Cascades Computer Innovation LLC v. RPX Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-01143
District Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 4, 2018 at 6:25 PM ST (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cascades Computer Innovation LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Early, Sr. +1 504 451 3313 REARLY4@COX.NET

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin L. Fineman +1 415 276 6500 +1 415 276 6599 martinfineman@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley La Valley +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 3137 alavalley@nshn.com
v.
Dell, Inc. Dell, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Perot Systems Corp
Unknown Role, Quest Software, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Griffin +1 415 983 1000 +9831 983 983 1200

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimball Richard Anderson +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 kanderson@winston.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Mendenhall , +1 312 558 5755 +1 312 558 5700 smendenhall@winston.com
No Logo HTC Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Jacobson +1 212 872 1000

Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

No Logo RPX Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael W. Scarborough +1 415 434 9100 +1 415 434 3947 mscarborough@smrh.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 25
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (225) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Amended Transcript of Proceedings (to replace docket entry 92), held on July 10, 2012, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie L. Ralston, Telephone number 510-755-2680. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2013. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2012: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations)) (oh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/26/2012) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***Transcript of Proceedings held on July 12, 2012, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Julie Bozaich, CSR, Telephone number 510-755-2680, juliebozaich@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 10/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 01/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 01/28/2012. Modified on 6/30/2016 (oh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/29/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 07/10/2012, 08/21/2012, 05/28/2013, 10/19/2015, 12/15/2015 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, AMENDED Designation Form to Correct docket #s on Dkt 212 (Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 6/28/2016) Modified on 6/28/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/21/2012 before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 5/18/2016) Modified on 5/19/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/10/12 before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC, for Court Reporter Julie Ralston. (Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 5/18/2016) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 07/10/12; 08/21/12; 05/28/13; 10/19/15; 12/15/15 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, re 210 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 5/26/2016. (Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 5/18/2016) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
                  USCA Case Number 16-15782 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 210 Notice of Appeal, filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. Appeals of 209 Judgment, 207 Order, 201 Order filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10400253 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Niro, Raymond) (Filed on 4/26/2016) Modified on 4/27/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Response
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                            Summons Issued as to Dell Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc, Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., RPX Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012) (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 12/15/2015 re 186 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. and RPX Corporation. Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Ferri. Defendant Attorney Michael Scarborough, Dylan Ballard and Aaron Chiu. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2015) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 6, 2015 AT 9:01AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. In light of the parties filing at Dkt. No. 182 the Friday 11/6/2015 at 9:01am Compliance hearing is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/19/2015., Case referred to Private ADR for Private Mediation to be completed by 1/17/16. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2016. Non-Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/30/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 1/9/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 day Jury Trial set for 1/9/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Defense to file Motion for Judgment on Pleadings by 11/3/15.Responses due by 11/17/2015. Replies due by 12/1/2015. Defendant's Motion for Judgment on Pleadings Hearing set for 12/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for WEDNESDAY, 12/14/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing re name of private mediator is set for 11/6/2015 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Statement filed by 10/30/15. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing set for Monday, 11/28/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Name Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Martin Fineman. Defendant Attorney Michael Scarborough and Aaron Chiu. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/19/2015) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the parties' joint case management statement (Dkt. No. 169), the Case Management Conference currently set for 8/31/2015 is CONTINUED to 10/19/2015 at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE: In light of the parties Joint Status Statement (Dkt. No. 165), the Status Conference set for June 12, 2015 is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Lift Stay
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Lift Stay
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE. In light of the Court's trial calendar, the hearing for December 5, 2014 at 9:01 AM is VACATED. The parties will receive notice of a future hearing date. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 AT 9:00AM STATUS CONFERENCE. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 145 Plaintiff's Attorneys' Motion to Appear by Telephone on 10/9/2014 at 11:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Notice re Telephonic Appearance Procedures) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 137 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RENEWING STAY, DENYING DISCOVERY REQUEST, AND SETTING STATUS HEARING. Status Conference set for 9/26/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 136 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER VACATING STATUS HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/18/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Tuen Fai Chiu for Defendant RPX Corporation (Chiu, Aaron) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Status Statement by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Cascades Computer Innovation LLC, HTC Corporation, RPX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER STAYING CASE for 120 days from date of this Order. Status Conference set for Friday, 6/20/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/4/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 14, 2014 AT 9:01AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT/STATEMENT, filed by HTC Corporation, RPX Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dylan I. Ballard, # 2 Exhibit A-C)(Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT/STATEMENT, filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaValley, Ashley) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION AS ORDER re 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC, Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc.; Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. terminated; and SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance set for Friday, 2/14/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Separate Statements filed by 2/7/2014. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/5/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL, filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC, Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc.. (LaValley, Ashley) (Filed on 1/31/2014) Modified on 2/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMotorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, filed by HTC Corporation. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/14/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, filed by RPX Corporation. (Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 1/14/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT REPLY to Response to Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Stayed, filed by HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, RPX Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dylan I. Ballard, # 2 Exhibit A-D)(Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2013) Modified on 12/13/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC . (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 12/9/2013) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 120 Joint Motion to Continue Filing Date for Answering Amended Complaint AS MODIFIED. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue Filing Date for Answering Amended Complaint, filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, RPX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Daniel P. Weick)(Ballard, Dylan) (Filed on 12/6/2013) Modified on 12/9/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 98 Motion to Dismiss; denying 99 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 118 Motion for Leave to File Notice; Order to Show Cause why this action should not be stayed. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recent Decision, filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Notice of Recent Decision, # 2 Exhibit: Attachment to Exhibit 1 Decision, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/9/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 118
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 116 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recent Decision by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 7/8/2013) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recent Decision filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Ntc of Recent Decision)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 7/8/2013) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 6/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 114 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Recent Decision (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 114 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Recent Decision (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recent Decision in Support of 98 , 99 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, HTC Corporation, RPX Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Notice of Recent Decision, # 3 Recent Decision)(Crew, Eugene) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/27/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on May 28, 2013, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-451-7530, rayneeh@hotmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2013. (Related documents(s) 110 , 111 , 112 , 109 ) (rhm) (Filed on 6/3/2013) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Motorola Mobility LLC for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Hannah, Jessica) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by RPX Corporation for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 5/29/2013) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 5/28/2013 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 5/28/2013) re 98 Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., HTC Corporation, 99 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by RPX Corporation. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/30/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 106 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter M. Boyle representing Defendant Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2013) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Peter Michael Boyle ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7712923.) filed by Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 5/20/2013) Modified on 5/21/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Memorandum re 99 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by RPX Corporation. (Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 5/6/2013) Modified on 5/7/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memorandum re 98 Joint Motion to Dismiss, filed by HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2013) Modified on 5/7/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to re 98 Joint Motion to Dismiss, 99 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 4/17/2013) Modified on 4/18/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 101 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 98 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, 99 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Responses due by 4/17/2013. Replies due by 5/6/2013. Hearing date continued to 5/28/13 at 2:00pm. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Briefing Deadlines and Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Continuance of Hearing Date, filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC, HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, RPX Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(LaValley, Ashley) (Filed on 3/28/2013) Modified on 3/29/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Judicial Notice re 99 Motion to Dismiss, filed by RPX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Related document(s) 99 ) (Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 3/20/2013) Modified on 3/21/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by RPX Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 4/3/2013. Replies due by 4/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 3/20/2013) Modified on 3/21/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/29/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss, filed by HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 4/3/2013. Replies due by 4/10/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/20/2013) Modified on 3/21/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of Alan J. Devlin as Counsel, filed by RPX Corporation (Devlin, Alan) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 95 Stipulation to Extend time to Respond to Amended Complaint (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint, filed by RPX Corporation, Cascades Computer Innovations LLC, HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Crompton, Charles) (Filed on 3/5/2013) Modified on 3/6/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., RPX Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. Filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 2/20/2013) Modified on 2/21/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 54 Motion to Dismiss; granting 55 Motion to Dismiss; granting 76 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on July 12, 2012, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie L. Ralston, Telephone number 510-755-2680. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2013. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2012: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations)) (oh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 90 Motion to Substitute Party. Motorola Mobility LLC is substituted in place of Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, on 10/22/12 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012) Modified on 10/24/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Parties, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Responses due by 10/25/2012. Replies due by 11/1/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Grossman, Richard) (Filed on 10/11/2012) Modified on 10/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on August 21, 2012, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-451-7530, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 10/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2012. (rhm) (Filed on 9/29/2012) (Entered: 09/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY Dismissal of Defendant LG Electronics, Inc., filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC.. (Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2012) Modified on 9/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 88 . *** NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Of Defendant LG Electronics, Inc. by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC (Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 9/11/2012) Modified on 9/12/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 8/21/2012 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 8/21/2012) re 76 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., LG Electronics, Inc, HTC Corporation. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Settlement, filed by LG Electronics, Inc., Cascades Computer Innovation LLC.. (Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by HTC Corporation (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/8/2012) Modified on 8/9/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum re 76 Joint Motion to Dismiss, filed by HTC Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc, Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/6/2012) Modified on 8/7/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 76 Joint MOTION to Dismiss ) OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF HTC, LGE, SAMSUNG AND MOTOROLA filed byCascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/20/2012) Modified on 7/23/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/18/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Motions Hearing held and submitted on 7/10/2012 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 7/10/2012) re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by RPX Corporation, 55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dell Inc. (Court Reporter Julie Ralston.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2012) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hannah, Jessica) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified on 7/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Crew, Eugene) (Filed on 7/16/2012) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss, filed by HTC Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/30/2012. Replies due by 8/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support Thereof, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified on 7/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/18/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Dell Inc. (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Cascades Computer Innovation LLC, Dell Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., RPX Corporation (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2012) Modified on 7/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC (Opatken, Gabriel) (Filed on 7/6/2012) Modified on 7/9/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear for Oral Argument at Hearing on Motions to Dismiss July 10, 2012 [at Docket Nos. 54 and 55] filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 7/6/2012) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Jessica Lea Hannah, Richard L. Grossman and Gene Crew as Counsel, filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hannah, Jessica) (Filed on 7/6/2012) Modified on 7/9/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE 69 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), 55 MOTION to Dismiss REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND NOTICE PER STANDING ORDER RE 7/10/12 HEARING (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 66 Statement re Motions to Dismiss and 7/10 hrg., filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 7/3/2012) Modified on 7/5/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement re Motion to Dismiss and the July 10 Hearing, filed by Dell Inc.. (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 7/3/2012) Modified on 7/5/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement re Motions to Dismiss and The July 10 Hearings, filed by HTC Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/3/2012) Modified on 7/5/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by RPX Corporation (Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 7/2/2012) Modified on 7/3/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum re 54 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) ), filed by RPX Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Second Request for Judicial Notice in Support Thereof, # 2 Exhibit D (Pt. 1 of 3) to Second RJN, # 3 Exhibit D (Pt. 2 of 3) to Second RJN, # 4 Exhibit D (Pt. 3 of 3) to Second RJN)(Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 6/19/2012) Modified on 6/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Memorandum re 55 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Dell Inc.. (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 6/19/2012) Modified on 6/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement re Upcoming Responses to Complaint, filed by HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/7/2012) Modified on 6/8/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 54 & 55 Motions to Dismiss by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 6/5/2012) Modified on 6/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 54 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), 55 MOtion to Dismiss, filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 6/5/2012) Modified on 6/6/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 58 Stipulation Continuing Hearings on Motions to Dismiss of Defendants' Dell Inc. and RPX Corporation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearings On Motions To Dismiss Of Defendants Dell Inc. and RPX Corporation, filed by Dell Inc., Cascades Computer Innovations LLC., RPX Corporation. (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 5/25/2012) Modified on 5/29/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 48 Stipulation Concerning Service of Process on Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. Response to Complaint shall be filed by 07/16/12. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, on 05/16/12 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012) Modified on 5/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 44 Stipulation Concerning Service of Process on Motorola Mobility, Inc.. Response to Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 07/16/12. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, on 05/16/12 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012) Modified on 5/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dell Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, # 5 Exhibit D to Request for Judicial Notice, # 6 Exhibit E to Request for Judicial Notice, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Dell Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 5/14/2012) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), filed by RPX Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support Thereof, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 5/14/2012) Modified on 5/15/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 50 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Chul Pak, 51 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel P. Weick (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 5/11/2012) Modified on 5/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Weick representing Defendant HTC Corporation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Chul Pak representing Defendant HTC Corporation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 42 Stipulation and Order of Substitution; Substituing Motorola Mobility Inc. in place of Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. Party Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Service Of Process On Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 5/10/2012) Modified on 5/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Davis on behalf of HTC Corporation (Davis, Lisa) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice application of Daniel Weick ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6804739.) filed by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Lisa) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice application of Chul Pak ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6804692.) filed by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Lisa) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by HTC Corporation (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Defendant HTC Corporation (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities and Disclosure Statement, filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Peters, Elliot) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of Thomas Edward Gorman as Counsel, filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Gorman, Thomas) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of Paula Lenore Blizzard as Counsel, filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Blizzard, Paula) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Elliot Remsen Peters as Counsel, filed by LG Electronics, Inc. (Peters, Elliot) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 33 Stipulation Concerning Service of Process on LG Electronics, Inc.. LGE's time to Repond to Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 07/16/12. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, on 04/24/12 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012) Modified on 4/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 32 Stipulation Concerning Service of Process on HTC Corporation. HTC Response to Complaint due by 07/16/12. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, on 04/24/12 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012) Modified on 4/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2012 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in the Oakland Courthouse. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Service of Process on LG Electronics, Inc., filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 4/18/2012) Modified on 4/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Servcie of Process of HTC Corporation, filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC., HTC Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferri, Daniel) (Filed on 4/18/2012) Modified on 4/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by RPX Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Charles River Partnership XIII, L.P., Other Affiliate Index Ventures Growth I (Jersey) L.P., Other Affiliate Kleiner Perkins Caufield & Byers XIII, LLC for RPX Corporation. (Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 4/17/2012) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 31 *** Certificate of Interested Entities by RPX Corporation (Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 4/13/2012) Modified on 4/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 28 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, 27 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Samuel Mendenhall representing Defendant Dell, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, on 04/12/12 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012) Modified on 4/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kimball R. Anderson representing Defendant Dell, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, on 04/12/12 (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012) Modified on 4/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension Of Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant To Civil Local Rule 6-1, filed by Dell Inc., Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 4/11/2012) Modified on 4/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Samuel Mendenhall) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6736501.) filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Kimball R. Anderson) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6736474.) filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of Sean D. Meenan as Counsel, filed by Dell Inc. (Meenan, Sean) (Filed on 4/11/2012) Modified on 4/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Dell Inc. (Dell Inc.'s Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities Or Persons) (Griffin, Paul) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Paul R. Griffin as Counsel, filed by Dell Inc. (Griffin, Paul) (Filed on 4/11/2012) Modified on 4/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT NO. 15 *** CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012) Modified on 4/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. served on 3/29/2012, answer due 4/19/2012. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 4/3/2012) Modified on 4/4/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. served on 3/29/2012, answer due 4/19/2012. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 4/3/2012) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. LG Electronics, Inc served on 3/30/2012, answer due 4/20/2012. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 4/3/2012) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/3/12. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by RPX Corporation. (Pfeiffer, Alfred) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service FOR RPX)(Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. Dell Inc. served on 3/23/2012, answer due 4/13/2012. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. RPX Corporation served on 3/23/2012, answer due 4/13/2012. (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for attorney Ashleu LaValley leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611071710.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/13/12 filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for attorney Daniel R. Ferri leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611071709.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/13/12 filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for attorney Gabriel I. Opatken leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611071711.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/13/12 filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC re 3 Certificate of Interested Entities SUPPLEMENT TO CERTIFICATE (Fineman, Martin) (Filed on 3/8/2012) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order re Discovery & Dispute Procedures, # 3 Standing Order for All Judges)(rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Dell Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc, Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., RPX Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611071462; Summons Issued). Filed by Cascades Computer Innovation LLC. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012) (ga, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 864 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?