Round Rock Research LLC v. ASUSTeK Computer Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00978
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 8, 2017 at 1:01 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Desmarais LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 rpiergiovanni@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Bondor +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 6460 paul.bondor@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
v.
No Logo ASUS Computer International Inc., Defendant

Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

No Logo Asustek Computer, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Ashby & Geddes, PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Schnurer +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 schnurer@fr.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Ashby & Geddes : D.I. # 54, 55 (cla, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
    ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of the following sealed documents, signed on behalf of Farnan LLP : D.I. # 49, 51 (cla, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
      ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING RETURN OF SEALED DOCUMENTS: Pursuant to the attached STANDING ORDER dated January 8, 2013, sealed documents identified on the highlighted docket sheet will be claimed by the FILING party/attorney no later than 3/14/14. Filing attorney or their designee shall CLAIM their sealed documents by sending an E-MAIL, Subject: Return of Sealed Documents, to returnsealeddocs@ded.uscourts.gov, listing the case number and a contact's name, phone number and address. Parties not registered in CM/ECF may call our Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to claim their sealed documents. Once sealed documents are claimed, THE CLERK SHALL prepare receipts and contact filers WHEN THEIR DOCUMENTS ARE READY FOR PICK-UP at the Clerk's Office, 844 N. King Street, Intake Help Desk, Room 4209. Documents not claimed shall be unsealed and handled pursuant to the standing order. (Attachments: # 1 Highlighted Docket Sheet) (cla, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,255,109; 5,787,174; 5,938,764; 5,991,843; 6,002,613; US 7,101,727 B2; US 7,138,823 B2; US 7,285,979 B2; US 7,389,369 B2; US 7,336,531 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Dismissal)(nms) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Round Rock Research LLC as to Defendants (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
            STIPULATION Regarding Time To Respond, by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Maguire, Lauren) Modified on 9/4/2013 (nms). (Entered: 09/03/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER Granting in part and Denying in Part the Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 17 ), and Denying the Motion to Transfer (D.I. 17 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2013. (nms) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 61 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                MEMORANDUM OPINION re 17 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Transfer. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2013. (nms) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tawen Chang - filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                    Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding Graphics Properties Holdings Decision. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Andrew C. Mayo regarding the applicability of Judge Stark's June 28, 2013 decision in Graphics v. ASUS, C.A. No. 12-210-LPS to Defendants' motion to dismiss or transfer. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                        REDACTED VERSION of 55 Declaration of James C. Pistorino by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                          REDACTED VERSION of 54 Reply Brief by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                            SEALED DECLARATION of James C. Pistorino re 54 Reply Brief, by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) Modified on 9/17/2012 (nms). (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                              SEALED REPLY BRIEF re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                REDACTED VERSION of 51 Declaration of Lauren Nowierski by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                  REDACTED VERSION of 49 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                    SEALED DECLARATION of Lauren M. Nowierski re 49 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 9/9/2012 (nms). (Entered: 09/08/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION of Joseph J. Farnan, III re 49 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 9/9/2012 (nms). (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                        SEALED Supplemental ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/17/2012. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 9/9/2012 (nms). (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 08-17-12 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2012. (lad) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                            Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John G. Day regarding jurisdictional discovery dispute. (Day, John) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                              Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 45 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER TO COMPLETE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY - An In-Person Discovery Hearing is set for 8/17/2012 at 09:00 AM in Chambers to resolve outstanding discovery disputes between the parties. The parties shall each submit a letter of no more than three pages with no attachments by the close of business 8/15/2012 identifying the outstanding discovery disputes and the bases for their positions. Please see Order for further details. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/13/2012. (ksr, ) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT Concerning Motion to Dismiss by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER that the parties submit a proposed order no later than August 10, 2012, with specific dates, to make the motion (D.I. 17 ) ready for decision. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/6/2012. (nms) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren M. Nowierski - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Subpoena of Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc. by Round Rock Research LLC (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Subpoena by Round Rock Research LLC Directed to Best Buy Co., Inc., Office Depot Inc., and Staples, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding Status Report Concerning Northern District of California Case. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Day, John) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant ASUSTek Computer Inc.'s Responses to Round Rock Research's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for the Production of Documents and Things, and 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony and Defendant ASUS Computer International's Responses to Round Rock Research's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for the Production of Documents and Things, and 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Order Vacating Stay Issued by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware by Round Rock Research LLC re 35 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Order Granting Provisional Relief in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Round Rock Research's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for the Production of Documents and Things, and 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Official Transcript of Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer held on 04-06-12 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Deanna Warner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2012. (lad) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James C. Pistorino - filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Citation of Subsequent Authority Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.2(b), by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 2/27/2012 (nms). (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ASUSTek Computer Inc. for ASUS Computer International Inc... (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of Joseph P. Reid re 28 Reply Brief, by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-12)(Day, John) Modified on 2/6/2012 (nms). (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY BRIEF re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Engle - filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply brief in support of motion to dismiss to February 3, 2012 - filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                DECLARATION of Joseph J. Farnan, III re 22 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 1/18/2012 (nms). (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jonas R. McDavit re 22 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 1/18/2012 (nms). (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    DECLARATION of Gerard A. deBlasi re 22 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 1/18/2012 (nms). (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Person filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/27/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of Briefing Deadline to 01/17/2012 - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Connie Huang re 17 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Transfer, by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Day, John) Modified on 12/28/2011 (nms). (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Godwin Yan re 17 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Transfer, by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Day, John) Modified on 12/28/2011 (nms). (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Transfer, filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Day, John) Modified on 12/28/2011 (nms). (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Transfer - filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Day, John) Modified on 12/28/2011 (nms). (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,244,109; 5,787,174; 5,938,764; 5,991,843; 6,002,613; US 7,101,727 B2; US 7,138,823 B2 ; US 7,285,979 B2; US 7,389,369 B2; US 7,336,531 B2. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.- filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    SO ORDERED- re 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: ASUS Computer International Inc. answer due 12/7/2011; ASUSTeK Computer Inc. answer due 12/7/2011. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 11/10/2011. (lid) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      SO ORDERED- re 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Schnurer. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 11/10/2011. (lid) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        SO ORDERED- re 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul A. Bondor and Jonas R. McDavit. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 11/10/2011. (lid) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Schnurer - filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) - filed by ASUS Computer International Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc.. (Day, John) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed by Round Rock Research LLC. ASUS Computer International Inc. served on 10/17/2011, answer due 11/7/2011. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul A. Bondor and Jonas R. McDavit of Desmarais LLP - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint sent via Registered Mail pursuant to Rule 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) to Jerry Shen, CEO and Director, ASUSTeK Computer Inc. Clerk's Office Cover Letter and Postal Receipt(s) attached.(dzs, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Rosemary J. Piergiovanni re 5 Praecipe re service pursuant to Rule 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (dzs, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      PRAECIPE filed by Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni on behalf of Round Rock Research LLC requesting Clerk to issue Rule 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) service on Jerry Shen, CEO and Director, ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (dzs, ) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (nms) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,255,109; 5,787,174; 5,938,764; 5,991,843; 6,002,613; 7,101,727; 7,138,823; 7,285,979; 7,389,369. (nms) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nms) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against ASUSTek Computer Inc., Asus Computer International Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-959931) - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(nms) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?