Vietnam Veterans of America et al v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-00037
District Judge Claudia Wilken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2021 at 8:03 PM ST (4.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bruce Price, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

No Logo David C. Dufrane, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

No Logo Eric P. Muth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

No Logo Franklin D. Rochelle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

No Logo Larry Meirow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

No Logo Swords to Plowshares, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gordon P. Erspamer +1 925 295 3341 +1 925 946 9912 GErspamer@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ADRIANO HRVATIN +1 415 268 6207 +1 415 268 7522 ahrvatin@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacey Michelle Sprenkel +1 415 268 6040 +1 415 268 7522 ssprenkel@mofo.com
No Logo Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

No Logo Tim Michael Josephs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

No Logo Veterans Rights Organization, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gordon P. Erspamer +1 925 295 3341 +1 925 946 9912 GErspamer@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ADRIANO HRVATIN +1 415 268 6207 +1 415 268 7522 ahrvatin@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacey Michelle Sprenkel +1 415 268 6040 +1 415 268 7522 ssprenkel@mofo.com
No Logo Vietnam Veterans of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

No Logo William Blazinski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

No Logo Wray C. Forrest, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 Timothy W. Blakely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gordon P. Erspamer +1 925 295 3341 +1 925 946 9912 GErspamer@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 12/22/2011 ADRIANO HRVATIN +1 415 268 6207 +1 415 268 7522 ahrvatin@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacey Michelle Sprenkel +1 415 268 6040 +1 415 268 7522 ssprenkel@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 07/28/2010 Kimberly Linnell Taylor +1 415 268 6153 +1 415 268 7522 KTaylor@mofo.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo David H Petraeus, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder, Jr."

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Eric K. Shinseki, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John McHugh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Leon E. Panetta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Leon Panetta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Edward Gardner +1 202 305 7583 +1 202 307 0972 joshua.e.gardner@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Lynn Herb +1 202 305 8356 +1 202 616 8470 kimberly.l.herb@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/12/2010 Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 965 6570 +1 202 616 8202 caroline.lewis-wolverton@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Lynn Herb +1 202 305 8356 +1 202 616 8470 kimberly.l.herb@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/12/2010 Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 965 6570 +1 202 616 8202 caroline.lewis-wolverton@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Lynn Herb +1 202 305 8356 +1 202 616 8470 kimberly.l.herb@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/12/2010 Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 965 6570 +1 202 616 8202 caroline.lewis-wolverton@usdoj.gov
No Logo Pete Geren, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Army United States Army, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Department of the Army"

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs"

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigham John Bowen +1 202 973 4236 +1 202 973 4499 brighambowen@dwt.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Veterans Affairs"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2010 Caroline Lewis Wolverton +1 202 965 6570 +1 202 616 8202 caroline.lewis-wolverton@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (602) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Stay
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 546 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/19/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 545 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO THE COURTS 544 SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/19/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 544 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 490 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 495 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/19/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 541 Filed: 10/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INTENDED AMENDED ORDER, INJUNCTION AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 Judgment, # 3 Injunction)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 540 Filed: 10/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. 541 *** NOTICE OF INTENDED AMENDED ORDER, INJUNCTION AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 amended order, # 2 judgment, # 3 injunction)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013) Modified on 10/11/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 537
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 532 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 527 Motion for Enlargement of Pretrial Schedule. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 526 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 525 Stipulation to Amend Pretrial Scheduling Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 522 Filed: 4/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/12/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 520 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/10/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 507 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 506 Motion To Reschedule Settlement Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 505 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 504 Stipulation Regarding Settlement Judge Referral. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 500 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 498 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 485 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part, and denying in part, 346 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, denying 431 471 Defendants' Motions for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration and for Relief from a Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge, and granting in part, and denying in part, 439 Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 481 Filed: 9/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS 479 MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions due by 12/5/2012. Responses / Cross Motions due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 2/1/2013. Replies due by 2/22/2013. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2013. Motion Heari ng / Further Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2013 02:00 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (20 day) 7/29/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/31/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 477 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS 471 MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELIEF FROM A NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/2/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 476 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 467). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 475 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO THE COURTS JULY 19, 2012 ORDER (Dkt. No. 472). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/31/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 470 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: JOINT STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Dkt. No. 468). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/19/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 469 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 447 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement Joint Statement Regarding Depositions by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Intelligence Agency. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 7/18/2012) Modified on 7/19/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 7/27/2012. Replies due by 8/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 7/13/2012) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 464 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit B (Part 3))(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 7/6/2012) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 439 MOTION to Substitute Party Kathryn McMillan-Forrest ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 7/6/2012) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 464 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 451 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 447 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 7/3/2012) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 462 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-21-2012, before Judge Jacqueline S. Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 7/3/2012) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Submission of Documents for in camera, ex parte review re 456 Order by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 6/28/2012) Modified on 6/29/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 447 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs ) filed byEric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John J. Spinelli, # 2 Exhibit A to Spinelli Declaration, # 3 Declaration of Lily Farel, # 4 Exhibit A to Farel Declaration)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 6/28/2012) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 439 MOTION to Substitute Party Kathryn McMillan-Forrest ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/26/2012) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 458 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELEASING JUNE 21, 2012 HEARING TRANSCRIPT TO THE PARTIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/26/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 457 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE: MAGNETIC TAPES DISPUTE (Dkt. No. 425). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/22/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 456 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Dkt. No. 447). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/22/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 6/21/2012 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 6/21/2012), Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2012 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 6/21/2012) re 446 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Patricia Cameresi (Docket No. 441-6) filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, Wray C. Forrest, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. (Court Reporter :Debra Pas) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2012) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Document Filing by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A, Part 5, # 6 Exhibit B)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/19/2012) Modified on 6/20/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America re Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Kathryn McMillan-Forrest as a Named Plaintiff (Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 6/19/2012) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Judson O. Littleton in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Kathryn McMillan-Forrest as a Named Plaintiff filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to Littleton Declaration)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 6/19/2012) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion and [Proposed] Order to File Under Seal filed by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Judson O. Littleton, # 2 Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 6/19/2012) Modified on 6/20/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 446 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Patricia Cameresi (Docket No. 441-6) ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly Herb, # 2 Exhibit A to the Herb Decl.)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/18/2012) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike 447 MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs, or in the alternative to set Briefing Schedule filed by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Responses due by 6/29/2012. Replies due by 7/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 6/15/2012) Modified on 6/18/2012 (kcS, ). (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 448 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RE: MAGNETIC TAPES DISPUTE (Dkt. No. 425). Discovery Hearing set for 6/21/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/15/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 6/28/2012. Replies due by 7/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ben Patterson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/14/2012) (Entered: 06/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Patricia Cameresi (Docket No. 441-6) filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 6/18/2012. Replies due by 6/19/2012. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/13/2012) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply in Support of 425 Supplemental Submission Concerning Magnetic Tapes and Motion to Compel by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Concerning Magnetic Tapes)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/13/2012) Modified on 6/14/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Regarding Supplemental Authority to Class Certification and re 431 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Elgin Decision)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/11/2012) Modified on 6/12/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 443 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE: RESPONSES TO COURTS MAY 31, 2012 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/7/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re 440 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Errata Regarding Department of Veterans Affairs' Reply by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/6/2012) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly Herb, # 2 Exhibit A to Herb Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Herb Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Herb Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Herb Decl., # 6 Declaration of Patricia Cameresi, # 7 Exhibit 1 to Cameresi Decl., # 8 Exhibit 2 to Cameresi Decl., # 9 Exhibit 3 to Cameresi Decl., # 10 Exhibit 4 to Cameresi Decl., # 11 Exhibit 5 to Cameresi Decl., # 12 Exhibit 6 to Cameresi Decl., # 13 Exhibit 7 to Cameresi Decl., # 14 Exhibit 8 to Cameresi Decl., # 15 Declaration of Julie Parrish)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/6/2012) Modified on 6/7/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs re 438 Notice (Other) of Errata (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 6/6/2012) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Substitute Party Kathryn McMillan-Forrest filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathryn McMillan-Forrest, # 2 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/5/2012) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to re 437 Response ) by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 6/4/2012) Modified on 6/5/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re 436 Order by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/1/2012) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 436 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE: MAY 30 & 31, 2012 IN CAMERA SUBMISSIONS OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/31/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 433 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission Concerning Magnetic Tapes (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America re 423 Order (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 5/31/2012) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, Vietnam Veterans of America . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly Herb in Support)(Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 6/1/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs re 430 Order Notice of Submission for Ex Parte In Camera Review (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 5/30/2012) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 5/24/2012) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 430 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: REMAINDER OF MAY 1, 2012 IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/23/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 429 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE: MAGNETIC TAPE DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/22/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to re 427 Statement of Discovery Disputes and Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 5/22/2012) Modified on 5/23/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re 426 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Statement of Discovery Disputes and Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 5/21/2012) Modified on 5/22/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re 425 Statement, by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 5/21/2012) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission and Defendants' Position Concerning Magnetic Tapes and Motion to Compel by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Frederick Ashley)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 5/21/2012) Modified on 5/22/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSES to questions posed in the court May 14, 2012 order 423 by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 5/18/2012) Modified on 5/21/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 423 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE: APRIL 12 AND MAY 1, 2012 IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/14/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Relevant to Class Certification by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs (Attachments: # 1 VCS et al. v. Shinseki et al.)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 5/7/2012) Modified on 5/8/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Submission for Ex Parte In Camera Review by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Index)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 5/4/2012) Modified on 5/7/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 420 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 413 Defendant's Motion for Relief From 4/6/2012 Order (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 413 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 408 Order on Motion to Compel ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of Response to Defendants' Motion for Relief)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 4/30/2012) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacquleine Scott Corley granting 415 Stipulation REGARDING CASE DEADLINES & JOINT STATEMENT CONCERNING SCOPE OF UPDATING DISCOVERY (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 417 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM APRIL 16, 2012 ORDER (Dkt. No. 413). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/25/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 416 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS 413 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE DEADLINES & JOINT STATEMENT CONCERNING SCOPE OF UPDATING DISCOVERY filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Intelligence Agency. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 4/19/2012) Modified on 4/20/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on April 5, 2012, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2012. (rhm, ) (Filed on 4/16/2012) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 408 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Responses due by 4/27/2012. Replies due by 5/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 4/13/2012) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Submission for Ex Parte In Camera Review by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America re 408 Order on Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 4/11/2012) Modified on 4/12/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Wray Forrest by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 4/11/2012) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 381 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 57, # 2 Exhibit 64)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 4/10/2012) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America re 394 Declaration in Support,,, - Notice of Filing of Corrected Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 23, # 5 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 24, # 6 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 26, # 7 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 45, # 8 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 51, # 9 Exhibit - Corrected Exhibit 74)(Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 4/10/2012) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 408 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 404 Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 406 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Ben Patterson in Support of Motion to Compel (Confidential Version Filed Under Seal) by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA (Confidential Sealed))(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 4/6/2012) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 406 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 362 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (Please note that this order is the same document as docket no. 402 ) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Ben Patterson in Support of 404 MOTION to Compel Discovery re Order DKT #402 filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y-0, # 26 Exhibit Y-1, # 27 Exhibit Z-0, # 28 Exhibit Z-1, # 29 Exhibit AA (Public Redacted), # 30 Exhibit BB, # 31 Exhibit CC, # 32 Exhibit DD, # 33 Exhibit EE, # 34 Exhibit FF, # 35 Exhibit GG)(Related document(s) 404 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 4/6/2012) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Discovery re Order DKT #402 filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Responses due by 4/20/2012. Replies due by 4/27/2012. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 4/6/2012) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/5/2012 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 4/5/2012). Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2012 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2012) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 402 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDERSEAL (Dkt. No. 362). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/5/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 4/5/2012 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 4/5/2012). (Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2012) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE regarding magnetic tapes by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America re 371 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julie Parrish)(Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 4/4/2012) Modified on 4/5/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 381 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18A, # 2 Exhibit 18B, # 3 Exhibit 19A, # 4 Exhibit 19B, # 5 Exhibit 48, # 6 Exhibit 49A, # 7 Exhibit 49B, # 8 Exhibit 52, # 9 Exhibit 55, # 10 Exhibit 56, # 11 Exhibit 57, # 12 Exhibit 58, # 13 Exhibit 59, # 14 Exhibit 63, # 15 Exhibit 64, # 16 Exhibit 65, # 17 Exhibit 66, # 18 Exhibit 77, # 19 Exhibit 78, # 20 Exhibit 80A, # 21 Exhibit 80B, # 22 Exhibit 80C, # 23 Exhibit 80D)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 4/2/2012) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 388 MOTION Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Extend Case Deadlines ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua E. Gardner)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 4/2/2012) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix re 393 Opposition/Response to Motion, Index of Exhibits, filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Related document(s) 393 ) (Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 4/2/2012) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (Con't) EXHIBITS re 394 Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb in Support of 393 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Public Exhibits) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 61, # 2 Exhibit 62, # 3 Exhibit 63, # 4 Exhibit 64, # 5 Exhibit 65, # 6 Exhibit 66, # 7 Exhibit 67, # 8 Exhibit 68, # 9 Exhibit 69, # 10 Exhibit 70, # 11 Exhibit 71, # 12 Exhibit 72, # 13 Exhibit 73, # 14 Exhibit 74, # 15 Exhibit 75, # 16 Exhibit 77, # 17 Exhibit 78, # 18 Exhibit 80, # 19 Exhibit 81, # 20 Exhibit 82, # 21 Exhibit 83)(Related document(s) 393 ) (Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 4/2/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/3/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (Con't) EXHIBITS re 394 Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb in Support of 393 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Public Exhibits) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 29, # 2 Exhibit 30, # 3 Exhibit 31, # 4 Exhibit 32, # 5 Exhibit 33, # 6 Exhibit 34, # 7 Exhibit 35A, # 8 Exhibit 35B, # 9 Exhibit 36, # 10 Exhibit 37, # 11 Exhibit 38, # 12 Exhibit 39, # 13 Exhibit 40, # 14 Exhibit 41, # 15 Exhibit 42, # 16 Exhibit 43, # 17 Exhibit 44, # 18 Exhibit 45, # 19 Exhibit 46, # 20 Exhibit 47, # 21 Exhibit 48, # 22 Exhibit 49, # 23 Exhibit 50, # 24 Exhibit 51, # 25 Exhibit 52, # 26 Exhibit 53, # 27 Exhibit 54, # 28 Exhibit 55, # 29 Exhibit 56, # 30 Exhibit 57, # 31 Exhibit 58, # 32 Exhibit 59, # 33 Exhibit 60)(Related document(s) 393 ) (Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 4/2/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb in Support of 393 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Public Exhibits) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19, # 19 Exhibit 20, # 20 Exhibit 21, # 21 Exhibit 22, # 22 Exhibit 23, # 23 Exhibit 24, # 24 Exhibit 25, # 25 Exhibit 26, # 26 Exhibit 27, # 27 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) 393 ) (Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 4/2/2012) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 346 MOTION to Certify Class ) (Redacted Version) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 4/2/2012) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 388 MOTION Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Extend Case Deadlines by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Tim Michael Josephs in Support of 387 Reply to Opposition/Response, in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Related document(s) 387 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Bernard Edelman on behalf of Vietnam Veterans of America in Support of 387 Reply to Opposition/Response, in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Related document(s) 387 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Stacey M. Sprenkel in Support of 387 Reply to Opposition/Response, in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 75, # 2 Exhibit 76, # 3 Exhibit 77, # 4 Exhibit 78, # 5 Exhibit 79, # 6 Exhibit 80, # 7 Exhibit 81, # 8 Exhibit 82, # 9 Exhibit 83, # 10 Exhibit 84, # 11 Exhibit 85, # 12 Exhibit 86, # 13 Exhibit 87, # 14 Exhibit 88)(Related document(s) 387 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Extend Case Deadlines filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Responses due by 4/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 346 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 380 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Michael Josephs in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 380 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Bernard Edelman on Behalf of Vietnam Veterans of America in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 380 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS 79 & 87 re Declaration of Stacey M. Sprenkel in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 79, # 2 Exhibit 87)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) Modified on 4/2/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/2/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 380 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 382 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on March 29, 2012. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 381 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 368 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 380 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 375 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Joshua E. Gardner in Support of 375 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Related document(s) 375 ) (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 3/29/2012) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 362 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit HH, # 3 Exhibit II, # 4 Exhibit JJ, # 5 Exhibit KK)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/26/2012) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of William Blazinski in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stacey M. Sprenkel, # 2 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/22/2012) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 365 Administrative Motion to Substitute Kathryn Mcmillan-Forrest as a Named Plaintiff ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/16/2012) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Ben Patterson in Support of 368 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 368 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/15/2012) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Joshua E. Gardner in Support of 371 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11 (part 1), # 12 Exhibit 11 (part 2), # 13 Exhibit 11 (part 3), # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37)(Related document(s) 371 ) (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 3/15/2012) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Spinelli, # 2 Exhibit A to Spinelli Declaration, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Michael Kilpatrick, # 4 Declaration of Anne Moroz, # 5 Declaration of Michael Hogan, # 6 Declaration of Dr. Victor Kalasinsky, # 7 Exhibit A to Kalasinksy Declaration, # 8 Exhibit B to Kalasinsky Declaration, # 9 Exhibit C to Kalasinsky Declaration, # 10 Exhibit D to Kalasinsky Declaration, # 11 Exhibit E to Kalasinsky Declaration)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 3/15/2012) Modified on 3/16/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 370 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 365 THEIR ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Errata re 368 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Declaration In Support of Motion to File Under Seal)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 3/9/2012) Modified on 3/12/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Judson O. Littleton, # 2 Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 3/8/2012) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Joshua E. Gardner in Support of 362 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Related document(s) 362 ) (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 3/8/2012) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 365 MOTION Administrative Motion to Substitute Kathryn Mcmillan-Forrest as a Named Plaintiff ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 3/7/2012) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to Substitute Kathryn Mcmillan-Forrest as a Named Plaintiff filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Responses due by 3/12/2012. Replies due by 3/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer, # 2 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/6/2012) Modified on 3/7/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/2/2012) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/1/2012) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/1/2012) Modified on 4/6/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 361 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS 356 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/29/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order granting 355 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Stacey M. Sprenkel in Support of 346 MOTION to Certify Class [Amended Version Pursuant to February 24, 2012 Order] filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Envelope 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit 74)(Related document(s) 346 ) (Sprenkel, Stacey) (Filed on 2/28/2012) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 352 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Stacey M. Sprenkel in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 69, # 3 Exhibit 70, # 4 Exhibit 71, # 5 Exhibit 72, # 6 Exhibit 73)(Sprenkel, Stacey) (Filed on 2/28/2012) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 355 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 2/28/2012) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Declaration of Joshua E. Gardner in Support of 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Related document(s) 347 ) (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/27/2012) Modified on 2/28/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/27/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY MOTION. Discovery Hearing set for 4/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/27/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order granting 349 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 346 MOTION to Certify Class , 349 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 346 MOTION to Certify Class and Motion to Amend Scheduling Order entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 352 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART, PLAINTIFFS 347 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Joshua E. Gardner in Support of 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 347 ) (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/16/2012) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 349 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 346 MOTION to Certify Class and Motion to Amend Scheduling Order ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 2/14/2012) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 346 MOTION to Certify Class and Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Judson O. Littleton, # 3 Exhibit A to Littleton Decl., # 4 Exhibit B to Littleton Decl., # 5 Exhibit C to Littleton Decl., # 6 Exhibit D to Littleton Decl., # 7 Exhibit E to Littleton Decl.)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 2/10/2012) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America (re: service of documents submitted under seal) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 2/9/2012) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 2/9/2012) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/24/2012
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Certify Class filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 2/23/2012. Replies due by 3/1/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 2/9/2012) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on December 15, 2011, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2012. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 12/28/2011) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gordon P. Erspamer Notice of Withdrawal of Timothy W. Blakely as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/22/2011) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gordon P. Erspamer Notice of Withdrawal of Adriano Hrvatin as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/22/2011) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon P. Erspamer of James P. Bennett (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/22/2011) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon P. Erspamer of Eugene Illovsky (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/22/2011) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 338 MOTION to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline and Unopposed Motion to Extend Other Case Deadlines and to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline with Respect to Two Depositions filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Objections due by 1/3/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/20/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 338 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline and Unopposed Motion to Extend Other Case Deadlines and to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline with Respect to Two Depositions ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 12/19/2011) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline and Unopposed Motion to Extend Other Case Deadlines and to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline with Respect to Two Depositions filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/16/2011) Modified on 12/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 12/15/2011 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 12/15/2011). (Court Reporter: Belle Ball) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2011) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 336 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE DEEMING OBJECTION DENIED re 329 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 327 Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement : Declaration of John Frederick Ashley Addressing Retreivability of Data on Magnetic Tapes by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/14/2011) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Supplemental Filing Concerning Magnetic Tapes by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/14/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 332 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Respect to Five Depositions filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/8/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 331 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 314 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE 295 MOTION TO EXTEND THE CASE DEADLINES. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2012 02:00 PM. Bench Trial (20 day) set for 10/9/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 330 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE: JOINT LETTER CONCERNING DISCOVERY STATUS AND DISPUTES (Dkt. No. 318). Discovery Hearing set for 12/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/30/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 327 Order filed by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs. Responses due by 12/13/2011. Replies due by 12/20/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE in response to court's November 23, 2011 re 327 Order by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 11/29/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 327 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE: DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/23/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/31/11, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2012. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 325 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES CONCERNING DEPOSITIONS AND FURTHER DOCUMENT PRODUCTION (Docket No. 307). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/17/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA re 323 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Information by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Supplemental Information re Cameresi Deposition)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Information filed by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement al Information re Cameresi Deposition, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/14/2011) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support of 307 Supplemental Brief Concerning Depositions and Navy and Air Force Document Production by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 11/11/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs of Submission of Documents for In Camera Review (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Index of documents submitted for in camera review)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 11/10/2011) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE DEEMING OBJECTION DENIED. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Gordon P. Erspamer to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 11/9/2011) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Gordon P. Erspamer and Joshua E. Gardner - Joint Letter Concerning Discovery Status and Disputes. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 11/7/2011) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re 307 Brief, re Depositions and Navy/Air Force Subpoenas by Central Intelligence Agency, John McHugh, Leon E. Panetta, David H Petraeus, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Gardner, # 2 Exhibit A to Gardner Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Gardner Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Gardner Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Gardner Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Gardner Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Gardner Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Gardner Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Gardner Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Gardner Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Gardner Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Gardner Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Gardner Declaration, # 14 Exhibit M to Gardner Declaration, # 15 Declaration of Penny Sayle, # 16 Declaration of D.J. Sherman)(Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 11/4/2011) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 315 Motion for Extension of Time to File (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File In Camera Submission filed by Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lily Sara Farel)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 11/2/2011) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 295 MOTION to Extend Case Deadlines filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs Objections due by 11/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/31/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/31/2011 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 10/31/2011). (Court Reporter: Jim Yeomans) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/31/2011) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE DEEMING 296 OBJECTION DENIED. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 311 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE: DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/25/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION RELIEF FROM PORTION OF NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 294 Order, filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Responses due by 11/7/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/24/2011) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 308 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit E to Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Concerning Depositions and Navy and Air Force Document Production filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Related document(s) 308 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/24/2011) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Concerning Depositions and Navy and Air Force Document Production filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/21/2011) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Concerning Depositions and Navy and Air Force Document Production filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/21/2011) Modified on 10/24/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on October 13, 2011, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Email address: smwtyping@yahoo.com; Telephone number: (859-539-2802). Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2012. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 10/31/2011 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 304 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFFS 295 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE: JOINT STATEMENTS OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES FILED OCTOBER 12, 2011 (Dkt. Nos. 299 & 300). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/14/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/13/2011 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 10/13/2011). (FTR 1:35-2:28) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2011) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Gordon P. Erspamer to Judge Corley enclosing documents for consideration at Status Conference this date at 1:30PM. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/13/2011) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Magnetic Tapes Regarding Database of Edgewood Test Participants and Project "Often" Documents by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Depositions and Navy and Air Force Document Production by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of submission for ex parte in camera review by United States Department of Veterans Affairs (Farel, Lily) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 295 MOTION to Extend Case Deadlines ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lily Farel, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 10/11/2011) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Relief From Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 294 Order, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Responses due by 10/25/2011. Replies due by 11/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 10/11/2011) Modified on 10/12/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Extend Case Deadlines filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Responses due by 10/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ben Patterson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/7/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (Dkt. No. 252), PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 255), PLAINITFFS MOTION TO COMPEL RULE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITIONS AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Dkt. No. 258), AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY (Dkt. No. 260). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/5/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/22/11, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2011. (Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 9/30/2011) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2011 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 9/23/2011) re 255 MOTION to Compel filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs, 260 MOTION to Extend Discovery of CIA filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs, 258 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Production of DocumentsMOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Production of DocumentsMOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Production of Documents filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs, 252 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Discovery filed by United States Department of Defense, Leon Panetta, United States Department of the Army, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Central Intelligence Agency, United States of America, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, Robert M. Gates, Eric K. Shinseki, Pete Geren, United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Court Reporter: Sahar Bartlett) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2011) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of 289 Reply to Opposition/Response,, in Support of Motion to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions and Production of Documents 258 filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 289 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 9/15/2011) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Ben Patterson in Support of 289 Reply to Opposition/Response,, in Support of Motion to Compel Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions and Production of Documents 258 filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 289 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 9/15/2011) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 258 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Production of Documents filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Stacey Sprenkel in Support of 287 Reply to Opposition/Response in Support of Motion to Compel 255 filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 287 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 9/15/2011) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 255 MOTION to Compel ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 9/15/2011) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 252 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Discovery ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb, # 2 Exhibit A to Herb Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Herb Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Herb Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Herb Decl.)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/9/2011) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 260 MOTION to Extend Discovery of CIA ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 9/8/2011) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/1/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/1/2011). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/1/2011) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 282 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 2 to Lee Declaration by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 9, to Bell Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 9, to Bell Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, Part 3 of 9, to Bell Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1, Part 4 of 9, to Bell Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 1, Part 5 of 9, to Bell Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 1, Part 6 of 9, to Bell Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 1, Part 7 of 9, to Bell Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 1, Part 8 of 9, to Bell Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 1, Part 9 of 9, to Bell Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 2, Part 1 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 2, Part 2 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 2, Part 3 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 2, Part 4 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 2, Part 5 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 2, Part 6 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 2, Part 7 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 2, Part 8 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 2, Part 9 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 2, Part 10 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 2, Part 11 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 2, Part 12 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 2, Part 13 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 2, Part 14 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 2, Part 15 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 2, Part 16 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 2, Part 17 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 2, Part 18 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 28 Exhibit 2, Part 19 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 29 Exhibit 2, Part 20 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 30 Exhibit 2, Part 21 of 21, to Bell Declaration, # 31 Exhibit 3, Part 1 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 32 Exhibit 3, Part 2 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 33 Exhibit 3, Part 3 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 34 Exhibit 3, Part 4 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 35 Exhibit 3, Part 5 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 36 Exhibit 3, Part 6 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 37 Exhibit 3, Part 7 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 38 Exhibit 3, Part 8 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 39 Exhibit 3, Part 9 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 40 Exhibit 3, Part 10 of 10, to Bell Declaration, # 41 Exhibit 4 to Bell Declaration, # 42 Exhibit 5, Part 1 of 3, to Bell Declaration, # 43 Exhibit 5, Part 2 of 3, to Bell Declaration, # 44 Exhibit 5, Part 3 of 3, to Bell Declaration)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 9/7/2011) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order granting 280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 281 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY AND MICHAEL J. MORRELLS 245 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY AND MICHAEL J. MORRELLS 266 MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER, AND GRANTING 252 SECTION I.A OF CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY AND MICHAEL J. MORRELLS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, Vietnam Veterans of America, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Joshua E. Gardner in Support of 278 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Gardner Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Gardner Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Gardner Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Gardner Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E to Gardner Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F to Gardner Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G to Gardner Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H to Gardner Declaration, # 9 Exhibit I to Gardner Declaration, # 10 Exhibit J to Gardner Declaration, # 11 Exhibit K to Gardner Declaration, # 12 Declaration of Michael Kilpatrick, # 13 Declaration of Phyllis Bell, # 14 Exhibit 1 to Bell Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 2 to Bell Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 3 to Bell Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 4 to Bell Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 5 to Bell Declaration, # 19 Declaration of Patsy D'Eramo, # 20 Declaration of Kevin Thomsen, # 21 Declaration of Lloyd Roberts, # 22 Declaration of Anthony Lee, # 23 Exhibit 1, Part 1, to Lee Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 1, Part 2, to Lee Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 2 to Lee Declaration, # 26 Declaration of Patricia Cameresi)(Related document(s) 278 ) (Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 9/1/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 258 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Production of Documents filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 9/1/2011) Modified on 9/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 260 MOTION to Extend Discovery of CIA ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 9/1/2011) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re 255 MOTION to Compel ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lily Farel Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Farel Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Farel Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Farel Declaration, # 5 Declaration Paul Black Declaration, # 6 Declaration Lisa Thomas Declaration, # 7 Declaration John J. Spinelli Declaratin, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit A to Spinelli Declaration)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 9/1/2011) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 252 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Discovery ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/31/2011) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 266 MOTION to Amend/Correct 238 Scheduling filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 266 MOTION to Amend/Correct 238 Scheduling Order filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/29/2011) Modified on 8/30/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule re 252 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Discovery; (Proposed) Order by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, Vietname Veterans of America, et al . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/26/2011) Modified on 8/29/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER CONCERNING BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY AND MICHAEL J. MORRELL'S 266 MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 8/31/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011) Modified on 8/26/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 268 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D, Dkt. 245-5 by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order granting 264 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order granting 263 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document 245-5 entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct 238 Scheduling Order filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 9/6/2011. Replies due by 9/13/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 8/23/2011) Modified on 8/24/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 262 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 259 Declaration in Support,,,, Exhibit L filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Related document(s) 259 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Extend Discovery of CIA and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/1/2011. Replies due by 9/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/18/2011) Modified on 8/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Ben Patterson in Support of 258 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Production of Documents filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, *** # 12 Exhibit L REMOVED, PURSUANT TO ORDER # 265 . SEE DOCUMENT # 261 FOR CORRECTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT L *** , # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC)(Related document(s) 258 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/18/2011) Modified on 8/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/19/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/23/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Production of Documents and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/1/2011. Replies due by 9/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/18/2011) Modified on 8/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 245 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and, In the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb, # 2 Exhibit A to Herb Declaration)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/18/2011) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Laura O'Neill in Support of 255 MOTION to Compel filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M-1, # 14 Exhibit M-2, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) 255 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/18/2011) Modified on 8/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/1/2011. Replies due by 9/8/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/18/2011) Modified on 8/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA re 252 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Discovery by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Motion for Protective Order Limiting Discovery)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Kimberly Herb in Support of 252 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Discovery filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Herb Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Herb Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Herb Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Herb Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E to Herb Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F to Herb Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G to Herb Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H to Herb Declaration, # 9 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 252 ) (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Discovery filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 8/15/2011) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 245 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and, In the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Central Intelligence Agency's Motion for Judgment on Pleadings and, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/11/2011) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-4-2011, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/11/2011) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ON DEFENDANT CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/9/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 8/4/2011 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 8/4/2011). (Court Reporter: Debra Pas) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/4/2011) Modified on 8/8/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Gordon P. Erspamer to Honorable Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/3/2011) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 245 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and, In the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/29/2011) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and, In the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/11/2011. Replies due by 8/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb, # 2 Exhibit A to Herb Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Herb Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Herb Decl., # 5 ***Exhibit D to Herb Decl. removed per order, document # 267 *** # 6 Exhibit E to Herb Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Herb Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Herb Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Herb Decl., # 10 Exhibit I to Herb Decl., # 11 Exhibit J to Herb Decl., # 12 Exhibit K to Herb Decl., # 13 Exhibit L to Herb Decl., # 14 Exhibit M to Herb Decl., # 15 Exhibit N to Herb Decl., # 16 Exhibit O to Herb Decl., # 17 Exhibit P to Herb Decl., # 18 Exhibit Q to Herb Decl., # 19 Exhibit R to Herb Decl., # 20 Exhibit S to Herb Decl., # 21 Exhibit T to Herb Decl., # 22 Exhibit U to Herb Decl.)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/28/2011) Modified on 7/29/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/24/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE HEARING ON JULY 21, 2011 JOINT STATEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/27/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Over Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs' Responses to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA re 241 Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Over Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs' Responses to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Over Defendant Department of Veterans Affairs' Responses to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests by William Blazinski, Department of Veterans Affairs, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 7/21/2011) Modified on 7/22/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Over Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Intelligence Agency. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 7/1/2011) Modified on 7/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Over Plaintiffs Requests for Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Intelligence Agency, et al. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 7/1/2011) Modified on 7/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 237 Stipulation Extending Case Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2012 02:00 PM. Bench Trial (20 day) set for 7/9/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Case Deadlines by William Blazinski, Central Intelligence Agency, David C. Dufrane, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Leon Panetta, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Eric K. Shinseki, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Case Deadlines)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/20/2011) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/14/2011) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE JOINT REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION re 234 Letter filed by United States Department of the Army, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Pete Geren, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of Defense, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Leon Panetta, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Central Intelligence Agency, United States of America, Bruce Price, Robert M. Gates, Eric K. Shinseki, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/9/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Request for Clarification of Procedure Concerning Discovery Disputes. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/7/2011) Modified on 6/8/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 233 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 187 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in Part; DENYING 211 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 231 Stipulation, filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Central Intelligence Agency, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/24/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order Modifying Protective Order Governing Discovery by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Itelligence Agency, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blakely, Timothy) (Filed on 5/19/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 228 Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of 228 Stipulation, filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Related document(s) 228 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 5/3/2011) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Deadlines by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Intelligence Agency, et al. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 5/3/2011) Modified on 5/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America Notice of Withdrawal of Daniel J. Vecchio as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 4/15/2011) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 221 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of 223 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Related document(s) 223 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 4/11/2011) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 221 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 180 Amended Complaint filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Modified on 4/12/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Renotice motion hearing re 221 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 180 Amended Complaint filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Related document(s) 221 ) (Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 4/7/2011) Modified on 4/8/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 180 Amended Complaint,, filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua E. Gardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 4/6/2011) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SUA SPONTE STRIKING 219 Letter filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/4/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER, DOCUMENT # 220 *** Letter from Gordon P. Erspamer to Judge Wilken. (Attachments: # 1 Gilliland v. E.J. Bartells Co., Inc., 270 F.3d 1259 (9th Cir. 2001))(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 4/4/2011) Modified on 4/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY (re 187 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE (re 187 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint ) filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 211 MOTION to Strike the CIA's Administrative Record ) Plaintiffs' Reply in Response to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the CIA's Administrative Record filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 3/11/2011) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 211 MOTION to Strike the CIA's Administrative Record ) filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 3/8/2011) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON BRIEFING REGARDING 187 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition due by 3/22/2011. Defendants' Supplemental Reply due by 3/29/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/8/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Kimberly L. Herb re submission of complete version of the document identified as AR-24(b) inadvertently omitted from the administrative record. (Attachments: # 1 document identfied as AR-24(B))(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/3/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***NOTE: ORIGINAL DOCUMENT WITH DOCUMENT #210*** (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER CONCERNING BRIEFING AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/2/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike the CIA's Administrative Record and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 2/25/2011) Modified on 2/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Record (Volume II) by Central Intelligence Agency (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Record (Volume 1) by Central Intelligence Agency (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America of Manual Filing of Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patricia B. Cameresi)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/16/2011) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Owen Littleton (Littleton, Judson) (Filed on 2/4/2011) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Gordon P. Erspamer to Magistrate Judge Larson re DoJ 2/1/11 Letter [Document 205]. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from Joshua E. Gardner by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America Pursuant to Magistrate Judge Larson's October 27, 2010 Request (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/1/2011) Modified on 2/2/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 203 Stipulation extending time for new defendants to file answer to re 180 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order extending time for new defendants to file answer to re 180 Amended Complaint,, by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 1/21/2011) Modified on 1/24/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION re 191 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/19/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **FILED IN ERROR** ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories 191 Motion to Compel (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (jlsec, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 199 STIPULATED Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents from Docket re 195 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATED Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents from Docket re 195 ; (Proposed) Order by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/11/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 191 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Farel Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Farel Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Farel Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Farel Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Farel Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Farel Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Farel Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Farel Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Farel Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Farel Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Farel Declaration)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 1/5/2011) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to re 190 Letter by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/14/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America re 178 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Lutz Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Lutz Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Lutz Declaration, # 4 Herb Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Herb Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 2, part 1 to Herb Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 2, part 2 to Herb Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 2, part 3 to Herb Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 2, part 4 to Herb Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 3 to Herb Declaration)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/20/2010) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). ***ATTACHMENTS 5-9 BLOCKED*** (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum re 187 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/17/2010) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 191 Renewed Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/17/2010) Modified on 12/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of 191 Renewed Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 191 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/17/2010) Modified on 12/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/19/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Renewed Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/17/2010) Modified on 12/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Gordon P. Erspamer re Defendants' Assertion of Privilege under 50 U.S.C. Section 403g. (Attachments: # 1 Rough Transcript of Pelikan Deposition)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/17/2010) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of 188 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 188 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/13/2010) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 187 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed byWilliam Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 12/13/2010) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, Eric K. Shinseki, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Department of the Army, United States Secretary of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/6/2010) Modified on 12/7/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER re 181 Stipulation, filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Central Intelligence Agency, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, Robert M. Gates, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 6, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 184 Stipulation, filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Leon Panetta, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, David C. Dufrane, Central Intelligence Agency, Franklin D. Rochelle, Bruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, Robert M. Gates, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/6/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Compliance with November 12, 2010 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions, filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Eric H. Holder, Jr.. (Blakely, Timothy) (Filed on 12/2/2010) Modified on 12/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Discovery. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/1/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Timothy W. Blakely in Support of 181 Stipulation and Proposed Order Enlarging Time for Settlement Proposal filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Related document(s) 181 ) (Blakely, Timothy) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 11/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Proposed Order Enlarging Time for Settlement Proposal, filed by William Blazinski, David C. Dufrane, Tim Michael Josephs, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares: Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Eric H. Holder. (Blakely, Timothy) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 11/30/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/25/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under United States Constitution and Federal Statutes and Regulations against Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Eric K. Shinseki. Filed byBruce Price, Vietnam Veterans of America, Veterans Rights Organization, Franklin D. Rochelle, Eric P. Muth, Swords to Plowshares, Larry Meirow, David C. Dufrane, William Blazinski, Tim Michael Josephs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 11/18/2010) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-27-10, before Judge James Larson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion ; Granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion ; Denying without Prejudice 131 Motion ; Denying without Prejudice 140 Motion for Protective Order (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Leave to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and to Overrule Objections 121 Motion for Protective Order (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Joshua Edward Gardner (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 11/12/2010) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/29/10. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference with Judge Laporte held on 10/29/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2010) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2010 before James Larson (Date Filed: 10/27/2010) re 128 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel Production of Documents filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Vietnam Veterans of America, 121 MOTION for Protective Order and to Overrule Objections filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Vietnam Veterans of America, 131 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Vietnam Veterans of America, 140 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Scope of Discovery filed by United States Department of Defense, 125 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by Eric P. Muth, Larry Meirow, Vietnam Veterans of America, After hearing oral arguments, the matters are taken under submission. The Court will issue an order. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2010) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Proposed Order re 128 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel Production of Documents by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Gordon P. Erspamer to Magistrate Judge Larson re Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Protective Order Governing Discovery)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/26/2010) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 20, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support re 131 MOTION for Sanctions filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/13/2010) Modified on 10/14/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Kimberly L. Herb in Support of 140 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Scope of Discovery filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Related document(s) 140 ) (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/13/2010) Modified on 10/14/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply in support of re 140 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Scope of Discovery filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Kilpatrick Declaration, # 10 Cameresi Declaration, # 11 Roberts Declaration)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/13/2010) Modified on 10/14/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED Proposed Protective Order Governing Discovery by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/13/2010) Modified on 10/14/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Timothy W. Blakely in Support of 163 Reply Memorandum, in Support of Motion for Protective Order and to Overrule Objections filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 163 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/13/2010) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memorandum re 121 MOTION for Protective Order and to Overrule Objections filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/13/2010) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum re 125 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/13/2010) Modified on 10/14/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of 160 Reply Memorandum filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 160 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/13/2010) Modified on 10/14/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Memorandum re 128 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel Production of Documents filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/13/2010) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 134 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER STAYING FURTHER DISCOVERY AND FOR A MODIFICATION OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of 157 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Erspamer Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Erspamer Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Erspamer Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Erspamer Declaration)(Related document(s) 157 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/6/2010) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 140 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Scope of Discovery filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 10/6/2010) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply in Support re 134 MOTION for Protective Order and Modification of Case Management Order filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 9/23/2010) Modified on 9/24/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Judge Wilken re ERRATA re 151 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order Staying Further Discovery by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion For Protective Order 121 ; Motion to Compel Depositions 125 ; Motion to Compel Production of Documents 128 ; Motion for Sanctions 131 set for 10/27/2010 09:30 AM before the Honorable James Larson in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Gordon P. Erspamer in Support of 151 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 151 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 9/16/2010) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 134 MOTION for Protective Order and Modification of Case Management Order filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 9/16/2010) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Declaration of Caroline Lewis Wolverton in support of Opposition re 131 MOTION for Sanctions (Amendment to 148 ) by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits part 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits part 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits part 5)(Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 131 MOTION for Sanctions by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 9/16/2010) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Caroline Lewis Wolverton in support of Opposition re 131 MOTION for Sanctions filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits part 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits part 4)(Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Michael Kilpatrick filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Anthony Lee filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Patricia Cameresi filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 131 MOTION for Sanctions filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 128 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel Production of Documents filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Patricia Cameresi, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Anthony Lee, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Kilpatrick, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Lloyd Roberts, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Patsy D'Eramo, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Raymond Laurel, # 7 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Patricia Cameresi, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of Caroline Wolverton, part 1, # 9 Affidavit Wolverton Declaration, part 2, # 10 Affidavit Wolverton Declaration, part 3, # 11 Affidavit Wolverton Declaration, part 4, # 12 Affidavit Wolverton Declaration, part 5, # 13 Proposed Order)(Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 125 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of Michael Kilpatrick, # 2 Affidavit Decl. of Anthony Lee, # 3 Affidavit Decl. of Lloyd Roberts, # 4 Affidavit Decl. of Arnold Dupuy, # 5 Affidavit Decl. of Richard Wiltison, # 6 Affidavit Decl. of Patsy D'Eramo, Jr., # 7 Affidavit Decl. of Lt. Col. Raymond Laurel, # 8 Affidavit Decl. of Patricia Cameresi, # 9 Affidavit Suppl. Decl. of Patricia Cameresi, # 10 Affidavit Decl. of Brigham Bowen, # 11 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. A, # 12 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. B, # 13 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. C, # 14 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. D, # 15 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. E, # 16 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. F, # 17 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. G, # 18 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. H, # 19 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. I, # 20 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. J, # 21 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. K, # 22 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. L, # 23 Exhibit Bowen Decl. Ex. M, # 24 Proposed Order)(Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 140 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Scope of Discovery by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Scope of Discovery filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Herb Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Herb Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Herb Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Herb Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Herb Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Herb Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Herb Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Herb Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Herb Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Herb Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Herb Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Herb Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Herb Declaration, # 14 Cameresi Declaration, # 15 Supplemental Cameresi Declaration, # 16 Kilpatrick Declaration and Exhibit 1, # 17 Roberts Declaration, # 18 Wiltison Declaration)(Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 121 MOTION for Protective Order and to Overrule Objections filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel, # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Protective Order)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Continuance of Hearing 137 Motion Granting (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION - Unopposed Motion to Change Time filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE AND ORDER - Further Settlement Conference set for 10/29/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/7/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/30/2010, before Judge James Larson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 9/2/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order and Modification of Case Management Order filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Kilpatrick, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Patricia Cameresi, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Caroline Lewis Wolverton, # 4 Proposed Order)(Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 8/27/2010) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 131 MOTION for Sanctions by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Daniel J. Vecchio in Support of 131 MOTION for Sanctions filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 131 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Sanctions filed by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2010 09:30 AM. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 128 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel Production of Documents by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Daniel J. Vecchio in Support of 128 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel Production of Documents filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 128 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel Production of Documents and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2010 09:30 AM. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 125 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Daniel J. Vecchio in Support of 125 MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 125 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Overrule Objections and Compel 30(b)(6) Depositions and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2010 09:30 AM. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Brigham John Bowen (Bowen, Brigham) (Filed on 8/23/2010) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Daniel J. Vecchio in Support of 121 MOTION for Protective Order and to Overrule Objections filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H-1, # 9 Exhibit H-2, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 121 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/19/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 121 MOTION for Protective Order and to Overrule Objections by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/19/2010) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order and to Overrule Objections filed by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/19/2010) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/6/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Regarding Meet and Confer Process by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Wolverton, Caroline) (Filed on 8/6/2010) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Over Plaintiffs' Requests for Production and 30(b)(6) Document Collection Depositions and Plaintiffs' Request for Sanctions by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert M. Gates, Pete Green, Erick H. Holder, Jr., Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/2/2010) Modified on 8/3/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Regarding Meet and Confer and Defendants' Position Regarding Status Report by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/2/2010) Modified on 8/3/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [Proposed] Protective Order Governing Discovery by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/2/2010) Modified on 8/3/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute Over Protective Order and Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert M. Gates, Pete Green, Erick H. Holder, Jr., Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 8/2/2010) Modified on 8/3/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Timothy W. Blakely (Blakely, Timothy) (Filed on 7/28/2010) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum re 87 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 7/15/2010) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories 76 Motion to Compel (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge 7/1/2010 granting 107 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 6/30/2010 before James Larson. Oral arguments heard, matter taken under submission. Parties are ordered to meet and confer today on all other issues. (Date Filed: 6/30/2010). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/1/2010) Modified on 7/2/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 107 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Administrative Relief by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/29/2010) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of GORDON P. ERSPAMER in Support of 107 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Administrative Relief filed byDavid C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/29/2010) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and for Administrative Relief filed by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/29/2010) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement in Opposition re 104 Statement Regarding Leave to Serve Interrogatories Exceeding 25 in Number by Central Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Michael V. Hayden, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Michael B. Mukasey, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Herb, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/28/2010) Modified on 6/29/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 87 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byCentral Intelligence Agency, Robert M. Gates, Pete Geren, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Leon Panetta, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Army, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farel, Lily) (Filed on 6/24/2010) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Individual Statement Regarding Leave to Serve Interrogatories Exceeding 25 in Number by David C. Dufrane, Wray C. Forrest, Larry Meirow, Eric P. Muth, Bruce Price, Franklin D. Rochelle, Swords to Plowshares, Veterans Rights Organization, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Erspamer, Gordon) (Filed on 6/22/2010) Modified on 6/23/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held with Judge Laporte on 6/16/2010). Parties exchanging further proposals prior to the Further Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/16/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 314 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?