Sandisk Corporation v. Round Rock Research LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-05243
District Judge Richard Seeborg, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 11:50 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Black Chang & Hamill LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Desmarais LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon T Hohenthaner +1 212 351 3400 jhohenthaner@desmaraisllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ameet A. Modi +1 212 351 3400 amodi@desmaraisllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com
SanDisk Corporation SanDisk Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chuck P. Ebertin +1 650 687 8204 +1 650 618 8508 cebertin@velaw.com
No Logo Asus Computer International, Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Schnurer +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 schnurer@fr.com
No Logo Asustek Computer, Inc., Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Schnurer +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 schnurer@fr.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (386) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
      REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION DISCLOSED IN PREVIOUS FILINGS. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Certain Claims and Entering Final Judgment filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/3/2014) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 146 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 RR Reply [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                  EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 336 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 SD Reply [SEALED], # 2 Garcia Ex 1 [SEALED], # 3 Garcia Ex 5 [SEALED], # 4 Declaration Bhagath [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                    EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 333 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 RR Reply [SEALED], # 2 Cowell Ex A [PUBLIC], # 3 Cowell Ex A [SEALED], # 4 Cowell Ex B [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                      EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 329 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 SD Opp [SEALED], # 2 Garcia Ex A [SEALED], # 3 Garcia Ex B [SEALED], # 4 Garcia Ex C [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                        EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 326 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 RR Opp [SEALED], # 2 Afromowitz Ex 1 [SEALED], # 3 Afromowitz Ex 2 [SEALED, # 4 Zeidman Ex A [SEALED], # 5 Zeidman Ex B [PUBLIC], # 6 Zeidman Ex B [SEALED], # 7 Zeidman Ex C [SEALED], # 8 Zeidman Ex D [SEALED], # 9 Zeidman Ex F [SEALED], # 10 Cowell Ex 1 [SEALED], # 11 Cowell Ex 4 [SEALED], # 12 Cowell Ex 5 [SEALED], # 13 Cowell Ex 6 [SEALED], # 14 Cowell Ex 7 [SEALED], # 15 Cowell Ex 8 [SEALED], # 16 Cowell Ex 9 [SEALED], # 17 Cowell Ex 10 [SEALED], # 18 Cowell Ex 11 [SEALED], # 19 Cowell Ex 13 [SEALED], # 20 Cowell Ex 14 [SEALED], # 21 Cowell Ex 15 [SEALED], # 22 Cowell Ex 21 [SEALED], # 23 Cowell Ex 22 [SEALED], # 24 Cowell Ex 23 [SEALED], # 25 Cowell Ex 24 [SEALED], # 26 Cowell Ex 25 [SEALED], # 27 Cowell Ex 1120 [SEALED], # 28 Cowell Ex 1239 [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                          EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 317 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 SD MSJ [SEALED], # 2 Tobin Ex 1 [SEALED], # 3 Tobin Ex 4 [SEALED], # 4 Tobin Ex 5 [PUBLIC], # 5 Tobin Ex 5 [SEALED], # 6 Tobin Ex 6 [PUBLIC], # 7 Tobin Ex 6 [SEALED], # 8 Tobin Ex 7 [SEALED], # 9 Tobin Ex 8 [SEALED], # 10 Tobin Ex 9 [SEALED], # 11 Tobin Ex 11 [SEALED], # 12 Tobin Ex 13 [PUBLIC], # 13 Tobin Ex 13 [SEALED], # 14 Maltiel Ex B [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                            EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 314 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 RR MSJ [SEALED], # 2 Packin Ex. 2 [SEALED], # 3 Packin Ex. 3 [SEALED], # 4 Packin Ex. 4 [SEALED], # 5 Packin Ex. 5 [SEALED], # 6 Packin Ex. 6 [SEALED], # 7 Packin Ex. 7 [SEALED], # 8 Packin Ex. 8 [SEALED], # 9 Packin Ex. 9 [SEALED], # 10 Packin Ex. 10 [SEALED], # 11 Packin Ex. 11 [SEALED], # 12 Packin Ex. 13 [SEALED], # 13 Packin Ex. 16 [SEALED], # 14 Packin Ex. 17 [SEALED], # 15 Packin Ex. 18 [SEALED], # 16 Packin Ex. 19 [SEALED], # 17 Packin Ex. 20 [SEALED], # 18 Packin Ex. 21 [SEALED], # 19 Packin Ex. 22 [SEALED], # 20 Packin Ex. 23 [SEALED], # 21 Packin Ex. 25 [SEALED], # 22 Packin Ex. 26 [SEALED], # 23 Packin Ex. 27 [SEALED], # 24 Packin Ex. 28 [SEALED], # 25 Packin Ex. 29 [SEALED], # 26 Packin Ex. 30 [SEALED], # 27 Packin Ex. 31 [SEALED], # 28 Packin Ex. 35 [SEALED], # 29 Packin Ex. 36 [SEALED], # 30 Packin Ex. 37 [SEALED], # 31 Packin Ex. 38 [PUBLIC], # 32 Packin Ex. 38 [SEALED], # 33 Zeidman Ex. 1 [SEALED], # 34 Zeidman Ex. 2 [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                              EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 298 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 SD Opp to Mtn to Strike [SEALED], # 2 Ta Ex. C [PUBLIC], # 3 Ta Ex. C [SEALED], # 4 Ta Ex. G [SEALED], # 5 Ta Ex. H [SEALED], # 6 Ta Ex. I [SEALED], # 7 Ta Ex. J [SEALED], # 8 Ta Ex. L [SEALED], # 9 Ta Ex. M [SEALED], # 10 Ta Ex. N [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 286 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 RR Mtn to Strike [SEALED], # 2 Packin Ex. 2 [SEALED], # 3 Packin Ex. 3 [SEALED], # 4 Packin Ex. 11 [PUBLIC], # 5 Packin Ex. 11 [SEALED], # 6 Packin Ex. 12 [SEALED], # 7 Packin Ex. 15 [SEALED], # 8 Packin Ex. 16 [SEALED], # 9 Packin Ex. 17 [SEALED], # 10 Packin Ex. 18 [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                  EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 284 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 SD Reply [SEALED], # 2 Declaration of Kenneth Bell [PUBLIC], # 3 Declaration of Kenneth Bell [SEALED], # 4 Ebertin Ex. 15 [SEALED], # 5 Ebertin Ex. 16 [PUBLIC], # 6 Ebertin Ex. 16 [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                    EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 277 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 RR Opp to SD Mtn to Strike [SEALED], # 2 Packin Ex 6 [SEALED], # 3 Packin Ex 7 [SEALED], # 4 Packin Ex 8 [SEALED], # 5 Packin Ex 9 [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                      EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 272 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 SD Motion to Strike [SEALED], # 2 Ebertin Ex. 1 [PUBLIC], # 3 Ebertin Ex. 1 [SEALED], # 4 Ebertin Ex. 2 [PUBLIC], # 5 Ebertin Ex. 2 [SEALED], # 6 Ebertin Ex. 3 [PUBLIC], # 7 Ebertin Ex. 3 [SEALED], # 8 Ebertin Ex. 6 [PUBLIC], # 9 Ebertin Ex. 6 [SEALED], # 10 Ebertin Ex. 8 [PUBLIC], # 11 Ebertin Ex. 8 [SEALED], # 12 Ebertin Ex. 10 [PUBLIC], # 13 Ebertin Ex. 10 [SEALED], # 14 Ebertin Ex. 11 [PUBLIC], # 15 Ebertin Ex. 11 [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                        EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 133 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Ebertin Ex. 26 [SEALED], # 2 Ebertin Ex. 36 [SEALED], # 3 Ebertin Ex. 37 [SEALED], # 4 Ebertin Ex. 38 part 1 [SEALED], # 5 Ebertin Ex. 38 part 2 [SEALED], # 6 Ebertin Ex. 39 [SEALED], # 7 Ebertin Ex. 40 [SEALED], # 8 Ebertin Ex. 41 [SEALED], # 9 Ebertin Ex. 42 [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                          EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Previously filed under Docket No. 132 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED SD Opp to RR MSJ, # 2 Declaration of Kenneth Bell, # 3 Declaration of Kenneth Bell [SEALED], # 4 Bell Ex. A [SEALED], # 5 Bell Ex. B [SEALED], # 6 Bell Ex. C [SEALED], # 7 Bell Ex. D [SEALED], # 8 Bell Ex. E [SEALED], # 9 Declaration of Mehrdad Mofidi [PUBLIC], # 10 Declaration of Mofidi [SEALED], # 11 Mofidi Ex. A [SEALED], # 12 Mofidi Ex. B [SEALED], # 13 Todd Waltze Ex. A [SEALED], # 14 Waltze Ex. B [SEALED], # 15 Waltze Ex. C [SEALED], # 16 Waltze Ex. D [SEALED], # 17 Waltze Ex. E [SEALED], # 18 Waltze Ex. F [SEALED], # 19 Ebertin Ex. 1 [SEALED], # 20 Ebertin Ex. 2 [SEALED], # 21 Ebertin Ex. 3 [SEALED], # 22 Ebertin Ex. 4 [SEALED], # 23 Ebertin Ex. 5 [SEALED], # 24 Ebertin Ex. 6 [SEALED], # 25 Ebertin Ex. 7 [SEALED], # 26 Ebertin Ex. 8 [SEALED], # 27 Ebertin Ex. 9 [SEALED], # 28 Ebertin Ex. 10 [SEALED], # 29 Ebertin Ex. 11 [SEALED], # 30 Ebertin Ex. 12 [SEALED], # 31 Ebertin Ex. 13 [SEALED], # 32 Ebertin Ex. 14 [SEALED], # 33 Ebertin Ex. 15 [SEALED], # 34 Ebertin Ex. 16 [SEALED], # 35 Ebertin Ex. 17 [SEALED], # 36 Ebertin Ex. 18 [SEALED], # 37 Ebertin Ex. 19 [SEALED], # 38 Ebertin Ex. 20 [SEALED], # 39 Ebertin Ex. 21 [SEALED], # 40 Ebertin Ex. 22 [SEALED], # 41 Ebertin Ex. 23 [SEALED], # 42 Ebertin Ex. 24 [SEALED])(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                            EXHIBITS re 362 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings Exhibits B and C to Cowell Declaration previously filed under Docket No. 123 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 362 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                              Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Previous Briefings filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard Cowell, # 2 Declaration of Efren Garcia, # 3 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER RE DAUBERT MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER RE ADDITIONAL MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE INVALIDITY AND INFRINGEMENT AS TO '839 PATENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 358 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE PATENT EXHAUSTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                        CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION [DKT. # 345] HEARING. Motion Hearing previously set for 6/12/14 has been Rescheduled to 6/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE to re 355 Notice (Other) Round Rock's Notice That the Court Need Not Decide Motions Regarding Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 5,682,345 by Sandisk Corporation. (Wong, Ryan) (Filed on 5/29/2014) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Round Rock Research LLC THAT THE COURT NEED NOT DECIDE MOTIONS REGARDING CLAIM 1 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,682,345 (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/28/2014) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Declaration of EFREN GARCIA in Support of 349 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 349 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE by Sandisk Corporation of Withdrawal of David Tobin (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 5/23/2014) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Re: Sandisk's Motion To Exclude Opinions And Testimony Of Round Rock's Experts filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 346 , 345 ) (Wong, Ryan) (Filed on 5/23/2014) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/22/2014) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE (re 345 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF ROUND ROCK'S EXPERTS ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tamir Packin, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 17)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/22/2014) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tamir Packin, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Opposition (Unredacted), # 4 Opposition (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 4 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 6 (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 8 (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit 9 (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit 10 (Unredacted), # 15 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted), # 16 Exhibit 12 (Unredacted), # 17 Exhibit 13 (Unredacted), # 18 Exhibit 14 (Unredacted), # 19 Exhibit 15 (Unredacted), # 20 Exhibit 16 (Unredacted), # 21 Exhibit 18 (Unredacted), # 22 Exhibit 19 (Unredacted), # 23 Exhibit 20 (Unredacted), # 24 Exhibit 21 (Unredacted), # 25 Exhibit 1266 (Unredacted), # 26 Exhibit 1355 (Unredacted), # 27 Exhibit 1356 (Unredacted))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/22/2014) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Declaration in Support of 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Related document(s) 344 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/12/2014) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandisk Corporation re 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Lam, Leo) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Declaration of Ryan Wong in Support of 345 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF ROUND ROCK'S EXPERTS filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 345 ) (Lam, Leo) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF ROUND ROCK'S EXPERTS filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 5/22/2014. Replies due by 5/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Round Rock's Experts)(Lam, Leo) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ryan Wong ISO Admin Mtn to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Admin Mtn to Seal, # 3 UnRedacted Mtn to Exclude, # 4 Redacted Mtn to Exclude, # 5 Decl of Ryan Wong ISO Mtn to Exclude, # 6 Unredacted Ex. A - Zeidman Report, # 7 Redacted Ex. A - Zeidman Report, # 8 Unredacted Ex. B - Zeidman Reply, # 9 Redacted Ex. B - Zeidman Reply, # 10 Unredacted Ex. C - Zeidman Depo, # 11 Redacted Ex. C - Zeidman Depo, # 12 Unredacted Ex. D - Zeidman Suppl. Report, # 13 Redacted Ex. D - Zeidman Suppl. Report, # 14 Unredacted Ex. E - Knittel Report, # 15 Redacted Ex. E - Knittel Report, # 16 Unredacted EX. F - Knittel Reply, # 17 Redacted EX. F - Knittel Reply, # 18 Unredacted Ex. G - Knittel Depo, # 19 Redacted Ex. G - Knittel Depo, # 20 Unredacted Ex. H - Wagner Report, # 21 Redacted Ex. H - Wagner Report, # 22 Unredacted Ex. I - Wagner Depo, # 23 Redacted Ex. I - Wagner Depo, # 24 Unredacted Ex. J - SAN00220221, # 25 Redacted Ex. J - SAN00220221, # 26 Unredacted Ex. K - Glennon Depo, # 27 Redacted Ex. K - Glennon Depo, # 28 Pubic Ex. L - Afromowitz Report, # 29 Public Ex. M - Maltiel Report, # 30 Unredacted Ex. N - Invention Disclosure, # 31 Redacted Ex. N - Invention Disclosure)(Lam, Leo) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-25-2014, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (Related documents(s) 342 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 5/1/2014) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sandisk Corporation for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Ryan, Christopher) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 4/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research LLC for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/26/2014) (Entered: 04/26/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry: Motions Hearing held on 4/25/2014 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 4/25/2014). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2014) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Sandisk Corporation of Withdrawal of Charles Ossola (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 4/24/2014) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 338 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by Sandisk Corporation of Withdrawal of Chuck Ebertin (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 4/17/2014) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Declaration of Efren Garcia in Support of 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 332 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 4/7/2014) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPLY (re 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Damages, Exhaustion, Invalidity and Non-Infringement ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Efren Garcia, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in SanDisk's Reply and Exhibits re its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Efren Garcia, # 3 REDACTED Reply brief, # 4 SEALED Reply brief, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Garcia Dec, # 6 Exhibit 2 to Garcia Dec, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Garcia Dec, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Garcia Dec, # 9 Declaration of Shrikar Bhagath)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research LLC re 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 333 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REPLY (re 314 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement and Validity ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard Cowell)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard Cowell, # 2 Exhibit A (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit B (Unredacted), # 4 (Unredacted) Round Rock SJ Motion Reply, # 5 (Redacted) Round Rock SJ Motion Reply)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan K.M. Wong , Robert A. Van Nest, Christa M. Anderson, and Leo L. Lam (Wong, Ryan) (Filed on 4/1/2014) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of 325 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Round Rock's Opposition filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 325 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 314 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement and Validity ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Efren Garcia, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/27/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 328 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in SanDisk's Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Efren Garcia, # 3 REDACTED Opposition, # 4 SEALED version, # 5 Exhibit A (Sealed), # 6 Exhibit B (Sealed), # 7 Exhibit C (Sealed))(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/27/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research LLC re 325 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Round Rock's Opposition (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/27/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Damages, Exhaustion, Invalidity and Non-Infringement ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Richard Cowell, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 26, # 7 Exhibit 27, # 8 Declaration of Martin Afromowitz)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/27/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Round Rock's Opposition filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Richard Cowell, # 3 Exhibit A of Zeidman Dec. (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit B of Zeidman Dec. (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit C of Zeidman Dec. (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit D of Zeidman Dec. (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit F of Zeidman Dec. (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 1 of Afromowitz Dec. (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 2 of Afromowitz Dec. (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 1 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 2 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 3 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit 4 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit 5 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 15 Exhibit 6 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 16 Exhibit 7 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 17 Exhibit 8 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 18 Exhibit 9 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 19 Exhibit 10 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 20 Exhibit 11 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 21 Exhibit 13 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 22 Exhibit 14 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 23 Exhibit 15 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 24 Exhibit 16 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 25 Exhibit 17 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 26 Exhibit 19 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 27 Exhibit 21 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 28 Exhibit 22 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 29 Exhibit 23 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 30 Exhibit 24 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 31 Exhibit 25 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 32 Exhibit 1072 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 33 Exhibit 1120 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 34 Exhibit 1239 of Cowell Dec (Unredacted), # 35 Declaration of Zeidman (Unredacted), # 36 Declaration of Zeidman (Redacted), # 37 Round Rock Opposition (Unredacted), # 38 Round Rock Opposition (Redacted))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/27/2014) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 324 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 323 REGARDING HEARING DATES FOR PENDING MOTIONS. Motions (Dkt. Nos. #123, #141, #272, #286, #314, #317) Hearing set for 4/25/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/24/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING HEARING DATES FOR PENDING MOTIONS filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY. Daubert Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/24/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Declaration of Richard Cowell in Support of 316 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in SanDisk's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMicron Technology Inc.. (Related document(s) 316 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Efren Garcia in Support of 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 312 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Discovery Dates filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Ron Maltiel in Support of 317 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Damages, Exhaustion, Invalidity and Non-Infringement filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Errata D)(Related document(s) 317 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Damages, Exhaustion, Invalidity and Non-Infringement filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 3/27/2014. Replies due by 4/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Tobin, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 14, # 5 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 316 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in SanDisk's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of David Tobin, # 3 REDACTED MSJ, # 4 SEALED MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 1 (SEALED), # 6 Exhibit 4 (SEALED), # 7 Exhibit 5 (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit 6 (SEALED), # 9 Exhibit 7 (SEALED), # 10 Exhibit 8 (SEALED), # 11 Exhibit 9 (SEALED), # 12 Exhibit 10 (SEALED), # 13 Exhibit 11 (SEALED), # 14 Exhibit 12 (SEALED), # 15 Exhibit 13 (SEALED), # 16 Exhibit 1269 (SEALED), # 17 Exhibit 1270 (SEALED), # 18 Exhibit 1271 (SEALED), # 19 Exhibit 1272 (SEALED), # 20 Exhibit 1273 (SEALED), # 21 Exhibit 1274 (SEALED), # 22 Exhibit 1275 (SEALED), # 23 Exhibit B to Maltiel Dec (SEALED))(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research LLC re 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement and Validity filed by Round Rock Research LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 3/27/2014. Replies due by 4/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Robert Zeidman, # 3 Declaration of Tamir Packin, # 4 Exhibit 3 of Zeidman Decl., # 5 Exhibit 1 of Packin Decl., # 6 Exhibit 12 of Packin Decl., # 7 Exhibit 14 of Packin Decl., # 8 Exhibit 15 of Packin Decl., # 9 Exhibit 24 of Packin Decl., # 10 Exhibit 32 of Packin Decl., # 11 Exhibit 33 of Packin Decl., # 12 Exhibit 34 of Packin Decl.)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS re 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment Unredacted Exhibit 16 to Packin Decl. (Omitted in Error) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Related document(s) 312 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tamir Packin, # 2 Exhibit 1 of Zeidman Decl. (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 2 of Zeidman Decl. (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 2 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 3 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 4 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 5 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 6 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 7 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 8 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 9 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 10 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit 11 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit 13 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 15 Exhibit 17 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 16 Exhibit 18 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 17 Exhibit 19 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 18 Exhibit 20 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 19 Exhibit 21 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 20 Exhibit 22 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 21 Exhibit 23 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 22 Exhibit 25 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 23 Exhibit 26 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 24 Exhibit 27 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 25 Exhibit 28 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 26 Exhibit 29 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 27 Exhibit 30 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 28 Exhibit 31 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 29 Exhibit 35 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 30 Exhibit 36 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 31 Exhibit 37 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 32 Exhibit 38 of Packin Decl. (Unredacted), # 33 Round Rock SJ Motion (Unredacted), # 34 Round Rock SJ Motion (Redacted))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SETH ADAM LINDNER PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 310 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING HEARINGS ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Sandisk Corporation Regarding Submitted Matters Pursuant to Local Rules 7-7(e) and 7-13 (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/12/2014) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Sandisk Corporation of Withdrawal of Andrew Xinghan Ng (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/12/2014) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Kimmel (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8442410.) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Kimmel, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/11/2014) Modified on 3/11/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ELIZABETH KIMMEL PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. 307 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Kimmel (Filing fee $ 305.) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Kimmel, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/11/2014) Modified on 3/11/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Janice Ta in Support of 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Exhibits to Round Rock's Reply filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 301 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/7/2014) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research LLC re 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Exhibits to Round Rock's Reply (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/3/2014) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 286 MOTION to Strike Portions of SanDisk's Expert Reports ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tamir Packin, # 2 Exhibit 25)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/3/2014) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Exhibits to Round Rock's Reply filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tamir Packin, # 2 Exhibit 20 (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 21 (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 22 (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 23 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 24 (Unredacted))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/3/2014) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Seth Lindner ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8419971.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/03/2014 filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lindner, Seth) (Filed on 3/3/2014) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 286 MOTION to Strike Portions of SanDisk's Expert Reports ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Janice Ta, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit K)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in its Opposition to Round Rock's Motion to Strike Portions of SanDisk's Expert Reports filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Janice Ta, # 3 Redacted Opposition, # 4 SEALED version Opposition, # 5 Exhibit C--SEALED, # 6 Exhibit D--SEALED, # 7 Exhibit F--SEALED, # 8 Exhibit G--SEALED, # 9 Exhibit H--SEALED, # 10 Exhibit I--SEALED, # 11 Exhibit J--SEALED, # 12 Exhibit L--SEALED, # 13 Exhibit M--SEALED, # 14 Exhibit N--SEALED, # 15 Exhibit O--SEALED)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 2/24/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 247 SanDisk's Motion to Compel. (jsclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO DENIAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research LLC re 289 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of 285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in its Motion to Strike filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 285 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 2/14/2014) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Jon Hohenthaner re 282 Order on Motion to Compel Declaration of Jon Hohenthaner In Support of Round Rock's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge (Motion filed under seal at Docket No. 289 ) (Correction of Docket No. 290 ) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. Responses due by 2/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ***ERRONEOUS AND DUPLICATE ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOC NO. 291*** Declaration of Jon Hohenthaner In Support of Round Rock's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 289 ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jon Hohenthaner, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (under seal), # 4 Exhibit Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (redacted), # 5 Exhibit A (under seal), # 6 Exhibit A (redactedl))(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2014) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research LLC re 285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in its Motion to Strike (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Portions of SanDisk's Expert Reports filed by Round Rock Research LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 2/24/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Tamir Packin, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 13, # 12 Exhibit 14)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in its Motion to Strike filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Unredacted Motion to Strike, # 3 Redacted Motion to Strike, # 4 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 12 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 15 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 16 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 17 (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 18 (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 19 (Unredacted))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 284 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 272 MOTION to Strike Portions of Round Rock's Expert Reports ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth Bell (Redacted), # 2 Declaration of Chuck Ebertin, # 3 Exhibit 16 (Redacted))(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding SanDisk's Reply Brief filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Chuck Ebertin, # 3 Reply Brief--REDACTED, # 4 Reply Brief--SEALED, # 5 Exhibit 15--SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 16--REDACTED, # 7 Exhibit 16--SEALED, # 8 Declaration of Ken Bell--REDACTED, # 9 Declaration of Ken Bell--SEALED)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE: ROUND ROCK RESEARCHS MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 243). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/29/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Janice Ta in Support of 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Round Rock's Opposition and Exhibits to SanDisk's Motion to Strike filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 276 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sandisk Corporation for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; and granting 269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corey (Date Filed: 1/24/2014) re 243 MOTION to Compel Discovery [Redacted] filed by Round Rock Research LLC, and 247 MOTION to Compel Documents from Round Rock Research LLC filed by Sandisk Corporation. (FTR Recording 10:45-11:04; 11:26-12:33) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 272 MOTION to Strike Portions of Round Rock's Expert Reports ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tamir Packin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 (REDACTED) Round Rock Opposition to Motion to Strike, # 4 (UNREDACTED) Round Rock Opposition to Motion to Strike, # 5 Exhibit 6 (UNREDACTED), # 6 Exhibit 7 (UNREDACTED), # 7 Exhibit 8 (UNREDACTED), # 8 Exhibit 9 (UNREDACTED))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 269 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in SanDisk's Reply Brief including Declaration of Richard Cowell filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit A (Redacted))(Related document(s) 269 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/10/2014) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Janice Ta in Support of 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Discovery filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 266 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/10/2014) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 272 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Portions of Round Rock's Expert Reports filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/23/2014. Replies due by 1/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Chuck Ebertin, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6 REDACTED, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 10 REDACTED, # 9 Exhibit 11 REDACTED, # 10 Exhibit 12, # 11 Exhibit 13, # 12 Exhibit 14)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/9/2014) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information and Exhibits relating to SanDisk's Motion to Strike filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Chuck Ebertin, # 3 REDACTED Motion to Strike, # 4 CONFIDENTIAL Motion to Strike, # 5 Exhibit 1--Confidential, # 6 Exhibit 2--Confidential, # 7 Exhibit 3--Confidential, # 8 Exhibit 6--Confidential, # 9 Exhibit 6--REDACTED, # 10 Exhibit 8--Confidential, # 11 Exhibit 10--Confidential, # 12 Exhibit 10--REDACTED, # 13 Exhibit 11--Confidential, # 14 Exhibit 11-REDACTED)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/9/2014) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration in Support of 268 Brief regarding SanDisk's Motion to Compel filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 268 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in SanDisk's Reply Brief filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Chuck Ebertin, # 3 REDACTED-- Reply, # 4 Reply--CONFIDENTIAL, # 5 Exhibit 22--CONFIDENTIAL, # 6 Exhibit 23-CONFIDENTIAL, # 7 Exhibit 24-CONFIDENTIAL, # 8 Exhibit 25-CONFIDENTIAL, # 9 Exhibit 26-CONFIDENTIAL, # 10 Exhibit 27--CONFIDENTIAL, # 11 Exhibit 28 CONFIDENTIAL, # 12 Exhibit 29 CONFIDENTIAL)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief re 258 Opposition/Response to Motion [REDACTED] Reply Brief filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 258 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 243 MOTION to Compel Discovery [Redacted] ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard Cowell, # 2 Exhibit 25 (Redacted))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Richard Cowell, # 3 (Unredacted) Reply ISO Motion to Compel, # 4 (Redacted) Reply ISO Motion to Compel, # 5 Exhibit 19 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 20 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 21 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 22 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 23 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 24 (Unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 25 (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 25 (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit 26 (Unredacted))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order granting 242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Richard Cowell in Support of 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Related document(s) 260 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 262 Declaration in Opposition, Exhibit X (also filed under Docket 260) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 262 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/31/2013) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of David Tobin in Opposition to 261 Opposition/Response to Motion filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit V, # 4 Exhibit W, # 5 Exhibit Y, # 6 Exhibit Z, # 7 Errata AA)(Related document(s) 261 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 243 MOTION to Compel Discovery [Redacted] ) REDACTED OPPOSITION filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Tobin, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Opposition, # 4 Redacted Opposition, # 5 Exhibit A -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 6 Exhibit B -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 9 Exhibit E -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 10 Exhibit F -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 11 Exhibit G -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 14 Exhibit J -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 15 Exhibit K -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 16 Exhibit L -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 17 Exhibit M -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 18 Exhibit N -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 19 Exhibit O -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 20 Exhibit P -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 21 Exhibit Q -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 22 Exhibit R -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 23 Exhibit S -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 24 Exhibit T -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 25 Exhibit U -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 26 Exhibit V, # 27 Exhibit W, # 28 Exhibit X, # 29 Exhibit Y, # 30 Exhibit Z, # 31 Exhibit AA, # 32 Exhibit BB -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 33 Exhibit CC -- CONFIDENTIAL, # 34 Exhibit DD -- CONFIDENTIAL)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Richard Cowell in Support of 258 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 258 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 247 MOTION to Compel Documents from Round Rock Research LLC ) (Redacted) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Opposition to SanDisk's Motion to Compel, # 4 Redacted Opposition to SanDisk's Motion to Compel, # 5 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit 6 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 8 (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit 8 (Redacted))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in its Motion to Compel Prodution of Documents from Round Rock Research LLC Amended Declaration of Richard Cowell filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 246 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Sandisk Corporation re 252 Order to Meet and Confer (Tobin, David) (Filed on 12/13/2013) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 254 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 253 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 252 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/6/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/4/2013) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of JANICE TA in Support of 242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 242 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/2/2013) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Richard Cowell in Support of 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in its Motion to Compel Prodution of Documents from Round Rock Research LLC filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Related document(s) 246 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 12/2/2013) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Corley for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/2/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Documents from Round Rock Research LLC filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/2/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 12/11/2013. Replies due by 12/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chuck Ebertin, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information Disclosed in its Motion to Compel Prodution of Documents from Round Rock Research LLC filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chuck Ebertin, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED version of Motion to Compel, # 4 UNREDACTED version of Motion to Compel, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Round Rock Research LLC re 242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 243 MOTION to Compel Discovery [Redacted] by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Discovery [Redacted] filed by Round Rock Research LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 12/11/2013. Replies due by 12/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 Exhibit 12, # 11 Exhibit 13, # 12 Exhibit 14, # 13 Exhibit 15)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Motion to Compel, # 4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Compel, # 5 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 16 (Unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 17 (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 18 (Unredacted))(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/27/2013) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 241 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING DATE FOR CLOSE OF DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING DATE FOR CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Efren Garcia in Support of Stipulation)(Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 11/18/2013) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY DATES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of EFREN GARCIA in Support of 237 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY DATES filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 237 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY DATES filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW NG PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8041245.) filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ng, Andrew) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings of Official Electronic Sound Recording held on 9-16-13, before Judge J. Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings of Official Electronic Sound Recording held on 9-12-13, before Judge J. Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES D. OSSOLA PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Charles D. Ossola ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8018842.) filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ossola, Charles) (Filed on 9/20/2013) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Round Rock Research LLC of Firm Name Change (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 9/16/2013) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 9/10/2013) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 228 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 227 MODIFYING DISCOVERY DATES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/5/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY DATES filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Efren Garcia)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 9/5/2013) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to SanDisk's Second Amended Complaint [Corrected and Redacted] , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Sandisk Corporation byRound Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/28/2013) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Round Rock's Corrected Amended Answer and Counterclaims to SanDisk's Second Amended Complaint by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/27/2013) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASES C 11-05243 RS and 13-mc-80165 EJD. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 214 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 8/26/2013) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 222 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ROUND ROCK PERMISSION TO FILE A CORRECTED AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO SANDISK'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 218 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment on SanDisk's Patent Exhaustion/First Sale, Equitable Estoppel, and Actual or Implied License Claims and Affirmative Defenses ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/23/2013) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Permission to File a Corrected Amended Answer and Counterclaims to SanDisk's Second Amended Complaint filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/23/2013) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Efren Garcia in Support of 218 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment on SanDisk's Patent Exhaustion/First Sale, Equitable Estoppel, and Actual or Implied License Claims and Affirmative Defenses filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B (MFN))(Related document(s) 218 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 8/19/2013) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 218 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Round Rock's Motion for Summary Judgment on SanDisk's Patent Exhaustion/First Sale, Equitable Estoppel, and Actual or Implied License Claims and Affirmative Defenses filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 8/19/2013) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chuck Ebertin, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 8/19/2013) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Non-Opposition re 212 MOTION to Relate Case filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Related document(s) 212 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/13/2013) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Round Rock's Amended Answer and Counterclaims to SanDisk's Second Amended Complaint by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/12/2013) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint [Redacted] , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Sandisk Corporation byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/12/2013) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY EDWARD BERNARD TERCHUNIAN PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Relate Case filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 8/9/2013) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, [DOCKET 194] by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 8/7/2013) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/7/2013) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/7/2013) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 8/7/2013) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Edward Terchunian ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7902584.) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Terchunian, Edward) (Filed on 8/6/2013) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 206 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING SANDISK'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS, AND ROUND ROCK'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIMS AND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE DENYING MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT THE MOTION HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 8, 2013 AT 1:30 P.M. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear by Telephone and [Proposed Order] filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/31/2013) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Efren Garcia in Support of 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 199 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 7/31/2013) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 7/22/2013 case not settled, further facilitated discussions expected by after Labor Day, mediation continuing. By Mediator, James Gilliland, dated 7/23/2013. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Richard Cowell in Support of 200 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 200 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/24/2013) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Counterclaims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Redacted) ) [Redacted] filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/24/2013) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/24/2013) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS (#182).Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of JANICE TA in Support of 196 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 196 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 196 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Counterclaims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Redacted) ) [REDACTED] filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 194 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SanDisk's Brief and Exhibits in Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Counterclaims and Infringement Contentions filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SanDisk's Brief and Exhibits in Opposition to Round Rock's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Counterclaims and Infringement Contentions filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/17/2013) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 182 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/12/2013) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of EFREN GARCIA in Support of 188 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 188 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 7/12/2013) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of EFREN GARCIA in Support of 185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 185 ) (Garcia, Efren) (Filed on 7/10/2013) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Tamir Packin in Support of 189 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L, # 11 Exhibit M, # 12 Exhibit N, # 13 Exhibit O, # 14 Exhibit P, # 15 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 189 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/5/2013) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 182 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/5/2013) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 188 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/5/2013) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Tamir Packin in Support of 186 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Counterclaims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Redacted) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 186 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/3/2013) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Counterclaims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Redacted) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/17/2013. Replies due by 7/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/3/2013) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 7/3/2013) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Sandisk Corporation re 182 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions CORRECTION TO EXHIBIT J (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J (Corrected))(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of CHUCK P. EBERTIN in Support of 182 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 182 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 6/20/2013) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/5/2013. Replies due by 7/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 6/20/2013) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before 9/12/2013 all non-expert discovery shall be completed. All pretrial dispositive motions must be filed and served by 1/30/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2014 10:00 AM, Jury Selection set for 8/11/2014 09:00 AM, and Jury Trial set for 8/11/2014 09:00 AM all in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge RICHARD SEEBORG on 06/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION FOLLOWING SUBSEQUENT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 6/5/2013) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 179 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/4/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT SUPPLEMENTAL filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 5/31/2013) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Round Rock's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/31/2013) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY TAMIR PACKIN PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7737805.) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Packin, Tamir) (Filed on 5/30/2013) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/30/2013 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 5/30/2013). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2013) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [JOINT] filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 5/23/2013) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE All parties shall appear telephonically for their case management conference scheduled for 11:00 a.m. on Thursday, May 30, 2013. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/20/2013) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR Clerks Notice Appointing James Gilliland as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY EFREN GARCIA PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Efren Garcia ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7688197.) filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 5/9/2013) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 5/7/2013. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED IN ERROR- DISREGARD. SEE DKT. NO 167 for correct document CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/7/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013) Modified on 5/7/2013 (rslc1, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT JOINT SCHEDULING PROPOSAL by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/30/2013) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of CHUCK EBERTIN in Support of 162 Reply to Opposition/Response, Re Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VII of Round Rock's Counterclaims -- Asserted Claims 1-4 of U.S. Patent No. 6,383,839 filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 162 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/24/2013) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COUNT VII OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 1-4 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,383,839 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/24/2013) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of CHUCK EBERTIN in Support of 160 Reply to Opposition/Response, Re Motion for Summary Judgment on Count IV of Round Rock's Counterclaims -- Asserted Claims 1-3 of U.S. Patent No. 6,015,760 are Invalid for Anticipation filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 160 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/24/2013) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment on COUNT IV OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 13 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,015,760 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/24/2013) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Clerks Notice Vacating Appointment of Mediator Brandon Baum 129 . The ADR Program will appoint another mediator as soon as possible. The pre-mediation teleconference with Brandom Baum today is also vacated. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW HEINZ PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7641865.) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Heinz, Andrew) (Filed on 4/19/2013) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Martin Afromowitz, Ph.D. in Support of 154 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 154 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Bradford J. Black in Support of 154 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 154 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment on COUNT IV OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 13 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,015,760 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Martin Afromowitz, Ph.D. in Support of 152 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 152 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COUNT VII OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 1-4 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,383,839 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/17/2013) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sandisk Corporation for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/16/2013) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER VACATING HEARING DATES AND REQUIRING FILING OF JOINT SCHEDULING PROPOSAL: Joint scheduling proposal due by 4/30/2013. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/15/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/16/2013, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2013. (Related documents(s) 148 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/12/2013) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Round Rock Research LLC for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Cowell, Richard) (Filed on 4/12/2013) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Richard M. Cowell in Support of 146 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 146 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/4/2013) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/4/2013) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 144 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply Brief that Contain or Reference Confidential Information filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/4/2013) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Round Rock's Reply Brief that Contain or Reference Confidential Information filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/4/2013) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COUNT VII OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 1-4 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,383,839 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/3/2013) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of CHUCK EBERTIN in Support of 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COUNT VII OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 1-4 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,383,839 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 141 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/3/2013) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COUNT VII OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 1-4 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,383,839 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 4/17/2013. Replies due by 4/24/2013. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/3/2013) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment on COUNT IV OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 13 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,015,760 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/3/2013) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of CHUCK EBERTIN in Support of 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment on COUNT IV OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 13 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,015,760 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 138 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/3/2013) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment on COUNT IV OF ROUND ROCKS COUNTERCLAIMS -- ASSERTED CLAIMS 1-3 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,015,760 ARE INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 4/17/2013. Replies due by 4/24/2013. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/3/2013) Modified on 4/3/2013 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandisk Corporation re 135 Declaration in Support, 132 Opposition/Response to Motion, 133 Declaration in Support,,,, 134 Declaration in Support, 136 Declaration in Support, (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/25/2013) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of TODD WALTZE in Support of 132 Opposition/Response to Motion for summary judgment on SanDisk's patent exhaustion/first sale, equitable estoppel, and actual or implied license claims and affirmative defenses filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 132 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2013) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of MEHRDAD MOFIDI in Support of 132 Opposition/Response to Motion for summary judgment on SanDisk's patent exhaustion/first sale, equitable estoppel, and actual or implied license claims and affirmative defenses [REDACTED] filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 132 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2013) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of KENNETH BELL in Support of 132 Opposition/Response to Motion for summary judment on SanDisk's patent exhaustion/first sale, equitable estoppel, and actual or implied license claims and affirmative defenses [REDACTED] filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 132 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2013) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of CHUCK EBERTIN in Support of 132 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment on SanDisk's Patent Exhaustion/First Sale, Equitable Estoppel, and Actual or Implied License Claims and Affirmative Defenses filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42)(Related document(s) 132 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2013) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) ) [REDACTED] filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2013) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SanDisk's Opposition Brief, Exhibits and Declarations that Contain or Reference Confidential Information filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2013) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of SanDisk's Opposition Brief, Exhibits and Declarations that Contain or Reference Confidential Information filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2013) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Brandon Baum as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ROUND ROCK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/5/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ROUND ROCK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chuck Ebertin in Support of Stipulation)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/5/2013) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Chuck P. Ebertin (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/5/2013) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Richard M. Cowell in Support of 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 123 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 3/13/2013. Replies due by 3/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Claims Construction held on 1/16/2013 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 1/16/2013). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2013) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 1/14/2013 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 1/14/2013). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/14/2013) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 118 SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND MARKMAN SCHEDULE. Tutorial Hearing set for 1/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] MARKMAN SCHEDULE filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/20/2012) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MODIFIED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/18/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFIED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/18/2012) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/13/2012) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of JOHN C. SPACCAROTELLA in Support of 112 Claim Construction Statement Round Rock's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W, # 2 Exhibit X, # 3 Exhibit Y, # 4 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/15/2012) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Round Rock's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/15/2012) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Chuck Ebertin in Support of 110 Claim Construction Statement Responsive Brief filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31)(Related document(s) 110 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/8/2012) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT SanDisk's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/8/2012) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of JOHN C. SPACCAROTELLA in Support of 108 Claim Construction Statement Round Rock's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Related document(s) 108 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 10/25/2012) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Round Rock's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 10/25/2012) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Claim Construction Hearing set for 1/16/2013 10:00 AM. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT JOINT filed by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSON OF ATTORNEY RICHARD COWELL PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Richard Cowell ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611076650.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/20/2012 filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Receipt)(dsc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 101 DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/19/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/19/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS filed by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/19/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count IX of Round Rock's Counterclaims -- Asserted Claims 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 9 and 10 of U.S. Patent No. 6,900,528 are Invalid for Anticipation by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Chuck P. Ebertin in Support of 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count IX of Round Rock's Counterclaims -- Asserted Claims 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 9 and 10 of U.S. Patent No. 6,900,528 are Invalid for Anticipation filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 98 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count IX of Round Rock's Counterclaims -- Asserted Claims 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 9 and 10 of U.S. Patent No. 6,900,528 are Invalid for Anticipation filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COUNT V OF ROUND ROCK'S COUNTERCLAIM -- ASSERTED CLAIM 14 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,255,209 IS INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Chuck P. Ebertin in Support of 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COUNT V OF ROUND ROCK'S COUNTERCLAIM -- ASSERTED CLAIM 14 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,255,209 IS INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment ON COUNT V OF ROUND ROCK'S COUNTERCLAIM -- ASSERTED CLAIM 14 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,255,209 IS INVALID FOR ANTICIPATION filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 7/5/2012) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND AMENDED ORDER RE 93 MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Claim Construction Hearing set for 1/9/2013 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 1/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 6/8/2012) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 101 DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/19/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 5/31/2012) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND AMENDED ORDER RE 93 MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Claim Construction Hearing set for 1/9/2013 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 1/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Bradford John Black (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/24/2012) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against Sandisk Corporation byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 5/17/2012) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/14/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 5/11/2012) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE re Motion to Relate Cases: The Court has reviewed the motion and has determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JANICE L. TA PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID J. TOBIN PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER V. RYAN PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 75 MOTION to Relate Case THIRD-PARTIES ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC. AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER CASES RELATED ) Opposition to Administrative Motion to Consider Cases Related filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 5/7/2012) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Janice Ta ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6801115.) filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher) (Filed on 5/7/2012) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David Tobin ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6801083.) filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher) (Filed on 5/7/2012) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher V. Ryan ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6801034.) filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher) (Filed on 5/7/2012) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT on the filing of second amended complaint or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 77 Opposition/Response to Motion by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 5/4/2012) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 75 MOTION to Relate Case THIRD-PARTIES ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC. AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER CASES RELATED ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 5/4/2012) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Round Rock Research LLC. Filed bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 5/3/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Relate Case THIRD-PARTIES ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC. AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER CASES RELATED filed by ASUS Computer International, Asustek Computer Inc.. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SANDISK'S ANSWER to Counterclaim bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/23/2012) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SANDISK CORPORATION TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/19/2012) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to mediation. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/7/2012 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/5/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Sandisk Corporation byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 4/5/2012) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 4/5/2012) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/29/2012 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 3/29/2012). (Court Reporter Not reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 65 MOTION to Dismiss Round Rock's Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Todd Glennon in Support of 65 MOTION to Dismiss Round Rock's Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Related document(s) 65 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Round Rock's Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 4/5/2012. Replies due by 4/12/2012. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Round Rock Research LLC, Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE All parties shall appear telephonically at the Case Management Conference scheduled for March 29, 2012. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/20/2012) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Round Rock's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First), COUNTERCLAIM against Sandisk Corporation byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 3/1/2012) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AND DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AS MOOT. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTTORNEY JOHN C. SPACCAROTELLA PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission of Attorney John C. Spaccarotella to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305.00, receipt number 34611069977) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 55 Consent MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CURRENT CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CURRENT CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE filed by Sandisk Corporation. Responses due by 2/2/2012. Replies due by 2/9/2012. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Round Rock Research LLC filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for SanDisk Corporation (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Round Rock Research LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 1/19/2012) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 48 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Round Rock Research LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 1/9/2012) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 47 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Sandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to Declaration of Chuck Ebertin in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 1/9/2012) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE THE MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 12, 2012 WILL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 35 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 27 MOTION for Discovery regarding Personal Jurisdiction ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/20/2011) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 8 MOTION to Dismiss ) (Redacted Version) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/20/2011) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Round Rock Research LLC. (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/20/2011) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 12/20/2011) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 35 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 37 by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 27 MOTION for Discovery regarding Personal Jurisdiction ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 38 Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Chuck Ebertin in Support of 38 Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Manual Filing, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 8 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 42 . *** Proposed Order re 35 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/13/2011) Modified on 12/14/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re 35 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 12/13/2011) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Round Rock Research LLC OF PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-7(e) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 12/12/2011) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY AMEET A. MODI PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE BRIEFING OF PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission of Attorney Ameet A. Modi to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305.00, receipt number 34611067455) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 29 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 27 MOTION for Discovery regarding Personal Jurisdiction by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery regarding Personal Jurisdiction filed by Sandisk Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 12/13/2011. Replies due by 12/20/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C)(Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Round Rock Research LLC. Filed bySandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/29/2011) Modified on 12/1/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Sandisk Corporation (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ) filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/23/2011) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Chuck Ebertin in Support of 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed bySandisk Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/23/2011) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Sandisk Corporation. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/23/2011) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JON T. HOHENTHANER PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Renotice motion hearing re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRound Rock Research LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission of Attorney Jon T. Hohenthaner to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305.00, receipt number 34611067187) filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2012. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/18/11. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Round Rock Research LLC. (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Round Rock Research LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Paul J. Riley in Support of 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE REQUESTING BOTH PARTIES FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION. Admissions due by 11/28/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Gerard A. deBlasi in Support of 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRound Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss filed by Round Rock Research LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 12/1/2011. Replies due by 12/8/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Grant Hamill on behalf of Defendant Round Rock Research LLC (Hamill, Andrew) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford John Black on behalf of Defendant Round Rock Research LLC (Black, Bradford) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandisk Corporation. Sandisk Corporation served on 11/1/2011, answer due 11/22/2011. (Ebertin, Chuck) (Filed on 11/10/2011) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Patent/Trademark Copy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 1/31/2012 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 2/7/2012 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011) (tnS, ). (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Round Rock Research LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011) (tnS, ). (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Non-Infringement and or Patent Invadility & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Round Rock Research LLC, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 54611010636] Filed by Plaintiff Sandisk Corporation. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2011: # 1 Complaint) (tnS, ). (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 421 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?