Stinson et al v. The City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-04228
District Judge Robert W. Sweet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 2:05 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian Morris, Plaintiff
No Logo Chanel Meausa, Plaintiff
No Logo Charlene Finley, Plaintiff
No Logo Christian Dudley, Plaintiff
No Logo DAVID THOMPSON, Plaintiff
No Logo Gary Shaw, Plaintiff
No Logo Jamel Towe, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeremy Thames, Plaintiff
No Logo Jocelyn Ferdinand, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Sarpong, Plaintiff
No Logo Julius Dixon, Plaintiff
No Logo Leander Griffin, Plaintiff
No Logo Leander Griffin , Plaintiff
No Logo Lindsey Riddick, Plaintiff
No Logo Mariam Farnum, Plaintiff
No Logo Mica Ancrum, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Bennett, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Riddick, Plaintiff
No Logo Ricardo Jones, Plaintiff
No Logo Ryburn Walkes, Plaintiff
No Logo Sean Pettigrew, Plaintiff
No Logo Sharif Stinson, Plaintiff
No Logo Victor Breland, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo P.O.s John Doe #1-50, Defendant
No Logo Paul Brown, Defendant
No Logo Raymond W Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bodyart, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Commissioner of the New York Police Department,  In his official capacity Sheila Weinstein +1 212 363 3100 +1 212 943 0001 sweinste@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Commissioner of the New York Police Department,  In his official capacity Joanne Maureen McLaren +1 212 801 3197 +1 212 801 6400 jmclaren@law.nyc.gov
Commissioner of the New York Police Department,  In his official capacity Daniel Louis Passeser +1 212 227 6339 +1 212 788 9776 dpassese@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Commissioner of the New York Police Department,  In his official capacity Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Commissioner of the New York Police Department,  In his official capacity Nicholas Shea Davis +1 212 455 2000 ndavis@stblaw.com
Commissioner of the New York Police Department,  In his official capacity Bryce L. Friedman +1 212 455 2000 bfriedman@stblaw.com
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bodyart, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheila Weinstein +1 212 363 3100 +1 212 943 0001 sweinste@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Marie Richardson +1 212 442 0832 +1 212 788 9776 lrichard@law.nyc.gov
Space Steven Mark Silverberg +1 212 788 1336 +1 212 788 9776 ssilverb@law.nyc.gov
Space Qiana Charmaine Smith +1 212 788 1588 +1 212 788 9776 qwilliam@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joanne Maureen McLaren +1 212 801 3197 +1 212 801 6400 jmclaren@law.nyc.gov
Space Daniel Louis Passeser +1 212 227 6339 +1 212 788 9776 dpassese@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Suzanna Publicker Mettham +1 212 788 1103 +1 212 788 9776 smettham@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Shea Davis +1 212 455 2000 ndavis@stblaw.com
Space Bryce L. Friedman +1 212 455 2000 bfriedman@stblaw.com
No Logo Patrick Lynch, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward A. McDonald +1 212 698 3672 +1 212 698 3599 edward.mcdonald@dechert.com
No Logo Patrolmen's Benevolent Association Of The City Of New York, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Gilbert +1 212 698 3886 +1 212 698 3599 michael.gilbert@dechert.com
Space Lauren Kurtz +1 212 698 3542 +1 212 698 0417 lauren.kurtz@dechert.com
Space Edward A. McDonald +1 212 698 3672 +1 212 698 3599 edward.mcdonald@dechert.com
No Logo Non-Party Police Officer Deponents, Intervenor
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (271) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 266 SECOND MOTION to Unseal records of summonses issued to presumptive class members. . Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Passeser, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 266 SECOND MOTION to Unseal records of summonses issued to presumptive class members. . Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated January 28, 2016 re: Discovery Schedule and including a Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 266 SECOND MOTION to Unseal records of summonses issued to presumptive class members: The Defendants' second motion to unseal, dated January 21, 2016, will be heard at noon on Thursday, February 11, 2016 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2016 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/25/2016) (tn) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 266 SECOND MOTION to Unseal records of summonses issued to presumptive class members. . Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Passeser, Daniel) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
            SECOND MOTION to Unseal records of summonses issued to presumptive class members. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Passeser, Daniel) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 265 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              OPINION: The Plaintiffs' motion for an adverse inference is grantedin part and denied in part, as set forth above. The parties shall meet and confer regarding a schedule for completing all outstanding discovery and submitting a pretrial order; in the event that they are unable to come to an agreement, they are directed to appear for a conference at 4:00pm on Thursday, January 28 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (As further set forth in this Order) (Status Conference set for 1/28/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/2/2016) (kl) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Suzanna Publicker Mettham dated December 31, 2015 re: Former Commissioner Kelly's Emails. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Mettham, Suzanna) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Shea Davis on behalf of Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Davis, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryce Leigh Friedman on behalf of Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Friedman, Bryce) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Curt P. Beck dated December 30, 2015 re: Amendments FRCP 37. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Beck, Curt) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        OPINION #106076: Defendants Raymond W. Kelly, the City of New York, and 50 John Doe police officers (collectively, the "Defendants" or the "City") have filed a letter-motion to remove the statutory seal imposed by N.Y.C.P.L. §§ 160.50 and 160.55 on the records of all individuals who received criminal court summonses between May 1, 2007 and the conclusion of this litigation. The City has failed to make the strong showing required to unseal the records. Its need for the information sought is insufficient to outweigh the privacy interests at issue and the deference accorded to state-created privileges. See Daniels, 2001 WL 228091, at *1. The motion to unseal is therefore denied. It is so ordered. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/11/2015) (kko) Modified on 12/22/2015 (ca). (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER. The documents will remain sealed. The officer in question is not a party to this proceeding and that her privacy interests are worthy of protection. The Plaintiffs' proposed redacted version of the grievance identifies other officers involved in the events, who also have privacy interests meriting consideration. These concerns do not apply to the email from Commissioner Kelly, and its contents are already available to the public because it was read in open court and transcribed by the court reporter. The request to unseal the documents relating to the officer's transfer is therefore denied. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/4/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 10/14/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 10/14/2015 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 10/20/2015 re: Defendants' October 20, 2015 Letter Regarding the Unsealing of Absent Class Member Records (Dkt. 255). Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Daniel Passeser dated October 20, 2015 re: Defendants' motion to unseal records. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Passeser, Daniel) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated October 9, 2015 re: Defendants' Sur-reply In Further Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Spoliation Sanctions. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated October 6, 2015 re: Exhibit 18 to Dkt. 249, Inadvertently Omitted From Public Filing. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 250 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Adverse Inferences Scheduled for October 7, 2015 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated October 5, 2015. filed by The City of New York, Raymond W. Kelly. ENDORSEMENT: Any sur-reply to be filed on 10/9/15. Argument 10/14/15. So ordered. (Surreplies due by 10/9/2015.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/6/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated October 5, 2015 re: 250 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Adverse Inferences Scheduled for October 7, 2015 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated October 5, 2015. . Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Adverse Inferences Scheduled for October 7, 2015 addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated October 5, 2015. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 10/2/2015 re: Pls.' Reply In Further Support of Mot. for Sanctions (Dkt. 222). Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix II, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 10/03/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Marjorie Singer dated 9/11/2015 re: We are seeking an extension of time to respond to the subpoena. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/25/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Daniel Passeser dated September 23, 2015 re: Defendants letter reply in support of their August 12, 2015 letter motion to unseal records. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised proposed unsealing order)(Passeser, Daniel) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated September 11, 2015 re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For An Adverse Inference. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MEMO ENDORSED ORDER on MOTION TO WITHDRAW granting 240 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Lisa Marie Richardson terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/9/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 239 Letter,,,,, filed by Gary Shaw, Ricardo Jones, David Thompson, Mica Ancrum, Jamel Towe, Mariam Farnum, Brian Morris, Jocelyn Ferdinand, Sean Pettigrew, Michael Bennett, Sharif Stinson, Chanel Meausa, Christian Dudley, Joseph Sarpong, Ryburn Walkes, Julius Dixon, Jeremy Thames, Victor Breland, Michael Riddick, Lindsey Riddick, Charlene Finley, Leander Griffin, re: Request for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/9/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Curt Peter Beck on behalf of Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Beck, Curt) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Joshua P. Fitch dated September 3, 2015 re: Letter in Opposition to Defendants' August 12, 2015 request for Unsealing Order. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A (REDACTED))(Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Lisa M. Richardson in Support re: 240 MOTION for Lisa M. Richardson to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by The City of New York. (Richardson, Lisa) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Lisa M. Richardson to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by The City of New York.(Richardson, Lisa) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet dated August 28, 2015 re: Request for Extension of Time to Comply With the August 28, 2015 Fact Discovery Deadline Set Forth in the Stipulation and Scheduling Order (Dkt. 211). Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 232 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendants' August 12, 2015 request for Unsealing Order (Dkt. 228) addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated August 17, 2015. filed by Gary Shaw, Ricardo Jones, David Thompson, Mica Ancrum, Jamel Towe, Mariam Farnum, Brian Morris, Jocelyn Ferdinand, Sean Pettigrew, Michael Bennett, Sharif Stinson, Chanel Meausa, Christian Dudley, Joseph Sarpong, Ryburn Walkes, Julius Dixon, Jeremy Thames, Victor Breland, Michael Riddick, Lindsey Riddick, Charlene Finley, Leander Griffin. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/22/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated August 21, 2015 re: Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Oppose Defendants' Request for an Unsealing Order. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 232 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants' letter-motion for an extension of time is granted. The Defendants' opposition papers shall be filed by Friday, September 11, 2015. Plaintiffs' reply papers shall be filed by Friday, October 2, 2015. The motion will be heard at noon on Wednesday, October 7, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/18/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER: The Defendants' letter-motion to unseal records will be heard on submission on Wednesday, September 9, 2015. All papers shall be submitted in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/18/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated August 19, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' August 17, 2015 LETTER MOTION (Dkt. 232) for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendants' August 12, 2015 request for Unsealing Order (Dkt. 228). Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Louis Passeser on behalf of Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Passeser, Daniel) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendants' August 12, 2015 request for Unsealing Order (Dkt. 228) addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated August 17, 2015. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 8/12/2015 re: 227 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated August 11. 2015. . Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSED ORDER on MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE granting 226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Jennifer Deanne Bishop terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/11/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated August 12, 2015 re: 227 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated August 11. 2015. . Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Lisa M. Richardson dated August 12, 2015 re: Defendants' request for Unsealing Order. Document filed by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Unsealing Order)(Richardson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated August 11. 2015. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Jennifer Deanne Bishop to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Bishop, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              OPINION #105713: The Plaintiffs' motion to compel the deposition of Officer Boylan is denied as moot. The Plaintiffs' motion to compel the production of Electronically Stored Information is granted in part and denied in part, as discussed above. The Defendant's motion for a stay of the case is denied. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/18/2015) (ama) (ama). (Main Document 225 replaced on 7/24/2015) (ajs). Modified on 7/29/2015 (ca). (Main Document 225 replaced on 7/30/2015) (ajs). (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER: The Plaintiffs' letter seeking sanctions, dated June 29, 2015, will be treated as a motion and will be heard at noon on Wednesday, September 30, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All papers shall be submitted in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/30/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/9/2015) (spo) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated July 2, 2015 re: Response to Plaintiffs' Motion For An Adverse Inference. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 6/29/2015 re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Related to Spoliation of Relevant Evidence. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, John Doe #1-50((NYPD Supervisory, Training and Police Personnel), In their Official Capacities, (the name John Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown)), John Doe #1-50((NYPD Supervisory, Training and Police Personnel), Individually (the name John Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown)), Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix I, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA, # 30 Exhibit AB, # 31 Exhibit AC, # 32 Exhibit AD, # 33 Exhibit AE, # 34 Exhibit AF, # 35 Exhibit AG, # 36 Exhibit AH, # 37 Exhibit AI, # 38 Exhibit AJ, # 39 Exhibit AK, # 40 Exhibit AL, # 41 Exhibit AM, # 42 Exhibit AN)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated May 28, 2015 re: Plaintiffs' Letter Submissions Dated May 21 and 26, 2015. Document filed by The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated May 26, 2015 re: List of Custodians in Connection With Plaintiffs' May 21, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 5/21/2015 re: Letter in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel ESI Production. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated May 19, 2015 re: In Response to Plaintiffs' Letters Dated May 12 and 14, 2015. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER. Plaintiffs' letter, dated May 14, 2015, will be treated as a motion and will be heard, along with their other currently-scheduled letter-motion to compel, at noon on Wednesday, May 20, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/15/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER. The Defendants' letter seeking a stay of discovery, dated May 15, 2015, will be treated as a motion and will be heard along with the currently-scheduled motions to compel, at noon on Wednesday, May 20, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/18/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Thomas Cook on behalf of Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Cook, Christopher) (Entered: 05/16/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 5/14/2015 re: Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Electronically Stored Information. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: Plaintiffs' letter, dated May 12, 2015, will be treated as a motion and will be heard at noon on Wednesday, May 20, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/13/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 5/12/2015 re: Motion to Compel Deposition of Police Officer Ryan Boylan. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, by and through their respective undersigned counsel, and made an Order of the Court subject to the Court's approval, that the Orders in this case dated April 25, 2013, January 9, 2014, and September 29, 2014 are amended as follows: 1. The parties shall complete the production of all currently outstanding documents by June 12, 2015. 2. The parties shall complete all fact discovery by August 28, 2015. 3. The parties shall complete service of all Requests for Admission by November 11, 2015. 4. The parties shall complete all expert depositions by December 11, 2015 (the parties may depose all experts). 5. All discovery shall be completed by December 11, 2015. 6. The parties shall submit to the Court trial briefs, a joint proposed pretrial order, and, if applicable, motions in limine and proposed jury charges, voir dire requests and special verdict form (in accordance with the April 25, 2013 Order) by January 29, 2016. A final pretrial conference will be held at 4:30 pm on that date and the Action shall be added to the trial calendar published in the New York Law Journal. ( Brief due by 1/29/2016., Deposition due by 12/11/2015., Discovery due by 12/11/2015., Fact Discovery due by 8/28/2015., Motions due by 1/29/2016., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2016.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/15/2015) (mro) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Plaintiffs and Defendants dated April 14, 2015 re: Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND RULE 502(D) ORDER: 1. The Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.'s (the "PBA") production of documents, electronically stored information ("ESI") or information, whether inadvertent or otherwise, following entry of this Order shall not be construed as a waiver of any applicable privileges or protection from discovery in this case or in any other federal, state, or administrative proceeding. This Order shall be interpreted to provide the maximum protection allowed by Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). 2. Nothing contained herein is intended to or shall serve to limit the PBA's right to conduct a review of documents, ESI, or information for relevance, responsiveness and/or segregation of privileged information before production. 3. Nothing contained herein is intended to or shall serve to limit the PBA's right to designate documents, ESI, or information as "Confidential" or "Attorneys' Eyes Only" pursuant to the Stipulation and Protective Order entered February 1, 2011 [Docket No. 11], as amended by the Order entered February 10, 2014 [Docket No. 85] (the "Protective Order"). (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/10/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Plaintiffs and the Patrolmen's Benevolent Association dated April 9, 2015 re: Stipulation and Proposed Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' and PBA's joint letter (Dkt. No. 205 ), the proposed briefing schedule is approved and Plaintiffs' motion to compel will be heard, on submission, on March 4, 2015. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/13/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Michael J. Gilbert dated February 18, 2015 re: Briefing Schedule set forth in the Joint Letter dated February 12, 2015 [ECF No. 205]. Document filed by Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc..(Gilbert, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated February 12, 2015 re: Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the PBA to Produce Certain Documents on its Privilege Log. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/28/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 1/28/2015 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 1/21/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 1/21/2015 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                OPINION #105172: For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's request for production of the Books is denied. It is so ordered. (See Opinion.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/23/2015) (ajs) Modified on 1/29/2015 (soh). (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Michael J. Gilbert dated January 28, 2015 re: late service of Plaintiffs' reply brief. Document filed by Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc..(Gilbert, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Michael J. Gilbert dated January 23, 2015 re: in opposition to Plaintiffs January 16, 2015 motion for an order requiring the PBA to comply with this Courts September 23, 2014 Order the September Order). Document filed by Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Gilbert, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Antoni Janus on behalf of Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Janus, Kevin) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Plaintiffs' letter dated January 16, 2015 will be treated as a motion to compel and will be heard at noon on Wednesday, January 28, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/19/2015) (ajs) Modified on 1/20/2015 (ajs). (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated January 16, 2015 re: Motion to Enforce the Courts September 18, 2014 Order. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE on re: 193 Letter,,,, filed by Gary Shaw, Ricardo Jones, David Thompson, Mica Ancrum, Jamel Towe, Mariam Farnum, Brian Morris, Jocelyn Ferdinand, Sean Pettigrew, Michael Bennett, Sharif Stinson, Chanel Meausa, Christian Dudley, Joseph Sarpong, Ryburn Walkes, Julius Dixon, Jeremy Thames, Victor Breland, Michael Riddick, Lindsey Riddick, Charlene Finley, Leander Griffin. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney David Lingard terminated. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/12/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from David Lingard dated January 7, 2015 re: Motion by David Lingard for Leave to Withdraw Appearance. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Lingard, David) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 186 Letter,, filed by Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw, Ricardo Jones, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes, Jeremy Thames, Victor Breland, Michael Bennett, Sharif Stinson, Leander Griffin re: Extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/3/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Suzanna Publicker Mettham, New Attorney: Qiana Smith-Williams, Address: NYC Law Department, 100 Church Street, New York, NY - New York, United States 10007, 2123562360. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Mettham, Suzanna) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Jon Norinsberg dated January 5, 2015 re: Redacted Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Schoolcraft documents. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Gerald Cohen dated December 31, 2014 re: extension of time to Reply Re: Schoolcraft Documents. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Lisa M. Richardson dated December 31, 2014 re: Plaintiff's request for an extension dated December 30, 2014. Document filed by The City of New York.(Richardson, Lisa) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Plaintiffs letter dated December 15, 2014 will be treated as a motion to compel and will be heard at noon on Wednesday, January 21, 2015 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. (Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/27/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Gerald Cohen dated December 30, 2014 re: extension of time to Reply Re: Schoolcraft Documents. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Suzanna Publicker Mettham dated December 26, 2014 re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' December 22, 2014 (incorrectly dated 12.15.14) Letter. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Mettham, Suzanna) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Jon Norinsberg dated December 15, 2014 re: to compel discovery of Schoolcraft documents (redacted). Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 182 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to compel discovery of Schoolcraft documents (redacted) addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Jon Norinsberg dated December 15, 2014. Redacted. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Mettham, Suzanna) Modified on 12/29/2014 (db). (Entered: 12/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference to compel discovery of Schoolcraft documents (redacted) addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Jon Norinsberg dated December 15, 2014. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Cohen, Gerald) Modified on 12/29/2014 (db). (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Document number 148 is hereby stricken and removed from the docket. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/6/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/22/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 10/22/2014 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated October 21, 2014 re: In Further Support of Defendants Motion To Find The Briefing and Topics Books Privileged. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated October 17, 2014 re: Opposition to Defendants' October 8 Letter. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanne Maureen McLaren on behalf of Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (McLaren, Joanne) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 10/1/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/1/2014 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION #104864: For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs are directed to return all copies of the Documents to Defendants. Plaintiffs may, however, rely on any material learned prior to the Defendants' September 16 Letter in challenging Defendants' assertion of privilege. Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' assertion of privilege dated October 8, 2014, must be served by Friday, October 17, 2014. Defendants' response, if any, must be served by Tuesday, October 21, 2014. The parties will be heard on Defendants' assertion of privilege on October 22, 2014 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/10/2014) (ajs) Modified on 10/14/2014 (soh). (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated October 6, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Authorities on Rule 26(b)(5)(B) dispute. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 167 Opposition Brief,,,,,, regarding Defendants' Sept. 22, 2014 Motion for an Order to Show Cause. Document filed by The City of New York. (Silverberg, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 9/17/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 9/17/2014 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall complete all fact discovery by April 15, 2015. The parties shall complete all expert discovery by July 30, 2015. The parties shall submit to the court trial briefs, a joint proposed pretrial order, and, if applicable, motions in limine and proposed jury charges, voir dire requests and special verdict form (in accordance with the April 25, 2013 Order) by September 3, 2015. A final pretrial conference will be held at 4:30 p.m., and as further set forth herein. (Expert Discovery due by 7/30/2015. Fact Discovery due by 4/15/2015. Motions due by 9/3/2015. Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2015.), (Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2015 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/29/2014) (ja) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION BRIEF re: 166 Opposition Brief,,,, Declaration of Elinor C. Sutton in Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition (Dkt. No. 166) to Defendants' Sept. 22, 2014 Motion for an Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION BRIEF to Defendants' Sept. 22, 2014 Motion for an Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Steven M. Silverberg dated 9/23/2014 re: Extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: The order to show cause will be heard October 1, opposition to be filed September 29, reply October 1. So ordered. (Replies due by 10/1/2014. Show Cause Response due by 9/29/2014.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/23/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION #104780: The Plaintiffs in this class action have moved to compel the nonparty Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York (the "PBA") to produce documents pursuant to a subpoena and an April 17, 2014 order of this Court (the "April 17 Order"). Based on the conclusions set forth within, the motion is granted. It is so ordered. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/18/2014) (ajs) Modified on 9/25/2014 (ca). Modified on 9/25/2014 (ca). (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION #104779: The Motion to Quash Is Denied. As set forth within, the Plaintiffs have cited a number of public statements made by Lynch as the PBA President on the subject of quotas for summons alleged to have been imposed by the New York Police Department. The basis for these statements and communications with others concerning quotas or summons may lead to admissible evidence and are properly discoverable. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/18/2014) (ajs) Modified on 9/25/2014 (ca). (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPINION #104783 re: 112 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012 filed by The City of New York, Raymond W. Kelly. Based upon the facts and conclusions of law as set forth within, Defendants' motion is denied. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/22/2014) (ajs) Modified on 9/25/2014 (ca). (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re: 160 Letter,,,,, regarding plaintiffs' response to defendants' motion for an Order to Show Cause. Document filed by The City of New York. (Silverberg, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated 9.23.14 re: Letter to the Court regarding date for submission of Plaintiffs opposition to Defendants Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY re: 158 Letter,,,,, by Plaintiffs dated September 12, 2014 in Opposition to Mr. Lynchs Motion to Quash the Subpoena. Document filed by Patrick Lynch. (McDonald, Edward) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated September 12, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Opposition to Patrick Lynch's September 5, 2014 Motion to Quash. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of City of New York, Inc.'s motion to quash dated September 5, 2014, will be heard at noon on Wednesday, September 17, 2014 in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. It is so ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2014 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/12/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 9.10.14 re: Plaintiffs Reply to PBAs September 5, 2014 Opposition to Plaintiffs August 14, 2014 Letter. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P, # 6 Exhibit Q, # 7 Exhibit R)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward A. McDonald on behalf of Patrick Lynch. (McDonald, Edward) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 9.8.14 Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated September 8, 2014 re: Opposition to Non-Party Patrolmen's Benevolent Association's Request for an Adjournment of the September 10, 2014 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Edward A. McDonald dated September 5, 2014 re: Oral Argument on Motion to Compel. Document filed by Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc..(McDonald, Edward) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Edward A. McDonald dated September 5, 2014 re: motion to quash the subpoena. Document filed by Patrick Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(McDonald, Edward) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re: 144 Letter,,,,, . Document filed by Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(McDonald, Edward) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Edward A. McDonald dated September 5, 2014 re: motion to quash the subpoena. Document filed by Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(McDonald, Edward) Modified on 9/9/2014 (lb). (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sheila Weinstein on behalf of Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Weinstein, Sheila) Modified on 10/24/2014 (db). (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 145 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Opposition to be filed September 5. Motion to be submitted September 10. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/20/2014) (tn) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 8.20.14 re: Plaintiffs letter in response to the PBAs August 19, 2014 letter. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Michael J. Gilbert dated August 19, 2014. Document filed by Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc..(Gilbert, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 8.14.14 re: Plaintiffs request that the PBA be ordered to comply with the Courts previous April 17, 2014 Order. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. In light of counsel's letter dated June 12, 2014 (ECF #140), the motion to intervene (ECF #134) is hereby marked as withdrawn. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/8/2014). (rjm) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Deanne Bishop on behalf of Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Bishop, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated June 13, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' May 22, 2014 Letter Motion. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Mitchell Garber dated June 12, 2014 re: Withdrawal of Motion To Intervene. Document filed by Non-Party Police Officer Deponents.(Garber, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 132 Letter filed by The City of New York, Raymond W. Kelly. ENDORSEMENT: The City's draft declaration attached hereto is approved. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/9/2014) (tn) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The previous scheduling order (ECF No. 128) is hereby amended as follows: Defendants' motion for decertification dated April 4, 2014 will now be heard, on submission, on Wednesday, June 11, 2014 at noon. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/9/2014) (tn) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Mitchell Garber dated 5/30/2014 re: 1. My firm's Motion to Intervene will be filed by June 2, 2014. 2. Assuming that the Court grants intervention, my firm's letter in response to the City's May 29, 2014 letter be filed by June 9, 2014. 3. The City's Reply will be filed by June 13, 2014. Any Response to the City's Reply will be filed by June 16, 2014. 5. The parties are requesting that the Court schedule argument on June 18, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: Schedule approved with submission on June 18., ( Replies due by 6/13/2014., Surreplies due by 6/16/2014.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/5/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY AFFIRMATION of Qiana Smith-Williams in Support re: 112 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 112 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012. . Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Mitchell Garber dated June 2, 2014 re: Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Non-Party Police Officer Deponents.(Garber, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Benjamin J. Gildin dated May 30, 2014 re: Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Decertification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(1)(C). Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Gildin, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated May 29, 2014 re: Request For Your Honor to Endorse the Officer Declaration Submitted by Defendants. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 112 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012. . Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Joshua P. Fitch in Opposition re: 112 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012.. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Benjamin J. Gildin dated May 22, 2014 re: compliance with the March 24, 2014 Order. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Declaration)(Gildin, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. Defendants' motion for decertification dated April 4, 2014 will now be heard on Wednesday, June 11, 2014 at noon. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 112 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012.: (Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/7/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Benjamin J. Gildin dated 5.5.2014 re: April 16, 2014 Order regarding Defendants' Motion for Decertification. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Gildin, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Lee Alan Adlerstein dated 5/1/2014 re: It is respectfully requested that your Honor approve of the May 14, 2014 deposition date through endorsement of this letter or such other manner as the Court deems appropriate. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Deposition due by 5/14/2014.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/1/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 4/17/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 4/17/2014 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Joseph Gildin on behalf of Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Gildin, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [PROPOSED] ORDER: 1. ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve Mr. Barry with a subpoena for testimony as soon as practicable; and it is further 2. ORDERED that the subpoena shall set a date for deposition fourteen (14) days from the date of service of the subpoena; and it is further 3. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' April 4, 2014 Motion For Decertification shall be due fourteen (14) days from the date of Mr. Barry's deposition. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/17/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated April 17, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Letter Dated April 15, 2014. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Defendants' motion for decertification dated April 4, 2014 will be heard on Wednesday, May 7, 2014 at noon. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1.Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 112 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012 :( Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/15/2014) (mro) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated April 15, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Letter re Defs.' April 4, 2014 Decertification Motion. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated April 14, 2014 re: Reply Letter to the PBA's April 8, 2014 Letter in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request to Enforce the PBA Subpoena. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/19/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/19/2014 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Edward A. McDonald dated April 8, 2014 re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' March 26, 2014 letter requesting order compelling PBA to produce additional documents pursuant to a third-party subpoena. Document filed by Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(McDonald, Edward) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Qiana Smith-Williams in Support re: 112 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 112 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct the Certification Order dated April 23, 2012. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference / Oral Argument addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Lauren Kurtz dated April 1, 2014. Document filed by Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc..(Kurtz, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Kurtz on behalf of Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. (Kurtz, Lauren) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Gilbert on behalf of Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. (Gilbert, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward A. McDonald on behalf of Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.. (McDonald, Edward) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          UNSEALING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the City of New York, including the Office of Corporation Counsel and the New York City Police Department, sha1l not be bound by the statutory sealing requirements of CPL §§ 160.50 and 160.55, as it relates to the CompStat videos at issue; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant City of New York produce non-party information subject to CPL §§ 160.50 and 160.55, contained on the subject CompStat videos, to plaintiffs; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the use of the above-referenced records is restricted to use in the above-entitled civil rights action and shall be protected by plaintiffs' counsel as "Attorneys' Eyes Only," such that plaintiffs' counsel may not disclose the non-party information on the CompStat videos to anyone other than employees of their firms, relevant deponents (and any court reporter/videographer at the deposition), and the Court. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/28/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated 3/27/2014 re: Defendants write to respectfully request (1) an enlargement of time to comply with the Court's March 25, 2014 Order and (2) that Your Honor endorse that attached Proposed Unsealing Order authorizing defendant City or New York to produce non-party information which may be subject to New York Criminal Procedure Law ("CPL") §§ 160.50 and 160.55. ENDORSEMENT: Production of videos to commence April 9, 2014. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/28/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The Plaintiffs' letter dated March 27, 2014 requesting an order compelling non-party, the Patrolmen's Benevolent Association of the City of New York, to provide outstanding discovery will be heard on Wednesday, April 9, 2014 at noon. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. (Conference set for 4/9/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/27/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Jon Norinsberg, Elinor Sutton dated March 26, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Request for the Court to Enforce the PBA Subpoena. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPINION 104154. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for reconsideration is denied, and Plaintiff's request for the City to provide non-party officers with a statement relating the potential conflict of representation by corporation counsel is granted. It is so ordered. re: 89 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's February 11, 2014 Order directing the City to provide CompStat meeting videos requested by plaintiffs for review by their counsel, irrespective of the privileged material on the videos filed by The City of New York, Raymond W. Kelly. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/24/2014) (rjm) Modified on 3/25/2014 (rjm). Modified on 4/3/2014 (nt). (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 89 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's February 11, 2014 Order directing the City to provide CompStat meeting videos requested by plaintiffs for review by their counsel, irrespective of the privileged material on the videos.. Document filed by The City of New York. (Silverberg, Steven) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 3.18.14 re: Plaintiffs Reply Letter to Defendants Mar. 11, 2014 Opposition Letter to Disqualify Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALING ORDER: Having considered Plaintiffs' February 26, 2014 request to file under seal their opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's February 11, 2014 Order, and upon finding good cause exists to seal the opposition based on the inclusion of information designated "Confidential - Attorneys' Eyes Only," IT IS HEREBY: 1. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request is GRANTED; and it is further 2. ORDERED that Plaintiffs are authorized to file under seal their Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/17/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Plaintiffs' letter dated March 19, 2014 will be treated as a motion to compel and will be heard in conjunction with the motion to disqualify on Wednesday, March 19, 2014 at noon. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/13/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lingard on behalf of Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Lingard, David) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Defendants' motion for reconsideration, dated February 26, 2014 will be heard on Wednesday, March 19, 2014, along with the discovery motion set for that date. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/6/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Defendants' motion for reconsideration, dated February 20, 2014 will be submitted on Thursday, March 13, 2014, at noon. Plaintiff's motion to disqualify corporate counsel will be heard on Wednesday, March 19, 2014 at noon. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1., ( Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/6/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Lisa M. Richardson dated March 11, 2014 re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Feb. 25, 2014 Letter Motion for Disqualification. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Richardson, Lisa) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton, Joshua Fitch, Jon Norinsberg dated 3.7.14 re: Request for Court Intervention - Disciplinary Files. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Suzanna Publicker Mettham dated 2/19/14 re: Defendants write to request that the Court grant defendants a brief three day enlargement of time to file a motion for reconsideration regarding the Court's February 11, 2014 Order to produce certain CompStat videos. Defendants contacted plaintiffs' counsel by email and telephone today to seek their consent, but had not heard back at the time of this writing. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/25/2014) (mro) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 89 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's February 11, 2014 Order directing the City to provide CompStat meeting videos requested by plaintiffs for review by their counsel, irrespective of the privileged material on the videos.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Silverberg, Steven) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Steven M. Silverberg in Support re: 89 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's February 11, 2014 Order directing the City to provide CompStat meeting videos requested by plaintiffs for review by their counsel, irrespective of the privileged material on the videos.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C)(Silverberg, Steven) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's February 11, 2014 Order directing the City to provide CompStat meeting videos requested by plaintiffs for review by their counsel, irrespective of the privileged material on the videos. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Silverberg, Steven) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated 2.25.14 re: Plaintiffs' Disqualification Letter. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/11/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/11/2014 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER:..regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/10/2014) (ama) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Plaintiffs' letter dated January 31, 2014 regarding COMPSTAT shall be treated as a motion and will be heard on Tuesday February 11, 2014 at noon. All motion paper shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. IT IS SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 80 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Regarding Motion to Compel Deposition Answers addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated January 28, 2014. :( Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/06/2014) (ama) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Plaintiffs and third parties may designate discovery material produced in this Action as "Confidential" under the Protective Order. All provisions of the Protective Order shall apply to discovery material designated as "Confidential" by Plaintiffs or a third party. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/5/2014) (ft) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Marie Richardson on behalf of Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Richardson, Lisa) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On January 29, 2014, this Court heard argument regarding the production of disciplinary files for NYPD officers being deposed in this matter; and based on the discovery and deposition schedules in this matter, the parties require an order reflecting the Court's ruling; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: Defendants will produce an unredacted and complete list of all disciplinary allegations made against each office being deposed in this matter. Defendants will produce a summary or description of the underlying facts related to each allegation; and Defendants may designate documents produced pursuant to Paragraphs 1 and 2 above (and deposition testimony regarding the same documents) as "Attorneys' Eyes Only," such that Plaintiffs' counsel may not disclose the documents or the contents of the documents to anyone other than employees of their respective firms, the relevant deponents (and any court reporter/videographer at the deposition), and the Court. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/3/2014) (ja) Modified on 2/3/2014 (ja). (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Regarding Motion to Compel Deposition Answers addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated January 28, 2014. Document filed by The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor C. Sutton dated January 23, 2014 re: Plaintiffs Reply to Motion Regarding Protective Order. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The Plaintiffs' letter dated January 13, 2014 for a protective order shall be treated as a motion and will be heard on Wednesday January 22, 2014. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/14/2014) (ama) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES RIDDICK AND DIXON:IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED and AGREED, pursuant to 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between the attorneys for the respective parties herein, that Lindsey Riddick and Julius Dixon are no longer representative plaintiffs and/or class members in this action and that all their claims against the defendants in this action are dismissed with prejudice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/13/2014) (ama) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall complete all fact discovery by 10/15/2014. The parties shall complete all expert discovery by 1/30/2015. The parties shall submit to the court trial briefs, a joint proposed pretrial order, and, if applicable, motions in limine and proposed jury charges, voir dire requests and special verdict form in accordance with the annexed form and instructions by 3/6/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2015 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet and the Action shall be added to the trial calendar published in the New York Law Journal. (Brief due by 3/6/2015. Expert Discovery due by 1/30/2015. Fact Discovery due by 10/15/2014. Motions due by 3/6/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2015 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/9/2014) (tro) Modified on 1/16/2014 (tro). (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Elinor Sutton dated 1.13.14 re: Third Party Protective Order. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Mark Silverberg on behalf of Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Silverberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Suzanna Publicker Mettham on behalf of Paul Brown, Paul Brown, Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. New Address: New York City Law Department, 100 Church Street, Rm 3-200, New York, New York, United States 10007, 212-356-2372. (Mettham, Suzanna) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Paul Brown, Paul Brown, John Doe #1-50((NYPD Supervisory, Training and Police Personnel), In their Official Capacities, (the name John Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown)), John Doe #1-50((NYPD Supervisory, Training and Police Personnel), Individually (the name John Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown)), Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Lindsey Riddick, Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Sean Pettigrew, Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Victor Breland, Jeremy Thames, Brian Morris, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Julius Dixon, Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated), Ricardo Jones, Leander Griffin, Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Michael Riddick, Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ). (Sutton, Elinor) Modified on 12/31/2013 (ml). (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTIONS proceeding held on 9/25/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTIONS held on 9/25/2013 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/2/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/2/2013 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/4/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' filings and having heard oral argument on September 25, 2013, and October 2, 2013 regarding Defendant City of New York's motion for a protective order, dated August 23, 2013, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Defendant shall provide a witness to testify as to Topic Nos. 1-5 set forth in Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) deposition notice served on August l, 2013 (the "Deposition Notice"). Plaintiffs agree to modify the definition of "Enforcement Activity" contained in the Deposition Notice to: "any and all actions taken by members of the NYPD to make arrests, issue summonses, and stop question and frisk civilians, and as further set forth in this document." (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/7/2013) (cd) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated October 7, 2013 re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Court Endorsement of a Proposed Order. Document filed by The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Steig D. Olson dated 10/04/2013 re: Plaintiffs' Proposed Order. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Olson, Steig) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Stephen R. Neuwirth dated 8/30/2013 re: Response to defendant City of NY letter, dated 8/23/2013 (previous docket entry) re request for a protective order be denied. Document filed by Sharif Stinson et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Snith-Williams dated 8/23/2013 re: Request for a protective order and that the Court limit the anticipated Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. Document filed by The City of New York.(cd) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Reply to Defendants' 08.23.13 Motion for Protective Order addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated September 16, 2013. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Publicker, Suzanna) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Change of Name. Document filed by The City of New York. (Publicker, Suzanna) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Defendants' motion for a protective order, dated August 23, 2013, will be heard at noon on Wednesday, September 25, 2013 in courtroom 18C. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. (Status Conference set for 9/25/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/30/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSED on NOTICE OF MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP AS CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 23(G) granting 53 Motion to Appoint Counsel. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted, no opposition. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/23/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: 53 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP as Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw, Ricardo Jones, Julius Dixon, Ryburn Walkes, Jeremy Thames, Victor Breland, Michael Bennett, Sharif Stinson, Lindsey Riddick, Leander Griffin. The plaintiffs' motion for the appointment of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan as co-lead class counsel pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) will be heard on submission on August 21, 2013. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Rule 6.1. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/5/2013) (tn) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elinor Catherine Sutton on behalf of Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Sutton, Elinor) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steig Olson on behalf of Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Olson, Steig) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Randall Neuwirth on behalf of Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP as Co-Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP as Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). Return Date set for 8/21/2013 at 12:00 PM.(Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: All motions are to be made returnable at 12:00 noon on Wednesday and in compliance with the rules of this Court. The parties shall complete all fact discovery by 1/15/2014 and all expert discovery by 4/16/2014. The parties shall file all motion, other than motions in limine, by this date. The parties shall submit to the court trial briefs, a jointed proposed pretrial order, and, if applicable, motions in limine and proposed jury charges, voir dire requests and special verdict form in accordance with the annexed form and instructions by 5/7/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/25/2013) (tro) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: 4/24/2013 Pretrial Conference reset for 4/25/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Please notify opposing counsel of the change. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/22/2013) (cd) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: 3/21/2013 Pretrial Conference reset for 4/24/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Please notify opposing counsel of the change. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/21/2013) (cd) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: 3/20/2013 Pretrial Conference reset for 3/21/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Please notify opposing counsel of the change. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/11/2013) (cd) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER: Counsel are directed to appear in courtroom 18C on 3/20/2013 at 4:30 p.m. for a pretrial conference for the purpose of resolving any outstanding discovery or other issues, and setting a time for trial. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2013 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/07/2013) (ama) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 12-3069. Petitioners, through counsel, move, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f), for leave to appeal the district courts order granting Respondents motion for class certification. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the petition is DENIED because an immediate appeal is unwarranted. See Sumitomo Copper Litig. v. Credit Lyonnais Rouse, Ltd., 262 F.3d 134, 139-40 (2d Cir. 2001). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 12/12/2012. (tp) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Please be advised that the conference scheduled for 5/16/12 has been rescheduled to 9/26/12 at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 18C. Please notify opposing counsel of the change. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/14/2012) (jfe) Modified on 9/14/2012 (jfe). (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION denying re: 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 34 Memorandum & Opinion filed by The City of New York, Raymond W. Kelly. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/13/2012) (cd) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Qiana Smith-Williams in Support re: 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 34 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 34 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 34 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Joshua P. Fitch in Opposition re: 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 34 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Gerald M. Cohen dated 5/31/2012 re: Request to modify the briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiffs' Opposition: 6/12/2012; Defendants' Reply: 6/26/2012. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Responses due by 6/12/2012, Replies due by 6/26/2012.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/4/2012) (jar) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet, from Joshua P. Fitch, dated 5/8/2012, re: on behalf of both parties to request an extension of both plaintiffs' time to file their opposition to defendants' motion for reconsideration and defendants' time to reply to same. Accordingly, the parties respectfully request that Your Honor adopt the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff's Opposition, 6/5/2012; Defendants' Reply, 6/18/2012. Parties also request that the conference currently scheduled for May 16, 2012 be adjourned to a date and time following the determination of defendants' instant motion. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. ( Responses due by 6/5/2012, Replies due by 6/18/2012.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/8/2012) (ja) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The Defendants' motion for reconsideration will be heard on submission on May 30, 2012. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/08/2012) (ama) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 34 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re; 34 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2012 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/27/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM & OPINION: #101736 For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is granted. The class certified is defined to include individuals who were issued summonses that were later dismissed upon a judicial finding of facial insufficiency and who were ticketed without probable cause. Individuals who were issued summonses that survived the defect review process but were dismissed upon a judicial finding of facial insufficiency are presumptive members of the class, but Defendants can challenge any presumptive class members on grounds that the summons at issue was dismissed for reasons other than a lack of probable cause. The applicable class period is May 25, 2007 to the present, pursuant to the three year statute of limitations governing actions brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983. The class is certified under both Rules 23 (b) (2) and 2 3 (b) (3), with the Rule 23 (b) (2) class seeking declaratory and injunctive relief and the Rule 23(b) (3) class seeking money damages. Plaintiffs Sharif Stinson, Ryburn Walkes, Gary Shaw, Michael Bennett, Chanel Meausa. David Thompson, Julius Dixon, Jeremy Thames, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Victor Breland and Lindsey Riddick will serve as class representatives, and Jon Norinsberg, Esq. and Cohen & Fitch LLP will serve as class counsel. re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class. filed by Gary Shaw, Ricardo Jones, David Thompson, Mica Ancrum, Jamel Towe, Mariam Farnum, Brian Morris, Jocelyn Ferdinand, Sean Pettigrew, Michael Bennett, Sharif Stinson, Chanel Meausa, Christian Dudley, Joseph Sarpong, Ryburn Walkes, Julius Dixon, Jeremy Thames, Victor Breland, Michael Riddick, Lindsey Riddick, Charlene Finley, Leander Griffin. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/23/2012) (djc) Modified on 5/2/2012 (jab). (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Joshua P. Fitch dated 1/17/2012 re: I write now on behalf of former proposed representative plaintiff Mariam Farnum to request leave for her civil rights to pursue her claim individually. Defendants take no position with respect to this request. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/17/2012) (ama) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - RESPONSE to Motion re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class. Sur-Reply in Further Opposition of Class Certification Motion. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) Modified on 11/14/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jon L. Norinsberg in Support re: 29 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bennett Dep., # 2 Exhibit Griffin Dep., # 3 Exhibit Walkes Dep., # 4 Exhibit Meausa Dep., # 5 Exhibit Shaw Dep., # 6 Exhibit Dixon Dep., # 7 Exhibit Jones Dep., # 8 Exhibit Breland Dep., # 9 Exhibit Riddick Dep., # 10 Exhibit Thames Dep., # 11 Exhibit Thompson Dep., # 12 Exhibit Stinson Dep.)(Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated 11/2/2011 re: Counsel for the Defendants writes to request that the Court allow defendants to file a sur-reply to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification, filed October 28, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Sur-reply permitted as requested. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/3/2011) (ab) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Lindsey Riddick, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves). (Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Joshua P. Fitch dated 10/14/2011 re: My firm, along with co-counsel Jon Norinsberg, represents plaintiffs in the above-referenced matter and we write to Your Honor to respectfully request an extension of the October 21, 2011 deadline to reply to defendants' opposition to class certification until October 28, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/17/2011) (rdz) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: At the request of the parties, Plaintiffs' motion for class certification, dated February 4, 2011, will be heard at noon on Wednesday, November 16, 2011, in courtroom 18C. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 11/16/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/11/2011) (ama) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Qiana Smith-Williams in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration Ex. A - F, # 2 Exhibit Declaration Ex. G - L, # 3 Exhibit Declaration Ex. M - P, # 4 Exhibit Declaration Ex. Q - U)(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated 8/24/2011 re: Counsel for the Defendants writes to request that Defendant's opposition papers to the class certification motion be served by 9/9/2011 and Plaintiff's reply papers be served by 10/21/2011. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/29/2011) (ab) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated 8/24/2011 re: Defendants request that the briefing schedule be enlarged as follows: Defendants opposition papers to be served by 9/9/11. Plaintiffs reply papers to be served by 10/21/11. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/25/2011) (jfe) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT ORDER: All pre-certification depositions in this matter will be conducted on or before 7/15/2011. Any plaintiff who fails to appear for a scheduled deposition by July 15, 2011, shall be removed as a proposed class representative; and as further set forth in this order. Defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion for certification shall be filed no later than 8/26/2011, and plaintiffs' reply papers shall be filed no later than 9/16/2011. (Deposition due by 7/15/2011.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/22/2011) (tro) Modified on 6/28/2011 (tro). (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Defendants' letter will be treated as a motion on Wednesday, April 20, 2011 to the Court, dated April 12, 2011, compel and will be heard at noon in courtroom 18C. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/15/2011) (jar) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Having received Plaintiffs' letter to the Court, dated April 12, 2011, stating that Defendants have served responses to Plaintiffs' discovery demands as well as several hundred documents, Plaintiffs' motion to compel, dated March 30, 2011, is hereby dismissed as moot. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/14/11). (djc) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Plaintiffs' letter to the Court, dated March 30, 2011, will be treated as a motion to compel and and will be heard at noon on Wednesday, April 13, 2011 in Courtroom 18C. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/5/2011) (js) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York. Related document: 8 Amended Complaint,,,,,, filed by Gary Shaw, Ricardo Jones, David Thompson, Mica Ancrum, Jamel Towe, Mariam Farnum, Brian Morris, Jocelyn Ferdinand, Sean Pettigrew, Michael Bennett, Sharif Stinson, Chanel Meausa, Christian Dudley, Joseph Sarpong, Ryburn Walkes, Julius Dixon, Jeremy Thames, Victor Breland, Michael Riddick, Lindsey Riddick, Charlene Finley, Leander Griffin.(Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Defendants' letter to the Court, dated February 18, 2011, will be treated as a motion and will be heard on submission, without oral argument, on March 16, 2011. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/5/11) (djc) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Qiana Charmaine Smith on behalf of Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York (Smith, Qiana) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Plaintiffs' motion for class certification, dated February 4, 2011, will be heard at noon on Wednesday, March 23, 2011, in courtroom 18C. All motion papers shall be served in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1. It is so ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 12 MOTION to Certify Class. ( Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2011 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/8/2011) (jmi) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Joshua P. Fitch in Support re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit OCA Statistics for Summons Activity for the year of 2004, # 2 Exhibit OCA Statistics for Summons Activity for the year of 2005, # 3 Exhibit OCA Statistics for Summons Activity for the year of 2006, # 4 Exhibit OCA Statistics for Summons Activity for the year of 2007, # 5 Exhibit OCA Statistics for Summons Activity for the year of 2008, # 6 Exhibit OCA Statistics for Summons Activity for the year of 2009)(Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated). (Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Victor Breland, Julius Dixon, Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ), Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Leander Griffin, Ricardo Jones, Chanel Meausa, Brian Morris, Sean Pettigrew, Lindsey Riddick, Michael Riddick, Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Jeremy Thames, David Thompson, Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated).(Fitch, Joshua) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/1/11) (mro) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Raymond W. Kelly served on 9/1/2010, answer due 9/22/2010. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Aronov, Clerk Authorized to Accept. Document filed by Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves). (Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The City of New York served on 9/1/2010, answer due 9/22/2010. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Aronov, Clerk Authorized to Accept. Document filed by Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated). (Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against John Doe #1-50((NYPD Supervisory, Training and Police Personnel), In their Official Capacities, (the name John Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown)), John Doe #1-50((NYPD Supervisory, Training and Police Personnel), Individually (the name John Doe being fictitious, as the true names are presently unknown)), Raymond W. Kelly, Raymond W. Kelly, The City of New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michael Bennett(on behalf of themselves ), Christian Dudley(on behalf of themselves ), Sharif Stinson(Other Similarly Situated), Michael Bennett(Other Similarly Situated), Jamel Towe(on behalf of themselves), Sharif Stinson(on behalf of themselves), Lindsey Riddick, Christian Dudley(Other Similarly Situated), Sean Pettigrew, Jocelyn Ferdinand(on behalf of themselves), Jocelyn Ferdinand(Other Similarly Situated), Joseph Sarpong(on behalf of themselves ), Victor Breland, Jeremy Thames, Brian Morris, Gary Shaw(Other Similarly Situated), Mica Ancrum(on behalf of themselves ), Mica Ancrum(similarly situated), Julius Dixon, Jamel Towe(Other Similarly Situated), David Thompson, Ryburn Walkes(on behalf of themselves), Chanel Meausa, Gary Shaw(on behalf of themselves), Joseph Sarpong(similarly situated), Charlene Finley(Other Similarly Situated), Ryburn Walkes(Other Similarly Situated), Ricardo Jones, Leander Griffin, Charlene Finley(on behalf of themselves), Mariam Farnum(Other Similarly Situated), Michael Riddick, Mariam Farnum(on behalf of themselves ). Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Gary Shaw, Christian Dudley, Jamel Towe, Mariam Farnum, Jocelyn Ferdinand, Ryburn Walkes, Michael Bennett, Sharif Stinson, Charlene Finley.(rdz) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Joshua Fitch dated 8/11/10 re: Request that plaintiffs amend the complaint without leave by 8/31/10 and that defendants answer within 60 days. It is also respectfully requested that the initial conference scheduled for 10/6/10 remain in tact. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/17/10) (cd) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2010 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/14/10) (rjm) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Qiana Smith-Williams dated 6/17/10 re: counsel requests a sixty-day enlargement of time from the present date until August 16, 2010 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. The City of New York answer due 8/16/2010; Raymond W. Kelly answer due 8/16/2010. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/23/10) (djc) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Paul Brown served on 5/27/2010, answer due 6/17/2010. Service was accepted by 5/27/2010. Document filed by Ryburn Walkes; Jamel Towe; Sharif Stinson; Christian Dudley; Jocelyn Ferdinand; Gary Shaw; Michael Bennett; Mariam Farnum; Charlene Finley. (Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Raymond W. Kelly served on 5/27/2010, answer due 6/17/2010. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Aronov. Document filed by Ryburn Walkes; Jamel Towe; Sharif Stinson; Christian Dudley; Jocelyn Ferdinand; Gary Shaw; Michael Bennett; Mariam Farnum; Charlene Finley. (Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The City of New York served on 5/27/2010, answer due 6/17/2010. Service was accepted by Dmitriy Aronov. Document filed by Ryburn Walkes; Jamel Towe; Sharif Stinson; Christian Dudley; Jocelyn Ferdinand; Gary Shaw; Michael Bennett; Mariam Farnum; Charlene Finley. (Cohen, Gerald) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against The City of New York , Raymond W. Kelly, Paul Brown, John Doe #1-50. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 904975)Document filed by Ryburn Walkes, Jamel Towe, Sharif Stinson, Christian Dudley, Jocelyn Ferdinand, Gary Shaw, Michael Bennett, Mariam Farnum, Charlene Finley.(rdz) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 564 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?