Soverain Software LLC v. W.W. Grainger, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00146
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 3:40 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L Cook +1 310 789 3158 +1 310 789 3009 vcook@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Pierre Lahad +1 713 653 7859 +1 713 654 3386 jlahad@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
No Logo Ghc Specialty Brands, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garret Alan Leach +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 gleach@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Brian Medek +1 312 862 7336 +1 312 861 2200 james.medek@kirkland.com
No Logo W.w. Grainger, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garret Alan Leach +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 gleach@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Brian Medek +1 312 862 7336 +1 312 861 2200 james.medek@kirkland.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and defts are dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the License Agreement. Each party shall bear its own fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/12. cc:attys 11-15-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv141 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-DO, # 2 Exhibit B-DCO, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/26/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 3-1and 3-2 (Lahad, John) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Order by GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, W.W. Grainger, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Medek, James) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/12. cc:attys 9-17-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline for Parties to Comply with P.R. 3-1, 3-2, 3-3 and 3-4) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 9/10/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (sms, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/10/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/20/12. cc:attys 8-21-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Lahad, John) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Brian Medek on behalf of GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, W.W. Grainger, Inc. (Medek, James) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garret A Leach on behalf of GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, W.W. Grainger, Inc. (Leach, Garret) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, W.W. Grainger, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for W.W. Grainger, Inc.; Corporate Parent W.W. Grainger for GHC Specialty Brands, LLC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, W.W. Grainger, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants W.W. Grainger, Inc.s and GHC Specialty Brands, LLCs deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/09/12. cc:attys 4-09-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Soverain Software LLC by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                      Return of Service Executed as to GHC Specialty Brands, LLC on 3/26/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/16/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                        Return of Service Executed as to W.W. Grainger, Inc. on 3/26/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/16/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                              SUMMONS Issued as to GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, W.W. Grainger, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Soverain Software LLC identifying Corporate Parent none for Soverain Software LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, W.W. Grainger, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3491276.), filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U S 5,715,314, # 2 Exhibit B - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,715,314, # 3 Exhibit C - US 5,909,492, # 4 Exhibit D - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,909,492 CI, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 460 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?