Khanum et al v. Mukasey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:08-cv-02899-JW
District Judge James Ware, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aasia Khanum, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Olumide Kolawole Obayemi +1 510 352 3000 +1 510 798 8732 obayemilaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Muhammad Zameer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Olumide Kolawole Obayemi +1 510 352 3000 +1 510 798 8732 obayemilaw@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Attorney General, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Kay L. Anske, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo United States Consular-General,, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo United States Consulate in Islamabad, Pakistan, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Office San Jose
Filed 6/10/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause Application for Naturalization
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Alameda
Terminated 8/22/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, CLOSED, E-Filing
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice re [16] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer. The Court terminates all pending deadlines, hearings and motions. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/22/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice and [Proposed] Order by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer (Obayemi, Olumide) (Filed on 8/19/2008) Modified on 8/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time Within Which The Defendants Must File An Answer re [14] Stipulation. Answer due 9/22/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/14/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Stipulation
        STIPULATION to Extend Time Within Which The Defendants Must File An Answer by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kay L. Anske, United States Consular-General,, United States Consulate in Islamabad, Pakistan, Michael B. Mukasey, Attorney General, Condoleezza Rice. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 8/12/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Certificate Of Service.
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer (Obayemi, Olumide) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Summons Issued
            Summons Issued as to Kay L. Anske. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 ERRATA
              Amended Summons as to Kay L. Anske and the United States Consulate in Islamabad, Pakistan by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer. *** HAS NOT BEEN ISSUED BY THE COURT *** (Obayemi, Olumide) (Filed on 7/17/2008) Modified on 7/30/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Amended Complaint
                AMENDED PETITION for WRIT OF MANDAMUS by Khanum and Zameer against all defendants. Filed by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer. (Obayemi, Olumide) (Filed on 7/16/2008) Modified on 7/30/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/30/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to the Office of the US Attorney General, Department of Justice of the summons and complaint by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer (Obayemi, Olumide) (Filed on 6/25/2008) Modified on 6/26/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer (Obayemi, Olumide) (Filed on 6/25/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer on ALL DEFENDANTS (Obayemi, Olumide) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/22/2008, Entered: 6/22/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer on Micheal B. Mukasey and United States Department of Justice of documents [1] and other documents given by the court. (Obayemi, Olumide) (Filed on 6/22/2008) Modified on 6/23/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Clerks Notice re: Failure to E-File and Register
                          CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File Petition and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Complaint
                            PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS with ***exhibits attached are turned upside down ***against all defendants. Filed by Aasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer. (Obayemi, Olumide) (Filed on 6/12/2008) Modified text on 6/12/2008,(counsel notified) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/30/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Case Referred to ECF
                              CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2008)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2008. Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/10/08. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
                                  Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Michael B. Mukasey, Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, Condoleezza Rice, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
                                    PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (summons issed) (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611020083). Filed byAasia Khanum, Muhammad Zameer. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?