Ezell et al., v. City of Chicago
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-05135
District Judge Virginia M. Kendall, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 5:44 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Action T AGt, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Action Target, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Gura & Possessky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Gura +1 703 835 9085 +1 703 997 7665 alan@gurapossessky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm of David G. Sigale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David G. Sigale +1 630 452 4547 +1 630 596 4445 dsigale@sigalelaw.com
No Logo Illinois State Rifle Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gura & Possessky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Gura +1 703 835 9085 +1 703 997 7665 alan@gurapossessky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm of David G. Sigale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David G. Sigale +1 630 452 4547 +1 630 596 4445 dsigale@sigalelaw.com
No Logo Joseph I. Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gura & Possessky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Gura +1 703 835 9085 +1 703 997 7665 alan@gurapossessky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm of David G. Sigale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David G. Sigale +1 630 452 4547 +1 630 596 4445 dsigale@sigalelaw.com
No Logo Rhonda Ezell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gura & Possessky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Gura +1 703 835 9085 +1 703 997 7665 alan@gurapossessky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm of David G. Sigale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David G. Sigale +1 630 452 4547 +1 630 596 4445 dsigale@sigalelaw.com
No Logo Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gura & Possessky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Gura +1 703 835 9085 +1 703 997 7665 alan@gurapossessky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm of David G. Sigale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David G. Sigale +1 630 452 4547 +1 630 596 4445 dsigale@sigalelaw.com
No Logo William Hespen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gura & Possessky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Gura +1 703 835 9085 +1 703 997 7665 alan@gurapossessky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Firm of David G. Sigale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David G. Sigale +1 630 452 4547 +1 630 596 4445 dsigale@sigalelaw.com
v.
City of Chicago City of Chicago, Defendant

Represented by City of Chicago

No Logo National Rifle Association of America, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "National Rifle Association"

Toggle Switch Represented by brennerlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2011 Stephen A. Kolodziej +1 312 781 1970 skolodziej@brennerlawfirm.com

Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
  Entries (283) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Attorney Fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None extension of time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Judgment - AO450
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Judgment - AO450
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for leave to file Submission Regarding Recent Legislative Action and to Cite Additional Authority in Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment 265 is granted. Motion hearing set for 6/11/2014 on this motion is hereby stricken.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion for leave to file 265 is reset to 6/11/2014 at 09:00 AM. per telephonic request.Telephoned notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 266 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion for leave to file, 265 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/10/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 265 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for leave to file Submission Regarding Recent Legislative Action and to Cite Additional Authority in Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 264 Filed: 4/5/2014, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to Rule 56 statement 259 (Response to Defendant's L.R.56(B)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Facts) (Sigale, David) (Entered: 04/05/2014)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 263 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                          REPLY by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 04/05/2014)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                            REPLY by Defendant City Of Chicago to Plaintiffs' Local Rule 56.1(B)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 261 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                              REPLY by Defendant City Of Chicago in Support of Summary Judgment (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 260 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                RULE 56 L.R.56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment 230 (Statement of Additional Facts in Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment) (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 259 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                  RULE 56 L.R. 56.1(B)(3) and (B)(3)(C) Statement by City Of Chicago regarding motion for summary judgment 230 (Wells, Mary) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file reply in support of summary judgment (unopposed) 256 is granted to 4/4/2014. Motion hearing set for 3/20/2014 on this motion is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 257 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of extension of time 256 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/20/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 256 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file reply in support of summary judgment (unopposed) (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing set for 3/24/2014 is stricken.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for leave to file Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(c) Statement of Additional Facts in Excess of Paragraph Limitation 248 is granted. MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for leave to file L.R.56.1(b)(3)C) Statement of Additional Facts in Excess of Paragraph Limitation 252 is granted. Both motions set for hearing on 3/13/2014 are stricken.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for leave to file, 252 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/13/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/08/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for leave to file L.R.56.1(b)(3)C) Statement of Additional Facts in Excess of Paragraph Limit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed L.R.56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Facts)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/08/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 251 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  RULE 56 L.R. 56.1 Statement by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment 222 Response to Defendant's l.R. 56.1 Statement of Facts (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/08/2014)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 250 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for summary judgment 222 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 249 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion for leave to file 248 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/13/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for leave to file Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(c) Statement of Additional Facts in Excess of Paragraph Limitation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 247 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association, Rhonda Ezell, Action Target, Inc., William Hespen, Joseph I. Brown, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for summary judgment 230 (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion to stay 243 proceedings is taken under advisement. The briefing schedule on the Motion for summary judgment 230 has been extended as follows: Responses due by 3/7/2014. Replies due by 3/21/2014. Ruling will be made by mail. Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 245 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to stay proceedings 243 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 244 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion to stay 243 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/30/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 243 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to stay proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion to amend/correct 239 is granted. MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for summary judgment 222 and MOTION by Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association, Rhonda Ezell, Action Target, Inc., William Hespen, Joseph I. Brown, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for summary judgment 230 are entered and briefed as follows: Responses due by 2/7/2014. Replies due by 2/21/2014. Ruling will be made by mail.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion to amend/correct 239 is entered and continued; Set deadlines/hearing as to motion for summary judgment 222 , motion for summary judgment 230 , motion to amend/correct 239 are entered and continued to 12/18/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 240 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion to amend/correct 239 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/12/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to amend/correct Summary Judgment Record (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 238 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Alan Gura of Change of Address (Gura, Alan) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 237 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for summary judgment 230 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/12/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 236 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Exhibit List (Exhibits 16-18) by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16 - City of Chicago Zoning Map (Sept. 28, 2012), # 2 Exhibit 17 - Deposition of Kevin Schnoes, # 3 Exhibit 18 - Deposition of Philip Cook)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 235 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Exhibit List (Exhibits 11-15) by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11 - Deposition of Rosemary Krimbel, # 2 Exhibit 12 - Deposition of Robert Fahlstrom, # 3 Exhibit 13 - Deposition of Kevin Johnson, # 4 Exhibit 14 - Deposition of Patricia Scudiero, # 5 Exhibit 15 - Deposition of Steven Valenziano)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 234 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Exhibit List (Exhibits 6-10) by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 - Deposition of Julianne Versnel, # 2 Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Jonathan Gordon, # 3 Exhibit 8 - Deposition of Paul Kuzmiercyzk, # 4 Exhibit 9 - Deposition of Lorin Kramer, # 5 Exhibit 10 - Deposition of JAck Giordano)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 233 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Exhibit List (Exhibits 1-5) by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Depositon of Rhonda Ezell, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Joseph I. Brown, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of William Hespen, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Richard Pearson, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Chris Hart)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 232 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment 230 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 231 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RULE 56 Local Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment 230 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 230 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiffs Illinois State Rifle Association, Rhonda Ezell, Action Target, Inc., William Hespen, Joseph I. Brown, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for summary judgment (Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 229 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion for summary judgment 222 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/12/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 228 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPENDIX motion for summary judgment 222 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31-36, # 2 Exhibit 37-40, # 3 Exhibit 41, # 4 Exhibit 42-46)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 227 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  APPENDIX (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18-21, # 2 Exhibit 22-23, # 3 Exhibit 24-25, # 4 Exhibit 26-30)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 226 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    APPENDIX motion for summary judgment 222 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 14-16 Part I, # 2 Exhibit 16 Part II, # 3 Exhibit 17 Part I, # 4 Exhibit 17 Part II)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 225 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      APPENDIX motion for summary judgment 222 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Exhibit 6-7 Part I, # 3 Exhibit 7 Part II -9, # 4 Exhibit 10-13)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RULE 56 56.1(a)(3) Statement by City Of Chicago regarding motion for summary judgment 222 (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 223 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in support of motion for summary judgment 222 (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 222 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for summary judgment (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for leave to file excess pages in support of summary judgment 217 is granted. Page limitation is between 80 - 100 pages. MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment 219 is granted. Cross motion for summary judgment with supporting memoranda due by 12/5/2013. Responses due by 1/10/2014. Replies due by 1/24/2014. Ruling will be made by mail. Motion hearing set for 11/21/2013 on this motion is hereby stricken.Advised in open court notice(tsa, ) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file 219 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/21/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment (Sigale, David) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 217 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/20/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for leave to file excess pages in support of summary judgment (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Mary Eileen Cunniff Wells (Wells, Mary) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 215 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held on 10/16/2013. Unopposed motion for extension of time to extend discovery 213 is granted. Motion hearing set for 10/17/2013 on this motion is hereby stricken. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda due by 11/22/2013. Responses due by 12/20/2013. Replies due by 1/10/2014. Ruling will be made by mail. Status hearing set for 3/24/2014 at 09:00 AM.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 214 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of extension of time 213 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/17/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to Extend Expert Discovery (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing reset for 10/16/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing set for 8/13/2013 is stricken and reset to 8/20/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Defendant City's motion for extension of time to complete expert discovery 208 is granted to 10/15/2013. Dispositive motions to be filed by 10/30/2013. Responses by 11/27/2013. Replies by 12/11/2013. Ruling will be made by mail. (mgh, ) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of extension of time 208 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/17/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to complete expert discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 207 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to amended complaint by City Of Chicago(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held on 2/28/2013 and continued to 8/13/2013 @ 9:00 a.m. Limited fact discovery is ordered closed by 6/3/2013. Expert discovery cut off set for 7/19/2013. Defendant expert disclosure report by 5/31/2013. Any plaintiff expert disclosures by 6/21/2013. Expert depositions by 7/31/2013. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda due by 8/26/2013. Responses due by 9/23/2013. Replies due by 10/7/2013. Ruling will be made by mail. Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Minute entry 203 is amended to correct the following sentences with the correct dates: That limited fact discovery is ordered closed by April 1, 2013. The Expert Discovery Schedule is amended so that expert discovery is now ordered closed by April 29, 2013. The rest of the order shall stand.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 204 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/22/2013.Mailed notice(tsa, ) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the Citys Motion to Strike Interrogatory Responses and Bar Plaintiffs from Introducing New Claims is denied, in part, and granted in part. The Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is granted. The City is granted leave to take additional fact discovery. That limited fact discovery is ordered closed by April 1, 2012. The Expert Discovery Schedule is amended so that expert discovery is now ordered closed by April 29, 2012.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 202 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing held on 2/4/2013. For the reasons set forth in the Court's forthcoming Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant City of Chicago's motion to strike interrogatory responses and bar plaintiff from introducing new claims 188 is denied and Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file second amend complaint 194 is granted. Plaintiffs' second amended complaint is due by February 7, 2013. Defendant's answer is due by March 4, 2013. A status hearing is set for 2/28/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re amended complaint 200 (Notice of FiIing) (Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 200 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED complaint by Illinois State Rifle Association, Rhonda Ezell, Action Target, Inc., William Hespen, Joseph I. Brown, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. against City Of Chicago (Sigale, David) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Ruling on motion to strike 188 is reset to 2/4/2013 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing set for 1/29/2013 is stricken and reset to 2/4/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 197 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by Defendant City Of Chicago In Support Of Motion To Bar Additional Claims and Response To Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiff's motion for extension of time 192 is granted. MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for leave to file Second Amended Complaint 194 is taken under advisement. Defendant to file a combined response/reply by 12/13/2012. Status hearing set for 1/29/2013 @ 9:00 a.m.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for leave to file, 194 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/10/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 194 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of extension of time 192 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/10/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 192 Filed: 12/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for extension of time for Dispositive Motions (Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 191 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to strike interrogatory responses and bar plaintiffs from introducing new claims 188 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 041112 e-mail, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 042512 letter, # 3 Exhibit 3 - KramerOne Report, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 040212 e-mail)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion to strike 188 is entered and briefed as follows: Responses due by 11/29/2012. Replies due by 12/13/2012. Ruling set for 1/29/2012 at 9:00 a.m. The Court suspends the expert discovery cut off until a ruling on the pending motion has been made. Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion to strike 188 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/8/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 188 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to strike interrogatory responses and bar plaintiffs from introducing new claims (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/19/12 before the Honorable Morton Denlow. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen M. Fennell, Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/31/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2013. (Fennell, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Daniel G. Martin:In light of the district court's minute order entry - docket no. 185 . Status hearing previously set for 10/22/2012 is stricken. Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 185 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held on 10/9/2012. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear. The Court withdraws the referral to the magistrate judge.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 184 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Status hearing set for 10/22/2012 at 10:00 a.m. to stand in courtroom 1350. Counsel shall file and deliver an updated status report to chambers, Room 1356, at least three (3) business days before the status hearing.Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 referring case to magistrate judgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that Daniel G. Martin has entered on duty as a Magistrate Judge for the Northern District of Illinois, with a duty in Chicago, Illinois, effective October 1, 2012; therefore Pursuant to Internal Operating Procedure 17, the attached list of civil cases previously pending before Magistrate Judge Denlow are hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Martin. It is further ordered that the attached list of civil referrals previously before Magistrate Judge Denlow are hereby transferred to Magistrate Judge Martin. It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Martin is to become the designed magistrate judge pursuant to Local Rule 72.1 in any pending civil or criminal case where Magistrate Judge Denlow was the designated magistrate judge as of September 30, 2012. It is further ordered that, unless otherwise ordered by Magistrate Judge Martin, all hearing dates, deadlines, and schedules set by Magistrate Judge Denlow in the attached list of cases are to remain in effect. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order is to become effective on October 1, 2012. Case referred to the Honorable Daniel G. Martin. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/01/12. (ef, ) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow: Status hearing set for 9/13/2012 is stricken by agreement of the parties and reset to 10/22/2012 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (ldg, ) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Defendant's unopposed motion to amend the discovery schedule to allow time for expert discovery 179 is granted. Expert discovery ordered closed by 11/13/2012. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda to be filed by 12/13/2012. Responses to be filed by 1/14/2013; replies to be filed by 1/28/2013. Ruling will be by mail. Notice of hearing set for 9/11/2012 180 is stricken. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion to amend/correct 179 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/11/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to amend/correct the Discovery Schedule to Allow Time for Expert Discovery (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Unopposed MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery 174 is granted. Fact Discovery ordered closed by 9/27/2012. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda due by 10/26/2012. Responses due by 11/30/2012. Replies due by 12/14/2012. Ruling will be made by mail. Status hearing set for 10/9/2012 at 09:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 8/14/2012 on this motion is hereby stricken.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 174 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/20/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AGREED PROTECTIVE Order (Exhibit) Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/2/2012.Mailed notice(smm) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 174 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/20/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery (Unopposed) (Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow: Motion hearing held on 8/6/2012. With respect to F.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) notice of deposition portion of the motion to compel 162 the motion is granted in part and denied in part as stated in open court. This resolves all remaining issues related to the motion to compel. Status hearing is set for 9/13/2012 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ldg, ) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AGREED PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/25/2012.Mailed notice(smm) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Agreed MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for protective order 169 is granted. Motion hearing set for 7/31/2012 on this motion is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion for protective order 169 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/31/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 169 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for protective order (Agreed) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow: Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 7/19/2012. Motion hearing held on 7/19/2012. Parts of Plaintiffs' F.R.Civ.P.37(a)(3)(B) motion to compel are granted in part and denied in part as stated in open court. The remainder is entered and continued to 8/6/2012 at 09:15 AM.Mailed notice (ldg, ) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 opinion from appellate court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFIED Copy of OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 4/4/11; Decided 7/6/11 in USCA case no. 10-3525. (smm) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFIED Copy of MANDATE of USCA dated 7/6/11 regarding notice of appeal 81 ; USCA No. 10-3525. (smm) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BILL OF COSTS submitted by USCA; USCA No. 10-3525. (smm) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 164 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 appeal record retained
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-3525 consisting of 2 Volumes of Exhibits to be returned later. (smm) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion to compel, 162 before Honorable Morton Denlow on 7/19/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Interrogatories to Defendant, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Rule 34 Request for Production, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Rule 30(B)(6) Notice of Deposition)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing set for 7/17/2012 is stricken and reset to 8/20/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing set for 7/19/2012 is stricken and reset to 7/17/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 159 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow: Plaintiff's counsel having failed to appear, the remaining issues related to Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery responses 136 are denied without prejudice. In the event Plaintiff's counsel wishes to raise the issues again he may do so by re-noticing the motion. Status hearing is set for 7/19/2012 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (ldg, ) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Minute entry 157 is stricken and entered in error. Status hearing set for 7/9/2012 is stricken and reset 7/19/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing set for 7/9/2012 is stricken and reset to 8/20/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Unopposed MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery 152 is granted. Fact Discovery ordered closed by 8/13/2012. Motion hearing set for 6/25/2012 on this motion is hereby stricken.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 152 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/25/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Notice of motion set for 6/19/2012 is stricken as not being timely filed. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 152 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/19/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 06/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery (Unopposed) (Sigale, David) (Entered: 06/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 151 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 6/12/2012. Plaintiffs' F.R.Civ.P. Rule 37(a)(3)(B) motion 136 is entered and continued to 7/9/2012 at 09:15 AM.Mailed notice (ldg, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 150 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow: Status hearing held on 5/10/2012 and continued to 6/12/2012 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 37(a)(3)(B) Motion to Compel 136 is granted in part and denied in part for the reasons stated in open court. Regarding Interrogatories #1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 11, 12, 13, and 16 the motion to compel further answers/responses is denied. With respect to Requests for Admission #1, 3, and 4 the motion to compel further answers/responses is denied. With respect to Interrogatory #17, the motion to compel further answer is granted; Defendants to supplement their answer by May 30, 2012. With respect to Request for Admission #12, the motion to compel further answer is granted following Plaintiffs amending the request by May 17, 2012; Defendants to supplement their answer by May 30, 2012. With respect to Interrogatory #18 and Request for Admission #6, Plaintiffs hold the motion to compel further answer/response in abeyance pending further discussion with Defendant. Mailed notice (ldg, ) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re reply to response to motion, 148 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 148 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to compel discovery responses 136 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow:Plaintiffs motion to compel discovery responses 136 set for 5/2/2012 is stricken. Status hearing set for 5/10/2012 at 10:00 A.M. to stand.Mailed notice (ldg, ) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 146 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow:Plaintiffs motion to compel discovery responses 136 is set for 5/2/2012 at 09:15 AM.Mailed notice (ldg, ) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 145 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow:This matter has been referred to Judge Denlow for ruling on a pending motion. If no briefing schedule has been set or if no briefing is desired, the parties are to notice the motion up on Mondays or Wednesdays at 9:15 a.m. Judge Denlow does not desire briefs on discovery disputes. Otherwise, the parties are to appear for status or argument at 10:00 a.m. on 5/10/2012. Mailed notice (ldg, ) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Morton Denlow pursuant to Local Rule 72.1 to perform such additional duties as are not inconsistent with the Constitution and laws of the United States: Motion to compel 136 . Signed by Executive Committee on 4/16/12.(smm) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 143 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to compel discovery responses 136 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 142 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Plaintiff Rhonda Ezell to quash Subpoenas 140 is denied for the reasons stated on the record in open court. Alternative motion for protective order is granted. The subpoena is narrowed to July.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Athis Muchoney for presentment of motion to quash 140 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/12/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Muchoney, Andrew) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiff Rhonda Ezell to quash Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Muchoney, Andrew) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 139 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiff's motion for protective order 134 and to quash depositions is denied for the reasons stated on the record in open court. Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery responses 136 is entered and briefed as follows: Response by 4/17/2012. Plaintiff to reply by 4/24/2012. Ruling will be made by mail. Fact Discovery is extended and ordered closed by 6/29/2012. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda due by 9/21/2012. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 11/9/2012. Ruling will be made by mail. Expert discovery cut off set for 8/31/2012. Status hearing stricken for 4/23/2012 and reset for 7/9/2012 at 09:00 AM. The Court allows two (2) hours more for each deposition. Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 138 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 81 (USCA no. 10-3525) consisting of one volume of transcripts. (smm) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion to compel, 136 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/3/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 3/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to compel discovery responses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's Answers to Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit Defendant's Responses to Request for Production, # 3 Exhibit Defendant's Answers to Request to Admit)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for protective order 134 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/3/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for protective order and to quash depositions (Sigale, David) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/26/2011 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Status Conference. Court Reporter Contact Information: April Metzler, april.courtreporter@gmail.com, 419-787-1832. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2012. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 03/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to amended complaint by City Of Chicago(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:For the below reasons, the Court will not enter Ezells proposed injunction order. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held on 10/26/2011. Fact Discovery ordered closed by 4/20/2012. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda due by 7/13/2012. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/24/2012. Ruling will be made by mail. Status hearing set for 4/23/2012 at 09:00 AM. to inform the Court if the parties would like to engage in settlement negotiations. Defendant's oral motion to answer the complaint by 11/16/2011 is granted. The Court denies the entry of a preliminary injunction by the plaintiff.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Defendant City Of Chicago In Support of Its Objections to the Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 128 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to objections 123 to Entry of Preliminary Injunction (Sigale, David) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 10/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re amended complaint 126 (Notice of Filing) (Sigale, David) (Entered: 10/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 126 Filed: 10/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED complaint by Illinois State Rifle Association, Rhonda Ezell, Action Target, Inc., William Hespen, Joseph I. Brown, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. against City Of Chicago (Sigale, David) (Entered: 10/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 125 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Written response to the defendant's objection to the entry of a preliminary injunction is due by 10/18/2011. Reply by 10/25/2011. Ruling will be made by mail.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 124 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Submission of E-mailed Proposed Injunction Order by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS Defendant's Objection to the Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 122 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/28/2011.(tsa, ) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 121 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Citys motion to dismiss the case as moot is denied. By September 30, 2011, the parties shall file an agreed proposed injunction order, or separate proposedinjunction orders if they cannot agree. Ezell must file her amended complaint by October 15, 2011. The parties shall appear for a status on October 26, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss the schedule going forward. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by City Of Chicago re reply to response to motion 119 to dismiss Plaintiffs' Case as Moot (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by City Of Chicago to memorandum in opposition to motion 118 to dismiss Plaintiffs' Case as Moot (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. in Opposition to motion to dismiss 114 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gura, Alan) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendant's motion to dismiss 114 , Replies due by 9/12/2011. Ruling will be made by mail.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' case as moot 114 is entered and briefed as follows: Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. Ruling will be made by mail. Motion hearing set for 8/15/2011 is stricken. Status hearing set for 10/25/2011 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion to dismiss 114 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/15/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to dismiss Plaintiffs' Case as Moot (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 opinion from appellate court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFIED Copy of OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 4/4/11; Decided 7/6/11 in USCA case no. 10-3525. (smm) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFIED MANDATE of USCA dated 7/6/11 regarding notice of appeal 81 ; USCA No. 10-3525. The district court's order denying the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is REVERSED, with costs, and the case is REMANDED with instructions to enter a preliminary injunction consistent with this opinion. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (smm) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Appeal Record Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-3525 consisting of record to be returned later. (smm) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BILL of COSTS submitted by USCA; USCA No. 10-3525. (smm) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/8/2011:For the foregoing reasons, the Citys motion to stay (Doc. 85) is granted and its motion to dismiss (Doc. 67) is denied without prejudice. Entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/8/2011.Mailed notice(tsa, ) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 text entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Minute entry 107 is stricken and was entered in error.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to stay proceedings pending appeal or in the alternative for extension of time 85 is dismissed as moot.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/17/2011, Entered: 1/17/2011 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by David G. Sigale of Change of Address (Sigale, David) (Entered: 01/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 supplemental record on appeal sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 81 (USCA no. 10-3525) consisting of 1 Volume of pleadings, 2 Volumes of Exhibits. (smm) (smm, ). (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: 12/28/2010 received record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA RECEIVED on 12/22/10 the supplemental record regarding notice of appeal 81 . (smm) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS and Transcript Designations by Defendant City Of Chicago. (Document not scanned). (smm) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS and Transcript Designations by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Document not scanned). (smm) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by Defendant City Of Chicago in support of motion to stay proceedings pending appeal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held on 12/22/2010.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Order on Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Agreed MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to supplement 94 the record on appeal is granted. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 supplemental record on appeal sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 81 (USCA no. 10-3525) consisting of 1 pdf Efiled Transcripts. (smm) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by City Of Chicago re status report 96 (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS Report (Joint) by City Of Chicago (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W Worseck for presentment of motion to supplement 94 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/22/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to supplement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Hearing Exhibits)(Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re response to motion, 92 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to stay proceedings pending appeal or in the alternative for extension of time 85 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/29/2010 received record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA RECEIVED on 11/23/10 the long record regarding notice of appeal 81 (dj, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/10/10 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Emergency Motion Hearing. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2011. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 transmitted long record to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 81 (USCA no. 10-3525) (dj, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendant's motion to stay 85 is entered and briefed as follows: Responses due by 12/6/2010. Replies due by 12/22/2010. Status hearing set for 12/22/2010 at 09:00 AM. The response is stayed on motion 67 until the Courts ruling on the motion to stay 85 . Defendant's reply in support is entered and continued until the motion to stay is ruled upon. Status hearing set for 11/17/2010 is stricken. Parties are to provide a status report by 12/20/2010. Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 61 . 62 . 63 is granted. Mailed notice (nf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion to stay 85 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/15/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to stay proceedings pending appeal or in the alternative for extension of time (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 USCA acknowledgment of short record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 81 ; USCA Case No. 10-3525. (smm) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 transmitted short record to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 81 . Notified counsel (dj, ) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 notice of appeal due letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record (dj, ) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appeal by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. regarding orders 77 , 78 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-5367812. (Gura, Alan) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. in Opposition to motion to dismiss 67 (Gura, Alan) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendant's motion to dismiss 67 is entered and briefed as follows: Responses due by 10/28/2010. Replies due by 11/4/2010. Ruling will be made by mail. Parties need not appear in court on 10/14/2010. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Memorandum, Opinion & Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/12/2010.(tsa, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs have failed to support their contention that they have been irreparably harmed by the Citys ban on firing ranges. Each individual plaintiff has the ability to travel to have firing range training conducted outside of the Citys borders and the organizational Plaintiffs have failed to support their contention that residents are unable to obtain their training outside the City with any evidence. Even if Plaintiffs could demonstrate that they were harmed by the new ordinance, that harm can be remedied through monetary damages in the likelihood that they succeed on the merits. Finally, no court has expanded the breadth of the Second Amendment right of possession within ones residence as established in Heller to the right to train at a firing range within ones municipality and therefore there is questionable likelihood of success on the merits. Therefore, Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction is denied. Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/4/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Vol 2-B. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/4/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Vol 2-A. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/1/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Vol 1. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/16/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Emergency Motion for TRO - Vol 2. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/15/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Emergency Motion for TRO - Vol 1. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/24/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Emergency Motion for TRO - Vol 2. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/23/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Emergency Motion for TRO - Vol 1B. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/23/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Emergency Motion for TRO - Vol 1A. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Metzler, April) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion to dismiss 67 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/14/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to dismiss plaintiffs' complaint (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Preliminary Injunction hearing held on 10/4/2010. The Court will rule by mail.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus National Rifle Association by Stephen A. Kolodziej (Kolodziej, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Preliminary Injunction hearing held on 10/1/2010 and continued to 10/4/2010 at 09:30 AM.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5278888. Motion of Jesse Panuccio for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5278846. Motion of David H. Thompson for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5278746. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Amicus National Rifle Association for leave to file Brief as Amicus Curiae (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae National Rifle Association, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Notice of Affiliates)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus National Rifle Association by Charles J. Cooper -- Appearance of Stephen A. Kolodziej (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendants motions for extension of time to answer 40 , 48 is granted to 10/8/2010 for an answer or to otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint. Defendant's Emergency Motion for Leave to Allow Additional Discovery or in the Alternative to Bar Certain Witnesses 44 is granted. Plaintiff's motion in limine #1 to exclude the testimony of six witnesses 50 is denied as to Dan Bartoli. Defendants are required to submit a summary statement of Dan Bartoli to plaintiff. The motion is also denied as to Pattie Scudiero and dismissed as moot as to the other four witnesses by agreement of the parties. Plaintiff's oral motion to depose Pattie Scudiero is granted and limited to one hour. Defendant's are permitted to depose the property owner and real estate owner each, but limited to one hour. Miss Versnell may also be deposed, but limited to one hour regarding new information. Plaintiffs must provide a copy of the new contract to defendant. (tsa, ) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re response to motion, 56 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file answer Filed as Emergency Motion 48 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re memorandum in opposition to motion 54 to Allow Additional Discovery or Bar Certain Witnesses (Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief 44 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. re reply to response to motion,, 52 (Gura, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for preliminary injunctionMOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for permanent injunction 4 , memorandum in opposition to motion 42 (Gura, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Alan Gura for presentment of motion in limine, 50 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/28/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Gura, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.in limine no. 1: to exclude six witnesses (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Gura, Alan) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 48 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/28/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file answer Filed as Emergency Motion (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 44 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/28/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing stricken for 9/23/2010 and reset for 9/28/2010 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 44 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/23/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant City Of ChicagoDefendant's Emergency Motion for Leave to Allow Additional Discovery or in the Alternative to Bar Certain Witnesses (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by City Of Chicago re memorandum in opposition to motion 42 for preliminary injunction (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion for preliminary injunction, motion for permanent injunction,, 4 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 40 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/23/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for leave to file excess pages instanter 37 is granted. The brief shall be filed as a separate document and not as an attachment.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 37 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/23/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for leave to file excess pages instanter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A-D)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 order on motion for temporary restraining order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for temporary restraining order 25 is denied. MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to vacate briefing schedule and preliminary injunction hearing set for October 1 27 is denied. Status hearing set for 9/23/2010 at 09:00 AM.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re memorandum in opposition to motion 31 to vacate briefing schedule (Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 order on motion for temporary restraining order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiff's motion for TRO 25 is entered and continued for ruling on 9/16/2010 at 04:00 PM. Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by City Of Chicago re memorandum in opposition to motion 32 (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago in Opposition to motion for temporary restraining order,, 25 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E-K, # 4 Exhibit L-P)(Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. in Opposition to motion to vacate 27 briefing schedule and hearing (Gura, Alan) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by William Macy Aguiar (Aguiar, William) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch for presentment of before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/15/2010 at 04:00 PM. (Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to vacate briefing schedule and preliminary injunction hearing set for October 1 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Hirsch, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED motion for temporary restraining order,, 25 Corrected Memorandum in Support (Gura, Alan) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for temporary restraining order (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Declaration of Andre Queen, # 3 Declaration of Richard Pearson, # 4 Declaration of Julianne Versnel, # 5 Declaration of Jerry Tilbor, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Declaration of Alan Gura, # 10 Memorandum in Support, # 11 Notice of Filing)(Gura, Alan) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Order on Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Emergency Motion by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to quash Unserved Subpoenas Duces tecum 21 is denied for the reasons stated on the record in open court.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion to quash 21 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/10/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. in support of motion to quash 21 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan Gura)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. to quash Unserved Subpoenas Duces tecum (Sigale, David) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Mardell Nereim (Nereim, Mardell) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Michael A. Forti (Forti, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Initial status hearing set for 11/17/2010 @ 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 11/10/2010. (See Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about status reports). The parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing.Mailed notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 order on motion for temporary restraining order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Temporary restraining order hearing held on 8/24/2010. Plaintiff's motion for TRO 11 is denied without prejudice for the reasons stated on the record in open court. Minute entry 13 is stricken. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary and permanent injunction 4 is briefed as follows: Responses due by 9/20/2010 Replies due by 9/27/2010. Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 10/1/2010 at 01:00 PM. Defendant's oral motion to keep the previous schedule is denied. Any discovery shall be complete by 9/13/2010. Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Temporary restraining order hearing held on 8/23/2010. Ruling set for 8/24/2010 at 09:30 AM.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for temporary restraining order 11 (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order 11 is set for hearing 8/23/2010 at 03:30 PM.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiff's motion for preliminary and permanent injunction 4 are entered and briefed as follows: Responses due by 10/7/2010. Replies due by 10/14/2010. Oral argument set for 10/15/2010 @ 1:00 p.m. Defendant's oral motion for discovery on preliminary injunction is granted to 9/30/2010.Advised in open court notice (tsa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. re complaint 1 (Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/22/2010, Entered: 8/22/2010 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for temporary restraining order (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing, # 2 Supplement Brief in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Declaration of Alan Gura)(Gura, Alan) (Entered: 08/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 9 is granted. Attorney Alan Gura for Action Target, Inc.,Alan Gura for Joseph I. Brown,Alan Gura for Rhonda Ezell,Alan Gura for William Hespen,Alan Gura for Illinois State Rifle Association,Alan Gura for Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. added. Mailed notice (smm) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5123851. (Gura, Alan) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Andrew W Worseck (Worseck, Andrew) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction, motion for permanent injunction,, 4 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/23/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction, motion for permanent injunction,, 4 (Corrected) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julianne Versnel, # 2 Exhibit (Exh. A to Versnel Declaration), # 3 Exhibit (Exh. B to Versnel Declaration), # 4 Declaration of Richard Pearson, # 5 Declaration of William Hespen, # 6 Declaration of Joseph I. Brown, # 7 Declaration of Rhonda Ezell, # 8 Declaration of Chris Hart)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction, motion for permanent injunction,, 4 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Trailer Rental Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Lease Agreement, # 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Julianne Versnel, # 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Richard Pearson, # 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of William Hespen, # 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Joseph I. Brown, # 7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Rhonda Ezell, # 8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Chris Hart)(Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for preliminary injunction, MOTION by Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for permanent injunction (Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Action Target, Inc., Joseph I. Brown, Rhonda Ezell, William Hespen, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. by David G. Sigale (Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 civil cover sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by Illinois State Rifle Association, Rhonda Ezell, Action Target, Inc., William Hespen, Joseph I. Brown, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.; Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5119115.(Sigale, David) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 183 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?