(PS) Johnson v. Mitchell et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-01968
District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 10:46 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Shepard Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Douglas R. Thorn, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shepard Johnson-PRO SE EFILER +1 916 208 9969 +1 916 780 4668 smj@surewest.net
v.
No Logo Ann Michelle Wand, Defendant
No Logo Bobby Hamond, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hamond, Bobby

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bobby Hamond +1 303 718 7718
No Logo Catherine Mitchell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 14 South Ridge Road

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Catherine Mitchell +1 603 938 2317
No Logo Chester Mitchell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 14 South Ridge Road

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chester Mitchell +1 603 938 2317
No Logo David Miner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downey Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Dale Ginter +1 916 444 1000 +1 916 444 2100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly Lois Pope +1 916 444 1000 +1 916 444 2100 kpope@downeybrand.com
No Logo Efim Shargorodsky, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Deborah Barron

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah M. Barron +1 916 486 1712 +1 916 927 5524 deborah.barron@lawbarron.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pennie Elizabeth Norris +1 916 486 1712 +1 916 927 5524 elizabeth.norris@lawbarron.com
No Logo Elena Shargorodsky, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Deborah Barron

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah M. Barron +1 916 486 1712 +1 916 927 5524 deborah.barron@lawbarron.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pennie Elizabeth Norris +1 916 486 1712 +1 916 927 5524 elizabeth.norris@lawbarron.com
No Logo Ford Hermansen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 1040

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ford Hermansen +1 651 335 5772
No Logo James Lynch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Lynch
No Logo Judith A. Cohen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Cohen
No Logo Julie Anne Kahler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kahler, Julie Anne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Anne Kahler +1 864 303 6836
No Logo Kim Parsons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parsons, Kim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kim Parsons +1 303 442 4036 +1 303 442 3693 kim@bearpawpropertymanagement.com
No Logo Lynn Yarrington, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary John Smith +1 415 262 4000 +1 415 262 4040 gsmith@bdlaw.com
No Logo Manual Berrocal, Defendant
No Logo Martha Thomas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica J Frascona +1 213 457 1734 +1 213 457 1850 mfrascona@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamara Husbands +1 213 457 1800 +1 213 457 1850 thusbands@dykema.com
No Logo Maurine E. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Michael Mode, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary John Smith +1 415 262 4000 +1 415 262 4040 gsmith@bdlaw.com
No Logo Monte Watson, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Hermanson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia Hermanson
No Logo Peter Reinhold, Defendant
No Logo Rogelio Arosemena, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Tornga, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra Tornga
No Logo Sarah Miner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downey Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly Lois Pope +1 916 444 1000 +1 916 444 2100 kpope@downeybrand.com
No Logo Solarte Inn Corporations, Defendant
No Logo Susan Fine, Defendant
No Logo Todd E. Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Deborah Barron

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah M. Barron +1 916 486 1712 +1 916 927 5524 deborah.barron@lawbarron.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pennie Elizabeth Norris +1 916 486 1712 +1 916 927 5524 elizabeth.norris@lawbarron.com
No Logo Viki Kiman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Deborah Barron

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah M. Barron +1 916 486 1712 +1 916 927 5524 deborah.barron@lawbarron.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pennie Elizabeth Norris +1 916 486 1712 +1 916 927 5524 elizabeth.norris@lawbarron.com
No Logo J. Michael Hopper, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Luke Hendrix +1 801 232 8976 luke_hendrix544@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
No Logo J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (308) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 302 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/17/13 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 5/10/13 295 are ADOPTED and Defendant Solarte is DISMISSED for failure to serve process pursuant to FRCP 4(m).(Mena-Sanchez, L)
    LREF
    Blank 297 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/14/2013 RECOMMENDING that 245 judgment be awarded to defendants as provided in these recommendations, and that plaintiff's 258 counter-motion be denied; this rec ommendation, if adopted, resolves the entire case, and it should be closed; Matter referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Any party may file objections to F&R within 14 days after being served; parties are advised that failure to file objections timely may waive the right to appeal. (Waggoner, D)
      LREF
      Blank 296 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER ADOPTING 288 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 5/13/2013. Rogelio Arosemena's and Manual Berrocal's 229 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and these defendants are DISMISSED. (Marciel, M)
        LREF
        Blank 295 Filed: 5/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/10/13 RECOMMENDING that Defendant Solarte be dismissed for failure to serve process pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Matter referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
          EXHIBITS H, I, J, K re 288 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS. 292 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 3/5/2013 (Reader, L). (Entered: 03/04/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
            EXHIBITS D, E, F, G re 288 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS. 292 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 3/5/2013 (Reader, L). (Entered: 03/04/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
              RESPONSE by Shepard Johnson to [ 290 ] Minute Order. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shepard Johnson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 3/5/2013 (Reader, L). (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Todd E. Johnson, Viki Kiman, David Miner, Sarah Miner, Catherine Mitchell, Chester Mitchell, Efim Shargorodsky, Elena Shargorodsky, Sandra Tornga, Ann Michelle Wand. Attorney Pope, Kelly Lois added. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James C. Bridgman, # 2 Proof of Service)(Pope, Kelly) Modified on 3/5/2013 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER: [Text Only] issued by courtroom deputy to Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: Briefing pursuant to 285 is due March 4, 2013. Plaintiff's request 289 to exceed the page limit is granted. Plaintiff may file briefing not to exceed 35 pages in length, signed by Magistrate Judge Hollows. (Eichhorn, D) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                    REQUEST TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT of further briefing pursuant to 285 Minutes by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/21/2013 (Michel, G). (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 288 Filed: 2/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/14/2013 GRANTING, in part, DENYING, in part, Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice; DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Fees and Costs; RECOMMENDING that the 229 Motion to Dismiss be granted; RECOMMENDING that Defendants Berrocal and Arosemena be dismissed from this action. Motion referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G)
                        LREF
                        Blank 288 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/14/2013 GRANTING, in part, DENYING, in part, Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice; DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Fees and Costs; RECOMMENDING that the 229 Motion to Dismiss be granted; RECOMMENDING that Defendants Berrocal and Arosemena be dismissed from this action. Motion referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                          LREF
                          Blank 287 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/13/13 ORDERING that the dismissal with prejudice is GRANTED; the parties agree to bear their own costs and attorneys. (Becknal, R)
                            LREF
                            Blank 287 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/13/13 ORDERING that the dismissal with prejudice is GRANTED; the parties agree to bear their own costs and attorneys. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                              WITHDRAWAL of 283 MOTION for SANCTIONS Violation of LR 260(b) by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: MOTION HEARING held on 1/31/2013. 229 Defendants Berrocal and Arosemena's MOTION to QUASH and MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT addressed first. The motion is taken under submission; formal written order will issue. 245 Defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT and 258 Plaintiff's CROSS MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT addressed. The court orders further, concurrent briefing, as set forth on the record, due by Monday, March 4, 2013. The parties shall file complete, accurate translations of all non-English documents. No requests for extension will be contemplated. After briefing is filed, the motions will be submitted and a formal written order will issue. Plaintiffs Counsel Pro Se present. Defendants Counsel James Bridgman for Berrocal, Arosemena, Chester and Catherine Mitchell, Tornga and Wand; R. Dale Ginter and Kelly Pope for David and Sarah Miner; Deborah Barron for Todd Johnson, Viki and Elena Shargorodsky present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1/1. (Eichhorn, D) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/30/2013 ORDERING 275 Motion for Extension is DENIED. (Waggoner, D) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Motion for SanctionsCourt Filing
                                    MOTION for SANCTIONS Violation of LR 260(b) by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER: [Text Only] issued by courtroom deputy D. Eichhorn for Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: The Court is in receipt of 281 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions set for hearing on 01/31/13. The motion is improperly noticed pursuant to Local Rule 230(b) and is, therefore, VACATED. (Eichhorn, D) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Motion for SanctionsCourt Filing
                                        MOTION for SANCTIONS Violation of LR 260(b) by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                          [PROPOSED] ORDER re 236 STIPULATION of Dimissal by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 1/29/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                            OPPOSITION by Todd E. Johnson, Viki Kiman, Efim Shargorodsky, Elena Shargorodsky to 275 MOTION for 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME re 257 Minute Order, 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Barron, Deborah) Modified on 1/29/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                              REPLY by Shepard Johnson to Defendants' OPPOSITION 277 to Motion, 276 , 275 MOTION for 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME 257 Minute Order, 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                OPPOSITION by Catherine Mitchell to 275 MOTION for 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file Plantiff's Reply to opposition to cross motion for summary judgment re 257 Minute Order, 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Bridgman, James) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                  OPPOSITION by David Miner, Sarah Miner to 275 MOTION for 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file Plantiff's Reply to opposition to cross motion for summary judgment re 257 Minute Order, 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service of Opposition to Request for Extension of Time to File Reply)(Ginter, Robert) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file Plantiff's Reply to opposition to cross motion for summary judgment re 257 Minute Order, 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY by Todd E. Johnson, Viki Kiman, David Miner, Sarah Miner, Catherine Mitchell, Chester Mitchell, Efim Shargorodsky, Elena Shargorodsky, Sandra Tornga, Ann Michelle Wand to RESPONSE to 245 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Bridgman in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of R. Dale Ginter, # 3 Declaration of Dario Sandoval Shaik, # 4 Proof of Service)(Ginter, Robert) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Manual Berrocal re 272 Reply. (Bridgman, James) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY by Manual Berrocal re 268 Opposition to Motion. (Bridgman, James) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                            EXHIBIT Johnson doc 269 exh.G signed re 229 Motion to Dismiss filed by Manual Berrocal. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                              REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Shepard Johnson in re 269 Declaration. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in OPPOSITION TO 229 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C,D,E,F,G, # 2 Exhibit H,I,J)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  OPPOSITION by Shepard Johnson to 229 Motion to Dismiss. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 267 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/16/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request 266 to exceed the 25 page limit imposed by the 3/2/12 order is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 267 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/16/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request 266 to exceed the 25 page limit imposed by the 3/2/12 order is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        REQUEST for permission to Exceed 25 Page Limit by Plaintiff Shepard Johnson re 229 Motion to Dismiss. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 1/15/2013 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          EXHIBIT 26-29 and 30-32 re 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30-32)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            EXHIBIT 21-25 re 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Shepard Johnson. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              EXHIBIT 12 pt2 and 13-20 re 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13-20)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                EXHIBIT 10 pt2-11 and 12 re 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12 pt 1)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  EXHIBIT 6-9 and 10 pt 1 re 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10 pt1)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    EXHIBIT Exhibit 4pt1 and pt2 and exh 5 re 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 pt 2 -5)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in SUPPORT OF 258 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                        MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement Disputed Facts, # 2 Statement Undisputed Facts, # 3 Statement Opposition to Evidence)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: [Text Only] issued by courtroom deputy to Magistrate Judge Hollows: On the court's own motion, Defendants Berrocal & Arosema's Motion to Quash and Dismiss 229 set for hearing on December 20, 2012, is CONTINUED to January 31, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Hollows, to be heard at the same time as the Motion for Summary Judgment 245 . Objections to the Motion to Quash and Dismiss are due January 17, 2013; reply, if any, is due January 24, 2013. (Eichhorn, D) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/5/12 ORDERING that the hearing currently set for 12/20/12 is VACATED and RESET for 1/31/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Plaintiff shall file his opoosition and/or his Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment against defendants by 1/3/13. The total number of pages included in Plantiff's filing (brief) shall not exceed 35. Any pages exceeding the 35-page limit will be stricken. Defendants shall file one, consolidated reply to Plaintiff's opposition or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by 1/24/13. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE by David Miner to 254 MOTION for 35-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to 1/10/2013 re 245 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Ginter, Robert) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for 35-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to 1/10/2013 to file an Opposition to 245 Motion for Summary Judgment by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 12/4/2012 (Reader, L). (Entered: 12/02/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Todd Johnson, Viki Kiman, Efim Shargorodsky, Elena Shargorodsky, Dario Sandoval Shaik, and Juan Carlos Arauz Ramos in SUPPORT OF 245 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Viki Kiman, # 2 Declaration Efim Shargorodsky, # 3 Declaration Dario Sandoval Shaik, # 4 Declaration Juan Carlos Arauz Ramos)(Ginter, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2012 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Thomas Aceituno in SUPPORT OF 245 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Ginter, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2012 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Chester Mitchell and Catherine Mitchell in SUPPORT OF 245 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Ginter, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2012 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DECLARATION in SUPPORT OF 245 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Ginter, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2012 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Sondra Tornga in support of 245 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ginter, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2012 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Anne-Michelle Wand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ginter, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2012 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of R. Dale Ginter in SUPPORT OF 245 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ginter, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2012 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of David Miner in support of 245 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Ginter, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2012 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Todd E. Johnson, Viki Kiman, David Miner, Sarah Miner, Catherine Mitchell, Chester Mitchell, Efim Shargorodsky, Elena Shargorodsky, Sandra Tornga, Ann Michelle Wand. Attorney Ginter, Robert Dale added. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Points and Authorities, # 2 Statement, # 3 Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Proof of Service)(Ginter, Robert) Modified on 11/27/2012 (Manzer, C). (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 22 Order to Show Cause by Julie Anne Kahler. (Michel, G) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 228 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Sandra Tornga. (Bridgman, James) Modified on 10/23/2012 (Michel, G). (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 228 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Ann Michelle Wand. (Bridgman, James) Modified on 10/23/2012 (Michel, G). (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in response to 228 Order. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 10/22/2012 (Michel, G). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re 239 Designation of Counsel by Sandra Tornga. (Bridgman, James) Modified on 10/22/2012 (Michel, G). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Attorney James C. Bridgman ADDED for Sandra Tornga. (Bridgman, James) Modified on 10/22/2012 (Michel, G). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re 237 Designation of Counsel by Ann Michelle Wand. (Bridgman, James) Modified on 10/22/2012 (Michel, G). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Attorney James C. Bridgman ADDED for Ann Michelle Wand. (Bridgman, James) Modified on 10/22/2012 (Michel, G). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dimissal as to Bobby Hammond by Shepard Johnson. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 10/16/2012 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Manual Berrocal. (Bridgman, James) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Manual Berrocal. (Bridgman, James) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Manual Berrocal re 230 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 232 Declaration, 231 Declaration, 229 Motion to Dismiss. (Bridgman, James) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Manuel Jose Berrocal in support of 229 Motion to Dismiss. (Bridgman, James) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Rogelio Arosemena in support of 229 Motion to Dismiss. Attorney Bridgman, James C. added. (Bridgman, James) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Manual Berrocal in support of 229 Motion to Dismiss. (Bridgman, James) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Manual Berrocal. Attorney Bridgman, James C. added. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Bridgman, James) Modified on 2/15/2013 (Michel, G). (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 228 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/9/2012 ORDERING that the deadline by which defendants shall file one, consolidated motion for summary judgment is 11/21/2012. At this time, plaintiff may move for an entry of default against defendants Arosemena, Berrocal, Kahler, Lynch and Wand pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff shall file his opposition, if any, and /or his cross-motion for summary judgement against defendants by 12/6/2012. Defendants shall file one, conso lidated reply to plaintiff's opposition or cross-motion for summary judgment by 12/13/2012. A hearing on the motions for summary judgment will be held on 12/20/2012. The undersigned FURTHER ORDERS Plaintiff shall file with the court, within te (10) days from the date upon which this order is issued, a declaration setting forth the date and manner in which service of process was completed as to defendants Reinhold and Solarte. Defendants Arosemena, Berrocal, Hammond, Kahler, Lynch, Tornga and Wand shall show cause in writing, within 20 days of entry of this order, why an entry of default or other sanctions should not be entered against them for their failure to comply with court orders. (Zignago, K.)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 228 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/9/2012 ORDERING that the deadline by which defendants shall file one, consolidated motion for summary judgment is 11/21/2012. At this time, plaintiff may move for an entry of default against defendants Arosemena, Berrocal, Kahler, Lynch and Wand pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff shall file his opposition, if any, and /or his cross-motion for summary judgement against defendants by 12/6/2012. Defendants shall file one, consolidated reply to plaintiff's opposition or cross-motion for summary judgment by 12/13/2012. A hearing on the motions for summary judgment will be held on 12/20/2012. The undersigned FURTHER ORDERS Plaintiff shall file with the court, within te (10) days from the date upon which this order is issued, a declaration setting forth the date and manner in which service of process was completed as to defendants Reinhold and Solarte. Defendants Arosemena, Berrocal, Hammond, Kahler, Lynch, Tornga and Wand shall show cause in writing, within 20 days of entry of this order, why an entry of default or other sanctions should not be entered against them for their failure to comply with court orders. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: MOTION HEARING held on 10/4/2012 re 222 Findings and Recommendations (Motion,,, Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration. The court and will issue a written order setting a schedule for summary judgment and memorializing the issues discussed today. Plaintiffs Counsel Pro Se Plaintiff present. Defendants Counsel James Bridgemant for Chester and Catherine Mitchell, via telephone, Robert Dale Ginter forr David and Sarah Miner and Deborah Barron for Todd E. Johnson, Viki Kiman and Efim Shargorodsky present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by Shepard Johnson, Todd E. Johnson, Viki Kiman, David Miner, Sarah Miner, Catherine Mitchell, Chester Mitchell, Efim Shargorodsky, Elena Shargorodsky. (Barron, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 09/11/12 ORDERING that attorney James C. Bridgman is SUBSTITUTED in for defendants Catherine Mitchell and Chester Mitchell. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Chester Mitchell. (Bridgman, James) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 223 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/29/12 ADOPTING IN FULL 222 Findings and Recommendations; Plaintiffs claims against defendant Ford Hermanson are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and defendant Ford Hermanson is DISMISSED from the action. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 8/29/2012 (Meuleman, A).
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 223 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/29/12 ADOPTING IN FULL 222 Findings and Recommendations; Plaintiffs claims against defendant Ford Hermanson are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and defendant Ford Hermanson is DISMISSED from the action. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 8/29/2012 (Meuleman, A). (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/7/12 ORDERING 221 Reply filed by Ford Hermansen be STRICKEN and DENYING 219 Motion for Reconsideration. Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/4 /2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; status report due no later than 9/27/12. All discovery shall remain STAYED until the court's status conference has taken place. IT IS ALSO HEREBY RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims against defendant Ford Hermanson be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 21 and that defendant Ford Hermanson be dismissed from the action. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 222 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/7/12 ORDERING 221 Reply filed by Ford Hermansen be STRICKEN and DENYING 219 Motion for Reconsideration. Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/4/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; status report due no later than 9/27/12. All discovery shall remain STAYED until the court's status conference has taken place. IT IS ALSO HEREBY RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims against defendant Ford Hermanson be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 21 and that defendant Ford Hermanson be dismissed from the action. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        (STRICKEN - SEE 222 ORDER) REPLY by Ford Hermansen to Shepard Johnson's Brief dated 7/28/2012 re Ford Hermanson's. 218 (Reader, L) Modified on 8/9/2012 (Meuleman, A). (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/2/2012. The matter of the Domicil is submitted and the court will issue a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel Shepard Johnson, Pro Se present. Defendants Counsel Ford Hermanson, Pro Se via telephone. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re 218 Order by Shepard Johnson. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 218 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/31/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's unauthorized reply brief and supporting documentation (dkt. nos. 216 , 217 ) are STRICKEN. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                [*** STRICKEN PER 218 ORDER ***] REPLY BRIEF by Shepard Johnson re 212 Minute Order, 216 Reply Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 7/30/2012 (Reader, L). Modified on 7/31/2012 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 07/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  [*** STRICKEN PER 218 ORDER ***] REPLY BRIEF by Shepard Johnson re 210 Order and Findings and Recommendations, re 211 Objections. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shepard Johnson)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 7/30/2012 (Reader, L). Modified on 7/31/2012 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 07/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 213 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/18/12 ORDERING 210 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED IN FULL; Defendant Patricia Hermanson's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (dkt. no. 193) is GRANTED IN PART and plaintiff's claims against defendant Patricia Hermanson are SEVERED under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota.(Matson, R) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Shaddox-Waldrop for Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/10/2012: The Court has reviewed defendant Ford Hermanson's objections 211 . The Court nevertheless finds it appropriate to conduct a hearing, as currently scheduled, on August 2, 2012 at 10:00 am before Judge Hollows. Defendant may appear via telephone and shall make appropriate arrangements with the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Shaddox-Waldrop, A) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS by Defendant Ford Hermansen to oral argument concerning domicile. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 210 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/25/2012 GRANTING 209 Request for Oral Hearing; SETTING a Hearing on the matter of Defendant Ford Hermanson's domicile for 8/2/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; RECOMMENDING that Defendant Patricia Hermanson's 193 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction be granted in part; RECOMMENDING that the plaintiff's claims against Defendant Patricia Hermanson be severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST for Oral Hearing by Shepard Johnson re 202 Response, filed by Shepard Johnson, 206 Brief filed by Ford Hermansen. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to 206 Brief by Ford Hermansen. (Manzer, C) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by defendant Patricia Hermanson to plaintiff's 201 Opposition to 193 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Ford Hermansen regarding his domicile in Panama and combined Affidavit. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: Certain defendants were terminated and their cases severed and transferred to other Districts pursuant to 203 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and 204 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations. This case remains OPEN to all other defendants. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/8/12 ADOPTING in full 200 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING IN PART 181 Motion to Dismiss, and plaintiff's claims against defendant Parsons are SEVERED under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 193 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's 199 Request for Leave to amend the third amended complaint is DENIED. (Meuleman, A) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 203 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ADOPTING 197 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 05/31/12 and ORDERING that defendants Mode and Yarrington's 179 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED IN PART; plaintiff's claims against defendants Mode and Yarrington are SEVERED under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont. Defendant Ford Hermansen's 151 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is DENIED. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 197 Order and Findings and Recommendations re Defendant Hermansen's residence as of 10/28/2010 by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proof of Service) (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 5/29/2012 (Michel, G). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Shepard Johnson to 193 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 200 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/10/12, RECOMMENDING that Defendant Kim Parsons's 181 motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction be granted in part and that plaintiff's claims against defendant Parsons be severed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Defendant Kim Parsons's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) be denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend the third amended complaint be denied. Case referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 218 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/31/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's unauthorized reply brief and supporting documentation (dkt. nos. 216 , 217 ) are STRICKEN. (Zignago, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Shepard Johnson to 181 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 213 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/18/12 ORDERING 210 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED IN FULL; Defendant Patricia Hermanson's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (dkt. no. 193) is GRANTED IN PART and plaintiff's claims against defendant Patricia Hermanson are SEVERED under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota.(Matson, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Patricia Hermanson re 195 MOTION for Withdrawal of Motion to Stay Proceedings. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 210 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/25/2012 GRANTING 209 Request for Oral Hearing; SETTING a Hearing on the matter of Defendant Ford Hermanson's domicile for 8/2/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtro om 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; RECOMMENDING that Defendant Patricia Hermanson's 193 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction be granted in part; RECOMMENDING that the plaintiff's claims against Defendant Patricia Hermanson be severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/4/2012 ORDERING Plaintiff to file and serve either (a) a Brief and Declaration re Defendant Hermansen's residence as of 10/28/2010, or (b) a Request for Dismissal of Defendant Hermansen; ORDERING Defendant Hermansen to Reply to the Brief and Declaration, if submitted, within 21 days of service; RECOMMENDING that the 179 Motion to Dismiss the 119 Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction be granted in part and that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Mode and Yarrington be severed under F.R.Cv.P. 21 and transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont; RECOMMENDING that the 151 Motion to Dismiss the 119 Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction be denied. Motions referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 6/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ADOPTING 197 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 05/31/12 and ORDERING that defendants Mode and Yarrington's 179 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED IN PART; plaint iff's claims against defendants Mode and Yarrington are SEVERED under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont. Defendant Ford Hermansen's 151 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Walter Dean in SUPPORT OF 190 MOTION. (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 200 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/10/12, RECOMMENDING that Defendant Kim Parsons's 181 motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction be granted in part and that plaintiff's claims agains t defendant Parsons be severed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Defendant Kim Parsons's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pur suant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) be denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend the third amended complaint be denied. Case referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Withdrawal of Motion to Stay Proceedings re 193 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Patricia Hermanson. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 5/1/2012 (Meuleman, A). (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 197 Filed: 5/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/4/2012 ORDERING Plaintiff to file and serve either (a) a Brief and Declaration re Defendant Hermansen's residence as of 10/28/2010, or (b) a Request for Di smissal of Defendant Hermansen; ORDERING Defendant Hermansen to Reply to the Brief and Declaration, if submitted, within 21 days of service; RECOMMENDING that the 179 Motion to Dismiss the 119 Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdic tion be granted in part and that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Mode and Yarrington be severed under F.R.Cv.P. 21 and transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont; RECOMMENDING that the 151 Motion to Dismiss the 119 Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction be denied. Motions referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 194 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/30/12 GRANTING 192 Motion for Extension for filing a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file any opposition to 193 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION filed by Patricia Hermanson within 21 days of the date of service of this order. Defendant Patricia Hermansen shall file any reply brief within 14 days of service with plaintiff's opposition, after which the motion shall be submitted on the record without oral argument. (Meuleman, A) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 194 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/30/12 GRANTING 192 Motion for Extension for filing a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file any opposition to 193 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTI ON filed by Patricia Hermanson within 21 days of the date of service of this order. Defendant Patricia Hermansen shall file any reply brief within 14 days of service with plaintiff's opposition, after which the motion shall be submitted on the record without oral argument. (Meuleman, A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to DISMISS 119 Third Amended for LACK of JURISDICTION by Patricia Hermanson. (Michel, G) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to to file a Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff's 119 Third Amended Complaint by Patricia Hermanson. (Michel, G) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/20/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve process on defendants Berrocal and Arosemena 190 is GRANTED along the terms outlined in this order; Within seven (7) days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall effectuate service by having the required service papers and a copy of this order served on defendants Berrocal and Arosemena via BOTH: (a) e-mail, at all known e-mail addresses for each defendant, and (b) U.S. Express Mail International, all postage pre-paid, at all known mailing addresses for each defendant. Plaintiff shall also file a declaration from the process server indicating the date on which both methods of service were accomplished; Service will be deemed complete within 14 days after the papers to be served by U.S. Express Mail International are deposited in the mail. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave To Serve Service Of Process Via Email by Shepard Johnson re 169 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 4/18/2012 (Matson, R). (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 189 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/13/12 VACATING the 4/19/12 hearing on dfts' 151 and 179 Motions to Dismiss; these motions are submitted on the record without oral argument. In regards to dft Kim Parson's 181 Motion to Dismiss, pltf shall file an opposition within 21 days; dft Parsons shall file any reply within 14 days thereafter. (Manzer, C) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by defendants in support of 179 Motion to Dismiss 119 Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Smith, Gary) Modified on 4/13/2012 (Marciel, M). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [DISREGARD - DUPLICATE - REFER TO 188 FILING AS ORIGINAL] REPLY by defendants in support of 179 Motion to Dismiss 119 Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction. (Smith, Gary) Modified on 4/13/2012 (Marciel, M) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Shepard Johnson to 179 Motion to Dismiss 119 Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdictionMotion to Dismiss 119 Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Shepard Johnson to 151 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: [TEXT ONLY] Plaintiff's request for clarification (docket no. 183) is granted. Plaintiff is correct. The motions to dismiss of defendants Mode, Yarrington, and Hermansen will be heard on April 19, 2012, signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 04/03/2012. (Eichhorn, D) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST for Clarification by Shepard Johnson of number of motions to dismiss to be heard on 4/19/12 and specifically which defendants motions will be heard on that date. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 4/3/2012 (Meuleman, A). (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 182 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/30/12 DENYING 180 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of time. (Donati, J) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to DISMISS and Waiver of Service, by Kim Parsons. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for 7 days to 51 days-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to Motions to Dismiss 119 , 151 , and 179 and re 178 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 3/28/2012 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to DISMISS 119 Third Amended Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction by Michael Mode. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Lynn Yarrington, # 3 Declaration of Michael Mode) (Smith, Gary) Modified on 3/23/2012 (Marciel, M) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/22/12; Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve defendant Kim Parsons with process by publication (dkt. no. 173) is granted; Defendant Kim Parsons shall be served by publication pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e)(1) and Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 415.50; Within seven (7) days of this order, plaintiff shall make arrangements to publish summons for defendant Parsons in the Sacramento Bee newspaper and in Boulder, Colorado's Daily Camera newspaper once a week for four successive weeks, and shall file a declaration indicating when the notices will be published. Service will be deemed complete as provided in Cal. Gov't Code § 6064; Within seven (7) days of this order, plaintiff shall send copies of the summons, operative complaint, and this order for publication to defendant Parsons via mail and e-mail at all of her known mailing addresses and e-mail addresses. Furthermore, a copy of the summons, the operative complaint, and this order for publication shall be forthwith sent to defendant Parsons at any additional address or e-mail address ascertained before expiration of the time prescribed for publication of the summons.(Matson, R) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 176 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/21/2012 ADOPTING 169 Findings and Recommendations; DISMISSING claims against Defendants Judith Cohen, Maurine Smith and Susan Fine without prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 21; GRANTING, in part, 131 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; SEVERING and TRANSFERRING claims against Defendant Martha Thomas to USDC - District of Colorado pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 21. Copy of remand order sent to other court. Maurine E. Smith, Martha Thomas, Judith A. Cohen and Susan Fine TERMINATED. (Michel, G) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: re 174 Minute Order. Upon further review of Plaintiff's Motion 173 , the court vacates its previous minute order 174 . Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for Miscellaneous Relief is hereby under submission and the court will issue a written order.(Callen, V) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: re 173 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Plaintiff's motion filed on March 20, 2012 is vacated from the calendar. Plaintiff must abide by Rule 230(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 78. (Callen, V) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for LEAVE to serve via Publishing by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 3/21/2012 (Marciel, M). (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER from defendant Patricia Hermanson regarding appearance in action pursuant to 114 Answer filed 10/20/2011. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 171 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part 170 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/16/12. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for RECONSIDERATION and Clarification by Shepard Johnson re 169 Order and Findings and Recommendations. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 3/16/2012 (Reader, L). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 169 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/2/12 DENYING 168 Motion to continue Decision, DENYING 143 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery, DISCHARGING 154 Order to Show Cause and LIMITING Plaintiff's future filings. Plaintiff is GRANTED a final 60-day period within which to complete service of process on all defendants. It is HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims against defendants Cohen, Smith and Fine be dismissed without prejudice. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the 131 Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss filed by Martha Thomas be granted in part, plaintiff's claims against Thomas be severed pursuant to FRCP 21 and these claims be transferred to the United States District Court, District of Colorado. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Donati, J) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue Decision on Briefs (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/28/2012 (Meuleman, A). (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Shepard Johnson to 154 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS by Defendant Martha Thomas to 164 Reply. (Frascona, Monica) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS by Defendant Martha Thomas to the Court's consideration of plaintiff's references to deposition testimony. (Frascona, Monica) Modified on 2/24/2012 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Martha Thomas in support of 131 Motion to Dismiss. (Frascona, Monica) Modified on 2/24/2012 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED 160 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Shepard Johnson in re 158 Opposition to Motion. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED BRIEF by Shepard Johnson re subject matter jurisdiction and diversity of jurisdiction. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/22/2012 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED 160 DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in support of 158 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/21/2012 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 02/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in support of 158 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit part 1, # 2 Exhibit part 2, # 3 Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS in support of 158 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Miner part 2, # 2 Exhibit Fine part 1, # 3 Exhibit Fine part 2)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/21/2012 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION by Shepard Johnson to 131 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-48 part 1, # 2 Exhibits 1-48 part 2, # 3 Exhibits 1-48 part 3, # 4 Exhibits 1-48 part 4, # 5 Exhibits 1-48 part 5)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/17/2012 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF re Subject Matter Jurisdiction re 154 Order to Show Cause, by Shepard Johnson. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/17/2012 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 156 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/31/2012 VACATING the Motion Hearing on 2/16/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows, GRANTING IN PART 155 Motion th Continue, ORDERING Plaintiff to show cause in writing by 2/23/2012 as to why Defendants Arosemena, Berrocal, Reinhold, Smith, Fine, Parsons and Solarte Inn Corporation should not be dismissed pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(b). (Michel, G) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to CONTINUE from 2/16/2012 to 2/23/2012 by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 154 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/27/2012. Plaintiff shall either file a Brief addressing propriety of subject matter jurisdiction or move to dismiss U.S. Citizen defendants no later than 2/16/2012. The 2/9/20102 Hearing of defendant Martha Thomas's 141 Motion to Dismiss is VACATED. Plaintiff shall file a Response to Motion no later than 2/16/2012. Defendant Thomas may file a Reply by 2/23/2012. Plaintiff's 143 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery is taken UNDER SUBMISSION. Defendant Ford Hermansen's 151 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Hearing is RE-SET for 4/19/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH). Any other defendants intending to file a Motion to Dismiss shall file such by 3/22/2012 and notice for hearing on 4/19/2012 at 10:00 before Magistrate Judge Hollows. No later than 2/16/2012, plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why defendants Rogelio Arosemena, Manuel Berrocal, Peter Reinhold, Maurine E. Smith, Susan Fine, Kim Parsons, and Solarte Inn Corporation should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Discovery in this matter will remain STAYED pending final resolution of issue of subject matter jurisdiction as well as any Motions to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: MOTION HEARING held on 1/26/2012 re 143 Motion for Leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery filed by Shepard Johnson. The motion is submitted and the court will issue a written order. Plaintiffs Counsel Pro Se Plaintiff present. Defendants Counsel Jon Cantor via telephone, Kelly L. Pope and Gary Smith present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: re 151 Motion to Dismiss: The defendant's motion filed 1/24/2012 will be heard before Magistrate Judge Hollows on February 23, 2012 @ 10:00 a.m. in courtroom #9 on the 13th floor. If the parties have any questions please contact Valerie Callen, Court Clerk to Magistrate Judge Hollows @ (916) 930-4199. (Callen, V) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT for LACK of PERSONAL JURISDICTION by defendant Ford Hermansen. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by Shepard Johnson re 143 Motion for Leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,B,D,E,F, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Barron, Deborah) Modified on 1/13/2012 (Marciel, M). (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION by Martha Thomas to 143 Motion for Leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery. (Frascona, Monica) Modified on 1/13/2012 (Marciel, M). (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER vacating 144 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Callen, V) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: re 144 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. The Defendant filed a motion to dismiss attempting to place this matter before the court on Thursday, January 26, 2012. The defendant is directed to L.R. 230(b). The motion to dismiss is vacated at this time without prejudice to the defendant, subject to its refiling. (Callen, V) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by defendant Ford Hermansen. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of PERSONAL JURISDICTION by defendant Ford Hermansen. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in support. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for LEAVE to conduct jurisdictional or in the alternatively, REQUEST for 30-day Extension to respond to defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shepard Johnson, # 2 Proof of Service) (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 12/23/2011 (Duong, D). (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 119 Third Amended Complaint by Robert Hammond.(Duong, D) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING re 131 MOTION by Martha Thomas: re 136 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion,. (Frascona, Monica) Modified on 12/15/2011 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE and ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint by Judith A. Cohen. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judith A. Cohen. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 119 Third Amended Complaint by Judith A. Cohen. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: re 136 Notice to Reschedule Hearing on Motion. The defendant in this matter has scheduled the above motion to be heard on a date which the court does not hold hearings. Please schedule this matter on a regular Civil Law and Motion Calendar which is Thursday at 10:00 a.m. or contact the Courtroom Deputy, Valerie Callen at (916) 930-4199. (Callen, V) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on 131 Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing RESET for 02/06/12 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Frascona, Monica) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss, noticed for hearing before Judge Burrell on 2/6/12, is vacated. Pursuant to the Local Rules, motions in cases designated pro se are to be noticed for hearing before the assigned Magistrate Judge. re 131 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/9/11. (Furstenau, S) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Martha Thomas. (Husbands, Tamara) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER re 131 MOTION to DISMISS MOTION by Martha Thomas. (Husbands, Tamara) Modified on 12/9/2011 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Martha Thomas in support of 131 Motion to Dismiss . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Husbands, Tamara) Modified on 12/9/2011 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to DISMISS Third Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 02/06/12 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. by Martha Thomas. (Husbands, Tamara) Modified on 12/9/2011 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tamara A. Husbands on behalf of Martha Thomas. Attorney Husbands, Tamara A. added. (Husbands, Tamara) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 119 Amended Complaint by Viki Kiman. Attorney Barron, Deborah M. added.(Barron, Deborah) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Lynn Yarrington re 126 Answer to Amended Complaint. (Smith, Gary) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Michael Mode re 125 Answer to Amended Complaint. (Smith, Gary) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 119 Amended Complaint by Lynn Yarrington. Attorney Smith, Gary J. added.(Smith, Gary) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 119 Amended Complaint by Michael Mode. Attorney Smith, Gary J. added.(Smith, Gary) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 119 Amended Complaint by Sandra Tornga. (Owen, K) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to 80 Corrected Second Amended Complaint, by Ann Michelle Wand.(Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 119 Amended Complaint by Efim Shargorodsky, Elena Shargorodsky.(Barron, Deborah) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 119 Amended Complaint by Todd E. Johnson.(Barron, Deborah) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Judith A. Cohen, Susan Fine, Bobby Hamond, Kim Parsons, Maurine E. Smith, Solarte Inn Corporations* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shepard Johnson, In Pro Se* *6085 Seven Cedars Place* *Granite Bay, CA 95746*. (Marciel, M) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by Shepard Johnson. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 11/7/2011 (Marciel, M). (Entered: 11/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/3/11 ORDERING that the 11/10/11 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file a third Amended Complaint is vacated. Defendants Kahler and Tornga's answers and/or Motions to Dismiss 102 and 113 are DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file a third amended Complaint 111 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file and serve the third Amended complaint on the defendants who have already been served with process within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this order. A Status Conference is SET for 1/26/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by James Lynch.(Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Ford Hermansen.(Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 80 Amended Complaint by Efim Shargorodsky, Elena Shargorodsky. Attorney Barron, Deborah M. added.(Barron, Deborah) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 80 Amended Complaint by Patricia Hermanson.(Matson, R) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Sandra Tornga.(Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Shepard Johnson re 111 MOTION to AMEND. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 10/11/2011 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 10/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/8/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to AMEND the 80 Amended Complaint by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion # 2 Declaration of Shepard Johnson, # Proof of service)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 10/11/2011 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 10/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Proof of Service by Shepard Johnson re 109 Summons Returned Executed, 108 Summons Returned Executed. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: James Lynch served on 9/28/2011, answer due 10/19/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Patricia Hermanson served on 9/26/2011, answer due 10/17/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by James Lynch. (Michel, G) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Proof of Service of 2nd Amended Complaint on Martha Thomas by Shepard Johnson. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Proof of Service via US Mail by Shepard Johnson. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 80 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by David Miner, Sarah Miner. Attorney Pope, Kelly Lois added.(Pope, Kelly) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/26/2011 GRANTING 83 Motion for Reconsideration, no additional service of process on Dfts. Martha Thomas and Sondra Tornga is required, Pltf. shall serve the Second Amended Complaint on these Dfts. withing 28 days, Dfts. Response due within 28 days of being served; DENYING without prejudice 82 , 86 , 90 and 91 Motions to Dismiss, these Dfts. Responses' to Pltf's. Second Amended Complaint due withing 28 days. Motion Hearing scheduled for 10/6/2011 is VACATED. (Michel, G) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to be DISMISSED from this action by Julie Anne Kahler. (Michel, G) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Elena Shargorodsky served on 8/30/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/28/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lynn Yarrington served on 8/30/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/28/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michael Mode served on 8/30/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/28/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Viki Kiman served on 8/30/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/28/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sarah Miner served on 8/30/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/28/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: David Miner served on 8/30/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/27/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Efim Shargorodsky served. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/27/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Julie Anne Kahler served on 8/30/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/27/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Todd E. Johnson served on 8/30/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/27/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ford Hermansen served on 8/30/2011. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/27/2011 (Michel, G). (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 80 Amended Complaint by Elena Shargorodsky.(Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 80 Amended Complaint by Efim Shargorodsky.(Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Chester Mitchell re 83 Motion for Reconsideration. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Chester Mitchell.(Becknal, R) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Catherine Mitchell re 83 Motion for Reconsideration. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to be Dismissed from this action by Viki Kiman. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Catherine Mitchell.(Becknal, R) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 80 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Todd E. Johnson. Attorney Barron, Deborah M. added.(Barron, Deborah) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for RECONSIDERATION to correct the record by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) Before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shepard Johnson, # 2 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 9/7/2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint and MOTION TO DISMISS by Ford Hermansen.(Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rogelio Arosemena, Manual Berrocal, Patricia Hermanson, Todd E. Johnson, Viki Kiman, Sarah Miner, Michael Mode, Peter Reinhold, Efim Shargorodsky, Elena Shargorodsky, Ann Michelle Wand, Lynn Yarrington* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shepard Johnson* *6085 Seven Cedars Place* *Granite Bay, CA 95746*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shepard Johnson by Shepard Johnson.(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 8/24/2011 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEE 80 ] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shepard Johnson by Shepard Johnson.(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 8/24/2011 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/22/11 GRANTING 36 , 38 , 39 , 77 Motions to Set Aside and 71 Motion to Amend the Complaint: The hearing on the motion to amend is vacated from the calendar for September 1, 2011. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to SET ASIDE 24 Clerk's Entry of Default by Ford Hermansen (Hermanson). (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER re 5 First Amended Complaint by Catherine Mitchell. (Michel, G) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER re 5 First Amended Complaint by Chester Mitchell. (Michel, G) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: re 71 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition. The Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, currently set on Thursday, September 1, 2011 is hereby off calendar and under submission after time has passed for the filing of the opposition and reply. If the parties have any questions or concern, please contact Valerie Callen, the Court Clerk at (916)930-4199. (Callen, V) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/25/2011 ORDERING that plaintiff shall file oppositions to the 36 38 39 motions to set aside entry of default within fourteen (14) days of this order. No further extensions will be granted. These motions will then be taken under submission without a hearing.(Duong, D) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/9/2011 ORDERING attorney Robert Dale Ginter added for David Miner. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to AMEND the 5 Amended Complaint by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Shepard Johnson, # 3 Notice Proof of Service by US Mail)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 7/19/2011 (Becknal, R). (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by David Miner. (Ginter, Robert) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [DISREGARD - See Doc. 70 ] NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Robert Dale Ginter on behalf of David Miner. Attorney Ginter, Robert Dale added. (Ginter, Robert) Modified on 7/18/2011 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/7/11 ADOPTING 62 Findings and Recommendations, GRANTING 25 Trustee's Motion to Intervene and DENYING 27 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Donati, J) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/27/11 DENYING 63 Motion to Deny Trustee's Intervention filed by Shepard Johnson, and DENYING without prejudice 64 Request for Continuance filed by Shepard Johnson. (Meuleman, A) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by J. Russell Cunningham to 63 Motion to Deny Trustee's Intervention. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service of Trustee's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Trustee's Intervention)(Cunningham, J.) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF UNAVAILABIITY by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of service)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to DENY TRUSTEE'S INTERVENTION by Shepard Johnson. Motion Hearing set for 06/09/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Johnson-PRO SE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 5/13/2011 (Marciel, M). (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/22/11 RECOMMENDING that trustee's motion to intervene 25 be granted and trustee's motion to dismiss 27 be denied; motions REFERRED to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Motion to Intervene; parties may file objections within 14 days after being served with these F&R's. (Carlos, K) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION by Shepard Johnson to 25 Motion to Intervene, 27 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Proof of Service)(Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by J. Russell Cunningham in SUPPORT of 25 Motion to Intervene, 27 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of J. Michael Hopper, # 2 Declaration Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to the Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham, # 4 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, J.) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by J. Russell Cunningham in re 25 Motion to Intervene, 27 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, J.) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/15/2011 ORDERING that Plaintiffs 55 motion for clarification, filed February 9, 2011, is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's opposition to the motions to set aside entry of default, filed January 18, 2011, shall be due within fourteen days of an order adopting or rejecting this court's findings and recommendations disposing of the trustee's motions to intervene and to dismiss. Any reply may be filed within seven days after an opposition is filed. No sur-reply is permitted.(Duong, D) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Shepard Johnson re 55 Request for Clarification, 56 Declaration of Shepard Johnson. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/11/2011 (Duong, D). (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in support of 55 Request for Clarification. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/10/2011 (Duong, D). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST for Clarification of briefing schedule with dates certain for the briefing of motions to set aside entry of default filed by David Miner, Catherine Mitchell and Chester Mitchell by Shepard Johnson. (Johnson-PROSE EFILER, Shepard) Modified on 2/16/2011 (Duong, D). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/7/11 ORDERING that the March 3, 2011 hearing on 36 38 39 motions to set aside entry of default, filed by defendants Catherine Mitchell, Chester Mitchell, and David Miner on January 18, 2011 is vacated. The motions shall be submitted for decision without oral argument after all briefing has been filed. Plaintiff's 31 request for extension of time in which to file motions for default judgments, filed January 13, 2011, is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall not file any motions for default judgment until after the motions to intervene and dismiss have been decided, and until after defendants motions to set aside entry of default have been decided.(Duong, D) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION by Shepard Johnson to Hopper's REPLY in SUPPORT OF 25 Motion to Intervene, 27 Motion to Dismiss. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/04/11 ORDERING that plf's 32 Motion for Leave to File Electronically is GRANTED. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: MOTION HEARING held on 2/3/2011 re 29 Notice - Other, filed by J. Russell Cunningham, 30 Notice - Other, filed by J. Russell Cunningham.The court gives his tentative view. The parties argue their positions regarding the Motion to Dismiss.The parties are given two weeks from today's date to submit supplemental briefing at such time the matter will be deemed submitted and the court will issue an order.The plaintiff brings up his motion to submit his filing electronically. The court grants that request. Plaintiffs Counsel Shepart Johnson, Pro Se Plaintiff present. Defendants Counsel J. Russell Cunningham ad J. Luke Hendrix, Representing Mr. Harper present. Court Reporter/CD Number: 1 of 1. (Callen, V) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE f non availability by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by J. Russell Cunningham re 25 Motion to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, J.) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by J. Russell Cunningham re 27 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, J.) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF of SERVICE by Shepard Johnson re 43 Request for Judicial Notice, 45 Declaration, 44 Opposition to Motion, 46 Objections, 42 Opposition to Motion. (Carlos, K) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTION to extrinsic evidence and motion to strike extrinsic evidence from motion to dismiss by Plaintiff Shepard Johnson. (Carlos, K) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in SUPPORT OF Opposition 44 to Motion to Intervene 25 . (Carlos, K) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION by Shepard Johnson to 25 Motion to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Carlos, K) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION by Shepard Johnson to 27 Motion to Dismiss. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Sandra Tornga* (Duong, D) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sandra Tornga by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shepard Johnson)(Duong, D) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to SET ASIDE 24 Clerk's Entry of Default by David Miner. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of David Miner, # 3 Proof of Service)(Duong, D) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to SET ASIDE 24 Clerk's Entry of Default by Chester Mitchell. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Chester Mitchell)(Duong, D) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 5 First Amended Complaint by Chester Mitchell.(Duong, D) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to SET ASIDE 24 Clerk's Entry of Default by Catherine Mitchell. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Catherine Mitchell)(Duong, D) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 5 First Amended Complaint by Catherine Mitchell.(Duong, D) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Shepard Johnson re 32 MOTION, 33 Notice, 31 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to file motion for entry of default judgment. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of nonavailability by Shepard Johnson. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for approval for electronic filing by Shepard Johnson. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to file motion for entry of default judgment by Shepard Johnson. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING by J. Russell Cunningham re 25 Motion to Intervene. Hearing RESET for 02/03/11 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, J.) Modified on 1/11/2011 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING by J. Russell Cunningham re 27 Motion to Dismiss. Hearing RESET for 02/03/11 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, J.) Modified on 1/11/2011 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss, noticed for hearing before Judge Burrell on 2/7/11, is vacated. Pursuant to the Local Rules, motions in cases designated pro se are to be noticed for hearing before the assigned Magistrate Judge. re 27 Motion to Dismiss, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/4/11. (Furstenau, S) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to DISMISS by J. Russell Cunningham. Motion Hearing set for 02/07/11 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Declaration of J. Michael Hopper, # 3 Exhibits, # 4 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, J.) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Intervene, noticed for hearing before Judge Burrell on 2/7/11, is vacated. Pursuant to the Local Rules, motions in cases designated pro se, are to be noticed for hearing before the assigned Magistrate Judge. re 25 Motion to Intervene, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/4/11. (Furstenau, S) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to INTERVENE by J. Russell Cunningham. Attorney Cunningham, J. Russell added. Motion Hearing set for 02/07/11 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibits, # 4 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, J.) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Ford Hermansen, Julie Anne Kahler, James Lynch, David Miner, Catherine Mitchell, Chester Mitchell, Martha Thomas* (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF of SERVICE by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in SUPPORT of 21 APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to defendant Chester C. Mitchell. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Chester Mitchell by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in SUPPORT of 19 APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to defendant Martha Thomas. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Martha Thomas by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson re 17 Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant Ford Hermansen. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ford Hermansen by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson re 15 Request for Entry of Default as to David Miner. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to David Miner by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson re 13 Request for Entry of Default. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Catherine Mitchell by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in SUPPORT of 11 Request for Entry of Default. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Julie Anne Kahler by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Shepard Johnson in SUPPORT of 9 Request for Entry of Default. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to James Lynch by Shepard Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sandra Tornga served on 12/16/2010. (Williams, D) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ford Hermansen, Julie Anne Kahler, David Miner, James Lynch, Catherine Mitchell, Chester Mitchell, Martha Thomas and Sandra Tornga served on 10/29/2010.(Duong, D) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET by Shepard Johnson. (Duong, D) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Hermansen, Julie Anne Kahler, James Lynch, David Miner, Catherine Mitchell, Chester Mitchell, Martha Thomas, Sandra Tornga by Shepard Johnson.(Reader, L) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ford Hermansen, James Lynch, David Miner, Sandra Tornga* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shepard Johnson* *6085 Seven Cedars Place* *Granite Bay, CA 95746*. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Julie Anne Kahler, Catherine Mitchell, Chester Mitchell, Martha Thomas, Monte Watson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shepard Johnson* *6085 Seven Cedars Place* *Granite Bay, CA 95746*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Shepard Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 334 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?