Soverain Software LLC v. eBay, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00143-LED
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 6:57 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L Cook +1 310 789 3158 +1 310 789 3009 vcook@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Pierre Lahad +1 713 653 7859 +1 713 654 3386 jlahad@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
eBay, Inc. eBay, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Bamboo.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mercadolibre Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Geringer +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5300 james.geringer@klarquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David McLeod +1 503 595 5300 +53595530 535 595 5301 richard.mcleod@klarquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Gsi Commerce, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Geringer +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5300 james.geringer@klarquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David McLeod +1 503 595 5300 +53595530 535 595 5301 richard.mcleod@klarquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
PayPal, Inc. PayPal, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Geringer +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5300 james.geringer@klarquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David McLeod +1 503 595 5300 +53595530 535 595 5301 richard.mcleod@klarquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
RadioShack Corporation RadioShack Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
v.
eBay, Inc. eBay, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Bamboo.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mercadolibre Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Geringer +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5300 james.geringer@klarquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David McLeod +1 503 595 5300 +53595530 535 595 5301 richard.mcleod@klarquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Gsi Commerce, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Geringer +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5300 james.geringer@klarquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David McLeod +1 503 595 5300 +53595530 535 595 5301 richard.mcleod@klarquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
PayPal, Inc. PayPal, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Geringer +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5300 james.geringer@klarquist.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David McLeod +1 503 595 5300 +53595530 535 595 5301 richard.mcleod@klarquist.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
RadioShack Corporation RadioShack Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/26/2012 Christopher Michael Joe +1 214 466 1272 +1 214 635 1828 Chris.Joe@bjciplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L Cook +1 310 789 3158 +1 310 789 3009 vcook@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Pierre Lahad +1 713 653 7859 +1 713 654 3386 jlahad@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and defendants eBay Inc. and PayPal Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/22/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/14/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/30/2015, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 57 Stipulation filed by Soverain Software LLC. Plaintiff's complaint against defendants GSI Commerce, Inc. and RadioShack Corp. is dismissed with prejudice. Counterclaims of defendants GSI Commerce, Inc. and RadioShack Corp. against Plaintiff are dismissed without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/29/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/30/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Withdraw
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Judgment under Rule 54(b)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/28/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER that the Clerk terminate Victoria L. Cook as Counsel for Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and discontinue CM/ECF notices to Victoria L. Cook for this civil action. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/13. (mll, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Case Referred to Mediator
                                          CASE REFERRED to Mediator. Mike Patterson is appointed as Mediator for all of the consolidated Soverian cases. Associated Cases: 6:12-cv-00141-LED, 6:12-cv-00142-LED, 6:12-cv-00143-LED, 6:12-cv-00144-LED, 6:12-cv-00145-LED, 6:12-cv-00146-LED, 6:12-cv-00147-LED, 6:12-cv-00148-LED, 6:12-cv-00149-LED, 6:12-cv-00150-LED, 6:12-cv-00151-LED, 6:12-cv-00152-LED, 6:12-cv-00153-LED(mll, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Order Staying Case
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv141 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-09-12(mll, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Remark
                                                  This Civil Action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:12cv141, which is designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings, except for venue motions, should be filed in the Lead Case. (mll, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012, Terminated: 10/30/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-DO, # (2) Exhibit B-DCO, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: 9/26/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [44] Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/26/12. (mjc, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Compliance with Patent Local Rule 3-1 and 3-2 (Lahad, John)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012, Terminated: 9/26/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [42] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/12. cc:attys 9-17-12 (mll, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012, Terminated: 9/17/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline for Parties to Comply with P.R. 3-1, 3-2, 3-3 and 3-4) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 9/10/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # (1) Sign-in Sheet) (sms, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/10/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/20/12. cc:attys 8-21-12(mll, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard David McLeod on behalf of Radioshack Corporation (McLeod, Richard)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Christopher Carraway on behalf of Radioshack Corporation (Carraway, John)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James E Geringer on behalf of Radioshack Corporation (Geringer, James)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared B Bobrow on behalf of GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc. (Bobrow, Jared)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arjun H Mehra on behalf of GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc. (Mehra, Arjun)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa L Hotze on behalf of GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc. (Hotze, Melissa)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                  Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to [25] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of eBay, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., and PayPal Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Lahad, John)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                    Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to [24] Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of RadioShack Corporation by Soverain Software LLC.(Lahad, John)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [29] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Michael Joe terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/26/12. cc:attys 6-26-12 (mll, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/26/2012 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and to Terminate Electronic Notices of Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC for RadioShack Corporation by Radioshack Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Radioshack Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Radioshack Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Lahad, John)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., eBay, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent eBay, Inc. for GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc.; Corporate Parent None for eBay, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                ANSWER to [4] Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by PayPal, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                ANSWER to [4] Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Radioshack Corporation.(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard David McLeod on behalf of GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., eBay, Inc. (McLeod, Richard)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James E Geringer on behalf of GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., eBay, Inc. (Geringer, James)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Christopher Carraway on behalf of GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., eBay, Inc. (Carraway, John)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Michael Joe (Joe, Christopher)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant RadioShack Corporation shall move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint no later than 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/10/12. cc:attys 4-10-12 (mll, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/10/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [4] Complaint, Defendant RadioShack Corporation's Motion to Extend Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Radioshack Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Radioshack Corporation on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to GSI Commerce, Inc. on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants eBay, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., and PayPal, Inc. shall have to 6-15-2012 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/05/12. cc:attys 4-05-12 (mll, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr on behalf of GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., eBay, Inc. (Lackey, Walter)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., eBay, Inc. (Craft, Roger)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/5/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [4] Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Corrected Notice of Appearances by Justin A. Nelson, Max L. Tribble, Jr., John P. Lahad, Victoria Cook and Kalpana Srinivasan (Nelson, Justin)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Rambin, Daymon)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Henry, Claire)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Hill, Jack)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE DISREGARD. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Nelson, Justin) Modified on 3/27/2012 (gsg).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED COMPLAINT against GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3491635.), filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - US 5,715,314, # (2) Exhibit B - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,715,314, # (3) Exhibit C - US 5,909,492, # (4) Exhibit D - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,909,492 CI, # (5) Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 3/14/2012 (gsg).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Soverain Software LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Soverain Software LLC. (Ward, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** COMPLAINT against GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3491095.), filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - US 5,715,314, # (2) Exhibit B - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,715,314, # (3) Exhibit C - US 5,909,492, # (4) Exhibit D - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,909,492 CI, # (5) Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 3/14/2012 (gsg).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice of Docket Correction
                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED. ATTORNEY HAS REFILED, (SEE ENTRY [4]) Document # 1, Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (gsg)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 513 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?