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/13/2012 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Brian Stoll on behalf of Jimmy Williams. (Stoll, Andrew)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER re: [64] MOTION in Limine. filed by Richard Pengel, Daniel Ehrenreich. The motions in limine are disposed of as stated on the record of today's conference. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 64. Regarding the third motion in limine, the plaintiff may send further submissions by letter to the Court by June 10, 2013. The defendants may respond by June 12, 2013. Another conference is scheduled for June 20, 2013 at 4:30pm. Trial will begin on June 24, 2013 at 9:00am. (Jury Trial set for 6/24/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Status Conference set for 6/20/2013 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/4/2013) (djc)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER: The defendants should provide the Court with the bases for the objections to the exhibits in the Joint Pre-Trial Order by June 7, 2013. The plaintiff may respond by June 11, 2013. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/4/2013) (djc)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed correspondence from the defendants dated February 22, 2013 and March 1, 2013. The Court has received and reviewed correspondence from the plaintiff dated February 27, 2013. A final pretrial conference in this matter, plus argument on all of the motions in limine, will be held on Tuesday, June 4, 2013 at 2:30pm. The parties shall be ready for trial on 48 hours notice beginning June 6, 2013. (Oral Argument set for 6/4/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/10/2013) (djc) Modified on 5/24/2013 (djc).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Motion in Limine
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Proposed Jury Instructions
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: 2/7/2013 Endorsed Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Motion in Limine
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Request to Charge
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Request to Charge
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Proposed Voir Dire Questions
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Joint Preliminary Trial Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Proposed Voir Dire Questions
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Request to Charge
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Endorsed Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Order
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: Oral argument originally scheduled for Tuesday, December 11, 2012, is hereby adjourned to Thursday, December 13, 2012 at 11:00 am. SO ORDERED ( Oral Argument set for 12/13/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/7/2012) (ago)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Morgan D. Kunz dated 11/20/2012 re: Counsel for Defendants Pengel, Ehrenreich and Matos seek a brief aqjoumment of the oral arguinents for the pending summary judgment motions. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to Tuesday, December 11, 2012 at 4:30 pm. So Ordered.., ( Oral Argument set for 12/11/2012 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/26/2012) (pl)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE OR ORAL ARGUMENT:You are directed to appear for oral argument on the pending motion(s), to be held on Friday, November 30, 2012 at 2:30 pm in Courtroom 12B, in front of the Honorable John G. Koeltl. All requests for adjournments must be made in writing to the Court. For any further information, please contact the Court at (212) 805-0107. Oral Argument set for 11/30/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (mro)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [36] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss.SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Daniel Ehrenreich, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel. (Wachs, Melissa)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNCE proceeding held on 7/3/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNCE held on 7/3/2012 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Melissa Wachs dated 9/7/2012 re: It is respectfully requested that, as provided by the original briefing schedule set forth by Your Honor, defendants be given ten days from the date plaintiff filed his opposition to file their reply papers, i.e. until September 17, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., ( Replies due by 9/17/2012.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/7/2012) (lmb)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [36] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss.SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Jimmy Williams. (Wadia, Darius)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          DECLARATION of Darius Wadia in Opposition re: [36] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss.SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Jimmy Williams. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Wadia, Darius)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                            COUNTER STATEMENT TO [39] Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Jimmy Williams. (Wadia, Darius)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: 8/29/2012 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Melissa Wachs dated 8/29/2012 re: Defense counsel writes to the Court seeking clarification of an Order. On July 17, 2012, this matter was given a trial ready date of September 10, 2012. On August 8, 2012, plaintiff's application for an enlargement of time to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss motion for summary judgment was granted. The Court simultaneously granted defendants until September 10, 2012 to reply to this response, and extended the time to submit jury instructions until after such time as the Court ruled on two pending motions. ENDORSEMENT: The Trial ready date is adjourned until 3 weeks following decision of the dispostive motion. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/29/2012) (ago)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G Koeltl from Darius Wadia dated 8/8/2012 re: Request to extend time to at least 8/31/2012 to respond to defendants' motion. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/8/2012) (cd)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: 8/8/2012 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Darius Wadia dated 8/7/2012 re: Counsel for plaintiff requests until September 7, 2012 to respond to the defendants' pending motion to dismiss/motion for partial summary judgment on the plaintiff's constitutional right to a fair trial.The response is currently due on August 17, 2012. Attorney for the defendants does not take a position on this request but, if it is granted, would request an additional ten days in which to file the defendants reply, if any. ENDORSEMENT: 1. Time to respond extended to 8/27/2012. 2. Time to reply extended to 9/12/2012. So Ordered., ( Responses due by 8/27/2012, Replies due by 9/12/2012.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/7/2012) (js)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                    RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Daniel Ehrenreich, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel. (Wachs, Melissa)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [36] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss.SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Daniel Ehrenreich, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel. (Wachs, Melissa)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                        DECLARATION of Melissa Wachs in Support re: [36] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss.SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Daniel Ehrenreich, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C, # (2) Exhibit D, # (3) Exhibit E)(Wachs, Melissa)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                          FIRST MOTION to Dismiss., SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Summary Judgment.( Responses due by 8/17/2012) Document filed by Daniel Ehrenreich, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel.(Wachs, Melissa)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: 7/25/2012 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/15/2012, Entered: 7/15/2012 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/15/2012, Entered: 7/15/2012 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/15/2012, Entered: 7/15/2012 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                          FIRST MOTION in Limine of Plaintiff. Document filed by Jimmy Williams.(Wadia, Darius)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Joint Preliminary Trial Report
                                                                                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by Daniel Ehrenreich, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel, The City of New York.(Wachs, Melissa)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine. Document filed by Daniel Ehrenreich, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel, The City of New York.(Wachs, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER: A final pretrial conference will be held on Tuesday, July 3, 2012 at 11:00am. The parties shall be ready for trial, on 48-hours notice, as of Monday, July 9, 2012. ( Ready for Trial by 7/9/2012., Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/3/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/21/2012) (mro)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Melissa Wachs dated 6/18/2012 re: Request that time to submit the JPTO and motions in limine currently scheduled for June 22, 2012 be extended to June 29, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered. (Motions due by 6/29/2012. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2012.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/18/2012) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Melissa Wachs dated 4/04/2012 re: Plaintiff's attorney and I write to jointly request that discovery in this matter be extended for two weeks, from April 13, 2012 to April 27 2012, and that the 'time to submit the JPTO and motions in limine currently scheduled for May 25, 2012 be extended to June 22, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/04/2012) (ama) Modified on 4/9/2012 (ama).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...ENDORSEMENT: This Order is not binding on the Court or Court personnel. The Court reserves the right to amend it at any time. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/30/2012) (mro)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Melissa Wachs dated 2/7/2012 re: Counsel writes at this time to respectfully request a brief adjournment of the trial-ready date of June 8, 2012, as I have a vacation overseas previously scheduled for June. ENDORSEMENT: Ready trial date adjourned to July 6, 2012 (48 hours notice). All other dated in the Scheduling Order are unchanged. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/7/2012) (djc)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Wachs on behalf of Daniel Ehrenreich, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel, The City of New York (Wachs, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/17/2011 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            CIVIL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/20/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 1/6/2012. Dispositive motions due 5/4/2012. Motions in limine or motions to bifurcate due by 5/25/2012. All discovery due by 4/13/2012. Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2012. Ready for Trial by 6/8/2012. The estimated trial time is 5 days, and this is a jury trial. The parties will notify the Court by 1/6/12 whether a reference to the Mag. Judge for settlement would be useful. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/16/2011) (lmb)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Daniel Ehrenreich, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel, The City of New York.(Parra, Elan)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Elan Parra dated 10/13/2011 re: Counsel for the Defendant City of New York writes to request an extension of time until 10/31/2011 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Defendant also requests an adjournment of the initial conference currently scheduled for 10/20/2011. ENDORSEMENT: Time to move or answer adjourned to 10/31/2011. Conference adjourned to Wednesday, November 16, 2011 at 4:30 PM. (Initial Conference set for 11/16/2011 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/14/2011) (ab)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Richard Pengel served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Service was accepted by P.O. Amoroso. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jimmy Williams. (Wadia, Darius)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Carlos Matos served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Service was accepted by P.O. Amoroso. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jimmy Williams. (Wadia, Darius)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Daniel Ehrenreich served on 9/9/2011, answer due 9/30/2011. Service was accepted by P.O. Amoroso. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jimmy Williams. (Wadia, Darius)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: 8/22/2011 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Elan Parra dated 8/17/2011 re: I am an Assistant Corporation Counsel in the office of Michael A. Cardozo, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, representing defendant City of New York in this action. We respectfully request that defendant City's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint be extended from August 17, 2011 until October 17, 2011, and respectfully request a corresponding adjournment of the initial conference, presently scheduled for September 26, 2011, at 4:30 p.m., until a date and time thereafter convenient to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Conference adjourned to October 20, 2011 at 4:30 P.M. Defendant's response date extended to October 17, 2011. The City of New York answer due 10/17/2011. ( Initial Conference set for 10/20/2011 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/22/2011) (lmb)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Court Conference: Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2011 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (cd)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/28/2011 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York served on 7/27/2011, answer due 8/17/2011. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Aronov. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jimmy Williams. (Wadia, Darius)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/28/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Daniel Ehrenreich, John and Jane Does 1 through 7, Carlos Matos, Richard Pengel, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401012637)Document filed by Jimmy Williams.(tro)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?