ASUS Computer International v. Round Rock Research, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:12-cv-02099
Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 12:52 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Asus Computer International, Plaintiff
No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Asus Computer International, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Asustek Computer, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Asustek Computer, Inc., Third Party Defendant
No Logo Kingston Digital, Inc., Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF S. J. CHRISTINE YANG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
Space Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
No Logo Kingston Solution Inc., Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF S. J. CHRISTINE YANG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
Space Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
Kingston Technology Company, Inc. Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF S. J. CHRISTINE YANG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
Space Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
No Logo Kingston Technology Far East Corp., Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF S. J. CHRISTINE YANG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
Space Christine Hwang Yang +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 cyang@sjclawpc.com
No Logo Micron Technology, Inc., Miscellaneous
No Logo Omnivision Technologies Inc., Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Francis Carr +1 650 843 7568 +1 650 843 4001 michael.carr@morganlewis.com
Space Michael Francis Carr +1 650 843 7568 +1 650 843 4001 michael.carr@morganlewis.com
No Logo PixArt Imaging (U.S.A.), Inc, Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by Novak Druce, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Duane H Mathiowetz +1 415 814 6161 +1 415 814 6165 duane.mathiowetz@novakdruce.com
No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (428) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 409 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 23, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 410 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 411 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
      EXHIBITS to re 404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion to Strike (renewing request at Dkt 284 ) filed by Omnivision Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Version of Exhibit Y, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) 404 ) (Carr, Michael) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
        Declaration of Yun (Louise) Lu in Support of re 405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike (renewing request at Dkt 350 ) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 405 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
          Declaration of Yun (Louise) Lu in Support of re 404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion to Strike (renewing request at Dkt 284 ) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 404 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. re 411 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Revised Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In ASUS' Opp to Round Rock Motion to Strike (Revising request at Dkt 274) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. re 410 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Revised Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In ASUS' Motion to Strike (Revising request at Dkt 330) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox in Support of re 411 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -Revised Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In ASUS' Opp to Round Rock Motion to Strike (Revising request at Dkt 274) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 411 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                  Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox in Support of re 410 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -Revised Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In ASUS' Motion to Strike (Revising request at Dkt 330) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 410 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 411 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -Revised Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In ASUS' Opp to Round Rock Motion to Strike (Revising request at Dkt 274) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Mot to Seal re Opp to Mot to Strike, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Opp to Mot to Strike, # 4 Exhibit Sealed Opp to Mot to Strike, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 1 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 7 Exhibit 2 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 2 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 9 Exhibit 4 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 4 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 11 Exhibit 5 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit 5 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 13 Exhibit 12 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit 12 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 15 Exhibit 13 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit 13 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 17 Exhibit 14 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 18 Exhibit 14 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 19 Exhibit 15 to Opp to Mot to Strike (FUS), # 20 Exhibit 15 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 21 Exhibit 16 to Opp to Mot to Strike (FUS), # 22 Exhibit 16 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 23 Exhibit 18 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 24 Exhibit 18 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 25 Exhibit 19 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 26 Exhibit 19 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 27 Exhibit 20 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 28 Exhibit 20 to Opp to Mot to Strike (Sealed))(Lu, Yun) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 410 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -Revised Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In ASUS' Motion to Strike (Revising request at Dkt 330) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lu ISO Mot to Seal re Mot to Strike, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Mot to Strike, # 4 Exhibit Sealed Mot to Strike, # 5 Exhibit B to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit B to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 7 Exhibit C to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit C to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 9 Exhibit F to Mot to Strike (FUS), # 10 Exhibit F to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 11 Exhibit G to Mot to Strike (FUS), # 12 Exhibit G to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 13 Exhibit H to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit H to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 15 Exhibit I to Mot to Strike (FUS), # 16 Exhibit I to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 17 Exhibit J to Mot to Strike (FUS), # 18 Exhibit J to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 19 Exhibit K to Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 20 Exhibit K to Mot to Strike (Sealed), # 21 Exhibit L to Mot to Strike (FUS), # 22 Exhibit L to Mot to Strike (Sealed))(Lu, Yun) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike (renewing request at Dkt 350 ) (Service to ASUS) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion to Strike (renewing request at Dkt 284 ) (Service to Omnivision) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 404 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion to Strike (renewing request at Dkt 284 ) (Service to ASUS) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 405 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike (renewing request at Dkt 350 ) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 5 (sealed), # 4 Exhibit 7 (sealed), # 5 Exhibit Opposition Brief (sealed), # 6 Exhibit Opposition Brief (redacted))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed In Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion to Strike (renewing request at Dkt 284 ) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Reply Brief (sealed), # 4 Exhibit Reply Brief (redacted), # 5 Exhibit X (sealed), # 6 Exhibit X (redacted), # 7 Exhibit Y (sealed))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/30/2014) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER REGARDING REVISED MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on May 12, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                      Letter Brief re 401 Order, re 394 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re 391 Order filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 401 , 394 , 391 ) (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 399 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International. Dismissal or Statement due by 5/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER by Hon. Jon S. Tigar denying 397 Motion for relief from nondispositive pretrial order.(jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014) Modified on 4/29/2014 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Proposed Order re 397 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 374 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Strike, by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 374 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Strike, filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Responses due by 5/9/2014. Replies due by 5/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 4/25/2014). (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 393 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Please contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov with a direct dial number for Mr. Wilcox. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL 224 274 284 330 350 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Appear by Telephone; Administrative Motion for Permission to Appear Telephonically at the April 25, 2014 Further Case Management Conference filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. At the request of the parties, a Further Case Management Conference is set for 4/25/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Discovery Letter Brief filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 4/23/2014) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/17/14, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2014. (Related documents(s) 384 , 383 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 4/23/2014) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Discovery Letter Brief re Redactions per Order on Motions to Strike filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/22/2014) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins Denying Motions to Compel; Granting in part Motion for Costs (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 385 Stipulation (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Date for Submitting Joint Letter Brief on Disagreement Regarding Portions of Expert Reports that should be Stricken Pursuant to April 11, 2014 Order (D.I. 374) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/17/2014) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/17/2014) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/17/2014) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 4/17/2014) re 273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Round Rock Research, LLC; 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International; 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Round Rock Research, LLC; 333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Reply to MSJ filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International; 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Round Rock Research, LLC; 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2014) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING ROUND ROCK'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE APRIL 17, 2014 HEARING REGARDING MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 380 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Motion for Permission to Appear Telephonically at the April 17, 2014 Hearing Regarding Motions to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on April 3, 2014, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2014. (Related documents(s) 362 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 4/15/2014) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Declaration of Michael F. Carr in Support of 284 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply in support of its Motion to Strike filed byOmnivision Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 284 ) (Carr, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/10/14, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2014. (Related documents(s) 373 , 372 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME OF HEARING. The Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2014 will begin at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. The Court will set aside three hours for the hearing. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER RE: BRIEF ADDRESSING MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS' ORDER ON MOTIONS TO STRIKE re 374 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part 196 , 247 , 330 Motions to Strike (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/11/2014) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/10/2014) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 4/10/2014) re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox and Exhibits thereto) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC, 275 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of James Pistorino filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International. (Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/10/2014) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A to ASUS Statement of Recent Decision ISO Motion for Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) 281 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 4/9/2014) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 271 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/9/2014) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER VACATING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR BRINGING EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 364 Stipulation. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 284 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply in support of its Motion to Strike (Service to Omnivision) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/8/2014) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 284 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply in support of its Motion to Strike (Service to ASUS) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/8/2014) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; -Joint Administrative Motion And [Proposed] Order To Bring Presentation Technology Into Courtroom- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/8/2014) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Hearing held on 4/3/2014 before Judge Nathanael Cousins re Discovery Letter Briefs 317 319 and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Response to ASUS's Motion to Strike Portions of Round Rock's Expert Reports. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ASUS Motion to Strike 330 taken under submission. (FTR: 1:30pm - 2:11pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: CONDUCT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING; SETTING SECOND SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Second Summary Judgment Hearing set for 5/13/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 331 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Corrected Version of Ex. KK to the Declaration of Justin Wilcox in support of Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 331 filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 331 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Declaration of Yun Lu in Support of 353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Objection to New Reply Evidence Submitted By ASUS filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 353 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 4/1/2014) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Declaration of Yun Lu in Support of 350 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 350 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 353 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Objection to New Reply Evidence Submitted By ASUS (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING RE 317 319 327 . Discovery and Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 330 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ASUS Motion to Strike); ASUS Reply in Support of Its Motion to Strike filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 353 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Objection to New Reply Evidence Submitted By ASUS filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Round Rock's Objection Brief (sealed), # 4 Exhibit Round Rock's Objection Brief (redacted))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          OBJECTIONS to re 334 Reply to Opposition/Response; -Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox ISO Round Rock's Objection to New Reply Evidence Submitted By ASUS)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 175, # 2 Exhibit 176)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 350 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 350 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Opposition Brief (sealed), # 4 Exhibit Opposition Brief (redacted), # 5 Exhibit 5 (sealed), # 6 Exhibit 7 (sealed))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 330 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ASUS Motion to Strike); -(Declaration of E. Terchunian ISO Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 6)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Yun Lu in Support of 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 332 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS to re 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Redacted Versions of Exhibits to ASUS Motion to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Round Rock's MSJ) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 (re 302-11) REDACTED, # 2 Exhibit 15 (re 302-22) REDACTED, # 3 Exhibit B1 (re 302-47) REDACTED)(Related document(s) 302 ) (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 281 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; -(Redacted Version of ASUS Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit ASUS [Corrected] Motion for Summary Judgment REDACTED)(Related document(s) 281 ) (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS to re 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ; -(Redacted Versions of Exhibits to ASUS Motion to File Under Seal Its Motion for Summary Judgment)- filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 (re 276-6) REDACTED, # 2 Exhibit 8 (re 276-7) REDACTED, # 3 Exhibit 15 (re 276-11) REDACTED, # 4 Exhibit 21 (re 276-17) REDACTED, # 5 Exhibit 25 (re 276-21) REDACTED, # 6 Exhibit B1 (re 276-29) REDACTED, # 7 Exhibit B2 (re 276-30) REDACTED)(Related document(s) 276 ) (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 3/26/2014) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS to re 333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Reply to MSJ; -(Declaration of E. Terchunian ISO ASUS's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 333 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 343 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Reply to MSJ; -Declaration of E. Terchunian ISO ASUS's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order, #(2) Exhibit ASUS's Reply Brief (sealed), #(3) Exhibit ASUS's Reply Brief (redacted))(Related document(s) 333 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING for 4/2/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins RE Discovery Letter Briefs 317 319 and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Responses to ASUS's Motion to Strike Portions of Round Rock's Expert Reports 327 . This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 327 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response to ASUS's Motion to Strike Portions of Round Rock's Expert Reports ) filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Tawen Chang ISO Opposition to RR Request for Leave, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. re 333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Reply to MSJ (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO SEAL as to 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. A hearing on these motions is set for 4/17/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #339*** CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO SEAL as to 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. A hearing on these motions is set for 5/8/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014) Modified on 3/24/2014 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Christine Yang filed byKingston Solution Inc., Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Shiou-Jin Christine) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 3/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment (Proof of Service to Kingston) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/22/2014) (Entered: 03/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment (Proof of Service to ASUS) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/22/2014) (Entered: 03/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 3/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 275 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Declaration of James Pistorino); -Declaration of Pistorino ISO Reply filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 33 to Pistorino Decl., #(2) Exhibit 34 to Pistorino Decl.)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/22/2014) (Entered: 03/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Reply to MSJ filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chang ISO, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/21/2014) (Entered: 03/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 332 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Reply Brief (sealed), # 4 Exhibit Reply Brief (redacted), # 5 Exhibit CC (sealed), # 6 Exhibit DD (sealed), # 7 Exhibit EE (sealed), # 8 Exhibit FF (sealed), # 9 Exhibit JJ (sealed))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/21/2014) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment; (Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox and Exhibits thereto)); -(Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox ISO Round Rock's Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits thereto)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB, # 2 Exhibit GG, # 3 Exhibit HH, # 4 Exhibit II, # 5 Exhibit KK, # 6 Exhibit LL)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/21/2014) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ASUS Motion to Strike filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of P. Morin ISO ASUS Mot to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order re Mot to Seal, # 3 Exhibit SEALED Mot to Strike, # 4 Exhibit REDACTED Mot to Strike, # 5 Declaration of Pistorino ISO Mot to Strike, # 6 Exhibit A to Pistorino Decl., # 7 Exhibit B to Pistorino Decl. SEALED, # 8 Exhibit B to Pistorino Decl. REDACTED, # 9 Exhibit C to Pistorino Decl. SEALED, # 10 Exhibit C to Pistorino Decl. REDACTED, # 11 Exhibit D to Pistorino Decl., # 12 Exhibit E to Pistorino Decl., # 13 Exhibit F to Pistorino Decl. SEALED, # 14 Exhibit F to Pistorino Decl. REDACTED, # 15 Exhibit G to Pistorino Decl. SEALED, # 16 Exhibit G to Pistorino Decl. REDACTED, # 17 Exhibit H to Pistorino Decl. SEALED, # 18 Exhibit H to Pistorino Decl. REDACTED, # 19 Exhibit I to Pistorino Decl. SEALED, # 20 Exhibit I to Pistorino Decl.REDACTED, # 21 Exhibit J to Pistorino Decl. SEALED, # 22 Exhibit J to Pistorino Decl. REDACTED, # 23 Exhibit K to Pistorino Decl. SEALED, # 24 Exhibit K to Pistorino Decl. REDACTED, # 25 Exhibit L to Pistorino Decl. SEALED, # 26 Exhibit L to Pistorino Decl. REDACTED, # 27 Proposed Order re Mot to Strike, # 28 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Morin, Philip) (Filed on 3/20/2014) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS to re 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of Andrew Hamill attaching Declaration of John J. Kelly of JEDEC in Support of ASUS's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 302 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS to re 273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of Andrew Hamill attaching Declaration of John J. Kelly of JEDEC in Support of Round Rock's Motion to File Under Seal) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 273 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response to ASUS's Motion to Strike Portions of Round Rock's Expert Reports filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit (Round Rock's Supplemental Response))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/19/2014) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. re 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS to re 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment; Supplemental Declaration of Miguel J. Bombach ISO Round Rock Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order - Amended Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Yu Decl Ex A), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Yu Decl ExB), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Yu Decl Ex C), # 5 Exhibit 4 (Yen Decl Ex A), # 6 Exhibit 5 (Yen Decl Ex B), # 7 Exhibit 6 (Yen Decl Ex C), # 8 Exhibit 7 (Yen Decl Ex D), # 9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 302 ) (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS to re 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of Jonas McDavit in support of ASUS's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)- filed by Micron Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 302 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS to re 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox in support of ASUS's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 8 to the Pistorino Declaration (redacted), # 3 Exhibit 9 to the Pistorino Declaration (redacted))(Related document(s) 302 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Yun Lu in Support of 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 304 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Christine Yang; DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE YANG PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 79-5(e) IN SUPPORT OF ROUND ROCK RESEARCH, LLCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONFIDENTAL INFORMATION OF NON-PARTIES KINGSTON TECHNOLOGY COMPANY, INC., KINGSTON DIGITAL INC., KINGSTON SOLUTIONS, INC., AND KINGSTON TECHNOLOGY FAR EAST CORP. (D.I. 304) filed by Kingston Solution Inc., Kingston Technology Company, Inc., Kingston Technology Far East Corp., Kingston Digital, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Yang, Shiou-Jin Christine) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE 317 . ASUS must file its motion to strike by 3/21/2014. Round Rock must file its opposition by 3/26/2014. AUSA may file a reply by 3/28/2014. Oral argument will be held on 4/2/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/18/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Discovery Letter Brief; (Response to ASUS's Letter Brief (D.I. 317 )) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Christine Yang In Support Of Asus Computer International And Asustek Computer, Incs Administrative Motion To File Under Seal filed byKingston Technology Company, Inc., Kingston Technology Far East Corp., Kingston Solution Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Shiou-Jin Christine) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery Letter Brief filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. re 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment (Proof of Service to Kingston) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment (Proof of Service to JEDEC) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment (Proof of Service to ASUS) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS to re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment; (Exhibit 151 to the Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 304 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2014) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS to re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment; (Exhibit 154 to the Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 304 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2014) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 310 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS to re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Exhibits & Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox in Support of Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 152 (sealed), # 2 Exhibit 153 (sealed), # 3 Exhibit 157 (sealed), # 4 Exhibit 158 (sealed), # 5 Exhibit 159 (sealed), # 6 Exhibit 160 (sealed), # 7 Exhibit 161 (sealed), # 8 Exhibit 162 (sealed), # 9 Exhibit 163 (sealed), # 10 Exhibit 165 (sealed), # 11 Exhibit 166 (sealed), # 12 Exhibit 170 (sealed), # 13 Exhibit 172 (sealed), # 14 Exhibit 173 (sealed), # 15 Exhibit 174 (sealed))(Related document(s) 304 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2014) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 309 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS to re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Exhibits & Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox in Support of Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 122 (sealed), # 2 Exhibit 126 (sealed), # 3 Exhibit 127 (sealed), # 4 Exhibit 128 (sealed), # 5 Exhibit 129 (sealed), # 6 Exhibit 130 (sealed), # 7 Exhibit 131 (sealed), # 8 Exhibit 132 (sealed), # 9 Exhibit 133 (sealed), # 10 Exhibit 134 (sealed), # 11 Exhibit 135 (sealed), # 12 Exhibit 136 (sealed), # 13 Exhibit 137 (sealed), # 14 Exhibit 138 (sealed), # 15 Exhibit 139 (sealed), # 16 Exhibit 140 (sealed), # 17 Exhibit 141 (sealed), # 18 Exhibit 142 (part 1 of 2) (sealed), # 19 Exhibit 142 (part 2 of 2) (sealed), # 20 Exhibit 143 (sealed), # 21 Exhibit 144 (sealed), # 22 Exhibit 145 (sealed), # 23 Exhibit 146 (sealed), # 24 Exhibit 147 (sealed), # 25 Exhibit 148 (sealed), # 26 Exhibit 149 (sealed), # 27 Exhibit 150 (sealed))(Related document(s) 304 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2014) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 308 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS to re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox in Support of Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 101A (sealed), # 2 Exhibit 101B (sealed), # 3 Exhibit 101C (sealed), # 4 Exhibit 102 (sealed), # 5 Exhibit 103 (sealed), # 6 Exhibit 105 (part 1 of 8) (sealed), # 7 Exhibit 105 (part 2 of 8) (sealed), # 8 Exhibit 105 (part 3 of 8) (sealed), # 9 Exhibit 105 (part 4 of 8) (sealed), # 10 Exhibit 105 (part 5 of 8) (sealed), # 11 Exhibit 105 (part 6 of 8) (sealed), # 12 Exhibit 105 (part 7 of 8) (sealed), # 13 Exhibit 105 (part 8 of 8) (sealed), # 14 Exhibit 106 (part 1 of 6) (sealed), # 15 Exhibit 106 (part 2 of 6) (sealed), # 16 Exhibit 106 (part 3 of 6) (sealed), # 17 Exhibit 106 (part 4 of 6) (sealed), # 18 Exhibit 106 (part 5 of 6) (sealed), # 19 Exhibit 106 (part 6 of 6) (sealed), # 20 Exhibit 107 (part 1 of 4) (sealed), # 21 Exhibit 107 (part 2 of 4) (sealed), # 22 Exhibit 107 (part 3 of 4) (sealed), # 23 Exhibit 107 (part 4 of 4) (sealed), # 24 Exhibit 109 (sealed), # 25 Exhibit 110 (part 1 of 5) (sealed), # 26 Exhibit 110 (part 2 of 5) (sealed), # 27 Exhibit 110 (part 3 of 5) (sealed), # 28 Exhibit 110 (part 4 of 5) (sealed), # 29 Exhibit 110 (part 5 of 5) (sealed), # 30 Exhibit 116 (part 1 of 5) (sealed), # 31 Exhibit 116 (part 2 of 5) (sealed), # 32 Exhibit 116 (part 3 of 5) (sealed), # 33 Exhibit 116 (part 4 of 5) (sealed), # 34 Exhibit 116 (part 5 of 5) (sealed), # 35 Exhibit 117 (sealed), # 36 Exhibit 118 (sealed), # 37 Exhibit 119 (sealed), # 38 Exhibit 121 (sealed))(Related document(s) 304 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2014) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to (re 275 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Declaration of James Pistorino); -(Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox in Support of Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 100, # 2 Exhibit 104 (part 1 of 3), # 3 Exhibit 104 (part 2 of 3), # 4 Exhibit 104 (part 3 of 3), # 5 Exhibit 108, # 6 Exhibit 111 (part 1 of 2), # 7 Exhibit 111 (part 2 of 2), # 8 Exhibit 112, # 9 Exhibit 113, # 10 Exhibit 114, # 11 Exhibit 115, # 12 Exhibit 120, # 13 Exhibit 123 (part 1 of 7), # 14 Exhibit 123 (part 2 of 7), # 15 Exhibit 123 (part 3 of 7), # 16 Exhibit 123 (part 4 of 7), # 17 Exhibit 123 (part 5 of 7), # 18 Exhibit 123 (part 6 of 7), # 19 Exhibit 123 (part 7 of 7), # 20 Exhibit 124, # 21 Exhibit 125, # 22 Exhibit 155 (part 1 of 5), # 23 Exhibit 155 (part 2 of 5), # 24 Exhibit 155 (part 3 of 5), # 25 Exhibit 155 (part 4 of 5), # 26 Exhibit 155 (part 5 of 5), # 27 Exhibit 156, # 28 Exhibit 164, # 29 Exhibit 167, # 30 Exhibit 168, # 31 Exhibit 169, # 32 Exhibit 171)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2014) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS to re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of Mr. David Taylor and exhibits thereto in Support of Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 304 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2014) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 305 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS to re 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of Dr. M. Afromowitz and exhibits thereto in Support of Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgmetn)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1 (part 1 of 2) (sealed), # 2 Exhibit A1 (part 2 of 2) (sealed), # 3 Exhibit A2 (sealed), # 4 Exhibit A3 (sealed), # 5 Exhibit A4 (sealed), # 6 Exhibit A5 (sealed), # 7 Exhibit A6 (sealed), # 8 A7 (sealed), # 9 Exhibit A8 (sealed), # 10 Exhibit A9 (sealed), # 11 Exhibit A10 (sealed), # 12 Exhibit A11 (sealed))(Related document(s) 304 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 304 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Opposition Brief (sealed), # 4 Exhibit Opposition Brief (redacted))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment; (Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox and Exhibits thereto)); -Declaration of James Pistorino ISO Opposition to RR's Motion for Summary Judgment- filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 14, # 6 Exhibit 23, # 7 Exhibit 38, # 8 Declaration of Baker ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit B2, # 10 Exhibit B3, # 11 Proposed Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bombach ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 SEALED Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Declaration of Pistorino ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3 SEALED (1 of 2), # 9 Exhibit 3 SEALED (2 of 2), # 10 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8 SEALED, # 15 Exhibit 9 SEALED, # 16 Exhibit 10, # 17 Exhibit 11 SEALED, # 18 Exhibit 12 SEALED, # 19 Exhibit 13 SEALED (1 OF 2), # 20 Exhibit 13 SEALED (2 OF 2), # 21 Exhibit 14, # 22 Exhibit 15 SEALED, # 23 Exhibit 16 SEALED, # 24 Exhibit 17 SEALED, # 25 Exhibit 18 SEALED, # 26 Exhibit 19 SEALED, # 27 Exhibit 20 SEALED, # 28 Exhibit 21 SEALED, # 29 Exhibit 22 SEALED, # 30 Exhibit 23, # 31 Exhibit 24 SEALED, # 32 Exhibit 25 SEALED, # 33 Exhibit 26 SEALED, # 34 Exhibit 27 SEALED, # 35 Exhibit 28 SEALED, # 36 Exhibit 29 SEALED, # 37 Exhibit 30 SEALED, # 38 Exhibit 31 SEALED, # 39 Exhibit 32 SEALED, # 40 Exhibit 33 SEALED, # 41 Exhibit 34 SEALED, # 42 Exhibit 35 SEALED, # 43 Exhibit 36 SEALED, # 44 Exhibit 37 SEALED, # 45 Exhibit 38, # 46 Declaration of Baker ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 47 Exhibit B1 SEALED, # 48 Exhibit B2, # 49 Exhibit B3, # 50 Declaration of Yu SEALED ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 51 Declaration of Yen SEALED ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, # 52 Proposed Order Denying RR Motion for Summary Judgment)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement re 299 Clerk's Notice of Deficiency filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Attachment)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/11/2014) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re 299 Clerk's Notice; (Amended Proposed Order re Round Rock's Motion to Strike) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit 2)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Per the minute order at docket entry 294, the parties were to submit supplemental briefing by 3/7/14, clarifying which paragraphs of expert reports they seek to strike. The parties failed to comply with this order. The parties are ordered to remedy or explain this deficiency immediately. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement re 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ASUS's Opposition to Round Rock's Motion to Strike filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Attachment)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox in Support of 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 276 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Jonas R. McDavit in Support of 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMicron Technology, Inc.. (Related document(s) 276 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox in Support of 274 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ASUS's Opposition to Round Rock's Motion to Strike filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 274 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Hearing held on 3/5/2014 before Judge Nathanael Cousins re ASUS's Motion to Strike Expert Reports 196 and Round Rock International's Motion to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports [246-3]. Court to issue order.(FTR: 1:33pm - 2:33pm.) (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. re 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Michael F. Carr in Support of 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOmnivision Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 276 ) (Carr, Michael) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; (Declaration of Lauren Nowierski in support of ASUS's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 (part 1 of 3) (under seal), # 2 Exhibit 2 (part 2 of 3) (under seal), # 3 Exhibit 2 (part 3 of 3) (under seal), # 4 Exhibit 2 (redacted))(Related document(s) 258 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Christine Yang in Support of re 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 276 ) (Yang, Shiou-Jin Christine) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 283 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Exhibit K) filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 283 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of 273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 273 ) (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 284 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply in support of its Motion to Strike; (Redacted Version of Reply Brief) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 284 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply in support of its Motion to Strike filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Reply Brief (under seal), # 4 Exhibit X (under seal), # 5 Exhibit Y (under seal))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 247 MOTION to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports); (Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox and exhibits thereto) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit V, # 2 Exhibit W)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Yun Louise Lu (Lu, Yun) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 281 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment (SEALED) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Chen Declaration ISO ASUS' Motion for Summary Judgment (SEALED))(Related document(s) 276 ) (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 3/3/2014) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. re 274 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ASUS's Opposition to Round Rock's Motion to Strike (Morin, Philip) (Filed on 3/3/2014) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Christine Yang in Support of 273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byKingston Technology Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 273 ) (Yang, Shiou-Jin Christine) (Filed on 3/3/2014) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Correcting Response and Reply deadlines as to 275 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of James Pistorino. The Dispositive Motion Deadline was 2/28/2014. The response and reply deadlines are reset as follows: Responses due by 3/14/2014. Replies due by 3/21/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTATE JUDGE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 257 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2014) (Entered: 03/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chang ISO Mot to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Mot to File Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Pistorino Decl, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Pistorino Decl, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Pistorino Decl, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Pistorino Decl, # 7 Exhibit 8 to Pistorino Decl, # 8 Exhibit 10 to Pistorino Decl, # 9 Exhibit 11 to Pistorino Decl, # 10 Exhibit 13 to Pistorino Decl, # 11 Exhibit 15 to Pistorino Decl, # 12 Exhibit 16 to Pistorino Decl, # 13 Exhibit 17 to Pistorino Decl, # 14 Exhibit 18 to Pistorino Decl, # 15 Exhibit 19 to Pistorino Decl, # 16 Exhibit 20 to Pistorino Decl, # 17 Exhibit 21 to Pistorino Decl, # 18 Exhibit 22 to Pistorino Decl, # 19 Exhibit 23 to Pistorino Decl, # 20 Exhibit 24 to Pistorino Decl, # 21 Exhibit 25 to Pistorino Decl, # 22 Exhibit 26 to Pistorino Decl, # 23 Exhibit 27 to Pistorino Decl, # 24 Exhibit 28 to Pistorino Decl, # 25 Exhibit 29 to Pistorino Decl, # 26 Exhibit 30 to Pistorino Decl, # 27 Exhibit 31 to Pistorino Decl, # 28 Exhibit 32 to Pistorino Decl, # 29 Exhibit B1 to Baker Decl, # 30 Exhibit B2 to Baker Decl, # 31 Exhibit B3 to Baker Decl, # 32 Exhibit B5 to Baker Decl, # 33 Declaration of Simon Chen, # 34 Exhibit A to Chen Decl, # 35 Exhibit B to Chen Decl, # 36 Exhibit C to Chen Decl, # 37 Exhibit D to Chen Decl, # 38 Exhibit E to Chen Decl, # 39 Exhibit F to Chen Decl, # 40 Exhibit G to Chen Decl, # 41 Exhibit H to Chen Decl, # 42 Exhibit I to Chen Decl, # 43 Exhibit J to Chen Decl, # 44 Exhibit K to Chen Decl)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/1/2014) (Entered: 03/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of James C. Pistorino in Support of Asustek Computer, Inc. and Asus Computer International's Motion for Summary Judgment)- filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/17/2014. Replies due by 3/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit 2 Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 12, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Declaration of Jake Baker, # 9 Exhibit B4 to Baker Decl)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 3/1/2014) (Entered: 03/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ASUS's Opposition to Round Rock's Motion to Strike filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Morin ISO ASUS Mot to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit ASUS Opp to RR Mot to Strike - SEALED, # 4 Exhibit ASUS Opp to RR Mot to Strike - REDACTED, # 5 Declaration of Morin ISO ASUS Opp to RR Mot to Strike, # 6 Exhibit 1 - SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 1 - No Redactions, # 8 Exhibit 2 - SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 2 - No Redactions, # 10 Exhibit 3, # 11 Exhibit 4 - SEALED, # 12 Exhibit 4 - No Redactions, # 13 Exhibit 5 - SEALED, # 14 Exhibit 5 - No Redactions, # 15 Exhibit 6 - SEALED, # 16 Exhibit 6 - No Redactions, # 17 Exhibit 7 - SEALED, # 18 Exhibit 7 - No Redactions, # 19 Exhibit 8, # 20 Exhibit 9 Part 1, # 21 Exhibit 9 Part 2, # 22 Exhibit 9 Part 3, # 23 Exhibit 10 - SEALED, # 24 Exhibit 10 - No Redactions, # 25 Exhibit 11 - SEALED, # 26 Exhibit 11 - No Redactions, # 27 Exhibit 12 - SEALED, # 28 Exhibit 12 - No Redactions, # 29 Exhibit 13 - SEALED, # 30 Exhibit 13 - No Redactions, # 31 Exhibit 14 - SEALED, # 32 Exhibit 14 - No Redactions, # 33 Exhibit 15 - SEALED, # 34 Exhibit 15 - No Redactions, # 35 Exhibit 16 - SEALED, # 36 Exhibit 16 - No Redactions, # 37 Exhibit 17, # 38 Exhibit 18 - SEALED, # 39 Exhibit 18 - No Redactions, # 40 Exhibit 19 - SEALED, # 41 Exhibit 19 - No Redactions, # 42 Exhibit 20 - SEALED, # 43 Exhibit 20 - No Redactions)(Morin, Philip) (Filed on 3/1/2014) (Entered: 03/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 4 Exhibit Motion for Summary Judgment (redacted), # 5 Exhibit Motion for Summary Judgment (under seal), # 6 Exhibit Declaration of David Taylor (under seal), # 7 Exhibit AA (under seal), # 8 Exhibit D (under seal), # 9 Exhibit G (under seal), # 10 Exhibit H (under seal), # 11 Exhibit I (under seal), # 12 Exhibit J (under seal), # 13 Exhibit L (under seal), # 14 Exhibit M (under seal), # 15 Exhibit N (under seal), # 16 Exhibit P (under seal) (part 1 of 2), # 17 Exhibit P (under seal) (part 2 of 2), # 18 Exhibit R (under seal), # 19 Exhibit U (under seal), # 20 Exhibit V (under seal), # 21 Exhibit W (under seal), # 22 Exhibit X (under seal), # 23 Exhibit Y (under seal), # 24 Exhibit Z (under seal) (part 1 of 5), # 25 Exhibit Z (under seal) (part 2 of 5), # 26 Exhibit Z (under seal) (part 3 of 5), # 27 Exhibit Z (under seal) (part 4 of 5), # 28 Exhibit Z (under seal) (part 5 of 5))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2014) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [Proposed] Order Granting Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment; re 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox and Exhibits thereto in Support of Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2014) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment; -(Declaration of Justin P.D. Wilcox and Exhibits thereto in Support of Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment)- filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/14/2014. Replies due by 3/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit K (part 1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit K (part 2 of 2), # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit S, # 7 Exhibit T)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2014) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING MOTION to File Under Seal filed by ASUS 258 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports filed by Round Rock Research 246 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Round Rock's Reply ISO Its Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research 226 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING MOTION to File Under Seal Exhibits ISO Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Letter Brief 225 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike 222 .Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING Motion to File Under Seal re ASUS Motion to Strike filed by ASUS 221 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014). (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief re ASUS Discovery Disputes filed by ASUS 220 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re ASUS Opposition to Motion to Amend 219 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING AS MOOT ASUS' MOTION to Extend Due Date for Compliance with Court's January 24, 2014 Order 214 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proof of Service filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 258 ) (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 2 to Chang Declaration In Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 258 ) (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 259 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 196 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports); -Declaration of Tawen Chang in Support of ASUS Computer International and Asustek Computer, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 258 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Reply (REDACTED), # 4 Reply (SEALED), # 5 Ex. 3 to Chang Decl. (SEALED))(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 212 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Responses due by 3/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting (213) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:12-cv-02099-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 255 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports Declaration of Miguel J. Bombach ISO Round Rock Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A ISO Wilcox Decl ISO Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B ISO Wilcox Decl ISO Mot to Strike (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit C ISO Wilcox Decl ISO Mot to Strike (Sealed - Proposed Redactions))(Related document(s) 246 ) (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports Declaration Of Michael F. Carr In Support Of Round Rock Research, LLCs Administrative Motion To File Documents Under Seal (D.E. 246) filed byOmnivision Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Version of Exhibit T, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit T)(Related document(s) 246 ) (Carr, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE Round Rock's Motion to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports [246-3]] for 3/5/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO STRIKE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS re 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 250 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 219 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re ASUS Opposition to Motion to Amend Declaration of E. Terchunian ISO ASUS's Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ASUS's Opposition Brief (sealed), # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 219 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 249 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 221 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re ASUS Mot to Strike Declaration of E. Terchunian ISO ASUS's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Motion to Strike (sealed), # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1 (redacted), # 4 Exhibit Ex. 2 (redacted), # 5 Exhibit Ex. 2 (sealed) (part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit Ex. 2 (sealed) (part 2 of 2))(Related document(s) 221 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration in Support of 220 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief re ASUS Discovery Disputes filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 220 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports;; DECLARATION of Justin P.D. Wilcox in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/28/2014. Replies due by 3/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit I, # 7 Exhibit J, # 8 Exhibit K, # 9 Exhibit L, # 10 Exhibit M, # 11 Exhibit N, # 12 Exhibit P, # 13 Exhibit R, # 14 Exhibit U)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Portions of ASUS's Expert Reports filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Motion to Strike (under seal), # 4 Exhibit Motion to Strike (redacted), # 5 Exhibit A (under seal), # 6 Exhibit B (under seal), # 7 Exhibit C (under seal), # 8 Exhibit D (under seal), # 9 Exhibit O (under seal), # 10 Exhibit Q (under seal), # 11 Exhibit S (under seal), # 12 Exhibit T (under seal))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar in case 3:12-cv-02099-JST; granting (36) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:14-cv-00275-JST. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00275-JST, 3:12-cv-02099-JST(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Miguel J. Bombach in Support of 226 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Round Rock's Reply ISO Its Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 226 ) (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Miguel J. Bombach in Support of 225 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits ISO Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Letter Brief filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 225 ) (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Miguel J. Bombach in Support of 224 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Joint Letter Brief filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 224 ) (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Miguel J. Bombach in Support of 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 222 ) (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. re 221 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re ASUS Mot to Strike (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE 217 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/13/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Motion to Strike Expert Reports 196 for 3/5/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014). (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Brief filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 167 Declaration in Support, Declaration of E. Terchunian ISO Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Joint Letter Brief and Exhibit D thereto (No Longer Sought to Be Sealed) filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 167 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS Ex. 1 to Round Rock's Joint Letter Brief (Docket No. 161 ) (Exhibit No Longer Sought To Be Sealed) filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. re 219 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re ASUS Opposition to Motion to Amend (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 224 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Joint Letter Brief Correction of Docket # 227 filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (redacted version))(Related document(s) 224 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Reid (Reid, Joseph) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 226 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Round Rock's Reply ISO Its Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 225 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits ISO Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Letter Brief (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 224 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Joint Letter Brief (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC re 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** EXHIBITS re 224 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Joint Letter Brief Sealed and Redacted Versions of Round Rock's Joint Letter Brief filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (redacted version))(Related document(s) 224 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/11/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Round Rock's Reply ISO Its Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit U (part 1 of 2)(under seal), # 4 Exhibit U (part 2 of 2)(under seal), # 5 Exhibit V (under seal), # 6 Exhibit W (under seal), # 7 Exhibit X (under seal), # 8 Exhibit Y (under seal), # 9 Exhibit Z (part 1 of 3) (under seal), # 10 Exhibit Z (part 2 of 3) (under seal), # 11 Exhibit Z (part 3 of 3) (under seal), # 12 Exhibit AA (part 1 of 3) (under seal), # 13 Exhibit AA (part 2 of 3) (under seal), # 14 Exhibit AA (part 3 of 3) (under seal), # 15 Exhibit CC (part 1 of 4) (under seal), # 16 Exhibit CC (part 2 of 4) (under seal), # 17 Exhibit CC (part 3 of 4) (under seal), # 18 Exhibit CC (part 4 of 4) (under seal), # 19 Exhibit EE (under seal), # 20 Exhibit HH (under seal), # 21 Exhibit PP (under seal), # 22 Exhibit QQ (under seal), # 23 Exhibit HH (redacted), # 24 Exhibit PP (redacted), # 25 Exhibit QQ (redacted))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/11/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits ISO Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Letter Brief filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit B (under seal), # 4 Exhibit F (under seal), # 5 Exhibit G (under seal), # 6 Exhibit A (under seal), # 7 Exhibit E (under seal), # 8 Exhibit A (redacted), # 9 Exhibit E (redacted))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Joint Letter Brief filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Exhibit 5 (under seal), # 3 Exhibit 7 (under seal), # 4 Exhibit 8 (under seal), # 5 Exhibit 9 (under seal), # 6 Exhibit 3 (under seal), # 7 Exhibit 4 (under seal), # 8 Exhibit 6 (under seal), # 9 Exhibit 11 (under seal), # 10 Exhibit 3 (redacted), # 11 Exhibit 4 (redacted), # 12 Exhibit 6 (redacted), # 13 Exhibit 11 (redacted))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Edward Terchunian in Support of 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 222 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion to Strike filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Opposotion to Motion to Strike, # 4 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Strike (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D (filed under seal), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E (filed under seal), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F (filed under seal))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re ASUS Mot to Strike filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miguel Bombach ISO ASUS Mot to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit SEALED ASUS Mot to Strike, # 4 Exhibit REDACTED ASUS Mot to Strike, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Ex 1 to Chang Decl re ASUS Mot to Strike, # 6 Exhibit SEALED Ex 2, Part 1 to Chang Decl re ASUS Mot to Strike, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Ex 2, Part 2 to Chang Decl re ASUS Mot to Strike, # 8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief re ASUS Discovery Disputes filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miguel Bombach ISO ASUS Mot to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit SEALED Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 4 Exhibit REDACTED Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Ex 1 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 6 Errata REDACTED Ex 1 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Ex 2 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 8 Exhibit REDACTED Ex 2 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 9 Exhibit SEALED Ex 3 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 10 Exhibit REDACTED Ex 3 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 11 Exhibit SEALED Ex 4 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 12 Exhibit REDACTED Ex 4 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 13 Exhibit SEALED Ex 5 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 14 Exhibit REDACTED Ex 5 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 15 Exhibit SEALED Ex 7 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 16 Exhibit REDACTED Ex 7 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 17 Exhibit SEALED Ex 8 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 18 Exhibit REDACTED Ex 8 to Joint Letter Brief #1 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 19 Exhibit SEALED Ex A to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 20 Exhibit REDACTED Ex A to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 21 Exhibit SEALED Ex C to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 22 Exhibit REDACTED Ex C to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 23 Exhibit SEALED Ex E to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 24 Exhibit REDACTED Ex E to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 25 Exhibit SEALED Ex F to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 26 Exhibit REDACTED Ex F to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 27 Exhibit SEALED Ex G to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 28 Exhibit REDACTED Ex G to Joint Letter Brief #2 re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 29 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re ASUS Opposition to Motion to Amend filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miguel Bombach ISO Mot to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit SEALED ASUS Opp to Mot to Amend, # 4 Exhibit REDACTED ASUS Opp to Mot to Amend, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Ex 1 to ASUS Opp to Mot to Amend, # 6 Exhibit REDACTED Ex 1 to ASUS Opp to Mot to Amend, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Ex 2 to ASUS Opp to Mot to Amend, # 8 Exhibit REDACTED Ex 2 to ASUS Opp to Mot to Amend, # 9 Exhibit SEALED Ex 15 to ASUS Opp to Mot to Amend, # 10 Exhibit REDACTED Ex 15 to ASUS Opp to Mot to Amend, # 11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION permitting the taking of an additional expert deposition after the close of discovery 215 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief - Joint Letter Brief Regarding Discovery Dispute filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUNDRECORDING held on 1/28/14, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858)453-7590, Email echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 1:13-2:55. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2014. (Related documents(s) 201 , 202 ) (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Permitting the Taking of an Additional Expert Deposition After the Close of Expert Discovery filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 214 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ASUS' MOTION to Extend Due Date for Compliance with Court's January 24, 2014 Order re 193 Order filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. Responses due by 2/21/2014. Replies due by 2/28/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider if Cases Should Be Related filed by Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Piatnicia, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 212 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS 155 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUNDRECORDING held on 1/23/14, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tara Bauer, Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (853)453-7590, Email echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 1:19-11:56. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2014. (Related documents(s) 190 , 191 ) (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER re 207 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding taking expert depositions after current deadline for expert discovery filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 5, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING ALL DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 5, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Nathan Millikan as Counsel for ASUS Computer International and ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (Millikan, Thomas) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER regarding taking expert depositions after current deadline for expert discovery filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 2/3/2014) M (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins Denying Without Prejudice Administrative Motions to File Under Seal 160 162 166 174 181 197 (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE VACATING the Further Discovery Hearing set for 2/5/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cousins. Court finds the matter suitable for decision without oral argument and will issue an order. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RELATING CASES AND REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO STRIKE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS re 196 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/29/2014) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/29/2014) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Further Discovery Hearing held on 1/28/2014 before Magistrate Judge Cousins. Hearing re Motions to Seal set for 2/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (FTR: 1:13pm - 2:21pm/2:42pm - 2:55 pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Tawen Chang in Support of 196 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports CORRECTION OF DOCKET #196 filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 196 ) (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 196 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 196 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Expert Reports filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/10/2014. Replies due by 2/18/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Brief re 175 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Round Rock's Proposed Amendments filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 175 ) (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Further Discovery Hearing heldre 161 164 188 on 1/23/2014 before Nathanael Cousins. Further Discovery Hearing set for 1/28/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (FTR: 1:19pm - 1:56pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 193 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ON DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS 161 , 164 , 188 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on January 24, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 157 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of L. Nowierski ISO Round Rock's Motion For Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions Corrected Exhibits to Round Rock's Amended Infringement Contentions filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 157 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL TO DETERMINE RELATIONSHIP OF CASES 3:14-cv-00275 NC and 3:12-cv-02099 JST. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/21/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT; Joint Status Report Regarding Discovery Disputes filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings of electronic sound recording held on 1-15-14, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2014. (Related documents(s) 185 , 184 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING ROUND ROCK RESEARCH LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS, re 155 MOTION to Amend/Correct; MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (For 1/15/14 hearing before NC, FTR 2:20-3:08=48 minutes; transcriber Kathy Wyatt.)TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/17/2014) Modified on 1/17/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (For 1/15/14 hearing before NC, FTR 2:20-3:08=48 minutes; transcriber Kathy Wyatt.)TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/16/2014) Modified on 1/17/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing re Letter Briefs 161 164 held on 1/15/2014 before Nathanael Cousins. Parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint status report by 1/21/2014. Further Discovery Hearing set for 1/23/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (FTR: 2:20pm - 3:08pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2014) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 181 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Lauren Nowierski ISO Round Rock's Reply ISO Its Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions Exhibit CC filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CC (part 2 of 4), # 2 Exhibit CC (part 3 of 4), # 3 Exhibit CC (part 4 of 4))(Related document(s) 181 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Lauren Nowierski ISO Round Rock's Reply ISO Its Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit U, # 5 Exhibit U (part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit V, # 7 Exhibit W, # 8 Exhibit X, # 9 Exhibit Y, # 10 Exhibit Z, # 11 Exhibit Z (part 2 of 3), # 12 Exhibit Z (part 3 of 3), # 13 Exhibit AA, # 14 Exhibit AA (part 2 of 3), # 15 Exhibit AA (part 3 of 3), # 16 Exhibit EE, # 17 Exhibit HH, # 18 Exhibit PP, # 19 Exhibit QQ)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Lauren M. Nowierski in Support of re 179 Reply to Opposition/Response; Reply ISO Round Rock's Motion For Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BB, # 2 Exhibit DD, # 3 Exhibit FF, # 4 Exhibit GG, # 5 Exhibit II, # 6 Exhibit JJ, # 7 Exhibit KK, # 8 Exhibit LL, # 9 Exhibit MM, # 10 Exhibit NN, # 11 Exhibit OO, # 12 Exhibit RR, # 13 Exhibit SS, # 14 Exhibit TT, # 15 Exhibit UU)(Related document(s) 179 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 155 MOTION to Amend/Correct; MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/13/2014) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING RE Joint Discovery Letter Briefs 161 164 . Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE Joint Discovery Letter Briefs 161 164 for 1/8/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry generated buy the Court. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 174 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ; Proof of Service of Exhibits filed Under Seal filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 174 ) (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to (re 155 MOTION to Amend/Correct; MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Sealed Oppo to Mot to Supp, # 4 Exhibit 1 - SEALED to Chang Decl ISO Oppo to Mot to Supp, # 5 Exhibit 2 - SEALED to Chang Decl ISO Oppo to Mot to Supp, # 6 Exhibit 15 - SEALED to Chang Decl ISO Oppo to Mot to Supp)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Edward Terchunian in Support of 162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 162 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MATERIALS RELATED TO ROUND ROCK'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 157 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Tawen Chang in Support of 160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter re Issues Raised by Round Rock Research filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 160 ) (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Tawen Chang in Support of 166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Edward Terchunian in Support of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Discovery Letter Brief filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 166 ) (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 2, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Edward Terchunian in Support of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Discovery Letter Brief --- Sealed Exhibits B and G to the Declaration of E. Terchunian filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 166 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/31/2013) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Edward Terchunian in Support of 164 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re ASUS Discovery Disputes Declaration of Edward Terchunian ISO Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Discovery Letter Brief filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 164 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Edward Terchunian in Support of Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Discovery Letter Brief filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 4 Exhibit Decl. of E. Terchunian ISO Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Discovery Letter Brief, # 5 Exhibit Ex. A to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 6 Exhibit Ex. D to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 7 Exhibit Ex. E to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 8 Exhibit Ex. F to Decl. of E. Terchunian)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael J. Engle in Opposition to 161 Joint Discovery Letter Brief(Public Version) filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A [SEALED], # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C [SEALED], # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E [SEALED], # 6 Exhibit F [SEALED], # 7 Exhibit G [SEALED])(Related document(s) 161 ) (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Discovery Letter Brief re ASUS Discovery Disputes filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle in support of Joint Letter re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter re Issues Raised by Round Rock Research Proof of Service Of Documents To Be Filed Under Seal filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Related document(s) 160 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle in support of Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 4 Exhibit Joint Letter re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Letter re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 6 Exhibit 2 to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Letter re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Letter re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Letter re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Letter re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Letter re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Letter re ASUS Discovery Disputes, # 12 Exhibit A to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Discovery Letter re Issues Raised by Round Rock, # 13 Exhibit C to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Discovery Letter re Issues Raised by Round Rock, # 14 Exhibit E to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Discovery Letter re Issues Raised by Round Rock, # 15 Exhibit F to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Discovery Letter re Issues Raised by Round Rock, # 16 Exhibit G to Engle Decl. ISO Joint Discovery Letter re Issues Raised by Round Rock)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Discovery Letter Brief(Public Version) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal), # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 (filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit 4 (filed under seal), # 6 Exhibit 5 (filed under seal), # 7 Exhibit 6 (filed under seal), # 8 Exhibit 7 (filed under seal), # 9 Exhibit 8 (filed under seal), # 10 Exhibit 9 (filed under seal), # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11 (filed under seal))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter re Issues Raised by Round Rock Research filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Terchunian, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Round Rock's Joint Discovery Letter, # 4 Exhibit Decl. of E. Terchunian ISO Round Rock's Joint Discovery Letter, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Decl. of E. Terchunian, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Decl. of E. Terchunian)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 158 Stipulation extending time to file discovery disputes.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.)(Filed on 12/27/2013) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Stipulation Extending Deadline To File Motions To Compel filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/26/2013) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of L. Nowierski ISO Round Rock's Motion For Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of L. Nowierski, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 4 Exhibit B (under seal), # 5 Exhibit C(under seal), # 6 Exhibit D(under seal), # 7 Exhibit D (part 2)(under seal), # 8 Exhibit E(under seal), # 9 Exhibit F(under seal), # 10 Exhibit G(under seal), # 11 Exhibit G (part 2)(under seal), # 12 Exhibit H(under seal), # 13 Exhibit H (part 2)(under seal), # 14 Exhibit I(under seal), # 15 Exhibit J(under seal), # 16 Exhibit K(under seal))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Lauren M. Nowierski in Support of re 155 MOTION to Amend/Correct; MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (under seal), # 3 Exhibit C (under seal), # 4 Exhibit D (under seal), # 5 Exhibit E (under seal), # 6 Exhibit F (under seal), # 7 Exhibit G (under seal), # 8 Exhibit H (under seal), # 9 Exhibit I (under seal), # 10 Exhibit J (under seal), # 11 Exhibit K (under seal), # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) 155 ) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct; MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/6/2014. Replies due by 1/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE: STIPULATION MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER re 153 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International. Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2013. Opening Expert Reports due 1/8/2014. Rebuttal Expert Reports due 1/24/2014. Expert Discovery due by 2/7/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 12/10/2013) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF CLARIFICATION RE DKT. NO. 145 146 147 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/3/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF CLARIFICATION RE DKT. NO. 145 146 147 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/3/2013. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting and adopting 150 Stipulated Protective Order.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re 145 Order on Discovery Letter Brief re Protective Order filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Attorney Justin P.D. Wilcox & Attorney Duane H. Mathiowetz, dated 11/22/2013 to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (tnS) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Alcide Morin for Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant ASUS Computer International and Counterclaim Defendant ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (Morin, Philip) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Round Rock Research, LLC Responding to 146 ASUS's Letter of 11/21/2013. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from ASUS Computer International, et al Seeking Clarification of Order. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 11/21/2013) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins regarding 121 Discovery Letter Brief (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins regarding 121 Discovery Letter Brief (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 140 Declaration in Support filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International, 122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 140 Declaration in Support filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International, 122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 142 Stipulation Amending Case Schedule.Fact Discovery Cutoff: December 12, 2013Opening Expert Reports: December 19, 2013.Rebuttal Expert Reports: January 10, 2014.Reply Expert Reports: N/ANo other case deadlines are affected.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 11/20/2013) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH [ROPOSED] ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 11/19/2013) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings of official electronic sound recording held on 11-6-13, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2014. (Related documents(s) 132 , 131 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Michael J. Engle in Support of 135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Related document(s) 135 ) (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2013) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ybarra Piatnicia (Piatnicia, Andrew) (Filed on 11/13/2013) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [Proposed] Order re 121 Joint Discovery Letter Brief; [Proposed] Order Re November 6, 2013 Hearing filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 11/13/2013) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [Proposed] Order re 121 Joint Discovery Letter Brief; Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/12/2013) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research, LLC Proof of Service of Exhibits Filed Under Seal (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/12/2013) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS TO THE PARTIES' JOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING DISCOVERY by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH 117 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH re 117 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Hearing held on 11/6/2013 before Nathanael Cousins re Joint Discovery Letter Brief 121 and Non-Party PixArt Imaging (U.S.A.), Inc.'s Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena 117 . (FTR: 2:25pm - 3:31pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2013) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 11/7/2013) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/7/2013) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 129 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 11/5/2013) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Karim Oussayef ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8137444.) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Oussayef, Karim) (Filed on 11/5/2013) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 127 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 11/5/2013) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ameet A. Modi (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8136001.) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Modi, Ameet) (Filed on 11/5/2013) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing regarding Joint Letter Brief 121 for 11/6/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/31/13. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 117 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena & Awarding Sanctions); Reply to Opposition to Motion to Quash filed by PixArt Imaging (U.S.A.), Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration)(Mathiowetz, Duane) (Filed on 10/30/2013) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Settlement Conferenc HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Matter did not settle. Parties instructed to call Judge Ryu if developments warrant further settlement discussions. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2013) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Joint Letter Brief Regarding Discovery filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of E. Terchunian, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F to Joint Letter Brief Regarding Discovery, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G to Joint Letter Brief Regarding Discovery, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H to Joint Letter Brief Regarding Discovery)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 10/29/2013) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 10/29/2013) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to (re 117 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena & Awarding Sanctions) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of L. Nowierski, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 10/25/2013) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Non-party PixArt Imagining, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena & Awarding Sanctions 117 . Hearing set for 11/6/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 10/25/2013. Replies due by 10/30/2013. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena & Awarding Sanctions filed by PixArt Imaging (U.S.A.), Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2013. Replies due by 11/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Mathiowetz, Duane) (Filed on 10/18/2013) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER re 114 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar terminating 96 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 10/16/2013) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 10/15/2013) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ** CORRECTION: This is not a daily trial request; this is a request for a copy of the 5/1/13 Claim Construction and CMC transcript that court reporter Debra Pas has already filed at docket entry #91. **TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Round Rock Research, LLC. (McDavit, Jonas) (Filed on 10/10/2013) Modified on 10/10/2013 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 103 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying as moot 109 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 110 Stipulation. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 106 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Joint Administrative Motion And [Proposed] Order To Bring Presentation Technology Into Courtroom filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Declarations ISO Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of L. Nowierski Explaining Why A Stipulation Could Not Be Obtained, #(2) Exhibit A - Declaration of David L. Taylor, #(3) Exhibit B - Declaration of Martin Afromowitz, #(4) [Proposed] Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 10/4/2013) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 107 Stipulation Amending Scheduling Order.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 10/4/2013) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 10/4/2013) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Edward Terchunian ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8041141.) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Terchunian, Edward) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 101 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Declaration of L. Nowierski In Support of ASUS's Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement ) filed byASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 9/20/2013) Modified on 9/26/2013 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 9/20/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Defendant Round Rock's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 9/20/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 9/20/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA to re 95 Opposition/Response to Motion ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement; Corrected Opposition Brief and Wilcox Declaration (REDACTED) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Corrected Opposition Brief, #(2) Exhibit Corrected Wilcox Declaration) (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 9/18/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO TERMINATE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 84 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 17, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSIVE BRIEF to (re 85 ASUS's MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement [REDACTED VERSION]) -CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 95 - filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 9/16/2013) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Round Rock Research, LLC of Firm Name Change (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 9/16/2013) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 94 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of L. Nowierski, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 9/14/2013) (Entered: 09/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement ) Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (REDACTED) filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Wilcox, # 2 Declaration of L. Nowierski, # 3 Exhibit 1 (part 1), # 4 Exhibit 1 (part 2), # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 9/14/2013) (Entered: 09/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Round Rock's Opposition to ASUS's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Andrew Grant Hamill (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 9/11/2013) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/5/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 9/5/2013). (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-1-2013, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2013. (Related documents(s) 83 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 9/5/2013 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Court will contact the parties using the conference call number provided to it by the plaintiff. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 88 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 9/4/2013) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gino Dante Serpe Limited Appearance (Serpe, Gino) (Filed on 9/4/2013) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Motion Hearing as to 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. The Motion Hearing is set for 10/10/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. Responses due by 9/13/2013. Replies due by 9/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Pistorino (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit 1A to Declaration of James C. Pistorino (Submitted Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 1B to Declaration of James C. Pistorino (Submitted Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino (Submitted Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Part 1) to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 6 Exhibit 3 (Part 2) to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 16 Declaration of Simon Chen (REDACTED), # 17 Exhibit A to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal), # 18 Exhibit B to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal), # 19 Exhibit C to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit D to Declaration of Simon Chen, # 21 Exhibit E to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal), # 22 Exhibit F to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal), # 23 Exhibit G to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal), # 24 Exhibit H to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal), # 25 Exhibit I to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal), # 26 Exhibit J to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal), # 27 Exhibit K to Declaration of Simon Chen (Submitted Under Seal))(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 8/30/2013) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James C. Pistorino, # 2 Proposed Order)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 8/30/2013) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Grant Hamill as counsel for Round Rock Research, LLC (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel Jose Bombach as Counsel for ASUS Computer International and ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (Bombach, Miguel) (Filed on 7/10/2013) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar terminating re 78 Stipulation. Stipulations of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) do not require court orders. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 6/17/2013) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS RELATED TO U.S. PATENT NO.7,021,520 filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2013) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting re 76 Parties' Stipulated Motion for Continuance of the Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, Notice of Rescheduled Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/3/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Stipulated Motion for Continuance of the Settlement Conference filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Tawen Chang ISO Stipulated Motion for Continuance of Settlement Conference)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 5/30/2013) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER. Non-Expert Discovery due by 10/31/2013. Expert Discovery due by 12/4/2013. Motions due by 1/16/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2014 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 10, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar denying re 73 Motion for Leave to File Response. ASUS' Motion to Submit Response is hereby denied.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 5/10/2013) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/10/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Tawen Chang ISO Mot to File Response, #(2) Exhibit A, #(3) Proposed Order)(Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 5/9/2013) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Amend Case Deadlines and for Counsel to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference if Conference Ordered to be Held filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 5/8/2013) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/1/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 5/1/2013), Claims Construction held on 5/1/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 5/1/2013). (Court Reporter: Debra Pas.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2013) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-16-2013, before Judge Jon S. TIgar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477 Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2013. (Related documents(s) 66 , 65 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/30/2013) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting 68 Joint Motion to Bring Equipment into the Courtroom for Claim Construction Hearing.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 4/29/2013) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Bring Equipment into the Courtroom for Claim Construction Hearing filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. Responses due by 5/13/2013. Replies due by 5/20/2013. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/28/2013) (Entered: 04/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/24/2013) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research, LLC for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 4/19/2013) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 4/18/2013) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 4/16/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 4/16/2013). Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter: Debra Pas.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2013) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting re 62 Joint Motion for Bringing Equipment into the Courtroom. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/12/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Bringing Equipment into Courtroom filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. Responses due by 4/25/2013. Replies due by 5/2/2013. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/11/2013) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: CONDUCT OF TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL re 60 Letter filed by Asustek Computer, Inc., ASUS Computer International. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Parties (Joint) re Conduct of Tutorial and Markman Hearing. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 4/8/2013) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RESCHEDULING TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Technology Tutorial Hearing set for 4/16/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/1/2013 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 3, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 3/19/2013) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Tawen Chang in Support of re 55 Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 55 ) (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 3/12/2013) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 3/12/2013) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Peter H. Chang in Support of 52 Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 52 ) (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 54 . *** Declaration of Peter H. Chang in Support of 52 Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 52 ) (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 2/26/2013) Modified on 2/27/2013 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byRound Rock Research, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 2/26/2013) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc., Round Rock Research, LLC. (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 2/26/2013) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Claim Construction Hearing set for 4/30/2013 at 2:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/16/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar denying 48 Motion For Extension of Briefing Schedule.The parties' stipulated request for an extension of the claim construction briefing schedule is hereby denied. The opening brief remains due on February 26, 2013. It is so ordered.(This is a text only docket entry.)(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Briefing Schedule filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. Responses due by 3/11/2013. Replies due by 3/18/2013. (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 2/25/2013) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Tawen Chang (Chang, Tawen) (Filed on 2/25/2013) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings., Judge Hon. William Alsup no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 2/11/2013. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference set for 6/18/2013 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/29/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Settlement Conference HELD on 1/11/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Matter did not settle. Parties will be contacted by Ivy Garcia (Judge Ryu's Courtroom Deputy) to schedule follow-up conference in May 2013 (anticipated consolidation with Case No. C-11-6636 CW for settlement purposes). (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/14/2013) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND PREHEARING STATEMENT PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-3 (Joint) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C)(Schnurer, John) (Filed on 1/11/2013) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING WILCOX PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Justin P.D. Wilcox ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7344750.) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilcox, Justin) (Filed on 12/13/2012) Modified on 12/13/2012 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/6/12, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2013. (Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 11/11/2012) (Entered: 11/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 1/11/2013 10:00 AMbefore Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/12/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order Re Schedule for Claim Construction by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Justin Wilcox ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611078157.) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Receipt)(dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/6/2012 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/6/2012), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Ryu for Mediation/Settlement Conference. Jury Selection set for 10/28/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/6/2012) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Mediation/Settlement. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/1/2013 01:30 PM. Discovery due by 7/31/2013. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 9/12/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/17/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/6/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 8/30/2012) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MCDAVIT PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING NOWIERSKI PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jonas McDavit (Filing fee Previously paid) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Lauren Nowierski (Filing fee Previously Paid) filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE to 9/6/2012 at 11:00 AM by Hon. William Alsup [granting 26 Motion to Continue]. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES.(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING BONDOR PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulated MOTION to Continue initial Case Management Conference and Proposed Order filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified on 7/26/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/26/2012 (dtm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Paul Bondor ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611076651.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/20/2012 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Lauren M Nowierski ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611076651.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/20/2012 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jonas R McDavit ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611076651.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/20/2012 filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Continue] to August 23, 2012, at 11:00 a.m.(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue initial Case Management Conference (Stipulated) and Proposed Order filed by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 7/12/2012) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. & Round Rock Research, LLC filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2012) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for ASUSTeK Computer Inc. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2012) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for ASUS Computer International (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 6/26/2012) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1 (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE to 9/6/2012 at 11:00 AM by Hon. William Alsup [granting 26 Motion to Continue]. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES.(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 6/22/2012. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Continue] to August 23, 2012, at 11:00 a.m.(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 7/17/2012 Case Management Conference is hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Round Rock Research, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 6/21/2012) Modified on 6/21/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM re 8 by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 6/11/2012) Linkage added on 6/12/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address of Counsel by Round Rock Research, LLC(Chang, Peter) (Filed on 5/24/2012) Modified on 5/24/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of Bradford John Black for Round Rock Research LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/20/2012) Text modified on 5/22/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint re 1 ; and Counterclaims against Asustek Computer, Inc. , ASUS Computer Text modified on 5/22/2012 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Round Rock Research, LLC identifying Other Affiliate IPValue Management Inc., Other Affiliate John M. Desmarais, Other Affiliate Desmarais LLP, Other Affiliate Gemas Capital, Inc., Other Affiliate Micron Technology Inc. for Round Rock Research, LLC. (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 5/18/2012) Text modified on 5/22/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance of Peter H. Chang on behalf of Round Rock Research (Chang, Peter) (Filed on 5/18/2012) Text modified on 5/22/2012 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE re Motion to Relate Cases: The Court has reviewed the motion and has determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Round Rock Research, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Non-Infringement, Invalidity and Un-enforceability (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Round Rock Research, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611011755). Filed by ASUS Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 678 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?