Dembling v. Winn
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10260
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paul Dembling, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Butters, Brazilian & Small LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Butters +1 617 367 2600 +1 617 367 1363 butters@buttersbrazilian.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Thompson +1 617 367 2600 +1 617 367 1363 thompson@buttersbrazilian.com
No Logo Warden David L. Winn, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA as to 10 Notice of Appeal, filed by David L. Winn. Upon consideration of appellant's assented-to motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (Mandate issued in the USCA 6/12/2007) (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
    USCA Case Number 07-1801 for 10 Notice of Appeal, filed by David L. Winn. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
      Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 10 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 8 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by David L. Winn NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 5/14/2007. (Grady, Mark) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT of Patrick Ward re 8 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by David L. Winn. (Grady, Mark) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered granting 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction "...The Court orders that within 10 calendar days of the date of this order, the BOP reconsider, in good faith....petitioner's placement in a community corrections center...." (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Response to Request for a Preliminary Injunction filed by David L. Winn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - CCC Program Statement)(Grady, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by David L. Winn.(Grady, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. "....counsel are ordered to appear for a hearingon 2-22-07 at 10 a.m. at the U. S. District Courthouse in SPRINGFIELD, MA...."(Johnson, Mary) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Paul Dembling. (Thompson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Paul Dembling. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott Richmond)(Thompson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                        PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Paul Dembling. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Judgment in a Criminal Case)(Thompson, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Butters on behalf of Paul Dembling (Butters, Thomas) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 106 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?