Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Banc of America Securities LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00532-JCM -RJJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 7:15 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grais & Ellsworth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Grais +1 212 755 0100 +1 212 755 0052 dgrais@graisellsworth.com
Space Mark Benjamin Holton +1 212 351 3891 +1 212 351 5230 mholton@graisellsworth.com
Space Mary G. Menge +1 212 755 0100
Space Leanne Marie Wilson +1 212 755 9822 +1 212 755 0052 lwilson@graisellsworth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris Peterson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joni A Jamison +1 702 474 9400 jaj@morrislawgroup.com
Space Robert R. McCoy +1 702 474 9400 +1 702 474 9422 rrm@morrislawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Christopher Jorgensen , +1 702 474 2642 +1 702 216 6178 cjorgensen@lrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erin J Cox +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 erin.cox@mto.com
Space James C Rutten +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 3702 james.rutten@mto.com
Space Marc S T Dworsky +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 marc.dworsky@mto.com
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Santoro Whitmire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oliver J Pancheri +1 702 948 8771 +1 702 948 8773 OPancheri@santoronevada.com
Space Nicholas J Santoro +1 702 948 8771 +1 702 948 8773 nsantoro@santoronevada.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua John Fritsch +1 212 558 3181 +1 212 558 4927 fritschj@sullcrom.com
Space Jeffrey T. Scott +1 212 558 3082 +1 212 558 3588 scottj@sullcrom.com
Morgan Stanley & Company LLC Morgan Stanley & Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Norman George +1 212 450 4103 +1 212 701 5103 nicholas.george@davispolk.com
Space James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
Space Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark E Ferrario +1 702 792 3773 +1 702 792 9002 ferrariom@gtlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
TEXT ONLY MDL MINUTE ORDER Suspending Rule 7.1(a) - Panel Rule 7.1(a), requiring notification to the Clerk of the Panel of potential tag-along actions, is hereby suspended in this litigation until further notice. Signed by MDL on 8/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Change of Address by Oliver J Pancheri. (Pancheri, Oliver) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
      TRANSMITTAL RETURN re 73 Order. Transferred case opened in Central District of California as case 2:12-CV-6690 on 8/3/2012. (ECS) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 73 Filed: 8/4/2012, Entered: None
        CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by MDL Panel on 8/3/12. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
          LREF
          Blank 73 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
          CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by MDL Panel on 8/3/12. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
            MINUTE ORDER regarding MDL Transfer. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 8/3/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
              CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER re MDL 2265. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, these actions are transferred to the Central District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Mariana R. Pfaelzer for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chairman John G. Heyburn II, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 8/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 70 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 7/12/2012. Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Company's motion for hearing 68 re its motion to remand to state court 42 is DENIED. The court's order on the motion to remand is complete and will issue forthwith.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Hearing re 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 7/11/2012. (MAJ) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of JPML Hearing Session and Request for Hearing by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation re 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                        STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 64 Motion to Remove Attorney Leanne M. Wilson from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJJ) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                            MOTION to remove attorney(s) Leanne M. Wilson from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 6/14/2012. (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                              (1st Notice) NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Jeffrey T. Scott, Joshua J. Fritsch and Leanne M. Wilson are in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select CM/ECF Info, to register the Attorney(s).(no image attached) (RFJ) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                (1st Notice) NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Daniel J. Schwartz, James P. Rouhandeh and Nicholas N. George are in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select CM/ECF Info, to register the Attorney(s). (no image attached) (RFJ) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER Granting 60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Court will therefore accept plaintiff's reply brief 59 filed in support of the motion to remand. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to Exceed Limitation on Length for Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 6/8/2012. (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                      REPLY to Response to 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court ; filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE to 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Replies due by 6/11/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit)(Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER Granting 52 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas N. George for Morgan Stanley & Company LLC and approving Attorney Mark E. Ferrario as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER Granting 54 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Rouhandeh for Morgan Stanley & Company LLC and approving Attorney Mark E. Ferrario as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER Granting 53 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel J. Schwartz for Morgan Stanley & Company LLC and approving Attorney Mark E. Ferrario as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James P. Rouhandeh and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark E. Ferrario (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2380447) filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley & Company LLC. Motion ripe 5/23/2012. (Ferrario, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                  VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J. Schwartz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark E. Ferrario (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2380439) filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley & Company LLC. Motion ripe 5/23/2012. (Ferrario, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                    VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas N. George and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark E. Ferrario (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2380429) filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley & Company LLC. Motion ripe 5/23/2012. (Ferrario, Mark) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER Granting 47 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey T. Scott for Barclays Capital Inc. and approving Attorney Nicholas Santoro as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER instructing parties that 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation will be adjudicated. Defendants shall file opposition within 14 days of this order. Any replies shall be filed within 7 days of the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER Granting 48 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua J. Fritsch and approving Attorney Nicholas J. Santoro as Designation of Local Counsel for Barclays Capital, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                            VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joshua J. Fritsch and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2369580) filed by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. Motion ripe 5/14/2012. (Pancheri, Oliver) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                              VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey T. Scott and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2369571) filed by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc.. Motion ripe 5/14/2012. (Pancheri, Oliver) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER Granting 12 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation. Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to Response to 12 MOTION to Stay ; filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to 12 MOTION to Stay, filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Replies due by 5/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 5/13/2012. (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER Granting 21 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Erin Cox and approving Attorney J.C. Jorgensen as Designation of Local Counsel for Banc of America Securities LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER Granting 22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James C. Rutten and approving Attorney J.C. Jorgensen as Designation of Local Counsel for Banc of America Securities LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER Granting 23 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc T.G. Dworsky and approving Attorney JC Jorgensen as Designation of Local Counsel for Banc of America Securities, LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER Granting 18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mary G. Menge for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation and approving Morris Law Group as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Granting 19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David J. Grais and approving Morris Law Group as Designation of Local Counsel for FDIC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER Granting 20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark B. Holton and approving Morris Law Group as Designation of Local Counsel as to FDIC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 20 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached). (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 19 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached). (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 18 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached). (McCoy, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 21 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC (no image attached)IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Erin Cox defendant's counsel is directed to correct questions, 5,6,7 and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#21) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Cox's Verified Petition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 23 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 22 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 21 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 20 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (no image attached)IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Mark Holton plaintiff's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6 and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#20) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Holton's Verified Petition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 23 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Marc Dworsky defendant's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6,7, and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#23) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Dworsky's Verified Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 22 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that James Rutten defendant's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6,7 and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#22) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Rutten's Verified Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 19 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURTthat David J. Grais plaintiff's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6, and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#19) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Grais's Verified Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 18 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Mary G. Menge plaintiff's counsel is directed to correct questions 5,6 and 8 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#18) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Ms. Menge's Verified Petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc T.G. Dworsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345218) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Motion ripe 4/23/2012. (Jorgensen, J.) Corrected image 31 added on 4/23/2012 (RFJ). (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James C. Rutten and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345210) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Motion ripe 4/23/2012. (Jorgensen, J.) Corrected image 30 added on 4/23/2012 (RFJ). (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Cox and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Christopher Jorgensen (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2345174) filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Motion ripe 4/23/2012. (Jorgensen, J.) Corrected image 29 added on 4/23/2012 (RFJ). (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Holton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344465) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 4/20/2012. (McCoy, Robert) Corrected image 35 filed on 4/24/2012 (SRK). (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David J. Grais and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344448) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 4/20/2012. (McCoy, Robert) Corrected image 34 filed on 4/24/2012 (SRK). (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary G. Menge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert R. McCoy (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2344424) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Motion ripe 4/20/2012. (McCoy, Robert) Corrected image 33 filed on 4/24/2012 (SRK). (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT to 12 MOTION to Stay ; by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Minutes of the Court by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC re 3 Minute Order re Removal,. (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of 11 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Mark Ferrario advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations which have a direct, pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached)(ASB) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC. Motion ripe 4/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Morgan Stanley & Company LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Ferrario, Mark) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC Notice of Filing a Notice of Removal to U.S. District Court (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC of Filing in the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation of Defendants' Notice of Related Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 4/2/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Erin Smith. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:12-cv-0532-JCM-RJJ. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Banc of America Securities LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Other Affiliate Aegis Mortgage Corporation, Other Affiliate First Magnus Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Other Affiliate Fieldstone Mortgage Company, Other Affiliate Alliance Bancorp, Other Affiliate Home Savings Mortgage, Other Affiliate American Home Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CWALT, Inc., Other Affiliate Alliance Bancorp Inc., Other Affiliate American Home Mortgage Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Cal Coast Mortgage Corporation, Other Affiliate ComUnity Lending, Inc., Other Affiliate First NLC Financial Services LLC, Other Affiliate New Century TRS Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Oak Street Mortgage LLC, Other Affiliate Prime Mortgage Financial, Inc. for Banc of America Securities LLC added.. (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Barclays Capital Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Barclays plc, Other Affiliate Barclays Bank PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Group US Inc for Barclays Capital Inc. added.. (Pancheri, Oliver) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Denying 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Marc T.G. Dworsky, James C. Rutten, Erin J. Cox, David J. Grais, Mark B. Holton, and Leanne M. Wilson to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 5/14/2012.(no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 5/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER instructing parties that 42 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation will be adjudicated. Defendants shall file opposition within 14 days of this order. Any replies shall be filed within 7 days of the filing of the opposition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 3/30/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Erin Smith. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/17/2012. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 12 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation. Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-12-657025-B, (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2322116), filed by Banc of America Securities LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jorgensen, J.) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?