Soverain Software LLC v. Oracle Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00141
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 4:02 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L Cook +1 310 789 3158 +1 310 789 3009 vcook@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Pierre Lahad +1 713 653 7859 +1 713 654 3386 jlahad@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Best Buy Company, Inc. Best Buy Company, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Best Buy Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo Bestbuy.com, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Neiman Marcus Neiman Marcus, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Neiman Marcus, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo OfficeMax, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Oracle Corporation Oracle Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo Oracle Otc Subsidiary LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

v.
No Logo bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Best Buy Company, Inc. Best Buy Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Best Buy Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo Bestbuy.com, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Neiman Marcus Neiman Marcus, Defendant
Officially listed as "Neiman Marcus, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo OfficeMax, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Oracle Corporation Oracle Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo Oracle Otc Subsidiary LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257

Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L Cook +1 310 789 3158 +1 310 789 3009 vcook@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Pierre Lahad +1 713 653 7859 +1 713 654 3386 jlahad@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (229) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 212 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/18/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 3/9/2015 re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheets) (cwk) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE: Deadlines terminated (Pretrial Conference, Jury Selection, and Trial dates cancelled). (cwk) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant International Business Machines Corporation in Consolidated Member Case 6:12-cv-142 are dismissed with prejudice. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendants Fossil, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., and Staples, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by BestBuy.com LLC, GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., W.W. Grainger, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 196 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by Neiman Marcus, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by Bloomingdales, Inc., Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s 188 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to International Business Machines Corp.'s 187 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Fossil, Inc.'s 186 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Beauty.com, Inc., Bloomingdales, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Fossil, Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:12cv142), GSI Commerce, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., J. Crew Group, Inc., KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation, Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Madewell, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Quill Corporation, Radioshack Corporation(Consolidated Civil Action 6:12cv143), Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., The Home Depot USA Inc, The Home Depot, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., drugstore.com, inc., eBay, Inc.. (Carraway, John) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Serbin on behalf of J. Crew Group, Inc., Madewell, Inc. (Serbin, Gary) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Serbin on behalf of KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation (Serbin, Gary) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Trial Trans.), # 2 Exhibit B (Rhyne Decl.), # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Defendant Home Depot U.S.A, Inc.' s Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint in Civil Action No. 6:12-CV-142 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Home Depot U.S.A, Inc..(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Defendant International Business Machines Corp.' s Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint in Civil Action No. 6:12-CV-142 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by International Business Machines Corp..(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Defendant Fossil, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint in Civil Action No. 6:12-CV-142 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Fossil, Inc..(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's Second Amended Answer to Defendants' Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims 179 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's Second Amended Answer to Defendant RadioShack's Amended Counterclaims 178 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's First Amended Answer to Defendants eBay, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., and PayPal Inc.'s First Amended Answer and Counterclaims 177 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Fossil, Inc. ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Fossil, Inc..(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 5/12/2014 (mjc, ). (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***International Business Machines Corp. Second Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by International Business Machines Corp..(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 5/12/2014 (mjc, ). (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Beauty.com, Inc., Bloomingdales, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Fossil, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., J. Crew Group, Inc., KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation, Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Madewell, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Quill Corporation, Radioshack Corporation(Consolidated Civil Action 6:12cv143), Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., The Home Depot USA Inc, The Home Depot, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., drugstore.com, inc., eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 314 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 492 Patent, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement Contentions, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Claims at Issue, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Newegg Appeal Brief, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Soverain Appeal Brief, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Petition for Rehearing, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Cert Petition, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Gifford Patent, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Newegg Trial 4-29-10 AM, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Newegg Trial 4-29-10 PM, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Newegg Trial 4-28-10 PM, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Alexander Trevor, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Bowen Manual, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Ellsworth Manual, # 16 Exhibit 16 - CompuServe Video, # 17 Exhibit 17 - CV of Alexander Trevor, # 18 Exhibit 18 - CompuServe Statement, # 19 Exhibit 19 - 314 Claim Chart, # 20 Appendix Local Rule CV-56 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to (Second Amended Answer) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 23 in 6:12-cv-00147), COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Macys, Inc., Bloomingdales, Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Brean, Daniel) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to (Second Amended Answer, Defenses) 40 Amended Complaint, Complaint Dkt. No. 4 in Civil Action No. 6:12-cv-143, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Radioshack Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to (First Amended Answer, Defenses) 40 Amended Complaint, Complaint Dkt. No. 4 in Civil Action No. 6:12-cv-143, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 175 Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff's complaint against the Oracle Defendants is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE; The Oracle Defendants' counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc., Bestbuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., BergdorfGoodman.com, LLC, and Office Max, Inc. is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc.s, Bestbuy.com LLCs, Neiman Marcus, Inc.s, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.s, BergdorfGoodman.com, LLCs, and Office Max, Inc.s counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Walgreens.com, Inc. is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Defendant Walgreens.com, Inc.'s counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Walgreen Co. is dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant Walgreen Co.'s counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/141. (mll, ) Modified on 4/24/2014 (mll, ). (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, Soverain Software LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REPORT of Mediation by Mike Patterson (re: 4/2/2014). Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/15/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REPORT of Mediation by Mike Patterson (re: 4/3/2014). Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/15/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPORT of Mediation by Mike Patterson (re: 4/8/2014). Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/15/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPORT of Mediation (re: 4/8/2014) by Mike Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/15/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REPORT of Mediation (April 10, 2014) by Mike Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/15/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPORT of Mediation (re: 4/1/2014) by Mike Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/15/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***REPORT of Mediation by Mike Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***REPORT of Mediation by Mike Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***REPORT of Mediation by Mike Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***REPORT of Mediation by Mike Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***REPORT of Mediation by Mike Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        MODIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered granting 161 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Entry of Modified Protective Order filed by PayPal, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/1/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Entry of Modified Protective Order by GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Modified Protective Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 71 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Roger Brian Craft (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss. Rather than dismissing Soverain's claims, the Court ORDERS Soverain to file an amended complaint within 14 days from the date of this Order to comply with the pleading requirements articulated in Twombly and Iqbal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/21/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 127 Motion for Reconsideration re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order filed by Office Max, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Madewell, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, Macys, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Beauty.com, Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Best Buy Co., Inc., Bloomingdales, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., GSI Commerce, Inc., The Home Depot USA Inc, Oracle Corporation, Walgreens.com, Inc., Quill Corporation, Macys.com, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Neiman Marcus, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, drugstore.com, inc., Saks Incorporated, J. Crew Group, Inc., Fossil, Inc., eBay, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., Kohls Corporation, Radioshack Corporation, Saks Direct, LLC, Staples, Inc. The parties SHALL modify the protective order by moving "unreleased products, future business plans, and strategies from competition" from Section 6(c) to Section 6(d) of the protective order. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit the modified protective order in compliance with this order within ten days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/21/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Asserted Claims (Lahad, John) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 153 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Constance S Huttner terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that the stay in this case is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/11/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Constance Huttner) by Beauty.com, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., drugstore.com, inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven J Reynolds on behalf of Quill Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4555621. (Reynolds, Steven) (Entered: 03/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order filed on behalf of Defendants filed by GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hotze, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John P. Lahad, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Tretter Email, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Nelson Email, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER modifying 147 Amended Docket Control Order. First Mediation Completion due by 4/15/2014. Mike Patterson is appointed as Mediator for all consolidated Soverian cases. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 145 Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/18/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order. Soverain is ORDERED to submit its responsive brief to Defendants' motion, by 2-26-2013. Defendants' reply brief, is due by 3-05-2013. Soverains surreply brief, is due by 3-12-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/12/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Soverain Software LLC. (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER regarding 143 Motion for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order. The parties shall resubmit a proposed Docket Control Order reflecting Plaintiff's proposed date for early mediation to be completed. With respect to the Discovery Order, the Court ORDERS that Exhibit A to Docket No. 63 of the lead case shall govern discovery in the Soverain matters. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/10/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Docket Control Order))(Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until 2-04-2014, to submit new Docket Control and Discovery Orders for the Court's consideration. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/28/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File New Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 139 Motion to Stay. All deadlines and proceedings in this matter are STAYED until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/24/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Stay Extension of Stay by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Stay by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 135 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Victoria L Cook terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Victoria L. Cook by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 133 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra R. Coleman terminated as counsel of record for Defendants Fossil, Inc., The Home Depot, Inc., The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., and International Business Machines Corp. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/2/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendants Fossil, Inc., The Home Depot, Inc., The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., and International Business Machines Corp. Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Debra Coleman as Counsel of Record by Fossil, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., The Home Depot USA Inc, The Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 131 Motion to Stay. All deadlines and proceedings in this matter are stayed until the earlier of: (1) 7-01-2013, or (2) two weeks after the date that the Federal Circuit grants or denies Soverain's petition for rehearing. Upon the earlier of these events, the stay will expire automatically, and if the Federal Circuit rules on the petition before 7-01-2013, the parties will give notice to the Court as soon as practicable thereafter on the date the stay will expire. Within two weeks of the expiration of the stay, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed schedule for resuming the litigation to the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/19/13. cc:attys 2-20-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Stay CORRECTED Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and Deadlines by Beauty.com, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Bloomingdales, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Fossil, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., J. Crew Group, Inc., KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation, Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Madewell, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Neiman Marcus, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, PayPal, Inc., Quill Corporation, Radioshack Corporation, Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Soverain Software LLC, Staples, Inc., The Home Depot USA Inc, The Home Depot, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, drugstore.com, inc., eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Deadlines by Beauty.com, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Bloomingdales, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Fossil, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., J. Crew Group, Inc., KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation, Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Madewell, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Neiman Marcus, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, PayPal, Inc., Quill Corporation, Radioshack Corporation, Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Soverain Software LLC, Staples, Inc., The Home Depot USA Inc, The Home Depot, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, drugstore.com, inc., eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order; Responses due by 3/1/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/11/13. cc:attys 2-11-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 127 MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/11/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re 123 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 125 Protective Order Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of the Protective Order by Beauty.com, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Bloomingdales, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Fossil, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., J. Crew Group, Inc., KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation, Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Madewell, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Neiman Marcus, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, PayPal, Inc., Quill Corporation, Radioshack Corporation, Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., The Home Depot USA Inc, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, drugstore.com, inc., eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Hotze, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Beauty.com, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., drugstore.com, inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/13. cc:attys 1-17-13(mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order - Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Beauty.com, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Bloomingdales, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Fossil, Inc., GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, GSI Commerce, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., J. Crew Group, Inc., KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation, Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Madewell, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Neiman Marcus, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, PayPal, Inc., Quill Corporation, Radioshack Corporation, Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., The Home Depot USA Inc, The Home Depot, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, drugstore.com, inc., eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pickett, John) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER terminating 121 Motion for Protective Order. Parties shall submit their agreed Protective Order in compliance with this order within 10 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/14/13. cc:attys 1-14-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of Illinois or, in the Alternative, to the District of Massachusetts filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order by Beauty.com, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Bloomingdales, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Fossil, Inc., GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, GSI Commerce, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., J. Crew Group, Inc., KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation, Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Madewell, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Neiman Marcus, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, PayPal, Inc., Quill Corporation, Radioshack Corporation, Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., The Home Depot USA Inc, The Home Depot, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, drugstore.com, inc., eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pickett, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2012: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation - Notice of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Pickett, John) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 118 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric Miller Albritton terminated as counsel for Quill Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/12. cc:attys 12-19-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Eric M. Albritton by Quill Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of Illinois or, in the Alternative, to the District of Massachusetts filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Beauty.com, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Bloomingdales, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Fossil, Inc., GSI Commerce, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., J. Crew Group, Inc., KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation, Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Madewell, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Neiman Marcus, Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, PayPal, Inc., Quill Corporation, Radioshack Corporation, Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Staples, Inc., The Home Depot USA Inc, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, drugstore.com, inc., eBay, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Compliance with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court extends the deadline for submission of a proposed protective order until December 21, 2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of Illinois or, in the Alternative, to the District of Massachusetts filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by GHC Specialty Brands, LLC, W.W. Grainger, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Leach, Garret) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Defendant RadioShack 98 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Defendants Staples and Quill's 97 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Defendants' 70 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Defendants Kohl's Corporation and Kohl's Department Stores, Inc 74 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to Defendant International Business Machines Corp's 99 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to Defendants J. Crew Group, Inc. and Madewell, Inc.'s 73 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until 12-13-2012 to comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4(b). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/12. cc;attys 11-30-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 102 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for submission of a proposed protective order is extended to 12-11-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/12. cc:attys 11-28-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until 12-05-2012 to respond to Defendants' First Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims and an Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/12. cc:attys 11-27-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer and Answer to Amended Counnterclaims by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 11/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM : IBM's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims against Soverain Software LLC by International Business Machines Corp..(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to Soverain Software LLC's First 40 Amended Complaint, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Radioshack Corporation. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to Soverain's First 40 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Staples, Inc., Quill Corporation. (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, by Beauty.com, Inc., Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., drugstore.com, inc..(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, by Office Depot, Inc..(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, by Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated.(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, by Williams-Sonoma, Inc..(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, by Nordstrom, Inc..(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, by Euromarket Designs, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C..(Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Initial Disclosures (Lahad, John) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by International Business Machines Corp. Notice of Initial Disclosure (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Beauty.com, Inc., Euromarket Designs, Inc., Meadowbrook L.L.C., Nordstrom, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Saks Direct, LLC, Saks Incorporated, Vision Direct, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens.com, Inc., Williams-Sonoma, Inc., drugstore.com, inc. [INITIAL DISCLOSURES] (Stout, Stephen) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by The Home Depot USA Inc Notice of Initial Disclosure (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Fossil, Inc. Notice of Initial Disclosure (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Quill Corporation Notice of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Staples, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by GSI Commerce, Inc., PayPal, Inc., Radioshack Corporation, eBay, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., Kohls Corporation - Notice of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Pickett, John) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by J. Crew Group, Inc., Madewell, Inc. - Notice of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Pickett, John) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Bloomingdales, Inc., Macys, Inc., Macys.com, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Brean, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 76 Notice of Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and defts WW Grainger Inc and GHC Specialty Brands LLC are dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the License Agreement. Each party shall bear its own fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/12. cc:attys 11-15-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for submission of a proposed protective order is extended to 11-27-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/14/12. cc:attys 11-14-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Stipulation Between Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and Defendants W.W. Grainger, Inc. and GHC Specialty Brands LLC and Order of Dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Kohls Corporation, KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Pickett, John) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Madewell, Inc., J. Crew Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Pickett, John) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to serve initial disclosures is extended to 11-16-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/13/12. cc:attys 11-13-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of Illinois or, in the Alternative, to the District of Massachusetts by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Exhibit 1), # 2 Exhibit (Exhibit 2), # 3 Exhibit (Exhibit 3), # 4 Exhibit (Exhibit 4), # 5 Exhibit (Exhibit 5), # 6 Exhibit (Exhibit 6), # 7 Exhibit (Exhibit 7), # 8 Exhibit (Exhibit 8), # 9 Exhibit (Exhibit 9), # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, Office Max, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC.(Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Serve Initial Disclosures by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for submission of a proposed protective order is extended to 11-13-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/08/12. cc:attys 11-08-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Early Mediation Completion due by 5/1/2013; Second Mediation Completion due 11-22-2013; Third Mediation Completion due 10-07-2014. Mike Patterson is appointed as Mediator for all the consolidated Soverian cases Jury Selection set for 3/2/2015 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 11/7/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/30/12. cc:attys 10-30-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER terminating 63 Motion for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order. The Court hereby APPOINTS Mr. Mike Patterson as the mediator for all of the consolidated cases. Accordingly, parties shall resubmit a proposed Docket Control Order. The Court ORDERS that Exhibit A to the Joint Motion shall govern discovery in the Soverain matters. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/12. cc:attys 10-22-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order, # 3 Exhibit B- Proposed Docket Control Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv141 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/12. cc:attys 10-02-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-DO, # 2 Exhibit B-DCO, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/26/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Compliance with Patent Local Rule 3-1 and 3-2 (Lahad, John) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/12. cc:attys 9-17-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline for Parties to Comply with P.R. 3-1, 3-2, 3-3 and 3-4) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 9/10/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (sms, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims of First Amended Complaint filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Lahad, John) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/10/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/20/12. cc:attys 8-21-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims of First Amended Complaint filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Exhibit A))(Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to 46 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Oracle Corp. et al. by Soverain Software LLC.(Lahad, John) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims of First Amended Complaint filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Patent Harbor, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney, Douglas S Rupert for Office Max, Inc. $100 Pro Hac Vice fee paid, Receipt No. 02-1242. (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney, John Sheldon Letchinger for Office Max, Inc. $100 Pro Hac Vice fee paid, Receipt No. 02-1242. (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 40 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, Office Max, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC.(Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims of First Amended Complaint by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to 33 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Soverain Software LLC.(Lahad, John) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Indirect Indfringement Claims filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against All Defendants, filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US 5,715,314, # 2 Exhibit Reexam Cert 5,715,314 C1, # 3 Exhibit US 5,909,492, # 4 Exhibit Reexam Cert 5,909,492 C1)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tonya M. Gray on behalf of Neiman Marcus, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC (Gray, Tonya) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Lahad, John) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Office Max, Inc. (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Neiman Marcus, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Neiman Marcus, Inc., Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC.(Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Indirect Infringement Claims by Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Vidmar, Srecko) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Srecko Vidmar on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clayton C James on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC (James, Clayton) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Srecko Vidmar on behalf of Oracle Corporation, Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC (Vidmar, Srecko) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 27 Motion Regarding Defendant Art Technology Group. The case caption and all subsequent documents filed and served in this case shall reflect the defendants name change from Art Technology Group, LLC to Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC. Service to Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC was effectuated byservice on Art Technology Group LLC. The response by Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC to Soverains Complaint is due on 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/02/12. cc:attys 5-02-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION re defendants name change from Art Technology Group, LLC to Oracle OTC Subsidiary LLC by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant Art Technology Group)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clayton C James on behalf of Art Technology Group, LLC, Oracle Corporation (James, Clayton) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 24 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ordered that Defendants Neiman Marcus Inc., The Neiman Marcus Group Inc., and BergdorfGoodman.com LLC's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, is extended until and including 6/15/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/11/2012. (leh, ) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Soverain Software LLC by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Office Max, Inc.s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/09/12. cc:attys 4-09-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Soverain Software LLC by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to BestBuy.com LLC on 3/26/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/16/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Best Buy Co., Inc. on 3/26/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/16/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Office Max, Inc. on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Art Technology Group, LLC on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Neiman Marcus, Inc. on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Oracle Corporation on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc. and Bestbuy.com LLC deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/04/12. cc:attys 4-04-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Soverain Software LLC by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Oracle Corporation and Art Technology Group, LLCs deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/12. cc:attys 3-27-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Art Technology Group, LLC, Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Soverain Software LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Soverain Software LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Art Technology Group, LLC, Best Buy Co., Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Neiman Marcus, Inc., Office Max, Inc., Oracle Corporation, The Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3490955.), filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 5,715,314, # 2 Exhibit B - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,715,314, # 3 Exhibit C - US 5,909,492, # 4 Exhibit D - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,909,492 CI, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/14/2012 to correct associated cases) (mll, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/15/2012 to correct associated attorneys) (mll, ). Modified on 3/15/2012 (mll, ). (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 524 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?