Zhi et al v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-02809-SI
District Judge Susan Illston, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cong Zhi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baughman & Wang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin X. Wang +1 415 576 9923 +1 415 576 9929 justin@lawbw.com
No Logo Tianqi Zhi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baughman & Wang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin X. Wang +1 415 576 9923 +1 415 576 9929 justin@lawbw.com
No Logo Ye, Yuan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baughman & Wang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin X. Wang +1 415 576 9923 +1 415 576 9929 justin@lawbw.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ila Casy Deiss +1 415 436 7124 +1 415 436 7169 ila.deiss@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOSEPH P. MARTIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ila Casy Deiss +1 415 436 7124 +1 415 436 7169 ila.deiss@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ila Casy Deiss +1 415 436 7124 +1 415 436 7169 ila.deiss@usdoj.gov
Office San Francisco
Filed 6/5/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1362 Indian Tribal Controversy
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Stipulation
STIPULATION to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice, Joseph P. Martin. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER continuing deadlines. Signed by Judge Illston on 7/8/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Stipulation
      STIPULATION to Extend Dates and [Proposed] Order by Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice, Joseph P. Martin. (Deiss, Ila) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cong Zhi, Ye Yuan, Tianqi Zhi (Wang, Justin) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Summons Issued
          Summons Issued as to Michael Chertoff, Condoleezza Rice, Joseph P. Martin. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 ADR Scheduling Order
            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2008. Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2008 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) standing orders and cmc order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
              Original Complaint for Writ in the Nature of Mandamus (Summons issued); (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611019935). Filed byCong Zhi, Ye Yuan, Tianqi Zhi. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008) Modified on 6/6/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF). (ys, COURT STAFF).
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 168 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?