Fortinet, Inc. v. SRI International, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-02540-JSW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 21, 2016 at 12:24 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Scott Andrews +1 415 947 2000 +1 415 947 2099 sandrews@wsgr.com
Space Robin Lynn Brewer +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 rbrewer@wsgr.com
Space Jason M Garr +1 650 849 3472 +1 650 493 6811 jgarr@wsgr.com
Space Madeleine E. Greene +1 415 947 2000 +1 415 947 2099 mgreene@wsgr.com
Space Michael Jeffrey Guo +1 415 947 2114 +1 415 947 2099 mguo@wsgr.com
Space Jennifer J Schmidt +1 415 947 2000 +1 415 947 2099 jschmidt@wsgr.com
Space Stefani Elise Shanberg +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 sshanberg@wsgr.com
Space Ryan R. Smith +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 rsmith@wsgr.com
No Logo SRI International, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo SRI International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis Joseph Albert +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 albert@fr.com; truax-padilla@fr.com
Space Joanna M Fuller +1 858 678 4380 jfuller@fr.com
Space David B. Kuznick +1 617 542 5070 kuznick@fr.com
Space Howard Glenn Pollack +1 650 839 5070 +1 650 839 5071 pollack@fr.com
Space Michael Sobolev +1 650 839 5070 +1 650 839 5071 sobolev@fr.com
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (107) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 96 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 95 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
    LREF
    Blank 96 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING 95 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Stipulation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: 11/8/2013 Case Management Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 92 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
              LREF
              Blank 92 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: 10/22/2013 OrderCourt Filing
              CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Transcript Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Transcript Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Claims Construction / Markman Hearing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 ~Notice (other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 ~Notice (other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TENTATIVE RULINGS AND QUESTIONS RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 3, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
                              LREF
                              Blank 85 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                              TENTATIVE RULINGS AND QUESTIONS RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 3, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Order on Stipulation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013 Stipulation
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Claim Construction Statement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Declaration in Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Brief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 Declaration in Support
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: 8/21/2013 Claim Construction Statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Declaration in Support
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Brief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 Order on Stipulation
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: 7/29/2013 Stipulation
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Claim Construction Statement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED JOINT CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/8/2013 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/1/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED JOINT CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/8/2013 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/1/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Brief - Opening Claim Construction Brief filed bySRI International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Frank J. Albert, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Albert, Francis) (Filed on 5/17/2013) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                              ***MINUTES ENTERED INTO WRONG CASE - PLEASE DISREGARD ***Modified on 4/19/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 4/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER GRANTING 68 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 68 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by John M. Neukom Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff Fortinet, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-3 filed by Fortinet, Inc., SRI International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C)(Albert, Francis) (Filed on 4/9/2013) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part (64) Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:12-cv-02540-JSW; granting in part and denying in part (57) Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:12-cv-03231-JSW (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part (64) Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:12-cv-02540-JSW; granting in part and denying in part (57) Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:12-cv-03231-JSW (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine E. Greene on behalf of Plaintiff Fortinet, Inc. (Greene, Madeleine) (Filed on 3/18/2013) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Fortinet, Inc., SRI International, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 3/15/2013) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES: ORDERING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER IN PERSON ON MARCH 14, 2013 AT 9:00 AM, COURTROOM B. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES: ORDERING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER IN PERSON ON MARCH 14, 2013 AT 9:00 AM, COURTROOM B. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna M Fuller for Defendant SRI International, Inc. (Fuller, Joanna) (Filed on 3/8/2013) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sobolev on behalf of SRI International, Inc. (Sobolev, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2013) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 59 STIPULATION to Extend Claim Construction Deadlines. Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/13/2013 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/6/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3.1.13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Claim Construction Deadlines filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Smith, Ryan) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Letter Brief re Discovery filed byFortinet, Inc., SRI International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 2/7/2013) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Motion [D.I. 55] Request for a Telephonic Conference re Discovery (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 2/7/2013) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jeffrey Guo for Plaintiff Fortinet, Inc. (Guo, Michael) (Filed on 2/4/2013) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION Request for a Telephonic Conference re Discovery filed by SRI International, Inc.. Responses due by 2/15/2013. Replies due by 2/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Francis J. Albert in Support, # 2 Exhibit 2013-01-28 Ltr to Andrews fr Albert re meet and confer)(Albert, Francis) (Filed on 2/1/2013) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott Andrews for Plaintiff Fortinet, Inc. (Andrews, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2013) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying without prejudice (46) Motion to Compel; (46) Discovery Letter Brief; (47) Motion to Strike in case 3:12-cv-02540-JSW; (37) Discovery Letter Brief; d(38) Motion to Strike in case 3:12-cv-03231-JSW (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE RE DISCOVERY REFERRAL: (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY (re 47 MOTION to Strike 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery Letter Brief regarding Fortinet, Inc.'s Discovery Responses ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer J. Schmidt, # 2 Exhibit A to Schmidt Declaration)(Schmidt, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 47 MOTION to Strike 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery Letter Brief regarding Fortinet, Inc.'s Discovery Responses ) filed bySRI International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Fortinet's Mtn, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A to Decl., # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 12/28/2012) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Declaration of Jennifer J. Schmidt in Support of 47 MOTION to Strike 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery Letter Brief regarding Fortinet, Inc.'s Discovery Responses filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Schmidt, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/21/2012) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 46 MOTION to Compel Discovery Letter Brief regarding Fortinet, Inc.'s Discovery Responses filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Responses due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 1/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/21/2012) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel , Discovery Letter Brief regarding Fortinet, Inc.'s Discovery Responses filed by SRI International, Inc.. Responses due by 1/3/2013. Replies due by 1/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 12/20/2012) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David B. Kuznick (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David B. Kuznick ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7334571.) filed by SRI International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Kuznick Certificate of Good Standing)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 12/11/2012) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on September 28, 2012, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2013. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 10/23/2012) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Jennifer J. Schmidt (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer J. Schmidt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7214004.) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Schmidt, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/19/2012) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fortinet, Inc... (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 10/12/2012) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/28/2012 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 10/1/2012). Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/7/2013 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 7/16/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2012) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/28/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Declaration of John L. Whittle in Support of 35 MOTION Administrative Motion Requesting Adjustment of Date for Completion of ADR Process in ADR Order filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/27/2012) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Stefani E. Shanberg in Support of 35 MOTION Administrative Motion Requesting Adjustment of Date for Completion of ADR Process in ADR Order filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/27/2012) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION Administrative Motion Requesting Adjustment of Date for Completion of ADR Process in ADR Order filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2012. Replies due by 10/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/27/2012) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/27/2012) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Report; [Proposed] Order filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/20/2012) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION Selecting Private ADR.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION Selecting Private ADR.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Fortinet, Inc. and SRI International, Inc. filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/14/2012) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Joseph Albert for Defendant SRI International, Inc. (Albert, Francis) (Filed on 9/6/2012) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Michael Garr for Plaintiff Fortinet, Inc. (Garr, Jason) (Filed on 9/6/2012) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Fortinet, Inc. filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Plaintiff Fortinet, Inc. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (SRI International) (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 8/17/2012) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Fortinet's ANSWER to Counterclaim byFortinet, Inc.. (Smith, Ryan) (Filed on 8/10/2012) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 8/7/2012) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 20 Motion to Relate Case C-12-3231 to C-12-2540 JSW (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 Joint MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 7/25/2012) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 7/25/2012) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              SRI INTERNATIONAL INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Fortinet, Inc. bySRI International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN COUNTS AGAINST DEFENDANT SRI INTERNATIONAL, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS CERTAIN COUNTS AGAINST DEFENDANT SRI INTERNATIONAL, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 7/13/2012) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by SRI International, Inc. Pursuant to L.R. 3-16, and Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. of Civ. P. 7.1 (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 7/10/2012) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION / JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Fortinet, Inc., SRI International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 7/10/2012) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order Setting Case Management Conference and Requiring Joint Case Management Conference Statement (Dkt. #12) served on Howard G. Pollack, Fish & Richardson P.C., Counsel for Defendant SRI International, Inc. on July 9, 2012, filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 7/9/2012) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on July 5, 2012. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SRI International, Inc. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 7/3/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof of Service re 4 ADR Scheduling Order, 3 Summons Issued, 2 Statement, 1 Complaint by Fortinet, Inc. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 6/1/2012) Text modified on 6/6/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re 1 filed by Fortinet, Inc. (Smith, Ryan) (Filed on 5/25/2012) Linkage added on 5/25/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer On May 17, 2012, counsel for Plaintiff filed a Complaint and Exhibits 1-8 manually, on paper. This case has been designated for electronic filing, pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and General Order 45.The above mentioned paper document has been filed and docketed. However, General Order 45provides at Section III that cases assigned to judges who participate in the e-filing program shall bepresumptively designated as e-filing cases. Therefore, counsel for Plaintiff should submit Exhibits1-8 Only , in PDF format within 10 days, as an attachment in an e-mail message directed to the judgeschamber's "PDF" email box listed at http://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012) Modified on 5/18/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to SRI International, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN COUNTS AGAINST DEFENDANT SRI INTERNATIONAL, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification of Interested Entites or Persons by Fortinet, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgement (Summons Issued); jury demand; against SRI International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611011879). Filed byFortinet, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2012: # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit-B, # 4 Exhibit-C, # 5 Exhibit-D, # 6 Exhibit-E) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2012: # 7 Exhibit-F) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 138 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?