Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-27976
District Judge Raymond B. Ray, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 10:10 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Creditors Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/29/2006 John W. Kozyak, Esq +1 305 372 1800 +1 305 372 3508 jk@kttlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Samuel M Stricklin, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel M Stricklin, Esq +1 214 758 1095
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the US Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heidi A Feinman +1 305 536 7285 +1 305 536 7360 Heidi.A.Feinman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Paul Steven Singerman, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Steven Singerman, Esq +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (165) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2769 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
Order Granting Application For Compensation (Re: # 2763) for Soneet R. Kapila,Accountant, fees awarded: $18000.00, expenses awarded: $2000.00 (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2768 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
    Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2765 Notice of Hearing, 2766 Notice of Hearing). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 2767 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
      Notice of Deposit of Funds with the USBC Clerk. Filed by Interested Party Soneet R. Kapila . (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2766 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
        Notice of Hearing (Re: 2762 Supplemental to Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursment of Expenses to Berger Singerman, P.A., as Counsel to the Plan Administrator for Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq, Attorney, Period: 1/1/2009 to 8/10/2009, Fee: $44,951.81, Expenses: $1,437.09. Filed by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq.) Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2009 at 09:30:00 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2765 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
          Notice of Hearing (Re: 2763 Supplemental Application for Final Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses to Accountants for the Plan Administrator for the Period August 1, 2009 Through Final Decree for Soneet R. Kapila, Accountant, Period: 8/1/2009 to 12/31/2009, Fee: $18,000.00, Expenses: $2,000.00. Filed by Accountant Soneet R. Kapila.) Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2009 at 09:30:00 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2764 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
            Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2762 Supplemental to Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursment of Expenses to Berger Singerman, P.A., as Counsel to the Plan Administrator for Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq, Attorney, Period: 1/1/2009 to 8/10/2009, Fee: $44,951.81, Expen filed by Accountant Soneet R. Kapila, Interested Party Soneet R. Kapila, 2763 Supplemental Application for Final Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses to Accountants for the Plan Administrator for the Period August 1, 2009 Through Final Decree for Soneet R. Kapila, Accountant, Period: 8/1/2009 to filed by Accountant Soneet R. Kapila, Interested Party Soneet R. Kapila). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2763 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
              Supplemental Application for Final Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses to Accountants for the Plan Administrator for the Period August 1, 2009 Through Final Decree for Soneet R. Kapila, Accountant, Period: 8/1/2009 to 12/31/2009, Fee: $18,000.00, Expenses: $2,000.00. Filed by Accountant Soneet R. Kapila. (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2762 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                Supplemental to Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursment of Expenses to Berger Singerman, P.A., as Counsel to the Plan Administrator for Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq, Attorney, Period: 1/1/2009 to 8/10/2009, Fee: $44,951.81, Expenses: $1,437.09. Filed by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq. (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2761 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                  Affidavit of Soneet R. Kapila, Plan Administrator Affidavit of Quarterly Disbursements for 2nd Quarter 2009 Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2760 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                    Notice of Filing Monthly Invoice of Plan Administrtor for Period of May 1, 2009 Through June 30, 2009, Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (^Kapila1, Soneet) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2759 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                      Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2758 Order on Motion to Approve, Order on Motion for Sale of Property). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2758 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                        Order Granting Motion To Approve Form of Asset Purchase Agreement Between Plan Administrator and Kesef International, Inc.; and Granting Motion for Sale of Property/Asset to Kesef International, Inc. (Re: # 2754) (Shafron, Judy) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2757 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None
                          Notice of Filing Monthly Invoice of Plan Administrator for Period of March 1, 2009 Through April 30, 2009, Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2756 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                            Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2755 Notice of Hearing). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2755 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                              Notice of Hearing (Re: 2754 Motion to Approve Form of Asset Purchase and Sale Agreement Between Plan Administrator and Cascade Settlement Services LLC, in addition to Motion for Sale of Property Asset to Cascade Settlement Services LLC Under 11 USC Section 363 b Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila.) Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2009 at 01:30:00 PM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2754 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                Motion to Approve Form of Asset Purchase and Sale Agreement Between Plan Administrator and Cascade Settlement Services LLC, in addition to Motion for Sale of Property Asset to Cascade Settlement Services LLC Under 11 USC Section 363 b Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase and Sale Agreement) (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2753 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                  Affidavit of Soneet R. Kapila, Plan Administrator Affidavit of Quarterly Disbursements for 1st Quarter 2009 Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2752 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2751 Order on Motion to Approve). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2751 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                      Order Granting Motion To Approve Agreement with FL Dept of Revenue as to Claim #1201 (Re: # 2746) (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2750 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Filing Monthly Invoice of Plan Adminstrator for Period of November 1, 2008 Through February 28, 2009, Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2749 Filed: 3/14/2009, Entered: None
                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 2747 Notice of Hearing) Service Date 03/14/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/15/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2748 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                            Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2747 Notice of Hearing). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2747 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Hearing (Re: 2746 Motion to Approve Agreement Between Plan Administrator and Florida Department of Revenue, With Respect to Claim No. 1201 Filed by Florida Department of Revenue Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila.) Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2009 at 09:30:00 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2746 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                Motion to Approve Agreement Between Plan Administrator and Florida Department of Revenue, With Respect to Claim No. 1201 Filed by Florida Department of Revenue Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2745 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Deposit of Funds with the USBC Clerk. Filed by Plan Administrator, Soneet Kapila . (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2744 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Affidavit of Soneet R. Kapila, Plan Administrator Affidavit of Quarterly Disbursements for 4th Quarter 2008 Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2743 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Paying Final Distribution to Holders of Allowed Class 3 Claims Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2742 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 2740 Order Granting Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds, original Claimant, Kenneth Cabe. (Re: # 2732) (Harper, Susan)) Service Date 12/24/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/25/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2741 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 2739 Order Granting Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds, original Claimant, Tree Trail E&A, LLC (Re: # 2733) (Harper, Susan)) Service Date 12/24/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/25/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2740 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Order Granting Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds, original Claimant, Kenneth Cabe. (Re: # 2732) (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2739 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Order Granting Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds, original Claimant, Tree Trail E&A, LLC (Re: # 2733) (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2738 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2735 Order on Application for Compensation, 2736 Order on Application for Compensation). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2737 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2734 Order on Motion to Approve). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2736 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Order Granting Final Application For Compensation (Re: # 2727) for Leslie Gern Cloyd, fees awarded: $195116.85, expenses awarded: $2525.92 (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2735 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Order Granting Final Application For Compensation (Re: # 2726) for Soneet R. Kapila, fees awarded: $207696.35, expenses awarded: $128.49 (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2734 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Order Granting Motion To Authorize Resolution of Remaining Issues with Buyer, Piccadilly Restaurants, LLC (Re: # 2730) (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2733 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds in the Amount of $8,765.54 Filed by Interested Party Adams & Cohen on Behalf of Edens & Avant. (Jeremiah, Leonard) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2732 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds in the Amount of $1,420.03 Filed by Interested Party Adams & Cohen on Behalf of Kenneth Cabe. (Jeremiah, Leonard) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2731 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Order on Post-Confirmation Status Conference, Granting Ore Tenus Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing to Consider Fee Applications, and Setting Hearing (Re: 2726 Final Application for Compensation filed by Accountant Soneet R. Kapila, 2727 Final Application for Compensation, filed by Special Counsel Leslie Gern Cloyd, and 2730 Motion to Approve Resolution of Remaining Issues with Buyer filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila). Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2008 at 09:30 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2730 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion to Approve Resolution of Remaining Issues With Buyer, Piccadilly Restaurants, LLC Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2729 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Filing District Court Order Dated November 5, 2008, Filed by Accountant Soneet R. Kapila. (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2728 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2726 Application for Final Compensation for Soneet R. Kapila, Accountant, Period: 8/1/2008 to 11/19/2008, Fee: $207,696.35, Expenses: $128.49. filed by Accountant Soneet R. Kapila, Interested Party Soneet R. Kapila). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2727 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to Berger Singerman, P.A., as Special Counsel to Plan Administrator (Fees Requested Includes Hold-Backs and Anticipated Fees) for Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq, Special Counsel, Period: 8/1/2008 to 11/20/2008, Fee: $195,116.85, Expenses: $2,525.92. Filed by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summary of Professional and Paraprofessional Time2 Exhibit 2 - Summary of Professional Time by Activity Code Category3 Exhibit 3 - Summary of Requested Reimbursement of Expenses and Disbursements4 Exhibit 4 - Detailed Description of Services Rendered and Disbursements) (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2726 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        Application for Final Compensation for Soneet R. Kapila, Accountant, Period: 8/1/2008 to 11/19/2008, Fee: $207,696.35, Expenses: $128.49. Filed by Accountant Soneet R. Kapila. (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2725 Filed: 11/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 2723 Order Granting Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds on behalf of Trans Louisiana Gas Co. (Re: # 2721) (Harper, Susan)) Service Date 11/15/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/16/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2724 Filed: 11/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 2722 Order Granting Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds on behalf of Myers Produce Inc. (Re: # 2720) (Harper, Susan)) Service Date 11/15/2008. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/16/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2723 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              Order Granting Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds on behalf of Trans Louisiana Gas Co. (Re: # 2721) (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2722 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds on behalf of Myers Produce Inc. (Re: # 2720) (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2721 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds in the Amount of $6,093.27 Filed by Interested Party American Property Locators Inc., on Behalf of Trans Louisiana Gas Co. (Jeremiah, Leonard) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2720 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Application to Withdraw Unclaimed Funds in the Amount of $5,407.55 Filed by Interested Party Adams & Cohen on Behalf of Meyers Produce, Inc. (Jeremiah, Leonard) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2719 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2717 Order on Objection to Claims). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2718 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Monthly Invoice of Plan Administrator for Period of October 1, 2008 Through October 31, 2008, Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Kapila, Soneet) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2717 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Order Sustaining Plan Administrator's Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims Relating to Claim #701 of City of Lakeland (Re: # 2674) Ordered that Claim #701 is Disallowed without Prejudice. (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2716 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2715 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry, 2714 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2715 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Order Granting Plan Administrator's Motion for Authorization to Deposit Final Distributions into Court Registry for Claimants Whose Interim Distribution Checks Have Been Unpresented.(Re: # 2706) (Shafron, Judy) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2714 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Order Granting Seventh Motion by Plan Administrator to (I)Extend Term of Employment Through the Entry of a Final Decree; and (II) Discharge Plan Administrator Upon the Entry of a Final Decree. Re: # 2711 (Shafron, Judy) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2713 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2712 Notice of Hearing, ). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2712 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing (Re: 2711 Seventh Motion by Plan Administrator to (I) Extend Term of Employment Through the Entry of a Final Decree; and (II) Discharge Plan Administrator Upon the Entry of a Final Decree Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Cloyd, Leslie)) Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2008 at 09:30:00 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2711 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Seventh Motion by Plan Administrator to (I) Extend Term of Employment Through the Entry of a Final Decree; and (II) Discharge Plan Administrator Upon the Entry of a Final Decree Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2710 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service by Attorney Leslie Gern Cloyd Esq (Re: 2707 Order Continuing Status Hearing, 2709 Notice of Hearing,, 2708 Order on Application for Compensation). (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2709 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing (Re: 2706 Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Cloyd, Leslie)) Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2008 at 09:30:00 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2708 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Order Granting Supplemental Final Application For Compensation (Re: # 2684) for Tara G. Richard, fees awarded: $5,123.50, expenses awarded: $1.37 (Weldon, Melva) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2707 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Order Continuing Post-Confirmation Status Conference (Re: 2687 Order Continuing Status Hearing). Status hearing to be held on 12/12/2008 at 09:30 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Harper, Susan) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2706 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Motion to Deposit Funds into Court Registry Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila. (Cloyd, Leslie) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2705 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Deposit of Funds with the USBC Clerk. Filed by Interested Party Soneet Kapila . (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Scott Y Stuart for Creditor Trufoods Corp.. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Motion By Creditor Ad Hoc Committee of Noteholders For Eric M Kay To Appear Pro Hac Vice (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Richard T Davis for Creditor Huntington Mall Company, Creditor Governor's Square Company. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Don C Fletcher for Creditor Peter Piper, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Objection By Creditor Palm Beach County Tax Collector To [33-1] Agreed Interim Order To Schedule Final Hearing On:( [8-1] Motion For an Interim and Final Order Authorizing The Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ) . (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By J Jeffrey Deery for Creditor AmSouth Bank. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By John P Dillman for Creditor Harris County Houston ISD, Creditor City of Houston. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By William M Lindeman for Creditor Colonial Properties Realty Ltd Ptnrshp. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Request by Creditor State of Maryland Dept. of Labor For Notice. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing by Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Re: [19-1] Motion For An Order Authorizing the Debtor to Implement Key Employee Retention Program by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. schd For 9:30 12/2/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Order ( 11/14/03) Granting [70-1] Motion For Scott A Griffin To Appear Pro Hac Vice as Special Counsel, with Pedro A Jimenez to act as Local Counsel by Piccadilly Acquisition Corporation (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By W Clark Watson for Creditor Alabama Power Company. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing by Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Re: [79-1] Motion for entry of Order Pursuant to 11 USC 105(a), 1107(a) & 1108 Authorizing Debtor to File a Form 15 with The Securities and Exchange Commission by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. schd For 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Ronald E Gold for Creditor CBL & Associates Management Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Request by Creditor The Travelers Insurance Co. For Notice. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Robert D Albergotti for Creditor Buffet Partners, LP. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Request by Creditor Manatee County Tax Collector For Notice. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice by AUST of Appointment of Creditors' Committee. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion by Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. for entry of Order Pursuant to 11 USC 105(a), 1107(a) & 1108 Authorizing Debtor to File a Form 15 with The Securities and Exchange Commission (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate Of Service By other professional Bankruptcy Management Corporation Of [47-1] Order/Notice Advising Debtor's Utility Services of the Courts Order Establishing Procedures with Respect to Providing Electricity, Natural Gas, Telephone, Water, Sewer and Trash Collection/ with instruction . (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate Of Service By other professional Bankruptcy Management Corporation Of [42-1] Hearing Notice by Paul Steven Singerman Esq, [22-1] Motion To Sell Free And Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests Substantially All of Its Assets Outside the Ordinary Course of Business by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [22-2] Motion for Approval of the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Located in Expandable Folder) (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., Interested Party Piccadilly Acquisition Corporation Re: Amended and Restated Asset Purchase Agreement with Exhibits and Schedules attached. (Located in Expandable Folder) (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Scott A Griffin for Interested Party Piccadilly Acquisition Corporation. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Frank J Wright for Creditor Beltline Ground Lease Investors, LP. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Daniel P Kelliher for Creditor The Rouse Company, Creditor Governor's Square, LLC, Creditor Augusta Mall Partnership. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection By Creditor Entergy Gulf States, Inc, Creditor Entergy Louisiana, Inc, Creditor Entergy Mississippi, Inc, Creditor Entergy New Orleans, Inc, Creditor Entergy Solutions, Ltd. To [13-1] Motion To Determine Adequate Assurance of Payment for Debtor's Utility Services by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [13-2] Motion Restraining Utilities From Altering, Disconnecting or Refusing the Debtor Service by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Extend Time To File Schedules and Statements . (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/17/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte Motion By Interested Party Piccadilly Acquisition Corporation For Scott A Griffin To Appear Pro Hac Vice as Special Counsel, with Pedro A Jimenez to act as Local Counsel (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion By Creditor Florida Power and Light Company To Reconsider Re: Order [24-1] Establishing Adequate Assurance of Payment for Debtor's Utility Services and Restraining Utilities from Altering, Disconnecting or Refusing Service (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request by Creditor Office of Reorganization SEC For Notice. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. for Approval of Competitive Bidding and Sale Procedures , for Approval of form of Asset Purchase Agreement , for Approval of Form and Manner of Notice , To Schedule Hearing Dates to Conduct Auction and to Consider Final Approval of Sale and Treatment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases On:( [22-1] Motion To Sell Free And Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests Substantially All of Its Assets Outside the Ordinary Course of Business by Cafeterias, Inc., [22-2] Motion for Approval of the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts Unexpired Leases by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. ) and Granting Related Relief (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate Of Service By Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Of [0-1] First Meeting 11 Notice (Rejected Leases/Contracts) to All Parties on Attached Service List. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Service By Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Of [0-1] First Meeting 11 to All Parties on Attached Master Service List. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Service By Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Of [36-1] Order Requiring Parties to Refer to Court Paper Numbers in All Pleadings filed in the Main Case and Any and All Related Cases. . (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By William E Steffes for Creditor Sam J. Kennedy. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Michael I Goldberg for Creditor Ad Hoc Committee of Noteholders. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Employ Curtis R Hearn of Jones, Walker, Waechter, Poitevent, et al, LLP as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to 10/29/03 . Affidavit Attached? Yes (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate Of Service By Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Of [46-1] Order Approving Rejection of Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property of Previously Closed Cafeterias and Unexpired Leases of Executory Contracts Related thereto. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing Original Signature Page By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Re: [14-1] Application To Employ Bankruptcy Management Corporation as Noticing and Claims Agent by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Craig V Rasile for Creditor Bank of New York. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Courtenay M. Labson for Creditor Northpark Mall Ltd Partnership. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Service By Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Of [50-1] Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Estate Professionals, [49-2] Interim Order Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Trading in Claims and Equity Securities, [49-1] Order To Schedule Final Hearing On:( [9-1] Motion For an Order Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Trading in Claims and Equity Securities by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 12/2/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ), [48-2] Interim Order Authorizing the Debtor to both Honor and Continue Pre-Petition Customer and Marketing Practices , [48-1] Order To Schedule Final Hearing On:( [12-1] Motion For an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Both Honor and Continue Its Pre-Petition Customer and Marketing Practices by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ), [47-1] Order Advising Debtor's Utility Services of the Courts Order Establishing Procedures with Respect to Providing Electricity, Natural Gas, Telephone, Water, Sewer and Trash Collection/ with instruction, [46-1] Order Approving Rejection of Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property of Previously Closed Cafeterias, etc, [45-1] Authorizing Employment of Retail Consulting Svcs Order, and [44-1] Order Authorizing Employment of Bankruptcy Management Corp as Noticing and Claims Agent. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate Of Service By Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Of [38-1] Hearing Notice on Motion to Determine Adequate Assurance of Payment for Utility Services, etc by Paul Steven Singerman Esq . (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Re: Amended List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Ronald M Tucker for Creditor Simon Property Group L.P.. (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Michael Chimitris for Creditor General Growth Management, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing by Kevin C Gleason for Creditor Glade Musemeche, Creditor John Musemeche Re: [32-1] Motion For Relief From Stay to Liquidate Damages in Personal Injury Case by Glade Musemeche, John Musemeche schd For 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order ( 11/4/03) Granting [3-1] Motion To Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Estate Professionals by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim Order ( 11/4/03) Granting [9-1] Motion For an Order Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Trading in Claims and Equity Securities by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., To Schedule Final Hearing On:( [9-1] Motion For an Order Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Trading in Claims and Equity Securities by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 12/2/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ) (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order ( 11/4/03), To Schedule Final Hearing On:( [12-1] Motion For an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Both Honor and Continue Its Pre-Petition Customer and Marketing Practices by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ) (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order/Notice ( 11/4/03), Advising Debtor's Utility Services of the Courts Order Establishing Procedures with Respect to Providing Electricity, Natural Gas, Telephone, Water, Sewer and Trash Collection/ with instruction (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order ( 11/4/03) Granting [5-1] Motion for Approval of the Rejection of Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property for Previously Closed Cafeterias, and Executory Contracts Related Thereto by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order ( 11/4/03) Authorizing Employment Re: [4-1] Application To Employ Retail Consulting Inc as Real Estate Consultant by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order ( 11/4/03) Authorizing Employment Re: [14-1] Application To Employ Bankruptcy Management Corporation as Noticing and Claims Agent by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. . (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing Amended Ex A By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Re: [13-2] Motion Restraining Utilities From Altering, Disconnecting or Refusing the Debtor Service by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing by Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Re: [22-1] Amended Motion To Sell Free And Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests Substantially All of Its Assets Outside the Ordinary Course of Business by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [22-2] Motion for Approval of the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. schd For 1:30 12/9/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Service By Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Of [33-2] Agreed Interim Order Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection, and [33-1] Order To Schedule Final Hearing On:( [8-1] Motion For an Interim and Final Order Authorizing The Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ), [30-2] Interim Order Granting Application to Employ PMCM LLC to Furnish Crises Managers, etc. , [30-1] Order To Schedule Final Hearing On:( [15-1] Application To Employ PMCM LLC, to Furnish Crises Managers to the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 363 and 105 of the Bankruptcy Code by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ), [29-1] Order Granting Motion for Authority to Pay Certain Accrued Pre-Petition Wages and Pre-Petition Employment Benefits and Pay Accrued Pre-Petition Employment Related Taxes, etc, [28-1] Order Granting Motion to Limit Notice and Approval of Form of Notice, etc, [27-2] Interim Order Granting Motion Authorizing Maintenance of bank Accounts and Cont'd use of Existing Business Forms, Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management System, Granting a Waiver of Additional Time to Comply with Investment and Deposit Guidelines, etc [27-1] Order Scheduling Final Hearing On:( [7-1] Motion For An Order Authorizing Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Continued Use of Existing Business Forms by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale, [7-2] Motion Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management System by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale, [7-3] Motion Granting a Waiver of or Additional Time to Comply with Investment and Deposit Guidelines by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ), [26-1] Order Granting Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Claims Under the Perishable Agric. Commodities Act., [25-1] Order Granting the Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Sales and Use Taxes and Directing Debtor's Banks to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay Checks, etc, [24-1] Order Granting Motion to Determine Adequate Assurance of Payment of Debtor's Utility Service and Restraining Utilities from Altering, Disconnecting or Refusing Service., and [23-1] Authorizing Employment Order by Paul Steven Singerman Esq . (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Notice of Hearing by Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Re: [17-1] Application To Employ Paul Steven Singerman and the law firm of Berger Singerman, P.A. by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [15-1] Application To Employ PMCM LLC, to Furnish Crises Managers to the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 363 and 105 of the Bankruptcy Code by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [14-1] Application To Employ Bankruptcy Management Corporation as Noticing and Claims Agent by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [13-2] Motion Restraining Utilities From Altering, Disconnecting or Refusing the Debtor Service by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [13-1] Motion To Determine Adequate Assurance of Payment for Debtor's Utility Services by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [12-1] Motion For an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Both Honor and Continue Its Pre-Petition Customer and Marketing Practices by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [11-2] Motion Directing the Debtor's Banks to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Drawn on the Debtor's Accounts for Such Purposes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [11-1] Motion For An Order Authorizing the Debtor to Pay Pre-Petition Sales and Use Taxes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [10-1] Motion For an Order Authorizing to Pay Pre-Petition Claims Under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [9-1] Motion For an Order Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Trading in Claims and Equity Securities by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [8-1] Motion For an Interim and Final Order Authorizing The Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [7-3] Motion Granting a Waiver of or Additional Time to Comply with Investment and Deposit Guidelines by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [7-2] Motion Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management System by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [7-1] Motion For An Order Authorizing Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Continued Use of Existing Business Forms by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [6-4] Motion For An Order Directing the Debtor's Banks to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Drawn on the Debtor's Accounts for Such Purposes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [6-3] Motion For Authority to Pay Accrued Pre-Petition Employment Related Taxes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [6-2] Motion For Authority to Pay Certain Accrued Pre-Petition Employment Benefits by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [6-1] Motion For Authority to Pay Certain Accrued Pre Petition Wages by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [5-1] Motion for Approval of the Rejection of Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property for Previously Closed Cafeterias, and Executory Contracts Related Thereto by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [4-1] Application To Employ Retail Consulting Inc as Real Estate Consultant by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [3-1] Motion To Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Estate Professionals by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. schd For 10:00 10/31/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By J David Forsyth for Creditor Clearview Palms Partnership, Creditor Globe II Ltd Partnership, Creditor Seville Plaza General Partnership, Creditor Cascade Drive Ltd Partnership, Creditor MacArthur Village Ltd Partnership, Creditor Stirling Properties, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing by Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Re: [13-1] Motion To Determine Adequate Assurance of Payment for Debtor's Utility Services by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [13-2] Motion Restraining Utilities From Altering, Disconnecting or Refusing the Debtor Service by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. schd For 10:00 10/31/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit Register by Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. for Hearing 10/31/03 @ 10:00 AM on First Day Motions. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order (10/31/03), Requiring Parties to Refer to Court Paper Numbers in All Pleadings filed in the Main Case and Any and All Related Cases. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Thomas W Daniels for Creditor Fort Henry, LLC. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Mark A Salzberg for Creditor Tree Trail, LLC. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed Interim Order (10/31/03) Granting [8-1] Motion For an Interim and Final Order Authorizing The Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., To Schedule Final Hearing On:( [8-1] Motion For an Interim and Final Order Authorizing The Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ) (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency Motion By Creditor John Musemeche, Creditor Glade Musemeche For Relief From Stay to Liquidate Damages in Personal Injury Case . (Receipt # 400987 Amount: $75.00) (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Robert L. LeHane for Creditor Gregory Greenfield & Associates, Creditor General Growth Management Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Interim Order ( 10/31/03) Granting [15-1] Application To Employ PMCM LLC, to Furnish Crises Managers to the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 363 and 105 of the Bankruptcy Code by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., To Schedule Final Hearing On:( [15-1] Application To Employ PMCM LLC, to Furnish Crises Managers to the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 363 and 105 of the Bankruptcy Code by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ) (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order ( 10/31/03) Granting [6-1] Motion For Authority to Pay Certain Accrued Pre Petition Wages by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Granting [6-2] Motion For Authority to Pay Certain Accrued Pre-Petition Employment Benefits by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Granting [6-3] Motion For Authority to Pay Accrued Pre-Petition Employment Related Taxes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Granting [6-4] Motion For An Order Directing the Debtor's Banks to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Drawn on the Debtor's Accounts for Such Purposes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order ( 10/31/03) Granting [18-1] Motion To Llimit Notice by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Granting [18-2] Motion For Approval of Form of Notice of Commencement of Case, Meeting of Creditors and Claims Bar Date by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Interim Order (10/31/03) Granting [7-1] Motion For An Order Authorizing Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Continued Use of Existing Business Forms by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Granting [7-2] Motion Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management System by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Granting [7-3] Motion Granting a Waiver of or Additional Time to Comply with Investment and Deposit Guidelines by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Scheduling Final Hearing On:( [7-1] Motion For An Order Authorizing Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Continued Use of Existing Business Forms by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale, [7-2] Motion Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management System by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale, [7-3] Motion Granting a Waiver of or Additional Time to Comply with Investment and Deposit Guidelines by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Hearing reset to 9:30 11/19/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale ) (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order ( 10/31/03) Granting [10-1] Motion For an Order Authorizing to Pay Pre-Petition Claims Under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order ( 10/31/03) Granting [11-1] Motion For An Order Authorizing the Debtor to Pay Pre-Petition Sales and Use Taxes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Granting [11-2] Motion Directing the Debtor's Banks to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Drawn on the Debtor's Accounts for Such Purposes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order ( 10/31/03) Granting [13-1] Motion To Determine Adequate Assurance of Payment for Debtor's Utility Services by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Granting [13-2] Motion Restraining Utilities From Altering, Disconnecting or Refusing the Debtor Service by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order ( 10/31/03) Authorizing Employment Re: [17-1] Application To Employ Paul Steven Singerman and the law firm of Berger Singerman, P.A. by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date . Attorney: Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., Added. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Motion by Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Sell Free And Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests Substantially All of Its Assets Outside the Ordinary Course of Business , and for Approval of the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases [21-1], [21-2] terminated. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. For Approval To Sell Free And Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests Substantially All of its Assets Outside the Ordinary Course of Business , and for Approval of the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing by Paul Steven Singerman for Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Re: [18-2] Motion For Approval of Form of Notice of Commencement of Case, Meeting of Creditors and Claims Bar Date by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [18-1] Motion To Llimit Notice by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [17-1] Application To Employ Paul Steven Singerman and the law firm of Berger Singerman, P.A. by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [15-1] Application To Employ PMCM LLC, to Furnish Crises Managers to the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 363 and 105 of the Bankruptcy Code by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [14-1] Application To Employ Bankruptcy Management Corporation as Noticing and Claims Agent by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [13-2] Motion Restraining Utilities From Altering, Disconnecting or Refusing the Debtor Service by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [13-1] Motion To Determine Adequate Assurance of Payment for Debtor's Utility Services by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [12-1] Motion For an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Both Honor and Continue Its Pre-Petition Customer and Marketing Practices by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [11-2] Motion Directing the Debtor's Banks to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Drawn on the Debtor's Accounts for Such Purposes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [11-1] Motion For An Order Authorizing the Debtor to Pay Pre-Petition Sales and Use Taxes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [10-1] Motion For an Order Authorizing to Pay Pre-Petition Claims Under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [9-1] Motion For an Order Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Trading in Claims and Equity Securities by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [8-1] Motion For an Interim and Final Order Authorizing The Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [7-3] Motion Granting a Waiver of or Additional Time to Comply with Investment and Deposit Guidelines by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [7-2] Motion Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management System by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [7-1] Motion For An Order Authorizing Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Continued Use of Existing Business Forms by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [6-4] Motion For An Order Directing the Debtor's Banks to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Drawn on the Debtor's Accounts for Such Purposes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [6-3] Motion For Authority to Pay Accrued Pre-Petition Employment Related Taxes by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [6-2] Motion For Authority to Pay Certain Accrued Pre-Petition Employment Benefits by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [6-1] Motion For Authority to Pay Certain Accrued Pre Petition Wages by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [5-1] Motion for Approval of the Rejection of Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property for Previously Closed Cafeterias, and Executory Contracts Related Thereto by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [4-1] Application To Employ Retail Consulting Inc as Real Estate Consultant by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., [3-1] Motion To Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Estate Professionals by Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. schd For (No time given) 10/31/03 at Room 308, Ft. Lauderdale (Harper S cm) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion by Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. For An Order Authorizing the Debtor to Implement Key Employee Retention Program (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/31/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Limit Notice , For Approval of Form of Notice of Commencement of Case, Meeting of Creditors and Claims Bar Date (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Employ Paul Steven Singerman and the law firm of Berger Singerman, P.A. Affidavit Attached? Yes (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit by Interested Party John G. McGregor Interim Chief Executive Officer of Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc., In Support of: Certain First Day Motions (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Employ PMCM LLC, to Furnish Crises Managers to the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 363 and 105 of the Bankruptcy Code . Affidavit Attached? Yes (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application Filed By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Employ Bankruptcy Management Corporation as Noticing and Claims Agent (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/31/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EMERGENCY Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Determine Adequate Assurance of Payment for Debtor's Utility Services , Restraining Utilities From Altering, Disconnecting or Refusing the Debtor Service (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EMERGENCY Motion by Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. For an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Both Honor and Continue Its Pre-Petition Customer and Marketing Practices (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/31/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. For An Order Authorizing the Debtor to Pay Pre-Petition Sales and Use Taxes , Directing the Debtor's Banks to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Drawn on the Debtor's Accounts for Such Purposes (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/31/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EMERGENCY Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. For an Order Authorizing to Pay Pre-Petition Claims Under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EMERGENCY Motion by Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. For an Order Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Trading in Claims and Equity Securities (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. For an Interim and Final Order Authorizing The Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EMERGENCY Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. For An Order Authorizing Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Continued Use of Existing Business Forms , Authorizing Maintenance of Cash Management System , Granting a Waiver of or Additional Time to Comply with Investment and Deposit Guidelines (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/31/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EMERGENCY Motion By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. For Authority to Pay Certain Accrued Pre Petition Wages , For Authority to Pay Certain Accrued Pre-Petition Employment Benefits , For Authority to Pay Accrued Pre-Petition Employment Related Taxes , For An Order Directing the Debtor's Banks to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Drawn on the Debtor's Accounts for Such Purposes (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2808 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Banoovong, Bea) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EMERGENCY Motion by Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. for Approval of the Rejection of Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property for Previously Closed Cafeterias, and Executory Contracts Related Thereto (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2806 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The debtor in the above case has filed a Final Report and Motion for Entry of Final Decree. The debtor has certified that the case has been fully administered. Based upon the Debtor's Final Report, the United States Trustee has no objection to the Court granting the Debtor's Motion for Final Decree. The Debtor will remain liable for United States Trustee Quarterly Fees for each calendar quarter (or portion thereof) through the date the Final Decree is entered in this case. The United States Trustee reserves the right to seek to have the Final Decree vacated should any United States Trustee Quarterly Fees remain unpaid through date of closing by the court. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application By Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Employ Retail Consulting Inc as Real Estate Consultant . Affidavit Attached? Yes by Ivan Friedman for Retail Consulting Services, Inc (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion by Debtor Piccadilly Cafeterias, Inc. To Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Estate Professionals (Cervino M cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Deficiency for Incomplete Filings and Certificate of Mailing. Missing Documents: - All Schedules and Statements Due: 11/13/03. (Falzone J cm) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Voluntary Petition Filed Under Chapter 11. Complete Schedules Filed? NO. (Receipt # 232973 Amount: $830.00), Disclosure Statement and Chapter 11 Plan Due: 2/26/04. (Falzone J cm) (Entered: 10/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2700 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 241 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?