Barnes v. Zaccari et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00077
District Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 11:34 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas Hayden Barnes, Plaintiff

Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggins Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2010 Irma I. Espino +1 404 659 2880 irma@wigginslawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cary Stephen Wiggins +1 404 659 2880 cary@wigginslawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Board Of Regents Of The University System Of Georgia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Devon Orland +1 404 656 3356 dorland@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 06/25/2008 Tamara Jeanne Wayland +1 404 463 8850 twayland@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Royal Washburn Will

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Hance +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 hhance@royallaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Will +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 dwill@royallaw.net
No Logo Kurt Keppler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Devon Orland +1 404 656 3356 dorland@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 06/25/2008 Tamara Jeanne Wayland +1 404 463 8850 twayland@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Royal Washburn Will

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Hance +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 hhance@royallaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Will +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 dwill@royallaw.net
No Logo Laverne Gaskins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Devon Orland +1 404 656 3356 dorland@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 06/25/2008 Tamara Jeanne Wayland +1 404 463 8850 twayland@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Robert Smith +1 202 663 6117 +1 202 663 6363 david.smith@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Leah McMillian, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daley, Koster & Lavallee, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Robert Koster +1 678 213 2401 +1 678 213 2406 prkoster@dkllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R. LaVallee +1 678 213 2401 mlavallee@dkllaw.com
No Logo Ronald M. Zaccari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2008 Tamara Jeanne Wayland +1 404 463 8850 twayland@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Devon Orland +1 404 656 3356 dorland@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Royal Washburn Will

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Hance +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 hhance@royallaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Will +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 dwill@royallaw.net
No Logo Russ Mast, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Devon Orland +1 404 656 3356 dorland@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 06/25/2008 Tamara Jeanne Wayland +1 404 463 8850 twayland@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Royal Washburn Will

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Hance +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 hhance@royallaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Will +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 dwill@royallaw.net
No Logo Valdosta State University, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Devon Orland +1 404 656 3356 dorland@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 06/25/2008 Tamara Jeanne Wayland +1 404 463 8850 twayland@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Royal Washburn Will

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Hance +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 hhance@royallaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Will +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 dwill@royallaw.net
No Logo Victor Morgan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/24/2009 Devon Orland +1 404 656 3356 dorland@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 06/25/2008 Tamara Jeanne Wayland +1 404 463 8850 twayland@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Royal Washburn Will

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Hance +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 hhance@royallaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Will +1 770 814 8022 +1 770 814 8360 dwill@royallaw.net
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (280) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 280 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Remark
Acknowledgment of receipt of depositions by Clerk USDC MD/GA, Valdosta re 279 Letter on 1/14/2013 (adg) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Letter
    Letter to the Clerk of Court, USDC MD/GA, Valdosta regarding the transmittal of the original depositions. (adg) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Order on Motion to Transfer Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 277 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
          LREF
          Blank 276 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Objection
            LREF
            Blank 275 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
              LREF
              Blank 274 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Appeal Record Returned
                Appeal Record Returned re: 249 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14622. (13 Vols of Pldgs w/1 filed under SEAL, 15 Depositions w/3 filed under SEAL and 8 Envelops of Exhibits filed under SEAL w/Pldg #'s; 136, 144, 164, 167, 177, 179, 194 and 232) (pjm) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 272 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT re 271 MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Georgia, Valdosta Division (Affidavit of Ronald M. Zaccari) by Ronald M. Zaccari. (Hance, Holly) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Motion to Transfer Case
                    MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Georgia, Valdosta Division with Brief In Support by Ronald M. Zaccari. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(Will, David) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER DIRECTING parties to confer and file a Joint Proposed Pretrial Order on or before 6/21/2012. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 6/6/2012. (adg) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 USCA MandateCourt Filing
                        ORDER making the USCA mandate the judgment of this Court re 249 Notice of Appeal, Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 10-14622-BB. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 6/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Remittitur Notice)(adg) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 USCA Judgment
                          Certified copy of JUDGMENT of USCA AFFIRMING IN PART, REVERSING IN PART, and REMANDING the decision of the District Court re: 249 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 10-14622. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Bill of Costs, # 2 Proposed Mandate Order) (jtj) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 267 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 USCA Opinion
                            USCA Opinion received re: 249 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia. In accordance with FRAP 41(b), the USCA mandate will issue at a later date. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14622-BB. (pjm) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                              LREF
                              Blank 266 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                              NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re: 249 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14622-BB. (pjm) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: 249 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14622-BB. (13 Vols of Pldgs w/1 filed under SEAL, 15 Depositions w/3 filed under SEAL and 8 Envelops of Exhibits filed under SEAL w/Pldg #'s; 136, 144, 164, 167, 177, 179, 194 and 232) (pjm) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 Forthwith letter
                                  FORTHWITH LETTER from USCA re: 249 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14622-BB. Appeal Record due by 4/14/2011. (pjm) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 USCA Order
                                    Certified copy of USCA ORDER DISMISSING 255 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes for lack of jurisdiction. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14831-BB. (pjm) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 USCA Acknowledgment (other)
                                      USCA Acknowledgment of Certificate of Readiness re: 249 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald M. Zaccari and the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14622-BB. (pjm) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Certificate of Readiness Transmission
                                        Certified copy of CERTIFICATE OF READINESS transmitted to USCA re: 249 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14622-BB. (pjm) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Transcript Order Form
                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (No Hrgs) re: 249 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14622-BB. Certificate of Readiness due on 11/15/2010. (pjm) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 259 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 USCA Acknowledgment
                                            USCA Acknowledgment of 255 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14831-BB. (pjm) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 258 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)Court Filing
                                              ORDER DENYING 248 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 10/26/2010. (adg) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 257 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Reply Brief
                                                REPLY BRIEF re 248 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Leah McMillian. (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 256 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                  Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 255 Notice of Cross Appeal. (pjm) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 255 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Notice of cross-appeal
                                                    NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 244 Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Oral Argument, by Thomas Hayden Barnes. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E-2945390. Transcript Order Form due on 10/25/2010 (Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 10/15/2010 to correct docket text (mlh). (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 254 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Response - non motion
                                                      RESPONSE re 251 Bill of Costs filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 253 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 USCA Acknowledgment
                                                        USCA Acknowledgment of 249 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 10-14622-BB. (pjm) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 252 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 248 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 251 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Bill of Costs
                                                            BILL OF COSTS by Laverne Gaskins. (Smith, David) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                              Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 249 Notice of Appeal. (pjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2010: # 1 Corrected NOA Trans) (pjm). (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 249 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Notice of Appeal
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 244 Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Ronald M. Zaccari. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E-2927666. Transcript Order Form due on 10/15/2010 (Will, David) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 ~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
                                                                  MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) with Brief In Support by Leah McMillian. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 247 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER DENYING 245 Motion for Reconsideration ; DENYING 245 Motion for a Certificate of Interlocutory Appeal under 1292(b). Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 9/15/2010. (adg) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 246 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Leave of Absence
                                                                      Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 11/24-26/10, 12/23-31/10, 02/18-25/11, and 03/07-11/11, by Matthew R. LaVallee. (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 245 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 244 Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Oral Argument, and MOTION for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal with Brief In Support by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 9/14/2010 to correct motion type (mlh). (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 244 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER DENYING 175 Motion for Oral Argument; GRANTING 167 Motion for Summary Judgment by Leah McMillan; GRANTING 174 Motion for Summary Judgment by Laverne Gaskin; DISMISSES VSU as a defendant in this action; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 177 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 179 Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas Hayden Barnes; DISMISSING as moot 164 Motion to Exclude. Having resolved all pending claims in this lawsuit as a matter of law, the only remaining issue in this case is damages. The court directs the parties to file their proposed pre-trial order no later than 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 9/3/2010. (adg) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 243 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                            Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Cary Stephen Wiggins replacing attorney Irma I. Espino. (Wiggins, Cary) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Leave of Absence
                                                                              Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6, 2010, by Matthew R. LaVallee. (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Notice of E-filing Requirement
                                                                                NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to Lisa Beth Zycherman re 240 Notice of Change of Address. (adg) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address for Robert Corn-Revere, Christopher A. Fedeli, Erin Nedenia Reid, Lisa Beth Zycherman, counsel for Thomas Hayden Barnes (adg) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Response - non motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE re 235 Reply Brief, Opposition to VSU Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Original Discovery filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 238 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Leave of Absence
                                                                                      Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 13-14, May 17-18, May 27-28, May 31, 2010, by Robert Corn-Revere. (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast re 235 Reply Brief, TO DISREGARD "EXHIBIT REPLY-1" (Hance, Holly) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 236 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Response - non motion
                                                                                          REPLY to Response re 167 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Leah McMillian. (LaVallee, Matthew) Modified on 4/13/2010 to correct docket text to accurately reflect e-filed document (adg). (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 235 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Reply Brief
                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply-1, # 2 Depo Excerpt - Neely, # 3 Objections to Plaintifff's Exh. H of Doc. #224-10 (Transcription of VSU Communications Bd. Meeting), # 4 Depo Excerpt - Mast)(Hance, Holly) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 234 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                NOTICE by Thomas Hayden Barnes re 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Espino, Irma) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/8/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Manual Filing Sealed Exhibits attached to Plaintiff's 179 Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas Hayden Barnes . (Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 4/9/2010 to link to correct docket entry (adg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2010: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13, # 5 Exhibit 14, # 6 Exhibit 17, # 7 Exhibit 20) (adg). (EXHIBITS FILED UNDER SEAL ) . (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/8/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits 1 through 57 attached to Plaintiff's 179 Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas Hayden Barnes .(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 15, # 11 Exhibit 16, # 12 Exhibit 18, # 13 Exhibit 19, # 14 Exhibit 21, # 15 Exhibit 22, # 16 Exhibit 23, # 17 Exhibit 24, # 18 Exhibit 25, # 19 Exhibit 26, # 20 Exhibit 27, # 21 Exhibit 28, # 22 Exhibit 29, # 23 Exhibit 30, # 24 Exhibit 31, # 25 Exhibit 32, # 26 Exhibit 33, # 27 Exhibit 34, # 28 Exhibit 35, # 29 Exhibit 36, # 30 Exhibit 37, # 31 Exhibit 38, # 32 Exhibit 39, # 33 Exhibit 40, # 34 Exhibit 41, # 35 Exhibit 42, # 36 Exhibit 43, # 37 Exhibit 44, # 38 Exhibit 45, # 39 Exhibit 46, # 40 Exhibit 47, # 41 Exhibit 48, # 42 Exhibit 49, # 43 Exhibit 50, # 44 Exhibit 51, # 45 Exhibit 52, # 46 Exhibit 53, # 47 Exhibit 54, # 48 Exhibit 55, # 49 Exhibit 56, # 50 Exhibit 57)(Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 4/9/2010 to link to correct docket entry (adg). (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: 4/2/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER the court DIRECTS the plaintiff to withdraw all 57 exhibits to the 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Then, the plaintiff is DIRECTED to electronically file all of the exhibits to the MSJ that were not designated to be sealed.Finally, the court DIRECTS the plaintiff to file the remaining exhibits to the MSJ that were designated to be sealed with the clerk. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 4/2/2010. (adg) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: 4/2/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 228 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 4/2/2010. (adg) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as a Consolidated Brief in Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            Notice of filing of transcript taken of November 17, 2006 Valdosta State University Communications Board Meeting, filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes in support of 224 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. (Audio recording received and placed in file). (adg) Modified on 11/3/2010 to correct text(pjm). (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 226 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Response - non motion
                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 212 Order,,,, filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Reid, Erin) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 225 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT re 224 Response to Motion, by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 224 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 List of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 223 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Response to Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                    Response to Statement of Material Facts re 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 222 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support filed by Leah McMillian. (Attachments: # 1 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 221 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Original Discovery and Electronic Media by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 220 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 164 MOTION to Exclude Dr. Matthew Norman as an Expert Witness filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 3)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 219 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast re 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit 30 to MSJ)(Hance, Holly) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 218 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Response to Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                              Response to Statement of Material Facts re 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Laverne Gaskins. (Smith, David) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 217 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Laverne Gaskins. (Smith, David) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 216 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R-MSJ 1, # 2 Exhibit R-MSJ 2, # 3 Barnes Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Daniels Depo. Excerpts, # 5 Keppler Depo. Excerpts, # 6 Mast Depo. Excerpts, # 7 Tanner Depo. Excerpts, # 8 Gaskins Depo. Excerpts, # 9 Neely Depo. Excerpts, # 10 Zaccari Depo. Excerpts, # 11 McMillan Depo. Excerpts, # 12 Morgan Depo. Excerpts, # 13 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Hance, Holly) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 215 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 214 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 3/24/2010. (adg) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 214 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as a Consolidated Brief In Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 213 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to seal Exhibit 1 re 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 3/19/2010. (adg) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 212 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER regarding documents filed by parties in this case. On 2/18/2010, the court directed the plaintiff to refile an accurate and more precise list of the particular documents that he wished to remain under seal in this matter ; On 3/4/2010, the plaintiff filed his responses, specifying documents he wished to remain sealed. The Court issued and order directing the Clerk to execute the Court's ruling. While executing the Court's Order, the Clerk discovered yet another discrepancy in the plaintiff's filing of exhibits. Accordingly, the court strongly encourages the parties to verify, once again, that they have properly and accurately filed all of their motions for summary judgment and exhibits thereto within 7 days of the date of this order. Furthermore, the court DIRECTS the plaintiff to submit a brief, within 7 days of the date of this order, that explains the discrepancies found regarding Exhibit 11 and any other errors. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 3/18/2010. (adg) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: 3/17/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to keep the documents as outlined in the Order filed under seal; to file under seal Exhibits 12, 13, 14, 17, and 20 to the Plaintiff's 179 Motion for Summary Judgment (as previously provided to chambers for review) and file without seal Exhibits 15, 16, 18, and 19 to said motion; and to unseal all other documents currently filed under seal, if not specifically designated for sealing in the Order. The Parties are no longer permitted to electronically submit protective orders to the Court that allow matters to be filed under seal; motions to file under seal shall be submitted first to chambers and the party shall enter a notice to that effect on the docket. The Court will forward any granted motions to file under seal and accompanying material to be sealed to the Clerk. The Parties are DIRECTED regarding case deadlines as follows: courtesy copies of the 167 , 174 , 177 , and 179 Motions for Summary Judgment shall be provided to chambers, and all responses to said motions shall be filed, both within 7 days of the date of this Order; all reply briefs to be filed thereafter in accordance with the NDGa LR. Courtesy copies of all responses/replies containing confidential material shall also be provided. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 3/17/2010. (alc) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 208 Order For A Revised Part III Of Plaintiff's Brief On The Parties' Protective Order filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Reid, Erin) Modified on 3/5/2010 to correct docket text (adg). (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Leave of Absence
                                                                                                                                                Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 2, June 3 and June 4, 2010, by Matthew R. LaVallee. (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 201 Order directing plaintiff to file a brief in support of sealing documents, the court DIRECTS the plaintiff to re-file an accurate and more precise Part III of the brief within 14 days of the date of this order. The court strongly encourages the plaintiff to identify with particularitythe documents that he wishes to remain sealed by electronic docketing number, verify that the exhibit is actually filed with the court, and then ensure that he has not requested that an exhibit remain under seal as a part of one document but not as a part of another document. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 2/18/2010. (adg) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 207 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Response to Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                    Response to Statement of Material Facts re 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Laverne Gaskins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A - 4/26/2007 e-mail exchange)(Smith, David) Modified on 2/2/2010 to remove double wording (adg). (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 206 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Laverne Gaskins. (Smith, David) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 205 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 201 Order For Briefing On The Parties' Protective Order filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Reid, Erin) Modified on 2/2/2010 to remove excess wording (adg). (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Electronic Media by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast re 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (DVD placed in file) (adg) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast re 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment ELECTRONIC MEDIA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 42)(Hance, Holly) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts Statement of Disputed Issues of Material Fact, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A thru J)(Zycherman, Lisa) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 201 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: telephone conference held 1/13/2010. The Court DIRECTS the parties not to w/draw their pending motions. The Court DIRECTS the pla to file a 3-part brief (as outlined in the this order) w/the court w/in 14 days of the date of this order. All deadlines pertaining to sealed s.j. motions as outlined in this order are suspended. Deadlines as to S.J. motion [doc. 174] are as follows: response briefs due 1/19/2010 and reply brief due 14 days later. (See order for specific details) Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 1/14/2010. (yrm) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 200 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 1/13/2010 re: 164 Motion to Exclude 167 , 174 , 177 and 179 Motions for Summary Judgment. Conference held regarding sealed motions. How to eliminate so many motions being filed under seal. Court heard from counsel. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Martha Frutchey) (bse) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 199 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER regarding the parties' Motion to Seal documents and the Court's 196 Order: All filing deadlines in case are SUSPENDED. The Court will hold a telephone conference on Wednesday, January 13, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. to discuss the issue of filing documents under seal in this case. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel for each of the parties in this case to contact the Court at (404)215-1580 no later than Wednesday, January 13, 2010, at 10:00 a.m., to provide a telephone number for where they can be reached at the time of the telephone conference and the name of the party they represent. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 1/12/2010. (ank) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION of DR. KEVIN WINDERS taken on July 31, 2009 by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL ) (adg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2010: # 1 Exhibits) (adg). Modified on 1/14/2010 (adg). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION of THOMAS HAYDEN BARNES taken on June 25, 2009 by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL ) (adg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2010: # 1 Deposition of Thomas Hayden Barnes (cont.), # 2 Exhibits) (adg). Modified on 1/14/2010 (adg). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 163 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal; GRANTING 176 Motion to Seal; GRANTING 178 Motion to Seal Document ; GRANTING 191 Motion to Seal; GRANTING 193 Motion to Seal. Based upon the abuse of the right to file documents under seal, the court hereby ORDERS that the parties are no longer permitted to electronically submit protective orders to the court that allow matters to be filed with the clerk of the court under seal. Instead, if a party has very good cause to request sealing, the party shall first present to Judge Pannell's chambers a sufficiently supported motion to file under seal. Further, the party shall indicate by entry of a NOTICE on the CM/ECF docket that a motion to seal has been presented to the chambers. Attached to the motion should be the material desired to be sealed. The court will then review the material in camera and make a decision whether to grant or deny the motion to seal. If the court determines that the motion is to be granted, the court will forward the signed motion and accompanying materials to the clerk of thecourt for entry of the motion on CM/ECF docket and appropriate filing of the sealed materials. If the court determines that the motion is to be denied, then the court will contact the filing party, which may then retrieve the motion/materials and determine whether it wants to file the document without a seal. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 1/7/2010. (adg) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Leave of Absence
                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 8 - 12, 2010, and May 28 - June 1, 2010, by Matthew R. LaVallee. (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 164 MOTION to Exclude Dr. Matthew Norman as an Expert Witness filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Notice of Filing of) - Dr. Norman, # 2 Affidavit of Dr. Norman, # 3 Deposition Excerpt - McMillan, # 4 Deposition Excerpt - Dr. Winders, # 5 Exhibit N-1, # 6 Exhibit N-2, # 7 Exhibit N-3, # 8 Exhibit N-4, # 9 Exhibit N-5, # 10 Exhibit N-6, # 11 Exhibit N-7, # 12 Exhibit N-8, # 13 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit N-9)(Hance, Holly) Modified on 1/6/2010 (adg). Modified on 3/17/2010 to modify sealed restrictions as directed per 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Motion to Seal (misc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motoin to Exclude Dr. Norman as an Expert by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (Hance, Holly) Modified on 1/6/2010 to correct docket text (adg). (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Original Deposition Transcript of Dr. Kevin Winders by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast (Will, David) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Motion to Seal (misc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (Will, David) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 190 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION of Dr. RONALD ZACCARI taken on July 29, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document, Part 2 of 2, # 2 Exhibits). (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION of Dr. KIMBERLY TANNER taken on July 27, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                          DEPOSITION of ELIZABETH EVANS NEELY taken on July 2, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                            (FILED UNDER SEAL) DEPOSITION of LEAH McMILLAN, LMFT taken on July 1, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (dfb) (Attachments: # 1 Main Document, Part 2 of 2, # 2 Exhibits) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                              DEPOSITION of RUSS MAST taken on July 28, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                DEPOSITION of RICHARD LEE, SR. taken on July 27, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (dfb) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION of Dr. KURT J. KEPPLER taken on July 28, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION of LAVERNE GASKINS, Esq. taken on June 12, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION of Major ANN FARMER taken on July 8, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION of Chief HOWARD SCOTT DONER taken on July 8, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 180 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEPOSITION of LINDA DANIELS taken on July 2, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (dfb) Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in Support by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (vs) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2009: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts) (vs). Modified on 12/29/2009 (vs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2009: # 2 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1-5, # 4 Exhibits 6-8, # 6 Exhibits 27-36, # 7 Exhibits 37-49, # 8 Exhibits 50-57) (vs). Modified on 12/29/2009 (vs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2010: # 9 Exhibits 9-10, 21-26, # 10 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 11 # 11 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhbit 12, # 12 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 13, # 13 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19, # 19 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 20) (fmm). Modified on 3/17/2010 Modified on 3/17/2010 to modify sealed restrictions as directed per 211 Order (fmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2010: # 20 Exhibit 1 (FILED UNDER SEAL ), # 21 Exhibit 2, # 22 Exhibit 3, # 23 Exhibit 4, # 24 Exhibit 5) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document re Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(vs) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Brief, # 3 Exhibit Index, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 17, # 21 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 18, # 22 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29, # 33 Exhibit 30, # 34 Exhibit 31, # 35 Exhibit 32, # 36 Exhibit 33, # 37 Exhibit 34, # 38 Exhibit 35, # 39 Exhibit 36, # 40 Exhibit 37, # 41 Exhibit 38, # 42 Exhibit 39, # 43 Exhibit 40, # 44 Affidavit Notice of Filing of, # 45 Affidavit Zaccari, # 46 Affidavit Mast, # 47 Affidavit Keppler, # 48 Index of Depo Excerpts, # 49 McMillan Depo Excerpts, # 50 Farmer Depo Excerpts, # 51 Morgan Depo Excerpts, # 52 Barnes Depo Excerpts, # 53 Gaskins Depo Excerpts, # 54 Norman Depo Excerpts, # 55 Request for Oral Argument, # 56 Notice of Filing of Original Deposition - Barnes)(Hance, Holly) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 12/24/2009 (fmm). Modified on 3/17/2010 to modify sealed restrictions as directed per 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Motion to Seal (misc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Subsequently Filed (Same Day) - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Accompanying Documents by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (Hance, Holly) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Motion for Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Oral Argument re 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Laverne Gaskins. (Smith, David) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Laverne Gaskins. (Attachments: # 1 notice of motion, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Statement of Material Facts Stmt of Undisputed Facts, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits Submitted in Support of MSJ, # 5 Exhibit Exhs. A-D to Exhs. to MSJ)(Smith, David) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Request to File Original Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request to File Original Discovery by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEPOSITION of DR. VICTOR MORGAN taken on July 14, 2009 by Leah McMillian. (adg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2009: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (adg). Modified on 12/30/2009 (adg). Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEPOSITION of DR. JOHN GROTGEN taken on July 14, 2009 by Leah McMillian. (adg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2009: # 1 Main Document, # 2 Exhibit 1) (adg). Modified on 12/30/2009 (adg). Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Amanda Tillman in Support re 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Leah McMillian. (adg). Modified on 12/30/2009 (adg). Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Leah McMillan in Support re 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Leah McMillian. (adg). Modified on 12/30/2009 (adg). Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Original Discovery by Leah McMillian. (adg). Modified on 12/30/2009 (adg). Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support and Statement of Material Facts by Leah McMillian. (adg) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2009: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts) (adg). Modified on 12/30/2009 (adg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2010: # 3 Motion with Exhibits - Redacted, # 4 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit A-1, # 5 FILED UNDER SEAL Part of Exhibit B) (fmm). Modified on 3/17/2010 to modify sealed restrictions as directed per 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/23/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 161 Motion to Dismiss Victor Morgan without prejudice. It is further Ordered that all other claims against the other defendants are not subject to this order and remain pending. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 12/22/2009. (adg) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 162 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 12/22/2009. (adg) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Exclude Dr. Matthew Norman as an Expert Witness with Memorandum of Law In Support by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (adg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2009: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H) (adg). Modified on 12/21/2009 (adg). Modified on 3/17/2010 to modify sealed restrictions as directed per 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Matthew Norman Under Sealby Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(adg) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Victor Morgan by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Order on Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 158 Motion for Clarification, neither Lukianoff nor ONeil willbe permitted to testify in this matter. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 12/4/2009. (adg) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 157 Notice to Take Deposition Response to Request for Production of Documents in the Notice of Deposition of Dr. Norman by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast.(Hance, Holly) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Clarification re: 156 Order on Motion to Exclude,,,,,,, by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Matthew W. Norman, M.D. filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 142 Motion to Exclude the expert reports and testimony ofGregory M. Lukianoff and Robert M. ONeil; DENYING 139 Motion to Exclude the expert report and testimony of Matthew W. Norman; Additionally, the courthereby RE-OPENS discovery for 45 days from the date of this order for the limited purpose of taking the deposition of Norman. Furthermore, in light of the court's 150 Order directing the parties to submit their motions for summary judgment within seven days of the court's ruling on the exclusion motions, thecourt orders that the parties shall now have 20 days from the date the Norman deposition transcript is available to submit their motions from summary judgment, but not later than 1/4/2010.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 10/22/2009. (adg) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Response - non motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 149 Objections to Attorney Fees and Expenses Related to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 10/1/2009 to correct docket text (adg). (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 142 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Gregory M. Lukianoff and Robert M. O'Neil filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Hance, Holly) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF in Support of 139 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Matthew W. Norman, M.D. filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (adg). Modified on 9/15/2009 (adg). Modified on 3/17/2010 to remove seal as directed by 211 Order(fmm). (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Filing Plaintiff's Reply Under Seal by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 9/15/2009 to remove unnecessary document link (adg). (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 142 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Gregory M. Lukianoff and Robert M. O'Neil filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibits A and B, # 4 Exhibits C & D)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 138 Motion to Seal. DENYING 145 Motion for Extension of Time. In considering the plaintiff's motion, the court notes that itpreviously granted an extension of time to file motions for summaryjudgment until 9/15/2009. Plaintiff shall file his reply to the 139 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Matthew W. Norman, M.D. no later than 9/14/2009. Plaintiff shall file his response to 142 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Gregory M. Lukianoff and Robert M. O'Neil no later than 9/14/2009. Defendants shall file their reply to the 142 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Gregory M. Lukianoff and Robert M. O'Neil no later than 9/17/2009. The parties shall have seven days from the date this court rules on the cross motions to exclude expert reports and testimonyDoc. Nos. 139 and 142 to submit initial motions for summary judgment. Thereafter, all responses and replies shall be filed in accordance with the court's local rules.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 9/9/2009. (adg) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS re 147 Detailed Specification and Itemization of Requested Attorney Fees by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan , (Hance, Holly) Modified on 9/11/2009 to correct docket text to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (rvb). (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 146 Motion to Seal Defendants Response In Opposition Re: Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Matthew W. Norman, M.D. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court place under seal Docket # 144 . Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 9/8/2009. (adg) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Detailed Specification and Itemization of Requested Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Detailed Specification and Itemization of Requested Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Robert Corn-Revere Setting Forth Amount of Fees and Expenses Related to Plaintiff's Filing of His Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Motion to Seal (misc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Defendants Response in Opposition Re: Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Matthew W. Norman, M.D. by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Parties to Submit Summary Judgment Motions re: 131 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 139 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Matthew W. Norman, M.D. filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (Attachments: # 1 Oral Argument Requested, # 2 Brief, # 3 FILED UNDER SEAL Excerpt - Deposition Dr. Winders)(Hance, Holly) Modified on 9/3/2009 (Restricted access pending Court ruling on 146 Motion to Seal) (adg). Modified on 9/8/2009 (adg). Modified on 3/17/2010 to modify sealed restrictions as directed per 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan re 142 MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Gregory M. Lukianoff and Robert M. O'Neil (Attachments: # 1 Lukianoff - Expert Report and CV, # 2 O'Neil - Expert Report and CV, # 3 Lukianoff - Depo Excerpt, # 4 O'Neil - Depo Excerpt)(Will, David) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Gregory M. Lukianoff and Robert M. O'Neil with Brief In Support by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(Will, David) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valdosta State University.(Hance, Holly) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 135 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 25 pages in support of her Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 08/21/2009. (rvb) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Matthew W. Norman, M.D. with Brief In Support by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Matthew W. Norman, M.D.)(Wiggins, Cary) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Motion to Seal (misc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Docket 136 due to Protective Order by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast. (Hance, Holly) Modified on 8/21/2009 to add document link (rvb). (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT FILED IN VIOLATION OF L.R. 5.4A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 124 Certificate of Service of VSU's Response to Defendant McMillan's 1st Request for Production to Defendant VSU by Valdosta State University.(Hance, Holly) Modified on 8/19/2009 to change document security (rvb). (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast.(Hance, Holly) Modified on 8/19/2009 to change access to pleading until Motion to Seal is granted by the Court (tcc). Modified on 8/21/2009 to add sealed text (rvb). Modified on 3/17/2010 (fmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2010: # 1 Supplemental Initial Disclosures - Redacted, # 2 FILED UNDER SEAL Attachment B) (fmm). Modified on 3/17/2010 to modify sealed restrictions as directed per 211 Order (fmm). (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Leah McMillian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Permission to Exceed Page Limit)(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 133 Motion for Leave to File a Brief in excess of 25 pages in support of his Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 8/17/2009. (tcc) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Laverne Gaskins. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Def. Gaskins Permission to File Brief in Excess of 25 Pages)(Smith, David) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 129 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 8/10/2009. (adg) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 130 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/15/2009 for parties to submit motions for summary judgment; 10/5/20009 for responses, and 10/19/2009 for replies. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 8/10/2009. (adg) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Submit Motions For Summary Judgment by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order to Extend Time To Submit Motions for Summary Judgment)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Permission To Exceed Page Limit)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 125 Motion to Seal subpoenas Doc. Nos. 120 , 121 , 122 , and 123 . Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 8/5/2009. (adg) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 126 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in brief in support of motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 8/4/2009. (adg) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Hance, Holly) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Motion to Seal (misc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Hance, Holly) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Valdosta State University by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan.(Hance, Holly) Modified on 8/5/2009 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL)(adg). (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan.(Hance, Holly) Modified on 8/5/2009 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (adg). (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan.(Hance, Holly) Modified on 8/5/2009 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) (adg). (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan.(Hance, Holly) Modified on 8/5/2009 (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL)(adg). (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Supplemental Document Production in Response to Defendant Leah McMillan's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan.(Hance, Holly) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan.(Hance, Holly) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ronald Zaccari filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kimberly Tanner filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Russ Mast filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Lee filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kurt Keppler filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kelly Burke filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan (Hance, Holly) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Kevin Winders filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan (Hance, Holly) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Greg Lukianoff filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan (Will, David) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert M. O'Neil filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan (Will, David) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valdosta State University.(Will, David) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to take deposition of Victor Morgan taken on July 14, 2009 by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) Modified on 7/8/2009 docket text corrected to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (rvb). (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to take deposition of John F. Grotgen, Ph.D., L.P.C. on July 14, 2009 by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) Modified on 7/8/2009 docket text corrected to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (rvb). (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Third Supplemental Discovery Responses by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Doner filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to take deposition of Elizabeth Neely on July 2, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 6/26/2009 to correct docket text to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (rvb). (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to take deposition of Linda Daniels on July 2, 2009 by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 6/26/2009 to correct docket text to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (rvb). (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Hayden Barnes filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan (Will, David) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice to Take Deposition of Ann Farmer by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Hayden Barnes filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan (Will, David) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: 6/18/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valdosta State University.(Will, David) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: 6/18/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia.(Will, David) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: 6/18/2009 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 06/18/2009. (rvb) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: 6/18/2009 Leave of Absence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 08/03/09-08/07/09, by Matthew R. LaVallee. (LaVallee, Matthew) Modified on 6/19/2009 to clarify dates of absence (rvb). (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Consent Protective Order to protect confidentiality of discovery documents by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald M. Zaccari.(Will, David) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Russ Mast.(Will, David) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kurt Keppler.(Will, David) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Second Supplemental Discovery Responses by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laverne Gaskins.(Smith, David) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 79 Motion to Compel and granting 79 Motion for Sanctions. Defendants Zacari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Keppler, and Mast are directed to respond without objection to the interrogatories and request to produce within 10 days of this order. Failure to comply will result in sanctions that may include striking the defendants' answer and entry of default. Additionally, the Court finds monetary sanctions are warranted. The Court will award attorneys fees and expenses related to the filing of the motion to compel. Counsel for Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit an affidavit setting forth the amount of fees and expenses related to filing the motion.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 06/04/2009. (rvb) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Proposed Order re 79 MOTION to Compel discovery MOTION for Sanctions by Thomas Hayden Barnes(Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 6/3/2009 to correct docket text to accurately reflect e-file pleading (rvb). (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Leah McMillan filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Laverne Gaskins filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 82 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Erin Nedenia Reid. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 05/22/2009. (rvb) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESUBMISSION OF APPLICATION for Admission of Erin Nedenia Reid Pro Hac Vice 81 APPLICATION for Admission of Erin Nedenia Reid Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002159769) by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Wiggins, Cary) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Erin Nedenia Reid Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002159769)by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Wiggins, Cary) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDOCKETED #78 MOTION AS MOTION to Compel discovery, MOTION for Sanctions with Brief In Support by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (rvb) Modified on 5/11/2009 to correct docket text to accurately reflect e-file pleading (rvb). (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT FILING ERROR MOTION to Compel Discovery and Request for Sanctions with Brief In Support by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 5/11/2009 (rvb). (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/7/2009 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 60 Motion for Order to allow discovery of Plaintiff's Medical and Mental Health Record. The court GRANTS thedefendants' motion to allow discovery of all of the plaintiff's mental health records. The court DIRECTS Barnes to provide the defendants with the documentation necessary to authorize any mental health provider who has treated him to release and disclose to the defendants any mental health records of thetreatment rendered. The court DENIES the defendants' motion to allow discovery of all of the plaintiff's medical records. The court DISMISSES as moot 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 05/07/2009. (rvb) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery through 8/1/2009, but no more. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 5/1/2009. (adg) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Thomas Hayden Barnes, Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Leah McMillian. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Consent Motion to Extend Discovery and Proposed Order)(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Laverne Gaskins.(adg) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Supplemental Discovery Responses by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Regarding Responsive Documents sent to Leah McMillan by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 68 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cristina Correia and Devon Orland terminated. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 3/24/2009. (gar) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Leave of Absence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 9/10-11/09, 10/8-9/09, 11/25-27/09, 12/23-31/09, 02/21-26/10, by Matthew R. LaVallee. (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw Cristina Correia and Devon Orland as Attorney by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Correia, Cristina) Modified on 3/23/ 2009 to correct docket text (adg). (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Smith on behalf of Laverne Gaskins (Smith, David) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 60 MOTION for Order MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Leah McMillian. (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Hance on behalf of Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan (Hance, Holly) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Will on behalf of Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan (Will, David) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Order MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Leah McMillan's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDOCKETED #59 MOTION AS MOTION for Order to Allow Discovery of Plaintiff's Medical and Mental Health Records and for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Leah McMillian, Victor Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Allowing Discovery of Plaintiff's Medical and Mental, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(gar) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCUMENT FILING ERROR MOTION for Discovery of Plaintiff's Medical and Mental Health Records with Brief In Support by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Leah McMillian, Victor Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Allowing Discovery of Plaintiff's Medical and Mental Health Records, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Correia, Cristina) Modified on 2/20/2009 (gar). (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Valdosta State University by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Ronald M. Zaccari by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Leah McMillan by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Russ Mast by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Kurt Keppler by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant La Verne Gaskins by Thomas Hayden Barnes.(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 48 Application for Admission of Christopher A. Fedeli Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 1/8/2009. (gar) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER approving the 45 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan except as herein modified: Daubert motions with regard to expert testimony shall be filed no later than 30 days after the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 1/7/2009. (gar) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher A. Fedeli Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001973911)by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Wiggins, Cary) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Initial Disclosures by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A - Witness List, # 2 Attachment B - Expert Witness List)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Initial Disclosures by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment C)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes, Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Leah McMillian, Victor Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Disclosures by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying both the plaintiff's 38 Motion for Reconsideration and Defendant McMillian's 40 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 12/12/2008. (gar) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Leah McMillian.(LaVallee, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief In Support of 40 MOTION for Reconsideration by Leah McMillian. (LaVallee, Matthew) Modified on 12/5/2008 to correct docket text to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (gar). (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration by Leah McMillian. (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan, Ronald M. Zaccari. Discovery ends on 5/3/2009.(Correia, Cristina) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/6/2009 to correct filer information(gar). (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 37 Order on Motion to Dismiss, with Brief In Support by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order, # 2 Affidavit Thomas Hayden Barnes, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Corn-Revere, Robert) Modified on 12/4/2008 to correct docket text(gar). (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 16 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 17 Motion to Dismiss.The defendants' answers are due pursuant to Rule 12(a)(4)(A) of the FRCP. DENYING 27 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 11/19/2008. (adg) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Thomas Hayden Barnes Local Rule 83.1E Certificate of Consent (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Thomas Hayden Barnes of Withdrawal of Counsel Brigham J. Bowen (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Cristina Correia replacing attorney Tamara Jeanne Wayland. (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Leah McMillian. (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 30 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment until 30 days after the Court's ruling on the defendants' 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 5/22/2008. (adg) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time through 5/27/2008 for Leah McMillan to file a Reply Brief in support of her 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 5/22/2008. (adg) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support Of their Motion For An Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment)(Wayland, Tamara) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Wayland, Tamara) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Leah McMillian. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koster, Paul) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C part 1, # 7 Exhibit C part 2, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O)(adg) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Originally contained in 25 Response in Opposition to Motion) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 5/7/2008. (adg) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss, 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C part 2, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit C part 1, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O)(Wiggins, Cary) Modified on 5/13/2008 (adg). (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiggins, Cary) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion for Extension of Time for plaintiff to respond to 16 MOTION to Dismiss and 17 MOTION to Dismiss until 5/2/2008; Rule 26(f) Conference 16 days from the filing of first answer; LR 16.2 Report due 30 days from filing of first answer; Initial Disclosures due 30 days from filing of first answer. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 4/28/2008. (adg) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend various Discovery Related Deadlines and to Respond re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss, 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiggins, Cary) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Extension of Time through 4/25/2008 for plaintiff to respond to the 16 MOTION to Dismiss and 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 4/22/2008. (adg) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Irma I. Espino on behalf of Thomas Hayden Barnes (Espino, Irma) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss, 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Thomas Hayden Barnes. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiggins, Cary) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defandants Zaccari, Gaskins, Keppler, Mast, Morgan, Valdosta State University, and the Board of Regents are permitted to file their brief in excess of the 25-page limitation, but shall not exceed 40 pages. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 4/9/2008. (adg) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Leah McMillian. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(Daley, Cynthia) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Their Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Defs' Brief in Support of Their Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Defs' Brief in Support of Their Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss)(Wayland, Tamara) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wayland, Tamara) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to 1 Complaint, Leah McMillian Answer due 4/1/2008. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 3/19/2008. (adg) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Leah McMillian. (Koster, Paul) Modified on 3/19/2008 to correct docket text (adg). (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, Ronald M. Zaccari Answer due 4/1/2008; Valdosta State University Answer due 4/1/2008; Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia Answer due 4/1/2008; Laverne Gaskins Answer due 4/1/2008; Kurt Keppler Answer due 4/1/2008; Russ Mast Answer due 4/1/2008; Victor Morgan Answer due 4/1/2008. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 3/7/2008. (adg) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading With Proposed Order by Ronald M. Zaccari, Valdosta State University, Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Laverne Gaskins, Kurt Keppler, Russ Mast, Victor Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wayland, Tamara) Modified on 3/7/2008 (adg). (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Robert Koster on behalf of Leah McMillian (Koster, Paul) Modified on 3/7/2008 (adg). (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. LaVallee on behalf of Leah McMillian (LaVallee, Matthew) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendants. Ronald M. Zaccari waiver mailed on 1/18/2008, answer due 3/18/2008; Valdosta State University waiver mailed on 1/18/2008, answer due 3/18/2008; Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia waiver mailed on 1/18/2008, answer due 3/18/2008; Laverne Gaskins waiver mailed on 1/18/2008, answer due 3/18/2008; Kurt Keppler waiver mailed on 1/18/2008, answer due 3/18/2008; Russ Mast waiver mailed on 1/18/2008, answer due 3/18/2008; Leah McMillian waiver mailed on 1/18/2008, answer due 3/18/2008; Victor Morgan waiver mailed on 1/18/2008, answer due 3/18/2008. (adg) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa Beth Zycherman. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 1/16/2008. (adg) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brigham J. Bowen. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 1/16/2008. (adg) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Corn-Revere. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr on 1/16/2008. (adg) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert Corn-Revere by Thomas Hayden Barnes.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #573148. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(epm) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brigham J. Bowen by Thomas Hayden Barnes.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #573148. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(epm) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Lisa Beth Zycherman by Thomas Hayden Barnes.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #573148. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(epm) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008, Terminated: 3/7/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Thomas Hayden Barnes. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 573148.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(epm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 242 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?