Heartbreaker Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-71
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-02860
District Judge Robert W. Gettleman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 5:53 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Heartbreaker Productions, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

v.
No Logo Does 1-71, Defendant
No Logo John Doe (IP Address: 71.194.15.55), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mark E. Wiemelt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. Wiemelt +1 312 372 7664 +1 312 372 6568 mark@wiemeltlaw.com
No Logo John Doe (IP Address: 98.206.75.102, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orum & Roth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Daniel Roth +1 312 922 6262 +1 202 639 6490 markdroth@gmail.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Terminate Hearings
MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 10/18/2011 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 text entry
    MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), defendants Does 1-18 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice, and the remaining Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Heartbreaker Productions, Inc. of Remaining Doe Defendants Without Prejudice (Steele, John) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/22/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Heartbreaker Productions, Inc. of Certain Doe Defendants With Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Steele, John) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Terminate Hearings
          MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing date of 9/14/2011 is stricken. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: 8/22/2011 Notice of Change of Address
            NOTICE by John Steele of Change of Address (Steele, John) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 status hearing
              MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 8/16/2011. Status hearing set for 10/18/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Heartbreaker Productions, Inc. of Certain Doe Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Steele, John) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011 Motion Hearing
                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 8/4/2011. Reply in support of defendant's motion 12 to quash subpoena is due by 8/25/2011. Status hearing set for 9/14/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Notice of Motion
                    CORRECTED NOTICE of Motion by Mark Daniel Roth for presentment of before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/4/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Letter
                      LETTER from Sharon Casares dated 6/24/2011. (Exhibit) (lp, ) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                        RESPONSE in opposition to 12 (Steele, John) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011 Notice of Motion
                          NOTICE of Motion by Mark Daniel Roth for presentment of before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/14/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011 Motion to Quash
                            MOTION by Defendant John Doe (IP Address: 98.206.75.102 to quash Subpoena Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(C)(3) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Roth, Mark) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011 Attorney Appearance
                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe (IP Address: 98.206.75.102 by Mark Daniel Roth (Roth, Mark) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe (IP Address: 71.194.15.55) by Mark E. Wiemelt (Wiemelt, Mark) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Order
                                  ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/5/2011:(lp, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Order on Motion to Expedite
                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman:Plaintiff's motion 5 to expedite is granted. [For further detail see separate order.]Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Set/Reset Hearings
                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing is set for 8/16/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Notice of Motion
                                        NOTICE of Motion by John Steele for presentment of motion to expedite 5 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/5/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Steele, John) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Motion to Expedite
                                          MOTION by Plaintiff Heartbreaker Productions, Inc. to expedite Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Steele, John) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 Certificate
                                            CERTIFICATE of Disclosure (Steele, John) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Heartbreaker Productions, Inc. by John Steele (Steele, John) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 civil cover sheet
                                                CIVIL Cover Sheet (Steele, John) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT filed by Heartbreaker Productions, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5950575. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Steele, John) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 417 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?