Captain Pamela Barnett, et al v. Barack Hussein Obama, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:09-cv-00082
District Judge David O. Carter, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ambassador Alan Keyes PhD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Captain David Smithey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Captain Harry G Butler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Captain Neil B Turner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Captain Pamela Barnett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Captain Robin D Biron, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Charles Crusemire, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Chief Warrant Office Thomas S Davidson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Colonel Harry Riley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Colonel John D Blair, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Commander David Fullmer LaRoque, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Commander Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo D Andrew Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Gail Lightfoot, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Israel D Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Jennifer Leah Clark, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Julliett Ireland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo LCDR Jeff Graham Winthrope, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Lieutenant Jason Freese, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Lieutenant Colonel Mark Wriggle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Lieutenant Colonel Richard Norton Bauerbach, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Lieutenant Commander John Bruce Steidel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Major David Grant Mosby, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Markham Robinson, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of Gary G Kreep

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Matthew Michael Edwards, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo MIL Officer Lita M Lott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Mr David L Bosley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Mr Kurt C Fuqua, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Ms Loretta G Bosley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo MSGT Jeffrey Schwilk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo MSGT Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Officer Clint Grimes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Representative Cynthia Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Representative Eric Swafford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Representative Glenn Casada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Representative Timothy Comerford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Retired Senator Jerry ONeil, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Richard E Venable, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Sergeant Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo SFC E7 Robert Lee Perry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo State Representative Frank Niceley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo State Representative Timothy Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Thomas J Taylor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
No Logo Wiley S Drake, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of Gary G Kreep

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Orly Taitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orly Taitz +1 949 683 5411 +1 949 766 7603 dr_taitz@yahoo.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Hussein Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleeza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary Rodham Clinton"
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Joseph R Biden"
No Logo Michael W Hager, Defendant
No Logo Michelle LR Obama, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Interested Party
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (135) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 135 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING PLAINTIFFS' RULE 60 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 130 : (See document for details.) (rla) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
    LREF
    Blank 134 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
    REPLY filed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Attachments: # 1 letter from the CA Bar)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
      LREF
      Blank 133 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Taking Matter Under Submission. Accordingly, the hearing set for September 10, 2012, at 8:30 a.m. is removed from the calender. Parties will be served with the Courts ruling. (db) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
        LREF
        Blank 132 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
        OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Order for reconsideration under rule 60 new information MOTION for Leave to file second amended complaint in RICO MOTION for Reconsideration of the order to dismiss 130 filed by Defendants Joseph R Biden, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Barack Hussein Obama, Michelle LR Obama. (DeJute, David) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
          EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. Manual filing of exhibit 19 (DVD), exhibit as to MOTION for Order for reconsideration under rule 60 new information MOTION for Leave to file second amended complaint in RICO MOTION for Reconsideration of the order to dismiss 130 . (Attachments: # 1 Notice of lodging, # 2 Certificate of service, # 3 Exhibit 19 Document Description DVD)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 130 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Motion for OrderCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for reconsideration under rule 60 new information, MOTION for Leave to file second amended complaint in RICO, MOTION for Reconsideration of the order to dismiss filed by plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2012 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits pp 1-30, # 2 Exhibits pp 31-60, # 3 Exhibits pp 61-80)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
              LREF
              Blank 129 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
              MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 109 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 , CCA # 09-56827, 10-55084. The Judgment of the district court is Affirmed. Mandate received in this district on 2/15/12. (car) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                LREF
                Blank 128 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 94 CCA # 09-56827. The decision of the district court is affirmed. Appellants' emergency petition for writ of mandamus, filed November 8, 2011, is denied. Mandate received in this district on 2/10/2012. (dmap); Modified on 2/16/2012 (dmap). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                  LREF
                  Blank 127 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                  ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 filed by Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, CCA # 09-56827. The petition for rehearing en banc filed by Plaintiff's Appellants Alan Keyes et al. (Dkt. No. 61) is DENIED. Order received in this district on 2/2/12. (car) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 USCA Order
                    ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 109 filed by Robert Lee Perry, Robin D Biron, John Bruce Steidel, Alan Keyes PhD, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Julliett Ireland, Charles Crusemire, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, D Andrew Johnson, Pamela Barnett, Loretta G Bosley, David Smithey, Kurt C Fuqua, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Thomas S Davidson, Frank Niceley, Harry Riley, David L Bosley, Timothy Comerford, Clint Grimes, Timothy Jones, Cynthia Davis, Mark Wriggle, Eric Swafford, Jennifer Leah Clark, Jason Freese, Glenn Casada, David Fullmer LaRoque, Richard E Venable, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Israel D Jones, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Gail Lightfoot, Neil B Turner, Harry G Butler, John D Blair, David Grant Mosby, Lita M Lott, Matthew Michael Edwards, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 filed by Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, CCA # 09-56827, 10-. Appellees' motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is due October 13, 2010. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Order received in this district on 9/28/2010. (lr) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 USCA Order
                      ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 109 filed by Robert Lee Perry, Robin D Biron, John Bruce Steidel, Alan Keyes PhD, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Julliett Ireland, Charles Crusemire, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, D Andrew Johnson, Pamela Barnett, Loretta G Bosley, David Smithey, Kurt C Fuqua, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Thomas S Davidson, Frank Niceley, Harry Riley, David L Bosley, Timothy Comerford, Clint Grimes, Timothy Jones, Cynthia Davis, Mark Wriggle, Eric Swafford, Jennifer Leah Clark, Jason Freese, Glenn Casada, David Fullmer LaRoque, Richard E Venable, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Israel D Jones, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Gail Lightfoot, Neil B Turner, Harry G Butler, John D Blair, David Grant Mosby, Lita M Lott, Matthew Michael Edwards, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 filed by Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, CCA # 09-56827, 10-55084. The opening brief submitted on August 11, 2010 is filed. Order received in this district on 9/28/2010. (lr) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 USCA Order
                        ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 109 filed by Robert Lee Perry, Robin D Biron, John Bruce Steidel, Alan Keyes PhD, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Julliett Ireland, Charles Crusemire, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, D Andrew Johnson, Pamela Barnett, Loretta G Bosley, David Smithey, Kurt C Fuqua, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Thomas S Davidson, Frank Niceley, Harry Riley, David L Bosley, Timothy Comerford, Clint Grimes, Timothy Jones, Cynthia Davis, Mark Wriggle, Eric Swafford, Jennifer Leah Clark, Jason Freese, Glenn Casada, David Fullmer LaRoque, Richard E Venable, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Israel D Jones, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Gail Lightfoot, Neil B Turner, Harry G Butler, John D Blair, David Grant Mosby, Lita M Lott, Matthew Michael Edwards, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 filed by Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, CCA # 09-56827, 10-55084. The opening brief submitted on August 12, 2010 is filed. Order received in this district on 9/28/2010. (lr) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 USCA Order
                          ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,, 109 filed by Robert Lee Perry, Robin D Biron, John Bruce Steidel, Alan Keyes PhD, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Julliett Ireland, Charles Crusemire, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, D Andrew Johnson, Pamela Barnett, Loretta G Bosley, David Smithey, Kurt C Fuqua, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Thomas S Davidson, Frank Niceley, Harry Riley, David L Bosley, Timothy Comerford, Clint Grimes, Timothy Jones, Cynthia Davis, Mark Wriggle, Eric Swafford, Jennifer Leah Clark, Jason Freese, Glenn Casada, David Fullmer LaRoque, Richard E Venable, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Israel D Jones, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Gail Lightfoot, Neil B Turner, Harry G Butler, John D Blair, David Grant Mosby, Lita M Lott, Matthew Michael Edwards, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 filed by Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, CCA # 09-56827, 10-55084. In view of the circumstances cite, appellants' motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due August 12, 2010. The answering brief is due September 13, 2010. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Order received in this district on 9/28/2010. (lr) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 USCA Order
                            ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 109 filed by Robert Lee Perry, Robin D Biron, John Bruce Steidel, Alan Keyes PhD, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Julliett Ireland, Charles Crusemire, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, D Andrew Johnson, Pamela Barnett, Loretta G Bosley, David Smithey, Kurt C Fuqua, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Thomas S Davidson, Frank Niceley, Harry Riley, David L Bosley, Timothy Comerford, Clint Grimes, Timothy Jones, Cynthia Davis, Mark Wriggle, Eric Swafford, Jennifer Leah Clark, Jason Freese, Glenn Casada, David Fullmer LaRoque, Richard E Venable, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Israel D Jones, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Gail Lightfoot, Neil B Turner, Harry G Butler, John D Blair, David Grant Mosby, Lita M Lott, Matthew Michael Edwards, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 filed by Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, CCA # 09-56827, 10-55084. The court sua sponte consolidates appeal nos. 09-56827 and 10-55084. Appeal nos. 09-56827 and 10-55084 are consolidated. The briefing schedule for the consolidated appeals is as follows: the opening briefs and excerpts of record are due June 28, 2010; the consolidated answering brief is due July 28, 2010; and the optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. Order received in this district on 9/28/2010. (lr) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Notice of Filing Transcript (G-46)
                              NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/13/2009 & 10/5/2009 (Gale, Debbie) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 120 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Transcript (CV)
                                TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/5/2009. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Debbie Gale, phone number 714-558-8141 / website: debbiegale.com / email: debbiegalecsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (Gale, Debbie) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 119 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Transcript (CV)
                                  TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/13/09. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Debbie Gale, phone number 714-558-8141 / website: debbiegale.com / email: debbiegalecsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2010. (Gale, Debbie) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 118 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 ERRATA
                                    NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Pamela Barnett. correcting Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals,,,, 115 (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 117 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Notice of Clerical Error (G-11)
                                      NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error The appeal filing fee paid was docketed for the wrong notice of appeal 94 . The appeal filing fee paid has been corrected noitce of appeal 109 . Re: Appeal Fees Paid 114 (lr) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Appeal Fees Paid
                                        APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 109 as to Plaintiffs Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua; Receipt Number: 19391, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 115 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals
                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. Appeal of Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 99 , Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) (Interlocutory Appeal),, Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) (Interlocutory Appeal) 23 , Motion Hearing, Link Motions to Minutes,,,, 24 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 , Order on Motion for Reconsideration 101 , Order on Motion for More Definite Statement, 104 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 25 (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 114 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Appeal Fees Paid
                                            APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 as to Plaintiffs Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake; Receipt Number: 19391, Paid in the amount of $455. (lr) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 USCA Order
                                              ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 filed by Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, CCA # 09-56827. The response to this court's order reflect that the district court has denied the post-judgment motion and that no amended notice of appeal will be filed to include the order denying the post-judgment motion. Accordingly, briefing resumes. Within 10 calendar days after entry of the order disposing of the post-judgment motion, appellants shall designate any reporter's transcripts or serve on appellees a statement indicating that appellants do not intend to order any transcripts. See 9th Cir. R. 10-3.1(a). If appellants fail to comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellants designate transcripts will be due March 2, 2010. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due April 12, 2010; the ansering brief is due May 12, 2010; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Order received in this district on 1/15/2010. (lr) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 112 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Transcript Designation and Order Form to the 9th CCA (A-9)
                                                TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 7/13/09, 9/8/09, 10/5/09; Court Reporter: Debbie Gale, Maria Dellaneve; Court of Appeals Case Number: 09-56827; Re: 94 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Notice of Eratta)(Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                  DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiff Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake re 94 (Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice
                                                    NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 10-55084, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 109 (cbr) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 1/17/2010, Entered: 1/17/2010 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Service statement, # 2 Appendix representation statement)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 01/17/2010)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 Order on Motion to Transfer CaseCourt Filing
                                                        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: denying 105 Motion to Transfer Case. Plaintiffs now request that their quo warranto claims be transferred to the District Court of the District of Columbia. As this case has been dismissed as to all claims with prejudice, meaning that there is no longer any action pending before this Court, the Motion to Transfer is DENIED. (ade) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Reply (Motion related)
                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion to transfer filed by Plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                            OPPOSITION Opposition re: First MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Columbia 105 filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama. (DeJute, David) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Motion to Transfer CaseCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Columbia filed by plaintiff Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. Motion set for hearing on 1/25/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 Order on Motion for More Definite StatementCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: CLARIFYING ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS OF OCTOBER 29, 2009: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification 103 regarding whether the October 29, 2009 Order was a dismissal with or without prejudice. The Courts dismissal of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint on October 29, 2009 was a dismissal without leave to amend and with prejudice. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on all parties to the action. (rla) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 12/13/2009, Entered: 12/13/2009 Motion for More Definite StatementCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 12/13/2009)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/8/2009 USCA Order
                                                                    ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 filed by Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, CCA # 09-56827. The court's record reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court shall be held in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of the pending motion. See Leader Nat'l Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F. 3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 5 days after the district court's ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district court's ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of apeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall served this order on the district court. Order received in this district on 12/07/09. (lr) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Reconsideration by Judge David O. Carter 90 . (See Order for details) (db) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                        letter to judge Carter filed by Plaintiff Pamela Barnett (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Barack Obama background report)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: taking under advisement 90 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court finds matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set December 7, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. is removed from the calendar. Parties will be served with the Courts ruling. (ade) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                            OPPOSITION TO AMENDED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 93 filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, Interested Party United States of America. (West, Roger) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Amendment (Motion related)
                                                                              Amendment to MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 93 filed by Plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Orly Taitz re basis for reconsideration, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Orly Taitz re meet and confer, # 3 Declaration Declaration re Larry Sinclair, his affidavit and book, # 4 Affidavit Coroners death cert. Donald Young; Affidavit of Larry Sinclair)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected RE: MOTION for Reconsideration 89 93 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (twdb) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice
                                                                                  NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-56827, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 94 as to Plaintiff Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. (dmap) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 . (Filing fee $455, receipt number 09730000000006158038.) (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Representation Statement and Service List, # 2 Supplement 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Docking Statement, # 3 Exhibit District Court Order Being Appealed)(Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 filed by plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Orly Taitz re basis for the motion for reconsideration, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Orly Taitz, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Orly Taitz re attempt for meet and confer, # 4 Declaration Coroners report and declaration of Donald Young)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                        OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 90 filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, Interested Party United States of America. (West, Roger) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                          REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 90 filed by plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Third circuit court of appeals decision)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case 89 filed by plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2009 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Orly Taitz, # 2 Exhibit Coroners report of Donald Young, Affidavit of Larry Sinclair)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Order on Motion to Dismiss CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 56 : (See document for details.) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (rla) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 10/25/2009, Entered: 10/25/2009 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2004 AP article "Kenyan born Obama...")(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/25/2009)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(West, Roger) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Expanded affidavit by Susan Daniels- use of ss number of the deceased by Barack Obama)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected RE: Miscellaneous Document 84 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (twdb) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 10/11/2009, Entered: 10/11/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                        Request for judicial notice filed by Plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Expanded affidavit by Susan Daniels)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/11/2009)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Order on Ex Parte Application to AccelerateCourt Filing
                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING EX PARTE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY OF DISCOVERY 82 : The Ex Parte Motion is hereby DENIED. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on all parties to the action. (rla) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Ex Parte Application to Accelerate
                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION to Accelerate motion for relief from stay of discovery Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Motion Hearing, Scheduling Conference,,,,,, 81 filed by plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1st response from US attorney Roger West, # 2 Exhibit 2nd response from the US attorney Roger West)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Order on Motion to Dismiss CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTES OF taking under advisement 56 Motion to Dismiss Case ; Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter:; Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. Case Management dates are as follows: Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing December 7, 2009, at 8:30 a.m. File Motion for Summary Judgment November 16, 2009 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment November 26, 2009 Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment November 30, 2009 Final Pretrial Conference January 11, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. Jury Trial January 26, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (ade) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua, Defendant Michael W Hager. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dossier # 3, # 2 Exhibit Dossier #4, # 3 Exhibit Dossier #5, # 4 Exhibit FOIA from Pamela Barnett, # 5 Exhibit Letter from legal counsel to Chairman of Joint Ch. of Staff, # 6 Exhibit Quo Warranto, # 7 Exhibit Easterling et al motion to file under original jurisdiction, # 8 Exhibit Certified mail receipt US Atty District of Columbia Jeffrey Taylor, # 9 Exhibit Dossier #1 no Social Security Numbers)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 ~Motion to Sever
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever PLAINTIFFS filed by PLAINTIFFS Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Wiley Drake in Support of Motion for Severance, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 10 in Support of Motion for Severance, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9 in Support of Motion for Severance, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Gary Kreep in Support of Motion for Severance, # 5 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                    opposition surreply opposition to motion to dismiss re: MOTION to Dismiss Case ; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION 56 filed by Plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua, Defendant Robert Mueller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from snator Sessions, # 2 Exhibit Quo Warranto request submitted to Atty Gen Eric Holder, # 3 Exhibit Request for investigations of Obama's background from the office of the Sec of State of KY, # 4 Exhibit Affidavit PI Susan Daniels-Obama's use of SS number of the deceased)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge David O. Carter: On 09/28/09, Court received letter from attorney Philip J Berg requesting Exhibit 7 to Response in Opposition to Motion 69 be sealed as it contains personal identifying information(see Order for specifics). Court orders Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Case (Doc 69) sealed. Plaintiffs shall refile redacted copy of entire Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, including all exhibits by Friday, October 2, 5 p.m. (ln) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE SUR-REPLY 75 : The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion and will give Plaintiffs leave of court to file a surreply not to exceed ten (10) pages to be filed by 5 p.m. on October 1, 2009. Plaintiffs' courtesy copy of the sur-reply shall be delivered to the Court's dropbox on the ninth floor of the Santa Ana courthouse by no later than noon on October 2, 2009. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on all parties to the action. (rla) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 9/26/2009, Entered: 9/26/2009 Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Surreply filed by plaintiff Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/26/2009)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Hearing re: Discovery; Service Notice and ex Parte Application held before Judge David O. Carter: Court and counsel confer re service of Defendants. Defense counsel states that service has been effectuated. Court and counsel confer regarding Ex Parte Application to Vacate Dismissal filed by Markham Robinson and Wiley S. Drake. Court grants Ex Parte Application. Attorney Gary Kreep added to the case. Court sets Scheduling Conference for October 5, 2009, at 8:30 a.m. Court and counsel confer and set tentative case management dates. Court and counsel confer regarding recusal of Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. Court denies, without prejudice, Plaintiffs Motion to Recuse the Magistrate Judge. The Court also denies Plaintiffs Motion for Modification of Magistrate Judge Nakazatos August 6, 2009 Order. Court Reporter: Maria Dellaneve. (kh) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM TO OPPOSITION FILED BY PLAINTIFFS DRAKE AND ROBINSON filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, Interested Party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (West, Roger) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY ALL PALINTIFFS EXCEPT DRAKE AND ROBINSON filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, Interested Party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(West, Roger) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                  OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Pamela Barnett, served on 09,23.09.. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING REQUEST TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE OF COURT 69 : The Clerk shall serve this minute order on all parties to the action. (rla) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case ; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION 56 filed by Plaintiff Pamela Barnett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from legal counsel of admiral Mulin, chairman of joint chief of staff, # 2 Exhibit Statement by Connie Rhodes, MD, # 3 Exhibit Dossier 1, # 4 Exhibit Dossier 3, # 5 Exhibit Dossier 4, # 6 Exhibit Dossier 5, # 7 Exhibit Dossier 6 redacted SS, # 8 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipts from US Atty Taylor, # 9 Exhibit Quo Warranto, # 10 Exhibit Easterling et al rule 17, # 11 Exhibit Barnett FOIA response)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                        JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, Interested Party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.. (West, Roger) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case ; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION 56 filed by Plaintiffs Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Plaintiffs' Compendium of Authorities in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Compendium of Authorities in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 Order on Ex Parte Application for Order re Discovery MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting 60 Ex Parte Application for Order for Limited Stay of Discovery. All discovery herein shall be stayed pending resolution of Defendants Motion to Dismiss, except for any discovery as to which Plaintiffs can demonstrate, to the satisfaction of Magistrate Judge Nakazato, is necessary for the purpose of opposing the Motion to Dismiss. (ade) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                              REVISED OPPOSITION to Ex Parte Application for Limited Stay of Discovery re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for LIMITED STAY OF DISCOVERY ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 60 filed by Plaintiffs Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Gary G. Kreep in Support of Filing Plaintiffs' Revised Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application For Limited Stay of Discovery, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Gary G. Kreep in Support of Filing Plaintiffs' Revised Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application For Limited Stay of Discovery, # 3 Appendix Plaintiffs' Compendium of Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application For Limited Stay of Discovery, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Compendium of Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Revised Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application For Limited Stay of Discovery)(Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR LIMITED STAY OF DISCOVERY re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for LIMITED STAY OF DISCOVERY ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 60 filed by Plaintiffs Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application For Limited Stay of Discovery, # 2 Appendix Plaintiffs' Compendium of Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application For Limited Stay of Discovery, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Compendium of Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application For Limited Stay of Discovery)(Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 9/13/2009, Entered: 9/13/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE filed by plaintiff Pamela Barnett. (Attachments: # 1 Letter proposed schedule of depositions, notice of motion to disqualify Gary Kreep as a co-counsel due to conflict of interest)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gary G Kreep on behalf of Plaintiffs Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake (Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY AND INITIATION OF DISCOVERY filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, Interested Party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (West, Roger) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 Ex Parte Application for Order re Discovery Matter
                                                                                                                                                        EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for LIMITED STAY OF DISCOVERY ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(West, Roger) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge held before Judge David O. Carter. Court orders First Amended Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory and Initiation of Discovery,filed by plaintiffs on August 20, 2009 referred to assigned Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. Accordingly, the noticed hearing date of September 14, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. before this Court is vacated. (db) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Order on Motion for ReviewCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge David O. Carter DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE NAKAZATOS AUGUST 6, 2009 ORDER AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECUSE MAGISTRATE JUDGE NAKAZATO; GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs Motion to Modify the Magistrate Judges August 6, 2009 Order and Motion to Recuse the Magistrate Judge 37 is DENIED. Plaintiffs Robinson and Drakes Ex Parte Application for Order Vacating Voluntary Dismissal 45 is hereby GRANTED. (kh) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR 10/5/2009 at 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (rrp) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2009 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(West, Roger) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Declaration regarding Kenian Hospital Birth Certificate of Barack Obama filed by plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration regarding Kenian Hospital Birth Certificate, # 2 Appendix Kenian Hospital Birth Certificate for Barack Obama)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismsisal 45 served on September 2, 2009. (Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                      OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismsisal 45 served on 8/27/2009. (Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 49 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (twdb) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Gary G. Kreep in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismsisal 45 filed by Plaintiffs Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. (Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing RE: Declaration (Motion related) 47 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rrp) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismsisal 45 served on August 27, 2009. (Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7-19.1 Notice to other parties of ex parte application lacking RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate 45 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (twdb) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Gary G. Kreep in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismsisal 45 filed by Plaintiffs Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. (Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed 08.25.09. The Summons and Complaint were served by process server, by Federal statute. Service accepted by Patricia Myles, civil process clerk for US attorneys on behalf of all defendants. Original Summons was returned. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Ex Parte Application to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismsisal filed by plaintiff Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Markham Robinson, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Wiley S. Drake, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Elliot Wilson, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Wiley Substitution, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Markham Substitution, # 7 Exhibit Letter from Dr. Taitz, # 8 Exhibit Notice of Dismissal, # 9 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application)(Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER SETTING SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 HEARING ONMOTIONS: (See document for details.) In summary, the Court sets for hearing at 8:00 a.m. on September 8, 2009, (1) the Discovery Motion, (2) the Service Notice, and (3) the Ex Parte Application. All parties are ordered to be present. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on all parties to the action. (rla) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Amendment (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment to MOTION to Expedite authentication MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for authenticity of Kenyan birth certificate 34 filed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Referral of Motion to Disqualify (CV 54)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            REFERRAL OF MOTION to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazatohas been filed. Pursuant to GO 08.05 and Local Rule 72-5 MOTION for Review 37 is referred to Judge David O. Carter for determination. (jal) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                              opposition to magistrate filed by Plaintiffs Clint Grimes, Julliett Ireland, D Andrew Johnson, Israel D Jones, Timothy Jones, David Fullmer LaRoque, Gail Lightfoot, Lita M Lott, David Grant Mosby, Steven Kay Neuenschwander, Frank Niceley, Jerry ONeil, Robert Lee Perry, Harry Riley, Markham Robinson, Jeffrey Wayne Rosner, Jeffrey Schwilk, David Smithey, John Bruce Steidel, Douglas Earl Stoeppelwerth, Thomas J Taylor, Eric Swafford, Neil B Turner, Richard E Venable, Jeff Graham Winthrope, Mark Wriggle, Alan Keyes PhD, Wiley S Drake, Pamela Barnett, Richard Norton Bauerbach, Robin D Biron, John D Blair, David L Bosley, Loretta G Bosley, Harry G Butler, Glenn Casada, Jennifer Leah Clark, Timothy Comerford, Charles Crusemire, Cynthia Davis, Thomas S Davidson, Matthew Michael Edwards, Jason Freese, Kurt C Fuqua (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FAILURE BY PLAINTIFFS TO PROPERLY EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS; DECLARATIONS OF DAVID A. DeJUTE AND FLABIA DE LA ROSA filed by Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5)(West, Roger) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected, correct event is Review and Incorrect category selected, correct category is Motion RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge MJ Pilot 37 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rrp) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING filed by plaintiff Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake. (Kreep, Gary) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Motion for ReviewCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Roger E West counsel for Defendants Michelle LR Obama, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Robert M Gates, Joseph R Biden, Barack Hussein Obama, Interested Party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Changing e-mail to roger.west4@usdoj.gov. Adding Roger E. West as attorney as counsel of record for Defendants for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Barack H. Obama, et al. (West, Roger) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/6/2009 Striking filed Documents (CV-80)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato: the documents listed below were improperly filed for the following reasons: Lacks proper notice; improper form and format; counsel failed to identify her Cal. State Bar No.; description of motion conflicts or differs from that which counsel entered on Court's e-docket; therefore, the following document(s) shall be stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court: MOTION to Expedite authentication MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for authenticity of Kenyan birth certificate 34 . (rla) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 8/1/2009, Entered: 8/1/2009 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Expedite authentication, MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for authenticity of Kenyan birth certificate filed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Photocopy of Obama's birth certificate from Kenya)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 08/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 8/1/2009, Entered: 8/1/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Markham Robinson, Wiley S Drake pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to all defendants. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 08/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD, uponRobert M Gates served on 7/15/2009, answer due 9/13/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by registered California process server, by Federal statute. Service accepted by Flabia De La Rosa on behalf of Thomas O'Brien US atty. Original Summons not returned. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD, uponHillary Rodham Clinton served on 7/15/2009, answer due 9/13/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by registered California process server, by Federal statute. Service accepted by Flabia De La Rosa on behalf of Thomas O'Brien, US atty. Original Summons not returned. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD, uponMichelle LR Obama served on 7/15/2009, answer due 9/13/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by registered California Process server, by Federal statute. Service accepted by Flabia de la Rosa on behalf of Thomas O'Brien, US atty. Original Summons not returned. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed The Summons and Complaint were served by registered California process server, by Federal statute. Service accepted by Flabia De La Rosa on behalf of Thomas O'Brien US attorney. Original Summons not returned. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD, uponUNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 7/15/2009, answer due 9/13/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by registered California process server, by Federal statute. Service accepted by Flabia De La Rosa on behalf of Thomas O'Brien, US atty. Original Summons not returned. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD, uponJoseph R Biden served on 7/15/2009, answer due 9/13/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by registered California Process server, by Federal statute. Service accepted by Flabia De La Rosa on behalf of Thomas O'Brien, US Atty. Original Summons not returned. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely RE: MOTION for Default Judgment 21 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (twdb) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES ( IN CHAMBERS) : ORDER held before Judge David O. Carter re: First Amended Complaint 22 . Plaintiffs are ORDERED to properly serve the First Amended Complaint on or before August 16, 2009 and file Proof of Service of such on or before August 23, 2009. (dg) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: RE: MOTION for Reconsideration of Order to Show Cause or in the Alternative to Certify Question for Appeal 15 : Counsel are excused to meet and confer regarding service of Complaint. Counsel return and advised the Court of their agreement to a means of proper service upon President Barack Obama. Court directs plaintiffs to immediately effect service of the Complaint upon a person authorized to accept service at the United States Attorneys Office as to the remaining defendant. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (rla) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: FINDING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AS MOOT 15 : Counts Two and Three of the Original Complaint, as well as all Defendants besides President Obama, are HEREBY VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on all parties to the action. (rla) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Amended Document (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Taitz, Orly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2009: # 1 Summons Issued) (lwag). (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Barack H. Obama, aka Barack Hussein Obama,II, a/k/a Barack H. Obama,II, a/k/a Barry Obama, a/k/a Barry Soetoro filed by plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix Appendix to Exhibit B)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/11/2009, Entered: 7/11/2009 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD, Barack H. Obama, aka Barack Hussein Obama, aka Barry Soetoro served on 06.29.09.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 07/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 17 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (rrp) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF INTEREST (DeJute, David) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/5/2009, Entered: 7/5/2009 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD, served on 06.28.09.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 07/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: SETTING HEARING ON MOTION: Before the Court is a Motion by Plaintiffs for Reconsideration of Order to Show Cause or in the Alternative to Certify Question for Appeal. Court sets this matter for hearing on July 13, 2009 at 8:30a.m. in Courtroom 9D. Plaintiffs are directed to make every effort possible to ensure that all remaining defendants are aware of the hearing and provide documentation that the individual receiving service is authorized to accept on defendants' behalf. (rla) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 6/14/2009, Entered: 6/14/2009 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 06/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Extending Order to Show Cause, and Finding as Moot Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification 13 by Judge David O. Carter. In light of plaintiffs' efforts, the Order to Show Cause is extended until 07/13/2009 to permit plaintiffs addirtional time to properly effect service pursuant to FRCivP4(i) as to all defendants. In addition, Plaintiffs' motion is rendered MOOT due to the Court's extension of the Order to Show Cause. (See order for further details) (db) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION for Reconsideration of Entry of Default, Renewed MOTION to Correct Notice of Deficiency of Proof of Service, Final Motion for Entry of Default against DefendantBarack H Obama filed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Notice of Deficiency - Default/Default Judgment (CV-52b)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as Proof of Service is lacking required information. Please reivew Federal Rules regarding service. (ade) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Notice of Clerical Error (G-11)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the following docket entry has been corrected as indicated below: The proof of service filed 5/18/09 answer due deadline should be 4/11/09. Re: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (60 days) 5 (twdb) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Amendment (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment to First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Barack H Obama 7 filed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Amended affidavit of the process server)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Amendment (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment to First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Barack H Obama 7 filed by Plaintiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Notice of Deficiency - Default/Default Judgment (CV-52b)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Barack H Obama 7 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as statute in which process was served not cited; name of deft does not exactly match name on complaint. (rla) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Request for Clerk to Enter Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Barack H Obama filed by filer-plaitiff Alan Keyes PhD. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of process server)(Taitz, Orly) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION held before Judge David O. Carter. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS Plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than June 12, 2009 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See order for details. (smi) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by plaintiffs upon Barack H Obama served on 2/10/2009, answer due 3/2/2009. The Summons and Complaint were served by substituted service, by not indicated statute, upon mail clerk at Department of Justice. Due Dilligence declaration none. Original Summons not returned. (twdb) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/29/2009. (smi) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Notice to Parties of ADR Program (ADR-8)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PILOT PROGRAM filed.(lwag) (lwag). (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Alan Keyes PhD, Wiley S Drake and Markham Robinson. (lwag) (lwag). (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Complaint - (Discovery)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Defendants Robert Mueller, Michael W Hager, Barack H Obama and Condoleeza Rice.(Filing fee $ 350). Filed by Plaintiffs Alan Keyes PhD, Wiley S Drake and Markham Robinson.(lwag) (lwag). (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 221 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?