Soverain Software LLC v. International Business Machines Corp. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00142
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 1:34 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L Cook +1 310 789 3158 +1 310 789 3009 vcook@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Pierre Lahad +1 713 653 7859 +1 713 654 3386 jlahad@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Fossil, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rader, Fishman & Grauer, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin S. Cohen +1 248 593 3327 jsc@raderfishman.com
International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "International Business Machines Corp."
Unknown Role, Unison Software, Inc.
No Logo Quill Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wong Cabello Lutsch Rutherford & Brucculeri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H Hall +1 832 446 2400 +1 832 446 2424 jhall@counselip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan K Knoll +1 832 446 2400 +1 832 446 2424 sknoll@counselip.com
Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wong Cabello Lutsch Rutherford & Brucculeri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H Hall +1 832 446 2400 +1 832 446 2424 jhall@counselip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan K Knoll +1 832 446 2400 +1 832 446 2424 sknoll@counselip.com
The Home Depot, Inc. The Home Depot, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC."
v.
No Logo Fossil, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rader, Fishman & Grauer, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin S. Cohen +1 248 593 3327 jsc@raderfishman.com
International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "International Business Machines Corp."
Unknown Role, Unison Software, Inc.
No Logo Quill Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wong Cabello Lutsch Rutherford & Brucculeri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H Hall +1 832 446 2400 +1 832 446 2424 jhall@counselip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan K Knoll +1 832 446 2400 +1 832 446 2424 sknoll@counselip.com
Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wong Cabello Lutsch Rutherford & Brucculeri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H Hall +1 832 446 2400 +1 832 446 2424 jhall@counselip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan K Knoll +1 832 446 2400 +1 832 446 2424 sknoll@counselip.com
The Home Depot, Inc. The Home Depot, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas George Papastavros +1 617 406 6019 +1 617 406 6119 nickpapastavros@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/12/2012 Michael C. Barrett +1 512 474 5201 +1 512 536 4598 mbarrett@fulbright.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2012 Sarah Renee Holland +1 512 474 5201 +1 512 536 4598 sholland@fulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claudia Wilson Frost +1 713 276 7648 +1 713 276 7673 claudia.frost@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria L Cook +1 310 789 3158 +1 310 789 3009 vcook@susmangodfrey.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Pierre Lahad +1 713 653 7859 +1 713 654 3386 jlahad@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 91 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant International Business Machines Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendants Fossil, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., and Staples, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER denying as moot 35 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 41 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER that the Clerk terminate Victoria L. Cook as Counsel for Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and discontinue CM/ECF notices to Victoria L. Cook for this civil action. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER terminating Debra Coleman as counsel of record for Defendants Fossil, Inc., The Home Depot, Inc., The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., and International Business Machines Corp. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/2/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER withdrawing Eric M Albritton as Counsel of Record for Quill Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/12. cc:attys 12-19-12(mll, ) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv141 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-DO, # 2 Exhibit B-DCO, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 83 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Susan K. Knoll, Keith A. Rutherford and James H. Hall, are no longer counsel of record for Defendants Staples, Inc. and Quill Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/27/12. cc:attys 9-27-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw AS COUNSEL by Quill Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, James) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/26/12. (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Compliance with Patent Local Rule 3-1 and 3-2 (Lahad, John) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by International Business Machines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 78 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/12. cc:attys 9-17-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline for Parties to Comply with P.R. 3-1, 3-2, 3-3 and 3-4) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 9/10/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (sms, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas G Papastavros on behalf of Quill Corporation (Papastavros, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas G Papastavros on behalf of Staples, Inc. (Papastavros, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudia Wilson Frost on behalf of Quill Corporation (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudia Wilson Frost on behalf of Staples, Inc. (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc. (Coleman, Debra) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of Fossil, Inc. (Coleman, Debra) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of International Business Machines Corp. (Coleman, Debra) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/10/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/20/12. cc:attys 8-21-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to 58 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Staples, Inc. and Quill Corporation by Soverain Software LLC.(Lahad, John) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Fossil, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Lahad, John) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to 51 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Lahad, John) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to 50 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of International Business Machines Corp. by Soverain Software LLC.(Lahad, John) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                              APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jon T Hohenthaner for International Business Machines Corp. (Attachments: # 1SEALED Exhibit)(pkb, ) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John M Desmarais for International Business Machines Corp. (pkb, ) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard M Cowell for International Business Machines Corp. (pkb, ) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dwain Mazingo on behalf of Quill Corporation, Staples, Inc. (Mazingo, Jason) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Quill Corporation, Staples, Inc. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert J Hammond on behalf of Fossil, Inc. (Hammond, Herbert) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          DEFENDANTS STAPLES, INC. AND QUILL CORPORATIONS ANSWER to 45 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Staples, Inc., Quill Corporation.(Knoll, Susan) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Staples, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Quill Corporation (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of The Home Depot, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Fossil, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Fossil, Inc.'s ANSWER to 45 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Fossil, Inc..(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. ANSWER to 45 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          International Business Machines Corp. ANSWER to 45 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by International Business Machines Corp..(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC's ANSWER to 37 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Staples, Inc. and Quill Corporation by Soverain Software LLC.(Lahad, John) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 41 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants IBMS and Fossils Motion to Dismiss Response to Defendants IBM and Fossil's Motion to Dismiss filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against All Defendants, filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US 5715314, # 2 Exhibit Reexam Cert. 5715314 C1, # 3 Exhibit US 5909492, # 4 Exhibit Reexam Cert. 5909492 C1)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Lahad, John) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Papastavros, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Home Depot, Inc. (Papastavros, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc.. Responses due by 7/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Papastavros, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James H Hall on behalf of Quill Corporation, Staples, Inc. (Hall, James) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Alan Rutherford on behalf of Quill Corporation, Staples, Inc. (Rutherford, Keith) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quill Corporation, Staples, Inc. (Knoll, Susan) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DEFENDANTS STAPLES, INC. AND QUILL CORPORATIONS ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Quill Corporation, Staples, Inc..(Knoll, Susan) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fossil, Inc. (Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Defendants IBMS and Fossils Motion to Dismiss by Fossil, Inc., International Business Machines Corp.. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by International Business Machines Corp. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of International Business Machines Corp. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael C Barrett and Sarah Renee Holland terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/12/12. cc:attys 6-12-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barrett, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas G Papastavros on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc. (Papastavros, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudia Wilson Frost on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc. (Frost, Claudia) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Defendant Fossil, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint.(Cohen, Justin S.) Modified on 4/25/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Fossil, Inc.s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/12. cc:attys 4-20-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) Modified on 4/19/2012 (gsg). (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Staples, Inc.s and Quill Corporations deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/09/12. cc:attys 4-09-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Home Depot is required to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/09/12. cc:attys 4-09-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Soverain Software LLC by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to The Home Depot, Inc. on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Quill Corporation on 3/21/2012, by personal service; answer due: 4/11/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Staples, Inc. on 3/26/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/16/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Fossil, Inc. on 3/26/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/16/2012. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2012: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to International Business Machines Corp. on 3/26/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/16/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holland, Sarah) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Renee Holland on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc. (Holland, Sarah) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael C Barrett on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc. (Barrett, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant International Business Machines deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/12. cc:attys 3-27-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lahad, John) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Notice of Attorney Appearances by Justin A. Nelson, Max L. Tribble, Jr., John P. Lahad, Victoria Cook and Kalpana Srinivasan (Nelson, Justin) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Fossil, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., Quill Corporation, Staples, Inc., THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of Soverain Software LLC (Nelson, Justin) Modified on 3/26/2012 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Soverain Software LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Soverain Software LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Fossil, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., Quill Corporation, Staples, Inc., THE HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., The Home Depot, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3491026.), filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 5,715,314, # 2 Exhibit B - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,715,314, # 3 Exhibit C - US 5,909,492, # 4 Exhibit D - Reexamination Certificate - US 5,909,492 CI, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/14/2012) (mll, ). (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 529 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?