Soverain Software LLC v. Office Depot, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00152
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 2:59 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L Cook +1 310 789 3158 +1 310 789 3009 vcook@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Pierre Lahad +1 713 653 7859 +1 713 654 3386 jlahad@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
No Logo Office Depot, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2012 Michael C. Barrett +1 512 474 5201 +1 512 536 4598 mbarrett@fulbright.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2012 Sarah Renee Holland +1 512 474 5201 +1 512 536 4598 sholland@fulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Charles Stout +1 512 542 8929 +1 512 236 3308 sstout@velaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Bruce Weaver +1 512 542 8651 +1 512 236 3476 dweaver@velaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
      First Amended ANSWER to 56 Amended Complaint by Office Depot, Inc..(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
        ANSWER to 56 Amended Complaint by Office Depot, Inc..(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
          AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Office Depot, Inc., filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER denying 39 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss. Rather than dismissing Soverain's claims, the Court ORDERS Soverain to file an amended complaint within 14 days from the date of this Order to comply with the pleading requirements articulated in Twombly and Iqbal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/21/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Constance S Huttner terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Constance Huttner) by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER that the Clerk terminate Victoria L. Cook as Counsel for Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and discontinue CM/ECF notices to Victoria L. Cook for this civil action. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv141 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 44 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 10/22/2012. Replies due by 11/16/2012. Surreplies due by 12/3/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/12. cc:attys 10-02-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Office Depot, Inc., Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                    Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-DO, # 2 Exhibit B-DCO, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/26/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 (Lahad, John) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Change Venue by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Dolly Voorhees Davis in Support of Office Depot's Motion to Change Venue, # 3 Declaration of Constance S. Huttner in Support of Office Depot's Motion to Change Venue, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Huttner Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Huttner Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Huttner Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Huttner Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Huttner Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Huttner Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Huttner Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Huttner Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Huttner Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Huttner Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Huttner Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Huttner Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 13 to Huttner Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 14 to Huttner Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 15 to Huttner Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 16 to Huttner Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 17 to Huttner Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 18 to Huttner Declaration)(Huttner, Constance) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/12. cc:attys 9-17-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Parties to Comply with P.R. 3-1, 3-2, 3-3 and 3-4) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 9/10/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (sms, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Constance S Huttner on behalf of Office Depot, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3753388. (Huttner, Constance) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims of the First Amended Complaint filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/10/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/20/12. cc:attys 8-21-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims of the First Amended Complaint filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims of the First Amended Complaint filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Patent Harbor, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, by Office Depot, Inc..(Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims of the First Amended Complaint by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Dismiss the Indirect Infringement Claims against Office Depot, Inc. Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Infringement Claims filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Office Depot, Inc., filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A US 5715314, # 2 Exhibit B Reexam Cert. US 5715314 C1, # 3 Exhibit C US 5909492, # 4 Exhibit D Reexam Cert. US 5909492 C1)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael C Barrett and Sarah Renee Holland terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/19/12. cc:attys 6-20-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Office Depot, Inc. (Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Lahad, John) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Office Depot, Inc. by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barrett, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 24 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Office Depot, Inc. (Preston, Hilary) Modified on 6/20/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Office Depot, Inc..(Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss the Indirect Infringement Claims against Office Depot, Inc. by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B Weaver on behalf of Office Depot, Inc. (Weaver, David) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hilary Preston on behalf of Office Depot, Inc. (Preston, Hilary) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Charles Stout on behalf of Office Depot, Inc. (Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Office Depot is required to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/09/12. cc:attys 4-09-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Office Depot, Inc. on 3/26/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/16/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holland, Sarah) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Renee Holland on behalf of Office Depot, Inc. (Holland, Sarah) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael C Barrett on behalf of Office Depot, Inc. (Barrett, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to Office Depot, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. INCORRECT CASE NUMBER. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Henry, Claire) Modified on 3/15/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Soverain Software LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Soverain Software LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Office Depot, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3491650.), filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 5,715,314, # 2 Exhibit B - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,715,314, # 3 Exhibit C - US 5,909,492, # 4 Exhibit D - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,909,492 CI, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 561 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?