Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00193
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 25, 2016 at 11:39 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Intellectual Ventures, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Intellectual Ventures I LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Brian Plies +1 512 394 3012 +1 512 394 3001 jeff.plies@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph James Farnan, III +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 jjfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph James Farnan, III +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 jjfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
v.
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

No Logo Nextel Operations Inc., Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo SBC Internet Services Inc., Defendant

Represented by Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Charles Riopelle +1 804 775 1013

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Hershkowitz +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 bhershkowitz@gibsondunn.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Watkins +1 650 849 5249 awatkins@gibsondunn.com

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

No Logo Telephone And Data Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/10/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Fineman +1 302 658 6541 fineman@rlf.com
United States Cellular Corporation United States Cellular Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. O'Brien +1 413 499 5656 +1 413 445 4926 rjolaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Fineman +1 302 658 6541 fineman@rlf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William M. Chang +1 312 853 7000 bchang@sidley.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (624) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Responses and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Common Interrogatory Nos. 4-16 by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Third Supplemental Response and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Common Interrogatory No. 1 by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Alcatel-Lucent by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Subpoena (on Steve Putz) by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on July 24, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intervenor Sierra Wireless America Inc.'s Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Sierra Wireless America Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
              NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's First Amended Responses and Objections to IV's Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                Amended NOTICE of Subpoena to Michael J. Donohue, Esq. by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants' Fourth Amended Initial Disclosures and Paragraph 3 Disclosures by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures's Reponses and Objections to Defendants' Third 30(b)(6) Notice to Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I and Intellectual Ventures II filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 9/21/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Third Party Subpoenas (ACM) by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 9/21/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Angie Wiskocil on 9/21/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 9/21/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T's Supplemental Responses and Objections to IV's Third Set of Interrogatories to AT&T, and (ii) AT&T's First Amended Responses and Objections to IV's Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Subpoena on Nathaniel Borenstein by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Fifth Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                      [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Subpoena to The World Company by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Subpoena to Kelton Research, LLC by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of AT&T's First Supplemental Response and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Common Interrogatory No. 1 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (rpg). (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of SERVICE of Order of Hong Kong Court by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION Narrowing of Issues Between Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC and All Defendants by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY BRIEF re 458 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sixth Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC (No. 17-25) filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP.(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on September 2, 2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) The AT&T Defendants' First Set of Individual Interrogatories to Intellectual Ventures I and II; and (2) The AT&T Defendants' First Set of Request for Admissions to Intellectual Ventures I and II filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC.(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures' Second Set of Requests for Admission to AT&T and (ii) Intellectual Ventures' Sixth Set of Requests for Production to AT&T filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC on August 21, 2015 filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Fact Discovery by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Joint NOTICE of Subpoenas to McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena (Tim Godfrey) by Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoenas on Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to file their reply brief in support of their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to August 5, 2015 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants' Identification of Prior Art by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T's Responses and Objections to IV's Fifth Set of Requests for Production to AT&T, and (ii) AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Twelfth Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures' First Set of Requests for Admission to Sierra Wireless America Inc. filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to identify their selection of primary references/systems and combinations of references/systems pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Second Scheduling Order [C.A. No. 12-193, D.I. 537] to July 27, 2015 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of (340 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 573 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Letter,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-28)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena (on Roger Marks) by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert L. Masterson - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena to Broadcom Corp. by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the time for Defendants to file their reply brief in support of their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to July 29, 2015 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Subpoenas to The Regents of the University of California, c/o The Office of The General Counsel by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena to Carnegie Mellon University, Office of the General Counsel by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding discovery dispute - re (340 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Letter,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 29, # 2 Exhibit 30, # 3 Exhibit 31, # 4 Exhibit 32, # 5 Exhibit 33, # 6 Exhibit 34)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Joint NOTICE of Subpoena on Michael Donohue by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Third Party Subpoenas (Elsevier Inc.) by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Wayport Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Defendants T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile US, Inc.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoena and Deposition by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoena to Apex Venture Partners LLC by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Nathan Myhrvold by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to file their reply brief in support of their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to July 22, 2015 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Third Party Subpoenas (on Carl F. Andren, Larry Ciaccia and James Zyren by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 3)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 7/28/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 8/6/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoena by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 13, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 13, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3 of 13, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Part 4 of 13, # 5 Exhibit 1 - Part 5 of 13, # 6 Exhibit 1 - Part 6 of 13, # 7 Exhibit 1 - Part 7 of 13, # 8 Exhibit 1 - Part 8 of 13, # 9 Exhibit 1 - Part 9 of 13, # 10 Exhibit 1 - Part 10 of 13, # 11 Exhibit 1 - Part 11 of 13, # 12 Exhibit 1 - Part 12 of 13, # 13 Exhibit 1 - Part 13 of 13)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's First Amended Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Ninth Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena (Third Party) by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoena upon Davis Wright Tremaine LLP by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Karen Jacobs (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants' Third Amended Initial Disclosures and Paragraph 3 Disclosures by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures' Fifth Set of Requests for Production to AT&T filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of of Subpoenas to Matthew Sherman by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Final Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Claims filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants to file their reply brief in support of their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings under U.S.C. § 101 to July 15, 2015 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of AT&T's Fourth Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I, LLC (Nos.1-2) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures' Second Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery teleconference scheduled for July 2, 2015 is CANCELLED is hereby re-scheduled for July 24, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. Letter submissions are due July 16 and July 17. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/23/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01631-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Responses and Objections to IV's First Set of Requests for Admission to AT&T by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Patricia A. Dyck as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding scheduling conflict for July 2 discovery teleconference - re (545 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 319 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures' First Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for July 2, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than June 24, 2015, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than June 25, 2015, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/17/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01631-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Lea on 7/7/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Defendants Nextel Operations, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoenas of Texas Instruments, Inc. by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 and 2)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Third Party Subpoenas by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Notice of Amended Third Party Subpoenas - The Internet Society by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. re (540 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 318 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 333 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 295 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS, 311 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS, 398 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 315 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 427 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 and 2)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Third Party Subpoenas by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua J. Yi - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Request for Discovery Teleconference. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2015. An Oral Argument is set for 11/24/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Status Conference is set for 10/25/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/8/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent letters (see, e.g., C.A. No. 12-193 D.I. 518, 521, 533), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that IV's request that the Court modify its prior decision relating to reduction of asserted claims is DENIED, given Defendants' representations that IV refused previously to consider any proposal to reduce the number of asserted claims and IV's failure to propose any reasonable alternative prior to the Court making its determination. The Court will enter a scheduling order (see D.I. 530) reflecting this decision, as well as setting argument on Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings and adopting Plaintiffs' reasonable proposal for the timing and number of expert reports. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/8/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoena to Testify to Pramodkumar Patel by United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lester, Katharine) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoenas (Third Party) by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Defendants respectfully submit this letter to provide comments on the scheduling proposals submitted by the parties (C.A. No. 193, D.I. 530) - re (287 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS, 415 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 387 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 321 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 530 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 309 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 306 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 301 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS) Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on May 12, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Defendants T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile US, Inc.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoenas by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. on Verizon Services Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Second Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The The Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of (Amended) Thomas Higley on June 10, 2015 filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit scheduling proposals to June 2, 2015 - filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sierra Wireless America Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re (303 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (314 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (300 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (524 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (409 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (294 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (280 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (381 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition of Tim A. Williams as to the SMS Patents by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re (303 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (314 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (300 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (524 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (409 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (294 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (280 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (381 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition of Victor Shoup by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re (300 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (409 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (280 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (303 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (314 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (524 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (294 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (381 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition of Jeffrey T. Fisher by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 458 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/11/2015. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend Page Limit for Answering Brief to 25 pages and Reply Brief to 15 pages re (346 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 458 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 252 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 247 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 305 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 262 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 237 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS, 234 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their scheduling proposals to June 1, 2015 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding regarding Defendants' response to IV's May 26, 2015 letter (C.A. No. 12-193, D.I. 518) seeking reconsideration of the Court's May 12, 2015 ruling that IV be required to reduce the number of asserted claims from 5 per common specification down to 3 - re (376 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 294 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 298 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 403 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 309 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 275 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS, 289 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS) Letter, (518 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of AT&T's Responses and Objections to IVs Fourth Set of Interrogatories filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit their scheduling proposals to May 29, 2015 - filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sierra Wireless America Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, T-Mobile US, Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Reduction of Claims. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoenas (Third Party) by Nextel Operations Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Wayport Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., Novatel Wireless, Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Amended Third Party Subpoenas by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Tenth Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their scheduling proposals to May 26, 2015 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T's Responses and Objections to IV's Third Set of Interrogatories to AT&T, (ii) AT&T's Responses and Objections to IV's Fourth Set of Requests for Production to AT&T, and (iii) AT&T's Responses and Objections to IV's Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoenas (Third Party) by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of (482 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 330 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 368 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Notice (Other) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Ninth Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoenas (Third Party) by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoenas (Third Party) by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Detkin (Amended) on May 19, 2015 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nate Alvord (Amended) on June 24, 2015 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Weisfield (Amended) on June 5, 2015 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Paschke (Amended) on June 30, 2015 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Kosiara on May 28, 2015 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Paranchych (Amended) on June 10, 2015 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bob Laurenson (Amended) on June 2, 2015 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Eighth Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoenas (Third Party) by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Second) on May 28, 2015 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Boost Mobile, LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Supplemental Claim Charts Relating to MMS Messaging Patents Pursuant to Paragraph 4, Footnote 3, of the Default Standard filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding re scheduling proposal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding scheduling proposal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 5/27/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures' First Set of Requests for Admission AT&T filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Third Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Duell on 5/14/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit their scheduling proposals to Noon on May 11, 2015 - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of AT&T's Supplemental Response and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Interrogatory No. 1 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph M. Abraham - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T's Responses to Intellectual Ventures II, LLC's Fourth Set of Requests for Production, and (ii) AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Seventh Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the time for the parties to submit their scheduling proposals pursuant to the Court's April 28, 2014 Oral Order to May 8, 2015 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures's Responses and Objections to Defendants' First 30(b)(6) Notice to Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I and Intellectual Ventures II filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Second Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for Plaintiffs' Answering Brief and for Defendants' Reply Brief regarding Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 to 6/1/2015 and 7/1/2015 respectively - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Defendants Nextel Operations, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoena by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the joint status report (C.A. No. 12-193 D.I. 457) and letter requesting a scheduling conference (id. D.I. 463), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the Court will not construe any additional disputed claim terms at this time; (2) the Court will hold a scheduling teleconference on May 12 beginning at 4:00 p.m.; and (3) the parties shall submit their proposal(s) as to how these cases should now proceed no later than May 6, 2015. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/28/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures' Fourth Set of Interrogatories to AT&T filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, United States Cellular Corporation, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Meyertons, Hood, Kivlin, Kowert, & Goetzel, P.C. by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, United States Cellular Corporation, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Lawrence J. Merkel by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, United States Cellular Corporation, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Michael J. Fogarty, III by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, United States Cellular Corporation, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nathan Myhrvold on May 14, 2015 filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mario Obeidat on May 11, 2015 filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary O'Malley on May 12, 2015 filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Lee on May 21, 2015 filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 5/11/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures' Third Set of Interrogatories to AT&T filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of IV's Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 20-23) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures' Fourth Set of Requests for Production to AT&T filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 464 Notice to Take Deposition by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Lea on 5/7/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Joint Request for Scheduling Conference. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 5/20/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Rubenstein - filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, SBC Internet Services Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoenas by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 458 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. § 101 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 4/30/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert W. Ashbrook, Jr. - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Frank J. Bogacz by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 4/27/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 447 Notice of Service of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of AT&T's First Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC.(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Issuance of Letter of Request (D.I. 429) by Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Prise on April 1, 2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 429 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory -- Defendants' Motion for Issuance of Letter of Request to The Central Authority of France to Obtain Evidence from The 3rd Generation Partnership Project -- filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Response to Defendants' Fifth Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I, LLC and Intellectual Ventures II, LLC (No. 16) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Savard on 3/26/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Amended Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: The Court having today issued a Memorandum Opinion and Order resolving all of the claim construction disputes that were argued at the two-day Markman hearing in September 2014, including the ten disputes identified by the parties as most important, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall, no later than April 14, 2015, submit a joint status report advising the Court, inter alia, of their position(s) as to whether the Court should resolve any additional claim construction disputes; if so, which ones and why; and, if so, whether additional briefing and/or an additional hearing is requested. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/24/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for Leave to File Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief (C.A. No. 12-193 D.I. 305) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/24/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 1:13-cv-01633-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re (244 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 327 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 288 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 221 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS, 222 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS, 438 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 237 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 233 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Memorandum Opinion re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/24/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/24/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Fifth Amended Response and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Common Interrogatory No. 2 by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Moshier on 3/24/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoena by United States Cellular Corporation [Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Testify and to Produce Documents to Frank J. Bogacz] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lester, Katharine) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gordon Mansfield on March 26, 2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel - Collins J. Seitz, Jr. by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 27, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nisha N. Patel - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory -- Defendants' Motion for Issuance of Letter of Request to The Central Authority of France to Obtain Evidence from The 3rd Generation Partnership Project -- - filed by Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Wayport Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibits A-I)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stephen Dartt - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition to Mike Garafano by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition to John Paschke by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition to David Paranchych by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition to Peter Detkin by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition to Nate Alvord by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition to Jim Weisfield by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition to Bob Laurenson by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of (260 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS) Letter by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Sierra Wireless America Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Responses and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Re-Notice of Subpoena to Jacob W. Jorgensen by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, United States Cellular Corporation, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the Deadline for Fact Discovery to 6/30/2015 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of (217 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 202 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS, 229 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 411 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 258 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 218 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 308 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 204 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Notice of Service of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding discovery dispute. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T's Responses and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories to AT&T (Nos. 2-3), and (ii) AT&T's Fourth Amended Response and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Common Interrogatory No. 2 by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Ericsson Inc. filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sami Markus Ala-Luukko on March 24, 2015 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, T-Mobile US, Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff and Defendants of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for February 27, 2015 at 2:45 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than February 23, 2015, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than February 24, 2015, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/18/15. (ntl) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., Nextel Operations, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoenas by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Request for Discovery Conference. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Fifth Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC (No. 16) filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP.(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoena by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Defendants Nextel Operations, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile US, Inc.'s Amended Notice of Third-Party Subpoenas by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoenas by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Response and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Interrogatory No. 1 by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Kevin Cadwell as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer an attorney with the firm of Baker Botts, L.L.P.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoena to Nokia Inc. by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Richard J. O'Brien as co-counsel.. (Lester, Katharine) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Sixth Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants (SMS-Related Patents) by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Intellectual Ventures I's Claim Construction Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of IV's Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 16-18) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants (Lawful Intercept) by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION / Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request to the Central Authority of Hong Kong to Obtain Evidence from Hong Kong University of Science & Technology, HKUST R and D Corporation Ltd, and Mr. Edward C. Wong - filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Supplemental Response to Defendants' Common Interrogatory No. 6 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC on February 17, 2015 filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Response to Defendants' Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I, LLC and Intellectual Ventures II, LLC (Nos. 8-15) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC Responses to Intervenor Sierra Wireless America Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Nos. 1-10) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fourth Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants (Wi-Fi Services) by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sierra Wireless America, Inc.'s Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents; (2) Defendant Sierra Wireless America, Inc.'s Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents; (3) Defendant Sierra Wireless America Inc.'s Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories; and (4) Defendant Sierra Wireless America, Inc.'s Response to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Second Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Sierra Wireless America Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Supplemental Claim Chart Relating to Calea Patent Pursuant to Paragraph 4, Footnote 3, of the Default Standard filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on December 17, 2014 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carl Gismervig - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint NOTICE of of Subpoena to Jacob W. Jorgensen by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, United States Cellular Corporation, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of (231 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 283 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 380 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Notice (Other) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants (Wireless Infrastructure) filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' latest submissions regarding the dispute relating to disclosure of AT&T confidential information to IV's expert, Dr. Marks (D.I. 376, 377), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that IV's request to qualify Dr. Marks under paragraph 9(a) of the Protective Order (D.I. 363, 366) is DENIED. IV has failed to demonstrate that it would be unduly prejudiced by having to retain an expert who, unlike Dr. Marks, is not prosecuting patent applications that are related to the subject matter of technologies at issue in this case. Additionally, the complicated procedure IV has identified for attempting to limit the prejudice to AT&T (D.I. 376-1 at 3-4) would impose burdens on AT&T and the Court that IV has not shown are warranted under the circumstances. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/29/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01631-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Third Amended Response and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Common Interrogatory No. 2 by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories to AT&T filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding response to IV's letter dated December 22, 2014 - re (195 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Workable Procedure to Disclose Materials to IV's Expert. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of (190 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Letter, (366 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding discovery dispute by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Responses to Sierra Wireless America Inc.'s Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-70) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 354 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Supplemental Claim Charts Relating to Infrastructure and MMS Messaging Patents Pursuant to Paragraph 4, Footnote 3, of the Default Standard filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of (188 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 363 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Letter, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Supplemental Claim Charts Relating to Infrastructure and SMS Messaging Patents Pursuant to Paragraph 4, Footnote 3, of the Default Standard filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Supplemental Claim Charts Relating to Wi-Fi Patents Pursuant to Paragraph 4, Footnote 3, of the Default Standard filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Supplemental Claim Charts Relating to Wi-Fi Patents Pursuant to Paragraph 4, Footnote 3, of the Default Standard filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT re (190 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Letter / Exhibits F - I to [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding discovery dispute by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding discovery dispute. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants' Second Amended Initial Disclosures and Paragraph 3 Disclosures by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants (Multimedia Messaging Services) by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sierra Wireless America, Inc. on 1/20/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories to Sierra Wireless; (ii) IV's Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Sierra Wireless; (iii) Intellectual Ventures' First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Sierra Wireless; and (iv) Intellectual Ventures' Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Sierra Wireless filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiffs and Defendants of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for December 17, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than December 11, 2014, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than December 12, 2014, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/8/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01631-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hugh Shieh on 1/13/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Wolter on 1/16/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures' Initial Disclosures to Sierra Wireless and (ii) Intellectual Ventures' Paragraph 3 Initial Disclosures to Sierra Wireless filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures I's First Set of Interrogatories to AT&T filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Notice of Deposition to AT&T Defendants (Directory Assistance) by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 332 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand - Sierra Wireless America Inc.'s Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Intellectual Ventures I LLC by Sierra Wireless America Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 332 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand / Answer to the Fourth Amended Complaint by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile US, Inc. Notice of Third Party Subpoenas by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena - Kaplan Breyer, # 2 Exhibit Subpoena - Thomas Horstemeyer LLP, # 3 Exhibit Subpoena - Lerner David)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Lott, Alex Bobotek, and Brad Jones on 1/16/2015, 2/3/2015, and 2/4/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hendry Tong on 1/26/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Slawomir Stawiarski on 1/23/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Weihua Ye on 1/21/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 1/27/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 1/19/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 1/12/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 1/5/2015 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 12/15/2014 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of AT&T Defendants on 12/8/2014 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Amended Third-Party Subpoena to Michael A. Martin by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC; and (2) First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC filed by Sierra Wireless America Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile US, Inc. Notice of Third Party Subpoenas by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Novak Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Michael Subpoena)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of (331 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 245 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Notice (Other) of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena to Third Party Berkeley Law & Technology by United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lester, Katharine) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoena to Third Party Cozen O'Connor by United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lester, Katharine) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpeona to Third Party Foley & Lardner LLP by United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lester, Katharine) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Request for Discovery Teleconference. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa Gardner - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc.- filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L, # 11 Exhibit M, # 12 Exhibit N, # 13 Exhibit O, # 14 Exhibit P, # 15 Exhibit Q, # 16 Exhibit R, # 17 Exhibit S)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories to Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Nos. 8-15) filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of SERVICE of (i) AT&T's Responses to Plaintiff's Amended Second Set of Requests for Production, and (ii) AT&T's Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Production by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cricket Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of (200 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 165 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 154 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS, 161 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS, 165 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 182 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 325 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 237 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Notice (Other) of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Second Amended Response and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Common Interrogatory No. 2 by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint REPLY to Response to Motion re 305 Joint MOTION for Leave to File / AT&T and T-Mobile's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Schuneman in Support of AT&T's and T-Mobile's Reply in Support of Their Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re (159 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 317 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 153 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS, 192 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS) Joint MOTION / Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request to the Central Authority of Finland to Obtain Evidence from Nokia Corporation and Current and/or Former Employees filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility II LLC, T-Mobile USA Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 1:13-cv-01633-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 306 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Substituting Cricket Wireless LLC for AIO Wireless LLC by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re (194 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (161 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (319 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, (155 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS) Answering Brief in Opposition, of James D. Ragon by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 305 Joint MOTION for Leave to File / AT&T and T-Mobile's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/27/2014. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re (153 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS) Joint MOTION / Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request to the Central Authority of Finland to Obtain Evidence from Nokia Corporation and Current and/or Former Employees by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION / Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request to the Central Authority of Finland to Obtain Evidence from Nokia Corporation and Current and/or Former Employees - filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B, # 4 Appendix C, # 5 Appendix D, # 6 Appendix E)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of (186 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 228 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 311 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Notice (Other) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Supplemental Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I, LLC (Nos. 4-5) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 301 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND (Third Amended Complaint) by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Aio Wireless LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sierra Wireless America, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Sierra Wireless America Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoenas by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena issued to Carnegie Mellon University, # 2 Subpoena issued to Gibbons P.C., # 3 Subpoena issued to Dan Doner, # 4 Subpoena issued to Oblon, Spivak, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, L.L.P., # 5 Subpoena issued to Santangelo Law Offices)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing - Volume B held on September 12, 2014 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing - Volume A held on September 10, 2014 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2015. (bpg) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures' Amended Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendant AT&T and (ii) Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Set of Requests for Production to Defendant AT&T filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of AT&Ts Responses and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLCs and Intellectual Ventures II LLCs Common Interrogatory Nos. 4-16 filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: 301 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand - Sierra Wireless America Inc.'s Answer to Third Amended Complaint and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Intellectual Ventures I LLC by Sierra Wireless America Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Leave to File / AT&T and T-Mobile's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief - filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald F. Lopez and Jennifer Hayes - filed by Sierra Wireless America Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Common Interrogatory No. 1 by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Aio Wireless LLC- filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L, # 11 Exhibit M, # 12 Exhibit N, # 13 Exhibit O, # 14 Exhibit P, # 15 Exhibit Q, # 16 Exhibit R, # 17 Exhibit S)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Response to Defendants' Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II, LLC (Nos. 6-7) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of (205 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 143 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 293 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 158 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 173 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 148 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 138 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS, 138 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Notice (Other) of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding to advise the Court that the parties have agreed to format for presentation at the upcoming Markman hearing. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding parties write to advise the Court that, subject to the Court's approval, they have agreed for three terms the parties will rest on their briefs and will not be presenting argument at the upcoming Markman hearing. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (please see order for details). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/8/2014. (rpg) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman hearing scheduled for this week will be held during the following times, as needed, subject to the time limits previously ordered: (i) Wednesday, September 10: 8:30 am - 10:00 am and 12:30 pm - 5:00 pm; and (ii) Friday, September 12: 9:30 am - 3:30 pm. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (rpg) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of IV's Amended Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of IV's Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT re (288 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief [Defendants' Statement of Non-Opposition] by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, SBC Internet Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Todd Moon on September 5, 2014 filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Wayport Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP.(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Compliance)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of (280 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 160 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 187 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Notice (Other) of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER: As requested by the parties (see C.A. No. 12-193 D.I. 274, 282), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (i) each side shall be allotted five (5) hours to present its claim construction arguments, and (ii) subject to any further order of the Court, the terms to be argued at the hearings on September 10 and 12 will be those proposed by the parties in their letter of August 18. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/21/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Omitted Exhibit by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC re (122 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS, 273 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 124 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS, 152 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 180 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 138 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 128 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 134 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS) Declaration,,, of Daniel B. Epstein in Support of Intellectual Ventures' Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 24)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding parties' terms for argument at the Markman hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants' Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding comments to Plaintiffs' Technology Tutorial. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Comments on Defendants' Technology Tutorial by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Plaintiffs' Corrected Technology Tutorial. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena on Niels Ferguson by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Niels Ferguson)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF [Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief] filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Wayport Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits (Part 1), # 2 Exhibits (Part 2), # 3 Exhibits (Part 3))(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Expert Testimony and Time for Argument at Markman Hearing. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Daniel B. Epstein in Support of Intellectual Ventures' Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35, # 2 Exhibit 36, # 3 Exhibit 37, # 4 Exhibit 38, # 5 Exhibit 39, # 6 Exhibit 40, # 7 Exhibit 41, # 8 Exhibit 42, # 9 Exhibit 43, # 10 Exhibit 44, # 11 Exhibit 45, # 12 Exhibit 46, # 13 Exhibit 47, # 14 Exhibit 48, # 15 Exhibit 49, # 16 Exhibit 50, # 17 Exhibit 51, # 18 Exhibit 52, # 19 Exhibit 53, # 20 Exhibit 54, # 21 Exhibit 55, # 22 Exhibit 56, # 23 Exhibit 57, # 24 Exhibit 58, # 25 Exhibit 59, # 26 Exhibit 60, # 27 Exhibit 61, # 28 Exhibit 62, # 29 Exhibit 63, # 30 Exhibit 64, # 31 Exhibit 65)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re 254 Claim Construction Opening Brief, filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Technology Tutorial. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jennifer Ying regarding enclosing two copies of a DVD containing Defendants' technology tutorial - re (102 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS, 102 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Novatel Wireless, Inc.'s Amended Motion to Intervene by Novatel Wireless, Inc. re (80 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) MOTION to Intervene , (168 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) MOTION to Intervene (Newell, Ryan) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of (133 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 146 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 116 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS, 123 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 267 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 129 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 174 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 119 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Notice (Other) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the Deadlines for Document Production and Fact Discovery to 11/5/14 and 3/31/2015 respectively - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Defendants Nextel Operations, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoena (on Ericsson, Inc.) by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery teleconference scheduled for 8/1/14 at 2:15 p.m. is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/23/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01631-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiffs and Defendants of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for August 1, 2014 at 2:15 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than July 24, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than July 25, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Should any document(s) be filed under seal, a courtesy copy of the sealed document(s) must be provided to the Court within one (1) hour of e-filing the document(s). Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/21/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01631-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on May 7, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redaction Request due 7/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of (257 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 166 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 139 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 122 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS) Notice (Other) of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Ross D. Murch by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Khaled Ben Letaief by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Issuance of Letter of Request to the Central Authority of Singapore to Obtain Evidence from Petri Timonen - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter of Request, # 2 Exhibit A - K to Letter of Request)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patricia A. Dyck - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on June 5, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Deanna Warner of Hawkins Reporting Service, Telephone (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Wayport Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibits (Part 1), # 3 Exhibits (Part 2), # 4 Exhibits (Part 3), # 5 Exhibits (Part 4), # 6 Exhibits (Part 5), # 7 Exhibits (Part 6))(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re (107 in 1:13-cv-01633-LPS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (117 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (110 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (123 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (134 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (112 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (161 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (252 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Claim Construction Opening Brief of Daniel B. Epstein by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 25, # 25 Exhibit 26, # 26 Exhibit 28, # 27 Exhibit 29, # 28 Exhibit 30, # 29 Exhibit 31, # 30 Exhibit 32, # 31 Exhibit 33, # 32 Exhibit 34)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric B. Fastiff and David T. Rudolph - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding response to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I & II's letter of June 2, 2014 (C.A. 12-193, D.I. 248). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Protective Order Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STATEMENT re (244 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 244 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Joint Submission of Ten Most Important Terms by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's First Amended Responses and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiffs and Defendants of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for June 5, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than June 2, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than June 3, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Should any document(s) be filed under seal, a courtesy copy of the sealed document(s) must be provided to the Court within one (1) hour of e-filing the document(s). Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/29/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION: Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 8/8/2014. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 6/11/2014. A 2-day Markman Hearing is set for 9/10/2014 and 9/12/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/15/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Issuance of Letter of Request to the Central Authority of France to Obtain Evidence From the European Telecommunications Standards Institute (ETSI) - filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Claim Construction by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Teleconference today will begin at 9:45 AM. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/7/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re (101 in 1:13-cv-01636-LPS, 142 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 235 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 117 in 1:13-cv-01632-LPS) MOTION For Issuance Of Letters Of Request To The Central Authority Of Finland To Obtain Evidence From The Named Inventor, Original Owner, And Prosecuting Firm Of Several Asserted Patents filed by Nextel Operations Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/4/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01632-LPS, 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 1:13-cv-01636-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark: Having reviewed the parties' letters regarding claim construction procedures and scheduling (D.I. 227 , 228 , 229 , 237 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) a teleconference is scheduled for Wednesday, May 7, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss the claim construction process; and (2) all claim construction briefing deadlines are stayed. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone conference to (302) 573-4573. (rpg) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Defendants' May 1, 2014 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Defendants respectfully submit this opening letter in support of their request for an in-person status conference with the Court to discuss case management and scheduling. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Opening Claim Construction Briefs to May 9, 2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION For Issuance Of Letters Of Request To The Central Authority Of Finland To Obtain Evidence From The Named Inventor, Original Owner, And Prosecuting Firm Of Several Asserted Patents - filed by Sprint Spectrum LP, Nextel Operations Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 3), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 3), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 3), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 3), # 6 Exhibit 2 (Part 3 of 3), # 7 Exhibit 3)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 230 Reply Brief by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 12, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) (Entered: 04/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM Construction Chart by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit MM-OO, # 2 Exhibit PP-RR, # 3 Exhibit SS-UU, # 4 Exhibit VV-DDD, # 5 Exhibit EEE-OOO)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLAIM Construction Chart by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G-O, # 5 Exhibit P-S, # 6 Exhibit T-U, # 7 Exhibit V, # 8 Exhibit W-Z, # 9 Exhibit AA-DD, # 10 Exhibit EE-GG, # 11 Exhibit HH-LL)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 203 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding Markman Briefing Proposal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 2-6)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Claim Construction. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Collins J. Seitz, Jr. regarding Claim Construction. (Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of (130 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 88 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS, 96 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 222 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) MOTION to Redact (84 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 199 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 112 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 78 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Transcript,, [Sprint's Unopposed Motion to Redact Portions of the February 12, 2014 Discovery Conference Transcript] by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Sprint's Proposed Redactions), # 2 Exhibit B (Proposed Form of Order))(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY BRIEF re 200 MOTION to Intervene filed by Sierra Wireless America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline for the parties to submit a briefing proposal for opening and answering brief page limits pursuant to Paragraph 10 of the First Scheduling Order to April 1, 2014 - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Karen Jacobs regarding EMERGENCY REQUEST for extension of time to submit claim construction briefing proposal to April 1, 2014 - re (215 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Stipulation,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] MOTION to Redact (84 in 1:13-cv-01635-LPS, 199 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 112 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 78 in 1:13-cv-01631-LPS) Transcript,, [Sprint's Unopposed Motion to Redact Portions of the February 12, 2014 Discovery Conference Transcript] - filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Sprint's Proposed Redactions), # 2 Exhibit B (Proposed Form of Order))(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 218 Memorandum in Opposition, / Declaration of Cheryl Choy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 218 Memorandum in Opposition, / Declaration of Andrew T. Smoak in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 203 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint / Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/3/2014. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Proposed Claim Constructions filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 200 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION To Extend Certain Claim Construction Deadlines by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, SBC Internet Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Defendants Nextel Operations, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoena by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 210 Notice (Other) of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Identification Of Claim Terms For Construction filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., Telephone and Data Systems, Inc., United States Cellular Corporation, T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint STIPULATION Regarding Limits on Written and Oral Discovery by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena on Jacob W. Jorgensen by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Response to Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Nos. 3-5) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to 91 Amended Complaint, by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 202 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend Answer filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility II LLC, Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/6/14. (ntl) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Amending Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Amended Third Party Subpoena by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Subpoena on Telcordia Technologies, Inc.)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Rule 7.1.1 Certification, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend Answer - filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 200 MOTION to Intervene filed by Sierra Wireless America Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/21/2014. (Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene - filed by Sierra Wireless America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Grimm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on February 12, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) Modified on 3/27/2014 (ntl). Modified on 4/2/2014 (ntl). (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 183 Letter by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 180 Notice (Other) of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT re 174 Answering Brief in Opposition - The AT&T Defendants and the Sprint Defendants' Statement in Support of Novatel Wireless, Inc.'s Amended Motion to Intervene by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc.. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF re 168 MOTION to Intervene filed by Novatel Wireless, Inc.. (Newell, Ryan) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena on Verizon Patent and Licensing Inc. by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Protective Order to February 12, 2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 175 Notice (Other) of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Collins J. Seitz, Jr. regarding Discovery Dispute - re 183 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Seitz, Collins) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Nokia Inc. by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Nos. 3-5) filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP.(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Nos. 3-5) filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended NOTICE of of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Pramodkumar Patel by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiffs and Defendants of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for February 12, 2014 at 1:15 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than February 6, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than February 7, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Should any document(s) be filed under seal, a courtesy copy of the sealed document(s) must be provided to the Court within one (1) hour of e-filing the document(s). Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/4/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00193-LPS, 1:13-cv-01631-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline to submit the proposed Protective Order to 2/7/2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 168 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 154 Notice (Other) of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena to NewNet Communication Technologies, LLC by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel B. Epstein - filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Setting Deadline for Plaintiff's Response to Amended Motion to Intervene re (37 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (35 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) MOTION to Intervene , (81 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (80 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) MOTION to Intervene , SO ORDERED, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Novatel Wireless, Inc.. (Newell, Ryan) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 168 MOTION to Intervene filed by Novatel Wireless, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Newell, Ryan) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene - filed by Novatel Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Newell, Ryan) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice to Withdraw (37 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, (35 in 1:13-cv-01634-LPS, 120 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) MOTION to Intervene , (122 in 1:12-cv-00193-LPS) Opening Brief in Support, - filed by Novatel Wireless, Inc.. (Newell, Ryan) Modified on 1/24/2014 (rpg). (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for Plaintiff's opposition to Novatel Wireless, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene to 1/24/2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Third Party Subpoenas on Buchanan Ingersoll and Perman Green by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline to submit a proposed Protective Order to 1/31/2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Sterne Kessler Goldstein Fox P.L.L.C. by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Third Party Subpoena by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants' Amended Initial Disclosures and Paragraph 3 Disclosures by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Corrected Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Response to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Nos. 1-2) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Response to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I, LLC (Nos. 1-2) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 149 Notice (Other) of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Responses and Objections to Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena to Openwave Messaging, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Subpoena to Cloudmark, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Defendants Nextel Operations, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Notice of Second Amended Subpoena on Thomas Higley by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP re (56 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Notice (Other), (48 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Notice (Other), (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Defendants Nextel Operations, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Notice of Amended Third Party Subpoena on Thomas Higley by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP re (48 in 1:13-cv-01637-LPS) Notice (Other), (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for Plaintiff's opposition to Novatel Wireless, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene to 1/22/2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subpoena by Intellectual Ventures I LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Pramodkumar Patel by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Morris James LLP by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Dilworth Paxton LLP by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Defendants Nextel Operations, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoenas by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP on NewNet Communication Technologies, LLC, SS8 Networks, Inc., David P. Gordon, McDermott Will & Emery and Thomas Higley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Defendants T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile US, Inc.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoena on Lowe, Price, LeBlanc & Becker by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 132 MOTION For Issuance Of Letters Of Request To The Central Authority Of The Netherlands To Obtain Evidence From Named Inventors On The '944 And '392 Patents filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of SERVICE of AT&T's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline to submit a proposed Protective Order to 1/21/2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Defendants T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile US, Inc.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoenas by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena on Andrew Brandt, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena on Heidi B. Newton, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Subpoena on Daniel E. Twing)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Official Transcript of Telephone Conference before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Defendants Nextel Operations, Inc. and Sprint Spectrum L.P.'s Notice of Third Party Subpoenas by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoenas (Third Party) by T-Mobile USA Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for Plaintiff's opposition to Novatel Wireless, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene to 1/10/2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 116 Notice (Other) of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION For Issuance Of Letters Of Request To The Central Authority Of The Netherlands To Obtain Evidence From Named Inventors On The '944 And '392 Patents - filed by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit 1 (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit 1 (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), # 7 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), # 8 Exhibit 2 (Part 3), # 9 Exhibit 2 (Part 4), # 10 Exhibit 2 (Part 5), # 11 Exhibit 2 (Part 6), # 12 Exhibit 2 (Part 7), # 13 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), # 14 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), # 15 Exhibit 3 (Part 3), # 16 Exhibit 3 (Part 4), # 17 Exhibit 3 (Part 5), # 18 Exhibit 3 (Part 6), # 19 Exhibit 3 (Part 7))(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Initial Claim Charts Pursuant to Paragraph 1(iv) of the Court's First Scheduling Order filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I, LLC (Nos. 1-2) filed by Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, United States Cellular Corporation, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., Wayport Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc..(Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of SERVICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Wi-Fi Alliance by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., Nextel Operations Inc., Sprint Spectrum LP, T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA Inc., United States Cellular Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Defendants' Notice of Subpoena to Nokia Inc. by AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc., SBC Internet Services Inc., Wayport Inc., New Cingular Wireless Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures I LLC's and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories to Defendants by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/16/2013: Having reviewed the parties' letters and materials relating to discovery and protective order disputes (see C.A. No. 12-193 D.I. 113 , 114 , 115 , 117 , 118 , 119 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Defendants' request that the protective order (paragraph 6) permit Defendants' in-house counsel to access settlement and license agreements relating to any of the patents-in-suit is DENIED; Defendants may make specific requests to Plaintiffs (and the Court) for provision of particular agreements to Defendants' in-house counsel; (2) Plaintiffs' request to share confidential information with experts and consultants located outside the United States is GRANTED, provided it is for the purpose of assisting in the litigation of this action and provided such experts/consultants execute the necessary undertakings to comply with the protective order; (3) Defendants' request to limit the number of Plaintiffs' experts who may review Defendants' source code is DENIED as arbitrary and unjustified; (4) Plaintiffs' request that Defendants make their source code available for review at locations convenient to Plaintiffs is DENIED, as Plaintiffs -- who chose to bring suit against multiple Defendants with operations in various locations -- fail to justify requiring Defendants to make this accommodation; (5) Plaintiffs' proposal as to printing of source code is GRANTED as it is more reasonable than Defendants' proposal; and (6) Defendants' request that the Court strike the entirety of Plaintiffs' most recent set of document requests is DENIED as unwarranted under the circumstances. No portion of the teleconference tomorrow, December 17, will be devoted to the issues resolved by this Order. This Order applies to all actions related to 12-193 in which discovery/protective order letters were filed. (rpg) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Newell on behalf of Novatel Wireless, Inc. (Newell, Ryan) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,382 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?