One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-888, ABM International, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al.
Federal Court Proceeding New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:06-md-01775
District Judge John Gleeson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 1:19 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 08 CV 0425(JG), One or More Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah Shube +1 212 274 8638 +1 212 219 6446 nshube@yahoo.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pattison & Flannery

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin J. Flannery +1 212 566 1111 mjf@patflan.com
No Logo Ab Lindex, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo Alfred Angelo, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler Travis & Rosenberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Becerra +1 305 267 9200 +1 305 267 5155 rbecerra@strtrade.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle L. Stopka +1 305 267 9200 +1 305 267 5155 mstopka@strtrade.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Nathan Wolf +1 212 883 1300 +1 212 883 0068 Kwolf@strtrade.com
No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Blair Scott +5823 582 582 3143 +1 610 649 3633

Toggle Switch Represented by Abbey, Gardy & Squitieri, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill S Abrams +1 212 889 3700 +1 212 684 5191 jabrams@abbeyspanier.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent W. Landau +1 267 773 4684 +1 267 773 4690 blandau@cmht.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. McNamara +1 202 408 4651 +1 202 408 4699 dmcnamara@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL A. SMALL +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 dsmall@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Bright +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189 tbright@gbclaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gwendolyn R. Giblin +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189 ggiblin@gbcslaw.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Much Shelist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Kanner +1 312 346 3100 +1 312 521 2100 skanner@muchshelist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay L. Himes +1 212 416 8282 +1 212 416 6015 jay.himes@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Angeles Garments, Corp., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler Travis & Rosenberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Becerra +1 305 267 9200 +1 305 267 5155 rbecerra@strtrade.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle L. Stopka +1 305 267 9200 +1 305 267 5155 mstopka@strtrade.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Nathan Wolf +1 212 883 1300 +1 212 883 0068 Kwolf@strtrade.com
No Logo Animal Land, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

No Logo Benchmark, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Bright +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry McDevitt

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Pease +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 ppease@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Butterfield +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 wbutterfield@hausfeldllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent W. Landau +1 267 773 4684 +1 267 773 4690 blandau@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric E Castelblanco Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric E Castelblanco +1 323 951 0180 +1 323 951 0183 attorney@castelblanco.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

No Logo Crismina Garments, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler Travis & Rosenberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Becerra +1 305 267 9200 +1 305 267 5155 rbecerra@strtrade.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle L. Stopka +1 305 267 9200 +1 305 267 5155 mstopka@strtrade.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Nathan Wolf +1 212 883 1300 +1 212 883 0068 Kwolf@strtrade.com
No Logo CTO-3, One or more Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Represented by Boundas, Skarzynski, Walsh & Black LLC

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VanDerGinst Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clinton A. Krislov +1 312 606 0500 +1 312 606 0207 clint@krislovlaw.com
No Logo CTO-4, One or More Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Chidi Amamgbo +1 510 434 7800 ndudia2003@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Blackwell & Blackwell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Blackwell +1 510 689 8888 +1 510 835 2848

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reginald Von Terrell +1 510 237 9700 +1 510 237 4616 reggiet2@aol.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lawrence D. Nwajei

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Dumzo Nwajei +1 323 549 0201 +1 323 549 0211

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo D.j. Fashions, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler Travis & Rosenberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Becerra +1 305 267 9200 +1 305 267 5155 rbecerra@strtrade.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle L. Stopka +1 305 267 9200 +1 305 267 5155 mstopka@strtrade.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Nathan Wolf +1 212 883 1300 +1 212 883 0068 Kwolf@strtrade.com
No Logo Foreign Purchaser Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo FTS International Express, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry McDevitt

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Pease +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 ppease@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Blair Cohen +1 215 592 1500 +1 215 592 4663 acohen@lfsblaw.com
No Logo Geodis Wilson Australia Pty Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geodis Wilson Australia Pty Ltd.
No Logo Geodis Wilson Denmark A/S, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geodis Wilson Denmark A/S
No Logo Geodis Wilson Hong Kong Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geodis Wilson Hong Kong Ltd.
No Logo Geodis Wilson Singapore Pte Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geodis Wilson Singapore Pte Ltd.
No Logo Geodis Wilson USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geodis Wilson USA, Inc.
No Logo Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. McNamara +1 202 408 4651 +1 202 408 4699 dmcnamara@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Imtiaz A. Siddiqui +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo JSNP, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry McDevitt

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Pease +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 ppease@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Blair Cohen +1 215 592 1500 +1 215 592 4663 acohen@lfsblaw.com
No Logo KappAhlaB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo Lynn Culver, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo Marc Seligman, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo Member Of PltffClass Schenker, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph Calder +1 212 940 6460 +1 212 940 3871 james.calder@kattenlaw.com
No Logo Olarte Transport Service, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry McDevitt

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Pease +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 ppease@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Blair Cohen +1 215 592 1500 +1 215 592 4663 acohen@lfsblaw.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3999, Delinear,Inc. v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG., et al.,, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Gross +1 415 544 0200 +1 415 544 0201 terry@grossbelsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One of more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3993, Alluvion Inc. v. ACE Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al.,, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-3294, Purolite Company v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Gerard Eisler +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1011, JCK Industries, Inc. v. British Airways, PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1061, Benchmark Export Services, INC. v. British Airways et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1106, JSL Carpet Corp. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1432, Thule, INC. et al v. Air Canada et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Douglas Richards +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 drichards@cohenmilstein.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter George Safirstein +1 212 271 8205 +1 212 868 1229 psafirstein@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Champlin Spencer +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mspencer@milberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1503, Rosetti Handbags and Accessories, Ltd. v. Air France ADS et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Esterkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael McLellan +1 202 337 8000 +1 202 337 8000 mgm@ftllaw.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1641, Sul-American Export, Inc. v. Air France ADS et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1655, Rapps v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1710, La Regale Limited v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1734, Gold Eye Distributors, Inc. v. Air France ADS et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-1941, Fayazi v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-2157, Perlman v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-2203, Young v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-2223, Malooly v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-2260, Antell v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-2427, Eurotrendz v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-2501, Rakoff v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-2740, Hirschbein v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3001, Maria's Collections, Inc. v. Air France-KLM et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Imtiaz A. Siddiqui +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3184, Printing Technologies, Inc. v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by (no Longer with)Cotchett Pitre Simon and mcCarthy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara L. Lyons +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 blyons@cpmlegal.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Esther L. Klisura +1 415 433 9000 +4159 415 415 9008 eklisura@psswplaw.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pearson Simon Soter Warshaw & Penny LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Lee Simon +1 415 433 9000 +1 415 433 9008 bsimon@pswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford H. Pearson +1 818 705 6800

Toggle Switch Represented by Wruck Paupore LLC - Dye/IN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Scott Soter +1 818 788 8300 +1 818 788 8104 gsoter@pswplaw.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3185, Niagara Frontier Distribution, Inc. v. Air France ADS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3188, Superior Jewelry Co. v. Air France ADS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerarld J Rodos +1 215 963 0600 +1 619 963 0838 grodos@barrack.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3189, Smith v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon T. King +1 415 229 2080 +1 415 986 3643 jking@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Paul Lehmann +1 415 229 2080 +1 415 986 3643 mlehmann@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Represented by Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by The Furth Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Patrick Dove +1 415 433 2070 +1 415 982 2076 tdove@furth.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3190, International Sea & Air Shipping Corp. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3191, American Flower Brokers v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3192, Topp, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanzman Criden Korge & Chaykin, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin B. Love +1 305 357 9000 +1 305 357 9050 klove@hanzmancriden.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3193,Bacchus Technologies, LLC v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3194, Lionheart Group, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harke & Clasby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Mitchell Bushman +1 305 536 8220 +1 305 536 8229 hbushman@harkeclasby.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3195 Sisimizi, Ltd. v. Air France-KLM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK EDWARD CAFFERTY +1 734 769 2144 +1 734 769 1207 pcafferty@caffertyfaucher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony F. Fata afata@caffertyfaucher.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marvin Allen Miller +1 312 782 4880 +1 312 782 4485 mmlaw4you@aol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Winter Sprengel +1 734 769 2144 +1 734 769 2144 jsprengel@caffertyfaucher.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Imtiaz A. Siddiqui +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3196, Blumex USA, Inc. v. Air Canada, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Albert +1 215 640 3280 +1 215 640 3281 lalbert@murrayfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Jane Fait +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 fait@whafh.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3197, Zucker's Gifts, Inc. v. Scandinavian Airlines Systems, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Represented by Lite DePalma Greenberg & Rivas, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3207, Paul Murphy v. Air France-KLM, et. al., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Imtiaz A. Siddiqui +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3211, Jain v. Virgin Atlantic Airways, Ltd. et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-3295, Finegan v. British Airways et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-4586, Paradiso, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-5452, Volvo Parts AB, v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-5453, Volvo Logistics AB, v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-5454, TNT Freight Management Holding AB, v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/17/2010, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Marc Jagher +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 Jjagher@srkw-law.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-5478, H&M Hennes & Maurtiz AB, v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-5481, Ikea Services AB, v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-5486, Deutscher Speditions Und Logistikverband E.V., v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-706 Fleurchem, Inc. v. British Airways et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaroslawicz & Jaros, Esqs.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jaroslawicz +1 212 227 2780 +1 212 227 5090 dj@lawjaros.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-725, Animal Land, Inc. v. Air Canada et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary B. Friedman +1 212 680 5150 +1 646 277 1151 gfriedman@flgllp.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Represented by Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield

Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-776, Adams v. British Airways et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Horwitz Horwitz & Paradis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gina Marie Tufaro +1 212 986 4500 +1 212 986 4501 gtufaro@hhplawny.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-827, Helen's Wooden Crafting Co. v. Air Canada et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-830, Rock International Transport, Inc. v. Air Canada et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Represented by Pomerantz LLP

No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-888, ABM International, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawrence Walner & Associates Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Walner +1 312 201 1616 walner@walnerclassaction.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-980, Mamlaka Video v. Air Canada et al, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marvin Srulowitz +1 212 686 1224 +1 212 532 3206 marvinlaw@aol.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Scarlato and Karon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEVEN A. ASHER +1 484 342 0700

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mindee Jill Reuben , +1 215 545 7200 +1 215 545 6535 reuben@wka-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Westrup Klick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Kitchenoff kitchenoff@wkalaw.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-981, Global Apparels Kenya (EPZ), Ltd. v. British Airways PLC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Osen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Osen +1 201 265 6400 +1 201 265 0303 gmo@osen.us
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-982, ACS Associates USA, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-984, Spraying Systems CO. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 06-cv-997, Spitz v. Air France-KLM et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L. Briskin +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 08-cv-308, Goldway Trading Corp v. Korean Air Lines Co., LTD et al, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiff(s) in 1:08-cv-42, Precision Associates, Inc et al v. Panalpina World Transport (Holding) LTD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Imtiaz A. Siddiqui +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or More Plaintiffs in 1:10-cv-00639-JG -VVP Benchmark Export Services et al v. China Airlines, Ltd. et al, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon P. Axelrod
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Bright +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric E. Castelblanco A Law Corp.
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd E. Palmer
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah Shube +1 212 274 8638 +1 212 219 6446 nshube@yahoo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Sweedler

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Butterfield +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 wbutterfield@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent W. Landau +1 267 773 4684 +1 267 773 4690 blandau@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Cohen +1 202 441 9724 +1 202 789 1813

Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay L. Himes +1 212 416 8282 +1 212 416 6015 jay.himes@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-04586,Paradiso, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sutton Keany +1 212 858 1223 +1 212 858 1500 skeany@optonline.net

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3971, Lozen International LLC v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Hadsell Stormer Keeny Richardson & Renick LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Hadsell, Stormer, Richardson & Renick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshue Piovia-Scott +1 626 585 9608 josh@renicklaw.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3972, Brian Fridman v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Hadsell Stormer Keeny Richardson & Renick LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Hadsell, Stormer, Richardson & Renick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshue Piovia-Scott +1 626 585 9608 josh@renicklaw.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McNicholas & McNicholas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McNicholas +1 310 474 1582 +1 310 475 7871 mel@mcnicholaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3973, Around the World Apparel, Inc v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Hadsell Stormer Keeny Richardson & Renick LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Hadsell, Stormer, Richardson & Renick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshue Piovia-Scott +1 626 585 9608 josh@renicklaw.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity CL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarina M Hinson +1 562 216 5270 +1 562 216 5271 shinson@lawgarcia.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3974, Woodrow Clark v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian Barry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Joseph Barry +1 323 522 5584
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Langan +1 310 788 0831

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3975 Y. Hata & Co., LTD vs. Air France ADS et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wexler Wallace LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark John Tamblyn +1 916 492 1100 +1 916 492 1124 mjt@wexlerwallace.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3976, Lynn Culver v. Air Canada et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3977, Jeni Redmond v. Ace Aviation Holdings, INC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3978, JSNP, INC v. ACE Aviation Holdings, INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3979, FTS International Express INC v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3980, Linkal Coporation v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3981, International Orchids Imports v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3983, Kathleen Enterprises, INC v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3984, Flowers by Fletcher, INC v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3985, Harry Okabe Flowers v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3986, TGIS Flowers INC v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Straus & Boies LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D. Battin +1 703 764 8700 +1 703 764 8704 tbattin@straus-boies.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3987, Creative Spirit LLC v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3988, RBX INDUSTRIES, INC v. AC Cargo et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3989 J.A. Transport INC v. ACE Aviation Holdings et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3990, Caribe Air Cargo, INC v. Ace Aviation Holdings, INC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3991, Leis By Ron, INC. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, INC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3992, Sangean America v. Ace Aviation Holdings, INC et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Paul Lehmann +1 415 229 2080 +1 415 986 3643 mlehmann@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/11/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry Cirillo +1 415 421 3400 +1 415 421 2234 hcirillo@steyerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Furth Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Patrick Dove +1 415 433 2070 +1 415 982 2076 tdove@furth.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3994, Ralph Olarte v. ACE Aviation Holdings, et al.,, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Cohen +1 202 441 9724 +1 202 789 1813

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more plaintiffs in 06-cv-3995, Capogiro LLC v. ACE Aviation Holdings, Inc., et al.,, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3996, Kenneth Y. Ibara, etc. v. ACE Aviation Holdings, Inc., et al.,, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3997, Floral Network LLC, etc v. ACE Aviation Holdings, Inc., et al.,, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-3998, Tropic Fish & Vegetable Center, Inc. v. ACE AviationHoldings, Inc., et al.,, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-4008, Funke Design Biuld, Inc. v. AMR Corporation et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Foote Meyers Mielke & Flowers, LLC

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Progressive Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Anthony Bulgarelli +1 312 787 2717 +1 888 574 9038 markb@progressivelaw.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-4009, R.I.M. Logistics, Ltd. v. Scandinavian Airline Systems et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lite DePalma Greenberg & Rivas, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-4010, CID Marketing & Promotion Inc. v. AMR Corporation et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Dawn M. Tancredi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dawn M. Tancredi +1 215 564 6446

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn, Connor, Weaver, Davies & Rouco, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Paul Rouco +1 205 803 4143 +1 205 328 9669 rrouco@qcwdr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whatley Drake & Kallas LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr. +1 212 447 7070 +1 212 447 7077 jwhatley@wdklaw.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-4012, Aleph Wines Corporation v. British Airways et al, Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew B. Moreland, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew B. Moreland +1 985 536 1186 +1 985 536 6445 mmoreland@becnellaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com

Represented by Strom Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity CJ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Becnel, Jr. +1 985 536 1186 +1 985 536 6445 dbecnel@rtconline.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-5200, Katie Tice vs. ACE Aviation Holdings et al, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah Shube +1 212 274 8638 +1 212 219 6446 nshube@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAREY & DANIS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flannery +1 314 725 7700 +1 314 721 0905 mflannery@careydanis.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine Kaplan & Black, RPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald L. Perelman +1 215 567 6565 +1 215 568 5872 dperelman@finekaplan.com

Represented by Freedman Boyd Hollander Goldberg Urias & Ward PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary B. Friedman +1 212 680 5150 +1 646 277 1151 gfriedman@flgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Hedlund +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 dhedlund@gustafsongluek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hulett Harper LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie L. Dieringer +1 619 338 1133 +1 619 338 1139 sldieringer@hulettharper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis Stewart +1 619 338 1133 +1 619 338 1139 dstewart@hulettharper.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-5202, SGS Logistics Services, INC v. ACE Aviation Holdings et al, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah Shube +1 212 274 8638 +1 212 219 6446 nshube@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAREY & DANIS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flannery +1 314 725 7700 +1 314 721 0905 mflannery@careydanis.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine Kaplan & Black, RPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald L. Perelman +1 215 567 6565 +1 215 568 5872 dperelman@finekaplan.com

Represented by Freedman Boyd Hollander Goldberg Urias & Ward PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary B. Friedman +1 212 680 5150 +1 646 277 1151 gfriedman@flgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Hedlund +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 dhedlund@gustafsongluek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hulett Harper LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie L. Dieringer +1 619 338 1133 +1 619 338 1139 sldieringer@hulettharper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis Stewart +1 619 338 1133 +1 619 338 1139 dstewart@hulettharper.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Much Shelist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Kanner +1 312 346 3100 +1 312 521 2100 skanner@muchshelist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Millen +1 312 346 3100

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 06-cv-5203, Association des Utilisateurs du Transport de Fret v. ACE Aviation Holdings et al, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah Shube +1 212 274 8638 +1 212 219 6446 nshube@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bolognese & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Bullion +1 215 814 6750 +1 215 814 6764 abullion@bolognese-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAREY & DANIS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flannery +1 314 725 7700 +1 314 721 0905 mflannery@careydanis.com

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine Kaplan & Black, RPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald L. Perelman +1 215 567 6565 +1 215 568 5872 dperelman@finekaplan.com

Represented by Freedman Boyd Hollander Goldberg Urias & Ward PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary B. Friedman +1 212 680 5150 +1 646 277 1151 gfriedman@flgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Hedlund +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 dhedlund@gustafsongluek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hulett Harper LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie L. Dieringer +1 619 338 1133 +1 619 338 1139 sldieringer@hulettharper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis Stewart +1 619 338 1133 +1 619 338 1139 dstewart@hulettharper.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lee Law Offices, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Won K. Lee +1 312 729 5435 +1 312 729 5436 dc5law@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo One or more Plaintiffs in 1:09-cv-01172-FB-SMG MacDonald v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Douglas Richards +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 drichards@cohenmilstein.com
No Logo Produce Solution, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
No Logo R.I.M. Logistics, Ltd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry McDevitt

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Pease +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 ppease@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

No Logo RICHARD SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Smith +1 301 432 2794
No Logo S.A.T. Sea & Air Transport, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry McDevitt

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Pease +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 ppease@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda R. Coolidge +1 212 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 mcoolidge@hausfeldllp.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Blair Cohen +1 215 592 1500 +1 215 592 4663 acohen@lfsblaw.com
No Logo Volvo North America Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Volvo North America Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry McDevitt

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel L. Orenstein +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 norenstein@bermanesq.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Pease +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 ppease@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Blair Cohen +1 215 592 1500 +1 215 592 4663 acohen@lfsblaw.com
No Logo W.I.T. Entertainment, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea L. Hertzfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ahertzfeld@cmht.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/24/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Matthew Moskowitz +1 305 372 1800 +1 305 372 3508 amm@kttlaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/24/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Harley Shepard Tropin +1 305 372 1800 +1 305 372 3508 hst@kttlaw.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/14/2008 Barbara J. Hart +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 bhart@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/10/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Delalio Bianco +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 326 2061 bbianco@omm.com
v.
No Logo AC Cargo LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George F. Hritz +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 gfhritz@hhlaw.com
No Logo Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George F. Hritz +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 gfhritz@hhlaw.com
No Logo Air Canada, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George F. Hritz +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 gfhritz@hhlaw.com
No Logo Air China Cargo Company Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George N. Tompkins, III +1 212 973 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Elliott +1 212 915 5502 +1 212 490 3038 margaret.elliott@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 09/24/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah Anne Elsasser +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Nelson Tompkins, III +1 212 973 8033 +1 212 972 8798 george.tompkinsiii@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Air China Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Air China Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George N. Tompkins, III +1 212 973 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Elliott +1 212 915 5502 +1 212 490 3038 margaret.elliott@wilsonelser.com
TERMINATED: 09/24/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah Anne Elsasser +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Nelson Tompkins, III +1 212 973 8033 +1 212 972 8798 george.tompkinsiii@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Air France, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Linklaters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery Paul Commission +1 212 424 9058 +1 212 424 9100 jeffery.commission@linklaters.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ivan Miguel Morales +1 212 903 9000 +1 212 903 9100
No Logo Air France-KLM Group, Defendant
No Logo Air-india, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reisman Peirez & Reisman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Christopher Murray +1 516 746 7799 +1 516 742 4946 emurray@reismanpeirez.com
No Logo Air Mauritius Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent M. Chen +1 518 429 4285 vchen@hblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Richard Flanagan +1 212 808 7800 +1 212 808 7897 sflanagan@kelleydrye.com
No Logo Air New Zealand Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Air New Zealand Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Holland +1 212 757 6870
No Logo Airways Corporation of New Zealand Limited d/b/a Airways New Zealand, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Holland +1 212 757 6870
No Logo Alitalia Linee Aeree Italiane S.p.a., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Biedermann, Reif, Hoenig & Ruff, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Massamillo +1 212 697 6555 emassamillo@bhmr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan, Massamillo & Andrews, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Alan Walker , +1 312 345 3000 +1 312 345 3119 rwalker@kmalawfirm.com
No Logo All Nippon Airways Co Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Constantine Cannon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alysia A. Solow +1 212 350 2700 +1 212 350 2701 asolow@cpny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckert, Scoutt & Rasenberger, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Simpson +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 cjsimpson@zsrlaw.com
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Officer/Director, AMR Corporation
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Singer Kaplan +1 202 682 7083 +1 202 857 0940 jaime.kaplan@weil.com
TERMINATED: 12/30/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra J. Pearlstein +1 212 310 8686 +1 213 310 8007 debra.pearlstein@weil.com
TERMINATED: 12/30/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Debra J. Pearlstein +1 212 310 8686 +1 213 310 8007 debra.pearlstein@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Paul Poscablo +1 212 310 8496 +1 212 310 8007 ryan.poscablo@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Alan Reiss +1 212 310 8174 +1 212 310 8007 steven.reiss@weil.com
Space Edward Soto +1 305 577 2861 +1 305 374 7159 edward.soto@weil.com
No Logo Asiana Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian Simmons +1 202 383 5414

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald A Stein +1 212 607 2834 +1 212 607 2832 gstein@ftc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw , +1 202 383 5163 +1 202 383 5414 bbradshaw@omm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Hammack +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 shammack@omm.com
TERMINATED: 11/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander P. Okuliar +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 356 2016
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Wilks +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 awilks@omm.com
No Logo Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Day Hendrickson +1 212 489 8230 +1 212 489 8340 victorhendrickson@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria G. Arlotto +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 235 9580 maria.arlotto@ropesgray.com
TERMINATED: 01/03/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Hartnagel +1 617 951 7343 +1 617 235 9326 david.hartnagel@ropesgray.com
No Logo Bram Graber, Defendant
No Logo British Airways Plc, Defendant
Officer/Director, Usair Group, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by SCURA MEALEY SCURA & STACK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph John Reilly +1 973 696 8391 +1 973 696 8571 jreilly@scuramealey.com

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

No Logo Bruce,Mc Caffrey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Todd Miller +1 202 637 9499
No Logo Cargolux Airlines International SA, Defendant

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

No Logo Cathay Pacific Airways Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward B. Schwartz +1 202 799 4516 +1 202 799 5516 eschwartz@steptoe.com
No Logo China Airlines, LTD., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com
No Logo Deutsche Lufthansa Ag, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Bell +1 202 663 6533 +1 202 663 6363 robert.bell@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Z. Stutz +1 202 663 6008 +1 202 663 6363 rachel.stutz@wilmerhale.com
No Logo EL AL Israel Airlines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Anders +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 2000 dbanders@wlrk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Ford Savarese +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 2000 jfsavarese@wlrk.com
TERMINATED: 12/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adir Gurion Waldman +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 2000 AGWaldman@wlrk.com
No Logo Emirates Airline d/b/a Emirates, Defendant

Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kaethe M. Carl +1 202 777 4501 +1 202 777 4555 kaethe.carl@freshfields.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Ensign +1 202 777 4527 +1 202 777 4555 thomas.ensign@freshfields.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine A Laciak +1 202 777 4578 +1 202 777 4555 christine.laciak@freshfields.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kate S. McMillan +1 202 777 4566 +1 202 777 4555 kate.mcmillan@freshfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson, Mag & Frizzell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E. Everson +1 816 842 8600 +1 816 691 3495 deverson@stinsonmoheck.com
No Logo Ethiopian Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ethiopian Airlines Enterprise, Defendant
No Logo Eurotrendz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sarraf Gentile LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Gentile +1 212 868 3610 +1 212 918 7967 joseph@sarrafgentile.com
No Logo Eva Airways Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris T. Casamassima +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 chris.casamassima@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ian Horowitz +1 213 680 8374 +1 213 680 8500 david.horowitz@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Howard Mutchnik +1 312 861 2350 +1 312 861 2200 jmutchnik@kirkland.com
No Logo Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Japan Airlines International Co., Ltd."
No Logo Jean Charles Foucault, Defendant

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

No Logo Kenya Airways Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Hoese , +1 215 238 1700 +1 215 238 1968 whoese@kohnswift.com
No Logo Korean Airlines Company, Ltd., Defendant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Brooks +1 202 467 7000
No Logo Lan Cargo S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com
No Logo Lufthansa Cargo Ag, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Bell +1 202 663 6533 +1 202 663 6363 robert.bell@wilmerhale.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Z. Stutz +1 202 663 6008 +1 202 663 6363 rachel.stutz@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Malaysia Airlines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas H. Flaum +1 212 859 8000 +1 212 859 4000 douglas.flaum@ffhsj.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shahzeb Lari +1 212 859 8000 +1 212 859 4000 shahzeb.lari@friedfrank.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernard A. Nigro +1 202 639 7000 +1 202 639 7003 barry.nigro@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Securities and Exchange Commission,US Attorneys'

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Daniel Roth +1 212 859 8035 +1 212 859 4000 rothjo@ffhsj.com
No Logo Malaysian Airline System Bhd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McBreen & Senior

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Weston +1 310 552 5300 +1 310 552 1205 mweston@mcbreensenior.com
No Logo Martinair Holland N.V., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frost Brown Todd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cory J. Skolnick +1 502 568 0254 +1 502 581 1087 cskolnick@fbtlaw.com

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

No Logo Nippon Cargo Airlines Co. Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Fornaciari +1 202 861 1612 +1 202 861 1783 jfornaciari@bakerlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy M. Keim +1 202 861 1669 +1 202 861 1783 jkeim@bakerlaw.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv- 980, Mamlaka Video v. Air Canada et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bernard M Gross PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warren Rubin +1 215 561 3600 +1 215 561 3000 warren@bernardmgross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Alan MacDonald +1 202 371 7260 +1 202 661 9008 gmacdona@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Murray Nannes +1 202 371 7500 +1 202 661 9191 john.nannes@skadden.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff J. VanHooreweghe +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 661 0564 jeffrey.vanhooreweghe@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckert, Scoutt & Rasenberger, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jolyon Silversmith +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 jasilversmith@zsrlaw.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-3193, Bacchus Technologies, LLC v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-3194, Lionheart Group, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Reginald Bartholomew +1 305 579 0418 +1 305 415 3001
TERMINATED: 10/22/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Brooks +1 202 467 7000
Space Thomas Roy Spencer +1 305 648 0940 +1 305 648 0950 TRSMiami@aol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret M. Zwisler +1 202 637 2201

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Stephen Carver +1 305 982 5572 +1 305 374 5095 christopher.carver@akerman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela G. Levinson +1 305 755 5825 +1 305 374 5095

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Fornaciari +1 202 861 1612 +1 202 861 1783 jfornaciari@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William King Hill +1 305 350 7202 +3512 351 351 2216 whill@bilzin.com

Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Z. Stutz +1 202 663 6008 +1 202 663 6363 rachel.stutz@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTINA M. BURDEN
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler White Boggs, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Francis Byrne Geary, Jr. +1 561 655 1100 +1 561 655 0399

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillarie Bass +1 305 579 0745 +1 305 579 0717

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Dov Edelman +1 212 832 8300 +1 212 763 7600 dedelman@hewm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George F. Hritz +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 gfhritz@hhlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Charlton Shipley, Jr. +1 305 459 6500 +1 305 459 6550
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Stock +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 EJStock@HHLAW.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Mitchell Wiseman +1 202 383 6638 +1 202 383 6610 wisemana@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Dean Silverman +1 305 377 1666 +1 305 377 1664 lsilverman@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abbott Bennett Lipsky +1 202 637 2200

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter E Halle +1 202 739 3000 +1 202 739 3001 phalle@morganlewis.com
TERMINATED: 06/22/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Willard K. Tom +1 202 739 5389 +1 202 739 3001 willard.tom@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Marc Kofsky +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 3300 akofsky@mayerbrownrowe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meredith Reade Miller mmiller@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/08/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew P. Garvey +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 matthew.garvey@ropesgray.com

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. Koob +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 ckoob@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Earle Vann, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 dvann@stblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Murray Nannes +1 202 371 7500 +1 202 661 9191 john.nannes@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Karas +1 202 429 6223 +1 202 261 0651 wkaras@steptoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Kevin Spencer +1 202 429 3000 +1 202 429 3902

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benedict Paul Kuehne +1 305 789 5989 +1 305 789 5987 ben.kuehne@sk-lawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-3196, Blumex USA, Inc. v. Air Canada, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steve W. Berman +206623 729 2fx0594 +1 206 623 0594

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clark Steven Tomashefsky +1 312 923 2769 +1 312 840 7769 stomashefsky@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Craig Medow +1 312 701 7060 +1 312 706 8657 jmedow@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckert, Scoutt & Rasenberger, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Calderwood +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 jacalderwood@zsrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jolyon Silversmith +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 jasilversmith@zsrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Simpson +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 cjsimpson@zsrlaw.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-3197, Zucker's Gifts, Inc. v. Scandinavian Airlines Systems, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-982, ACS Associates USA, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-1011, JCK Industries, Inc. v. British Airways, PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Alan MacDonald +1 202 371 7260 +1 202 661 9008 gmacdona@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Murray Nannes +1 202 371 7500 +1 202 661 9191 john.nannes@skadden.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff J. VanHooreweghe +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 661 0564 jeffrey.vanhooreweghe@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckert, Scoutt & Rasenberger, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Calderwood +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 jacalderwood@zsrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jolyon Silversmith +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 jasilversmith@zsrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Simpson +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 cjsimpson@zsrlaw.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-1061, Benchmark Export Services, INC. v. British Airways et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-1106, JSL Carpet Corp. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Alan MacDonald +1 202 371 7260 +1 202 661 9008 gmacdona@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Murray Nannes +1 202 371 7500 +1 202 661 9191 john.nannes@skadden.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff J. VanHooreweghe +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 661 0564 jeffrey.vanhooreweghe@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckert, Scoutt & Rasenberger, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Calderwood +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 jacalderwood@zsrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jolyon Silversmith +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 jasilversmith@zsrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Simpson +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 cjsimpson@zsrlaw.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-1432, Thule, INC. et al v. Air Canada et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Disch +1 202 296 8600

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Fornaciari +1 202 861 1612 +1 202 861 1783 jfornaciari@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Champlin Spencer +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mspencer@milberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Alan MacDonald +1 202 371 7260 +1 202 661 9008 gmacdona@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Murray Nannes +1 202 371 7500 +1 202 661 9191 john.nannes@skadden.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeff J. VanHooreweghe +1 202 371 7000 +1 202 661 0564 jeffrey.vanhooreweghe@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckert, Scoutt & Rasenberger, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Calderwood +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 jacalderwood@zsrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jolyon Silversmith +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 jasilversmith@zsrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Simpson +1 202 298 8660 +1 202 342 0683 cjsimpson@zsrlaw.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-1503, Rosetti Handbags and Accessories, Ltd. v. Air France ADS et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Esterkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mila Bartos +1 202 337 8000 +1 202 337 8090 mfb@ftllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-1641, Sul-American Export, Inc. v. Air France ADS et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-1710, La Regale Limited v. British Airways PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Weissman +1 202 383 7450 +1 202 383 6610 weissmans@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Karas +1 202 429 6223 +1 202 261 0651 wkaras@steptoe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Z. Stutz +1 202 663 6008 +1 202 663 6363 rachel.stutz@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-1734, Gold Eye Distributors, Inc. v. Air France ADS et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-1941, Fayazi v. British Airways PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-2157, Perlman v. British Airways PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-2203, Young v. British Airways PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-2223, Malooly v. British Airways PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-2260, Antell v. British Airways PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-2427, Eurotrendz v. British Airways PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-2501, Rakoff v. British Airways PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-2740, Hirschbein v. British Airways PLC et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-3001, Maria's Collections, Inc. v. Air France-KLM et al, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Disch +1 202 296 8600

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Fornaciari +1 202 861 1612 +1 202 861 1783 jfornaciari@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2009, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Ogden +1 202 663 6440 +1 202 663 6363 david.ogden@wilmer.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalya Katherine Scimeca +1 202 663 6045 +1 202 663 6363 natalya.scimeca@wilmerhale.com
No Logo One or more Defendant(s) in 06-cv-3184, Printing Technologies, Inc. v. Deutsche Lufthansa AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert G Badal +1 323 681 3503 +1 805 845 1156 rgbadal@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Suzanne Fitzpatrick +1 206 839 4876 +1 206 839 4801 danielle.fitzpatrick@dlapiper.com
TERMINATED: 06/26/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristen E. Sikes +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 223 2085 cristen.sikes@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen H. Cho +1 213 689 7630 +1 213 244 7629

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vernon Dick +1 202 626 6714 +1 202 457 6315 james.dick@squirepb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacie D Yee +1 213 624 2500 +1 213 623 4581 stacie.yee@squirepb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP