Capcom Co. LTD. et al v. The MKR Group, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:08-cv-00904-RS
District Judge Richard Seeborg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 2, 2016 at 2:02 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Capcom Company, Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Capcom Co. LTD."

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo The MKR Group, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Joseph McCabe , +1 408 975 7500 +1 408 975 7501 pmccabe@kenyon.com
Space Mark Delun Yuan +1 408 975 7957 +1 408 975 7501 myuan@kenyon.com
v.
No Logo The MKR Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Joseph McCabe , +1 408 975 7500 +1 408 975 7501 pmccabe@kenyon.com
Space Jonathan David Reichman +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jreichman@kenyon.com
Space Mimi Kristin Rupp +21255621 00x 827 4334 +1 212 556 2222 mrupp@kenyon.com
Space Mark Delun Yuan +1 408 975 7957 +1 408 975 7501 myuan@kenyon.com
No Logo Capcom Company, Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Capcom Co. LTD."

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Third Party Defendant

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Tomlinson Zisko Morosoli & Maser LLP, Mediator
Officially listed as "M. Scott Donahey"
No Logo The MKR Group, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Joseph McCabe , +1 408 975 7500 +1 408 975 7501 pmccabe@kenyon.com
Space Mark Delun Yuan +1 408 975 7957 +1 408 975 7501 myuan@kenyon.com
Office San Jose
Filed 2/12/2008
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Cause Section 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Outside US
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, AO279, E-Filing, MEDIATION
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 69 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
ORDER AND JUDGMENT re 68 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Modified on 12/1/2008 (rssec, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/25/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
    STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order and Judgment by The MKR Group, Inc. (McCabe, Philip) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Text modified on 11/14/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/14/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER VACATING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Motion HearingCourt Filing
        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2008 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 9/3/2008) re [34] MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc.. (Tape #FTR.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
          Letter from MKR Group concerning mediation. (Reichman, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/6/2008) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Letter
            Letter from Mediator, M. Scott Donahey, dated 8/26/2008. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER re 64 Stipulation filed by The MKR Group, Inc. Stipulation Modified by the Court. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/29/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 11/12/2008 09:30 AM., at the offices of Fenwick & West, 801 California Street, Mountain View, CA 94041. Mediation statements submitted to mediator by Wednesday, 11/5/2008. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order to Continue Case Management Conference and Statement Deadline by The MKR Group, Inc. (McCabe, Philip) (Filed on 10/29/2008) Modified on 11/6/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                    Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 11/13/2008 09:30 AM., at the offices of Fenwick & West, 801 California Street, Mountain View, CA 94041. Mediation statements submitted to mediator by Wednesday, 11/5/2008. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER re 61 Stipulation filed by The MKR Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/20/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting [55] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allen J. Baden terminated (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 34 Motion to Dismiss (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Proposed Order
                            (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Allen J. Baden as Counsel of Record re [55] by The MKR Group, Inc. (McCabe, Philip) (Filed on 8/18/2008) Modified on 8/18/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order to Continue Mediation Deadline by The MKR Group, Inc. (McCabe, Philip) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 11/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008, Terminated: 8/19/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Allen J. Baden as Counsel of REecord filed by The MKR Group, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (McCabe, Philip) (Filed on 8/18/2008) Text modified on 8/18/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/03/2008, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Bryce, e-mail Courtreporter232@aol.com Telephone number (510)828-9404. Tape Number: 10:21-11:55. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2009. (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Joseph McCabe (McCabe, Philip) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Proposed Order
                                      Amended (Proposed) Order Granting MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint re [34] by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/13/2008) Text modified on 8/14/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Objection
                                        OBJECTIONS to Exhibits Attached to the Declaration of Mimi Rupp In Opposition to Capcom's Motion to Dismiss MKR's Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint re ([4]) by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/13/2008) Text modified on 8/14/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Reply Memorandum
                                          Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion tp Dismiss Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint re [34] filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 8/13/2008) Text modified on 8/14/2008 conforming to poste document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Pre MED phone conference
                                            Pre MED phone conference rescheduled to Thursday, August 7, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                              Manual Filing of Exhibit A by The MKR Group, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2008) (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Declaration in Opposition
                                                DECLARATION of Mimi Rupp in Opposition to Capcom's Motion to Dismiss MKR's Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint re [48] filed by The MKR Group, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O) (Baden, Allen) (Filed on 7/23/2008) Text modified on 7/24/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                  Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss MKR's Amended Countercliams and Third Party Complaint re [34] filed by The MKR Group, Inc. (Baden, Allen) (Filed on 7/23/2008) Text modified on 7/24/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Letter
                                                    Letter from Mediator, M. Scott Donahey, dated 7/16/2008. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Pre MED phone conference
                                                      Pre MED phone conference scheduled on Friday, July 25, 2008 at 9:30 a.m. PDT. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER re [45] Stipulation filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc. Motion Hearing re [34] continued to 9/3/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/30/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Stipulation
                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing the Hearing on, and Modifying the Briefing Schedule Related to, Capcom's Motion to Dismiss MKR's Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint re ([34]) by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 6/30/2008) Linkage added on 6/30/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2008 02:30 PM. Discovery due by 6/30/2009. Jury Trial set for 9/28/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/25/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2008)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/25/2008 before Judge Richard Seeborgq (Date Filed: 6/25/2008). (not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/25/2008)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER re [39] Letter, filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/12/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2008)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Exhibits
                                                                  EXHIBITS to the Request for Judicial Notice In Support of MotioN to Dismiss Amended Complaint Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint re [37], [34] (OVERSIZED DOCUMENT) filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. re [37] by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Kelly, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/11/2008) Modified on 6/12/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                      Letter to Judge Seeborg from Rodger Cole requesting to lodge an Xbox with the Court (and in connection with Capcom Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint). (Attachments: # (1) (Proposed) Order Permitting Delivery and Use of Xbox) (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 6/11/2008) Text Modified on 6/12/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
                                                                        ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing M. Scott Donahey as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities re [34] filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3 (Part 1), # (4) Exhibit 3 (Part 2), # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15 (part 1), # (17) Exhibit 15 (Part 2), # (18) Exhibit 16, # (19) Exhibit 17, # (20) Exhibit 18, # (21) Exhibit 19, # (22) Exhibit 20, # (23) Exhibit 21, # (24) Exhibit 22, # (25) Exhibit 23, # (26) Exhibit 24, # (27) Exhibit 25, # (28) Exhibit 26, # (29) Exhibit 27, # (30) Exhibit 28, # (31) Exhibit 29, # (32) Exhibit 30, # (33) Exhibit 31, # (34) Exhibit 32, # (35) Exhibit 33, # (36) Exhibit 34, # (37) Exhibit 35, # (38) Exhibit 36, # (39) Exhibit 37, # (40) Exhibit 38, # (41) Exhibit 39, # (42) Exhibit 40, # (43) Exhibit 41, # (44) Exhibit 42, # (45) Exhibit 43, # (46) Exhibit 44)(Related document(s)[34]) (Kelly, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/11/2008) Text modified on 6/12/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                            Declaration of Koichi Niida in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities [34] filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc (Kelly, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/11/2008) Modified on 6/12/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                              Declaration of Jennifer L. Kelly in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint re [34] filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Kelly, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/11/2008) Modified on 6/12/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008, Terminated: 8/13/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # (1) (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Kelly, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/11/2008) Modified on 6/12/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2008 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/11/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/10/08. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING [30] Stipulation CONSENTING TO THE REASSIGNMENT OF THIS ACTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD SEEBORG. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/9/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008, Terminated: 6/9/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSENTING TO THE REASSIGNMENT OF THIS ACTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD SEEBORG by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Case Referred to Mediation
                                                                                          CASE REFERRED to court-sponsored Mediation [15]. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Case Management Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 8/8/2008 09:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2008. Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2008 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/3/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/30/2008 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 6/2/2008). (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2008)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Allen J. Baden (Baden, Allen) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING [22] Request to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 27, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [19] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan D. Reichman (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [18] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mimi K. Rupp (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Capcom U.S.A., Inc.. (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008, Terminated: 5/27/2008 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by The MKR Group, Inc.. (Yuan, Mark) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by The MKR Group, Inc. (Yuan, Mark) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The MKR Group, Inc.. Service waived by Capcom U.S.A., Inc. waiver sent on 5/20/2008, answer due 7/21/2008. (Yuan, Mark) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by The MKR Group, Inc. and their Counsel (Yuan, Mark) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008, Terminated: 5/27/2008 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Jonathan D. Reichman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611019315.) filed by The MKR Group, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008, Terminated: 5/27/2008 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Mimi K. Rupp ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611019315.) filed by The MKR Group, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiffs, Counterclaim-Defendants and their Counsel (Kelly, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/19/2008) Modified on 5/19/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Received Document
                                                                                                                        Received Document (Proposed) Order re [18] MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611019315.) by The MKR Group, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting [13] Stipulation re ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 15, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2008)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                            Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Capcom U.S.A., Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc. byThe MKR Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-O)(Yuan, Mark) (Filed on 5/15/2008)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008, Terminated: 5/15/2008 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Arbitrati
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Arbitration by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc. and Capcom U.S.A., Inc. (Kelly, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs byThe MKR Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-O)(Yuan, Mark) (Filed on 5/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/7/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re [8] Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by The MKR Group, Inc.. (Yuan, Mark) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [8] Stipulation To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by The MKR Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/14/2008. Deadline: May 5, 2008.(mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008, Terminated: 4/14/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by The MKR Group, Inc.. (Yuan, Mark) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc.. Service waived by The MKR Group, Inc. waiver sent on 2/15/2008, answer due 4/15/2008. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc. re [5] Certificate of Service AMENDED (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 2/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE re ([2]) ADR Scheduling Order by Capcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 2/15/2008) Linkage added on 8/14/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Initial Scheduling Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2008 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2008.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/15/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Patent/Trademark Copy
                                                                                                                                                  REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                    ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2008 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order, # (2) Standing Order)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against The MKR Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611015730.). Filed byCapcom Co. LTD., Capcom Entertainment, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008) (hdj, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                        CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to The MKR Group, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?