Ameranth, Inc. v. Pizza Hut, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-01810
District Judge Janis L. Sammartino, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated Today at 3:34 PM (6.1 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Domino's Pizza, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank A. Angileri +1 248 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 fangileri@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W. Cunningham +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 tcunningham@brookskushman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Murphy +1 617 573 4727 michael.murphy@nelsonmullins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Sandor Korniczky +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2555 stephenkorniczky@sheppardmullin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca S Roberts +1 619 338 6500 +1 619 234 3815 rroberts@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo Domino's Pizza LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brooks Kushman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank A. Angileri +1 248 358 4400 +3583 358 358 3351 fangileri@brookskushman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W. Cunningham +1 248 358 4400 +1 248 358 3351 tcunningham@brookskushman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Murphy +1 617 573 4727 michael.murphy@nelsonmullins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Sandor Korniczky +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2555 stephenkorniczky@sheppardmullin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca S Roberts +1 619 338 6500 +1 619 234 3815 rroberts@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo O-web Technologies, Ltd., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Opentable, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Flagel +1 310 277 1010

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James L Day

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Leslie Day +1 206 292 2110 +1 206 292 2104 jday@bskd.com
No Logo Papa John's USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

No Logo Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Pizza Hut, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo QuikOrder, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Seamless North America Llc, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Faragi +1 212 408 2500 +1 212 408 2501 eric.faragi@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Craig Scheinfeld +1 212 408 2512 +1 212 259 2512 rscheinfeld@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Emmet, Marvin & Martin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eliot D. Williams +1 212 705 5000

Represented by Law Office of Richard Clegg

Starbucks Corporation Starbucks Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Square, Inc. Officer/Director, Square, Inc.
No Logo Agilysys, Inc., Defendant
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob Anderson +1 619 699 2657 jacob.anderson@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D Fowler +1 650 833 2048 +1 650 833 2001 mark.fowler@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
No Logo Atx Innovation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Best Western International Inc, Defendant
No Logo Emn8, Inc., Defendant
Eventbrite, Inc. Eventbrite, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Atricure Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Paige Gibson +1 619 699 2862 +1 619 764 6662 erin.penning@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Jesse Hindman +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 jesse.hindman@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Williams +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 robert.williams@dlapiper.com
No Logo Exit 41, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel A. Lawton +1 619 595 1370 +1 619 595 1520 dan@lawtonlaw.com
No Logo Expedia Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fandango, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Grubhub, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cook Alex McFarron Manzo Cummings & Mehler, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Lesht +1 312 984 0144 dlesht@emcpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Konrad Sherinian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Konrad Sherinian +1 630 318 2606 +1 630 318 2605 pto@sherinianlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Robertson & Associates, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley W Robertson +1 619 531 7000 +1 619 531 7007 lrobertson@robertsonapc.com
No Logo Hilton International Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hilton International Co."
No Logo Hilton Resorts Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hotel Tonight, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hotels.com, LP, Defendant
No Logo Hotwire, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hyatt Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Kayak Software Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Laughstub LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by fitzgeraldknaier.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth M Fitzgerald +1 619 241 4810 +1 619 955 5318 kfitzgerald@fitzgeraldknaier.com
No Logo Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Defendant
Marriott International, Inc. Marriott International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Paul Rice +1 949 263 8400 +1 949 263 8414 srice@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G. Babbitt +1 312 222 9350 mbabbitt@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradford P. Lyerla +1 312 923 2613 +1 312 923 2713 blyerla@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nick Saros +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5185 nsaros@jenner.com
Micros Systems, Inc. Micros Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mobo Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo NAAMA Networks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Netwaiter, L.l.c., Defendant
Oracle Corporation Oracle Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared Bobrow +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 Jared.Bobrow@Weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright Robinson McCammon Osthimer & Tatum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/12/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Joseph Bonoli +1 323 213 0114 +1 213 624 3755 Philip.Bonoli@leclairryan.com
Orbitz, LLC Orbitz, LLC, Defendant
No Logo ORDR.IN, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Paul Rice +1 949 263 8400 +1 949 263 8414 srice@crowell.com
No Logo Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Defendant
No Logo StubHub, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Paul Rice +1 949 263 8400 +1 949 263 8414 srice@crowell.com
No Logo Ticketbiscuit, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Olavi Dunne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Dunne +1 213 516 7900 +1 213 516 7910 bdunne@olavidunne.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matt Olavi +1 213 516 7900 +1 213 516 7910 molavi@olavidunne.com
No Logo Ticketfly, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonali Maitra +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 smaitra@durietangri.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Henry Page +1 415 376 6403 +1 415 236 6300 mpage@durietangri.com
No Logo Ticketmaster LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ticketmob LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by fitzgeraldknaier.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth M Fitzgerald +1 619 241 4810 +1 619 955 5318 kfitzgerald@fitzgeraldknaier.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaczko Goddard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Christopher Jaczko +1 858 550 6150 +1 858 225 3500 cjaczko@jaczkogoddard.com
No Logo Travelocity.com LP, Defendant
No Logo Usablenet Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wanderspot LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ameranth Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Ipdev Co, Counter-Defendant
Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Barclay +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 mbarclay@eff.org
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (620) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1505 Filed: 12/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1504 Filed: 12/3/2021, Entered: None Order Lifting Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1502 Filed: 11/29/2021, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1501 Filed: 11/19/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1500 Filed: 11/16/2021, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1499 Filed: 11/15/2021, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1498 Filed: 11/11/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1497 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1496 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1495 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1494 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1492 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1491 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Order Staying Case
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1490 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1489 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1488 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1487 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1486 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1485 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1484 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1483 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1482 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1481 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1480 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1479 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1477 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1476 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Spreading the Mandate
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1475 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1474 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER Granting 600 Motion to Withdraw Sonal N. Mehta as Counsel for Oracle Corporation. The motion is GRANTED. Sonal N. Mehta is granted permission to withdraw as Defendant Oracle Corporation's counsel of record. Jared Bobrow of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP will continue to represent Defendant Oracle Corporation. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/24/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sonal N. Mehta as Counsel for Oracle Corporation by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared Bobrow)(Bobrow, Jared) (aef). (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER Striking Answer and Entering Default. This matter came on for hearing on an Order to Show Cause re: Counsel. No party filed a written response to the Order to Show Cause, and no party made an appearance at the Order to Show Cause hearing. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Clerk of Court shall strike the Answer of Ordr.In, Inc. and enter its default for failure to comply with Civil Local Rule 83.3(k). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/29/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: This matter was set for hearing on and Order Show Cause. No appearances were made. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (no document attached) (jak) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER Granting 595 Request for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant, Ordr.In, Inc. It is hereby ordered: 1. Counsel's motion to withdraw is granted. Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP is hereby withdrawn as attorneys for Ordr.In, Inc., effective forthwith. 2. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.3(k), Ordr.In, Inc. shall file a notice of appearance of new counsel on or before June 19, 2015. 3. If Ordr.In, Inc. does not identify its new counsel on or before June 19, 2015, the Court will hold an Order to Show Cause hearing on June 26, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. as to why sanctions, including the entry of default, should not be imposed for its failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 83.3(k). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/9/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER Denying 591 Motion to Lift Stay. The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to lift the stay of these proceedings. The parties shall notify the Court when the Federal Circuit issues its decision on the pending appeals. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/4/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed as - NOTICE by ORDR.IN, Inc. Request for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kelly A. Van Nort, # 2 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Proof of Service via CM/ECF)(Van Nort, Kelly) Modified on 6/1/2015-QC mailer sent re wrong event; s/ signature (aef). (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (Re: Doc. 591 ) Ameranth's motion to lift the stay is currently scheduled for hearing on May 22, 2015. The Court has reviewed the parties' briefs, and finds the matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the May 22, 2015 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/15/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 591 MOTION Lift Stay of Proceedings filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 591 MOTION Lift Stay of Proceedings filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin Gibson, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Gibson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Gibson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Gibson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Gibson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Gibson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Gibson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Gibson Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Gibson Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Gibson Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Gibson Declaration)(Gibson, Erin) (aef). (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION Lift Stay of Proceedings by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER. It is hereby ordered: If Ameranth wishes to lift the stay in this case, it shall filed a motion to that effect pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Civil Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/22/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Court's April 3, 2015 Order [Docket No. 585] by Apple, Inc.. (Gibson, Erin) (aef). (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Regarding CBM Proceedings by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Granting 586 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Emily C. Johnson and Kellie Marie Johnson terminated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/14/2015. (aef) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc.. (Stein, David) (aef). (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Continuing Stay re 581 Notice of Ruling Regarding Issuance ofFinal Written Decisions; Request to Lift Stay. In light of that decision, Ameranth requests that the Court lift the stay. Defendants state that request is premature as the time for requesting reconsideration of that decision or filing an appeal have yet to run. The Court agrees with Defendants. Accordingly, Ameranths request to lift the stay is denied. The stay shall remain in place until the time for seeking reconsideration or filing an appeal of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board's decision has expired. If either party decides to seek reconsideration or file an appeal, the stay shall remain in place until those proceedings are completed. The parties shall file a further status report on those proceedings on or before April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/3/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dls) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Joinder by Best Western International, Inc. re 582 Response - Other (Kim, Jenny) (aef). (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Joinder by ATX Innovation, Inc. re 582 Response - Other (Kim, Jenny) (aef). (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 581 MOTION to Lift Stay Defendants' Response to Ameranth's Notice of Ruling Regarding Issuance of Final Written Decisions; Request to Lift Stay filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gibson, Erin) (aef). (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. of Ruling Regarding Issuance of Final Written Decisions; Request to Lift Stay (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lodgment, # 2 Table of Contents of Exhibits to Notice of Lodgment, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 3/24/2015-Motion to lift stay added (aef). (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James G. DeRouin by Hyatt Corporation. (DeRouin, James) (dls). (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Grubhub, Inc. (Second Supplemental) (Clegg, Richard) (dls). (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Grubhub, Inc. (Clegg, Richard) (dls). (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Bonoli, Philip) (aef). (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Oracle Corporation of Withdrawal of Counsel (Bonoli, Philip) qc email re event and lacking pos on 11/21/2014 (rlu). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 573 Joint Motion to Substitute Parties. It is ordered that Oracle Corporation is substituted for MICROS Systems, Inc. and the style of the case is revised accordingly. Ameranth need not amend its complaint and Oracle Corporation need not file a new answer in connection with this order. Ameranth's First Amended Complaint, Ameranth's existing infringement contentions, and MICROS's Answer to Ameranth's First Amended Complaint will remain the operative complaint, infringement contentions, and answer with respect to Oracle Corporation going forward. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/17/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Micros Systems, Inc. (Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Micros Systems, Inc. (Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal N. Mehta on behalf of Micros Systems, Inc (Mehta, Sonal)Attorney Sonal N. Mehta added to party Micros Systems, Inc(pty:dft) (knb). (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Bobrow on behalf of Micros Systems, Inc (Bobrow, Jared)Attorney Jared Bobrow added to party Micros Systems, Inc(pty:dft) (knb). (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc. of Withdrawal of Duane H. Mathiowetz (Maddeford, Alison) (aef). (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Maxwell Hankins on behalf of Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc. (Hankins, Stephen)Attorney Stephen Maxwell Hankins added to party Pizza Hut of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Maxwell Hankins added to party Pizza Hut, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Maxwell Hankins added to party QuikOrder, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef). (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by IPDEV Co. of Withdrawal of Duane H. Mathiowetz (Maddeford, Alison) (aef). (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Lowell D. Mead (Mead, Lowell) (aef). (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc. re 564 Notice (Other) (AMENDED) of Withdrawal of George C. Yu (Yu, George)Attorney George Chin-Lun Yu added to party Pizza Hut of America, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney George Chin-Lun Yu added to party Pizza Hut, Inc.(pty:cc) (aef). (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc. of Withdrawal of George C. Yu (Yu, George) (aef). (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Dane Robert Voris on behalf of Mobo Systems, Inc. (Voris, Dane)Attorney Dane Robert Voris added to party Mobo Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef). (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Mobo Systems, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Jose R. Rodriguez (Mead, Lowell) (aef). (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Angela K. Hsieh by Hyatt Corporation. (Hsieh, Angela) (aef). (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: 12/16/2013 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: 12/13/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Les Robertson by Grubhub, Inc.. (Robertson, Lesley) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 552 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David Lesht by Grubhub, Inc.. (Robertson, Lesley) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Konrad Sherinian by Grubhub, Inc.. (Robertson, Lesley) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation Conferences due to Litigation Stay; denying as moot pending Discovery Motion. All eighteen Early Neutral Evaluation Conferences set before the undersigned are hereby vacated. The Court will revisit the scheduling of Early Neutral Evaluation Conferences when the stay is lifted. The parties' Joint Motion in Related Case Number 12-CV-1360-DMS-WVG, is denied as moot. The parties' Joint Motion in Related Case Number 12-CV-2350- DMS-WVG, is denied as moot. Due to the stay in this litigation, all other discovery dates issued by this Court are hereby vacated. The Court will revisit the discovery schedule when the stay is lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/4/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 520 Defendants' Motion to Stay. The Court grants Defendants' motion to stay this case pending Defendants' petitions for CBM review. Upon issuance of a final decision from the PTAB, the parties shall request that the stay be lifted so this case may proceed. The parties shall include a copy of the PTAB's final action with that request. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/26/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by James G. DeRouin (DeRouin, James) (aef). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Angela Katine Hsieh (Hsieh, Angela) (aef). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph S Hanasz (Hanasz, Joseph) (aef). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by David Paul Lindner (Lindner, David) (aef). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Laura Beth Miller (Miller, Laura) (aef). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 543 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Faragi on behalf of Grubhub, Inc. (Faragi, Eric)Attorney Eric J. Faragi added to party Grubhub, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C Scheinfeld on behalf of Grubhub, Inc. (Scheinfeld, Robert)Attorney Robert C Scheinfeld added to party Grubhub, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Akin Gump) by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Keith McNally, # 3 Declaration John W. Osborne, # 4 Notice of Lodgment, # 5 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14, # 20 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 11/25/2013-QC mailer sent re document not signed with s/ (aef). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/22/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (jrl). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by George Chin-Lun Yu on behalf of Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc. (Yu, George)Attorney George Chin-Lun Yu added to party Pizza Hut of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney George Chin-Lun Yu added to party Pizza Hut, Inc.(pty:dft) Modified on 11/25/2013-QC mailer sent re document not signed with s/ (aef). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Noelle Berg on behalf of Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc. (Berg, Lindsey)Attorney Lindsey Noelle Berg added to party Pizza Hut of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lindsey Noelle Berg added to party Pizza Hut, Inc.(pty:dft) Modified on 11/25/2013-QC mailer sent re document not signed with s/ (aef). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Duane H Mathiowetz on behalf of Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc. (Mathiowetz, Duane)Attorney Duane H Mathiowetz added to party Pizza Hut of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Duane H Mathiowetz added to party Pizza Hut, Inc.(pty:dft) Modified on 11/25/2013-QC mailer sent re document not signed with s/ (aef). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alison L. Maddeford on behalf of Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc. (Maddeford, Alison)Attorney Alison L. Maddeford added to party Pizza Hut of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alison L. Maddeford added to party Pizza Hut, Inc.(pty:dft) Modified on 11/25/2013-QC mailer sent re document not signed with s/ (aef). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 11/22/2013(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mcb) (aef). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration William J. Caldarelli, # 3 Declaration Keith McNally, # 4 Declaration John W. Osborne, # 5 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, # 6 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Exhibit 10, # 17 Exhibit 11, # 18 Exhibit 12, # 19 Exhibit 13, # 20 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Alan Clegg on behalf of Grubhub, Inc. (Clegg, Richard) (jao). (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 522 Application for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae in Support of Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby grants 448 Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal; finds as moot 463 Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Source Code Organization Interrogatories; finds as moot 466 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Accommodate Rolling Production of Documents; finds as moot 467 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Accommodate Rolling Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Re: Oral Argument. The motion for leave to file brief amici curiae by Application Developers Alliance and Electronic Frontier Foundation is currently scheduled for hearing on November 22, 2013. The Court has reviewed the motion and Plaintiff's opposition, and finds the matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the November 22, 2013 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/18/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) Modified on 11/18/2013-To modify word "oral"; NEF regenerated (aef). (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 520 MOTION to Stay filed by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (aef). (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 522 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae of Application Developers Alliance and Electronic Frontier Foundation in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 520 MOTION to Stay Under Section 18(b) of the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration William J. Caldarelli, # 2 Declaration Keith McNally, # 3 Notice of Lodgment, # 4 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit 15, # 21 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluations set for 1/15/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants Expedia, Hotels.com, Travelocity. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/15/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendant Dominos Pizza. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/17/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants Pizza Hut, QuikOrder. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/17/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendant Apple, Inc. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/27/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants Fandango, Live Nation, StubHub,Ticketmaster. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendant Eventbrite. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants Hilton, Hyatt. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/31/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants Marriott, Starwood. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants Hotel Tonight, Kayak, Orbitz. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendant Papa John's. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants GrubHub, Seamless. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/12/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants OpenTable, Wanderspot. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendant O-Web Technologies. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/21/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants Agilysys, Micros Systems. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/24/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants Ticketbiscuit, Ticketfly, ATX Innovation. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendants Ordr.in, Mobo Systems, Usablenet. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/28/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo re Defendant Best Western. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/30/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dls) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. of Joint Statement Regarding ENE Schedule (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on 520 MOTION to Stay. Defendants have filed a motion to stay this case under Section 18(B) of the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act. The motion is currently scheduled for hearing on December 13, 2013. In anticipation of that hearing, the Court issues the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the motion on or before November 8, 2013. Defendants shall file their reply on or before November 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/24/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae of Application Developers Alliance and Electronic Frontier Foundation in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Motion For Leave to File, # 2 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Barclay, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Barclay on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation (Barclay, Michael)Attorney Michael Barclay added to party Electronic Frontier Foundation(pty:am) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Richard Zembek, # 3 Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (aef). (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: On October 15, 2013, counsel for Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc. ("Ameranth") notified the Court of a discovery dispute involving cost-sharing for Ameranths review of Defendant Pizza Hut, Inc.'s ("Pizza Hut") source code. The Court finds it fair and reasonable to impose cost-sharing of this inspection of Pizza Hut's source code, and hereby grants Pizza Hut's request. Pizza Hut shall make its source code available for inspection by Ameranth's expert for a maximum of 8 hours. The inspection shall occur in no more than 2 sessions to be allocated as the parties mutually decide. Ameranth's inspection shall be completed by October 23, 2013. Neither this Order, nor the October 15, 2013, Order involving Ameranth's dispute with QuikOrder (Doc. No. 516), provides any precedential value with respect to further source code inspections. These two Orders only address cost-sharing and source code review with respect to Ameranth's preliminary infringement contentions, and only as to these two Defendants. (Plaintiff Attorney William Caldarelli; Ethan Watts). (Defendant Attorney Joel Beres). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 10/16/2013(no document attached) (mcb) (aef). (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. On October 14, 2013, this Court held a telephonic Discovery Conference with counsel for Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc. ("Ameranth") and counsel for Defendant QuikOrder, Inc. ("QuikOrder"). On October 15, 2013, the Court issued a Discovery Order regarding the issues discussed at the Discovery Conference. Also on October 15, 2013, the Court was notified of a discovery dispute between Plaintiff and Defendants other than QuikOrder, which is related to the Discovery Order. Therefore, the Court will hold a telephonic Discovery Conference on October 16, 2013, at 7:30 a.m., with counsel for Ameranth and counsel for Defendant Pizza Hut, Inc. and Pizza Hut of America, Inc. Only counsel must participate and the Court will initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/15/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: On October 14, 2013, counsel for Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc. ("Ameranth") and Defendant QuikOrder, Inc. ("QuikOrder") notified the Court of a discovery dispute involving Ameranth's review of QuikOrder's source code. This Court hereby grants Ameranth's request to review QuikOrder's source code. The Court finds it reasonable to allow Ameranth's expert to again inspect QuikOrder's source code, but with limitations. QuikOrder shall make its source code available for inspection by Ameranth's expert for a maximum of 8 hours. The inspection shall occur in no more than 2 sessions to be allocated as the parties mutually decide. Ameranth's inspection shall be completed by October 23, 2013. Ameranth's request to print portions of the source code is denied. (Plaintiff Attorney William Caldarelli; Ethan Watts) (Defendant Attorney George Yu). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 514 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Early Neutral Evaluation Schedule. The Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion. On or before October 25, 2013, the parties shall file a Joint Statement, which will include a proposed schedule for the Early Neutral Evaluation Conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/10/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Early Neutral Evaluation Schedule by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (aef). (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER (1) Resolving Parties' 450 Joint Motion for Discovery Dispute, (2) Resolving Parties' 455 Joint Motion regarding service of Amended Infringement Contentions and (3) Resetting Dates. On or before July 7, 2014, the parties shall complete and file a joint claim construction chart, joint claim construction worksheet, and joint hearing statement pursuant to Patent L.R. 4.2. All discovery intended for use in the claim construction hearing must be completed no later than August 18, 2014. On October 9, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. the Court will hold a joint telephonic conference to discuss the parties' intended presentations at the claim construction hearing, including any tutorial and testimony. The claim construction hearing will be held on November 3, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. See Patent L.R. 4.5. The Court shall hold a joint case management conference at the end of the claim construction hearing. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/10/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) Modified on 10/10/2013-to include motion link; NEF regenerated (aef). (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 512 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 509 Joint Motion of Plaintiff and Defendants to Extend Time to Answer Amended Complaints. Plaintiff shall have until October 2, 2013 to re-file amended complaints that were only filed in the consolidated case in the corresponding individual cases, and Defendants shall have until October 4, 2013, to file their answers to Ameranth's amended complaints. This order applies to all pending cases in the consolidated action. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/30/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 447 , 457 Defendants' Amended Motion for Reconsideration or, in the alternative, for certification of the Collateral Estoppel Order for Interlocutory Appeal. The Court denies Defendants' motion for certification of the issue for interlocutory review. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/30/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 510 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Early Neutral Evaluation Conferences; Document Designation. This Court held a telephonic Status Conference on September 27, 2013. On or before October 11, 2013, the parties shall file a Joint Statement, which will include a proposed schedule for the Early Neutral Evaluation Conferences. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/30/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Amended Complaints by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (aef). (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 450 Joint MOTION for Order for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re: QuikOrder's Responses to Ameranth's Interrogatories Re: Source Code Organization, 455 Joint MOTION Regarding Service of Amended Infringement Contentions and to Defendants' Supplemental Briefs filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 9/27/2013(no document attached) (mcb) (aef). (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 506 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Ticketbiscuit, LLC re 450 Joint MOTION for Order for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re: QuikOrder's Responses to Ameranth's Interrogatories Re: Source Code Organization, 455 Joint MOTION Regarding Service of Amended Infringement Contentions . (Olavi, Matt) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 505 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Ticketfly, Inc. re 450 Joint MOTION for Order for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re: QuikOrder's Responses to Ameranth's Interrogatories Re: Source Code Organization, 455 Joint MOTION Regarding Service of Amended Infringement Contentions . (Maitra, Sonali) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 504 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Eventbrite, Inc. re 450 Joint MOTION for Order for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re: QuikOrder's Responses to Ameranth's Interrogatories Re: Source Code Organization, 455 Joint MOTION Regarding Service of Amended Infringement Contentions . (Gibson, Erin) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Apple, Inc. re 450 Joint MOTION for Order for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re: QuikOrder's Responses to Ameranth's Interrogatories Re: Source Code Organization, 455 Joint MOTION Regarding Service of Amended Infringement Contentions . (Gibson, Erin) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 502 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Starbucks Corporation re 450 Joint MOTION for Order for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re: QuikOrder's Responses to Ameranth's Interrogatories Re: Source Code Organization, 455 Joint MOTION Regarding Service of Amended Infringement Contentions . (Bernstein, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendants Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC re 450 Joint MOTION for Order for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re: QuikOrder's Responses to Ameranth's Interrogatories Re: Source Code Organization . (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 287 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Defendant's Fourth Affirmative Defense. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 283 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Sixth Affirmative Defense and First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 282 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Ninth Affirmative Defense and First, Second and Third Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/12/2013, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2013. (Transcript includes proceedings held in case numbers 11-cv-01810-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-00729-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-00731-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-00732-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-00733-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-00737-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-00739-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-00742-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-00858-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01627-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01629-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01630-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01631-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01633-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01634-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01636-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01640-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01642-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01643-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01644-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01646-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01648-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01649-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01650-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01651-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01652-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01653-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01654-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01655-DMS-WVG, 12-cv-01656-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00350-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00352-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-00353-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-01072-DMS-WVG, 13-cv-01520-DMS-WVG, and 13-cv-01525-DMS-WVG). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Status Conference. It is hereby ordered that a telephonic Status Conference call shall be held on September 27, 2013 at 7:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/18/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Brian J Lum appearing for Defendant Agilysys, Inc., Receipt # 54761. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (av1). (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to 457 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration filed as - MOTION for Reconsideration re 457 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 447 MOTION for Reconsideration re 425 Order, or in the Alternative, Certification of the Collateral Estoppel Order for Interlocutory Appeal Hilton's Reply Brief in Support of its Amended Motion For Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, For Certification of the Collateral Estoppel Order For Interlocutory Appeal by Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Stein in Support of Hilton's Reply Brief in Support of Its Amended Motion For Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, For Certification of The Collateral Estoppel Order For Interlocutory Appeal, # 2 Table of Contents For Exhibits To Hilton's Reply Brief, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Proof of Service)(Stein, David) Modified on 9/17/2013-to term motion; per Atty Emily Johnson document filed incorrectly should be a Reply (aef). (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Order: On September 13, 2013, the Honorable Dana M. Sabraw, United States District Judge, issued an Order Following Status Conference. (Doc. No. 491.) Pursuant to Paragraph 7 of Judge Sabraw's Order, "Pending the claim construction hearing, discovery shall be limited to claim construction issues." Id. at 3. Therefore, any subpoenas previously issued to third parties that request information not related to claim construction issues, shall be withdrawn and reissued at an appropriate time after the claim construction hearing. Further, any party discovery that has previously been requested that is not related to claim construction issues, shall be stayed. No responses shall be required until after the claim construction hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/16/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Rejecting Document, from Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc., re 490 Request for Judicial Notice. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Permission to file supplemental brief not requested or granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/16/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Following Status Conference. All future docketing will be done in the lead case; Documents relating to all actions should be filed in the lead case, and should be captioned "In Re: Ameranth Patent Litigation." Documents affecting a single case should be filed in that case only. Documents relating to more than one, but less than all, of the associated cases should be filed in each affected case. Pursuant to their representation at the status conference, Defendants shall file their petition with the United States Patent and Trademark Office for Covered Business Method review of the patents-in-suit on or before October 15, 2013. In an effort to resolve the motions pending at Docket Nos. 450 and 455, the Court will allow supplemental briefing from those Defendants that have not yet had an opportunity to be heard on these issues. Each of those Defendants may file a supplemental brief of no more than five (5) pages. Those briefs shall be filed on or before September 20, 2013. Plaintiff may file a responsive brief of no more than ten (10) pages, which shall be filed on or before September 27, 2013. To the extent they have not yet done so, no later than November 1, 2013, the parties shall comply with the initial disclosure requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/13/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ****DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ENTRY 492 **** - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. (Supplemental) in Support of Ameranth, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael Fabiano, # 2 Notice of Lodgment, # 3 Table of Contents of Exhibits to Notice of Lodgment, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 9/16/2013-to strike document (aef). (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 443 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Stay this Lawsuit Regarding Usablenet, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/12/2013. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney William J Caldarelli, Michael D Fabiano). (Defendant Attorney Joel Beres, Scott Smedresman, Ian Stewart, George Yu). (no document attached) (jak) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Agilysys, Inc. of Withdrawal of Jennifer M. Dienes (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Lytle, Douglas) Modified on 9/12/2013-Incorrect judge in POS caption (aef). (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Agilysys, Inc. of Withdrawal of Jennifer M. Dienes (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Lytle, Douglas) Modified on 9/11/2013-QC mailer sent re wrong s/ used; REFILE (aef). (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Ameranth, Inc. re 484 Response in Opposition to Motion, Hilton's Amend. Mtn for Reconsideration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 457 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 447 MOTION for Reconsideration re 425 Order, or in the Alternative, Certification of the Collateral Estoppel Order for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 9/9/2013-missing TOC; Atty will file TOC (aef). (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Robert G. Lancaster and Kristy A. Murphy by ORDR.IN, Inc.. (Lancaster, Robert) Modified on 9/6/2013-incorrect judge in caption (aef). (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Micros Systems, Inc, filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D Under Seal, # 6 Proof of Service) (Caldarelli, William)(aef). (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 481 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 480 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (leh). (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William)(leh). (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wanderspot LLC, filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service) (Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Ameranth, Inc. against Exit 41, LLC. It is hereby Ordered and Adjudged Judgment is entered in favor of Ameranth, Inc. against Exit 41, LLC as follows: Exit 41 and its officers, directors, employees, attorneys, agents, representatives, parents, subsidiaries, affiliates and all other persons acting in concert, participation or privity with them, and their successors and assigns, are permanently enjoined from infringing, contributorily infringing, and/or inducing others to infringe the valid and enforceable claims of United States Patent No. 6,384,850 and United States Patent No. 6,871,325 (the "Patents-in-Suit"). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 303 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Defendant Exit 41, LLC. Exit 41 and its officers, directors, employees, attorneys, agents, representatives, parents, subsidiaries, affiliates and all other persons acting in concert, participation or privity with them, and their successors and assigns, are permanently enjoined from infringing, contributorily infringing, and/or inducing others to infringe the valid and enforceable claims of United States Patent No. 6,384,850 and United States Patent No. 6,871,325 (the "Patents-in-Suit"). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/3/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AGREED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/30/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 444 Amended Complaint, by Hyatt Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Noureddini, Noushan) Modified on 9/3/2013-QC mailer sent re incorrect judge in caption (aef). (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 8/30/2013(no document attached) (mcb) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Aileen Van Nort on behalf of ORDR.IN, Inc. (Van Nort, Kelly)Attorney Kelly Aileen Van Nort added to party ORDR.IN, Inc.(pty:dft) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 472 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: On August 29, 2013, this Court issued an Order Staying Dates in Current Scheduling Orders. (Doc. No. 468.) On August 30, 2013, at 1:30 p.m., this Court will hold a telephonic Status Conference to discuss this Court's Order with counsel for Plaintiff and Defense liaison counsel. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/30/2013.(aef) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ameranth, Inc. against Hilton Resorts Corporation, filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service) (Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ameranth, Inc. against Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc., filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service) (Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. A telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/12/2013 at 01:00 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/29/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Staying Dates in Current Scheduling Orders. Due to the recent reassignment of this case and all related cases to a different District Judge and Magistrate Judge, this Court hereby Orders a stay on all currently pending dates set by Judge Stormes in the Order Following Second Case Management Conference (Doc. No. 345) and the Scheduling Order (Doc. No. 346). Specifically, the stay on all currently pending dates before this Court includes a stay on any pending discovery disputes and the filing of Invalidity Contentions. The stay shall be in effect until further notice. However, the stay shall not apply to the dates set by Judge Stormes in the Order Granting Joint Motion to Accommodate Rolling Production of Documents. (Doc. No. 422.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/29/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Order to Extend Time to Accommodate Rolling Production of Documents by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Watts, Ethan) (aef). (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Order to Extend Time to Accomodate Rolling Production of Documents by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ameranth, Inc. against Travelocity.com, LP, filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service) (Caldarelli, William)(aef). (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 464 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ameranth, Inc. against Ticketmaster, LLC, filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service Proof of Service) (Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Order to Extend Time to File Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Source Code Organization Interrogatories by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Ameranth, Inc. against Stubhub, Inc., filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service Proof of Service) (Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by O-Web Technologies LTD of Withdrawal of John Mitchell as Counsel of Record (Licygiewicz, Arthur) (aef). (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge The new case number is 11cv1810-DMS(WVG) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (tel) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Orbitz, LLC, filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service) (Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. Judge William Q. Hayes has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 11cv1810-BEN(WVG) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (tel) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 447 MOTION for Reconsideration re 425 Order, or in the Alternative, Certification of the Collateral Estoppel Order for Interlocutory Appeal by Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Hilton's Amended Motion For Reconsideration or, In the Alternative, Csertificate of the Collateral Estoppel Order For Interlocutory Appeal, # 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 3 Exhibit B of Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 4 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 5 Declaration of David M. Stein in Support of Hilton's Amended Motion For Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification of the Collateral Estoppel Order For Interlocutory Appeal, # 6 Proof of Service)(Stein, David)(yeb). (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 447 MOTION for Reconsideration re 425 Order, or in the Alternative, Certification of the Collateral Estoppel Order for Interlocutory Appeal and Objection to Hilton Defendants' Non-Compliant Motion for Reconsideration filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (yeb). (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION Regarding Service of Amended Infringement Contentions by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (yeb). (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz is recusing himself because a long-term law clerk's husband is representing one party in the case. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original District Judge have been vacated. The new case number is 11cv1810-WQH(WVG) (no document attached) (tel) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Modified on 8/14/2013 - Docketed in error (tel). (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Noelle Berg on behalf of QuikOrder, Inc. (Berg, Lindsey)Attorney Lindsey Noelle Berg added to party QuikOrder, Inc.(pty:dft) Modified on 8/15/2013 - Issued non-compliance notice re font size. (mdc) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judges have been transferred to the newly assigned Judges. The new case number is 11cv1810-BTM(WVG) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (tel) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Order for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re: QuikOrder's Responses to Ameranth's Interrogatories Re: Source Code Organization by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lodgment, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Lodgment (lodged under seal), # 3 Declaration Michel Cardinal, # 4 Declaration George Yu, # 5 Declaration Helen Irza, # 6 Declaration Marc Asher, # 7 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 449 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 448 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Caldarelli, William) (sjt). (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (sjt). (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 425 Order, or in the Alternative, Certification of the Collateral Estoppel Order for Interlocutory Appeal by Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Declaration of David Stein, # 5 Proof of Service)(Stein, David) (jao). (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order -Supplemental by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 443 MOTION to Dismiss. A hearing on the motion is currently set for October 17, 2013. Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc. shall file an opposition on or before September 12, 2013. Defendant shall file a reply on or before September 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/6/2013.(jao) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hyatt Corporation, filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service) (Caldarelli, William) [Also filed in 12cv1627] (jao). (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Usablenet, Inc. re ECF 438 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities) Filed per Order 434 . (jao) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 433 Joint Motion to Extend time to Complete Meet and Confer and respond to Court Order of July 26,2013. The parties shall have through August 15, 2013, to complete their meet and confer and file a proposed joint motion and schedule of service with the Court as ordered in the last paragraph of the Courts July 26, 2013 Order Determining Joint Motion for Discovery Dispute No. 2 [Doc. No. 432]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/2/2013. (jao) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Expedia, Inc., filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D part 1, # 6 Exhibit D part 2, # 7 Exhibit D part 3, # 8 Exhibit D part 4, # 9 Exhibit D part 5, # 10 Proof of Service). Filer Per ORder 434 . (jao) (cap). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hotwire, Inc., filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service). Filed Per Order 434 . (jao) (cap). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fandango, Inc., filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service). Filed Per Order 434 . (jao) (cap). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Usablenet, Inc., filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service). Filed Per Order 434 . (jao) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kayak Software Corporation, filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service). Filer Per Order 434 . (jao) (cap). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hotels.com, LP, filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service) Filed Per Order 434 . (jao) (cap). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hotel Tonight, Inc., filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proof of Service). Filed Per Order 434 . (jao) (cap). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 427 Joint Motion Regarding Filing of Amended Complaints and Responses Thereto. The Court Hereby Orders: (1) That Defendants are not required to file separate answers to Ameranth's non-dismissed claims for direct infringement of the patents-in-suit as otherwise might be required under Rule 12(a)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; (2) That Ameranth shall file amended complaints against the Defendants on or before September 4, 2013; and (3) In the event that Ameranth files an amended complaint on or before September 4, 2013, upon a Defendant, that such Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before October 11, 2013. (4) In the event that Ameranth does not file an amended complaint on or before September 4, as set forth above, that each such Defendant for whom an amended complaint is not filed shall answer or otherwise respond to the current complaint on or before October 11, 2013. The Court further orders all parties to, in addition to filing the original amended complaints in the respective dockets of each member case, file a duplicate copy of any such amended complaints or responsive pleadings on the docket for the lead case, Ameranth v. Pizza Hut, Inc. et al, Case No. 11-CV-1810. The Court directs the Clerk to file, nunc pro tunc, a duplicate copy of any previously filed amended complaints or responsive pleadings from the member cases in the lead case. The Court further directs the Clerk to file, nunc pro tunc, a duplicate copy of any subsequently filed motions, including Defendant Usablenet's Motion to Dismiss (12-cv-1650, ECF No. 19), in the lead case pursuant to the Court's October 4, 2012 Consolidation Order. (1810, ECF No. 279.) The Court reminds all parties that any future motions SHALL BE FILED in the lead case. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/2/2013. (jao) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Order to Extend Time to Complete Meet and Confer and Respond to Court Order of July 26, 2013 by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Determining Joint Motion for Discovery Dispute No. 2 and Granting Defendants' Request That Ameranth Amend Its Infringement Contentions or Drop Those Contentions re 402 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/26/2013. (jao) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To Complete Meet And Confer And File Any Joint Discovery Motion Re Infringement Contentions (Re Doc. 430 ): The date for the Ticketing Company Defendants and Ameranth to complete meet and confer efforts and to file any joint motion regarding Ameranth's infringement contentions concerning the Ticketing Company Defendants is continued to 8/16/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/24/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notices also were mailed to Attys Richard Dault, Angela Hsieh, and Bradford P. Lyerla.) (mdc) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (Joint) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Infringement Contentions by Fandango, Inc., Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) Modified on 7/24/2013 - Added "Joint" to text/motion text. (mdc) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 428 Joint Motion to Accommodate Supplemental Production of Documents. Any joint discovery motion regarding Papa John's production of documents or source code related to the Brandt/WiseOutlook version of the Papa John's ordering system shall be brought by August 14, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/22/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Order to Accommodate Supplemental Production of Documents Re: Defendant Papa John's by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Watts, Ethan) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Order Regarding Filing of Amended Complaints and Responses Thereto by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Joint Motion For 30-Day Extension Of Time To Complete Meet And Confer And File Any Joint Discovery Motion Re Infringement Contentions (Re Doc. 424 ): The date for the Hotel Defendants and Ameranth to complete meet and confer efforts and to file any joint motion regarding Ameranth's infringement contentions concerning the Hotel Defendants' accused systems is continued to 8/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/18/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notices also were mailed to Attys Richard Dault, Angela Hsieh, and Bradford P. Lyerla.) (mdc) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants in part and denies in part Hilton's motion to dismiss. The Court grants Hilton's motion without prejudice as to Ameranth's indirect infringement and willful infringement claims. The Court denies Hilton's motion as to Ameranth's direct infringement claims. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/18/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Joint Discovery Motion re Infringement Contentions and to Complete Meet and Confer by Ameranth, Inc., Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Stein, David) (mdc) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss (re ECF 18 in member case 12cv1659). As stipulated by the parties, Ameranth's complaint against EMN8 is dismissed with prejudice, EMN8's counterclaims against Ameranth are dismissed with prejudice.Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/16/2013.(jao) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 420 Joint Motion to Accomodate Rolling Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/15/2013. (jao) (jcj). (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 419 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Meet and Confer and File Any Joint Discovery Motions re Infringement Contentions. It is ordered that the date for Travel Aggregator Defendants and Ameranth to complete meet and confer efforts and to file any joint motion regarding Ameranths infringement contentions concerning the accused Travel Aggregator Defendants is continued to August 2, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/15/2013. (jao) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Discovery to Accommodate Rolling Production of Documents by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Infringement Contentions by Ameranth, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Orbitz, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (jao). (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (re ECF 10 in member case 12cv1650). For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Usablenet's motion to dismiss Ameranths indirect infringement and willful infringement claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/9/2013.(jao) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Dismiss (re ECF 16 in member case 12cv1629). For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants in part and denies in part Starwood's motion to dismiss. The Court grants Starwood's motion without prejudice as to Ameranth's indirect infringement and willful infringement claims. The Court denies Starwood's motion as to Ameranth's direct infringement claims. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/9/2013.(jao) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Dismiss. The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motions to dismiss. The Court grants without prejudice Defendants' motions as to Ameranth's indirect infringement claims and willful infringement claims. The Court denies Defendants' motions as to invalidity of the Asserted Patents and Ameranth's direct infringement claims. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/5/2013.(jao) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 414 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Service of Infringement Contentions. Upon the Joint Motion of plaintiff Ameranth, Inc. and defendant EMN8, Inc. to extend the time for Ameranth to serve Infringement Contentions upon EMN8, and for good cause shown, the Court orders: the time for Ameranth to serve infringement contentions upon EMN8 is continued to July 26, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 7/3/2013. (jao) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Order to Extend Time for Service of Infringement Contentions Regarding Defendant EMN8, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Joinder by Best Western International, Inc. re 402 MOTION for Discovery Dispute No. 2 Re Infringement Contentions (Kim, Jenny)(jao). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 407 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Meet and Confer and File Any Required Discovery Motion re Infringement Contentions. It is ordered that the date for Marriott and Ameranth to complete meet and confer efforts and to file any joint motion regarding Ameranth's infringement contentions concerning Marriott's accused system is hereby continued to July 18, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/27/2013. (jao) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 408 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Meet and Confer and File Any Joint Discovery re Infringement Contentions. It is ordered that the date for Hilton and Ameranth to complete meet and confer efforts and to file any joint motion regarding Ameranth's infringement contentions concerning the accused Hilton system is continued to July 18, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/27/2013. (jao) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 406 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Meet and Confer and File Any Required Discovery Motion re Infringement Contentions. It is ordered that the date for Hyatt and Ameranth to complete meet and confer efforts and to file any joint motion regarding Ameranth's infringement contentions concerning Hyatts accused system is hereby continued to July 18, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/27/2013. (jao) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 405 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Meet and Confer and File Any Required Discovery Motion re Infringement Contentions. It is ordered that the date for Starwood and Ameranth to complete meet and confer efforts and to file any joint motion regarding Ameranth's infringement contentions concerning Starwood's accused system is hereby continued to July 18, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/27/2013. (jao) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Joint Discovery Motion re Infringement Contentions and to Complete Meet and Confer by Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (originally filed in 12cv1636 ECF 30, re-filed per order 31, 6/27/2013)(jao) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION For Extension Of Time To Complete Meet And Confer And File Any Joint Discovery Motion Re Infringement Contentions by Ameranth, Inc., Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (Saros, Nick) (jao). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion Regarding Infringement Contentions and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding Hyatt by Ameranth, Inc.(Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Discovery Motion regarding Infringement Contentions and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding Starwood by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte 400 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Joint Motion for Resolution of Discovery Dispute No. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/24/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Ameranth, Inc. re 402 MOTION for Discovery Dispute No. 2 Notice of Lodgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/26/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery Dispute No. 2 by Opentable, Inc., Wanderspot LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lodgment, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Zembek, Richard) (jao). (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 401 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 400 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Caldarelli, William) (rlu). (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (rlu). (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 398 Joint Motion for Further Extension of Time to Complete Meet and Confer and File Any Required Discovery Motions Re Source Code Tools. Ameranth and Seamless shall have until July 8, 2013, to complete their meet and confer efforts and file any necessary discovery motion regarding the scope and format of Seamless' production of source code in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/21/2013. (jao) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Continue Complete Meet and Confer by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 396 Joint Motion for Further Extension of Time to Complete Meet and Confer and File Any Required Discovery Motion Re Source Code Tools. Ameranth and Pizza Hut shall have until July 8, 2013, to complete their meet and confer efforts and file any necessary discovery motion regarding the scope and format of Pizza Hut's production of source code in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/20/2013. (jao) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion Regarding Source Code Tools and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding Pizza Hut Defendants by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 390 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kimberly A. Warshawsky terminated as attorney of record for Defendant Best Western International, Inc. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/17/2013. (jao) (jcj). (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Erikson C Squier on behalf of Best Western International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Squier, Erikson) (jao). (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny S. Kim on behalf of Best Western International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Kim, Jenny) (jao). (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Hoting on behalf of Best Western International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hoting, Shaun) (jao). (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ATX Innovation, Inc. re 389 Notice of Appearance (Hoting, Shaun) (jao). (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kimberly A. Warshawsky by Best Western International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Tache, Joseph) (jao). (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Hoting on behalf of ATX Innovation, Inc. (Hoting, Shaun) (jao). (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Denying 359 Ex Parte Motion for a Joint Discovery Conference. The court finds that the matters raised are not so urgent as to warrant the setting of a discovery conference prior to the parties first engaging in meaningful meet and confers and fully briefing the issues in a coordinated joint discovery motion. The issues raised do not appear amenable to being resolved without the benefit of prior briefing and meet and confers, and with the verbal participation of over 20 attorneys. The court, therefore, denies Ameranth's ex parte application to hold a discovery conference. This denial is without prejudice to the parties raising the substantive discovery issues in a single, coordinated joint discovery motion after all meet and confers have taken place. The court sets July 12, 2013 as the deadline to file any joint discovery motion related to the issues raised in this ex parte application. If the parties file any further ex parte applications that involve resolution of substantive discovery disputes, such an application will count against the collective total limit of 20 joint discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/7/2013. (jao) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 385 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion. Ameranth and Wanderspot shall have until June 21, 2013, to complete their meet and confer efforts and file any necessary discovery motion regarding any alleged deficiencies in Ameranths infringement contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/5/2013. (jao) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 384 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion. Ameranth and OpenTable shall have until June 21, 2013, to complete their meet and confer efforts and file any necessary discovery motion regarding any alleged deficiencies in Ameranth's infringement contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/5/2013. (jao) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Wanderspot LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (jao). (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Opentable, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard)(jao). (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Erikson C Squier on behalf of ATX Innovation, Inc. (Squier, Erikson) (jao). (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny S. Kim on behalf of ATX Innovation, Inc. (Kim, Jenny) (jao). (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney KIMBERLY A. WARSHAWSKY, by ATX Innovation, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Tache, Joseph) Modified text/event on 6/4/2013 (jao). (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R.R. Tache on behalf of ATX Innovation, Inc. (Tache, Joseph) Mailer sent, attys not added on 6/3/2013 (jao). (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 359 Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing /Joint Discovery Conference Regarding the Defendants' Responses to Ameranth's Written Discovery Requests filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William Caldarelli, # 2 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 363 Motion for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion Between Plaintiff and Defendant Seamless. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (jcj). (Main Document 378 replaced on 5/31/2013) (sjt). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 366 Motion for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion Between Plaintiff and Defendant QuikOrder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (jcj). (Main Document 377 replaced on 5/31/2013) (sjt). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 368 Motion for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion Between Plaintiff and Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (jcj). (Main Document 376 replaced on 5/31/2013) (sjt). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 365 Motion for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion Between Plaintiff and Defendant Papa John's. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (jcj). (Main Document 375 replaced on 5/31/2013) (sjt). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 370 Motion for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion Between Plaintiff and Defendant O-Web Technologies, LTD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (jcj). (Main Document 374 replaced on 5/31/2013) (sjt). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 364 Motion for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion Between Plaintiff and Defendant OpenTable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (jcj). (Main Document 373 replaced on 5/31/2013) (sjt). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 367 Motion for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion Between Plaintiff and Defendant Grubhub. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (jcj). (Main Document 372 replaced on 5/31/2013) (sjt). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 369 Motion for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer and File any Required Discovery Motion Between Plaintiff and Defendant Dominos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/29/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (jcj). (Main Document 371 replaced on 5/31/2013) (sjt). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding O-Web by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William). (jah). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding Dominos by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William). (jah). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding Pizza Hut by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William). (jah). (Entered: 05/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding GrubHub by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jpp). (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding QuikOrder by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (cge). (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding Papa John's by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (cge). (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding OpenTable by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (cge). (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Required Discovery Motion and to Complete Meet and Confer Regarding Seamless by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (cge). (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 359 Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing /Joint Discovery Conference Regarding the Defendants' Responses to Ameranth's Written Discovery Requests filed by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Richard Zembek, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Declaration Anthony Nimmo, # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (cge). (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Ameranth, Inc. re 359 Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing /Joint Discovery Conference Regarding the Defendants' Responses to Ameranth's Written Discovery Requests . (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 359 Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing Joint Discovery Conference Regarding the Defendants' Responses to Ameranth's Written Discovery Requests: To allow for the coordinated response of all Defendants, the opposition is due by 5/24/2013. Plaintiff's reply is due by 5/31/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/10/2013.(no document attached) (ecp) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION for Hearing /Joint Discovery Conference Regarding the Defendants' Responses to Ameranth's Written Discovery Requests by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice, # 2 Declaration William J. Caldarelli, # 3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (sjt). (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Seamless North America, LLC Supplemental Notice of Party with Financial Interest under Civil Local Rule 40.2 and F.R.C.P. 7.1. (Williams, Eliot) (jao). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. in Support of Ameranth, Inc.'s Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Joint Motion Regarding ESI re 355 . The Parties agree that this Order applies to all Documents collected and produced in this matter, with the exception of source code, the production of which is addressed in the Court's Orders of December 14, 2012 and February 20, 2013. However, nothing herein shall require the re-formatting or re-production of documents or materials previously produced in this matter prior to the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/12/2013. (jao) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/12/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION Regarding Proposed ESI Order by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Case Management Conference) held on 2/20/2013, before Magistate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Merker on behalf of Agilysys, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Merker, Nicholas) (ag). (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Nicholas R. Merker appearing for Defendant Agilysys, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Agilysys, Inc. of Withdrawal of Kregg T. Brooks (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Nimmo, Anthony) (jao). (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by EMN8, Inc. of Withdrawal of Phillip Bennett as Counsel (Berretta, Frederick) (jao). (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Zelkind on behalf of EMN8, Inc. (Zelkind, Boris) (jao). (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Dienes on behalf of Agilysys, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Dienes, Jennifer) (jao). (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Jennifer M. Dienes appearing for Defendant Agilysys, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings in a Patent Case. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3B before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/22/2013.(jao) (jcj). (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Following Second Case Management Conference and Case Management Order. Issued contemporaneously with this order is a scheduling order listing all pretrial dates up to the claim construction hearing. Within three days of the district judge's issuance of a claim construction order, the parties shall contact this chambers with their availability for the scheduling of a third case management conference, at which the court will set all remaining dates in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/22/2013.(jao) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 344 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Determining 325 Joint Motion for Resolution of Discovery Dispute No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/20/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 344 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Determining 325 Joint Motion for Resolution of Discovery Dispute No. 1. The Court requests that if you have downloaded a previous version of this Order, please delete, as it contains confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/20/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) Modified on 2/21/2013 to replace image, and regenerate NEF to all parties (leh). (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Case Management Conference held on 2/20/2013. (Plaintiff Attorneys William Caldarelli, Mike Fabiano, Ben West, Ethan Watts). (Defendant Attorneys Rich Zembek, Gilbert Greene (Papa John's, Wanderspot, Expedia, Hotels.com, Hotel Tonight, Hotwire, Kayak, Orbitz, Travelocity, Fandango, StubHub, Ticketmaster, Live Nation, Micros, OpenTable); Kimberly Warshawsky (ATX, Best Western); Joel Beres (Pizza Hut); Alison Maddeford (QuikOrder); T. Jesse Hindman (Starwood); Robert Lancaster (Ord.in, Inc.); Richard Clegg (Seamless); Arthur Licygiewicz (O-Web Techs.); Andrew Zappia (Usablenet); Nick Saros (Marriott); David Stein (Hilton); Phillip Bennett (EMN8); Thomas Cunningham (Domino's Pizza); Jose Rodriguez (Mobo Systems); Les Robertson (Grubhub); Douglas Lytle (Agilysys); Gerald Schneeweis (Hyatt)). Orders to issue. (CD# 2/20/2013 NLS13-9:42-10:21). (no document attached) (ecp) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. of Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Warshawsky on behalf of ATX Innovation, Inc. (Warshawsky, Kimberly) (jao). (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Rodriguez on behalf of Mobo Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Rodriguez, Jose) (jao). (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Alison L. Maddeford on behalf of QuikOrder, Inc. (Maddeford, Alison) (jao). (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Regarding Second Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/8/2013.(jao) (jcj). (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. in Support of Oppositions to Motions to Dismiss of Defendants Expedia (12cv1654 Dk#26), Fandango (12cv1651 Dk#27), Hotel Tonight (12cv1633 Dk#26), Hotels.com (12cv1634 Dk#26), Hotwire (12cv1653 Dk#26), Kayak (12cv1640 Dk#26), Micros (12cv1655 Dk#26), Orbitz (12cv1644 Dk#26), StubHub (12cv1646 Dk#26), Ticketmaster (12cv1648 Dk#28), Travelocity (12cv1649 Dk#26), Wanderspot (12cv1652 Dk#26), Hilton Hotels (12cv1636 Dk#27), Starwood (12cv1629 Dk#24), Usablenet (12cv1650 Dk#16) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Continuing Hearings. Presently before the Court are Defendant Papa John's USA, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment, (12-cv-729, ECF No. 27), and Defendant GrubHub, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment, (12-cv-739, ECF No. 33). Due to conflicts in the Court's schedule, the motion hearings set for both motions on February 14, 2013, are hereby continued to February 28, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/5/2013.(jao) (jcj). (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. of Joint Case Management Statement and Discovery Plan (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 332 Motion to Substitute Attorneys. Presently before the Court is Defendant Opentable, Inc.'s Substitution of Attorneys of Record Herein. Defendant seeks to substitute John A. OMalley; Dan D. Davison; Marc L. Delflache; Richard S. Zembek; George W. Jordan, III; Gilbert A. Greene; and Sheila C. Kadura in place of Mark A. Flagel and James L. Day. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 83.3(g)(2), Defendant's motion is granted. The Clerk shall update the Court's docket to reflect the substitution. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/1/201. (jao) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Opentable, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (jao). (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Defendant's 326 Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Duane H Mathiowetz on behalf of QuikOrder, Inc. (Mathiowetz, Duane) (jao). (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by George Chin-Lun Yu on behalf of QuikOrder, Inc. (Yu, George) Mailer sent on 1/22/2013 (jao). (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/25/2013] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 326 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Zembek, Richard) (rlu). (Main Document 327 replaced on 1/25/2013) (rlu). Modified on 1/25/2013 to add file date of lodgment (rlu). (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Zembek, Richard) (rlu). (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Discovery Resolution Dispute No. 1 by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Effertz, # 2 Exhibit A to Decl Effertz, # 3 Declaration Larson, # 4 Declaration Korabelnikov, # 5 Declaration Reynolds, # 6 Declaration Russo)(Zembek, Richard) (jao). (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Vacating Hearing re 303 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Exit 41, Inc. [FRCP 55(b)(2)]. The hearing set for Thursday, January 10, 2013 is hereby vacated, and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/4/2013.(jao) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Protective Order Governing Confidential Information for Consolidated Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 12/14/2012.(jao) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 303 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Exit 41, Inc. [FRCP 55(b)(2)] filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Sheila Kadura appearing for Defendants Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC, Counter Claimant Papa John's USA, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Gilbert A. Greene appearing for Defendants Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC, Counter Claimant Papa John's USA, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Vacating Hearings. The hearings set for fourteen motions on Thursday, December 13, 2012 are hereby vacated, and the matters are taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/6/2012.(jao) (jrl). (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Continuing Hearings. Presently before the Court are Defendant Papa John's USA, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment, (11-cv-729, ECF No. 27), and Defendant GrubHub, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment, (11-cv-739, ECF No. 33). Due to conflicts in the Court's schedule, the motion hearings set for both motions on December 13, 2012, are hereby continued to February 14, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/6/2012.(jao) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Case Management Conference) held on 11/14/2012, before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Cameron P. Kircher. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ben West on behalf of Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(West, Ben) (jao). (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Angela Hsieh appearing for Defendant Hyatt Corporation. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Vacating Hearings. The hearings set for all eight motions on Thursday, November 29, 2012 are hereby vacated, and the matters are taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/21/2012.(jao) (jrl). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Vacating Hearings re 283 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Best Western International, Inc.'s Sixth Affirmative Defense and First Through Seventh Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b), 282 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ATX Innovation, Inc.'s Ninth Affirmative Defense and First Through Third Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b), 287 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Defendants Marriott International, Inc.'s, The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC's, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.'s and Renaissance Hotel Operating Company's Fourth Affirmative Defense. The hearings set for all three motions on Thursday, November 29, 2012 are hereby vacated, and the matters are taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/21/2012.(jao)(jrl). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 287 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Defendants Marriott International, Inc.'s, The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC's, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.'s and Renaissance Hotel Operating Company's Fourth Affirmative Defense filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 283 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Best Western International, Inc.'s Sixth Affirmative Defense and First Through Seventh Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 282 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ATX Innovation, Inc.'s Ninth Affirmative Defense and First Through Third Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 304 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/16/2012. (leh) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule as to 303 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Exit 41, Inc. [FRCP 55(b)(2)]. Defendant shall file its opposition on or before December 13, 2012. Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before December 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/15/2012.(jao) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Following Inital Case Management Conference and Setting Second Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/15/2012.(jao) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 11/16/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 304 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Caldarelli, William) Modified on 11/16/2012 to add file date to lodgment(leh). (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Exit 41, Inc. [FRCP 55(b)(2)] by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of William J. Caldarelli, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of William J. Caldarelli, # 4 Declaration Jeffrey Brown, # 5 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, # 6 Exhibit Not Under Seal, # 7 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2012. (Plaintiff Attorneys William Caldarelli, Mike Fabiano). (Defendant Attorneys Rich Zembek, Bert Greene (Papa John's, Wanderspot, Expedia, Hotels.com, Hotel Tonigh, Hotwire, Kayak, Orbitz, Travelocity, Fandago, StubHub, Ticketmaster, Live Nation, Micros); J. Rick Tache (ATX); Joel Beres (Pizza Hut); George Yu (QuikOrder); T. Jesse Hindman (Starwood); Robert Lancaster (Ord.in, Inc.); Richard Clegg (Seamless); Arthur Licygiewicz (O-Web Techs.); Philip Bonoli (Usablenet); Nick Saros (Marriott); David Stein (Hilton); Phillip Bennett (EMN8); Thomas Cunningham (Domino's Pizza); Lowell Mead (Mobo Systems); James Day (Open Table); Les Robertson (Grubhub); Anthony Nimmo (Agilysys); Gerald Schneeweis (Hyatt)). Order to issue. (no document attached) (ecp) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 287 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Defendants Marriott International, Inc.'s, The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC's, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.'s and Renaissance Hotel Operating Company's Fourth Affirmative Defense filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Saros, Nick) (jao). (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: George W. Jordan, III appearing for Defendants Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC, Counter Claimant Papa John's USA, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 282 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ATX Innovation, Inc.'s Ninth Affirmative Defense and First Through Third Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) filed by ATX Innovation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Rick Tache ISO Defendant ATX Innovation, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Proof of Service)(Tache, Joseph) (jao). (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 283 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Best Western International, Inc.'s Sixth Affirmative Defense and First Through Seventh Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) filed by Best Western International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Rick Tache ISO Def. Best Western International, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Proof of Service)(Tache, Joseph) (jao). (Entered: 11/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. of Joint Statement Regarding Proposed Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Seamless North America, LLC re 89 Notice of Party With Financial Interest Supplemental Notice of Party with Financial Interest. (Williams, Eliot) (jao). (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Vacating Hearing. Presently before the Court is Defendant Usablenet, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (12cv1650, ECF No. 10.) The hearing set for Thursday, November 8, 2012, is hereby vacated, and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/2/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Kellie M. Johnson appearing for Defendants Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (cap). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Emily C. Johnson appearing for Defendants Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (cap). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court strikes Exit 41's answer and directs the Clerk of Court to enter default against Exit 41 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Ameranth is directed to file its motion for default judgment within 28 days of the date that this Order is electronically docketed.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 264 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Exit 41, Inc. and to Strike Answer of Defendant Exit 41, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court strikes Exit 41's answer and directs the Clerk of Court to enter default against Exit 41 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Ameranth is directed to file its motion for default judgment within 28 days of the date that this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/18/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino : Motion for Entry of Default against Defendant Exit 41, Inc., and to Strike Answer of Defendant Exit 41, Inc 264 granted (Court Reporter Gayle Wakefield / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Counsel William J. Caldarelli ) (no document attached) (acr) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule as to 287 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Defendants Marriott International, Inc.'s, The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC's, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.'s and Renaissance Hotel Operating Company's Fourth Affirmative Defense. Defendants shall file their oppositions on or before November 13, 2012. Ameranth shall file its reply on or before November 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/18/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Arthur P. Licygiewicz appearing for Counter Claimants O-Web Technologies LTD, O-Web Technologies LTD, Defendant O-Web Technologies LTD. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Defendants Marriott International, Inc.'s, The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC's, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.'s and Renaissance Hotel Operating Company's Fourth Affirmative Defense by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, # 3 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Usablenet, Inc. Reply Memorandum in Support of Usablenet Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Proof of Service)(Bonoli, Philip) (jao). (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule as to 283 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Best Western International, Inc.'s Sixth Affirmative Defense and First Through Seventh Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b), 282 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ATX Innovation, Inc.'s Ninth Affirmative Defense and First Through Third Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b).The hearings for both motions are currently set for November 29, 2012. Defendants ATX Innovation Inc. and Best Western International, Inc. shall file their oppositions on or before November 12, 2012. Ameranth shall file its replies on or before November 19, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/15/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The Court vacates the ENE set for 11/14/2012. A Case Management Conference is set for 11/14/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/12/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Best Western International, Inc.'s Sixth Affirmative Defense and First Through Seventh Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, # 3 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ATX Innovation, Inc.'s Ninth Affirmative Defense and First Through Third Counterclaims Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 12(f) and/or for Failure to Comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b) by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, # 3 Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)(jao). (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 231 Amended Answer to Complaint and First Amended Counterclaims by GrubHub, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Ameranth, Inc. of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition to Usablenet's Motion to Dismiss [Consolidated with Case No. 12-cv-1650] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Cases Consolidated, 11cv1810-JLS-NLS. All future docketing will be done in the lead case. The thirty related cases above are consolidated for all pretrial issues up to and including claim construction with the lead case, 11-CV-1810. All parties SHALL FILE any future motions in the lead case. The setting of the Case Management Conference will be addressed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. All issues raised regarding proposed limits and timing of discovery will also be addressed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. The proposed grouping of Defendants into industry groups will be addressed by the Court at the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/4/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (jrl). (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameranth, Inc. re 277 Order to Show Cause, on Defendant Exit 41 (Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/18/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 06 before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. It is ordered that Ameranth shall serve this Order on Exit 41, and shall file proof of service with the Court. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/1/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (jrl). (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Vacating Hearing. The hearing set for Thursday, November 8, 2012 is hereby vacated, and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/1/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (jrl). (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY - Other re 264 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Exit 41, Inc. and to Strike Answer of Defendant Exit 41, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Ameranth, Inc. re 272 Response - Other to Order to Show Cause Regarding Consolidation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 271 Order to Show Cause, filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC, Grubhub, Inc., O-Web Technologies LTD, Opentable, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc., Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Richard S. Zembek, # 2 Exhibit 1 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 Declaration, # 5 Request for Judicial Notice, # 6 Exhibit 4 Judicial Notice, # 7 Exhibit 5 Judicial Notice, # 8 Exhibit 6 Judicial Notice, # 9 Exhibit 7 Judicial Notice, # 10 Exhibit 8 Judicial Notice, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (jao). (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 271 Order to Show Cause, Regarding Consolidation of Cases filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Directing Parties to Show Cause Why These Cases Should Not Be Consolidated For Pretrial Purposes Up To and Including Claim Construction. The parties shall file briefs not to exceed ten pages directly responding to the issues raised in this order by September 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/19/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 268 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Troy S. Prince terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/12/2012. (jao) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (cap). (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Dan Duncan Davison appearing for Papa John's USA, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Troy S. Prince by O-Web Technologies LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Motion To Withdraw As Attorney)(Janis, Dean) (jao). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 266 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Edward George Dane and Peter E. Gratzinger terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/10/2012. (jao) (cap). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ameranth, Inc.. (Gratzinger, Peter) (jao). (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 264 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Exit 41, Inc. and to Strike Answer of Defendant Exit 41, Inc. Defendant's opposition is due by September 27, 2012, and Plaintiff's reply is due by October 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/6/2012.(jao) (cap). (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Exit 41, Inc. and to Strike Answer of Defendant Exit 41, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Striking Documents and Directing Clerk to Refile in Related Case 12cv0739-JLS-NLS. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/24/2012. (jao) (cap). (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER 263 ** MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William)(kaj). (Main Document 262 replaced on 8/24/2012) (jao). Modified to strike on 8/24/2012 (jao). (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **DOCUMENT STRIKEN PER ORDER 263 ** RESPONSE in Opposition re 252 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Defendant GrubHub, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Separate Statement, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Declaration Piers O'Hanlon, # 4 Declaration Michael D. Fabiano, # 5 Notice of Lodgment, # 6 Exhibit to Notice of Lodgment, # 7 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jao). (Main Document 261 replaced on 8/24/2012) (jao). Modified to strike on 8/24/2012 (jao). (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Defendants' Motions to Sever and Consolidate Claims (Doc Nos. 188 , 196 , 197 , 200 , 203 , 208 , 214 , 215 ). The claims against each Defendant shall remain governed by the relevant portions of the operative pleadings filed in the instant action. All further litigation of these claims and related counterclaims shall occur in the later-filed cases. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/6/2012. (leh) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 252 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement. The motion hearing is set for October 4, 2012. Plaintiffs opposition to the motion is DUE BY August 23, 2012. Defendants reply is DUE BYAugust 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/3/2012.(mtb) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 250 MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Counterclaim of Defendant and Counterclaimant GrubHub, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). The motion hearing is set for September 20, 2012. Defendants opposition to the motion is DUE BY August 23, 2012. Plaintiffs reply is DUE BY August 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/3/2012.(mtb) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting defendant GrubHub, Inc.'s 253 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/3/12. (kaj) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 240 Joint Motion to Stay All Claim Construction Deadlines in This Action and Setting a Settlement Conference in This Action to Coincide With the ENE/CMC in Related Cases. Settlement Conference set for 11/14/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/2/2012. (mtb) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/3/12] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 253 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Robertson, Lesley) (kaj). (Main Document 254 replaced on 8/3/2012) (kaj). Modified on 8/3/2012 to add file date of lodgment (kaj). (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Robertson, Lesley) qc mail sent re missing pos (kaj). (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER 263 ** MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Grubhub, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Les W. Robertson, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Proof of Service)(Robertson, Lesley) (jpp). (Main Document 252 replaced on 8/24/2012) (jao). Modified to strike on 8/24/2012 (jao). (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Exit 41, LLC re 245 Order on Motion for Order, Motion Hearing,, Notice of Ruling Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record (w/COS) (Kracht, Joseph) (rlu). (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER 263 ** MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Counterclaim of Defendant and Counterclaimant GrubHub, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (rlu). (Main Document 250 replaced on 8/24/2012) (jao). Modified to strike on 8/24/2012 (jao). (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 232 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of QuikOrder, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)(yeb). (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 115 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of OpenTable, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)(yeb). (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 227 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Domino's Pizza, Inc. and Domino's Pizza, LLC by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (knb). (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 243 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Seamless North America, LLC by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (knb). (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino : Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for defendant Exit 41, Inc. 183 is granted. Defendant Exit 41, Inc., has 30 days to obtain new counsel of record (Court Reporter Gayle Wakefield / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Ethan M. Watts / Defendant Attorney Joseph Kracht) (no document attached) (acr) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Vacating Hearing. The Court finds the 214 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate, 197 MOTION to Sever and to Consolidate, 188 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate Claims, 196 MOTION to Sever And Consolidate, 215 Amended MOTION to Sever 200 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Consolidate Cases , 203 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Consolidate the claims with Civil Action No. 12CV0732-JLS-NLS, 208 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Consolidate the claims with Civil Action No. 12CV0731-JLS-NLS, suitable for determination on the papers submitted and without oral argument. Accordingly, no appearances are required. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/26/2012.(mtb) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Ameranth, Inc. by Seamless North America, LLC. (Clegg, Richard). (jah). (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 230 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answers and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/25/2012. (mtb) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Gratzinger on behalf of Ameranth, Inc. (Gratzinger, Peter) (leh). (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Stay Claim Construction Dates and Deadlines Until After the August 29, 2012, ENE in related cases by Seamless North America, LLC. (Clegg, Richard) (jpp). (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT 236 by Seamless North America, LLC re 236 Joint MOTION to Stay Claim Construction Dates and Deadlines Until After the August 29, 2012, ENE in related cases filed by Seamless North America, LLC with incorrect Case Number in the Caption. (Clegg, Richard) (jpp). (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NON Opposition re 230 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to the Second Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Amernath, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jpp). (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 214 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate, 197 MOTION to Sever and to Consolidate, 188 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate Claims, 196 MOTION to Sever And Consolidate, 189 MOTION to Sever the Claims against it from This Case and to Consolidate, 215 Amended MOTION to Sever The Claims Against It From This Case And To Consolidate The Claims With Civil Action No. 12CV00733-JLS-NLS, 200 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Consolidate Cases , 203 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate MOTION to Consolidate the claims with Civil Action No. 12CV0732-JLS-NLS, 208 MOTION to Sever and to Consolidate MOTION to Consolidate the claims with Civil Action No. 12CV0731-JLS-NLS filed by Seamless North America, LLC. (Clegg, Richard)(cge). (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITHDRAWN PER 239 - Joint MOTION to Stay Claim Construction Dates and Deadlines Until After the August 29, 2012, ENE in related cases by Seamless North America, LLC. (Clegg, Richard) (cge). Modified on 7/25/2012 to edit text, efiling withdrawn. (jpp). (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameranth, Inc. re 233 Notice of Appearance Corrected (Dane, Edward) (kaj). (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ameranth, Inc. re 233 Notice of Appearance (Dane, Edward) (kaj). (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Edward George Dane on behalf of Ameranth, Inc. (Dane, Edward) qc mail sent re cert of service (kaj). (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 232 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Second 106 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ameranth, Inc. by QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Yu, George) (leh). (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 231 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Second 106 Amended Complaint, by Grubhub, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Two, # 3 Exhibit Three, # 4 Exhibit Four, # 5 Proof of Service)(Robertson, Lesley) (jpp). (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to the Second Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Amernath, Inc. by Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Attachment A - Seamless North America LLC's First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to the Second Amended Complaint Modified on 7/18/2012 (jpp). (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 229 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand re 106 Second Amended Complaint.(Day, James) Modified text to create correct link on 7/17/2012 (mtb). (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 214 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate, 197 MOTION to Sever and to Consolidate, 188 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate Claims, 196 MOTION to Sever And Consolidate, 215 Amended MOTION to Sever The Claims Against It From This Case And To Consolidate The Claims With Civil Action No. 12CV00733-JLS-NLS, 200 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Consolidate Cases , 203 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate MOTION to Consolidate the claims with Civil Action No. 12CV0732-JLS-NLS, 208 MOTION to Sever and to Consolidate MOTION to Consolidate the claims with Civil Action No. 12CV0731-JLS-NLS of All Defendants filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jpp). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Second 106 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (mtb). (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Breifing Schedule re 214 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate filed by Papa John's USA, Inc., and 215 Amended MOTION to Sever The Claims Against It From This Case And To Consolidate The Claims With Civil Action No. 12CV00733-JLS-NLS filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc. These motions, and any further motions to sever and consolidate, set for hearing together on August 2, 2012, shall follow the same briefing schedule already set forth in the Courts June 26, 2012 Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/27/2012.(mtb) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 212 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/27/2012. (mtb) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 186 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 190 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 193 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 194 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 199 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 204 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 206 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/26/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION to Sever The Claims Against It From This Case And To Consolidate The Claims With Civil Action No. 12CV00733-JLS-NLS by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (mtb). (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Sever and Consolidate by Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marc Delflache [Redacted], # 2 Exhibit A [Redacted], # 3 Proof of Service)(O'Malley, John) (rlu). (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/27/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 212 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (O'Malley, John) (kaj). (Main Document 213 replaced on 6/28/2012) (kaj). Modified on 6/28/2012 to add text re filing as sealed doc. (kaj). (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (O'Malley, John) (kaj). (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D. Gopen on behalf of Papa John's USA, Inc. (Gopen, Aaron)(yeb). (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 124 , 125 , 126 , 127 , 128 Plaintiff's Motions to dismiss Counterclaims and to dismiss or strike affirmative defenses. If Defendants wish, they may file amended Answers, which remedy the deficiencies, within 21 days of the date this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/26/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Briefing S re 188 , 189 , 196 , 197 , 200 , 203 , 208 MOTIONS to Sever and to Consolidate. Any partys opposition to the motions is DUE BY July 16, 2012. The moving Defendants reply is DUE BY July 23, 2012. To the extent possible, this briefing should be consolidated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/26/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Sever and to Consolidate by Opentable, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration [Redacted] Declaration of Ryan B. Erickson In Support of Defendant OpenTable, Inc.s Motion To Sever Under Rules 20 and 21 and To Consolidate Under Rule 42, # 2 Exhibit Amended Claim Chart as to Defendant OpenTable, Inc.)(Day, James)(aef). Added MOTION to Consolidate the claims with Civil Action No. 12CV0731-JLS-NLS on 6/26/2012 (aef). Modified on 6/26/2012-no memorandum of points and authorities (aef). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/26/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 206 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Day, James) (leh). (Main Document 207 replaced on 6/28/2012) (kaj). Modified on 6/28/2012 to add text re filing as sealed doc. (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Day, James)(leh). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/26/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Prince, Troy) (leh). (Main Document 205 replaced on 6/28/2012) (kaj). Modified on 6/28/2012 to add text re filing as sealed doc. (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Prince, Troy) (leh). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Sever and Consolidate by O-Web Technologies LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Redacted of Troy S. Prince)(Prince, Troy). (aef) Added MOTION to Consolidate the claims with Civil Action No. 12CV0732-JLS-NLS on 6/26/2012 (aef). Modified on 6/26/2012-no memorandum of points and authorities (aef). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/26/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Robertson, Lesley) (Main Document 202 replaced on 6/28/2012) (kaj). Modified on 6/28/2012 to add text re filing as sealed doc. (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/26/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 199 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Yu, George) (kaj). (Main Document 201 replaced on 6/28/2012) (kaj). Modified on 6/28/2012 to add text re filing as sealed doc. (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Sever and, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc.. ( Memo of Points and Authorities re Motion see doc 188 attachment #1 # 2 Declaration [Redacted] of Joel T. Beres)(Beres, Joel) Modified on 6/26/2012 to edit text. (jpp). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yu, George) (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re 197 MOTION to Sever and to Consolidate [Redacted] by Defendant QuikOrder, Inc.. (Yu, George) (jpp). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Sever and to Consolidate by QuikOrder, Inc.. (Yu, George)(yeb). QC Mailer sent for no P's and A's. (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Sever And Consolidate by Grubhub, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Les W. Robertson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proof of Service)(Robertson, Lesley)(yeb). QC Mailer sent for no P's and A's. (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/26/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 194 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Beres, Joel) (kaj). (Main Document 195 replaced on 6/28/2012) (kaj). Modified on 6/28/2012 to add text re filing as sealed doc. (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Beres, Joel)(kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Robertson, Lesley) (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/26/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Cunningham, Thomas) (kaj). (Main Document 192 replaced on 6/28/2012) (kaj). Modified on 6/28/2012 to add text re filing as sealed doc. (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 188 MOTION to Sever and Consolidate Claims by Defendants Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC, Counter Claimants Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (rlu). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas). Modified on 6/25/2012 to edit text (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Sever the Claims against it from This Case and to Consolidate the Claims with Civil Action No. 12cv00737-JLS-NLS re 188 by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) Modified on 6/25/2012 to edit text (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Sever and Consolidate Claims by Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Consolidated Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Sever and Consolidate, # 2 Declaration [Redacted] Declaration of Eric J. Faragi in Support of Seamless's Motion to Sever and Consolidate)(Clegg, Richard) (rlu). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/26/12] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 186 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Clegg, Richard) (kaj). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2012: # 1 Main Document) (kaj). Modified on 6/28/2012 to add text re sealed doc. (kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Clegg, Richard)(kaj). (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 183 MOTION for Order to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant Exit 41, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William J. Caldarelli, # 2 Exhibit A-D, # 3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jpp). (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule as to 183 MOTION for Order to Withdraw as Counsel of Record.( Responses due by 7/5/2012, Replies due by 7/12/2012). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/8/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (jcj). (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Exit 41, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Dan Lawton)(Lawton, Daniel) (kaj). (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Deval K Zaveri on behalf of O-Web Technologies LTD (Zaveri, Deval)(yeb). (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Judge Janis L. Sammartino granting motion to withdraw O. Judson Scheaf, III as counsel of record 170 . Hearing set for 5/31/2012 is taken off calendar (acr) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca S Roberts on behalf of Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC (Roberts, Rebecca) (mtb). (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 175 Request for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant TicketMob only. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 05/25/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jcj). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 177 Joint Motion to Further Amend Scheduling Order; and Issuing Second Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 05/25/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (Main Document 178 replaced on 5/29/2012) (ag). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)(yeb). (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Denying 174 Joint Motion to further amend scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/23/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs) (jcj). (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Ameranth, Inc. Against TicketMob, LLC Defendant Only with Prejudice [FRCP 41(a)(2)] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 5/24/2012 to create motion (ag). (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (knb). (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 172 Joint Motion to (1) Extend Time for Exit 41 to Produce Documents and Source Code and (2) Extend Time for Ameranth to Serve Amended Preliminary Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/2/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (jcj). (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Order Extending Time for Exit 41, LLC to Produce Documents and Source Code and for Ameranth, Inc. to Serve Amended Preliminary Infringement Contentions as to Exit 41 by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: John R. Mitchell appearing for Defendant O-Web Technologies LTD (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record O. Judson Scheaf, III by O-Web Technologies LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of Motion Of Counsel For O-Web Technologies, Ltd. To Withdraw O. Judson Scheaf, III As Counsel Of Record)(Janis, Dean) (lmt). Modified on 4/27/2012 (lmt). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 169 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 138 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Mr. Lawton's motion is DENIED at this time. He may renew the motion after serving a copy of this Order on his client, Defendant Exit41, and filing proof of such service with the Court, along with a declaration explaining what action Defendant Exit41 has taken in securing counsel and proceeding in its defense in this case. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/19/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 166 Motion to Substitute Attorney: J. Christopher Jaczko shall be substituted for Kenneth M. Fitzgerald as attorney of record for Defendant Ticketmob, LLC. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/19/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by O-Web Technologies LTD identifying Corporate Parent LivingSocial Acquisition Corp, Other Affiliate Amazon.com, Inc., Other Affiliate LivingSocial, Inc., Other Affiliate Amazon.com NV Investment Holdings LLC for O-Web Technologies LTD, O-Web Technologies LTD.. (Janis, Dean) (lmt). (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Substitute of Attorney by Ticketmob, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Fitzgerald, Kenneth) Modified to correct event on 4/12/2012 (lmt). (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Simkins Irza on behalf of QuikOrder, Inc. (Irza, Helen) (lmt). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/23/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (jcj). (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 127 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendants Domino's Pizza, LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc. Amended Reply filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 128 MOTION to Dismiss First Counterclaim of Defendant Seamless North America, LLC filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Support re 126 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendant QuikOrder, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 124 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendant OpenTable, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re 125 MOTION to Dismiss First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims of Defendant GrubHub, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re 127 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendants Domino's Pizza, LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: (1) Denying as moot 152 Motion for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motion; granting 153 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; and (3) Issuing First Amended Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings in a Patent Case: The claim construction hearing currently set for 9/20/12 is VACATED and RESET for 10/25/12 at 1:30 PM before Judge Sammartino. All other provisions in the scheduling order of 12/16/11 remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/21/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: David Lesht appearing for Defendant Grubhub, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ldp) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Konrad Sherinian appearing for Defendant Grubhub, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ldp) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Vacating Hearing re 138 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Exit41, Inc., 127 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendants Domino's Pizza, LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc., 128 MOTION to Dismiss First Counterclaim of Defendant Seamless North America, LLC, 126 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendant QuikOrder, Inc., 124 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendant OpenTable, Inc., 125 MOTION to Dismiss First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims of Defendant GrubHub, Inc. : the motion hearing set for 3/26/12 is HEREBY VACATED, and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/16/12.(lmt) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motion Concerning Plaintiff's Original Preliminary Infringement Contentions by Seamless North America, LLC. (Clegg, Richard) (lmt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 124 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendant OpenTable, Inc. filed by Opentable, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Day, James) (lmt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 128 MOTION to Dismiss First Counterclaim of Defendant Seamless North America, LLC filed by Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard A. Clegg in Support of Seamless Opposition)(Clegg, Richard) (lmt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 126 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendant QuikOrder, Inc. filed by QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Yu, George) (lmt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 127 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendants Domino's Pizza, LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc. filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (lmt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 125 MOTION to Dismiss First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims of Defendant GrubHub, Inc. filed by Grubhub, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Les W. Robertson, # 2 Proof of Service)(Robertson, Lesley) (lmt). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 145 Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for Filing a Joint Discovery Motion Regarding Plaintiff's Preliminary Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/9/12. (lmt) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION To Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Discovery Motion by Seamless North America, LLC. (Clegg, Richard) (lmt). (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 140 Counterclaim,, of O-Web Technologies, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Mahoney Watts on behalf of Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Watts, Ethan) (lmt). (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Determining Parties' Joint 134 Motion for Ruling on Discovery Dispute, Adopting Defendants' Proposed Language for Logging Communications with Prosecution Counsel: the Court ADOPTS Defendants' proposed language and ORDERS the parties to incorporate Defendants' proposed language into the protective order. The parties shall lodge that revised protective order with Judge Stormes by 3/2/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/17/12. (lmt) (jrl). (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 141 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part Joint 133 Motion for Protective Order to Determine Parties' Dispute Regarding Patent Prosecution Bar: The parties shall lodge the revised protective order with Judge Stormes by 3/2/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 2/17/12. (lmt) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to 106 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Ameranth, Inc. by O-Web Technologies LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - G to Defendant O-Web Technologies, Ltd.'s Amended Answer And Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement, # 2 Proof of Service)(Janis, Dean)(aef). (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended ANSWER to 106 Amended Complaint, by Ticketmob, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E in Support, # 2 Proof of Service)(Fitzgerald, Kenneth) (lmt). (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Exit41, Inc. by Exit 41, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Dan Lawton)(Lawton, Daniel) (lmt). (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 121 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Grubhub, Inc. Change of Attorney information (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Robertson, Lesley) (atty contacted re event) (lmt). (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John William Osborne on behalf of Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Osborne, John) (lmt). (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Motion Re: Defendants' Request for Prosecution Bar (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Cited Cases, # 2 Exhibit List of Exhibits A-G, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) Modified to correct event on 1/18/2012 (lmt). (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 123 Joint Motion to Allow O-Web Technologies to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims: O-Web has until 2/8/12 to file an Amended Answer and Counterclaims and Ameranth has until 2/28/12 to respond thereto by Motion or otherwise. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/13/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: John William Osborne appearing for Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ldp) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Murphy on behalf of Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC (Murphy, Michael) (lmt). (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ameranth, Inc.'s ANSWER to 117 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Papa John's USA, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss First Counterclaim of Defendant Seamless North America, LLC by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendants Domino's Pizza, LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendant QuikOrder, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss First, Second, Third, Fifth, Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims of Defendant GrubHub, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Counterclaims of Defendant OpenTable, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct O-Web Technologies, Ltd., d/b/a Onosys's Answer and Counterclaim by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (lmt). (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 118 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Pizza Hut of America, Inc. answer due 1/3/2012; Pizza Hut, Inc. answer due 1/3/2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/3/12. (lmt) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 106 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Ameranth, Inc. by Pizza Hut, Inc., Pizza Hut of America, Inc.(Beres, Joel) (ecs). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request