Zhong et al v. United States Department of State et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-02871-WHA
District Judge William H Alsup, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chen, Zhong, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clemons, Holley et al.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Tzu Ken Huang +1 626 289 0006 +1 626 289 0005 lawyer99@pacbell.net
No Logo Jian Ming Zhong, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clemons, Holley et al.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Tzu Ken Huang +1 626 289 0006 +1 626 289 0005 lawyer99@pacbell.net
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Emilio T. Gonzalez, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Maura Harty, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael Jacobsen, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Robert Goldberg, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office San Francisco
Filed 6/9/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 9/16/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER re [13] Joint MOTION to Be Excused From the Formal ADR Process filed by Robert Goldberg, Michael Jacobsen, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Maura Harty, United States Department of State, Condoleezza Rice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/14/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO OCTOBER 16, 2008, AT 11:00 A.M. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/14/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Joint MOTION to Be Excused From the Formal ADR Process filed by Emilio T. Gonzalez, United States Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Robert Goldberg, Michael Jacobsen. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008, Terminated: 8/14/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Joint MOTION to Vacate or Continue CMC filed by Emilio T. Gonzalez, United States Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Robert Goldberg, Michael Jacobsen. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE by Emilio T. Gonzalez, United States Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Robert Goldberg, Michael Jacobsen of Unavailability (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or For Summary Judgment filed by Emilio T. Gonzalez, United States Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Robert Goldberg, Michael Jacobsen. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # (2) Walker Declaration, # (3) Dybdahl Declaration, # (4) Proctor Decl, # (5) Proposed Order)(Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2008. Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2008 11:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jian Ming Zhong, Chen Zhong (Huang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/7/2008) Modified on 7/10/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jian Ming Zhong, Chen Zhong (Huang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/7/2008) Modified on 7/10/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jian Ming Zhong, Chen Zhong (Huang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/7/2008) Modified on 7/10/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jian Ming Zhong, Chen Zhong (Huang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/7/2008) Modified on 7/10/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jian Ming Zhong. Emilio T. Gonzalez served on 6/16/2008, answer due 8/15/2008. (Huang, Daniel) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE M
                            SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re [3] ADR Scheduling Order (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 ADR Scheduling Order
                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2008. Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2008 11:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Jian Ming Zhong, Chen Zhong (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008) (sis, COURT STAFF).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT against Emilio T. Gonzalez, United States Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Robert Goldberg, Michael Jacobsen ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611020039.). Filed byJian Ming Zhong, Chen Zhong. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2008: # (1) Exhibit) (sis, COURT STAFF).
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                    CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
                                      Summons Issued as to Emilio T. Gonzalez, United States Department of State, Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Robert Goldberg, Michael Jacobsen, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?